ROBERTSON v. USA
Federal Civil Lawsuit United States Court of Federal Claims, Case No. 1:95-cv-00658-EGB
District Judge Eric G. Bruggink, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo DORIS TALBOT ROBERTSON, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Nancy Lee Presson +1 770 997 0334 +1 770 478 2334 caninecabin@bellsouth.net
v.
United States of America United States of America, Defendant
Officially listed as "USA"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Darshpaul Singh Padda +1 202 307 0282
Office COFC
Filed 9/29/1995
Jury Demand
Demand $0
Nature of Suit 352 - Military Pay - Retirement
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1491 Tucker Act
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition Preliminary Injunction
County
Terminated 10/7/1996
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flag CLOSED
  Entries (25) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 21 Filed: 4/9/1997, Entered: 4/16/1997 CAFC Mandate Dismissing
MANDATE (certified copy) from CAFC dated 4/9/97 dismissed [20-1] appeal by DORIS TALBOT ROBERTSON. (HW)
    LREF
    Blank -- Filed: 12/30/1996, Entered: 1/9/1997 CAFC Case Number
    CAFC Case Number Re: [20-1] appeal by DORIS TALBOT ROBERTSON. CAFC NUMBER: 97-5033. (HW)
      LREF
      Blank 20 Filed: 12/2/1996, Entered: 12/26/1996 Terminated: Court Filing
      NOTICE OF APPEAL by DORIS TALBOT ROBERTSON. Copy to USA, Judge Bruggink, and to C.A.F.C. FILING FEE $ 105.00; RECEIPT # 042767. (HW)
        LREF
        Blank 19 Filed: 10/7/1996, Entered: 10/8/1996 Judgment*
        JUDGMENT entered pursuant to Rule 58 that the complaint is dismissed. No costs (signed by Clerk). Copy to parties. (FE)
          LREF
          Blank -- Filed: 10/7/1996, Entered: 10/8/1996 Terminated Case
          Case closed. (FE)
            LREF
            Blank 18 Filed: 10/3/1996, Entered: 10/7/1996 Unpublished DecisionCourt Filing
            UNPUBLISHED DECISION denying [15-1] cross motion, granting [10-1] motion for Summary Judgment ( signed by Judge Eric G. Bruggink ). Copy to parties. (HW)
              LREF
              Blank -- Filed: 8/21/1996, Entered: 8/21/1996
              (FE)
                LREF
                Blank 17 Filed: 7/8/1996, Entered: 7/11/1996 Notice of Change of Address
                NOTICE of change of address by Darshpaul Singh Padda (FE)
                  LREF
                  Blank 16 Filed: 6/6/1996, Entered: 6/10/1996 Reply to Response to MotionCourt Filing
                  REPLY by USA to response to [10-1] motion for Summary Judgment. Filed by leave of the Judge. Service: 5/30/96 (FE)
                    LREF
                    Blank 15 Filed: 5/22/1996, Entered: 5/28/1996 Terminated:
                    CROSS MOTION by DORIS TALBOT ROBERTSON (Service: 5/13/96) and RESPONSE to [10-1] motion for Summary Judgment by USA Response due: 6/13/96 (FE) Modified on 05/28/1996
                      LREF
                      Blank 14 Filed: 5/22/1996, Entered: 5/28/1996 Terminated:
                      RESPONSE by DORIS TALBOT ROBERTSON to [11-1] proposed findings by USA. Service: 5/13/96 (FE)
                        LREF
                        Blank 13 Filed: 5/22/1996, Entered: 5/28/1996 OrderCourt Filing
                        ORDER granting [12-1] motion for Leave to File response to motion for summary judgment out of time (signed by Judge Eric G. Bruggink). Copy to parties. (FE)
                          LREF
                          Blank -- Filed: 5/22/1996, Entered: 5/28/1996 Set/Reset Deadlines:
                          Deadline updated; Response to [15-1] cross motion reset to 6/13/96 . (FE)
                            LREF
                            Blank 12 Filed: 5/15/1996, Entered: 5/17/1996, Terminated: 5/22/1996 Terminated:
                            MOTION by DORIS TALBOT ROBERTSON (Service: 5/13/96) for Leave to File response to motion for summary judgment out of time . (FE)
                              LREF
                              Blank 11 Filed: 3/22/1996, Entered: 3/28/1996 Proposed Findings of Uncontroverted Fact
                              PROPOSED FINDINGS of Uncontroverted Fact by USA. Service: 3/22/96 (HW)
                                LREF
                                Blank 10 Filed: 3/22/1996, Entered: 3/28/1996 Terminated:
                                MOTION by USA (Service: 3/22/96) for Summary Judgment . Response due: 4/22/96. (HW)
                                  LREF
                                  Blank 9 Filed: 3/18/1996, Entered: 3/22/1996 OrderCourt Filing
                                  ORDER granting [8-1] motion to Extend Time to respond to complaint and reset Answer deadline to 3/22/96 (signed by Judge Eric G. Bruggink). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                    LREF
                                    Blank 8 Filed: 3/13/1996, Entered: 3/19/1996, Terminated: 3/18/1996 Terminated:
                                    MOTION by USA (Service : 3/13/96) to Extend Time to respond to complaint (March 22, 1996). Response due: 4/1/96 (FE)
                                      LREF
                                      Blank 7 Filed: 2/9/1996, Entered: 2/14/1996 OrderCourt Filing
                                      ORDER granting [6-1] motion to Extend Time to respond to complaint and reset Answer deadline to 3/15/96 (signed by Judge Eric G. Bruggink). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                        LREF
                                        Blank 6 Filed: 1/29/1996, Entered: 2/5/1996, Terminated: 2/9/1996 Terminated:
                                        MOTION by USA (Service: 1/29/96) to Extend Time to respond to complaint [to March 15, 1996]. (FE)
                                          LREF
                                          Blank 5 Filed: 11/30/1995, Entered: 12/7/1995 OrderCourt Filing
                                          ORDER granting [4-1] motion to Extend Time to respond to complaint ; reset Answer deadline to ( signed by Judge Eric G. Bruggink ) Copy to parties. (HW)
                                            LREF
                                            Blank 4 Filed: 11/28/1995, Entered: 12/4/1995, Terminated: 11/30/1995 Terminated:
                                            MOTION by USA (Service: 11/28/95) to Extend Time to respond to complaint [to January 29, 1996]. (FE)
                                              LREF
                                              Blank 3 Filed: 10/27/1995, Entered: 11/2/1995 Notice of Appearance/
                                              NOTICE of Attorney Appearance for USA by Darshpaul Singh Padda. Service : 10/27/95 (FE)
                                                LREF
                                                Blank 2 Filed: 9/29/1995, Entered: 10/3/1995 Case Assigned/ReassignedCourt Filing
                                                Notice of assignment to Judge Eric G. Bruggink. Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                  LREF
                                                  Blank 1 Filed: 9/29/1995, Entered: 10/3/1995 Complaint
                                                  COMPLAINT, FILING FEE $120, RECEIPT #040202. Answer due on 11/28/95. (FE) Modified on 10/11/1995
                                                    LREF

                                                    Statistics

                                                    This case has been viewed 198 times.

                                                    No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                    Space
                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                     
                                                    PlainSite
                                                    Sign Up
                                                    Need Password Help?