DAU v. USA
Federal Civil Lawsuit United States Court of Federal Claims, Case No. 1:95-cv-00661-RHH
District Judge Robert H. Hodges, Jr., presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo JAMES E. DAU, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Banner & Witcoff, Ltd.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Mark T. Banner +1 312 463 5000 +1 312 463 5001 mbanner@bannerwitcoff.com
v.
United States of America United States of America, Defendant
Officially listed as "USA"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Todd Michael Hughes +1 202 307 1011
Office COFC
Filed 9/29/1995
Jury Demand
Demand $1000000
Nature of Suit 346 - Military Pay - Correct/Reinstate
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1491 Tucker Act
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition Preliminary Injunction
County
Terminated 4/25/1996
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flag CLOSED
  Entries (24) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 22 Filed: 6/9/1997, Entered: 6/17/1997 CAFC Mandate Affirming
MANDATE (certified copy) from CAFC dated June 9, 1997, affirmed [19-1] order. (HW)
    LREF
    Blank -- Filed: 6/26/1996, Entered: 6/26/1996
    CAFC Case Number Re: [21-1] appeal by JAMES E. DAU. CAFC NUMBER: 96-5114. (HW)
      LREF
      Blank 21 Filed: 6/24/1996, Entered: 6/24/1996, Terminated: 6/9/1997 Notice of AppealCourt Filing
      NOTICE OF APPEAL by JAMES E. DAU. Copy to USA, Judge Hodges and to CAFC. FILING FEE $ 105.00; RECEIPT # 041726. (HW)
        LREF
        Blank 20 Filed: 4/25/1996, Entered: 4/30/1996 Judgment*
        JUDGMENT entered pursuant to Rule 58 granting defendant's judgment on the record. No costs (signed by Clerk). Copy to parties. (FE)
          LREF
          Blank -- Filed: 4/25/1996, Entered: 4/30/1996 Terminated Case
          Case closed. (FE)
            LREF
            Blank 19 Filed: 4/24/1996, Entered: 4/29/1996 Unpublished DecisionCourt Filing
            UNPUBLISHED DECISION granting [16-1] motion to Dismiss (signed by Judge Robert H. Hodges, Jr.). Copy to parties. (FE)
              LREF
              Blank 18 Filed: 3/25/1996, Entered: 4/1/1996 Reply to Response to Motion
              REPLY by USA to response to [16-1] motion to Dismiss. Service: 3/25/96. (HW)
                LREF
                Blank 17 Filed: 3/14/1996, Entered: 3/21/1996 Terminated: Court Filing
                RESPONSE by JAMES E. DAU (Service: 3/8/96) to [16-1] motion to Dismiss by leave of the Judge. Reply due: 3/25/96 (FE)
                  LREF
                  Blank 16 Filed: 2/22/1996, Entered: 2/29/1996 Terminated:
                  MOTION by USA (Service : 2/9/96 ) to Dismiss , or in the alternative, for judgment upon the record. Response due: 3/11/96 (HW)
                    LREF
                    Blank 15 Filed: 2/22/1996, Entered: 2/29/1996 Statement of Facts
                    STATEMENT OF FACTS filed by USA. Service: 2/15/96. (HW)
                      LREF
                      Blank 14 Filed: 2/22/1996, Entered: 2/29/1996 OrderCourt Filing
                      ORDER granting [13-1] motion for Leave to File its motion to dismiss or, in the alternative, motion for judgment upon the record, out of time ( signed by Judge Robert H. Hodges ) Copy to parties. (HW)
                        LREF
                        Blank 13 Filed: 2/15/1996, Entered: 2/21/1996, Terminated: 2/22/1996 Terminated:
                        MOTION by USA (Service : 2/9/96 ) for Leave to File its motion to dismiss or, in the alternative, motion for judgment upon the record, out of time . Response due: 2/26/96 (HW)
                          LREF
                          Blank 12 Filed: 2/9/1996, Entered: 2/21/1996 Administrative Record
                          Notice of filing the Administrative record, together with the administrative record, consisting of five bound volumes, filed by USA. Service: 2/9/96 (DS)
                            LREF
                            Blank 11 Filed: 1/19/1996, Entered: 1/26/1996 Terminated:
                            RESPONSE by JAMES E. DAU (Service: 1/19/96 ) to [10-1] motion to Extend Time to file answer or responsive pleading. Reply due: 2/2/96 (FE)
                              LREF
                              Blank 10 Filed: 1/5/1996, Entered: 1/16/1996 Terminated:
                              MOTION by USA (Service : 1/4/96) to Extend Time to file answer or responsive pleading until furlough is lifted, plus an additional seven days. Response due: 1/22/96 (FE)
                                LREF
                                Blank 9 Filed: 12/26/1995, Entered: 1/4/1996 Terminated:
                                RESPONSE by JAMES E. DAU (Service: 12/26/95 ) to [7-1] motion to Stay. Reply due: 1/12/96. (HW)
                                  LREF
                                  Blank 8 Filed: 12/15/1995, Entered: 2/13/1996 OrderCourt Filing
                                  ORDER denying [7-1] motion to Stay, denying [7-2] motion to Extend Time to respond to complaint ( signed by Judge Robert H. Hodges ) Copy to parties. (DS) Modified on 02/21/1996
                                    LREF
                                    Blank 7 Filed: 12/12/1995, Entered: 12/14/1995, Terminated: 12/15/1995 Terminated:
                                    MOTION by USA (Service: 12/12/95) to Stay and to Extend Time to respond to complaint [to February 15, 1996]. Response due: 12/29/95 (FE) Modified on 02/13/1996
                                      LREF
                                      Blank 6 Filed: 12/5/1995, Entered: 12/8/1995 OrderCourt Filing
                                      ORDER granting [5-1] motion to Extend Time within which to respond to complaint reset Answer deadline to 1/5/96 , defendant will file administrative record immediately ( signed by Judge Robert H. Hodges ). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                        LREF
                                        Blank 5 Filed: 11/21/1995, Entered: 11/30/1995, Terminated: 12/5/1995 Terminated:
                                        MOTION by USA (Service : 11/21/95 ) to Extend Time within which to respond to complaint , (January 29, 1995). Response due: 12/8/95. (HW)
                                          LREF
                                          Blank 4 Filed: 10/17/1995, Entered: 10/19/1995 Notice of Appearance/
                                          NOTICE of Attorney Appearance for USA by Todd Michael Hughes. Service: 10/17/95 (FE)
                                            LREF
                                            Blank 3 Filed: 9/29/1995, Entered: 10/5/1995 Notice of Related Cases
                                            NOTICE by JAMES E. DAU of related case(s). (FE)
                                              LREF
                                              Blank 2 Filed: 9/29/1995, Entered: 10/5/1995 Case Assigned/ReassignedCourt Filing
                                              Notice of assignment to Judge Robert H. Hodges. Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                LREF
                                                Blank 1 Filed: 9/29/1995, Entered: 10/5/1995 Complaint
                                                COMPLAINT, FILING FEE $120, RECEIPT #040183. Answer due on 11/28/95. (FE)
                                                  LREF

                                                  Statistics

                                                  This case has been viewed 220 times.

                                                  No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                  Space
                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                   
                                                  PlainSite
                                                  Sign Up
                                                  Need Password Help?