WILLIAMS v. USA
Federal Civil Lawsuit United States Court of Federal Claims, Case No. 1:95-cv-00714-CCM
District Judge Christine O.C. Miller, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo OLIN WILLIAMS, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Nancy Lee Presson +1 770 997 0334 +1 770 478 2334 caninecabin@bellsouth.net
v.
United States of America United States of America, Defendant
Officially listed as "USA"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Laureen Kapin +1 202 307 1011
Office COFC
Filed 10/27/1995
Jury Demand
Demand $0
Nature of Suit 352 - Military Pay - Retirement
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1491 Tucker Act
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition Preliminary Injunction
County
Terminated 3/15/1996
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flag CLOSED
  Entries (9) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 8 Filed: 3/15/1996, Entered: 3/22/1996 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by OLIN WILLIAMS and USA. Service:3/15/96. Complaint dismissed pursuant to Rule 41 (a)(1)(B) this day. Copy to parties. Nature of Jgm DP (HW)
    LREF
    Blank -- Filed: 3/15/1996, Entered: 3/22/1996 Terminated Case
    Case closed. (HW)
      LREF
      Blank 7 Filed: 2/29/1996, Entered: 3/6/1996 OrderCourt Filing
      ORDER granting [6-1] motion to Stay proceedings , (until March 11, 1996). Defendant shall respond to complaint by Answer deadline of 3/15/96 , if a stipulation of dismissal has not been filed by that date ( signed by Chief Judge Loren A. Smith for Chief Judge Loren A. Smith for Judge Christine O. Miller ) Copy to parties. (HW)
        LREF
        Blank 6 Filed: 2/26/1996, Entered: 3/1/1996, Terminated: 2/29/1996 Terminated:
        MOTION by USA (Service: 2/26/96) to Stay proceedings [to March 11, 1996]. (FE)
          LREF
          Blank 5 Filed: 12/13/1995, Entered: 12/18/1995 OrderCourt Filing
          ORDER granting [4-1] motion to Extend Time to respond to complaint ; Answer deadline to 2/26/96 ( signed by Judge Christine O. Miller ). Copy to parties. (HW)
            LREF
            Blank 4 Filed: 12/11/1995, Entered: 12/14/1995, Terminated: 12/13/1995 Terminated:
            MOTION by USA (Service: 12/11/95) to Extend Time to respond to complaint [to February 25, 1996]. (FE)
              LREF
              Blank 3 Filed: 11/21/1995, Entered: 11/30/1995 Notice of Appearance/
              NOTICE of Attorney Appearance for USA by Laureen Kapin Service : 11/21/95 (FE)
                LREF
                Blank 2 Filed: 10/27/1995, Entered: 11/1/1995 Case Assigned/ReassignedCourt Filing
                Notice of assignment to Judge Christine O. Miller. Copy to parties. (FE)
                  LREF
                  Blank 1 Filed: 10/27/1995, Entered: 11/1/1995 Complaint
                  COMPLAINT, FILING FEE $120, RECEIPT #040355. Answer due on 12/26/95. (FE)
                    LREF

                    Statistics

                    This case has been viewed 142 times.

                    No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                    Space
                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                     
                    PlainSite
                    Sign Up
                    Need Password Help?