HOWARD v. USA
Federal Civil Lawsuit United States Court of Federal Claims, Case No. 1:95-cv-00595-LAS
District Judge Loren A. Smith, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

No Logo ANNA MAE HOWARD, Plaintiff
v.
United States of America United States of America, Defendant
Officially listed as "USA"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space William Francis Ryan william.ryan2@usdoj.gov
Office COFC
Filed 9/5/1995
Jury Demand
Demand $1000
Nature of Suit 354 - Military Pay - SBP
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1491 Tucker Act
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition Preliminary Injunction
County
Terminated 1/28/1999
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flag CLOSED
  Entries (27) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank -- Filed: 3/27/2006, Entered: 3/30/2006 Order
ORDER: Lifting Stay Signed by Special Master Patricia E. Campbell-Smith. (mij, )
    LREF
    Blank 22 Filed: 1/28/1999, Entered: 1/28/1999
    JUDGMENT entered, pursuant to Rule 58, that the complaint is dismissed. (signed by Clerk). Copy to parties. (LD)
      LREF
      Blank 21 Filed: 1/28/1999, Entered: 1/28/1999 Court Filing
      PUBLISHED DECISION denying [13-1] cross motion, mooting [11-1] motion to Dismiss and granting defendant's motion for summary judgment as a matter of law .( signed by Chief Judge Loren A. Smith ). Copy to parties. (LD)
        LREF
        Blank -- Filed: 1/28/1999, Entered: 1/28/1999
        Case closed (LD)
          LREF
          Blank 20 Filed: 6/19/1998, Entered: 6/22/1998 Notice of Appearance/
          NOTICE of Attorney Appearance for USA by William Francis Ryan. Service : 6/19/98 (JT)
            LREF
            Blank 19 Filed: 10/10/1996, Entered: 10/16/1996 Notice of Appearance/
            NOTICE of Attorney Appearance for USA by Laurel A. Loomis Service : 10/10/96 (HW)
              LREF
              Blank 18 Filed: 7/5/1996, Entered: 7/11/1996 Notice of Appearance/
              NOTICE of Attorney Appearance for USA by Lesleyanne Koch Kessler. Service: 7/5/96 (FE)
                LREF
                Blank 17 Filed: 6/24/1996, Entered: 6/28/1996 Notice of Change of Address
                NOTICE of change of address by Mark Brian Ehrlich (FE)
                  LREF
                  Blank 16 Filed: 4/19/1996, Entered: 4/24/1996 Reply to Response to Motion
                  REPLY by USA to plaintiff's response to defendant's [11-1] motion to Dismiss or, in the alternative for summary judgment. Service: 4/12/96. (FE)
                    LREF
                    Blank 15 Filed: 4/19/1996, Entered: 4/24/1996 Terminated:
                    RESPONSE by USA (Service: 4/12/96 ) to plaintiff's [13-1] cross motion for summary judgment. Reply due: 4/29/96. (FE)
                      LREF
                      Blank 14 Filed: 4/2/1996, Entered: 4/8/1996 Statement of Genuine Issues
                      STATEMENT OF GENUINE ISSUES by ANNA MAE HOWARD. Service: 3/29/96 (FE)
                        LREF
                        Blank 14 Filed: 4/2/1996, Entered: 4/8/1996 Proposed Findings of Uncontroverted Fact
                        PROPOSED FINDINGS of Uncontroverted Fact by ANNA MAE HOWARD Service: 3/29/96 (FE)
                          LREF
                          Blank -- Filed: 4/2/1996, Entered: 4/16/1996 Set/Reset Deadlines:
                          Deadline updated; Response to [13-1] cross motion reset to 4/29/96 (per order of 2/29/96) (DS)
                            LREF
                            Blank 13 Filed: 2/29/1996, Entered: 4/16/1996 Terminated:
                            CROSS MOTION by ANNA MAE HOWARD ( Service: 2/23/96 ) and RESPONSE to [11-1] motion to Dismiss or, in the alternative for summary judgment by USA filed [by leave of the judge]. Response due: (after filing of proposed findings, etc.) (DS)
                              LREF
                              Blank 12 Filed: 2/29/1996, Entered: 3/7/1996 OrderCourt Filing
                              ORDER re: (1) The Clerk of the Court is directed to file the document entitled "Cross-Motion for Denial of Defendant's Motion to Dismiss," by leave of the court; and (2) Plaintiff shall file the Proposed Findings of Uncontroverted Fact ans Statement of Genuine Issues as required under RCFC 56(d) by Brief deadline of 4/19/96 ( signed by Chief Judge Loren A. Smith ) Copy to parties. (HW) Modified on 04/16/1996
                                LREF
                                Blank 11 Filed: 1/25/1996, Entered: 1/31/1996 Terminated:
                                MOTION by USA (Service : 1/25/96) to Dismiss or, in the alternative for summary judgment . Response due: 2/26/96. (HW)
                                  LREF
                                  Blank 10 Filed: 1/25/1996, Entered: 1/31/1996 Proposed Findings of Uncontroverted Fact
                                  PROPOSED FINDINGS of Uncontroverted Fact by USA. Service: 1/25/96. (HW)
                                    LREF
                                    Blank 9 Filed: 1/17/1996, Entered: 1/24/1996 OrderCourt Filing
                                    ORDER granting [8-1] motion to Extend Time to respond to complaint and reset Answer deadline to 1/26/96 (signed by Chief Judge Loren A. Smith). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                      LREF
                                      Blank 8 Filed: 1/16/1996, Entered: 1/23/1996, Terminated: 1/17/1996 Terminated:
                                      MOTION by USA (Service: 1/11/96) to Extend Time to respond to complaint [to January 26, 1996]. (FE)
                                        LREF
                                        Blank 7 Filed: 1/5/1996, Entered: 1/17/1996 OrderCourt Filing
                                        ORDER granting [6-1] motion to Extend Time to respond to complaint reset Answer deadline to 1/12/96 ( signed by Chief Judge Loren A. Smith ). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                          LREF
                                          Blank 6 Filed: 12/18/1995, Entered: 12/27/1995, Terminated: 1/5/1996 Terminated:
                                          MOTION by USA (Service: 12/??/95) to Extend Time to respond to complaint [to January 12, 1996]. (FE)
                                            LREF
                                            Blank 5 Filed: 10/31/1995, Entered: 11/6/1995 OrderCourt Filing
                                            ORDER granting [4-1] motion to Extend Time within which to respond to complaint and reset Answer deadline to 12/22/95 (signed by Chief Judge Loren A. Smith). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                              LREF
                                              Blank 4 Filed: 10/24/1995, Entered: 10/30/1995, Terminated: 10/31/1995 Terminated:
                                              MOTION by USA (Service : 10/24/95 ) to Extend Time within which to respond to complaint , (until December 22, 1995). Response due: 11/6/95. (HW)
                                                LREF
                                                Blank 3 Filed: 10/3/1995, Entered: 10/5/1995 Notice of Appearance/
                                                NOTICE of Attorney Appearance for USA by Mark Brian Ehrlich Service : 10/3/95 (HW)
                                                  LREF
                                                  Blank 2 Filed: 9/25/1995, Entered: 9/28/1995 Case Assigned/ReassignedCourt Filing
                                                  Notice of assignment to Chief Judge Loren A. Smith. Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                    LREF
                                                    Blank 1 Filed: 9/5/1995, Entered: 9/11/1995 Complaint
                                                    COMPLAINT FILED. FILING FEE $ 120. RECEIPT # 40007. Answer due on 11/6/95. (FE)
                                                      LREF
                                                      Blank -- Filed: 9/5/1995, Entered: 9/11/1995 Case Assigned/Reassigned
                                                      CASE assigned to Judge Unassigned. (FE)
                                                        LREF

                                                        Statistics

                                                        This case has been viewed 81 times.

                                                        No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                        Space
                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                         
                                                        PlainSite
                                                        Sign Up
                                                        Need Password Help?