BANK OF AMERICA, FSB, et al v. USA
Federal Civil Lawsuit United States Court of Federal Claims, Case No. 1:95-cv-00660-JPW
District Judge John P. Wiese, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Bank of America Corporation Bank of America Corporation, Plaintiff
Officially listed as "BANK OF AMERICA, FEDERAL SAVINGS BANK"

Toggle Switch Represented by Arnold & Porter, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Steven S. Rosenthal +1 202 682 3553 +1 202 414 0410 srosenthal@kayescholer.com
v.
United States of America United States of America, Defendant
Officially listed as "USA"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Frank Jefferson Hughes +1 202 305 3067 +1 202 514 8640 jeff.hughes@usdoj.gov
No Logo GEORGE GILLESPIE, III, Movant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Toni C. Lichstein +1 212 530 5000
No Logo GERALD L. PARSKY, Movant

Toggle Switch Represented by Gibson Dunn & Crutcher, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space John Curry Millian +1 202 955 8500 +1 202 467 0539 jmillian@gibsondunn.com
No Logo GERALD M. CZARNECKI, Movant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Frank J. Eisenhart +1 202 261 3306 +1 202 261 3333 feisenhart@msn.com
No Logo HONKIDS PARTNERS, Movant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Toni C. Lichstein +1 212 530 5000
No Logo J. PETER SIMON, Movant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Toni C. Lichstein +1 212 530 5000
No Logo LARRY B. THRALL, Movant

Toggle Switch Represented by Arnold & Porter, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Melvin Carl Garbow +1 202 942 5000 +1 202 942 5999 melvin_garbow@aporter.com
No Logo ROY DOUMANI, Movant

Toggle Switch Represented by Arnold & Porter, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Melvin Carl Garbow +1 202 942 5000 +1 202 942 5999 melvin_garbow@aporter.com
No Logo WILLIAM E. SIMON, JR., Movant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Toni C. Lichstein +1 212 530 5000
Office COFC
Filed 9/29/1995
Jury Demand
Demand $0
Nature of Suit 511 - Taking - FIRREA
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1491 Tucker Act
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition Judgment
County
Terminated 3/21/2006
Origin 1
Reopened
Lead Case
195-cv-00660-JPW None
Related Case
Other Court Cases '06-5088'[], '06-5089'[], '06-5090'[]
Def Custody Status
Flags CLOSED, LEAD, PROTO
  Entries (437) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 401 Filed: 10/19/2007, Entered: 10/22/2007 CAFC Mandate Affirming
MANDATE of CAFC affirming [392] Published Opinion/Order that directed the Clerk to enter judgment in this case. (hw1, )
    LREF
    Blank 400 Filed: 6/7/2006, Entered: 6/7/2006, Terminated: 10/19/2007 CAFC Case Number
    CAFC Case Number 06-5088 for [397] Notice of Cross Appeal filed by USA. (hw1, )
      LREF
      Blank 399 Filed: 6/7/2006, Entered: 6/7/2006, Terminated: 10/19/2007 CAFC Case Number
      CAFC Case Number 06-5089 for [396] Notice of Appeal filed by LARRY B. THRALL, ROY DOUMANI. (hw1, )
        LREF
        Blank 398 Filed: 6/7/2006, Entered: 6/7/2006, Terminated: 10/19/2007 CAFC Case Number
        CAFC Case Number 06-5090 for [395] Notice of Appeal filed by BANK OF AMERICA, FEDERAL SAVINGS BANK. (hw1, )
          LREF
          Blank 397 Filed: 5/19/2006, Entered: 6/1/2006 Terminated: Court Filing
          NOTICE OF CROSS APPEAL, filed by USA. Copies to Judge, opposing party and CAFC. (hw1, ) Modified on 6/2/2006 (hw1, ).
            LREF
            Blank 396 Filed: 5/18/2006, Entered: 5/19/2006 Terminated:
            NOTICE OF APPEAL, filed by ROY DOUMANI, LARRY B. THRALL. Filing fee $ 455, receipt number 064941. Copies to judge, opposing party and CAFC. (hw1, ) .
              LREF
              Blank 395 Filed: 5/16/2006, Entered: 6/2/2006 Terminated:
              NOTICE OF APPEAL, filed by BANK OF AMERICA, FEDERAL SAVINGS BANK. Filing fee $ 455, receipt number 064924. Copies to judge, opposing party and CAFC. (hw1, ) .
                LREF
                Blank 394 Filed: 3/22/2006, Entered: 3/27/2006 Certified Transcript to Attorney
                CERTIFIED TRANSCRIPT OF JUDGMENT, dated March 21, 2006, forwarded to Steven S. Rosenthal. See letter in file. (bre,)
                  LREF
                  Blank 393 Filed: 3/21/2006, Entered: 3/21/2006
                  JUDGMENT entered, pursuatn to Rule 58, that plaintiff Bank of America recover of and from the United States the sum of $16,750,553.00. All remaining claims in these consolidated actions are dismissed. No costs. (lld, )
                    LREF
                    Blank 392 Filed: 3/21/2006, Entered: 3/21/2006 Court Filing
                    PUBLISHED ORDER and OPINION granting [364] MOTION for Reconsideration re [363] Published Opinion filed by BANK OF AMERICA, FEDERAL SAVINGS BANK,. The Clerk is directed to enter judgment in favor of plaintiff Bank of America in the amount of $16,750,553.00, and dismiss all remaining claims in these consolidated cases. No costs. Signed by Judge John P. Wiese. (lld, )
                      LREF
                      Blank 391 Filed: 2/23/2006, Entered: 2/27/2006 Notice of Appearance/
                      NOTICE of Appearance by Frank Jefferson Hughes for USA. Service: 2/23/2006.(mb2, )
                        LREF
                        Blank 390 Filed: 12/20/2005, Entered: 12/27/2005 Order on Motion For Leave to File.Court Filing
                        ORDER granting [388] Motion for Leave to File Original Signed Declarations Addressing HFH's Distribution to the Bispho Estate of Bishop's Interest in HFH Partners. Signed by Judge John P. Wiese. (mb2, )
                          LREF
                          Blank 389 Filed: 12/20/2005, Entered: 12/27/2005 Response
                          RESPONSE to [385] Supplemental Brief , filed by USA. Service: 12/20/2005.(mb2, )
                            LREF
                            Blank 388 Filed: 12/15/2005, Entered: 12/20/2005, Terminated: 12/20/2005 Terminated:
                            MOTION for Leave to File Original Signed Declarations Addressing HFH's Distribution to the Bispho Estate of Bishop's Interest in HFH Partners , filed by BANK OF AMERICA, FEDERAL SAVINGS BANK. Service: 12/15/2005. Response due by 1/3/2006. (mb2, )
                              LREF
                              Blank 387 Filed: 12/14/2005, Entered: 12/20/2005 Supplemental Brief
                              SUPPLEMENTAL Declaration of Jeffrey N. Gordon, filed by BANK OF AMERICA, FEDERAL SAVINGS BANK. (mb2, )
                                LREF
                                Blank 386 Filed: 12/14/2005, Entered: 12/20/2005 Order on Motion For Leave to File.Court Filing
                                ORDER granting [383] Motion for Leave to File Supplemental Declaration Addressing HFH's Distribution to the Bishop Estate of Bishop's Interest in HFH Partners. Signed by Judge John P. Wiese. (mb2, )
                                  LREF
                                  Blank 385 Filed: 12/12/2005, Entered: 12/16/2005 Supplemental Brief
                                  SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEF and Declarations Addressing HFH's Distribution to the Bishop Estate of Bishop's Interest in HFH Partners, filed by BANK OF AMERICA, FEDERAL SAVINGS BANK. [FILED BY LEAVE OF THE JUDGE] Service: 12/7/2005.(mb2, )
                                    LREF
                                    Blank 384 Filed: 12/12/2005, Entered: 12/16/2005 Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
                                    SCHEDULING ORDER: Response due by 12/20/2005. Status Conference set for 12/21/2005 at 02:00 PM before Senior Judge John P. Wiese. Signed by Judge John P. Wiese. (mb2, )
                                      LREF
                                      Blank 383 Filed: 12/8/2005, Entered: 12/13/2005, Terminated: 12/14/2005 Terminated:
                                      MOTION for Leave to File Supplemental Declaration Addressing HFH's Distribution to the Bishop Estate of Bishop's Interest in HFH Partners , filed by BANK OF AMERICA, FEDERAL SAVINGS BANK. Service: 12/8/2005. Response due by 12/27/2005. (mb2, )
                                        LREF
                                        Blank 382 Filed: 12/6/2005, Entered: 12/12/2005 Order on Motion For Leave to File.Court Filing
                                        ORDER granting [380] Motion for Leave to File Original Version of Declaration in Support of Defendant's Response to the Court's Question about the Nature of the HFH Partners' Distributions. Signed by Judge John P. Wiese. (mb2, )
                                          LREF
                                          Blank 381 Filed: 12/1/2005, Entered: 12/6/2005 Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
                                          SCHEDULING ORDER: Memorandum due by 12/7/2005. Status Conference set for 12/12/2005 at 11:00 AM before Senior Judge John P. Wiese. Signed by Judge John P. Wiese. (mb2, )
                                            LREF
                                            Blank 380 Filed: 11/30/2005, Entered: 12/5/2005, Terminated: 12/6/2005 Terminated:
                                            MOTION for Leave to File Original Version of Declaration in Support of Defendant's Response to the Court's Question about the Nature of the HFH Partners' Distributions , filed by USA. Service: 11/30/2005. Response due by 12/19/2005. (mb2, )
                                              LREF
                                              Blank 379 Filed: 11/23/2005, Entered: 11/30/2005 Memorandum
                                              Response to the Court's Question About the Nature of the HFH Partners' Distributions, filed by USA. [FILED BY LEAVE OF THE JUDGE] Service: 11/21/2005.(mb2, )
                                                LREF
                                                Blank 378 Filed: 11/21/2005, Entered: 11/22/2005 Terminated:
                                                MOTION for Leave to Propose Briefing Schedule , filed by BANK OF AMERICA, FEDERAL SAVINGS BANK. Service: 11/21/2005. Response due by 12/8/2005. (mb2, )
                                                  LREF
                                                  Blank 377 Filed: 11/4/2005, Entered: 11/8/2005 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                  REPLY to Response to Motion re [374] MOTION for Leave to File response to questions posed by the court during oral argument , filed by BANK OF AMERICA, FEDERAL SAVINGS BANK. Service: 11/4/2005.(mb2, )
                                                    LREF
                                                    Blank 376 Filed: 11/2/2005, Entered: 11/4/2005 Response to Motion
                                                    RESPONSE to [374] MOTION for Leave to File response to questions posed by the court during oral argument , filed by USA. Reply due by 11/17/2005. Service: 11/2/2005.(mb2, )
                                                      LREF
                                                      Blank 375 Filed: 10/27/2005, Entered: 10/28/2005 TranscriptCourt Filing
                                                      TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on October 19, 2005 before Senior Judge John P. Wiese. (dw1)
                                                        LREF
                                                        Blank -- Filed: 10/25/2005, Entered: 10/25/2005
                                                        Set/Reset Transcript Deadlines: Transcript due by 11/21/2005. (vp1, )
                                                          LREF
                                                          Blank 374 Filed: 10/24/2005, Entered: 10/26/2005 Terminated:
                                                          MOTION for Leave to File response to questions posed by the court during oral argument filed by BANK OF AMERICA, FEDERAL SAVINGS BANK. Service: 10/4/05. Response due by 11/10/2005. (dw1)
                                                            LREF
                                                            Blank 373 Filed: 10/17/2005, Entered: 10/19/2005 Terminated:
                                                            MOTION for Leave to File a Response to Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to File Notice of Supplemental Authority Out of Time, filed by USA. Service: 10/17/2005. Response due by 11/3/2005. (mb2, )
                                                              LREF
                                                              Blank 372 Filed: 10/12/2005, Entered: 10/14/2005 Order Setting Oral Argument/Hearing on MotionCourt Filing
                                                              ORDER Setting Hearing: Oral Argument set for 10/19/2005 at 3:30 PM in National Courts Building before Senior Judge John P. Wiese. Signed by Judge John P. Wiese. (mb2, )
                                                                LREF
                                                                Blank 371 Filed: 9/23/2005, Entered: 9/26/2005 Terminated:
                                                                MOTION for Leave to File Notice of Supplemental Authority filed by BANK OF AMERICA, FEDERAL SAVINGS BANK.Service: 9/23/05. Response due by 10/11/2005. (dw1)
                                                                  LREF
                                                                  Blank 370 Filed: 9/16/2005, Entered: 9/20/2005 Response
                                                                  RESPONSE to [368] Initial Brief Addressing the Parties' August 26, 2005 Damages Calculations, filed by USA. Service: 9/16/2005.(mb2, )
                                                                    LREF
                                                                    Blank 369 Filed: 9/16/2005, Entered: 9/20/2005 Response
                                                                    RESPONSE to [367] Memorandum, filed by BANK OF AMERICA, FEDERAL SAVINGS BANK. Service: 9/16/2005.(mb2, )
                                                                      LREF
                                                                      Blank 368 Filed: 9/9/2005, Entered: 9/13/2005 Memorandum
                                                                      Initial Brief Addressing the Parties' August 26, 2005 Damages Calculations, filed by all plaintiffs. Service: 9/9/2005.(mb2, )
                                                                        LREF
                                                                        Blank 367 Filed: 9/9/2005, Entered: 9/13/2005 Memorandum
                                                                        MEMORANDUM in Support of the Damage-Related Calculations for Common Dividents and Retained Earnings, filed by USA. Service: 9/9/2005.(mb2, )
                                                                          LREF
                                                                          Blank 366 Filed: 9/6/2005, Entered: 9/12/2005 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous ReliefCourt Filing
                                                                          ORDER granting [365] Motion to establish a Briefing Schedule. Signed by Judge John P. Wiese. (mb2, )
                                                                            LREF
                                                                            Blank -- Filed: 9/6/2005, Entered: 9/12/2005 Set/Reset Deadlines:
                                                                            Set Deadlines: Brief, not to exceed ten (10) pages, due 9/9/2005. Response Brief, not to exceed five (5) pages due 9/16/2005. (mb2, )
                                                                              LREF
                                                                              Blank 365 Filed: 8/26/2005, Entered: 8/30/2005, Terminated: 9/6/2005 Terminated:
                                                                              Joint Filing of Damages Calculations and MOTION to Establish Briefing Schedule, filed by USA, BANK OF AMERICA, FEDERAL SAVINGS BANK. Service: 8/26/2005. Response due by 9/12/2005. (mb2, )
                                                                                LREF
                                                                                Blank 364 Filed: 8/26/2005, Entered: 8/30/2005, Terminated: 3/21/2006 Terminated:
                                                                                MOTION for Reconsideration, Clarification or Amendment re [363] Published Opinion, filed by BANK OF AMERICA, FEDERAL SAVINGS BANK. Service: 8/26/2005. Response due by 9/12/2005. (mb2, )
                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                  Blank 363 Filed: 7/21/2005, Entered: 7/21/2005 Court Filing
                                                                                  PUBLISHED OPINION. Signed by Judge John P. Wiese. (mb2, )
                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                    Blank -- Filed: 6/8/2005, Entered: 6/8/2005
                                                                                    Set/Reset Transcript Deadlines: Transcript due by 6/10/2005. (vp1, )
                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                      Blank 362 Filed: 6/7/2005, Entered: 6/10/2005 Response to Motion
                                                                                      RESPONSE to [360] MOTION for Leave to File The Petition for Rehearing of the United States in Home Savings of America, FSB V. United States, filed by USA. Reply due by 6/24/2005. Service: 6/7/2005.(mb2, )
                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                        Blank 361 Filed: 6/2/2005, Entered: 6/6/2005 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                        REPLY to Response to Motion re [358] MOTION for Leave to File Supplemental Authority filed by BANK OF AMERICA, FEDERAL SAVINGS BANK. Service: 6/2/05.(dw1)
                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                          Blank 360 Filed: 5/25/2005, Entered: 5/31/2005 Terminated:
                                                                                          MOTION for Leave to File The Petition for Rehearing of the United States in Home Savings of America, FSB V. United States, filed by BANK OF AMERICA, FEDERAL SAVINGS BANK. Service: 5/25/2005. Response due by 6/13/2005. (mb2, )
                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                            Blank 359 Filed: 5/23/2005, Entered: 5/27/2005 Response to Motion
                                                                                            RESPONSE to [358] MOTION for Leave to File Supplemental Authority and NOTICE of Supplemental Authority, filed by USA. Reply due by 6/9/2005. Service: 5/23/2005.(mb2, )
                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                              Blank 358 Filed: 5/19/2005, Entered: 5/24/2005 Terminated:
                                                                                              MOTION for Leave to File Supplemental Authority, filed by BANK OF AMERICA, FEDERAL SAVINGS BANK. Service: 5/19/2005. Response due by 6/6/2005. (mb2, )
                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                Blank 357 Filed: 5/18/2005, Entered: 5/24/2005 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                NOTICE of Appearance by Edward Sullivan for USA. Service: 5/18/2005.(mb2, )
                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                  Blank -- Filed: 5/11/2005, Entered: 5/13/2005 Transcript
                                                                                                  TRANSCRIPT (Pg 4370-4533)of Proceedings held on 5/10/05 before Judge John P. Wiese. (eph, )
                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                    Blank 356 Filed: 4/28/2005, Entered: 4/29/2005 Response to Motion
                                                                                                    RESPONSE to [355] MOTION for Leave to File Supplemental Authority filed by BANK OF AMERICA, FEDERAL SAVINGS BANK. Reply due by 5/12/2005. Service: 4/28/2005.(mb2, )
                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                      Blank 355 Filed: 4/27/2005, Entered: 4/28/2005 Terminated:
                                                                                                      MOTION for Leave to File Supplemental Authority, filed by USA. Service: 4/27/2005. Response due by 5/16/2005. (mb2, )
                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                        Blank 354 Filed: 4/21/2005, Entered: 4/25/2005 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous ReliefCourt Filing
                                                                                                        ORDER re: [353] Motion Concerning the Scheduling of Closing Argument. Signed by Judge John P. Wiese. (mb2, )
                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                          Blank -- Filed: 4/21/2005, Entered: 4/25/2005 Set/Reset Hearings
                                                                                                          Set/Reset Hearings: Closing Argument set for 5/10/2005 at 2:30 PM in National Courts Building before Senior Judge John P. Wiese. (mb2, )
                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                            Blank 353 Filed: 4/19/2005, Entered: 4/21/2005 Terminated:
                                                                                                            MOTION Concerning the Scheduling of Closing Argument, filed by USA. Service: 4/19/2005. Response due by 5/6/2005. (mb2, )
                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                              Blank 352 Filed: 4/7/2005, Entered: 4/11/2005 Notice of Additional Authority
                                                                                                              NOTICE of Supplemental Authority, filed by BANK OF AMERICA, FEDERAL SAVINGS BANK. [FILED BY LEAVE OF THE JUDGE] Service: 4/1/2005.(mb2, )
                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                Blank 351 Filed: 4/1/2005, Entered: 4/7/2005 Terminated:
                                                                                                                MOTION for Leave to File Notice of Supplemental Authority, filed by USA.Service: 4/1/2005. Response due by 4/18/2005.(mb2)
                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                  Blank 350 Filed: 3/29/2005, Entered: 4/1/2005 Supplemental Brief
                                                                                                                  BRIEF regarding the Impact of the Fed. Cir. Decision in Home Savings of America v. United States by BANK OF AMERICA, FEDERAL SAVINGS BANK. Service: 3/29/2005.(mb2, )
                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                    Blank 349 Filed: 3/29/2005, Entered: 4/1/2005 Supplemental Brief
                                                                                                                    SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEF re: [348] Scheduling Order by USA. Service: 3/29/2005.(mb2, )
                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                      Blank 348 Filed: 3/16/2005, Entered: 3/18/2005 Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                      SCHEDULING ORDER: Supplemental Post-Trial Briefs due by 3/29/2005. Signed by Judge John P. Wiese. (mb2, )
                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                        Blank 347 Filed: 3/16/2005, Entered: 3/18/2005 Response
                                                                                                                        RESPONSE to [345] Motion for Order Directing Parties to File Supplemental Briefs, filed by USA. [FILED BY LEAVE OF THE JUDGE] Service: 3/14/2005.(mb2, )
                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                          Blank 346 Filed: 3/15/2005, Entered: 3/17/2005 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous ReliefCourt Filing
                                                                                                                          ORDER granting [345] MOTION for Order Directing Parties to File Supplemental Briefs Signed by Judge John P. Wiese. (mb2, )
                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                            Blank 345 Filed: 3/15/2005, Entered: 3/17/2005, Terminated: 3/15/2005 Terminated:
                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Supplemental Authority and MOTION for Order Directing Parties to File Supplemental Briefs filed by BANK OF AMERICA, FEDERAL SAVINGS BANK. [FILED BY LEAVE OF THE JUDGE] Service: 3/7/2005. Response due by 4/1/2005.(mb2, ) Modified on 3/17/2005 (mb2, ).
                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                              Blank -- Filed: 3/15/2005, Entered: 3/17/2005 Set/Reset Deadlines:
                                                                                                                              Set/Reset Deadlines: Supplemental Briefs, not to exceed fifteen (15) pages due by 3/21/2005. (mb2, )
                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                Blank 344 Filed: 3/11/2005, Entered: 3/16/2005 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Appearance by Lee McWethy Straus for USA. Service: 3/11/2005.(mb2, )
                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                  Blank 343 Filed: 2/22/2005, Entered: 2/24/2005 Supplemental Brief
                                                                                                                                  BRIEF re: [340] Notice by BANK OF AMERICA, FEDERAL SAVINGS BANK. Service: 2/22/2005.(mb2, )
                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                    Blank 342 Filed: 2/22/2005, Entered: 2/24/2005 Post-Trial Brief
                                                                                                                                    Supplemental POST TRIAL BRIEF Applying CALFED by USA. Service: 2/22/2005.(mb2, )
                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                      Blank 341 Filed: 2/4/2005, Entered: 2/7/2005 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous ReliefCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                      ORDER granting [339] Motion For Limited Additional Briefing on Matters Raised by the Government's Notice of Supplemental Authority. Signed by Judge John P. Wiese. (mb2, )
                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                        Blank -- Filed: 2/4/2005, Entered: 2/7/2005 Set Deadlines/Hearings:
                                                                                                                                        Set Deadlines/Hearings: Supplemental Briefs due by 2/22/2005. (mb2, )
                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                          Blank 340 Filed: 2/3/2005, Entered: 2/4/2005 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Supplemental Authority by USA. Service: 02/01/05.(mb2, )
                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                            Blank 339 Filed: 2/2/2005, Entered: 2/3/2005, Terminated: 2/4/2005 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                            MOTION For Limited Additional Briefing on Matters Raised by the Government's Notice of Supplemental Authority by BANK OF AMERICA, FEDERAL SAVINGS BANK.Service: 02/02/05. Response due by 2/22/2005 (mb2, )
                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                              Blank 338 Filed: 1/14/2005, Entered: 1/19/2005 Response
                                                                                                                                              RESPONSE to [335] Scheduling Order filed by BANK OF AMERICA, FEDERAL SAVINGS BANK. Service: 01/14/05.(mb2, )
                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                Blank -- Filed: 1/14/2005, Entered: 1/19/2005 Response
                                                                                                                                                RESPONSE to [335] Scheduling Order filed by BANK OF AMERICA, FEDERAL SAVINGS BANK. Service: 01/14/05.(mb2, )
                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Blank 337 Filed: 12/20/2004, Entered: 12/29/2004 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to FileCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                  ORDER granting [336] Motion for Extension of Time to respond to the court's questions. Signed by Senior Judge John P. Wiese. (dw1)
                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Blank 336 Filed: 12/10/2004, Entered: 12/16/2004, Terminated: 12/20/2004 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                    MOTION for Extension of Time until 1/14/2005 for both parties to file responses to the court's question by BANK OF AMERICA, FEDERAL SAVINGS BANK.Service: 12/10/04. (dw1)
                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Blank 335 Filed: 12/2/2004, Entered: 12/9/2004 Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                      SCHEDULING ORDER: On or before 1/7/2005, each party shall file a response addressing the following questions: (See order for details). Signed by Judge John P. Wiese. (jcp, )
                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Blank 334 Filed: 10/25/2004, Entered: 10/29/2004 Response
                                                                                                                                                        RESPONSE to [330] Post Trial Brief filed by BANK OF AMERICA, FEDERAL SAVINGS BANK. Service: 10/25/04.(jat, )
                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Blank 333 Filed: 10/25/2004, Entered: 10/29/2004 Response
                                                                                                                                                          RESPONSE to [331] Post Trial Brief filed by USA. Service: 10/25/04.(jat, )
                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Blank 332 Filed: 10/12/2004, Entered: 10/14/2004 TranscriptCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                            TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings in Twenty One (21) Volumes Along With the Cumulative Index of Trial held on 7/12/2004 - 9/2/2004 before Judge John P. Wiese. (jcp, )
                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Blank 331 Filed: 10/8/2004, Entered: 10/13/2004 Post-Trial Brief
                                                                                                                                                              INITIAL POST TRIAL BRIEF by BANK OF AMERICA, FEDERAL SAVINGS BANK. (jcp, )
                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Blank 330 Filed: 10/8/2004, Entered: 10/13/2004 Post-Trial Brief
                                                                                                                                                                POST TRIAL BRIEF by USA. (jcp, )
                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 329 Filed: 9/24/2004, Entered: 9/28/2004 TranscriptCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                  REVISED AND CORRECTED COPY OF TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings (Trial) held on 7/12/2004 - 7/14/2004 before Judge John P. Wiese. (jcp, )
                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 328 Filed: 9/13/2004, Entered: 9/16/2004 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                    CONSENT ORDER Regarding Corrections to Trial Transcript. Signed by Judge John P. Wiese. (jcp, )
                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 327 Filed: 9/13/2004, Entered: 9/16/2004 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER: The consent order, received on 9/9/2004, regarding corrections to the trial transcript, as signed by both parties and the court, shall be FILED THIS DAY and submitted to Heritage Reporting for incorporation into the final trial transcript. Signed by Judge John P. Wiese. (jcp, )
                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 326 Filed: 9/3/2004, Entered: 9/8/2004 Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                        SCHEDULING ORDER: On or before 10/8/2004, each party shall file its initial post trial brief, not to exceed 60 pages. On or before 10/25/2004, each party shall file its responsive post trial brief, not to exceed 25 pages. Signed by Judge John P. Wiese. (jcp, )
                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Blank -- Filed: 9/3/2004, Entered: 9/3/2004
                                                                                                                                                                          Set/Reset Transcript Deadlines: Transcript due by 10/4/2004. (vp1, )
                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Blank -- Filed: 8/2/2004, Entered: 8/2/2004
                                                                                                                                                                            Set/Reset Transcript Deadlines: Transcript due by 8/30/2004. (vp1, )
                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Blank -- Filed: 7/28/2004, Entered: 7/28/2004
                                                                                                                                                                              Set/Reset Transcript Deadlines: Transcript due by 8/30/2004. (vp1, )
                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 325 Filed: 7/19/2004, Entered: 7/20/2004 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous ReliefCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER: [318] Dft's Motion to Cross Designate Deposition Testimony of Preston Martin is ALLOWED. Signed by Judge John P. Wiese. (jcp, )
                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 324 Filed: 7/12/2004, Entered: 7/14/2004 TranscriptCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                  TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings in One Volume held on 7/8/2004 before Judge John P. Wiese. (jcp, )
                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank -- Filed: 7/9/2004, Entered: 7/9/2004
                                                                                                                                                                                    Set/Reset Transcript Deadlines: Transcript due by 8/9/2004. (vp1, )
                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank -- Filed: 7/9/2004, Entered: 7/9/2004
                                                                                                                                                                                      Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge John P. Wiese : Telephone Conference held on 7/08/04. (jwg)
                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 323 Filed: 7/8/2004, Entered: 7/13/2004 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                        OPPOSITION to [322] Dft's MOTION for a Status Conference and REQUEST for Expedited Treatment, filed by BANK OF AMERICA, FEDERAL SAVINGS BANK. Reply due by 7/22/2004. Service: 7/8/2004.(jcp, )
                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 322 Filed: 7/8/2004, Entered: 7/13/2004 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION for a Status Conference and REQUEST for Expedited Treatment, by USA.Service: 7/8/2004. Response due by 7/26/2004. Response due by 7/26/2004. (jcp, )
                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank -- Filed: 7/8/2004, Entered: 7/8/2004
                                                                                                                                                                                            Set/Reset Transcript Deadlines: Transcript due by 6/30/2004. (vp1, )
                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 321 Filed: 7/7/2004, Entered: 7/9/2004 Exhibit
                                                                                                                                                                                              Supplemental Exhibit List by BANK OF AMERICA, FEDERAL SAVINGS BANK. (jcp, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 320 Filed: 7/7/2004, Entered: 7/9/2004 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                RESPONSIVE DESIGNATIONS of Deposition Testimony of James Cowles, by BANK OF AMERICA, FEDERAL SAVINGS BANK. Service: 7/7/2004 by hand.(jcp, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 319 Filed: 7/7/2004, Entered: 7/9/2004 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION for Leave to File Two Pages Omitted From Pltf's Notice of Filing Expert Reports by BANK OF AMERICA, FEDERAL SAVINGS BANK.Service: 7/7/2004. Response due by 7/26/2004. (jcp, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 318 Filed: 7/7/2004, Entered: 7/9/2004 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION to Cross-Designate Deposition Testimony of Preston Martin by USA.Service: 7/7/2004. Response due by 7/26/2004. (jcp, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 317 Filed: 7/6/2004, Entered: 7/9/2004 Expert Report - Rule 26
                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE OF FILING OF EXPERT REPORTS of Dr. Nevins D. Baxter, and Michael S. Green filed by BANK OF AMERICA, FEDERAL SAVINGS BANK. Service: 7/6/2004.(jcp, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 316 Filed: 7/2/2004, Entered: 7/8/2004 Exhibit
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Supplemental Exhibit List by USA. (jcp, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 315 Filed: 7/2/2004, Entered: 7/8/2004 Expert Report - Rule 26
                                                                                                                                                                                                          EXPERT WITNESS REPORTS of Dr. Anjan Thakor, Dr. William Hamm, and Dr. Paul Griffin filed by USA. Service: 7/2/2004 by hand.(jcp, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 314 Filed: 6/30/2004, Entered: 7/6/2004 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                            OPPOSITION to [312] Pltf's MOTION to Quash Trial Subpoena for Preston Martin, filed by USA. Reply due by 7/15/2004. Service: 6/30/2004.(jcp, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 313 Filed: 6/29/2004, Entered: 6/30/2004 TranscriptCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                              TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on June 25, 2004 before Senior Judge John P. Wiese. (dw1)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank -- Filed: 6/25/2004, Entered: 6/25/2004
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Set/Reset Transcript Deadlines: Transcript due by 7/26/2004. (vp1, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 311 Filed: 6/24/2004, Entered: 6/28/2004 Order on Motion For Leave to File.Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER granting [308] Motion for Leave to File proposed agenda for the pretrial conference. Signed by Judge John P. Wiese. (jat, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 312 Filed: 6/23/2004, Entered: 6/29/2004 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION to Quash Subpoena by Third Party Preston Martin.Service: 6/23/04. Response due by 7/12/2004. (dw1)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 310 Filed: 6/23/2004, Entered: 6/25/2004 ~Notice (other)Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Counter-Designations of the deposition testimony of Edwin J. Gray and Donald W. Mochel by USA, by leave of the Judge. Service: 6/21/04.(dw1)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 309 Filed: 6/23/2004, Entered: 6/25/2004 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        RESPONSE to [308] MOTION for Leave to File Proposed Agenda for Pretrial Conference filed by BANK OF AMERICA, FEDERAL SAVINGS BANK. Reply due by 7/7/2004. Service: 6/23/2004.(hw1, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 308 Filed: 6/21/2004, Entered: 6/23/2004, Terminated: 6/24/2004 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION for Leave to File Proposed Agenda for Pretrial Conference by USA.Service: 6/21/04. Response due by 7/8/2004 (jat, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 307 Filed: 6/18/2004, Entered: 6/22/2004 Response
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            RESPONSE to [281] Memorandum of Contentions of Fact and Law filed by BANK OF AMERICA, FEDERAL SAVINGS BANK. Service: 6/18/04.(dw1)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 306 Filed: 6/17/2004, Entered: 6/22/2004 Order on Motion in LimineCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER denying [291] Motion in Limine, denying [292] Motion in Limine, denying [293] Motion in Limine and denying [294] Motion in Limine. Signed by Senior Judge John P. Wiese. (dw1)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank -- Filed: 6/16/2004, Entered: 6/16/2004
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge John P. Wiese : Telephone Conference held on 6/16/04. (jwg)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 305 Filed: 6/15/2004, Entered: 6/18/2004 Declaration
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Notice of Filing & DECLARATION of Robin L. Rudisill by BANK OF AMERICA, FEDERAL SAVINGS BANK. Service: 6/15/04.(jat, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 304 Filed: 6/15/2004, Entered: 6/18/2004 Response
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    OBJECTIONS to Defendant's Trial Exhibits filed by BANK OF AMERICA, FEDERAL SAVINGS BANK. Service: 6/15/04.(jat, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 303 Filed: 6/14/2004, Entered: 6/17/2004 Order on Motion For Leave to File.Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER: [289] Pltf's Motion for Leave to File a Corrected Motion for Authorization of Service of Subpoena is ALLOWED. Signed by Judge John P. Wiese. (jcp, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 302 Filed: 6/14/2004, Entered: 6/17/2004 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        OPPOSITION to [292] Pltf's MOTION in Limine to Exclude Evidence of Benefits Received by HFH, filed by USA. Reply due by 6/28/2004. Service: 6/14/2004.(jcp, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 301 Filed: 6/14/2004, Entered: 6/17/2004 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          OPPOSITION to [291] Pltf's MOTION in Limine to Shift Burden of Proof, filed by USA. Reply due by 6/28/2004. Service: 6/14/2004.(jcp, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 300 Filed: 6/14/2004, Entered: 6/17/2004 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            OPPOSITION to [293] Pltf's MOTION in Limine to Exclude in Part the Proposed Expert Testimony of William G. Hamm, filed by USA. Reply due by 6/28/2004. Service: 6/14/2004.(jcp, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 299 Filed: 6/14/2004, Entered: 6/16/2004 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              RESPONSE to [294] MOTION in Limine filed by BANK OF AMERICA, FEDERAL SAVINGS BANK. Reply due by 6/28/2004. Service: 6/14/2004.(dw1)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank -- Filed: 6/10/2004, Entered: 6/10/2004
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge John P. Wiese : Telephone Conference held on 6/7/04. (jwg)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 298 Filed: 6/8/2004, Entered: 6/10/2004 Order on Motion in LimineCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER denying [295] Dft's Motion in Limine Exclude Testimony or Documentary Evidence Concerning the Effect of the Breach Upon Honfed's Cost of Funds; Honfed's Physical Collateral Delivery Fees to the Federal Home Loan Bank of Seattle; the Hours of Honfed's Managers; the Retention of a Public Relations Firm to Bolster Morale; and Honfed's Modified Capital Ratio Requirement. Signed by Judge John P. Wiese. (jcp, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 297 Filed: 6/8/2004, Entered: 6/10/2004 Order on Motion in LimineCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER denying [296] Dft's Motion in Limine Regarding the Testimony of Michael Green. Signed by Judge John P. Wiese. (jcp, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 296 Filed: 6/4/2004, Entered: 6/7/2004, Terminated: 6/8/2004 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION in Limine to Exclude the Testimony of Michael Green, by USA.Service: 6/4/2004 by hand. Response due by 6/18/2004. (jcp, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 295 Filed: 6/4/2004, Entered: 6/7/2004, Terminated: 6/8/2004 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION in Limine to Exclude Testimony or Documentary Evidence Concerning the Effect of the Breach Upon Honfed's Cost of Funds; Honfed's Physical Collateral Delivery Fees to the Federal Home Loan Bank of Seattle; the Hours of Honfed's Managers; the Retention of a Public Relations Firm to Bolster Morale; and Honfed's Modified Capital Ratio Requirement, by USA.Service: 6/4/2004 by hand. Response due by 6/18/2004. (jcp, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 294 Filed: 6/4/2004, Entered: 6/7/2004 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION in Limine to Exclude From Evidence Quotations of the Market Price of the Subordinated Debt of HonFed Bank by Third Parties, by USA.Service: 6/4/2004 by hand. Response due by 6/18/2004. (jcp, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 293 Filed: 6/4/2004, Entered: 6/7/2004 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION in Limine to Exclude in Part the Proposed Expert Testimony of William G. Hamm, by BANK OF AMERICA, FEDERAL SAVINGS BANK.Service: 6/4/2004. Response due by 6/21/2004.(jcp, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 292 Filed: 6/4/2004, Entered: 6/7/2004 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION in Limine to Exclude Evidence of Dividends Paid by Honfed to HFH as an "Offset" to a Restitution Award, by BANK OF AMERICA, FEDERAL SAVINGS BANK.Service: 6/4/2004 by hand. Response due by 6/18/2004.(jcp, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 291 Filed: 6/4/2004, Entered: 6/7/2004, Terminated: 6/17/2004 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION in Limine With Respect to the Burden of Proof Regarding "Offsets" to Pltf's Claimed Damages and Restitution Entitlement, by BANK OF AMERICA, FEDERAL SAVINGS BANK.Service: 6/4/2004 by hand. Response due by 6/18/2004. (jcp, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 290 Filed: 6/2/2004, Entered: 6/4/2004 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER: The court authorizes the issuance of a subpoena for the folllowing additional witness: James Faulstich of Mercer Island, Washington. Signed by Judge John P. Wiese. (jcp, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 289 Filed: 6/1/2004, Entered: 6/3/2004 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION for Leave to File Pltf's Corrected Motion for Authorization of Service of Subpoenas More Than 100 Miles From the Place of Trial, by BANK OF AMERICA, FEDERAL SAVINGS BANK.Service: 6/1/2004. Response due by 6/18/2004. (jcp, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 288 Filed: 5/28/2004, Entered: 6/2/2004 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous ReliefCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER allowing [275] Dft's Motion to Admit Designated Portions of the Deposition Testimony of James Cowles. Signed by Judge John P. Wiese. (jcp, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 287 Filed: 5/28/2004, Entered: 6/2/2004 Order on Motion for ClarificationCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER: [280] Dft's Motion for Clarification of the Court's Order of 5/12/2004 is DENIED without prejudice to reconsideration upon the conclusion of this litigation. Signed by Judge John P. Wiese. (jcp, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 286 Filed: 5/28/2004, Entered: 6/2/2004 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION for Authorization of Service of Subpoenas More Than 100 Miles From the Place of Trial, by BANK OF AMERICA, FEDERAL SAVINGS BANK.Service: 5/28/2004. Response due by 6/14/2004. (jcp, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 285 Filed: 5/27/2004, Entered: 6/1/2004 Order on Motion for Authorization of Service 100+Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER granting [276] Dft's Motion for Authorization of Service of Subpoenas More Than 100 Miles From the Place of Trial. The court authorizes the issuance of subpoenas for the following witnesses: Steven Ko of Indianapolis, Indiana; Preston Martin of San Francisco, Calfornia; MItchell Gilbert of Rocklin, Calfornia; Darrel Dochow of Seattle, Washington; and Duane Thorkildsen of Dallas, Texas. Signed by Judge John P. Wiese. (jcp, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 284 Filed: 5/26/2004, Entered: 5/28/2004 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              RESPONSE to [275] Dft's MOTION to Admit Deposition Testimony of Unavailable Witness, filed by BANK OF AMERICA, FEDERAL SAVINGS BANK. Reply due by 6/9/2004. Service: 5/26/2004.(jcp, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 283 Filed: 5/26/2004, Entered: 5/28/2004 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                RESPONSE to [280] Dft's MOTION for Clarification of [269] Order Dated 5/12/2004, filed by BANK OF AMERICA, FEDERAL SAVINGS BANK. Reply due by 6/9/2004. Service: 5/26/2004.(jcp, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 282 Filed: 5/25/2004, Entered: 5/27/2004 TranscriptCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings in One Volume held on 5/18/2004 before Judge John P. Wiese. (jcp, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 281 Filed: 5/21/2004, Entered: 5/25/2004 Memorandum of Contentions of Fact and Law
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Memorandum of Contentions of Fact and Law by USA. (jcp, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 280 Filed: 5/21/2004, Entered: 5/25/2004, Terminated: 5/28/2004 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION for Clarification of [269] Order Dated 5/12/2004, by USA.Service: 5/21/2004 by hand. Response due by 6/4/2004. (jcp, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 279 Filed: 5/21/2004, Entered: 5/25/2004 Exhibit
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Exhibit List by USA. (jcp, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 278 Filed: 5/21/2004, Entered: 5/25/2004 Response
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          OBJECTIONS to [262] Pltf's Exhibit List filed by USA. Service: 5/21/2004 by hand.(jcp, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 277 Filed: 5/21/2004, Entered: 5/25/2004 Witness List
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Witness List by USA. (jcp, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 276 Filed: 5/21/2004, Entered: 5/25/2004, Terminated: 5/27/2004 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION for Authorization of Service of Subpoenas More Than 100 Miles From the Place of Trial, by USA.Service: 5/21/2004 by hand. Response due by 6/4/2004. (jcp, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 275 Filed: 5/21/2004, Entered: 5/25/2004 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION to Admit Deposition Testimony of Unavailable Witness by USA.Service: 5/21/2004 by hand. Response due by 6/4/2004. (jcp, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 273 Filed: 5/19/2004, Entered: 5/20/2004 Protective OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  PROTECTIVE ORDER: Allowing Pltf to Conduct Voluntary, Confidential Interviews ofJames Faulstich Outside the Presence of Dft's Trial Counsel. Signed by Judge John P. Wiese. (jcp, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 272 Filed: 5/19/2004, Entered: 5/19/2004 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings in One Volume held on 5/10/2004 before Judge John P. Wiese. (jcp, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank -- Filed: 5/19/2004, Entered: 5/19/2004
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Set/Reset Transcript Deadlines: Transcript due by 6/18/2004. (vp1, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 271 Filed: 5/14/2004, Entered: 5/17/2004 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        REPLY to Response to Motion re [270] MOTION for Protective Order filed by BANK OF AMERICA, FEDERAL SAVINGS BANK. Service: 5/14/04.(jat, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 274 Filed: 5/13/2004, Entered: 5/21/2004 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          OPPOSITION to [270] Pltf's MOTION for Protective Order Allowing Pltf to Conduct Voluntary, Confidential Interviews of James Faulstich Outside the Presence of Dft's Trial Counsel, filed by USA. Service: 5/13/2004.(jcp, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 269 Filed: 5/12/2004, Entered: 5/13/2004 Order on Motion to StrikeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER: [263] Dft's Motion to Strike is DENIED, and [264] Pltf's Motion for Leave to File Deposition Transcripts is ALLOWED. Signed by Judge John P. Wiese. (jcp, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 270 Filed: 5/11/2004, Entered: 5/13/2004 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION for Protective Order Allowing Pltf to Conduct Voluntary, Confidential Interviews of James Faulstich Outside the Presence of Dft's Trial Counsel, by BANK OF AMERICA, FEDERAL SAVINGS BANK.Service: 5/11/2004. Response due by 5/28/2004. (jcp, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank -- Filed: 5/11/2004, Entered: 5/11/2004
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Set/Reset Transcript Deadlines: Transcript due by 6/10/2004. (vp1, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank -- Filed: 5/10/2004, Entered: 5/10/2004
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge John P. Wiese : Status Conference held on 5/10/04. (jwg)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 268 Filed: 5/6/2004, Entered: 5/10/2004 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    REPLY BRIEF in Support of [264] Pltf's MOTION for Leave to File Deposition Transcripts, filed by BANK OF AMERICA, FEDERAL SAVINGS BANK. Service: 5/6/2004.(jcp, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 267 Filed: 5/4/2004, Entered: 5/6/2004 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      REPLY in Support of [263] Dft's MOTION to Strike filed by USA. Service: 5/4/2004.(jcp, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 266 Filed: 4/30/2004, Entered: 5/5/2004 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        RESPONSE to [263] MOTION to Strike filed by BANK OF AMERICA, FEDERAL SAVINGS BANK. Reply due by 5/11/2004. Service: 04/30/2004 by hand.(lld, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 265 Filed: 4/29/2004, Entered: 5/3/2004 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          RESPONSE to [264] MOTION for Leave to File Deposition Transcripts filed by USA. Reply due by 5/10/2004. Service by hand: 4/29/04.(dw1)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 264 Filed: 4/21/2004, Entered: 4/23/2004 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION for Leave to File Deposition Transcripts by BANK OF AMERICA, FEDERAL SAVINGS BANK. [FILED BY LEAVE OF THE JUDGE]Service: 4/19/2004 by hand. Response due by 5/3/2004. (jcp, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 263 Filed: 4/19/2004, Entered: 4/21/2004, Terminated: 5/12/2004 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION to Strike the Supplemental Report of Pltf's Expert, DR. Nevins Baxter, by USA.Service: 4/19/2004 by hand. Response due by 5/3/2004. (jcp, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 262 Filed: 4/19/2004, Entered: 4/21/2004 Exhibit
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Exhibit List by BANK OF AMERICA, FEDERAL SAVINGS BANK. (lld, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 261 Filed: 4/19/2004, Entered: 4/21/2004 Witness List
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Witness List by BANK OF AMERICA, FEDERAL SAVINGS BANK. (lld, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 260 Filed: 4/19/2004, Entered: 4/21/2004 Proposed Findings of Uncontroverted Fact
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    PROPOSED FINDINGS of Uncontroverted Fact by BANK OF AMERICA, FEDERAL SAVINGS BANK. Service: 04/19/2004 by hand.(lld, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 259 Filed: 2/11/2004, Entered: 2/18/2004 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Firm Registration as an LLP and Name Change by ROY DOUMANI, LARRY B. THRALL. [FILED BY LEAVE OF THE JUDGE] Service: 2/3/2004.(jcp, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 258 Filed: 1/8/2004, Entered: 1/13/2004 Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        SCHEDULING ORDER: On or before 4/19/2004, pltfs shall file their pretrial submissions pursuant to Appendix A. On or before 5/21/2004, dft shall file its responsive pretrial submissions pursuant to Appendix A. On or before 6/4/2004, the parties shall file any motions in limine. On or before 6/14/2004, the parties shall file their responses to any motions in limine. On or before 6/15/2004, pltfs shall file any objections to dft's exhibits. On or before 6/18/2004, pltfs shall file their responses to any new material presented in dft's proposed findings of fact and conclusions of law. A Pretrial Conference shall be held on Friday, 6/25/2004 02:30 PM in National Courts Building before Senior Judge John P. Wiese. The proceedings will be transcribed. Trial is scheduled to commence on Monday, 7/12/2004 10:00 AM in National Courts Building before Senior Judge John P. Wiese. Signed by Judge John P. Wiese. (jcp, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank -- Filed: 1/8/2004, Entered: 1/8/2004
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge John P. Wiese : Telephone Conference held on 12/19/03. (jwg)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 257 Filed: 12/30/2003, Entered: 1/8/2004 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            JOINT MOTION That the Court Enter an Order Approving the Attached Pretrial Schedule by BANK OF AMERICA, FEDERAL SAVINGS BANK, USA.Service: 12/30/2003. Response due by 1/16/2004. (jcp, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 256 Filed: 12/15/2003, Entered: 12/19/2003 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              RESPONSE to [255] Dft's MOTION for Leave to Respond to Plaintiff's Proposed Schedule filed by BANK OF AMERICA, FEDERAL SAVINGS BANK. Reply due by 12/29/2003. Service: 12/15/03 by hand.(jcp, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 255 Filed: 12/12/2003, Entered: 12/18/2003 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION for Leave to respond to plaintiff's proposed schedule filed by USA. Service: 12/12/03. Response due by 12/29/2003 (Response included in motion)(dls)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 254 Filed: 12/3/2003, Entered: 12/9/2003 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION for Leave to File Bank of America's Proposed Schedule by BANK OF AMERICA, FEDERAL SAVINGS BANK. [PROPOSED SCHEDULE ATTACHED TO MOTION]Service: 12/3/03. Response due by 12/22/2003. (jcp, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 253 Filed: 11/18/2003, Entered: 11/24/2003 Order on Motion to Dismiss - Rule 12(b)(1)Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER: For the reasons set forth above, [244] Dft's Motion for Reconsideration, titled "Dft's Renewed Motion to Dismiss Based Upon New Evidence," is denied. Signed by Judge John P. Wiese. (jcp, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 252 Filed: 11/5/2003, Entered: 11/10/2003 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER: Pursuant to dft's motion for a show cause order and on the basis of the facts and reasons set forth above, the court now directs the following: 1) The non-contract claims recited in the Bank's complaint, specifically Counts IV, V, VI, and VII, are dismissed pursuant to Rule 12(b)(6) for failure to state claims upon which relief can be granted. 2) The takings claim recited in Count IV of the shareholder-plaintiff's first amended complaint, the only claim still remaining in their action, is dismissed pursuant to Rule 12(b)(6) for failure to state a claim upon which relief can be granted. 3) The entry of judgment consistent with this order will be entered upon the conclusion of all remaining proceedings in this case. Signed by Judge John P. Wiese. (jcp, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank -- Filed: 11/3/2003, Entered: 11/3/2003
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge John P. Wiese : Telephone Conference held on 11/03/03. (jwg)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank -- Filed: 8/15/2003, Entered: 8/15/2003
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge John P. Wiese : Telephone Conference held on 8/12/03. (jwg)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 251 Filed: 8/13/2003, Entered: 8/18/2003 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER: Please take notice that in the above case, there has been entered this day on [247] Dft's MOTION, filed June 25, 2003 for a Show Cause Order, the following Order: RULING DEFERRED PENDING THE FEDERAL CIRCUIT'S DECISION IN BAILEY V. UNITED STATES, NO. 02-5170. Signed by Judge John P. Wiese. (jcp, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 250 Filed: 7/28/2003, Entered: 7/30/2003 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              REPLY in Support of [247] Dft's MOTION for Order Requiring Pltf Bank of America, FSB and Shareholder Pltfs Thrall and Doumani to Show Cause Why Their Non-Contract Counts Should Not Be Dismissed For Failure To State A Claim For Which Relief May Be Granted filed by USA. Service: 7/28/03.(jcp, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 249 Filed: 7/14/2003, Entered: 7/16/2003 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                RESPONSE/OPPOSITION to [247] Dft's MOTION for Order to Show Cause filed by ROY DOUMANI, LARRY B. THRALL. Reply due by 7/28/2003. Service: 7/14/03.(jcp, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 248 Filed: 7/14/2003, Entered: 7/16/2003 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  RESPONSE to [247] Dft's MOTION for Order to Show Cause filed by BANK OF AMERICA, FEDERAL SAVINGS BANK. Reply due by 7/28/2003. Service: 7/14/03.(jcp, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 247 Filed: 6/25/2003, Entered: 6/26/2003 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION for Show Cause Order requiring plaintiff Bank of America, FSB and shareholder plaintiffs Thrall and Doumani to show cause why their non-contract counts should not be dismissed by UNITED STATES.Service: 6/25/03. Response due by 7/14/2003 (jcp, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 246 Filed: 5/19/2003, Entered: 5/27/2003 Description not available
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      REPLY to Response re [244] MOTION to Dismiss pursuant to Rule 12(b)(1) filed by UNITED STATES. Service: 5/19/03.(hw1, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 245 Filed: 5/6/2003, Entered: 5/9/2003 Response to MotionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        RESPONSE to Motion re [244] MOTION to Dismiss pursuant to Rule 12(b)(1) filed by BANK OF AMERICA, FEDERAL SAVINGS BANK, by leave of the Judge. Reply due by 5/15/2003. Service: 5/1/03.(dw1, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 244 Filed: 4/11/2003, Entered: 4/17/2003, Terminated: 11/18/2003 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          RENEWED MOTION to Dismiss based upon new evidence by The United States.Service by hand: 4/11/03. Response due by 5/9/2003. (dw1, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 243 Filed: 4/10/2003, Entered: 4/10/2003 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER vacating March 21, 2003 [240] Judgment Signed by Judge John P. Wiese. (lld, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank -- Filed: 4/9/2003, Entered: 4/9/2003
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge John P. Wiese : Telephone Conference held on 4/8/03 to discuss Thrall and Doumani's 4/4/03 motion to amend judgment. (jwg, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 242 Filed: 4/4/2003, Entered: 4/9/2003 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION for Reconsideration re [240] Judgment by ROY DOUMANI and LARRY B. THRALL. Service: 4/4/03. Response due by 4/21/2003. (dw1, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 240 Filed: 3/21/2003, Entered: 3/21/2003
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  JUDGMENT entered, pursuant to Rule 58, that the complaints of investor-plaintiffs Beverly W. Thrall (successor by operation of law to the claims of Larry B. Thrall) and Roy Doumani are dismissed. (lld, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 239 Filed: 3/21/2003, Entered: 3/21/2003 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    PUBLISHED ORDER and OPINION granting plaintiff Bank of America's motion for partial summary judgment on liability filed June 3, 1998, granting defendant's cross-motion for summary judgment on liability, filed June 3, 1998, with respect to plaintiff Bank of America's claims and granted with respect to the investors' claims, denying defendant's motion to dismiss and alternative motion for summary judgment on liability, filed October 10, 2000, with respect to plaintiff Bank of America's claims and granting with respect to investors' claims, denying investors' motion for partial summary judgment on liability, filed October 19, 2000, granting [164] Motion for Summary Judgment filed by The United States, denying [166] Motion for Summary Judgment filed by LARRY B. THRALL, GERALD L. PARSKY, granting [172] Motion for Summary Judgment filed by BANK OF AMERICA, FEDERAL SAVINGS BANK. The Clerk is directed to enter judgment, as there is no just reason for delay, pursuant to Rule 54(b) dismissing the complaints of investor-plaintiffs Beverly W. Thrall (successor by operation of law to the claims of Larry B. Thrall) and Roy Doumani. Signed by Judge John P. Wiese. (lld, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 241 Filed: 3/20/2003, Entered: 3/24/2003 Response to MotionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      RESPONSE to Motion, re [237] Motion for Leave to Notify the Court of New Authority, filed by BANK OF AMERICA, FEDERAL SAVINGS BANK. Reply due 4/2/2003. Service: 3/19/03. Filed by leave of the Judge. (lrd)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 238 Filed: 3/13/2003, Entered: 3/14/2003 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER granting [237-1] motion for Leave to notify the Court of new authority, Centex II (signed by Judge John P. Wiese). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 237 Filed: 3/11/2003, Entered: 3/12/2003, Terminated: 3/13/2003 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION by LARRY B. THRALL, ROY DOUMANI (Service: 3/11/03) for Leave to notify the Court of new authority, Centex II . Response due: 3/28/03. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank -- Filed: 3/4/2003, Entered: 3/4/2003
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Oral Argument re: [172-1] motion for Partial Summary Judgment as to claim of ownership by BANK OF AMERICA, FSB ( Transcript due 4/3/03 ), [166-1] motion for Summary Judgment by LARRY B. THRALL, GERALD L. PARSKY ( Transcript due 4/3/03 ), [164-1] motion for Summary Judgment by USA ( Transcript due 4/3/03 ) (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 236 Filed: 2/20/2003, Entered: 3/4/2003 Transcript
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              TRANSCRIPT of proceedings re: 1 volume, at Washington, D.C., for date of February 11, 2003, exhibits: Pltfs. 1-3. Notice to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 235 Filed: 2/10/2003, Entered: 2/20/2003 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION by BANK OF AMERICA, FSB (Service: 2/10/03) proposing oral argument schedule . Response due: 2/27/03. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 234 Filed: 2/5/2003, Entered: 2/13/2003 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  RESPONSE by USA (Service: 2/5/03) to [227-1] motion for Leave to notify the court of new authority: LaSalLe Talman, [226-1] motion for Leave to notify the court of new authority: Franklin Federal. Reply due: 2/18/03. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 231 Filed: 1/29/2003, Entered: 2/6/2003 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER granting [227-1] motion for Leave to notify the court of new authority: LaSalLe Talman (signed by Judge John P. Wiese). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 230 Filed: 1/29/2003, Entered: 2/6/2003 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER granting [228-1] motion to Correct certificate of service (signed by Judge John P. Wiese). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 229 Filed: 1/29/2003, Entered: 2/6/2003 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER granting [226-1] motion for Leave to notify the court of new authority: Franklin Federal (signed by Judge John P. Wiese). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 232 Filed: 1/28/2003, Entered: 2/7/2003 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          RESPONSE by BANK OF AMERICA, FSB (Service: 1/28/03) to [227-1] motion for Leave to notify the court of new authority: LaSalLe Talman, [226-1] motion for Leave to notify the court of new authority: Franklin Federal. Reply due: 2/11/03. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 228 Filed: 1/24/2003, Entered: 1/31/2003, Terminated: 1/29/2003 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION by LARRY B. THRALL, ROY DOUMANI (Service: 1/24/03) to Correct certificate of service . Response due: 2/10/03. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 227 Filed: 1/23/2003, Entered: 1/30/2003, Terminated: 1/29/2003 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION by LARRY B. THRALL (Service : 1/23/03 ) for Leave to notify the court of new authority: LaSalLe Talman . Response due: 2/10/03 (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 226 Filed: 1/23/2003, Entered: 1/30/2003, Terminated: 1/29/2003 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION by LARRY B. THRALL, ROY DOUMANI (Service : 1/23/03 ) for Leave to notify the court of new authority: Franklin Federal . Response due: 2/10/03 (HW) Modified on 01/30/2003
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 233 Filed: 1/16/2003, Entered: 2/11/2003 Response
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  RESPONSE by BANK OF AMERICA, FSB, LARRY B. THRALL, ROY DOUMANI to notice of supplemental authority: Standard Federal. Service: 1/16/03. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 225 Filed: 1/13/2003, Entered: 1/21/2003 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER granting [222-1] motion for Leave to file notice of supplemental authority (signed by Judge John P. Wiese). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 223 Filed: 1/9/2003, Entered: 1/14/2003 Response to MotionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      RESPONSE by BANK OF AMERICA, FSB (Service: 1/6/03) to [222-1] motion for Leave to file notice of supplemental authority. Reply due: 1/21/03. Filed by leave of the Judge. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 222 Filed: 1/8/2003, Entered: 1/13/2003, Terminated: 1/13/2003 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION by USA (Service: 1/8/03) for Leave to file notice of supplemental authority . Response due: 1/27/03. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 221 Filed: 1/2/2003, Entered: 1/7/2003 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER granting [220-1] motion for Leave to file notice of supplemenatl authority (signed by Judge John P. Wiese). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 220 Filed: 12/26/2002, Entered: 1/2/2003, Terminated: 1/2/2003 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION by USA (Service: 12/26/02) for Leave to file notice of supplemenatl authority . Response due: 1/13/03 (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 224 Filed: 12/3/2002, Entered: 1/15/2003 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER re: motion to intervene and for expedited consideration of that motions are deemed moot as essentially having been granted ( signed by Judge John P. Wiese ) Copy to parties. (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 218 Filed: 12/3/2002, Entered: 12/19/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER granting [133-1] motion to Expedite consideration of his motion for leave to intervene and amend complaint (signed by Judge John P. Wiese ). Copy to parties. (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 217 Filed: 12/3/2002, Entered: 12/4/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER oral argument set for 2:30 p.m. on 2/11/03 for [172-1] motion for Partial Summary Judgment as to claim of ownership, [166-1] motion for Summary Judgment and [164-1] motion for Summary Judgment (signed by Judge John P. Wiese). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 219 Filed: 11/22/2002, Entered: 12/29/2002 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION by USA (Service: 11/22/02) for Oral Argument . (DS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 215 Filed: 10/8/2002, Entered: 10/9/2002 ResponseCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      RESPONSE by USA to [213-1] notice of new authority by ROY DOUMANI. Service: 10/4/02. Filed by leave of the Judge. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 216 Filed: 10/3/2002, Entered: 10/24/2002 Notice of Change of Address
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of change of address by Steven S. Rosenthal. (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 214 Filed: 10/1/2002, Entered: 10/8/2002 ResponseCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          RESPONSE to shareholder plaintiff's notice of new authority by USA, filed by leave of the Judge. Service: 9/27/02 (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 213 Filed: 9/24/2002, Entered: 9/27/2002 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of New Authority by ROY DOUMANI. Service: 9/17/02 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 212 Filed: 9/24/2002, Entered: 9/27/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER granting [209-1] motion for Leave to file proposed Intervenor Doumani's notice of new authority. ( signed by Judge John P. Wiese ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 211 Filed: 9/24/2002, Entered: 9/27/2002 ResponseCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                RESPONSE by BANK OF AMERICA, FSB to [207-1] notice by LARRY B. THRALL. Filed by leave of the Judge. Service: 9/17/02 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 210 Filed: 9/17/2002, Entered: 9/23/2002 Stipulation
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Stipulation by USA, BANK OF AMERICA, FSB, GERALD L. PARSKY, LARRY B. THRALL, ROY DOUMANI of dismissal of plaintiff GERALD l. PARSKY's claims related to Honolulu Federal Savings and Loan Association. (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 209 Filed: 9/17/2002, Entered: 9/20/2002, Terminated: 9/24/2002 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION by ROY DOUMANI (Service: 9/17/02) for Leave to file proposed Intervenor Doumani's notice of new authority . Response due: 10/4/02. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 208 Filed: 9/17/2002, Entered: 9/19/2002 ResponseCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      RESPONSE by USA to Shareholder Plaintiffs' Notice of New Authority, by leave of the Judge. Service: 9/13/02. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 207 Filed: 9/13/2002, Entered: 9/18/2002 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of New Authority: Franklin Federal Savings Bank, et al. v. U.S. by LARRY B. THRALL. Service: 9/10/02 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 206 Filed: 9/13/2002, Entered: 9/18/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER granting [205-1] motion for Leave to File notice of new authority. ( signed by Judge John P. Wiese ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 205 Filed: 9/10/2002, Entered: 9/18/2002, Terminated: 9/13/2002 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION by LARRY B. THRALL (Service : 9/9/02 ) for Leave to File notice of new authority. Response due: 9/25/02 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 204 Filed: 9/10/2002, Entered: 9/13/2002 ResponseCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              RESPONSE by BANK OF AMERICA, FSB to [192-1] notice by GERALD L. PARSKY and LARRY B. THRALL. Service: 9/5/02. Filed by leave of the Judge. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 203 Filed: 9/4/2002, Entered: 9/6/2002 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of new authority by BANK OF AMERICA, FSB. Service: 8/27/02. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 202 Filed: 9/4/2002, Entered: 9/6/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER granting [201-1] motion for Leave to file notice of new authority (signed by Judge John P. Wiese). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 201 Filed: 8/26/2002, Entered: 8/29/2002, Terminated: 9/4/2002 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION by BANK OF AMERICA, FSB (Service: 8/26/02) for Leave to file notice of new authority . Response due: 9/13/02. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 200 Filed: 8/19/2002, Entered: 8/22/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER granting [198-1] motion for Leave to file notice of supplemental authority (signed by Judge John P. Wiese). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 199 Filed: 8/19/2002, Entered: 8/22/2002 ResponseCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        RESPONSE by GERALD L. PARSKY and LARRY B. THRALL to notices of authority. Service: 8/16/02. Filed by leave of the Judge. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 198 Filed: 8/15/2002, Entered: 8/16/2002, Terminated: 8/19/2002 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION by BANK OF AMERICA, FSB (Service: 8/15/02) for Leave to file notice of supplemental authority . Response due: 9/3/02. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 197 Filed: 8/12/2002, Entered: 8/14/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER granting [196-1] motion for Leave to file notice of supplemental authority (signed by Judge John P. Wiese). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 196 Filed: 8/6/2002, Entered: 8/7/2002, Terminated: 8/12/2002 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION by USA (Service: 8/6/02) for Leave to file notice of supplemental authority . Response due: 8/23/02. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 195 Filed: 7/1/2002, Entered: 7/2/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER granting [194-1] motion for Leave to File Notice of Supplemental Authority. ( signed by Judge John P. Wiese ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 194 Filed: 6/24/2002, Entered: 6/25/2002, Terminated: 7/1/2002 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  CORRECTED COPY - MOTION by BANK OF AMERICA, FSB (Service : 6/11/02 ) for Leave to File Notice of Supplemental Authority. Response due: 6/28/02 (JT) Modified on 06/25/2002
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 193 Filed: 6/24/2002, Entered: 6/25/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER re: Plaintiffs' corrected motion, received on 6/21/02, for leave to file notice of new authority shall be filed this day. ( signed by Judge John P. Wiese ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 192 Filed: 6/13/2002, Entered: 6/14/2002 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of New Authority by LARRY B. THRALL, GERALD L. PARSKY Service: 6/7/02 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 191 Filed: 6/13/2002, Entered: 6/14/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER granting [189-1] motion for Leave to file Notice of New Authority. ( signed by Judge John P. Wiese ) Copy to parties. (JT) Modified on 06/14/2002
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 190 Filed: 6/11/2002, Entered: 6/12/2002 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION by BANK OF AMERICA, FSB (Service : 6/11/02 ) for Leave to File Notice of Supplemental Authority. Response due: 6/28/02 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 189 Filed: 6/7/2002, Entered: 6/10/2002, Terminated: 6/13/2002 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION by GERALD L. PARSKY and LARRY B. THRALL (Service : 6/7/02 ) for Leave to to file Notice of New Authority (Centex) Response due: 6/24/02 (AB)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 188 Filed: 6/3/2002, Entered: 6/4/2002 Reply to Response to MotionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              REPLY by BANK OF AMERICA, FSB to response to [172-1] motion for Partial Summary Judgment as to claim of ownership. Service: 5/31/02. Filed by leave of the Judge. FILED UNDER SEAL. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 187 Filed: 5/31/2002, Entered: 6/3/2002 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                REPLY by GERALD L. PARSKY, LARRY B. THRALL to response to [166-1] motion for Summary Judgment. Service: 5/31/02 (DS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 186 Filed: 5/31/2002, Entered: 6/3/2002 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  REPLY by USA to response to [164-1] motion for Summary Judgment. Service: 5/31/02 (DS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 185 Filed: 5/21/2002, Entered: 5/22/2002 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    RESPONSE by GERALD L. PARSKY, LARRY B. THRALL (Service: 5/17/02) to [164-1] motion for Summary Judgment, [172-1] motion for Partial Summary Judgment as to claim of ownership filed [by leave of the judge]. Reply due: 5/31/02 (DS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 184 Filed: 5/21/2002, Entered: 5/22/2002 Response
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      RESPONSE by GERALD L. PARSKY, LARRY B. THRALL to [163-1] proposed findings by USA filed [by leave of the judge]. Service: 5/17/02 (DS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 183 Filed: 5/21/2002, Entered: 5/22/2002 Response
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        RESPONSE by GERALD L. PARSKY, LARRY B. THRALL to [171-1] proposed findings by BANK OF AMERICA, FSB filed [by leave of the judge]. Service: 5/17/02 (DS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 182 Filed: 5/17/2002, Entered: 5/22/2002 Response
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          RESPONSE by USA to [165-1] proposed findings by LARRY B. THRALL, GERALD L. PARSKY. Service: 5/17/02 (DS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 181 Filed: 5/17/2002, Entered: 5/21/2002 Response
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            RESPONSE by USA to [171-1] proposed findings by BANK OF AMERICA, FSB. Service: 5/17/02 (DS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 180 Filed: 5/17/2002, Entered: 5/21/2002 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              RESPONSE by USA (Service: 5/17/02) to [172-1] motion for Partial Summary Judgment as to claim of ownership. Reply due: 5/31/02 (DS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 179 Filed: 5/17/2002, Entered: 5/21/2002 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                RESPONSE, together with a separate volume of appendix, by USA (Service: 5/17/02) to [166-1] motion for Summary Judgment. Reply due: 5/31/02 (DS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 178 Filed: 5/17/2002, Entered: 5/21/2002 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  RESPONSE, together with a separate volume of appendix, by BANK OF AMERICA (Service: 5/17/02) to [166-1] motion for Summary Judgment, [164-1] motion for Summary Judgment FILED UNDER SEAL. Reply due: 5/31/02 (per court order) (DS) Modified on 05/21/2002
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 177 Filed: 5/17/2002, Entered: 5/21/2002 Response
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    RESPONSE by BANK OF AMERICA to [165-1] proposed findings by LARRY B. THRALL, GERALD L. PARSKY FILED UNDER SEAL. Service: 5/17/02 (DS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 176 Filed: 5/17/2002, Entered: 5/21/2002 Response
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      RESPONSE by BANK OF AMERICA to [163-1] proposed findings by USA FILED UNDER SEAL. Service: 5/17/02 (DS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 175 Filed: 5/7/2002, Entered: 5/8/2002 Memorandum
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        CORRECTED COPY of Motion for Partial Summary Judgment as to Claim Ownership filed by BANK OF AMERICA pursuant to [174-1] order. UNDER SEAL. Service: 4/25/02. (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 174 Filed: 5/7/2002, Entered: 5/8/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER granting [167-1] motion for Leave to file corrected copies of motion for partial summary judgment ( signed by Judge John P. Wiese ) Copy to parties. (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 173 Filed: 5/6/2002, Entered: 5/7/2002 AffidavitCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            DECLARATION of JOHN C. FAUVRE by BANK OF AMERICA, by leave of the Judge. Service 5/6/02. [FILED UNDER SEAL] (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 172 Filed: 5/6/2002, Entered: 5/7/2002 Terminated: Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION, together with two volumes of appendix, by BANK OF AMERICA (Service: 4/24/02) for Partial Summary Judgment as to claim of ownership , by leave of the Judge. Response due: 5/17/02. [FILED UNDER SEAL] (FE) Modified on 05/21/2002
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 171 Filed: 5/6/2002, Entered: 5/7/2002 Proposed Findings of Uncontroverted FactCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                PROPOSED FINDINGS of Uncontroverted Fact by BANK OF AMERICA, by leave of the Judge. [FILED UNDER SEAL] Service: 4/24/02. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 170 Filed: 5/6/2002, Entered: 5/7/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER granting [168-1] motion for Leave to file notice of supplemental authority (signed by Judge John P. Wiese) Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 169 Filed: 5/6/2002, Entered: 5/7/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER granting [162-1] motion for Leave to file notice of supplemental authority (signed by Judge John P. Wiese). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank -- Filed: 5/6/2002, Entered: 5/7/2002 Set/Reset Deadlines:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Deadline updated; Reply to Response to Motion reset to 5/31/02 for [172-1] motion for Partial Summary Judgment as to claim of ownership (filed with a two [2] volume appendix in support) . (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 168 Filed: 5/3/2002, Entered: 5/6/2002, Terminated: 5/6/2002 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION by USA (Service: 5/3/02) for Leave to file notice of supplemental authority . Response due: 5/20/02. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 167 Filed: 4/25/2002, Entered: 4/26/2002, Terminated: 5/7/2002 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION by BANK OF AMERICA (Service: 4/25/02) for Leave to file corrected copies of motion for partial summary judgment . Response due: 5/13/02 (DS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 166 Filed: 4/24/2002, Entered: 4/25/2002 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION, together with a separate volume of appendix, by GERALD L. PARSKY, LARRY B. THRALL (Service: 4/24/02) for Summary Judgment on ownership of claims for breach of contract. Response due: 5/17/02 (per court order) (DS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 165 Filed: 4/24/2002, Entered: 4/25/2002 Proposed Findings of Uncontroverted Fact
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              PROPOSED FINDINGS of Uncontroverted Fact filed by GERALD L. PARSKY, LARRY B. THRALL. Service: 4/24/02 (DS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 164 Filed: 4/24/2002, Entered: 4/25/2002, Terminated: 3/21/2003 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION by USA (Service: 4/24/02) for Summary Judgment on the "Claim Ownership" issue. Response due: 5/17/02 (per court order) (DS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 163 Filed: 4/24/2002, Entered: 4/25/2002 Proposed Findings of Uncontroverted Fact
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  PROPOSED FINDINGS of Uncontroverted Fact filed by USA. Service: 4/24/02 (DS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 162 Filed: 4/24/2002, Entered: 4/24/2002, Terminated: 5/6/2002 Motion for Leave to File
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION by USA (Service: 4/24/02) for Leave to file notice of supplemental authority . Response due: 5/13/02. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 161 Filed: 4/8/2002, Entered: 4/9/2002 Response
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      RESPONSE by BANK OF AMERICA, to [156-1] supplemental brief by USA. Service: 4/8/02. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 160 Filed: 4/8/2002, Entered: 4/9/2002 Response
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        RESPONSE by GERALD L. PARSKY, LARRY B. THRALL to [156-1] supplemental memorandum by USA. Service: 4/8/02. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 159 Filed: 4/8/2002, Entered: 4/9/2002 Response
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          RESPONSE by USA to [158-1] supplemental brief by LARRY B. THRALL, GERALD L. PARSKY. Service: 4/8/02. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 158 Filed: 3/18/2002, Entered: 3/19/2002 MemorandumCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            SUPPLEMENTAL MEMORANDUM on liability by GERALD L. PARSKY, LARRY B. THRALL. Service: 3/15/02. Filed by leave of the Judge. (LTD) Modified on 03/19/2002
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank -- Filed: 3/18/2002, Entered: 3/19/2002 Set/Reset Deadlines:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Deadline updated; Response to supplemental memorandum by Thrall and Parsky due 4/8/02 . (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 157 Filed: 3/15/2002, Entered: 3/18/2002 Response
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEF ON LIABILITY by BANK OF AMERICA, pursuant to [155-3] order. Service: 3/15/02. (LTD) Modified on 03/18/2002
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 156 Filed: 3/15/2002, Entered: 3/18/2002 Memorandum
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Supplemental brief regarding liability filed by USA. Service: 3/15/02 (DS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank -- Filed: 3/15/2002, Entered: 3/18/2002 Set/Reset Deadlines:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Deadline updated; Defendant's response to Plaintiff's supplemental brief on liability due 4/8/02 (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 155 Filed: 2/13/2002, Entered: 2/14/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER granting [154-1] joint motion for an amended scheduling schedule . Parties shall file Supplemental Briefs on Liability by deadline of 3/15/02 ; with Responses by 4/8/02. Motions for Partial Summary Judgment on the "Claim Ownership" Issue shall be filed by Motion Filing deadline of 4/24/02 ; with Responses due 5/17/02; and Replies due 5/31/02 ( signed by Judge John P. Wiese ) Copy to parties. (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 154 Filed: 2/11/2002, Entered: 2/14/2002, Terminated: 2/13/2002 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        JOINT MOTION by USA, BANK OF AMERICA, for an amended scheduling schedule : (1) Simultaneous Supplemental Briefs on Liability by 3/15/02; (2) Responses to Supplemental Briefs on Liability by 4/8/02; (3) Motions for Partial Summary Judgment on the "Claim Ownership" Issue by 4/24/02; (4) Responses to motions for Partial Summary Judgment on "Ownership" Issues by 5/17/02; and (5) Replies in Support of Motions for Summary Judgment on the "Claim Ownership" by 5/31/02 (HW) Modified on 02/14/2002
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank -- Filed: 2/1/2002, Entered: 2/1/2002
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          CASE reassigned to Judge John P. Wiese . (DS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 153 Filed: 1/24/2002, Entered: 1/25/2002 Transcript
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            TRANSCRIPT of proceedings re: status conference, 1 volume, at Washington, D.C., for date of January 23, 2002. Notice to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 152 Filed: 1/24/2002, Entered: 1/24/2002 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER vacating [149-1] order Parties joint briefing schedule due 3/1/02 and parties' summaries of the case due 3/25/02 (signed by Judge John P. Wiese). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 151 Filed: 1/24/2002, Entered: 1/24/2002 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER mooting [150-1] motion for Clarification of order concerning Motion to Stay (signed by Judge John P. Wiese). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank -- Filed: 1/23/2002, Entered: 1/24/2002 Status Conference
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Status Conference held ( Transcript due 2/22/02 ) (DS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank -- Filed: 1/22/2002, Entered: 1/23/2002 Status Conference
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Status Conference set at 3:00 p.m. on 1/23/02 (DS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 150 Filed: 1/18/2002, Entered: 1/18/2002, Terminated: 1/24/2002 Motion for Clarification
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION by USA (Service: 1/18/02) for Clarification of order concerning Motion to Stay . Response due: 2/4/02. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 149 Filed: 1/17/2002, Entered: 1/17/2002, Terminated: 1/24/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER granting [147-1] motion to Stay pending Supreme Court decision (signed by Judge John P. Wiese). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 148 Filed: 1/16/2002, Entered: 1/17/2002 Published DecisionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          PUBLISHED DECISION (signed by Judge John P. Wiese). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 147 Filed: 1/14/2002, Entered: 1/15/2002, Terminated: 1/17/2002 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION by GERALD L. PARSKY and LARRY B. THRALL (Service: 1/14/02) to Stay pending Supreme Court decision. Response due: 1/31/02. (FILED WITH NOTICE OF GRANT OF CERTIORARI). (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 147 Filed: 1/14/2002, Entered: 1/15/2002, Terminated: 1/17/2002 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Grant of Certiorari by GERALD L. PARSKY and LARRY B. THRALL. Service: 1/14/02. (FILED WITH MOTION FOR STAY PENDING SUPREME COURT DECISION). (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 146 Filed: 1/11/2002, Entered: 1/11/2002 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Notice of reassignment to Judge John P. Wiese, effective, February 1, 2002. Copy to parties. (DS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 145 Filed: 1/7/2002, Entered: 1/8/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER re: reassignment of cases. ( signed by Sr. Judge Loren A. Smith ) Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 144 Filed: 12/21/2001, Entered: 12/21/2001
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    TRANSCRIPT of proceedings re: 1 volume, at Washington, D.C., for date of December 18, 2001. Notice to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank -- Filed: 12/18/2001, Entered: 1/23/2002 Oral Argument
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Oral Argument re: [105-1] motion to Dismiss pursuant to statute of limitations by USA ( Transcript due 1/17/02 ), [106-1] cross motion by USA ( Transcript due 1/17/02 ) (DS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 143 Filed: 12/5/2001, Entered: 12/6/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER oral argument set for 2:30 p.m. on 12/18/01 for [105-1] motion to Dismiss pursuant to statute of limitations and for [106-1] cross motion (signed by Judge John P. Wiese). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 142 Filed: 11/14/2001, Entered: 11/16/2001 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          RESPONSE by BANK OF AMERICA, (Service: 11/14/01 ) to [105-1] motion to Dismiss pursuant to statute of limitations. Reply due: 12/3/01. (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 141 Filed: 11/7/2001, Entered: 11/8/2001 Transcript
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            TRANSCRIPT of proceedings re: status conference (one volume), taken at Washington, DC, on October 24, 2001. Notice to parties. (DS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 140 Filed: 11/2/2001, Entered: 11/5/2001 Response
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              RESPONSE by USA to [139-2] order. Service: 11/2/01. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 139 Filed: 10/25/2001, Entered: 10/26/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER Defendant's response to Plaintiffs' sur-reply due 11/2/01 and Plaintiff's reply due 11/14/01 . Replies shall not exceed five pages (signed by Judge John P. Wiese). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank -- Filed: 10/24/2001, Entered: 11/8/2001 Status Conference
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Status Conference held ( Transcript due 11/23/01 ) (DS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank -- Filed: 10/22/2001, Entered: 11/8/2001 Status Conference
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Status Conference set at 3:00 p.m. on 10/24/01 (DS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 138 Filed: 8/14/2001, Entered: 8/15/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER referring the Government's renewed motion to dismiss to Judge Wiese for determination. Case Nos. 95-660C, 75-7311C, 95-7971C, 95-8031C (consolidated) but will remain on former Chief Judge Smith's docket unless and until Judge Wiese grants the government's renewed motion (signed by Chief Judge Lawrence M. Baskir). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 137 Filed: 5/14/2001, Entered: 5/15/2001 ~Notice (other)Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of filing relating to motion to intervene by ROY DOUMANI, file by leave of the Judge. Service: 5/2/01. (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 136 Filed: 5/10/2001, Entered: 5/11/2001 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of COMPULSORY PROCESS by BANK OF AMERICA. Service: 5/10/01. (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 135 Filed: 5/9/2001, Entered: 5/10/2001 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            RESPONSE by USA (Service: 5/9/01) to [133-1] motion to Expedite consideration of his motion for leave to intervene and amend complaint. Reply due: 5/21/01. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 134 Filed: 5/1/2001, Entered: 5/8/2001 Notice of Change of Address
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of change of address by Steven S. Rosenthal. (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 133 Filed: 5/1/2001, Entered: 5/2/2001, Terminated: 12/3/2002 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION by ROY DOUMANI (Service : 5/1/01 ) to Expedite consideration of his motion for leave to intervene and amend complaint . Response due: 5/18/01. (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 132 Filed: 4/26/2001, Entered: 5/1/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER granting [123-1] motion to Stay Expert Discovery pending resolution of statute of limitations issues, granting [122-1] motion for Leave to file corrected response, granting [118-1] motion to transfer for resolution of statue of limitations issue (signed by Senior Judge Loren A. Smith). Case transferred to Judge John P. Wiese. Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 131 Filed: 3/8/2001, Entered: 3/13/2001 Reply to Response to MotionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    REPLY by ROY DOUMANI to response to [129-1] motion for Leave to file notice of new authority, filed by leave of the Judge. Service: 1/25/01 (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 130 Filed: 3/8/2001, Entered: 3/13/2001 Response to MotionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      RESPONSE by USA (Service: 1/16/01 ) to [129-1] motion for Leave to file notice of new authority, filed by leave of the Judge. Reply due: 2/2/01 (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 129 Filed: 3/8/2001, Entered: 3/13/2001 Terminated: Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION by ROY DOUMANI (Service : 1/4/01 ) for Leave to file notice of new authority , filed by leave of the Judge. Response due: 1/22/01 (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 128 Filed: 3/7/2001, Entered: 3/13/2001 ~Notice (other)Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of filings by ROY DOUMANI, (proposed intervenor), relating to motion to intervene, filed by leave of the Judge. Service: 1/25/01. (HW) Modified on 03/13/2001
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 127 Filed: 3/7/2001, Entered: 3/8/2001 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            REPLY by BANK OF AMERICA, to response to [119-1] motion for Leave to file a surreply in opposition to renewed motion to dismiss pursuant to statue of limitations. Service: 3/7/01. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 126 Filed: 2/26/2001, Entered: 2/27/2001 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              RESPONSE by USA (Service by hand: 2/26/01 ) to [119-1] motion for Leave to file a surreply in opposition to renewed motion to dismiss pursuant to statue of limitations. Reply due: 3/7/01 (LTD) Modified on 03/01/2001
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank -- Filed: 2/26/2001, Entered: 3/1/2001 Set/Reset Deadlines:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Deadline updated; Reply to Response to Motion reset to 3/7/01 for [119-1] motion for Leave to file a surreply in opposition to renewed motion to dismiss pursuant to statue of limitations (AB)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 125 Filed: 2/22/2001, Entered: 2/23/2001 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  REPLY by USA to response to [118-1] motion to transfer for resolution of statue of limitations issue . Service: 2/22/01 (DS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 124 Filed: 2/16/2001, Entered: 2/20/2001 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    RESPONSE by USA (Service: 2/16/01 ) to [123-1] motion to Stay Expert Discovery pending resolution of statute of limitations issues. Reply due: 3/5/01. (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 123 Filed: 2/14/2001, Entered: 2/16/2001, Terminated: 4/26/2001 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION by HONKIDS PARTNERS, WILLIAM E. SIMON, GERALD L. PARSKY, LARRY B. THRALL, WILLIAM E. SIMON JR., J. PETER SIMON, GEORGE GILLESPIE III (Service: 2/14/01) to Stay Expert Discovery pending resolution of statute of limitations issues Response due: 3/5/01. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 122 Filed: 2/13/2001, Entered: 2/15/2001 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION by BANK OF AMERICA, (Service : 2/13/01 ) for Leave to file corrected response . Response due: 3/2/01 (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 121 Filed: 2/9/2001, Entered: 2/12/2001 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          RESPONSE by HONKIDS PARTNERS, GERALD L. PARSKY, WILLIAM E. SIMON JR., J. PETER SIMON and GEORGE GILLESPIE III(Service: 2/9/01) to [118-1] motion to transfer for resolution of statue of limitations issue. Reply due: 2/23/01. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 120 Filed: 2/9/2001, Entered: 2/12/2001 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            RESPONSE by BANK OF AMERICA and LARRY B. THRALL (Service: 2/9/01) to [118-1] motion to transfer for resolution of statue of limitations issue. Reply due: 2/23/01. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 119 Filed: 2/9/2001, Entered: 2/12/2001 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION by BANK OF AMERICA and LARRY B. THRALL (Service: 2/9/01) for Leave to file a surreply in opposition to renewed motion to dismiss pursuant to statue of limitations . Response due: 2/26/01. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 118 Filed: 1/23/2001, Entered: 1/24/2001 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION by USA (Service: 1/23/01) to transfer for resolution of statue of limitations issue . Response due: 2/9/01. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 117 Filed: 1/16/2001, Entered: 1/18/2001 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  REPLY by WILLIAM E. SIMON JR., et al. to response to [107-1] motion for Summary Judgment. Service: 1/16/01 (DS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 116 Filed: 1/12/2001, Entered: 1/18/2001 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    REPLY by USA to response to [106-1] cross motion . Service: 1/12/01 (DS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 115 Filed: 1/12/2001, Entered: 1/18/2001 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      REPLY by USA to response to [105-1] motion to Dismiss pursuant to statute of limitations . Service: 1/12/01 (DS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 114 Filed: 1/12/2001, Entered: 1/18/2001 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        RESPONSE, together with a separate volume of exhibits, by WILLIAM E. SIMON JR., et al. (Service: 12/18/00 ) to [105-1] motion to Dismiss pursuant to statute of limitations filed [by leave of the judge]. Reply due: 1/16/01 (DS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 113 Filed: 1/12/2001, Entered: 1/18/2001 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          RESPONSE by WILLIAM E. SIMON JR., et al. (Service: 12/18/00 ) to [106-1] cross motion filed [by leave of the judge]. Reply due: 1/16/01 (DS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 112 Filed: 12/18/2000, Entered: 1/18/2001 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            RESPONSE by BANK OF AMERICA, et al. (Service: 12/18/00 ) to [106-1] cross motion. Reply due: 1/16/01 (DS) Modified on 01/18/2001
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 111 Filed: 12/18/2000, Entered: 12/20/2000 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              RESPONSE by BANK OF AMERICA (Service: 12/18/00) to [105-1] motion to Dismiss pursuant to statute of limitations. Reply due: 1/18/01. (FE) Modified on 01/18/2001
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 110 Filed: 12/18/2000, Entered: 12/20/2000 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                RESPONSE by USA (Service: 12/18/00) to [107-1] motion for Summary Judgment. Reply due: 1/16/01. (FE) Modified on 01/18/2001
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 109 Filed: 10/26/2000, Entered: 11/21/2000 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER granting [99-1] motion for substitution of parties. ( signed by Senior Judge Loren A. Smith ) Copy to parties. (DS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 108 Filed: 10/26/2000, Entered: 11/21/2000 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER granting [98-1] motion for substitution of parties. ( signed by Senior Judge Loren A. Smith ) Copy to parties. (DS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 107 Filed: 10/19/2000, Entered: 10/24/2000 Terminated: Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION by WILLIAM E. SIMON, GERALD L. PARSKY, LARRY B. THRALL (Service : 10/10/00 ) for Summary Judgment. Filed by leave of the Judge. Response due: 11/29/00 (JT) Modified on 01/18/2001
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 106 Filed: 10/10/2000, Entered: 1/18/2001 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        [SUPPLEMENTAL] CROSS MOTION to dismiss, or alternatively for summary judgment by USA ( Service: 10/10/00 ) and SUPPLEMENTAL RESPONSE to [48-1] motion for Summary Judgment by BANK OF AMERICA, (DS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 105 Filed: 10/10/2000, Entered: 10/11/2000 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          RENEWED MOTION by USA (Service: 10/10/00) to Dismiss pursuant to statute of limitations . Response due: 11/29/00. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 104 Filed: 9/25/2000, Entered: 9/28/2000 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION by USA (Service : 9/25/00 ) For leave to exceed the page limitation. (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 103 Filed: 9/5/2000, Entered: 9/7/2000 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              RESPONSE by USA (Service: 9/5/00 ) to [99-1] motion for substitution of parties. Reply due: 9/18/00 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 102 Filed: 9/5/2000, Entered: 9/7/2000 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                RESPONSE by USA (Service: 9/5/00 ) to [98-1] motion for substitution of parties. Reply due: 9/18/00 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 101 Filed: 8/25/2000, Entered: 8/25/2000 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER granting [100-1] motion for Leave to Take depositions out of time and granting [100-2] motion to modify expert discovery schedule (signed by Judge Robert H. Hodges). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 100 Filed: 8/22/2000, Entered: 8/24/2000, Terminated: 8/25/2000 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    JOINT MOTION by USA, BANK OF AMERICA, GERALD M. CZARNECKI, HONKIDS PARTNERS, WILLIAM E. SIMON, GERALD L. PARSKY, LARRY B. THRALL for Leave to Take depositions out of time and to modify expert discovery schedule. (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 99 Filed: 8/21/2000, Entered: 8/23/2000, Terminated: 10/26/2000 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION by WILLIAM E. SIMON (Service : 8/21/00 ) for substitution of parties. (RE: 95-803) Response due: 9/7/00 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 98 Filed: 8/21/2000, Entered: 8/22/2000, Terminated: 10/26/2000 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION by WILLIAM E. SIMON (Service : 8/21/00 ) for substitution of parties. Response due: 9/7/00 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 97 Filed: 8/16/2000, Entered: 8/17/2000 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Suggestion of Death on the Record by WILLIAM E. SIMON. Service: 8/16/00 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 96 Filed: 8/9/2000, Entered: 8/10/2000 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER granting [94-1] motion For Voluntary Dismissal ( signed by Senior Judge Loren A. Smith). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 95 Filed: 7/7/2000, Entered: 7/12/2000 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER re: 7/6/00 teleconference regarding deposition issues. ( signed by Judge Robert H. Hodges ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 94 Filed: 6/14/2000, Entered: 6/15/2000, Terminated: 8/9/2000 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION by GERALD M. CZARNECKI (Service: 6/14/00) For Voluntary Dismissal . Response due: 7/3/00. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 93 Filed: 5/9/2000, Entered: 5/11/2000 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER granting [92-1] motion to Extend Time to respond to first set of interrogatories reset Interrogatories deadline to 5/16/00 ( signed by Judge Robert H. Hodges ) Copy to parties. (DS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 92 Filed: 5/2/2000, Entered: 5/3/2000, Terminated: 5/9/2000 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION by HONKIDS PARTNERS and WILLIAM E. SIMON (Service: 5/2/00) to Extend Time to respond to first set of interrogatories , (until May 16, 2000). (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 91 Filed: 2/25/2000, Entered: 2/29/2000 Memorandum
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      RESPONSE by LARRY B. THRALL re: Defendant's supplemental filing pursuant to Pargraph 5.d of the Omnibus Case Management Order and response to the Court's Order to Show Cause. Service: 2/25/00 (JT) Modified on 02/29/2000
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 90 Filed: 2/25/2000, Entered: 2/29/2000 Memorandum
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        RESPONSE by WILLIAM E. SIMON, HONKIDS PARTNERS re: Defendant's response to Order to Show Cause and Defendant's cross-motion for summary judgment. Service: 2/25/00 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 89 Filed: 2/25/2000, Entered: 2/29/2000 Memorandum
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          REPLY by BANK OF AMERICA re: partial summary judgment. Service: 2/25/00 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 88 Filed: 1/28/2000, Entered: 2/1/2000 Response
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            RESPONSE to the order to show cause issued by the Court as part of its 12/22/97 opinion in four related Winstar cases re: California Federal, FSB by USA. Service: 9/17/99. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 87 Filed: 1/28/2000, Entered: 2/1/2000 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of filing "Supplmental Filing Pursuant To Paragraph 5.d Of The Omnibus Case Management Order" by USA. Service: 9/17/99. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 86 Filed: 1/28/2000, Entered: 2/1/2000 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER granting [73-1] motion for Leave to File response to the Court's Show Cause Order and supplemental filing pursuant to Paragraph 5.d of the Omnibus Case Management Order (signed by Chief Judge Loren A. Smith). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 85 Filed: 1/28/2000, Entered: 2/1/2000 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER granting [84-1] motion to Extend Time to respond to defendant's interrogatories, granting [84-2] motion to Extend Time for defendant to respond to interrogatories (Plaintiff's response due) Interrogatories deadline to 2/8/00 and (Defendant's response due) Interrogatories deadline to 3/15/00 (signed by Chief Judge Loren A. Smith ). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 84 Filed: 1/14/2000, Entered: 1/18/2000, Terminated: 1/28/2000 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION by BANK OF AMERICA (Service : 1/14/00 ) to Extend Time to respond to defendant's interrogatories (to February 8, 2000), and to Extend Time for defendant to respond to interrogatories (to March 15, 2000). (DS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 83 Filed: 10/26/1999, Entered: 10/29/1999 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      REPLY by USA to response to [74-1] motion to Extend Time of the parties' partial summary judgment motions until the completion of fact discovery. Service: 10/26/99 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 82 Filed: 10/14/1999, Entered: 10/19/1999 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        RESPONSE by BANK OF AMERICA, (Service: 10/14/99 ) to [74-1] motion to Extend Time of the parties' partial summary judgment motions until the completion of fact discovery. Reply due: 10/28/99 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 81 Filed: 10/6/1999, Entered: 10/8/1999 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION by BANK OF AMERICA, (Service : 10/6/99 ) to Extend Time to respond to Defendant's motion for continuance [until October 14, 1999]. Response due: 10/25/99 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 80 Filed: 10/4/1999, Entered: 10/7/1999 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION by GERALD M. CZARNECKI (Service : 10/4/99 ) to Extend Time to respond to Defendant's motion for continuance [until October 14, 1999]. Response due: 10/21/99 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 78 Filed: 10/1/1999, Entered: 10/6/1999 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION by LARRY B. THRALL (Service : 10/1/99 ) to Extend Time to respond to Defendant's motion for continuance [until October 14, 1999]. Response due: 10/18/99 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 77 Filed: 10/1/1999, Entered: 10/6/1999 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION by HONKIDS PARTNERS and WILLIAM E. SIMON (Service: 10/1/99) to Extend Time to respond to motion for continuance , (until October 14, 1999). (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 76 Filed: 9/30/1999, Entered: 10/4/1999 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER granting [75-1] motion to Extend Time to respond to Defendant's first request for production of documents by 10/27/99 (signed by Judge Robert H. Hodges). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 75 Filed: 9/27/1999, Entered: 9/30/1999, Terminated: 9/30/1999 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION by GERALD L. PARSKY (Service : 9/27/99 ) to Extend Time to respond to Defendant's first request for production of documents [until October 27, 1999]. Response due: 10/14/99 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 74 Filed: 9/20/1999, Entered: 9/24/1999 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION by USA (Service : 9/17/99 ) to Extend Time of the parties' partial summary judgment motions until the completion of fact discovery. Response due: 10/4/99 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 73 Filed: 9/20/1999, Entered: 9/24/1999, Terminated: 1/28/2000 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION by USA (Service : 9/17/99 ) for Leave to File response to the Court's Show Cause Order and supplemental filing pursuant to Paragraph 5.d of the Omnibus Case Management Order. Response due: 10/4/99 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 79 Filed: 8/18/1999, Entered: 10/6/1999 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          (Corrected) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance for USA by Tonia June Tornatore Service : 8/18/99 (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 72 Filed: 8/18/1999, Entered: 8/19/1999 Notice of Change of Address
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of change of address by Tonia June Tornatore. (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 70 Filed: 6/16/1999, Entered: 6/18/1999 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Attorney Appearance for USA by Tonia June Tornatore. Service 6/16/99. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 69 Filed: 4/6/1999, Entered: 4/12/1999 Remark
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                See Order of 4/6/99 in 90-8 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 68 Filed: 1/8/1999, Entered: 1/12/1999 Notice of Change of Address
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of change of address by Steven S. Rosenthal. (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 67 Filed: 10/1/1998, Entered: 10/6/1998 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER granting [63-1] motion to Withdraw [62-1] memorandum by USA and [61-1] by USA. ( signed by Chief Judge Loren A. Smith ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 66 Filed: 10/1/1998, Entered: 10/5/1998 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER granting [63-1] motion to Withdraw [62-1] memorandum by USA and [61-1] by USA ( signed by Chief Judge Loren A. Smith ) Copy to parties. (CDC)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 65 Filed: 9/16/1998, Entered: 9/22/1998 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER memorializing the oral order of the court of August 11, 1998. Pursuant to that oral order, consideration of the motions for summary judgment, including any briefing not yet complete, is stayed until October 13, 1998. (See Order in 90-8) ( signed by Chief Judge Loren A. Smith ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 64 Filed: 9/14/1998, Entered: 9/17/1998 Response
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          RESPONSE by USA to [60-1] response by BANK OF AMERICA. Service: 9/14/98 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 63 Filed: 9/10/1998, Entered: 9/16/1998, Terminated: 10/1/1998 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION by USA (Service : 9/10/98 ) to Withdraw [62-1] memorandum by USA and [61-1] by USA . (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 62 Filed: 8/31/1998, Entered: 9/1/1998 Memorandum
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              SUPPLEMENTAL FILING pursuant to paragraph 5.d of the omnibus case management order by USA. Service: 8/31/98 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 61 Filed: 8/31/1998, Entered: 9/1/1998 Response to Order to Show Cause
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Response to order to show cause by USA. Service: 8/31/98 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 60 Filed: 8/31/1998, Entered: 9/1/1998 Response
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  RESPONSE by BANK OF AMERICA, to [59-1] notice by USA. Service: 8/31/98 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 59 Filed: 8/13/1998, Entered: 8/14/1998 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Filing Motion for Leave to File Supplemental Authority with the Court by USA. Service: 8/13/98 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 57 Filed: 7/14/1998, Entered: 7/17/1998 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Filing Motion for Stay by USA. Service: 7/14/98 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 58 Filed: 7/13/1998, Entered: 7/20/1998 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER granting [56-1] motion to Extend Time to respond to Plaintiffs joint short-form motion for partial summary judgment. Response to [51-1] cross motion reset to 8/3/98. ( signed by Chief Judge Loren A. Smith ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 56 Filed: 7/2/1998, Entered: 7/8/1998, Terminated: 7/13/1998 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION by USA (Service : 7/2/98 ) to Extend Time to respond to Plaintiffs joint short-form motion for partial summary judgment [to August 3, 1998]. Response due: 7/20/98 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 55 Filed: 6/30/1998, Entered: 7/2/1998 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Attorney Appearance for USA by F. Jefferson Hughes. Service : 6/30/98 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 54 Filed: 6/26/1998, Entered: 6/30/1998 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER granting [53-1] motion for Clarification of the Court's Order of June 4, 1998, granting [53-2] motion for expedited consideration. ( signed by Chief Judge Loren A. Smith ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 53 Filed: 6/19/1998, Entered: 6/23/1998, Terminated: 6/26/1998 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION by BANK OF AMERICA (Service : 6/19/98 ) for Clarification of the Court's Order of June 4, 1998 and for expedited consideration. Response due: 7/6/98 FILED UNDER SEAL (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 52 Filed: 6/16/1998, Entered: 6/22/1998 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION by LARRY B. THRALL (Service : 6/16/98 ) to substitute Beverly W. Thrall for Plaintiff Larry B. Thrall. Response due: 7/6/98 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 51 Filed: 6/3/1998, Entered: 6/5/1998 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    CROSS MOTION by USA ( Service: 5/28/98) and RESPONSE to [48-1] motion for Summary Judgment by BANK OF AMERICA Response due: 7/6/98. FILED UNDER SEAL. (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 50 Filed: 6/3/1998, Entered: 6/5/1998 Affidavit
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      [Declaration of Bette Cook] by BANK OF AMERICA, Re: [48-1] motion for Summary Judgment by BANK OF AMERICA. Service 6/3/98. FILED UNDER SEAL. (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 49 Filed: 6/3/1998, Entered: 6/5/1998 Affidavit
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        [Declaration of Steven S. Rosenthal] by BANK OF AMERICA, Re: [48-1] motion for Summary Judgment by BANK OF AMERICA. Service 6/3/98. FILED UNDER SEAL. (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 48 Filed: 6/3/1998, Entered: 6/5/1998 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION by BANK OF AMERICA, (Service: 4/3/98) for Summary Judgment , together with separate two volume appendix. Response due: 7/6/98. FILED UNDER SEAL. (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 47 Filed: 6/3/1998, Entered: 6/5/1998 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER: (1) The claims related to the recapitalization and acquistion of Honolulu Federal Savings and Loan Association (HonFed) contained in case nos. 95-731 C, 95-797C and 95-803C; (2) The HonFed portions of these complaints will be designated as follows: Parsky (95-7311C), Thrall (95-7971C), and Alham (95-8031C); (3) Clerk directed to file plaintiffs' motion for summary judgment; (4) granting [46-1] motion for Leave to file corrected copies of response to motion for partial summary judgment, ; and (5) granting [44-1] motion to Consolidate Related Claims ( signed by Chief Judge Loren A. Smith ) Copy to parties. (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank -- Filed: 6/3/1998, Entered: 6/5/1998 Set/Clear Flags
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Consolidated Lead Case (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 46 Filed: 5/28/1998, Entered: 6/1/1998, Terminated: 6/3/1998 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION by USA (Service: 5/28/98) for Leave to file corrected copies of response to motion for partial summary judgment Response due: 6/15/98. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 45 Filed: 4/22/1998, Entered: 4/29/1998 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  RESPONSE by USA to [44-1] motion to Consolidate Related Claims. Reply due: 5/1/98 (DS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 44 Filed: 4/22/1998, Entered: 4/29/1998 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION by BANK OF AMERICA, GERALD M. CZARNECKI, HONKIDS PARTNERS, WILLIAM E. SIMON, GERALD L. PARSKY, LARRY B. THRALL to Consolidate Related Claims (Nos. 95-660C, 95-731C, 95-797C, 95-803C) (DS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 43 Filed: 4/22/1998, Entered: 4/29/1998 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER directing the Clerk to file the joint motion for leave to file motion to consolidate; granting [42-1] motion for Leave to File motion to consolidate related claims; and directing the Clerk to file defendant's response to motion to consolidate, with filings bearing the consolidated case caption to be noted in Nos. 95-731C, 95-797C and 95-803C. ( signed by Chief Judge Loren A. Smith ) Copy to all parties. (DS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 42 Filed: 4/22/1998, Entered: 4/29/1998, Terminated: 4/22/1998 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION by BANK OF AMERICA, GERALD M. CZARNECKI, HONKIDS PARTNERS, WILLIAM E. SIMON, GERALD L. PARSKY, LARRY B. THRALL (Service by hand: 4/3/98 ) for Leave to File motion to consolidate related claims. Response due: 4/17/98 (DS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 41 Filed: 3/24/1998, Entered: 3/25/1998 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION by GERALD M. CZARNECKI (Service : 3/20/98 ) to substitute attorney (consented) Terminated attorney William R. Richardson for GERALD M. CZARNECKI Added Frank J. Eisenhart. (DS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 40 Filed: 1/21/1998, Entered: 1/23/1998 Notice of Change of Address
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of change of address by Steven S. Rosenthal (DS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 39 Filed: 8/21/1997, Entered: 8/25/1997 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER granting [38-1] motion to Extend Time to reply to opposition to motion to intervene Reply to Response to Motion due 14 days after ruling resolving Common Issue 11 for [20-1] motion to Intervene ( signed by Chief Judge Loren A. Smith ) Copy to parties. (DS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 38 Filed: 7/21/1997, Entered: 8/1/1997, Terminated: 8/21/1997 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION by HONKIDS PARTNERS, WILLIAM E. SIMON (Service : 7/15/97 ) to Extend Time to reply to opposition to motion to intervene (to August 4, 1997). (DS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 37 Filed: 7/8/1997, Entered: 7/24/1997 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  RESPONSE by USA (Service: 7/7/97 ) to [20-1] motion to Intervene Reply due: 7/21/97 (DS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 36 Filed: 2/5/1997, Entered: 2/10/1997 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION by HONKIDS PARTNERS, WILLIAM E. SIMON (Service: 2/5/97) to substitute attorney (consented). Terminated attorney William R. Richardson for WILLIAM E. SIMON, attorney William R. Richardson for HONKIDS PARTNERS. Added Toni C. Lichstein. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 35 Filed: 1/7/1997, Entered: 1/8/1997 Published DecisionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      PUBLISHED DECISION denying [30-1] motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction as to the 24 thrifts who filed suit prior to December 7, 1995, and granting motion to dismiss as to Ariadne Financial Services and Shane ( signed by Judge John P. Wiese ). Copy to all parties. (DS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 34 Filed: 12/5/1996, Entered: 12/9/1996 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER oral argument set for 10:30 a.m. on 12/19/96 for [30-1] motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction in this and listed cases signed by Judge John P. Wiese). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 33 Filed: 10/8/1996, Entered: 10/9/1996 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          RESPONSE by BANK OF AMERICA, (Service by hand: 10/8/96 ) to [30-1] motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction. Reply due: 10/18/96 (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 31 Filed: 10/7/1996, Entered: 10/8/1996 Case Assigned/ReassignedCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            See 90-8C for Notice of reassignment to Judge John P. Wiese. Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 32 Filed: 10/4/1996, Entered: 10/9/1996 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Attorney Appearance for USA by Frank Jefferson Hughes Service : 10/4/96 (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 30 Filed: 9/9/1996, Entered: 9/16/1996 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION by USA (Service: 9/9/96) to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction . Response due: 10/10/96 (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 29 Filed: 8/16/1996, Entered: 8/20/1996 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION by USA (Service : 8/16/96 ) for Leave to File attached proposed pretrial order. Response due: 9/3/96 (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 28 Filed: 7/31/1996, Entered: 8/5/1996 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    SEE 990-581C FOR ORDER granting [27-1] motion for Leave to File a copy of the attached motion to adopt special case management procedures (signed by Chief Judge Loren A. Smith). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 27 Filed: 7/23/1996, Entered: 7/25/1996, Terminated: 7/31/1996 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION by USA (Service : 7/23/96 ) for Leave to File a copy of the attached motion to adopt special case management procedures . Response due: 8/5/96 (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 26 Filed: 7/8/1996, Entered: 7/11/1996 Notice of Change of Address
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of change of address by Geoffrey Charles Cook (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 25 Filed: 6/27/1996, Entered: 7/11/1996 Notice of Change of Address
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of change of address by Geoffrey Charles Cook (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 24 Filed: 5/9/1996, Entered: 5/14/1996 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION by BANK OF AMERICA (Service: 5/9/96) for Leave to File a Response to Government's Motion to Lift Stay to File Motion to Implement Case Management System . Response due: 5/28/96, (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 23 Filed: 4/26/1996, Entered: 4/30/1996 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION by USA (Service : 4/26/96 ) for Leave to File a copy of the motion to adopt special case management procedures . Response due: 5/13/96 (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 22 Filed: 4/11/1996, Entered: 4/18/1996 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                SEE 90-581C for ORDER granting [21-1] motion for Leave to File notice and declaration re: certain documents that may be relevant to this action (signed by Chief Judge Loren A. Smith). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 21 Filed: 3/19/1996, Entered: 3/25/1996, Terminated: 4/11/1996 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION by USA (Service : 3/19/96 ) for Leave to File notice and declaration re: certain documents that may be relevant to this action . Response due: 4/5/96 (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 20 Filed: 2/29/1996, Entered: 3/5/1996 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION by GERALD M. CZARNECKI, HONKIDS PARTNERS, WILLIAM E. SIMON (Service: 12/6/95) to Intervene . Response due: 4/1/96 (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 19 Filed: 2/29/1996, Entered: 3/5/1996 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER granting [14-1] motion to Extend Time to respond to motions to intervene and lfor leave to lift stay for limited purpose and Response to motion to intervene set to 9/9/99 [response due 30 days after the pending stay is lifted] (signed by Chief Judge Loren A. Smith). Copy to parties. (FE) Modified on 03/05/1996
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 18 Filed: 1/30/1996, Entered: 2/6/1996 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER granting [16-1] motion to Extend Time to respond to motion to intervene, granting [16-2] motion to Extend Time to motion for leave to lift stay . Response to [13-1] motion to lift stay for limited purpose reset to 1/30/96 ( signed by Chief Judge Loren A. Smith ) Copy to parties. (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 17 Filed: 1/30/1996, Entered: 2/5/1996 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          RESPONSE by USA (Service: 1/30/96) to [13-1] motion to lift stay for limited purpose. Reply due: 2/12/96 (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 16 Filed: 1/11/1996, Entered: 1/19/1996, Terminated: 1/30/1996 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION by USA (Service : 1/9/96) to Extend Time to respond to motion to intervene until 1/30/96, and to Extend Time to motion for leave to lift stay until 1/30/96. Response due: 1/26/96. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 15 Filed: 12/19/1995, Entered: 12/29/1995 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              RESPONSE by BANK OF AMERICA (Service: 12/19/95) to [14-1] motion to Extend Time to respond to motions to intervene and lfor leave to lift stay for limited purpos.e Reply due: 1/2/96 (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 14 Filed: 12/18/1995, Entered: 12/27/1995, Terminated: 2/29/1996 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION by USA (Service: 12/18/95) to Extend Time to respond to motions to intervene and lfor leave to lift stay for limited purpose [to January 9, 1996]. Response due: 1/4/96 (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 13 Filed: 12/7/1995, Entered: 12/12/1995 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION by GERALD M. CZARNECKI, HONKIDS PARTNERS, WILLIAM E. SIMON (Service: 12/6/95) to lift stay for limited purpose . Response due: 12/26/95 (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 12 Filed: 11/14/1995, Entered: 11/24/1995 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    SEE ORDER IN 90-581C staying proceedings until disposition of pending Supreme Court action in WINSTAR 90-8C. Parties may file amended complaints, answers, or motions with responses from parties due 30 days after stay is lifted . (signed by Chief Judge Loren A. Smith) Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 11 Filed: 11/14/1995, Entered: 11/20/1995 Status Report
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      STATUS REPORT by BANK OF AMERICA. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 10 Filed: 11/14/1995, Entered: 11/20/1995 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER granting [5-1] motion for Leave to File status report (signed by Chief Judge Loren A. Smith). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 9 Filed: 11/13/1995, Entered: 11/17/1995 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          REPLY by USA to response to [6-1] motion to Stay Proceedings. Service: 11/13/95 (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 8 Filed: 11/6/1995, Entered: 11/9/1995 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            RESPONSE by BANK OF AMERICA, (Service BY HAND: 11/6/95) to [6-1] motion to Stay Proceedings. Reply due: 11/16/95 (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 7 Filed: 10/27/1995, Entered: 11/2/1995 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              RESPONSE by USA (Service: 10/27/95 ) to [5-1] motion for Leave to File status report. Reply due: 11/13/95 (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 6 Filed: 10/20/1995, Entered: 10/26/1995 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION by USA (Service : 10/20/95) to Stay Proceedings . (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 5 Filed: 10/20/1995, Entered: 10/24/1995, Terminated: 11/14/1995 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION by BANK OF AMERICA, (Service: 10/20/95) for Leave to File status report . Response due: 11/6/95 (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 4 Filed: 10/19/1995, Entered: 10/23/1995 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Attorney Appearance for USA by Geoffrey Charles Cook. Service: 10/19/95 (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 3 Filed: 9/29/1995, Entered: 10/3/1995 Case Assigned/ReassignedCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Notice of assignment to Chief Judge Loren A. Smith. Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 2 Filed: 9/29/1995, Entered: 10/3/1995 Notice of Related Cases
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE by BANK OF AMERICA, FEDERAL SAVINGS BANK of related case(s). (Windstar 90-8 C, et al.) (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 1 Filed: 9/29/1995, Entered: 10/3/1995 Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          COMPLAINT, FILING FEE $120, RECEIPT #040156. Answer due on 11/28/95. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            This case has been viewed 285 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                             
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Need Password Help?