MISHIK v. USA
Federal Civil Lawsuit United States Court of Federal Claims, Case No. 1:95-cv-00679-WCR
District Judge Wilkes C. Robinson, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo JEFFREY PHILIP MISHIK, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Nancy Lee Presson +1 770 997 0334 +1 770 478 2334 caninecabin@bellsouth.net
v.
United States of America United States of America, Defendant
Officially listed as "USA"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Lydia Kay Griggsby +1 202 224 2981 +1 202 514 8780 lydia.griggsby@usdoj.gov
Office COFC
Filed 10/13/1995
Jury Demand
Demand $0
Nature of Suit 352 - Military Pay - Retirement
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1491 Tucker Act
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition Preliminary Injunction
County
Terminated 2/21/1996
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flag CLOSED
  Entries (11) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 10 Filed: 2/21/1996, Entered: 2/28/1996 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by JEFFREY PHILIP MISHIK, USA. Service: Complaint dismissed pursuant to Rule 41 (a)(1)(B). Copy to parties. Nature of Jgm DP. (FE)
    LREF
    Blank -- Filed: 2/21/1996, Entered: 2/28/1996 Terminated Case
    Case closed. (FE)
      LREF
      Blank 9 Filed: 2/14/1996, Entered: 2/20/1996 OrderCourt Filing
      ORDER granting [8-1] motion to Extend Time within which to respond to complaint and reset Answer deadline to 2/23/96 (signed by Judge Wilkes C. Robinson). Copy to parties. (FE)
        LREF
        Blank 8 Filed: 2/9/1996, Entered: 2/13/1996, Terminated: 2/14/1996 Terminated:
        MOTION by USA (Service : 2/9/96 ) to Extend Time within which to respond to complaint . Response due: 2/22/96. (HW)
          LREF
          Blank 7 Filed: 2/1/1996, Entered: 2/8/1996 OrderCourt Filing
          ORDER granting [6-1] motion to Extend Time to respond to complaint and reset Answer deadline to 2/9/96 (signed by Judge Wilkes C. Robinson). Copy to parties. (FE)
            LREF
            Blank 6 Filed: 1/26/1996, Entered: 2/1/1996, Terminated: 2/1/1996 Terminated:
            MOTION by USA (Service : 1/26/96) to Extend Time to respond to complaint (to February 9, 1996). (FE)
              LREF
              Blank 5 Filed: 12/18/1995, Entered: 12/28/1995 OrderCourt Filing
              ORDER granting [4-1] motion to Extend Time to answer complaint and reset Answer deadline to 1/26/96 (signed by Judge Wilkes C. Robinson). Copy to parties. (FE)
                LREF
                Blank 4 Filed: 12/8/1995, Entered: 12/12/1995, Terminated: 12/18/1995 Terminated:
                MOTION by USA (Service : 12/8/95) to Extend Time to answer complaint (to January 26, 1996). (FE)
                  LREF
                  Blank 3 Filed: 10/27/1995, Entered: 11/2/1995 Notice of Appearance/
                  NOTICE of Attorney Appearance for USA by Lydia Kay Griggsby Service : 10/27/95 (FE)
                    LREF
                    Blank 2 Filed: 10/13/1995, Entered: 10/17/1995 Case Assigned/ReassignedCourt Filing
                    Notice of assignment to Judge Wilkes C. Robinson. Copy to parties. (FE)
                      LREF
                      Blank 1 Filed: 10/13/1995, Entered: 10/17/1995 Complaint
                      COMPLAINT, FILING FEE $120, RECEIPT #040229. Answer due on 12/12/95. (FE)
                        LREF

                        Statistics

                        This case has been viewed 145 times.

                        No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                        Space
                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                         
                        PlainSite
                        Sign Up
                        Need Password Help?