CENLAR CAPITAL, et al v. USA
Federal Civil Lawsuit United States Court of Federal Claims, Case No. 1:95-cv-00730-LAS
District Judge Loren A. Smith, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo CENLAR CAPITAL CORPORATION, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Joseph Patrick Daly +1 202 362 0840
No Logo CENLAR FEDERAL SAVINGS BANK, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Joseph Patrick Daly +1 202 362 0840
v.
United States of America United States of America, Defendant
Officially listed as "USA"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Delisa Maria Sanchez +1 202 616 0337 +1 202 305 7643 delisa.sanchez@usdoj.gov
Office COFC
Filed 11/3/1995
Jury Demand
Demand $0
Nature of Suit 511 - Taking - FIRREA
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1491 Tucker Act
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition Preliminary Injunction
County
Terminated 6/10/2002
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flag CLOSED
  Entries (51) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 48 Filed: 6/10/2002, Entered: 6/10/2002
Stipulation of Voluntary Dismissal by CENLAR CAPITAL, CENLAR FEDERAL and USA. Complaint dismissed with prejudice pursuant to Rule 41 (a)(1)(ii). Copy to parties. (AB)
    LREF
    Blank -- Filed: 6/10/2002, Entered: 11/14/2002 Terminated Case
    Case closed (FE)
      LREF
      Blank 47 Filed: 1/7/2002, Entered: 1/8/2002 OrderCourt Filing
      ORDER re: discovery. ( signed by Sr. Judge Loren A. Smith ) Copy to parties. (FE)
        LREF
        Blank 46 Filed: 8/7/2000, Entered: 8/8/2000 Terminated:
        MOTION by CENLAR CAPITAL, CENLAR FEDERAL (Service : 7/20/00 ) to substitute attorney (consented) Terminated attorney Sean Patrick Murphy for CENLAR FEDERAL, attorney Sean Patrick Murphy for CENLAR CAPITAL Added Joseph Patrick Daly. (JT)
          LREF
          Blank 45 Filed: 8/7/2000, Entered: 8/8/2000 ~Notice (other)Court Filing
          NOTICE of Opt-Out of Third Discovery Wave by CENLAR CAPITAL, CENLAR FEDERAL. Filed by leave of the Judge. Service: 7/24/00 (JT)
            LREF
            Blank 44 Filed: 2/16/2000, Entered: 2/17/2000 Notice of Appearance/
            NOTICE of Attorney Appearance for USA by Delisa Maria Sanchez. Service : 2/16/00 (JT)
              LREF
              Blank 43 Filed: 5/3/1999, Entered: 5/5/1999 ~Notice (other)
              NOTICE of Opt-Out of Second Discovery Wave by CENLAR CAPITAL, CENLAR FEDERAL. Service: 5/3/99 (JT)
                LREF
                Blank 42 Filed: 4/6/1999, Entered: 4/12/1999 Remark
                See Order of 4/6/99 in 90-8 (JT)
                  LREF
                  Blank 41 Filed: 1/6/1999, Entered: 1/8/1999 Terminated:
                  MOTION by USA (Service : 1/5/99 ) for Leave to file motion to renew the stay of proceedings on motions for summary judgment in certain cases . Response due: 1/22/99. (FE)
                    LREF
                    Blank 40 Filed: 10/13/1998, Entered: 10/15/1998 Reply to Response to Motion
                    REPLY by CENLAR CAPITAL, CENLAR FEDERAL to response to [27-1] motion for Summary Judgment relating to liability. Service: 10/13/98. (HW)
                      LREF
                      Blank 39 Filed: 9/16/1998, Entered: 9/22/1998 OrderCourt Filing
                      ORDER memorializing the oral order of the court of August 11, 1998. Pursuant to that oral order, consideration of the motions for summary judgment, including any briefing not yet complete, is stayed until October 13, 1998. (See Order in 90-8) ( signed by Chief Judge Loren A. Smith ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                        LREF
                        Blank 38 Filed: 8/28/1998, Entered: 8/31/1998 Reply to Response to MotionCourt Filing
                        REPLY by USA to response to [32-1] motion to Stay proceedings. Filed by leave of the Judge. Service: 8/7/98 (JT)
                          LREF
                          Blank 37 Filed: 8/28/1998, Entered: 8/31/1998 OrderCourt Filing
                          ORDER granting [35-1] motion for Leave to File, Out of Time, Reply to Plaintiffs' Opposition to Motion to Stay. ( signed by Chief Judge Loren A. Smith ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                            LREF
                            Blank 36 Filed: 8/11/1998, Entered: 8/13/1998 Terminated:
                            MOTION by USA (Service : 8/11/98 ) for Leave to file supplemental authority with court . Response due: 8/28/98 (HW)
                              LREF
                              Blank 35 Filed: 8/7/1998, Entered: 8/12/1998, Terminated: 8/28/1998 Terminated:
                              MOTION by USA (Service : 8/7/98 ) for Leave to File, Out of Time, Reply to Plaintiffs' Opposition to Motion to Stay. Response due: 8/24/98 (JT)
                                LREF
                                Blank 34 Filed: 7/20/1998, Entered: 7/23/1998 Memorandum
                                120 Day Response by USA re: [27-1] motion for Summary Judgment relating to liability by CENLAR FEDERAL, CENLAR CAPITAL. Service: 7/20/98 (JT) Modified on 07/23/1998
                                  LREF
                                  Blank -- Filed: 7/20/1998, Entered: 7/24/1998 Set/Reset Deadlines:
                                  Deadline updated; Plaintiffs' Reply to Response to Motion reset to 8/20/98 for [27-1] motion for Summary Judgment relating to liability. (JT)
                                    LREF
                                    Blank 32 Filed: 7/15/1998, Entered: 7/20/1998 Terminated:
                                    MOTION by USA (Service: 7/15/98) to Stay proceedings . Response due: 8/5/98. (HW)
                                      LREF
                                      Blank 33 Filed: 7/13/1998, Entered: 7/20/1998 Terminated:
                                      RESPONSE by CENLAR CAPITAL, CENLAR FEDERAL (Service: 7/13/98 ) to [32-1] motion to Stay proceedings. Reply due: 7/27/98. (FE)
                                        LREF
                                        Blank 31 Filed: 7/13/1998, Entered: 7/17/1998 Response to Order to Show Cause
                                        Response to order to show cause by USA. Service: 7/1/98 (JT)
                                          LREF
                                          Blank 30 Filed: 7/13/1998, Entered: 7/17/1998 OrderCourt Filing
                                          ORDER granting [29-1] motion for Leave to File, Out of Time, Response to the Court's Order to Show Cause. ( signed by Chief Judge Loren A. Smith ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                                            LREF
                                            Blank 29 Filed: 7/1/1998, Entered: 7/6/1998, Terminated: 7/13/1998 Terminated:
                                            MOTION by USA (Service : 7/1/98 ) for Leave to File, Out of Time, Response to the Court's Order to Show Cause. Response due: 7/20/98 (JT)
                                              LREF
                                              Blank 28 Filed: 5/22/1998, Entered: 5/28/1998 Terminated:
                                              RESPONSE by USA (Service: 5/22/98 ) to [27-1] motion for Summary Judgment relating to liability. Reply due: 8/10/98 (JT)
                                                LREF
                                                Blank 27 Filed: 3/23/1998, Entered: 3/24/1998 Terminated:
                                                SHORT FORM MOTION by CENLAR CAPITAL, CENLAR FEDERAL (Service : 3/23/98 ) for Summary Judgment relating to liability. Response due: 5/22/98 FILED UNDER SEAL (JT) Modified on 03/24/1998
                                                  LREF
                                                  Blank -- Filed: 3/23/1998, Entered: 3/24/1998 Set/Reset Deadlines:
                                                  Deadline updated; Response to [27-1] motion for Summary Judgment relating to liability reset to 5/22/98. (JT)
                                                    LREF
                                                    Blank 26 Filed: 8/28/1997, Entered: 9/4/1997 Terminated:
                                                    MOTION by CENLAR CAPITAL, CENLAR FEDERAL (Service : 8/28/97 ) for Clarification of Procedural Order No. 1 . Response due: 9/15/97 (DS)
                                                      LREF
                                                      Blank 25 Filed: 8/22/1997, Entered: 8/26/1997 Terminated:
                                                      MOTION by CENLAR CAPITAL, CENLAR FEDERAL (Service: 8/20/97) to substitute attorney (consented) Terminated attorney Marc Paul Levy for CENLAR FEDERAL, attorney Marc Paul Levy for CENLAR CAPITAL Added Sean Patrick Murphy. (HW)
                                                        LREF
                                                        Blank 24 Filed: 1/15/1997, Entered: 1/21/1997 Terminated:
                                                        MOTION by CENLAR CAPITAL and CENLAR FEDERAL (Service: 1/15/97 ) to substitute attorney (consented) Terminated attorney William Edward Donnelly for CENLAR FEDERAL, attorney William Edward Donnelly for CENLAR CAPITAL Added Marc Paul Levy. Response due: (HW)
                                                          LREF
                                                          Blank 23 Filed: 1/7/1997, Entered: 1/10/1997 OrderCourt Filing
                                                          SEE 95-660C FOR OPINION denying [18-1] motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction ( signed by Judge John P. Wiese ) Copy to parties. (DS)
                                                            LREF
                                                            Blank 22 Filed: 12/5/1996, Entered: 12/9/1996 OrderCourt Filing
                                                            SEE 95-660C FOR ORDER oral argument set for 10:30 a.m. on 12/19/96 for [18-1] motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction signed by Judge John P. Wiese). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                              LREF
                                                              Blank 21 Filed: 10/28/1996, Entered: 10/30/1996 Notice of Appearance/
                                                              NOTICE of Attorney Appearance for USA by Jonathan Bruce Taylor. Service : 10/28/96 (HW)
                                                                LREF
                                                                Blank 20 Filed: 10/8/1996, Entered: 10/9/1996 Terminated:
                                                                RESPONSE by CENLAR CAPITAL, CENLAR FEDERAL (Service by hand: 10/8/96 ) to [18-1] motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction. Reply due: 10/18/96 (HW)
                                                                  LREF
                                                                  Blank 19 Filed: 10/7/1996, Entered: 10/8/1996 Case Assigned/ReassignedCourt Filing
                                                                  See 90-8C for Notice of reassignment to Judge John P. Wiese. Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                    LREF
                                                                    Blank 18 Filed: 9/9/1996, Entered: 9/16/1996 Terminated:
                                                                    MOTION by USA (Service: 9/9/96) to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction . Response due: 10/10/96 (FE)
                                                                      LREF
                                                                      Blank 17 Filed: 8/28/1996, Entered: 9/13/1996 Case Assigned/ReassignedCourt Filing
                                                                      SEE ORDER IN 90-8C for Notice of reassignment to Chief Judge Loren A. Smith. Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                        LREF
                                                                        Blank 16 Filed: 8/20/1996, Entered: 8/26/1996 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                        ORDER granting [15-1] motion for Leave to File attached proposed pretrial order (signed by Judge Moody R. Tidwell, III). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                          LREF
                                                                          Blank 15 Filed: 8/16/1996, Entered: 8/21/1996, Terminated: 8/20/1996 Terminated:
                                                                          MOTION by USA (Service : 8/16/96 ) for Leave to File attached proposed pretrial order. Response due: 9/3/96 (HW)
                                                                            LREF
                                                                            Blank 14 Filed: 7/25/1996, Entered: 7/29/1996 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                            ORDER granting [13-1] motion for Leave to File copy of motion to adopt special case management procedures (signed by Judge Moody R. Tidwell, III). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                              LREF
                                                                              Blank 13 Filed: 7/23/1996, Entered: 7/25/1996, Terminated: 7/25/1996 Terminated:
                                                                              MOTION by USA (Service: 7/23/96) for Leave to File copy of motion to adopt special case management procedures . Response due: 8/9/96 (FE)
                                                                                LREF
                                                                                Blank 12 Filed: 6/21/1996, Entered: 6/28/1996 Notice of Change of Address
                                                                                NOTICE of change of address by Steven Eric Gordon (FE)
                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                  Blank 11 Filed: 5/1/1996, Entered: 5/3/1996 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                  ORDER granting [10-1] motion for Leave to File Motion to Adopt Special Case Management Procedures (signed by Judge Moody R. Tidwell, III). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                    Blank 10 Filed: 4/29/1996, Entered: 5/1/1996, Terminated: 5/1/1996 Terminated:
                                                                                    MOTION by USA (Service: 4/26/96) for Leave to File Motion to Adopt Special Case Management Procedures . Response due: 5/13/96. (FE)
                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                      Blank 9 Filed: 3/19/1996, Entered: 3/25/1996 Terminated:
                                                                                      MOTION by USA (Service : 3/19/96 ) for Leave to File notice and declaration re:certain documents that may be relevant to this action Response due: 4/5/96 (FE)
                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                        Blank 8 Filed: 1/3/1996, Entered: 1/5/1996 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                        ORDER plaintiffs' response to motion for a stay of proceedings, received 12/28/95, is MOOT, motion was granted on 12/21/95 ( signed by Judge Moody R. Tidwell III ). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                          Blank 7 Filed: 12/21/1995, Entered: 1/2/1996 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                          ORDER granting [6-1] motion to Stay pending decision in Winstar ( signed by Judge Moody R. Tidwell III ) Copy to parties. (HW)
                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                            Blank 6 Filed: 12/19/1995, Entered: 12/28/1995, Terminated: 12/21/1995 Terminated:
                                                                                            MOTION by USA (Service: 12/18/95) to Stay pending decision in Winstar . (FE)
                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                              Blank 5 Filed: 11/21/1995, Entered: 11/30/1995 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                              NOTICE of Attorney Appearance for USA by Steven Eric Gordon Service : 11/21/95 (HW)
                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                Blank 4 Filed: 11/13/1995, Entered: 11/17/1995 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                ORDER informing parties of two rules that will apply to litigation (signed by Judge Moody R. Tidwell III). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                  Blank 3 Filed: 11/3/1995, Entered: 11/7/1995 Notice of Related Cases
                                                                                                  NOTICE by CENLAR CAPITAL, CENLAR FEDERAL of related case(s). (FE)
                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                    Blank 2 Filed: 11/3/1995, Entered: 11/7/1995 Case Assigned/ReassignedCourt Filing
                                                                                                    Notice of assigned to Judge Moody R. Tidwell III. Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                      Blank 1 Filed: 11/3/1995, Entered: 11/7/1995 Complaint
                                                                                                      COMPLAINT (Filed with Exhibits 1 through 4), FILING FEE $120, RECEIPT #040375. Answer due on 1/2/96. (FE)
                                                                                                        LREF

                                                                                                        Statistics

                                                                                                        This case has been viewed 249 times.

                                                                                                        No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                        Space
                                                                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                         
                                                                                                        PlainSite
                                                                                                        Sign Up
                                                                                                        Need Password Help?