PERUTA v. USA
Federal Civil Lawsuit United States Court of Federal Claims, Case No. 1:95-cv-00588-RHH
District Judge Robert H. Hodges, Jr., presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo EDWARD ALLAN PERUTA, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Bruce E. Hodge +1 401 273 8200
v.
United States of America United States of America, Defendant
Officially listed as "USA"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Armando Omar Bonilla +1 202 616 2983 +1 202 514 3003 armando.bonilla@usdoj.gov
Office COFC
Filed 8/31/1995
Jury Demand
Demand $0
Nature of Suit 352 - Military Pay - Retirement
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1491 Tucker Act
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition Preliminary Injunction
County
Terminated 5/6/1996
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flag CLOSED
  Entries (26) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 24 Filed: 8/6/1996, Entered: 8/12/1996 Costs TaxedCourt Filing
Taxation of Costs for USA in the amount of $317.10 for the costs of duplication of papers (signed by Clerk). Copy to parties and to Judge. (FE)
    LREF
    Blank 23 Filed: 6/21/1996, Entered: 6/28/1996 Notice of Change of Address
    NOTICE of change of address by Armando Omar Bonilla (FE)
      LREF
      Blank 22 Filed: 6/5/1996, Entered: 6/10/1996 Terminated:
      Bill of costs by USA. Service: 6/5/96. (Objection to Bill of Costs due by 6/24/96). (FE)
        LREF
        Blank 20 Filed: 5/22/1996, Entered: 5/28/1996 OrderCourt Filing
        ORDER denying as moot [18-1] motion to Extend Time within to respond to motion for reconsideration and remand (signed by Judge Robert H. Hodges, Jr.). Copy to parties. (FE)
          LREF
          Blank 19 Filed: 5/22/1996, Entered: 5/28/1996 OrderCourt Filing
          ORDER denying [17-1] motion to Amend [16-1] judgment order, denying [17-2] motion to Stay judgment and denying [17-3] motion to Remand case to the Board for Correction of Naval Records (signed by Judge Robert H. Hodges, Jr.). Copy to parties. (FE)
            LREF
            Blank 21 Filed: 5/17/1996, Entered: 6/3/1996 ~Notice (other)
            Assented to NOTICE of corrected motion by EDWARD ALLAN PERUTA Service: 5/15/96 (FE)
              LREF
              Blank 17 Filed: 5/17/1996, Entered: 5/21/1996, Terminated: 5/22/1996 Terminated: Court Filing
              MOTION by EDWARD ALLAN PERUTA (Service: 5/14/96) to Amend [16-1] judgment order , to Stay judgment and to Remand case to the Board for Correction of Naval Records by leave of the Judge. Response due: 5/31/96. (FE) Modified on 05/21/1996
                LREF
                Blank -- Filed: 5/17/1996, Entered: 5/21/1996 Set/Reset Deadlines:
                Deadline updated; Response to [17-1] motion to Amend [16-1] judgment order reset to 5/31/96, [17-2] motion to Stay judgment reset to 5/31/96 and [17-3] motion to Remand case to the Board for COrrection of Naval Records reset to 5/31/96 . (FE)
                  LREF
                  Blank 18 Filed: 5/16/1996, Entered: 5/21/1996, Terminated: 5/22/1996 Terminated:
                  MOTION by USA (Service : 5/16/96 ) to Extend Time within to respond to motion for reconsideration and remand , (until June 17, 1996). (HW)
                    LREF
                    Blank 16 Filed: 5/6/1996, Entered: 5/9/1996 Judgment*
                    JUDGMENT entered pursuant to Rule 58 that the defendant's motion for judgment on the record is granted. Costs to defendant (signed by Clerk). Copy to parties. (FE)
                      LREF
                      Blank -- Filed: 5/6/1996, Entered: 5/9/1996 Terminated Case
                      Case closed. (FE)
                        LREF
                        Blank 15 Filed: 5/3/1996, Entered: 5/6/1996 Unpublished DecisionCourt Filing
                        UNPUBLISHED DECISION affirming ruling of the Board for Correction of Military Records, denying [14-1] motion to Extend Time to reply to Motion for Judgment upon the record, denying motion to extend time to respond to motion for judgment on the administrative record and granting [12-1] motion for Judgment upon the administrative record (signed by Judge Robert H. Hodges, Jr.). Copy to parties. (FE)
                          LREF
                          Blank 14 Filed: 4/26/1996, Entered: 5/1/1996 Terminated:
                          MOTION by EDWARD ALLAN PERUTA (Service: 4/25/96) to Extend Time to reply to Motion for Judgment upon the record until 7/26/96. (FE)
                            LREF
                            Blank 13 Filed: 3/13/1996, Entered: 3/19/1996 Terminated:
                            MOTION by EDWARD ALLAN PERUTA (Service : 3/11/96 ) to extend time to respond to motion for judgment on the administrative record (to April 26, 1996). (FE)
                              LREF
                              Blank 12 Filed: 2/12/1996, Entered: 3/18/1996 Terminated:
                              MOTION by USA (Service: 2/12/96) for Judgment upon the administrative record Response due: 3/14/96 (DS)
                                LREF
                                Blank 11 Filed: 2/12/1996, Entered: 2/15/1996 Statement of Facts
                                STATEMENT OF FACTS filed by USA. Service: 2/12/96 (FE)
                                  LREF
                                  Blank 10 Filed: 1/26/1996, Entered: 2/2/1996 OrderCourt Filing
                                  ORDER granting [8-1] motion to Extend Time to respond to complaint and reset Answer deadline to 2/12/96 (signed by Judge Robert H. Hodges). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                    LREF
                                    Blank 9 Filed: 1/24/1996, Entered: 1/30/1996 Administrative Record
                                    Administrative record filed by USA. Service: 1/24/96 (FE)
                                      LREF
                                      Blank 8 Filed: 1/5/1996, Entered: 1/16/1996, Terminated: 1/26/1996 Terminated:
                                      MOTION by USA (Service : 1/5/96) to Extend Time to respond to complaint requests an enlargement of time equal to the number of days of the current Government furlough plus 14 days. (FE)
                                        LREF
                                        Blank 7 Filed: 12/11/1995, Entered: 12/12/1995 Notice of Appearance/
                                        NOTICE of Attorney Appearance for USA by Armando Omar Bonilla. Service: 12/11/95 (FE)
                                          LREF
                                          Blank 6 Filed: 12/11/1995, Entered: 12/12/1995 OrderCourt Filing
                                          ORDER granting [5-1] motion to Extend Time to respond to complaint, reset Answer deadline to 1/18/96 , directing Defendant to file the administrative record as soon as it is received and Waiver of Duplication (signed by Judge Robert H. Hodges). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                            LREF
                                            Blank 5 Filed: 12/4/1995, Entered: 12/11/1995, Terminated: 12/11/1995 Terminated:
                                            MOTION by USA (Service : 12/1/95) to Extend Time to respond to complaint (to January 18, 1995). (FE)
                                              LREF
                                              Blank 4 Filed: 10/31/1995, Entered: 11/6/1995 OrderCourt Filing
                                              ORDER granting [3-1] motion to Extend Time to respond to complaint reset Answer deadline to 12/4/95 ( signed by Judge Robert H. Hodges ). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                LREF
                                                Blank 3 Filed: 10/18/1995, Entered: 10/20/1995, Terminated: 10/31/1995 Terminated:
                                                MOTION by USA (Service: 10/18/95) to Extend Time to respond to complaint [to December 4, 1995]. (FE)
                                                  LREF
                                                  Blank 2 Filed: 8/31/1995, Entered: 8/31/1995 Court Filing
                                                  Notice of assignment to Judge Robert H. Hodges. Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                    LREF
                                                    Blank 1 Filed: 8/31/1995, Entered: 8/31/1995
                                                    COMPLAINT, FILING FEE $120, RECEIPT #39986. Answer due on 10/30/95. (FE)
                                                      LREF

                                                      Statistics

                                                      This case has been viewed 186 times.

                                                      No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                      Space
                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                       
                                                      PlainSite
                                                      Sign Up
                                                      Need Password Help?