1ST HOME LIQUIDATING, et al v. USA
Federal Civil Lawsuit United States Court of Federal Claims, Case No. 1:95-cv-00250-LAS
District Judge Loren A. Smith, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo 1ST HOME LIQUIDATING TRUST, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Greenberg Traurig, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jerry Stouck +1 202 331 3173 +1 202 331 3101 stouckj@gtlaw.com
No Logo EVERETTE E. MILLS, III, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Greenberg Traurig, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jerry Stouck +1 202 331 3173 +1 202 331 3101 stouckj@gtlaw.com
No Logo ROGER P. KAVANAGH, JR.,, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Greenberg Traurig, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jerry Stouck +1 202 331 3173 +1 202 331 3101 stouckj@gtlaw.com
No Logo WILLIAM E. STONE, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Greenberg Traurig, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jerry Stouck +1 202 331 3173 +1 202 331 3101 stouckj@gtlaw.com
v.
United States of America United States of America, Defendant
Officially listed as "USA"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space David Alan Levitt +1 202 307 0309 david.levitt@usdoj.gov
Office COFC
Filed 3/22/1995
Jury Demand
Demand $0
Nature of Suit 511 - Taking - FIRREA
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1491 Tucker Act
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition Judgment - Stipulation
County
Terminated 12/13/2007
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case '08-5050'[]
Def Custody Status
Flags APPEAL, CLOSED, CRSAPP, ECF
  Entries (174) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document 165 Filed: 3/19/2008, Entered: 3/19/2008
NOTICE OF CROSS APPEAL, filed by 1ST HOME LIQUIDATING TRUST, EVERETTE E. MILLS, III, WILLIAM E. STONE. Filing fee $ 455.00, receipt number 067849. (hw1, )
    LREF
    Legal Document 164 Filed: 3/14/2008, Entered: 3/14/2008
    CAFC Case Number 08-5050 for [162] Notice of Appeal filed by USA. (hw1, )
      LREF
      Legal Document 162 Filed: 3/7/2008, Entered: 3/7/2008
      NOTICE OF APPEAL, filed by USA. Copies to judge, opposing party and CAFC. (hw1, )
        LREF
        Legal Document 163 Filed: 2/25/2008, Entered: 3/11/2008 Certified Transcript to Attorney
        CERTIFIED TRANSCRIPT OF JUDGMENT, forwarded to Jerry Stouck. See letter in file. (bre, )
          LREF
          Legal Document 161 Filed: 1/9/2008, Entered: 1/9/2008
          CORRECTED JUDGMENT entered pursuant to January 4, 2008 Order. (lld)
            LREF
            Legal Document 160 Filed: 1/4/2008, Entered: 1/4/2008 Court Filing
            ORDER granting [159] Motion to Amend/Correct Signed by Judge Loren A. Smith. (lp1)
              LREF
              Legal Document 159 Filed: 12/14/2007, Entered: 12/14/2007, Terminated: 1/4/2008 Motion to Amend/Correct
              Consent MOTION to Amend/Correct [158] Judgment, filed by 1ST HOME LIQUIDATING TRUST, ROGER P. KAVANAGH, JR, EVERETTE E. MILLS, III, WILLIAM E. STONE.(Stouck, Jerry)
                LREF
                Legal Document 158 Filed: 12/13/2007, Entered: 12/13/2007
                JUDGMENT entered, pursuant to Rule 58, that the plaintiffs recover of and from the United States a total amount of $26,025.250.00, to be distributed as detailed in document. (lld)
                  LREF
                  Legal Document 157 Filed: 12/12/2007, Entered: 12/12/2007 Court Filing
                  granting [156] Motion for Clarification; UNPUBLISHED OPINION and ORDER. The Clerk is directed to enter judgment. Signed by Judge Loren A. Smith. (lp1)
                    LREF
                    Legal Document 156 Filed: 12/12/2007, Entered: 12/12/2007, Terminated: 12/12/2007 Motion for Clarification
                    Joint MOTION for Clarification and correction of order dated December 7, 2007, filed by USA.Response due by 12/31/2007.(Levitt, David)
                      LREF
                      Legal Document 155 Filed: 12/7/2007, Entered: 12/7/2007 Court Filing
                      UNPUBLISHED. Parties in Count III were inadvertently left off and are the individuals that are double spaced. The Clerk is directed to enter judgment. Signed by Judge Loren A. Smith. (lp1)
                        LREF
                        Legal Document 154 Filed: 12/7/2007, Entered: 12/7/2007 Court Filing
                        UNPUBLISHED ORDER. The Clerk is directed to enter judgment. Signed by Judge Loren A. Smith. (lp1)
                          LREF
                          Legal Document 153 Filed: 11/30/2007, Entered: 11/30/2007 Amended Complaint
                          SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT against. (Stouck, Jerry)
                            LREF
                            Legal Document 152 Filed: 11/30/2007, Entered: 11/30/2007
                            NOTICE, filed by all plaintiffs re [151] Order,, Notice of Filing of Second Amended Complaint and Renewed Motion for Entry of Partial Judgment Under Rule 54(b) (Stouck, Jerry)
                              LREF
                              Legal Document 151 Filed: 11/15/2007, Entered: 11/15/2007 Court Filing
                              ORDER. Pursuant to the telephone status conference held on November 14, 2007, the Court hereby GRANTS the Plaintiffs Motion to File a Second Amended Complaint. The Second Amended Complaint shall be filed and served within 10 days. The Plaintiffs shall also file a wordperfect copy by email to Laura_Palguta@ao.uscourts.gov. After the Second Amended Complaint has been filed, the Court shall rule on Plaintiffs and Defendants Motions for Entry of Judgment. Signed by Judge Loren A. Smith. (lp1)
                                LREF
                                Legal Document 150 Filed: 11/7/2007, Entered: 11/7/2007 Court Filing
                                STATUS CONFERENCE ORDER: Status Conference set for 11/14/2007 11:30 am by telephone before Sr. Judge Loren A. Smith. Signed by Judge Loren A. Smith. (lp1)
                                  LREF
                                  Legal Document 149 Filed: 10/3/2007, Entered: 10/3/2007 Court Filing
                                  ORDER denying [142] Motion for Reconsideration. The Court will contact the parties to set up a telephone status conference to discuss the remaining issues in this litigation. Signed by Judge Loren A. Smith. (lp1)
                                    LREF
                                    Legal Document 148 Filed: 9/19/2007, Entered: 9/19/2007
                                    REPLY to Response to Motion re [144] MOTION for Entry of Judgment under Rule 54(b) , Notice of Filing of Amended Complaint and Request for Prompt Status Conference MOTION for Entry of Judgment under Rule 54(b) , Notice of Filing of Amended Complaint and Request for Prompt Status Conference, filed by 1ST HOME LIQUIDATING TRUST, ROGER P. KAVANAGH, JR, EVERETTE E. MILLS, III, WILLIAM E. STONE. (Stouck, Jerry)
                                      LREF
                                      Legal Document 147 Filed: 9/12/2007, Entered: 9/12/2007 Court Filing
                                      ORDER granting [146] Motion for Extension of Time to File Reply re Government's response to [144]MOTION for Entry of Judgment under Rule 54(b) Reply due by 9/19/2007. Signed by Judge Loren A. Smith. (lp1)
                                        LREF
                                        Legal Document 146 Filed: 9/11/2007, Entered: 9/11/2007, Terminated: 9/12/2007 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Repl
                                        Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response or Reply as to [145] Response to Plaintiff's Motion for Entry of Partial Judgment Under Rule 54(b), filed by 1ST HOME LIQUIDATING TRUST, ROGER P. KAVANAGH, JR, EVERETTE E. MILLS, III, WILLIAM E. STONE.Response due by 9/28/2007.(Stouck, Jerry)
                                          LREF
                                          Legal Document 145 Filed: 8/29/2007, Entered: 8/29/2007
                                          RESPONSE to [143] Amended Complaint and motion for entry of partial judgment under rule 54(b), filed by USA. (Levitt, David)
                                            LREF
                                            Legal Document 144 Filed: 8/16/2007, Entered: 8/16/2007, Terminated: 12/7/2007 ~Motion for Entry of Judgment under Rule 54(b)
                                            MOTION for Entry of Judgment under Rule 54(b) , Notice of Filing of Amended Complaint and Request for Prompt Status Conference, filed by 1ST HOME LIQUIDATING TRUST, ROGER P. KAVANAGH, JR, EVERETTE E. MILLS, III, WILLIAM E. STONE.Response due by 9/17/2007.(Stouck, Jerry)
                                              LREF
                                              Legal Document 143 Filed: 8/16/2007, Entered: 8/16/2007
                                              AMENDED COMPLAINT, filed by all plaintiffs.. (Stouck, Jerry)
                                                LREF
                                                Legal Document 142 Filed: 8/1/2007, Entered: 8/1/2007, Terminated: 10/3/2007 Motion for Reconsideration
                                                MOTION for Reconsideration re [137] Order on Motion for Summary Judgment, Order on Cross Motion [Dispositive], Order on Motion to Dismiss - Rule 12(b)(6), Order on Motion for Leave to File, Published Opinion, filed by USA.Response due by 8/20/2007.(Levitt, David)
                                                  LREF
                                                  Legal Document 141 Filed: 7/20/2007, Entered: 7/20/2007 Court Filing
                                                  ORDER granting [140] Motion for Extension of Time. Plaintiffs' Amended Complaint shall be filed and served on or before August 16, 2007. Signed by Judge Loren A. Smith. (lp1)
                                                    LREF
                                                    Legal Document 140 Filed: 7/20/2007, Entered: 7/20/2007, Terminated: 7/20/2007 Motion for Extension of Time
                                                    Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time until August 16, 2007 to to File Amended Complaint, filed by 1ST HOME LIQUIDATING TRUST, ROGER P. KAVANAGH, JR, EVERETTE E. MILLS, III, WILLIAM E. STONE.Response due by 8/6/2007.(Stouck, Jerry)
                                                      LREF
                                                      Legal Document 139 Filed: 6/4/2007, Entered: 6/4/2007 Court Filing
                                                      ORDER granting [138] Motion for Extension of Time to Amend Complaint. Amended Pleadings due by 7/26/2007. Signed by Judge Loren A. Smith. (lp1)
                                                        LREF
                                                        Legal Document 138 Filed: 6/1/2007, Entered: 6/1/2007, Terminated: 6/4/2007 Motion for Extension of Time to Amend
                                                        Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Amend Complaint, filed by 1ST HOME LIQUIDATING TRUST, ROGER P. KAVANAGH, JR, EVERETTE E. MILLS, III, WILLIAM E. STONE.Response due by 6/18/2007.(Stouck, Jerry)
                                                          LREF
                                                          Legal Document 137 Filed: 5/11/2007, Entered: 5/11/2007 Court Filing
                                                          PUBLISHED Opinion and Order granting [113] Motion for Summary Judgment; denying [117] Cross Motion; denying [117] Motion to Dismiss - Rule 12(b)(6); granting [135] Motion for Leave to Documents. Signed by Judge Loren A. Smith. (lp1)
                                                            LREF
                                                            Legal Document 136 Filed: 12/18/2006, Entered: 12/18/2006
                                                            RESPONSE to [135] Motion for Leave to File,, filed by 1ST HOME LIQUIDATING TRUST. (Stouck, Jerry)
                                                              LREF
                                                              Legal Document 135 Filed: 12/15/2006, Entered: 12/15/2006, Terminated: 5/11/2007 Motion for Leave to File
                                                              MOTION for Leave to File supplemental authority in support of government's cross-motion for summary judgment and to issue a decision on the pending cross-motions or, in the alternative, transfer the case for decision by another judge, filed by USA.Response due by 1/1/2007.(Levitt, David)
                                                                LREF
                                                                Legal Document 134 Filed: 8/29/2006, Entered: 8/29/2006
                                                                NOTICE of Designation of Electronic Case. (hw1, )
                                                                  LREF
                                                                  Blank 133 Filed: 8/29/2006, Entered: 8/29/2006 Court Filing
                                                                  ORDER directing the Clerk to designate this case as an electronic (ECF) case. All future filings will be in electronic form. Signed by Judge Loren A. Smith. (hw1, )
                                                                    LREF
                                                                    Blank 132 Filed: 5/25/2005, Entered: 5/31/2005 Response
                                                                    RESPONSE to [131] Notice of Additional Authority filed by USA. [FILED BY LEAVE OF THE JUDGE] Service: 5/19/2005.(mb2, )
                                                                      LREF
                                                                      Blank 131 Filed: 5/11/2005, Entered: 5/13/2005 Notice of Additional Authority
                                                                      NOTICE of Additional Authority by 1ST HOME LIQUIDATING TRUST. [FILED BY LEAVE OF THE JUDGE] Service: 5/4/2005.(mb2, ) Modified on 5/13/2005 (mb2, ).
                                                                        LREF
                                                                        Blank 130 Filed: 3/22/2004, Entered: 3/24/2004 Response
                                                                        RESPONSE to the Dft's Citation of Supplemental Authority in Support of the Dft's Cross Motion for Summary Judgment on Liability and "Money Back" Restitution, filed by 1ST HOME LIQUIDATING TRUST, ROGER P. KAVANAGH JR., EVERETTE E. MILLS III, WILLIAM E. STONE. [FILED BY LEAVE OF THE JUDGE] Service: 3/11/2004.(jcp, )
                                                                          LREF
                                                                          Blank 129 Filed: 3/2/2004, Entered: 3/4/2004 Order on Motion For Leave to File.Court Filing
                                                                          ORDER: The Court hereby GRANTS the [128] Dft's Motion for Leave to Cite Supplemental Authority filed with the Court on 2/23/2004. Signed by Judge Loren A. Smith. (jcp, )
                                                                            LREF
                                                                            Blank 128 Filed: 2/23/2004, Entered: 2/29/2004 Terminated:
                                                                            MOTION for Leave to Cite Supplemental Authority in Support of the Government's Cross Motion for Summary Judgment on Liability and "Money Back" Restitution, by USA.Service: 2/23/2004. Response due by 3/11/2004. (jcp, )
                                                                              LREF
                                                                              Blank 127 Filed: 11/25/2003, Entered: 12/2/2003 Order on Motion For Leave to File.Court Filing
                                                                              ORDER granting [125] Pltfs' Motion for Leave to File Documents Referenced by Pltfs' Counsel During the Oral Argument on 10/16/2003. Signed by Judge Loren A. Smith. (jcp, )
                                                                                LREF
                                                                                Blank 126 Filed: 11/13/2003, Entered: 11/13/2003 Court Filing
                                                                                TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on October 16, 2003 before Senior Judge Loren A. Smith. (hw1, )
                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                  Blank 125 Filed: 10/21/2003, Entered: 10/23/2003, Terminated: 11/25/2003 Terminated:
                                                                                  MOTION for Leave to File documents referenced during the 10/16/03 oral argument by 1ST HOME LIQUIDATING TRUST, ROGER P. KAVANAGH JR., EVERETTE E. MILLS III, WILLIAM E. STONE.Service: 10/21/03. Response due by 11/7/2003 (jat, )
                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                    Blank -- Filed: 10/20/2003, Entered: 10/20/2003
                                                                                    Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Loren A. Smith : Oral Argument held on 10/16/2003. Oral Argument was completed on 10/16, and additional day of argument (originally scheduled for 10/17) was not held. (lmm)
                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                      Blank -- Filed: 10/16/2003, Entered: 10/16/2003
                                                                                      Set/Reset Transcript Deadlines: Transcript due by 11/3/2003. (vp1, )
                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                        Blank 124 Filed: 10/1/2003, Entered: 10/7/2003 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                        REPLY to Response to Motion re [117] CROSS MOTION to [113] Motion for Summary Judgment, filed by 1ST HOME LIQUIDATING TRUST, ROGER P. KAVANAGH, EVERETTE E. MILLS, WILLIAM E. STONE MOTION to Dismiss pursuant to Rule 12(b)(6) MOTION to Dismiss pursuant to Rule 12(b)(6) filed by USA. Service by hand: 10/1/03.(dw1, )
                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                          Blank 123 Filed: 9/15/2003, Entered: 9/22/2003 Response to Proposed Findings of Uncontroverted Fa
                                                                                          RESPONSE to [118] Dft's PROPOSED FINDINGS of Uncontroverted Fact filed by 1ST HOME LIQUIDATING TRUST, ROGER P. KAVANAGH JR., EVERETTE E. MILLS III, WILLIAM E. STONE. Service: 9/15/03.(jcp, )
                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                            Blank 122 Filed: 9/15/2003, Entered: 9/22/2003 Response to Motion
                                                                                            OPPOSITION to [117] Dft's CROSS MOTION and REPLY in Support of [113] Pltfs' Motion for Summary Judgment on Liability and Money-Back Restitution for Breach of Contract, and MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Upon Which Relief Can Be Granted filed by 1ST HOME LIQUIDATING TRUST, ROGER P. KAVANAGH JR., EVERETTE E. MILLS III, WILLIAM E. STONE. Reply due by 10/2/2003. Service: 9/15/03.(jcp, )
                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                              Blank 121 Filed: 9/3/2003, Entered: 9/8/2003 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File RespCourt Filing
                                                                                              ORDER granting [120] Pltf's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Reply and Opposition to [117] Dft's CROSS MOTION to [113] Pltf's Motion for Summary Judgment. Reply due by 10/1/2003. Response due by 9/15/2003 Signed by Judge Loren A. Smith. (jcp, )
                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                Blank 120 Filed: 8/29/2003, Entered: 9/4/2003, Terminated: 9/3/2003 Terminated:
                                                                                                UNOPPOSED MOTION for Extension of Time to File Reply and Opposition to [117] Dft's CROSS MOTION to [113] Pltfs' Motion for Summary Judgment, until 9/15/03, by 1ST HOME LIQUIDATING TRUST, ROGER P. KAVANAGH JR.,, EVERETTE E. MILLS III, WILLIAM E. STONE.Service: 8/29/03. Response due by 9/15/2003. (jcp, )
                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                  Blank 119 Filed: 8/18/2003, Entered: 8/20/2003 Response to Proposed Findings of Uncontroverted Fa
                                                                                                  RESPONSE to [114] Pltfs' PROPOSED FINDINGS of Uncontroverted Fact by USA. Service: 8/18/03 by hand.(jcp, )
                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                    Blank 118 Filed: 8/18/2003, Entered: 8/20/2003 Proposed Findings of Uncontroverted Fact
                                                                                                    PROPOSED FINDINGS of Uncontroverted Fact by USA. Service: 8/18/03 by hand.(jcp, )
                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                      Blank 117 Filed: 8/18/2003, Entered: 8/20/2003 Terminated:
                                                                                                      OPPOSITION and CROSS MOTION to [113] Pltfs' Motion for Summary Judgment on Liability and Money Back Restitution, and MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Rule 12(b)(6) for Failure to State A Claim Upon Which Relief Can Be Granted, Together with Large Separately Bound Appendix Volume by USA.Service: 8/18/03 by hand. Response due by 9/15/2003. Response due by 9/15/2003. (jcp, )
                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                        Blank -- Filed: 8/18/2003, Entered: 8/20/2003 Set/Reset Deadlines:
                                                                                                        Set/Reset Deadlines: Reply due by 9/15/2003. (jcp, )
                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                          Blank 116 Filed: 7/31/2003, Entered: 8/1/2003 Order Setting Oral Argument/Hearing on MotionCourt Filing
                                                                                                          ORDER Setting Hearing on Motion re: [113] MOTION for Summary Judgment:The Court hereby RESCHEDULES the Oral Argument on the parties' Cross-Motions for Summary Judgment on Liability and Damages from Thursday, 10/9/03, to Thursday, 10/16/2003 through Friday, 10/17/2003 10:00 AM in Courtroom 9 before Senior Judge Loren A. Smith. Signed by Judge Loren A. Smith. (jcp, )
                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                            Blank 115 Filed: 7/30/2003, Entered: 7/31/2003 Order on Motion For Leave to File.Court Filing
                                                                                                            ORDER granting [112] Pltfs' Motion for Leave to Substitute Original for Telecopied Declaration Filed by Leave on July 17, 2003. Signed by Judge Loren A. Smith. (jcp, )
                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                              Blank 114 Filed: 7/17/2003, Entered: 7/18/2003 Proposed Findings of Uncontroverted FactCourt Filing
                                                                                                              PROPOSED FINDINGS of Uncontroverted Fact by 1ST HOME LIQUIDATING TRUST, ROGER P. KAVANAGH JR.,, EVERETTE E. MILLS III, WILLIAM E. STONE, Filed by Leave of the Judge. Service: 7/14/03 by hand.(jcp, )
                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                Blank 113 Filed: 7/17/2003, Entered: 7/18/2003, Terminated: 5/11/2007 Terminated: Court Filing
                                                                                                                MOTION for Summary Judgment on Liability and Money-Back Restitution for Breach of Contract, Together with Two (2) Separately Bound Exhibit Appendix Volumes by 1ST HOME LIQUIDATING TRUST, ROGER P. KAVANAGH JR., EVERETTE E. MILLS III, WILLIAM E. STONE, Filed by Leave of the Judge.Service: 7/14/03 by hand. Response due by 8/18/2003. (jcp, )
                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                  Blank 112 Filed: 7/17/2003, Entered: 7/18/2003, Terminated: 7/30/2003 Terminated: Court Filing
                                                                                                                  MOTION for Leave to Substitute Original for Telecopied Declaration by 1ST HOME LIQUIDATING TRUST, ROGER P. KAVANAGH JR.,, EVERETTE E. MILLS III, WILLIAM E. STONE, Filed by Leave of the Judge.Service: 7/15/03 by hand. Response due by 8/1/2003. (jcp, )
                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                    Blank 111 Filed: 6/6/2003, Entered: 6/17/2003 Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                    SCHEDULING ORDER:Plaintiff's motion for summary judgment due by 7/14/2003; Defendant's opposition and cross-motion due by 8/18/2003; Plaintiffs' reply and opposition due by 9/8/2003; Defendant's reply due by 9/24/2003; oral argument set for 10/9/2003 before Senior Judge Loren A. Smith. Signed by Judge Loren A. Smith. (jat, )
                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                      Blank -- Filed: 6/6/2003, Entered: 6/17/2003 Set Deadlines/Hearings:
                                                                                                                      Set Deadlines/Hearings: Oral Argument set for 10/9/2003 before Senior Judge Loren A. Smith. (jat, )
                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                        Blank -- Filed: 6/6/2003, Entered: 6/6/2003
                                                                                                                        Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Loren A. Smith: Telephone Status Conference held on June 5, 2003. (tro)
                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                          Blank 110 Filed: 5/30/2003, Entered: 6/6/2003 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                          SURREPLY BRIEF ON LIABILITY by 1ST HOME LIQUIDATING TRUST, ROGER P. KAVANAGH JR., EVERETTE E. MILLS III and WILLIAM E. STONE. Service: 5/30/03.(dw1, )
                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                            Blank 109 Filed: 5/30/2003, Entered: 6/6/2003 Surreply
                                                                                                                            SUR-REPLY re [75] Motion for Summary Judgment for restitutionary recovery for breach of contract filed by UNITED STATES. Service: 5/30/03.(dw1, )
                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                              Blank 108 Filed: 5/30/2003, Entered: 6/6/2003 Order on Motion for Summary JudgmentCourt Filing
                                                                                                                              ORDER denying [26] Motion for Summary Judgment, denying [48] Cross Motion for Summary Judgment, denying [49] Motion to Dismiss, denying [50] Motion to Dismiss, denying [51] Motion to Dismiss, denying [75] Motion for Summary Judgment, denying [76] Motion to Strike as untimely defendant's defense of prior material breach and statement of genuine issues, denying [87] Cross Motion for Summary Judgment, denying [100] Motion to Strike statement of genuine issues, granting [105] Motion for Leave to File notice of recent decisions. Plaintiff's Motion for leave to file Surreply is granted, Defendant's Motion for leave to file a Surreply to Plaintiff's reply in support of their Motion for Summary Judgment, etc., is granted. Signed by Judge Loren A. Smith. (dw1, )
                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                Blank -- Filed: 5/30/2003, Entered: 6/6/2003 Set/Reset Deadlines:
                                                                                                                                Set/Reset Deadlines: Oral Argument set for 10/1/2003. Plaintiff's Second Surreply due by 6/20/2003. Responses due by 9/8/2003. Dispositive Motion(s) due by 8/5/2003. Defendant's response to the two surreplies due by 7/11/2003. Replies due by 9/19/2003. Defendant's Response to plaintiff's motion for leave to file notice of recent decisions due by 6/20/2003. (dw1, )
                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                  Blank 107 Filed: 5/29/2003, Entered: 6/5/2003 Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                  SCHEDULING ORDER: A Telephonic Status Conference set for 6/5/2003 04:00 PM before Senior Judge Loren A. Smith. Signed by Judge Loren A. Smith. (vro, )
                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                    Blank 106 Filed: 3/20/2002, Entered: 3/21/2002 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Attorney Appearance for USA by David Alan Levitt. Service: 3/20/02. (FE)
                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                      Blank 105 Filed: 1/9/2001, Entered: 1/9/2001, Terminated: 5/30/2003 Motion for Leave to File
                                                                                                                                      MOTION by 1ST HOME LIQUIDATING, ROGER P. KAVANAGH JR., EVERETTE E. MILLS III, WILLIAM E. STONE (Service : 1/9/01 ) for Leave to file notice of Recent Decisions Response due: 1/26/01. (FE)
                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                        Blank 104 Filed: 10/17/2000, Entered: 10/19/2000 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                        REPLY by USA to response to [100-1] motion to Strike [95-1] statement by WILLIAM E. STONE, EVERETTE E. MILLS III, ROGER P. KAVANAGH JR., 1ST HOME LIQUIDATING. Service: 10/17/00 (JT)
                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                          Blank 103 Filed: 10/6/2000, Entered: 10/11/2000 Response
                                                                                                                                          REPLY by 1ST HOME LIQUIDATING, ROGER P. KAVANAGH JR., EVERETTE E. MILLS III and WILLIAM E. STONE to the Court's 9/20/00 order re: "FIRST 30" CASES. Service: 10/06/00. (see order in 90-8C) (FE)
                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                            Blank 102 Filed: 9/29/2000, Entered: 10/4/2000 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                            RESPONSE by 1ST HOME LIQUIDATING, ROGER P. KAVANAGH JR., EVERETTE E. MILLS III, WILLIAM E. STONE (Service: 9/29/00 ) to [100-1] motion to Strike [95-1] statement by WILLIAM E. STONE, EVERETTE E. MILLS III, ROGER P. KAVANAGH JR., 1ST HOME LIQUIDATING. Reply due: 10/16/00 (JT)
                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                              Blank 101 Filed: 9/25/2000, Entered: 9/28/2000 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                              MOTION by 1ST HOME LIQUIDATING, ROGER P. KAVANAGH JR., EVERETTE E. MILLS III, WILLIAM E. STONE (Service : 9/25/00 ) to Extend Time to respond to Defendant's motion to strike [until September 29, 2000]. Response due: 10/12/00 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                Blank 100 Filed: 9/8/2000, Entered: 9/11/2000 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                MOTION by USA (Service : 9/8/00 ) to Strike [95-1] statement by WILLIAM E. STONE, EVERETTE E. MILLS III, ROGER P. KAVANAGH JR., 1ST HOME LIQUIDATING. Response due: 9/25/00 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Blank 99 Filed: 9/8/2000, Entered: 9/11/2000 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                  MOTION by USA (Service : 9/8/00 ) for Leave to File sur-reply to Plaintiffs' reply to response to motion for summary judgment. Response due: 9/25/00 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Blank 98 Filed: 9/8/2000, Entered: 9/11/2000 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                    REPLY by USA to response to [87-1] cross motion. Service: 9/8/00 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Blank -- Filed: 9/8/2000, Entered: 9/11/2000 Set/Reset Deadlines:
                                                                                                                                                      Deadline updated; Plaintiffs' Response to [100-1] motion to Strike [95-1] statement by WILLIAM E. STONE, EVERETTE E. MILLS ROGER P. KAVANAGH JR., 1ST HOME LIQUIDATING reset to 9/25/00. (JT)
                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Blank 97 Filed: 7/24/2000, Entered: 7/27/2000 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                        MOTION by USA (Service : 7/24/00 ) to Extend Time to reply to response to cross-motion [until September 8, 2000]. Response due: 8/10/00 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Blank 96 Filed: 7/6/2000, Entered: 7/14/2000 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                          RESPONSE by 1ST HOME LIQUIDATING, ROGER P. KAVANAGH JR., EVERETTE E. MILLS III, WILLIAM E. STONE (Service: 7/6/00 ) to [87-1] cross motion Reply due: 7/24/00 (HW)
                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Blank 95 Filed: 7/6/2000, Entered: 7/10/2000 Statement of Genuine Issues
                                                                                                                                                            STATEMENT OF GENUINE ISSUES by 1ST HOME LIQUIDATING, ROGER P. KAVANAGH JR., EVERETTE E. MILLS III, WILLIAM E. STONE. Service: 7/6/00. (HW)
                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Blank 94 Filed: 6/23/2000, Entered: 6/27/2000 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                              MOTION by 1ST HOME LIQUIDATING, ROGER P. KAVANAGH JR., EVERETTE E. MILLS III, WILLIAM E. STONE (Service: 6/23/00) to Extend Time to file combined reply in support of motion for summary judgment until 7/6/00. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Blank 93 Filed: 6/9/2000, Entered: 6/12/2000 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                MOTION by 1ST HOME LIQUIDATING, ROGER P. KAVANAGH JR., EVERETTE E. MILLS III, WILLIAM E. STONE (Service : 6/9/00 ) to Extend Time to reply to response to motion for summary judgment and respond to cross-motion [until June 26, 2000]. Response due: 6/26/00 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 92 Filed: 6/1/2000, Entered: 6/2/2000 Affidavit
                                                                                                                                                                  DECLARATION OF WALTER K. RUSH, III, CPA by USA. Service 5/17/00 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 91 Filed: 6/1/2000, Entered: 6/2/2000 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER granting [88-1] motion for Leave to file the declaration of Walter K. Rush, III. ( signed by Chief Judge Loren A. Smith ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 90 Filed: 5/19/2000, Entered: 5/22/2000 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER granting [78-1] motion to Extend Time to respond to motion to strike, motion to suspend expert discovery, and motion for leave to file a surreply., granting [83-1] motion to Extend Time to respond to Plaintiff's motion for summary judgment, granting [84-1] motion to Extend Time to respond to motion for summmary judgment. ( signed by Chief Judge Loren A. Smith ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 89 Filed: 5/17/2000, Entered: 5/18/2000 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER granting [73-1] motion to suspend expert discovery. If Plaintiffs' motions are not resolved in their favor in their entirety, they must depose the government's experts within 60 days of a decision on the motions. ( signed by Chief Judge Loren A. Smith ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 88 Filed: 5/12/2000, Entered: 5/16/2000, Terminated: 6/1/2000 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION, pursuant to Rule 56(g), by USA (Service : 5/12/00 ) for Leave to file the declaration of Walter K. Rush, III (by May 26, 2000). Response due: 5/30/00 (DS)
                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 87 Filed: 5/12/2000, Entered: 5/16/2000 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                            CROSS MOTION, together with a separate volume of appendix, filed by USA ( Service: 5/12/00 ) and RESPONSE to [75-1] motion for Summary Judgment. Response due: 6/12/00 (DS)
                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 86 Filed: 5/12/2000, Entered: 5/16/2000 Proposed Findings of Uncontroverted Fact
                                                                                                                                                                              (Statement of genuine issues and) PROPOSED FINDINGS of Uncontroverted Fact filed by USA. Service: 5/12/00 (DS)
                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 86 Filed: 5/12/2000, Entered: 5/16/2000 Statement of Genuine Issues
                                                                                                                                                                                STATEMENT OF GENUINE ISSUES (and Proposed findings of uncontroverted fact) filed by USA. Service: 5/12/00 (DS)
                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank -- Filed: 5/12/2000, Entered: 5/16/2000 Set/Reset Deadlines:
                                                                                                                                                                                  Deadline updated; Response to [87-1] cross motion reset to 6/12/00 (DS)
                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 85 Filed: 5/10/2000, Entered: 5/12/2000 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                    REPLY by 1ST HOME LIQUIDATING to response to [72-1] motion for Leave to File a surreply in support of opposition to Defendant's cross-motion for summary judgment, [76-1] motion to strike as untimely Defendant's defense of prior material breach and statement of genuine issues. Service: 5/10/00 (DS)
                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 84 Filed: 5/8/2000, Entered: 5/10/2000 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION by USA (Service : 5/8/00 ) to Extend Time to respond to motion for summmary judgment (to May 12, 2000). (DS)
                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 83 Filed: 4/28/2000, Entered: 5/2/2000 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION by USA (Service : 4/28/00 ) to Extend Time to respond to Plaintiff's motion for summary judgment [until May 8, 2000]. Response due: 5/15/00 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 82 Filed: 4/28/2000, Entered: 5/1/2000 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                          RESPONSE by USA (Service: 4/28/00 ) to [76-1] motion to strike as untimely Defendant's defense of prior material breach and statement of genuine issues, [72-1] motion for Leave to File a surreply in support of opposition to Defendant's cross-motion for summary judgment. Reply due: 5/12/00 (DS)
                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 81 Filed: 4/27/2000, Entered: 4/28/2000 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                            REPLY by 1ST HOME LIQUIDATING, ROGER P. KAVANAGH JR., EVERETTE E. MILLS III and WILLIAM E. STONE to response to [73-1] motion to suspend expert discovery, [73-2] motion for expedited consideration. Service: 4/27/00. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 80 Filed: 4/20/2000, Entered: 4/21/2000 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                              RESPONSE by USA (Service: 4/20/00) to [73-1] motion to suspend expert discovery and [73-2] motion for expedited consideration. Reply due: 5/4/00. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 79 Filed: 4/19/2000, Entered: 4/20/2000 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                RESPONSE by 1ST HOME LIQUIDATING, ROGER P. KAVANAGH JR., EVERETTE E. MILLS III, WILLIAM E. STONE (Service: 4/19/00 ) to [78-1] motion to Extend Time to respond to motion to strike, motion to suspend expert discovery, and motion for leave to file a surreply. Reply due: 5/1/00 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 78 Filed: 4/18/2000, Entered: 4/19/2000, Terminated: 5/19/2000 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION by USA (Service : 4/17/00 ) to Extend Time to respond to motion to strike, motion to suspend expert discovery, and motion for leave to file a surreply. (to April 28, 2000 for response to motion to strike and motion for leave; to April 21, 2000 for motion to suspend) (DS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 77 Filed: 4/7/2000, Entered: 4/10/2000 Response
                                                                                                                                                                                                    RESPONSE by 1ST HOME LIQUIDATING, ROGER P. KAVANAGH JR., EVERETTE E. MILLS III, WILLIAM E. STONE to the Court's 3/27/00 Order. Service: 4/7/00 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 76 Filed: 4/3/2000, Entered: 4/4/2000 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION by 1ST HOME LIQUIDATING, ROGER P. KAVANAGH JR., EVERETTE E. MILLS III, WILLIAM E. STONE (Service : 4/3/00 (by hand)) to strike as untimely Defendant's defense of prior material breach and statement of genuine issues. Response due: 4/17/00 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 75 Filed: 4/3/2000, Entered: 4/4/2000 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION by 1ST HOME LIQUIDATING, ROGER P. KAVANAGH JR., EVERETTE E. MILLS III, WILLIAM E. STONE (Service : 4/3/00 (by hand)) for Summary Judgment for restitutionary recovery for breach of contract. (1 Separate Volume of Appendix) Response due: 5/1/00 (JT) Modified on 04/04/2000
                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 74 Filed: 4/3/2000, Entered: 4/4/2000 Proposed Findings of Uncontroverted Fact
                                                                                                                                                                                                          PROPOSED FINDINGS of Uncontroverted Fact by 1ST HOME LIQUIDATING, ROGER P. KAVANAGH JR., EVERETTE E. MILLS III, WILLIAM E. STONE. Service: 4/3/00 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 73 Filed: 4/3/2000, Entered: 4/4/2000, Terminated: 5/17/2000 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION by 1ST HOME LIQUIDATING, ROGER P. KAVANAGH JR., EVERETTE E. MILLS III, WILLIAM E. STONE (Service : 4/3/00 ) to suspend expert discovery and for expedited consideration. Response due: 4/17/00 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 72 Filed: 4/3/2000, Entered: 4/4/2000 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION by 1ST HOME LIQUIDATING, ROGER P. KAVANAGH JR., EVERETTE E. MILLS III, WILLIAM E. STONE (Service : 4/3/00 ) for Leave to File a surreply in support of opposition to Defendant's cross-motion for summary judgment. Response due: 4/17/00 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 71 Filed: 3/8/2000, Entered: 3/10/2000 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER denying [62-1] motion to Strike the materials Plaintiffs submitted on 11/10/99. ( signed by Chief Judge Loren A. Smith ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 70 Filed: 1/28/2000, Entered: 2/1/2000 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  REPLY by USA to response to [62-1] motion to Strike the materials Plaintiffs submitted on 11/10/99. Service: 1/21/00. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 69 Filed: 1/28/2000, Entered: 2/1/2000 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER granting [68-1] motion for Leave to to file reply to response to motion to strike out of time (signed by Chief Judge Loren A. Smith). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 68 Filed: 1/21/2000, Entered: 1/24/2000, Terminated: 1/28/2000 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION by USA (Service : 1/21/00 ) for Leave to to file reply to response to motion to strike out of time. Response due: 2/7/00 (DS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 67 Filed: 1/18/2000, Entered: 1/19/2000 Response
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        RESPONSE by 1ST HOME LIQUIDATING, ROGER P. KAVANAGH JR., EVERETTE E. MILLS III, WILLIAM E. STONE to [57-1] notice by USA. Service: 1/18/00 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 66 Filed: 1/3/2000, Entered: 1/4/2000 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          RESPONSE by 1ST HOME LIQUIDATING, ROGER P. KAVANAGH JR., EVERETTE E. MILLS III, WILLIAM E. STONE (Service: 1/3/00 ) to [62-1] motion to Strike the materials Plaintiffs submitted on 11/10/99. Reply due: 1/18/00 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 65 Filed: 12/20/1999, Entered: 12/22/1999 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            REPLY by USA to response to [50-1] motion to Dismiss plaintiffs' request for pre-judgment interest. Service: 12/20/99 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 64 Filed: 12/20/1999, Entered: 12/22/1999 Statement of Genuine Issues
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              STATEMENT OF GENUINE ISSUES by USA. Service: 12/20/99 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 63 Filed: 12/20/1999, Entered: 12/22/1999 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                REPLY by USA to response to [51-1] motion to Dismiss Count II, III, IV, VII and VIII of the complaint. Service: 12/20/99 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 62 Filed: 12/20/1999, Entered: 12/22/1999, Terminated: 3/8/2000 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION by USA (Service : 12/20/99 (by hand)) to Strike the materials Plaintiffs submitted on 11/10/99. Response due: 1/3/00 (JT) Modified on 12/22/1999
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 61 Filed: 12/20/1999, Entered: 12/22/1999 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    REPLY by USA to response to [48-1] cross motion. (2 Separate Volumes of Appendix) Service: 12/20/99 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 60 Filed: 12/13/1999, Entered: 12/16/1999 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION by USA (Service : 12/13/99 ) to Extend Time to file reply papers in support of the motions filed on 9/14/99 [until December 20, 1999]. Response due: 12/30/99 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 59 Filed: 12/10/1999, Entered: 12/15/1999 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER granting [58-1] motion to Extend Time to file reply papers in further support of the motions filed until 12/13/99. ( signed by Chief Judge Loren A. Smith ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 58 Filed: 12/3/1999, Entered: 12/7/1999, Terminated: 12/10/1999 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION by USA (Service : 12/3/99 ) to Extend Time to file reply papers in further support of the motions filed on 9/14/99 [until December 13, 1999]. Response due: 12/20/99 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 57 Filed: 11/15/1999, Entered: 11/17/1999 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Initial List of Potential Issues Remaining to be Decided by USA. Service: 11/15/99 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 56 Filed: 11/10/1999, Entered: 11/14/1999 Statement of Genuine Issues
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              STATEMENT OF GENUINE ISSUES and PROPOSED FINDINGS OF UNCONTROVERTED FACT AS TO RELEVANT MATTERS NOT COVERED BY THE DEFENDANT'S PROPOSED FINDINGS by 1ST HOME LIQUIDATING, ROGER P. KAVANAGH JR., EVERETTE E. MILLS III, WILLIAM E. STONE. Service: 11/10/99 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 55 Filed: 11/10/1999, Entered: 11/14/1999 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                RESPONSE by 1ST HOME LIQUIDATING, ROGER P. KAVANAGH JR., EVERETTE E. MILLS III, WILLIAM E. STONE (Service: 11/10/99 (by hand)) to [51-1] motion to Dismiss Count II, III, IV, VII and VIII of the complaint. Reply due: 11/24/99 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 54 Filed: 11/10/1999, Entered: 11/14/1999 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  RESPONSE by 1ST HOME LIQUIDATING, ROGER P. KAVANAGH JR., EVERETTE E. MILLS III, WILLIAM E. STONE (Service: 11/10/99 (by hand)) to [48-1] cross motion. (1 Separate Volume of Appendix) Reply due: 11/24/99 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 53 Filed: 11/3/1999, Entered: 11/5/1999 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION by 1ST HOME LIQUIDATING, ROGER P. KAVANAGH JR., EVERETTE E. MILLS III and WILLIAM E. STONE (Service: 11/3/99) to Extend Time to file reply in support of motion for summary judgment and opposition to cross-motion for summary judgment on Count 1 and opposition to motion to dismiss . (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 52 Filed: 9/17/1999, Entered: 9/22/1999 Proposed Findings of Uncontroverted Fact
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      PROPOSED FINDINGS of Uncontroverted Fact by USA re: (1) cross motion for summary judgment on breach of contract (count 1); (2) opposition to motion for summary judgment on liability for breach of contract; and (3) motion for summary judgment on plaintiffs' takings claim (counts V and VI). Service: 9/14/99. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 51 Filed: 9/17/1999, Entered: 9/22/1999 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION by USA (Service: 9/14/99) to Dismiss Count II, III, IV, VII and VIII of the complaint . Response due: 10/1/99. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 50 Filed: 9/17/1999, Entered: 9/22/1999 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION by USA (Service: 9/14/99) to Dismiss plaintiffs' request for pre-judgment interest . Response due: 10/1/99. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 49 Filed: 9/17/1999, Entered: 9/22/1999 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION by USA (Service: 9/14/99) to Dismiss . Response due: 10/15/99. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 48 Filed: 9/17/1999, Entered: 9/22/1999 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              CROSS MOTION by USA (Service: 9/14/99) and RESPONSE to [26-1] motion for Summary Judgment (Counts I, V and VI) by 1ST HOME LIQUIDATING, filed together with separate appendix. Response: 10/14/99. (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank -- Filed: 9/17/1999, Entered: 9/22/1999 Set/Reset Deadlines:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Deadline updated; Response to [48-1] cross motion reset to 10/14/99 (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 47 Filed: 9/14/1999, Entered: 9/17/1999 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION by USA (Service: 9/14/99) For leave to exceed the page limitation (1) cross-motion for summary judgment on breach of contract (count 1); (2) opposition to motion for summary judgment on liability for breach of contract; and (3) motion for summary judgment on plaintiff's takings claim (counts V and VI) . Response due: 10/1/99. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 45 Filed: 8/25/1999, Entered: 8/27/1999 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Attorney Appearance for USA by Robert Ernest Leidenheimer Jr. Service : 8/25/99 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 44 Filed: 4/6/1999, Entered: 4/12/1999 Remark
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      See Order of 4/6/99 in 90-8 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 43 Filed: 11/18/1998, Entered: 11/24/1998 Stipulation
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Joint Stipulation Regarding Discovery by 1ST HOME LIQUIDATING, ROGER P. KAVANAGH JR., EVERETTE E. MILLS III, WILLIAM E. STONE, USA. (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 42 Filed: 11/18/1998, Entered: 11/24/1998 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER granting [41-1] joint motion for Leave to file Joint Stipulation Regarding Discovery. ( signed by Judge Christine O. C. Miller ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 41 Filed: 11/16/1998, Entered: 11/18/1998, Terminated: 11/18/1998 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            JOINT MOTION by 1ST HOME LIQUIDATING, ROGER P. KAVANAGH JR., EVERETTE E. MILLS III, WILLIAM E. STONE, USA for Leave to file "Joint Stipulation Regarding Discovery" . (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 40 Filed: 10/6/1998, Entered: 10/8/1998 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER granting [36-1] motion to Extend Time to respond to plaintiff's first set of interrogatories and first set of request's for admissions. Reset Defendant's responses to Plaintiff's first set of interrogatories and requests for admissions deadline to 12/14/98. ( signed by Judge Christine O. C. Miller ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 39 Filed: 10/6/1998, Entered: 10/8/1998 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                REPLY by USA to response to [36-1] motion to Extend Time to respond to plaintiff's first set of interrogatories and first set of requests for admissions. Service: 10/6/98 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 38 Filed: 10/1/1998, Entered: 10/5/1998 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION by 1ST HOME LIQUIDATING, ROGER P. KAVANAGH JR., EVERETTE E. MILLS III, WILLIAM E. STONE (Service by hand: 10/1/98 ) to transfer government's motion for an enlargement of time to discovery judge Response due: 10/15/98 (CDC)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 37 Filed: 10/1/1998, Entered: 10/2/1998 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    RESPONSE by 1ST HOME LIQUIDATING, ROGER P. KAVANAGH JR., EVERETTE E. MILLS III, WILLIAM E. STONE (Service by hand: 10/1/98 ) to [36-1] motion to Extend Time to respond to plaintiff's first set of interrogatories and first set of request's for admissions Reply due: 10/13/98 (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 36 Filed: 9/14/1998, Entered: 9/16/1998, Terminated: 10/6/1998 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION by USA (Service : 9/14/98 ) to Extend Time to respond to plaintiff's first set of interrogatories and first set of request's for admissions , (until December 14, 1998). Response due: 10/1/98 (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 35 Filed: 9/4/1998, Entered: 9/9/1998 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Attorney Appearance for USA by Gordon Michael Harvey. Service : 9/4/98. (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 34 Filed: 7/1/1998, Entered: 7/6/1998 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION by USA (Service : 7/1/98 ) to Extend Time to serve privilege log in response to Plaintiff's first set of request for production of documents [to July 8 1998]. Response due: 7/20/98 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 33 Filed: 6/19/1998, Entered: 6/23/1998 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            RESPONSE by 1ST HOME LIQUIDATING, ROGER P. KAVANAGH JR., EVERETTE E. MILLS III, WILLIAM E. STONE (Service: 6/19/98 (by hand)) to [32-1] motion to Extend Time to respond to Plaintiffs' motion for summary judgment. Reply due: 6/30/98 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 32 Filed: 6/3/1998, Entered: 6/5/1998 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION by USA (Service : 6/2/98 ) to Extend Time to respond to Plaintiffs' motion for summary judgment [until Defendant has conducted discovery]. Response due: 6/19/98 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 31 Filed: 6/1/1998, Entered: 6/4/1998 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER granting [29-1] motion to Extend Time to respond to plaintiffs' motion for summary judgment. Defendant's response to Plaintiffs' motion for summary judgment set for 6/2/98. ( signed by Chief Judge Loren A. Smith ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 29 Filed: 5/29/1998, Entered: 5/29/1998, Terminated: 6/1/1998 Motion for Extension of Time
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION by USA (Service : 5/29/98 ) to Extend Time to respond to plaintiffs' motion for summary judgment [until 6/2/98]. (AB)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 30 Filed: 5/28/1998, Entered: 6/1/1998 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER granting [28-1] motion to Extend Time to respond to Plaintiffs' motion for summary judgment Response to [26-1] motion for Summary Judgment reset to 5/29/98. ( Signed by Chief Judge Loren A. Smith. ) Copy to parties. (CDC)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 28 Filed: 5/22/1998, Entered: 5/27/1998, Terminated: 5/28/1998 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION by USA (Service : 5/22/98 ) to Extend Time to respond to Plaintiffs' motion for summary judgment [to May 29, 1998]. Response due: 6/8/98 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 27 Filed: 4/2/1998, Entered: 4/6/1998 Proposed Findings of Uncontroverted Fact
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        PROPOSED FINDINGS of Uncontroverted Fact filed by plaintiffs. Service by hand: 4/2/98 (DS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 26 Filed: 4/2/1998, Entered: 4/6/1998, Terminated: 5/30/2003 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION by plaintiffs (Service by hand: 4/2/98 ) for Summary Judgment , together with a separate volume of appendix. Response due: 6/1/98 (DS) Modified on 04/06/1998
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 25 Filed: 12/23/1997, Entered: 12/30/1997 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Attorney Appearance for USA by Kenneth MacPhee Kulak Service : 12/23/97 (CDC)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 24 Filed: 10/4/1996, Entered: 10/8/1996 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Attorney Appearance for USA by Arthur Gerard Wyatt. Service : 10/4/96 (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 23 Filed: 8/16/1996, Entered: 8/20/1996 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION by USA (Service : 8/16/96 ) for Leave to File attached proposed pretrial order. Response due: 9/3/96 (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 22 Filed: 7/31/1996, Entered: 8/5/1996 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  SEE 90-581 C FOR ORDER granting [21-1] motion for Leave to File copy of motion to adopt special case management procedures (by Chief Judge Loren A. Smith). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 21 Filed: 7/25/1996, Entered: 7/29/1996, Terminated: 7/31/1996 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION by USA (Service: 7/25/96) for Leave to File copy of motion to adopt special case management procedures . Response due: 8/12/96 (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 20 Filed: 6/21/1996, Entered: 6/28/1996 Notice of Change of Address
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of change of address by Agnes Marie Brown (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 19 Filed: 5/8/1996, Entered: 5/13/1996 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION by 1ST HOME LIQUIDATING, ROGER P. KAVANAGH JR., EVERETTE E. MILLS III, WILLIAM E. STONE (Service : 5/8/96 ) for Leave to File response to the defendant's motion for leave to file motion to adopt specialized case management procedure. Response due: 5/28/96 (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 18 Filed: 4/29/1996, Entered: 5/2/1996 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION by USA (Service : 4/26/96 ) for Leave to File a copy of the motion to adopt special case management procedures . Response due: 5/13/96 (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 17 Filed: 4/17/1996, Entered: 4/22/1996 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER granting [14-1] motion for Leave to File motion for order compelling defendant to respond to discovery requests, etc. (signed by Chief Judge Loren A. Smith). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 16 Filed: 4/11/1996, Entered: 4/18/1996 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              SEE 90-581C for ORDER granting [15-1] motion for Leave to File a notice with an attached declaration (signed by Chief Judge Loren A. Smith). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 15 Filed: 3/21/1996, Entered: 3/27/1996, Terminated: 4/11/1996 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION by USA (Service : 6/20/94) for Leave to File a notice with an attached declaration Response due: 4/8/96 (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 14 Filed: 3/4/1996, Entered: 3/8/1996, Terminated: 4/17/1996 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION by 1ST HOME LIQUIDATING (Service: 3/4/96) for Leave to File motion for order compelling defendant to respond to discovery requests, etc. . Response due: 3/21/96 (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 13 Filed: 12/8/1995, Entered: 12/12/1995 Status ReportCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    STATUS REPORT by USA [by leave of the Judge]. Service: 11/24/95. (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 12 Filed: 12/8/1995, Entered: 12/12/1995 ResponseCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      REPLY by USA to [9-1] response by WILLIAM E. STONE, EVERETTE E. MILLS III, ROGER P. KAVANAGH JR. and 1ST HOME LIQUIDATING [by leave of the Judge]. Service: 11/9/95. (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 11 Filed: 11/14/1995, Entered: 11/27/1995 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        SEE ORDER in 90-581C re stay & filing of papers under stay . (signed by Chief Judge Loren A. Smith) Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 10 Filed: 11/14/1995, Entered: 11/21/1995 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION by USA (Service : 11/14/95) to Extend Time to file status report until 11/22/95. Response due: 12/1/95 (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 9 Filed: 11/2/1995, Entered: 11/7/1995 Response
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            RESPONSE by 1ST HOME LIQUIDATING, ROGER P. KAVANAGH JR., EVERETTE E. MILLS III, WILLIAM E. STONE to Order of 10/11/95, objecting to any further stay of proceedings beyond 12/1/95. Service: 11/2/95 (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 8 Filed: 10/18/1995, Entered: 10/20/1995 Status Report
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              STATUS REPORT by 1ST HOME LIQUIDATING, et al. Service: 10/18/95 (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 7 Filed: 10/11/1995, Entered: 10/17/1995 Status Report/OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                STATUS REPORT ORDER. Status report and listed cases in footnote due on 11/15/95, staying proceedings until 12/1/95 and directing parties' to file any objections to this stay by 11/2/95 (signed by Chief Judge Loren A. Smith). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 6 Filed: 6/20/1995, Entered: 6/22/1995 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER entered granting [4-1] motion to Stay proceedings pending decision of Appeals for the Federal Circuit Court in Winstar Corp v. U.S. (signed by Chief Judge Loren A. Smith ) Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 5 Filed: 6/8/1995, Entered: 6/9/1995 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    RESPONSE by 1ST HOME LIQUIDATING (Service: 6/8/95) to [4-1] motion to Stay proceedings pending decision of Appeals for the Federal Circuit Court in Winstar. Reply due: 6/22/95 (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 4 Filed: 5/22/1995, Entered: 5/23/1995, Terminated: 6/20/1995 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION by USA (Service: 5/22/95) to Stay proceedings pending decision of Appeals for the Federal Circuit Court in Winstar . Response due: 6/8/95 (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 3 Filed: 4/7/1995, Entered: 4/11/1995 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Attorney Appearance for USA by Agnes Marie Brown Service : 4/7/95 (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 2 Filed: 3/22/1995, Entered: 3/23/1995 Case Assigned/ReassignedCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Notice of assignment to Chief Judge Loren A. Smith. Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 1 Filed: 3/22/1995, Entered: 3/23/1995 Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            COMPLAINT, FILING FEE $120, RECEIPT #38901, Answer due on 5/22/95. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              This case has been viewed 141 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                               
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Need Password Help?