WESTBROOK v. USA
Federal Civil Lawsuit United States Court of Federal Claims, Case No. 1:95-cv-00674-LMB
District Judge Lawrence M. Baskir, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo MICHELE LATOUR WESTBROOK, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by KATOR, PARKS & WEISER, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Michael J. Kator +1 202 898 4800 +1 202 289 1389 mkator@katorparks.com
v.
United States of America United States of America, Defendant
Officially listed as "USA"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space S. Lane Tucker +1 202 514 7300
Office COFC
Filed 10/11/1995
Jury Demand
Demand $30000
Nature of Suit 304 - Civilian Pay - FLSA
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1491 Tucker Act
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition Preliminary Injunction
County
Terminated 10/2/2000
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flag CLOSED
  Entries (87) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 84 Filed: 10/2/2000, Entered: 10/4/2000 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by MICHELE LATOUR WESTBROOK and USA. Complaint dismissed pursuant to Rule 41 (a)(1)(B) this day. Copy to parties. Nature of Jgm DP. (FE)
    LREF
    Blank -- Filed: 10/2/2000, Entered: 10/4/2000 Terminated Case
    Case closed (FE)
      LREF
      Blank 83 Filed: 9/13/2000, Entered: 9/14/2000 OrderCourt Filing
      ORDER denying [82-1] motion to Extend Time to file response and consolidated statement of facts. Plaintiff is to file opposition and cross-motion forthwith. ( signed by Chief Judge Lawrence M. Baskir ) Copy to parties. (JT)
        LREF
        Blank 82 Filed: 9/12/2000, Entered: 9/14/2000, Terminated: 9/13/2000 Terminated:
        MOTION by MICHELE LATOUR WESTBROOK (Service : 9/12/00 ) to Extend Time to file response and consolidated statement of facts [until September 28, 2000]. Response due: 9/29/00 (JT)
          LREF
          Blank 81 Filed: 8/1/2000, Entered: 8/3/2000 Terminated: Court Filing
          MOTION by USA (Service : 7/28/00 ) for Summary Judgment. (1 Separate Volume of Appendix) Filed by leave of the Judge. Response due: 8/29/00 (JT)
            LREF
            Blank 80 Filed: 8/1/2000, Entered: 8/3/2000 Proposed Findings of Uncontroverted FactCourt Filing
            PROPOSED FINDINGS of Uncontroverted Fact by USA. Filed by leave of the Judge. Service: 7/28/00 (JT)
              LREF
              Blank 79 Filed: 8/1/2000, Entered: 8/3/2000 OrderCourt Filing
              ORDER filing by leave Defendant's motion for summary judgment, proposed findings of facts, and appendix. Defendant is directed to send the original affidavits forthwith. ( signed by Chief Judge Lawrence M. Baskir ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                LREF
                Blank 78 Filed: 6/29/2000, Entered: 7/7/2000 OrderCourt Filing
                ORDER granting [77-1] motion to amend [76-5] order. Plaintiff is to furnish Defendant its proposed findings of fact forthwith; reset Defendant's dispositive motion filing deadline to 7/31/00 ; reset Plaintiff's response and cross-motion filing deadline to 8/29/00 ; and reset Defendant's reply deadline to 9/12/00. ( signed by Judge Lawrence M. Baskir ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                  LREF
                  Blank 77 Filed: 6/28/2000, Entered: 7/6/2000, Terminated: 6/29/2000 Terminated:
                  MOTION by USA (Service : 6/28/00 ) to amend [76-5] order. Response due: 7/17/00 (JT)
                    LREF
                    Blank -- Filed: 6/28/2000, Entered: 7/6/2000 Set/Reset Deadlines:
                    Deadline updated; Plaintiff's Response to [77-1] motion to amend [76-5] order reset to 7/17/00. (JT)
                      LREF
                      Blank 76 Filed: 5/9/2000, Entered: 5/11/2000 OrderCourt Filing
                      ORDER granting [75-1] motion to Amend Scheduling Order plaintiff to furnish its proposed findings of fact to defendant by 5/19/00 , defendant to file its dispositive motion by 6/30/00 , plaintiff to file its response and cross-motion by 7/28/00 , defendant to respond and reply by 8/11/00; plaintiff to reply by 8/25/00 ; and directing parties to file the consolidated statement of proposed uncontroverted facts in conjunction with the pleadings. ( signed by Judge Lawrence M. Baskir ) Copy to parties. (DS)
                        LREF
                        Blank 75 Filed: 4/28/2000, Entered: 5/1/2000, Terminated: 5/9/2000 Terminated:
                        MOTION by USA (Service : 4/28/00 ) to Amend Scheduling Order (to May 19, 2000 for plaintiff to provide to defendant its proposed findings of fact; to June 30, 2000 for defendant to file its motion for summary judgment, with further briefing to be according to the Rules). Response due: 5/15/00 (DS)
                          LREF
                          Blank 74 Filed: 3/20/2000, Entered: 3/23/2000 OrderCourt Filing
                          ORDER set Motion Filing deadline to 4/28/00(defendant) , the plainitiff shall file opposition and cross motion by 5/19/00 , defendant shall file opposition and reply by 6/9/00 and plaintiff shall reply by 7/7/00 (signed by Judge Lawrence M. Baskir). Copy to parties. (FE)
                            LREF
                            Blank 73 Filed: 3/20/2000, Entered: 3/23/2000 Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
                            SCHEDULING ORDER setting Status conference at 2:00 p.m. on 3/22/00. ( signed by Judge Lawrence M. Baskir ) Copy to parties. (DS)
                              LREF
                              Blank 72 Filed: 3/16/2000, Entered: 3/20/2000 Terminated:
                              MOTION by USA (Service : 3/15/00 ) to Amend the scheduling order. Response due: 4/3/00 (JT)
                                LREF
                                Blank 71 Filed: 2/24/2000, Entered: 2/28/2000, Terminated: 2/24/2000 Terminated:
                                MOTION by MICHELE LATOUR WESTBROOK (Service : 2/23/00 ) to Amend scheduling order. (JT) Modified on 02/28/2000
                                  LREF
                                  Blank 70 Filed: 2/24/2000, Entered: 2/28/2000 OrderCourt Filing
                                  ORDER granting [71-1] motion to amend the scheduling order. Reset Defendant's dispositive motion filing deadline to 3/29/00 ; reset Plaintiff's Cross Motions deadline to 4/14/00 ; reset Defendant's response deadline to 4/27/00; and reset Plaintiff's reply to response deadline to 5/10/00. ( signed by Judge Lawrence M. Baskir ) Copy to parties. (JT) Modified on 02/28/2000
                                    LREF
                                    Blank 69 Filed: 2/9/2000, Entered: 2/11/2000 OrderCourt Filing
                                    ORDER reset Defendant's dispositive motion filing deadline to 2/29/00 ; reset Plaintiff's cross-motion deadline to 3/14/00 ; reset Defendant's response deadline to 3/27/00; and reset Plaintiff's reply deadline to 4/10/00. ( signed by Judge Lawrence M. Baskir ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                                      LREF
                                      Blank 68 Filed: 1/28/2000, Entered: 2/1/2000 Terminated:
                                      MOTION by MICHELE LATOUR WESTBROOK (Service : 1/28/00 ) to substitute attorney (consented) Terminated attorney Joseph B. Scott for MICHELE LATOUR WESTBROOK Added Michael J. Kator. (DS)
                                        LREF
                                        Blank 67 Filed: 1/13/2000, Entered: 1/14/2000 Terminated:
                                        MOTION by USA (Service : 12/21/99 ) to amend the scheduling order. (JT)
                                          LREF
                                          Blank 66 Filed: 1/13/2000, Entered: 1/14/2000 OrderCourt Filing
                                          ORDER directing the Clerk to file Defendant's motion to amend the scheduling order and set Notice of Compliance deadline to 1/28/00 for Plaintiff to file an affidavit substituting Mr. Kator as counsel. ( signed by Judge Lawrence M. Baskir ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                                            LREF
                                            Blank 65 Filed: 12/3/1999, Entered: 12/7/1999 Transcript
                                            TRANSCRIPT of proceedings 1 volume, at Washington, D.C., for date of November 3, 1999. Notice to parties. (FE)
                                              LREF
                                              Blank 64 Filed: 11/3/1999, Entered: 11/8/1999 OrderCourt Filing
                                              ORDER set Defendant's dispositive motion filing deadline to 12/21/99 ; set Plaintiff's cross-motion deadline to 1/31/00 ; set Defendant's response and reply deadline to 2/28/00; and set Plaintiff's reply deadline to 3/17/00. ( signed by Judge Lawrence M. Baskir ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                                                LREF
                                                Blank -- Filed: 11/3/1999, Entered: 11/4/1999 Status Conference
                                                Status Conference held ( Transcript due 12/3/99 ) (DS)
                                                  LREF
                                                  Blank 63 Filed: 10/25/1999, Entered: 10/26/1999 Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
                                                  SCHEDULING ORDER setting Telephonic Status conference for 10:00 a.m. 11/3/99 (signed by Judge Lawrence M. Baskir). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                    LREF
                                                    Blank 62 Filed: 10/21/1999, Entered: 10/26/1999 Status ReportCourt Filing
                                                    JOINT STATUS REPORT by MICHELE LATOUR WESTBROOK, USA. Filed by leave of the Judge. (JT)
                                                      LREF
                                                      Blank 61 Filed: 10/21/1999, Entered: 10/26/1999 Terminated: Court Filing
                                                      MOTION by MICHELE LATOUR WESTBROOK (Service : 10/15/99 ) to Substitute Attorney. Filed by leave of the Judge. Response due: 11/1/99 (JT)
                                                        LREF
                                                        Blank 60 Filed: 10/21/1999, Entered: 10/26/1999 OrderCourt Filing
                                                        ORDER directing the Clerk to term the Plaintiff's Praecipe as an incomplete Motion for Substitution and file it by leave. The Plaintiff is directed to file an affidavit according to Rule 81(d)(4). ( signed by Judge Lawrence M. Baskir ) Copy to parties. (JT) Modified on 10/26/1999
                                                          LREF
                                                          Blank 59 Filed: 9/10/1999, Entered: 9/13/1999 OrderCourt Filing
                                                          ORDER set joint status report deadline to 10/15/99. The parties are to call the Court re: status conference and the parties are ordered to file a Consolidated Statement of Facts in conjunction with briefing of dispositive motions, not individual findings of fact. ( signed by Judge Lawrence M. Baskir ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                                                            LREF
                                                            Blank 58 Filed: 8/25/1999, Entered: 8/25/1999 Court Filing
                                                            ORDER re: It is directed plaintiff's unopposed motion for enlargement of time to respond to defendant's proposed findings of uncontroverted fact be returned to plaintiff's attorney of record for proper filing [CFC Rules 11 and 81(d)] (signed by Chief Judge Loren A. Smith). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                              LREF
                                                              Blank 57 Filed: 7/27/1999, Entered: 7/28/1999 OrderCourt Filing
                                                              ORDER granting [56-1] motion to Extend Time within which parties may submit dispositive motions. Reset the time within which the parties may modify the dispositive motions and appendices deadline to 8/20/99. ( signed by Judge Lawrence M. Baskir Copy to parties. (JT)
                                                                LREF
                                                                Blank 56 Filed: 7/23/1999, Entered: 7/26/1999, Terminated: 7/27/1999 Terminated:
                                                                MOTION by USA (Service : 7/23/99 ) to Extend Time within which parties may submit dispositive motions , (until August 20, 1999). (HW)
                                                                  LREF
                                                                  Blank 55 Filed: 6/23/1999, Entered: 6/25/1999 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                  ORDER granting [54-1] motion to Extend Time to submit dispositive motion. Reset the time in which the parties may modify the dispositive motions and appendices deadline to 7/23/99. ( signed by Judge Lawrence M. Baskir ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                                                                    LREF
                                                                    Blank 54 Filed: 6/18/1999, Entered: 6/22/1999, Terminated: 6/23/1999 Terminated:
                                                                    MOTION by USA (Service: 6/18/99) to Extend Time to submit it's dispositive motion , (until July 23, 1999). (FE)
                                                                      LREF
                                                                      Blank 53 Filed: 5/26/1999, Entered: 6/3/1999 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                      ORDER granting [52-1] motion to Extend Time to file a dispositive motion . Motion Filing deadline to 6/21/99 (signed by Judge Lawrence M. Baskir). Copy to parties. (HW)
                                                                        LREF
                                                                        Blank 52 Filed: 5/21/1999, Entered: 5/25/1999, Terminated: 5/26/1999 Terminated:
                                                                        MOTION by USA (Service : 5/21/99 ) to Extend Time to file a dispositive motion [until June 21, 1999]. Response due: 6/7/99 (JT)
                                                                          LREF
                                                                          Blank 51 Filed: 4/28/1999, Entered: 5/3/1999 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                          SPECIAL PROCEDURES and ORDER granting [50-1] motion to Extend Time to submit dispositive motion. Reset dispositive motion filing deadline to 5/21/99. ( signed by Judge Lawrence M. Baskir ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                                                                            LREF
                                                                            Blank 50 Filed: 4/26/1999, Entered: 4/28/1999, Terminated: 4/28/1999 Terminated:
                                                                            MOTION by USA (Service: 4/26/99) to Extend Time to submit dispositive motion , (until May 21, 1999). (FE)
                                                                              LREF
                                                                              Blank 49 Filed: 3/16/1999, Entered: 3/18/1999 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                              ORDER granting [48-1] motion to Extend Time to file dispositive motions by 4/23/99 ( signed by Judge Lawrence M. Baskir). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                LREF
                                                                                Blank 48 Filed: 3/12/1999, Entered: 3/16/1999, Terminated: 3/16/1999 Terminated:
                                                                                MOTION by USA (Service : 3/12/99 ) to Extend Time to file dispositive motions [until April 23, 1999]. Response due: 3/29/99 (JT)
                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                  Blank 47 Filed: 2/4/1999, Entered: 2/4/1999 Court Filing
                                                                                  Notice of reassignment to Judge Lawrence M. Baskir . Copy to parties. (CDC)
                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                    Blank 46 Filed: 1/14/1999, Entered: 1/19/1999 Status Report
                                                                                    STATUS REPORT by USA. Service: 1/14/99 (JT)
                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                      Blank 45 Filed: 12/3/1998, Entered: 12/8/1998 Status ReportCourt Filing
                                                                                      STATUS REPORT by USA (filed by leave of the Judge) Service: 12/1/98. (FE)
                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                        Blank 44 Filed: 7/27/1998, Entered: 7/30/1998 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                        ORDER re: absent the filing of defendant's motion for summary judgment, a Status Report shall be filed 8/21/98 ( signed by Judge Robert J. Yock ) Copy to parties. (HW)
                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                          Blank 43 Filed: 7/20/1998, Entered: 7/22/1998 Status Report
                                                                                          STATUS REPORT by USA. Service: 7/17/98 (JT)
                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                            Blank 42 Filed: 6/19/1998, Entered: 6/22/1998 Status Report
                                                                                            STATUS REPORT by USA. Service: 6/19/98 (JT)
                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                              Blank 41 Filed: 6/10/1998, Entered: 6/10/1998 Court Filing
                                                                                              ORDER continuing stay in this case and setting Defendant's summary judgment motion filing deadline to 6/19/98. If a summary judgment is not filed by 6/19/98, a status report will be due on 6/19/98. ( signed by Chief Judge Loren A. Smith ) Copy to parties. (JT) Modified on 06/10/1998
                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                Blank 40 Filed: 6/4/1998, Entered: 6/5/1998 Status Report
                                                                                                STATUS REPORT by USA Service: 6/4/98 (CDC)
                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                  Blank 39 Filed: 5/13/1998, Entered: 5/18/1998 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                  ORDER granting [38-1] motion to Stay Proceedings until June 5, 1998. ( Signed by Judge Robert J. Yock. ) Copy to parties. (CDC)
                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                    Blank 38 Filed: 5/1/1998, Entered: 5/5/1998, Terminated: 5/13/1998 Terminated:
                                                                                                    MOTION by USA (Service : 5/1/98 ) to Stay Proceedings until June 5, 1998. (DS)
                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                      Blank 37 Filed: 4/15/1998, Entered: 4/15/1998 Court Filing
                                                                                                      ORDER granting [36-1] motion to Extend Time to submit a dispositive motion. Reset Defendant's Motion Filing deadline for a dispositive motion to 4/24/98. ( signed by Judge Robert J. Yock ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                        Blank 36 Filed: 4/10/1998, Entered: 4/13/1998, Terminated: 4/15/1998 Terminated:
                                                                                                        MOTION by USA (Service : 4/10/98 ) to Extend Time to submit a dispositive motion [to April 24, 1998]. Response due: 4/27/98 (JT)
                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                          Blank 35 Filed: 3/13/1998, Entered: 3/16/1998 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                          ORDER granting [32-1] motion to Extend Time, granting [34-1] motion to Extend Time to submit a dispositive motion. Reset Motion Filing deadline to 4/10/98 for Defendant's dispositive motion. ( signed by Judge Robert J. Yock ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                            Blank 34 Filed: 3/10/1998, Entered: 3/11/1998 Terminated:
                                                                                                            MOTION by USA (Service : 3/10/98 ) to Extend Time to submit a dispositive motion [to April 10, 1998]. Response due: 3/27/98 (JT)
                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                              Blank 33 Filed: 3/3/1998, Entered: 3/4/1998 Terminated:
                                                                                                              MOTION by USA (Service : 3/3/98 ) to Extend Time to submit a dispositive motion [until March 10,1998.] Response due: 3/20/98 (CDC)
                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                Blank 32 Filed: 2/20/1998, Entered: 2/24/1998, Terminated: 3/13/1998 Terminated:
                                                                                                                MOTION by USA (Service : 2/20/98 ) to Extend Time within which to submit a dispositive motion in this matter, (3/3/98). Response due: 3/9/98 (FE)
                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                  Blank 31 Filed: 2/13/1998, Entered: 2/18/1998 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                  ORDER granting [30-1] motion to Extend Time to submit a dispositive motion reset Motion Filing deadline to 2/20/98 Signed by Judge Robert J. Yock. ) Copy to parties. (CDC)
                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                    Blank 30 Filed: 2/11/1998, Entered: 2/13/1998, Terminated: 2/13/1998 Terminated: Court Filing
                                                                                                                    MOTION by USA (Service : 2/6/98 ) to Extend Time to submit a dispositive motion [to February 20, 1998]. Filed by leave of the Judge. Response due: 2/23/98 (JT) Modified on 02/13/1998
                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                      Blank 29 Filed: 2/11/1998, Entered: 2/13/1998 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                      ORDER granting [28-1] motion to Extend Time to submit a dispositive motion. Reset Motion Filing deadline to 2/6/98. ( signed by Judge Robert J. Yock ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                        Blank 28 Filed: 1/23/1998, Entered: 2/13/1998, Terminated: 2/11/1998 Terminated:
                                                                                                                        MOTION by USA (Service : 1/23/98 ) to Extend Time to submit a dispositive motion [to February 6, 1998]. Response due: 2/9/98 (JT)
                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                          Blank 26 Filed: 1/6/1998, Entered: 1/13/1998 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                          ORDER granting [24-1] motion to Extend Time within which to file dispositive motion reset Motion Filing deadline to 1/23/98 ( signed by Judge Robert J. Yock ) Copy to parties. (DS)
                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                            Blank 25 Filed: 11/26/1997, Entered: 1/13/1998 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                            ORDER granting [23-1] motion to Extend Time within which to submit dispositive motion reset Motion Filing deadline to 11/26/97 ( signed by Judge Robert J. Yock ) Copy to parties. (DS)
                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                              Blank 24 Filed: 11/26/1997, Entered: 12/9/1997, Terminated: 1/6/1998 Terminated:
                                                                                                                              MOTION by USA (Service : 11/26/97 ) to Extend Time within which to file dispositive motion , (until January 23, 1998). Response due: 12/15/97. (HW) Modified on 01/13/1998
                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                Blank 23 Filed: 10/24/1997, Entered: 11/3/1997, Terminated: 11/26/1997 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                MOTION by USA (Service : 10/24/97 ) to Extend Time within which to submit dispositive motion , (until 11/26/97). Response due: 11/10/97 (HW)
                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                  Blank 22 Filed: 7/24/1997, Entered: 8/1/1997 Status Report
                                                                                                                                  STATUS REPORT by USA Service: 7/24/97 (CDC)
                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                    Blank 21 Filed: 7/23/1997, Entered: 8/1/1997 Status ReportCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                    STATUS REPORT by USA Service: 7/22/97 Filed by leave of the Judge. (CDC)
                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                      Blank 20 Filed: 4/9/1997, Entered: 4/23/1997 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                      ORDER re: Status Report deadline to 6/6/97 ( signed by Judge Robert J. Yock ) Copy to parties. (HW)
                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                        Blank 19 Filed: 4/4/1997, Entered: 4/14/1997 Status Report
                                                                                                                                        STATUS REPORT by USA. Service: 4/4/97. (HW)
                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                          Blank 18 Filed: 2/10/1997, Entered: 2/12/1997 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                          ORDER reset Discovery deadline to 3/21/97 and set Status Report deadline to 4/4/97 (signed by Judge Robert J. Yock). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                            Blank 17 Filed: 2/3/1997, Entered: 2/7/1997 Status Report
                                                                                                                                            STATUS REPORT by USA. Service: 2/3/97 (FE)
                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                              Blank 15 Filed: 11/12/1996, Entered: 11/14/1996 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                              ORDER granting [14-1] motion to Extend Time to respond to request for production of documents and interrogatories and reset Interrogatories deadline to 11/29/96 (signed by Judge Robert J. Yock). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                Blank 16 Filed: 11/7/1996, Entered: 11/14/1996 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                ORDER granting [13-1] motion to Extend Time to complete Discovery , with parties to file individual status reports within 30 days thereafter. Reset Discovery deadline to 1/3/97 ( signed by Judge Robert J. Yock ) Copy to parties. (HW)
                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Blank 14 Filed: 11/7/1996, Entered: 11/13/1996, Terminated: 11/12/1996 Terminated: Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                  MOTION by USA (Service : 11/1/96) to Extend Time to respond to request for production of documents and interrogatories (to November 29, 1996). Filed by leave of the Judge. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Blank 13 Filed: 11/1/1996, Entered: 11/7/1996, Terminated: 11/7/1996 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                    MOTION by USA (Service: 11/1/96) to Extend Time to complete Discovery until 1/3/97. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Blank -- Filed: 8/21/1996, Entered: 8/21/1996
                                                                                                                                                      (FE)
                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Blank 12 Filed: 5/24/1996, Entered: 5/30/1996 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                        ORDER setting Discovery deadline to 11/1/96 , and setting parties Status Reports deadline to 12/2/96 or within 30 days after completion of discovery. (signed by Judge Robert J. Yock) Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Blank 11 Filed: 5/22/1996, Entered: 5/28/1996 Joint Preliminary Status Report
                                                                                                                                                          JOINT PRELIMINARY STATUS REPORT. (HW)
                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Blank 10 Filed: 5/21/1996, Entered: 5/24/1996 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                            ORDER granting [9-1] motion to Extend Time to file JPSR and reset date Joint Preliminary Status Report due to 5/22/96 (signed by Judge Robert J. Yock). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Blank 9 Filed: 5/17/1996, Entered: 5/21/1996, Terminated: 5/21/1996 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                              MOTION by USA to Extend Time to file JPSR (to May 22, 1996). (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Blank 8 Filed: 5/9/1996, Entered: 5/14/1996 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                ORDER granting [7-1] motion for Leave to File JPSR out of time reset date Joint Preliminary Status Report due to 5/17/96 ( signed by Judge Robert J. Yock ) Copy to parties. (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 7 Filed: 5/3/1996, Entered: 5/8/1996, Terminated: 5/9/1996 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION by USA (Service : 5/2/96 ) for Leave to File JPSR out of time . Response due: 5/20/96. (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 6 Filed: 2/2/1996, Entered: 2/8/1996 Answer
                                                                                                                                                                    ANSWER to Complaint by USA. Service: 2/2/96 ( JPSR due 3/21/96 ). (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 5 Filed: 1/17/1996, Entered: 1/24/1996 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER granting [4-1] motion to Extend Time to respond to complaint and reset Answer deadline to 2/2/96 (signed by Judge Robert J. Yock). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 4 Filed: 1/5/1996, Entered: 1/18/1996, Terminated: 1/17/1996 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION by USA (Service : 1/5/96) to Extend Time to respond to complaint until 2/2/96. Response due: 1/22/96 (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 3 Filed: 11/9/1995, Entered: 11/14/1995 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Attorney Appearance for USA by S. Lane Tucker Service : 11/9/95 (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 2 Filed: 10/11/1995, Entered: 10/13/1995 Case Assigned/ReassignedCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                            Notice of assignment to Judge Robert J. Yock. Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 1 Filed: 10/11/1995, Entered: 10/13/1995 Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                              COMPLAINT, FILING FEE $120, RECEIPT #040212. Answer due on 12/11/95. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                Space Space

                                                                                                                                                                                Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                This case has been viewed 75 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                Space
                                                                                                                                                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                 
                                                                                                                                                                                PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                Need Password Help?