CARTER, et al v. USA
Federal Civil Lawsuit United States Court of Federal Claims, Case No. 1:95-cv-00600-WCR
District Judge Wilkes C. Robinson, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo LINDA M. CARTER, Plaintiff
No Logo RANDOLPH P. CARTER, Plaintiff
v.
United States of America United States of America, Defendant
Officially listed as "USA"
Office COFC
Filed 9/6/1995
Jury Demand
Demand $0
Nature of Suit 202 - Tax - Declaratory Judgment 28:1507
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1491 Tucker Act
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition Preliminary Injunction
County
Terminated 9/18/1995
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flag CLOSED
  Entries (9) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 5 Filed: 7/9/1996, Entered: 7/10/1996 CAFC Mandate Affirming
MANDATE (certified copy) from CAFC dated July 5, 1996 affirmed [3-1] judgment order. (HW)
    LREF
    Blank -- Filed: 11/28/1995, Entered: 12/4/1995 CAFC Case Number
    CAFC Case Number Re: [4-1] appeal by LINDA M. CARTER, RANDOLPH P. CARTER CAFC NUMBER: 96-5019 (HW)
      LREF
      Blank 4 Filed: 10/31/1995, Entered: 11/13/1995 Terminated:
      NOTICE OF APPEAL by RANDOLPH P. CARTER and LINDA M. CARTER. Copy to and to C.A.F.C. FILING FEE $ 105.00 with RECEIPT # 040364. (HW)
        LREF
        Blank 3 Filed: 9/18/1995, Entered: 9/18/1995
        JUDGMENT entered pursuant to Rule 58 dismissing the complaint for lack of jurisdiction. No costs (signed by Clerk). Copy to parties. (FE)
          LREF
          Blank -- Filed: 9/18/1995, Entered: 9/18/1995
          Case closed. (FE)
            LREF
            Blank 2 Filed: 9/8/1995, Entered: 9/13/1995 Unpublished DecisionCourt Filing
            UNPUBLISHED DECISION dismissing [1-1] complaint (signed by Judge Wilkes C. Robinson). Copy to parties. (FE)
              LREF
              Blank -- Filed: 9/8/1995, Entered: 9/13/1995 Case Assigned/Reassigned
              CASE assigned to Judge Wilkes C. Robinson. (FE)
                LREF
                Blank 1 Filed: 9/6/1995, Entered: 9/11/1995 Terminated:
                COMPLAINT FILED. FILING FEE $ 120. RECEIPT # 40003. Answer due on 11/6/95. (FE)
                  LREF
                  Blank -- Filed: 9/6/1995, Entered: 9/11/1995 Case Assigned/Reassigned
                  CASE assigned to Judge Unassigned. (FE)
                    LREF

                    Statistics

                    This case has been viewed 64 times.

                    No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                    Space
                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                     
                    PlainSite
                    Sign Up
                    Need Password Help?