PARSKY, et al v. USA
Federal Civil Lawsuit United States Court of Federal Claims, Case No. 1:95-cv-00731-LMB
District Judge Lawrence M. Baskir, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo GERALD L. PARSKY, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Gibson Dunn & Crutcher, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space John Curry Millian +1 202 955 8500 +1 202 467 0539 jmillian@gibsondunn.com
v.
United States of America United States of America, Defendant
Officially listed as "USA"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space David Charles Hoffman +1 202 616 0341 +1 202 514 8624 david.hoffman3@usdoj.gov
Office COFC
Filed 11/6/1995
Jury Demand
Demand $0
Nature of Suit 511 - Taking - FIRREA
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1491 Tucker Act
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition Preliminary Injunction
County
Terminated 12/14/2001
Origin 1
Reopened
Lead Case
193-cv-00052-LMB None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flags CLOSED, MEMBER
  Entries (40) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 35 Filed: 8/2/2002, Entered: 8/2/2002
MANDATE (certified copy) from CAFC dated August 2, 2002 dismissed [34-1] appeal by GERALD L. PARSKY. (HW)
    LREF
    Blank -- Filed: 4/3/2002, Entered: 4/11/2002 CAFC Case Number
    CAFC Case Number Re: [34-1] appeal by GERALD L. PARSKY. CAFC NUMBER: 02-5087. (HW)
      LREF
      Blank 34 Filed: 3/4/2002, Entered: 3/5/2002 Terminated: Court Filing
      NOTICE OF APPEAL by GERALD L. PARSKY. Copy to Chief Judge Lawrence M. Baskir, Defendant and to CAFC. FILING FEE $ 105.00; RECEIPT # 053359. (HW)
        LREF
        Blank 33 Filed: 12/14/2001, Entered: 12/14/2001
        JUDGMENT entered, pursuant to Rule 58, that the complaint is dismissed. Each party to bear its own costs. (signed by Clerk). Copy to parties. (LD)
          LREF
          Blank -- Filed: 12/14/2001, Entered: 12/14/2001
          Case closed (LD)
            LREF
            Blank -- Filed: 12/28/2000, Entered: 12/28/2000
            CASE reassigned to Chief Judge Lawrence M. Baskir . (DS)
              LREF
              Blank 32 Filed: 2/24/2000, Entered: 2/25/2000 Notice of Appearance/
              NOTICE of Attorney Appearance for USA by David Charles Hoffman. Service : 2/24/00 (JT)
                LREF
                Blank 31 Filed: 2/9/2000, Entered: 2/22/2000 OrderCourt Filing
                SEE NO. 93-52C FOR ORDER Consolidating Cases. ( signed by Chief Judge Loren A. Smith ) Copy to parties. (DS)
                  LREF
                  Blank -- Filed: 2/9/2000, Entered: 2/22/2000 Set/Clear Flags
                  Consolidated Member Case. See lead case number 93-cv-52 for further proceedings. (DS)
                    LREF
                    Blank 30 Filed: 12/10/1999, Entered: 12/15/1999 Remark
                    Joint Motion to Consolidate filed in Southern California Federal 93-52C. (JT)
                      LREF
                      Blank 29 Filed: 4/6/1999, Entered: 4/12/1999 Remark
                      See Order of 4/6/99 in 90-8 (JT)
                        LREF
                        Blank 28 Filed: 6/3/1998, Entered: 6/5/1998 OrderCourt Filing
                        See Lead Case, 95-660C for ORDER dated 6/3/98 ( signed by Chief Judge Loren A. Smith ). Copy to parties. (HW)
                          LREF
                          Blank -- Filed: 6/3/1998, Entered: 6/5/1998 Set/Clear Flags
                          Consolidated Member Case. See lead case number 95- 660 C for further proceedings. (HW)
                            LREF
                            Blank 27 Filed: 4/22/1998, Entered: 4/29/1998 Remark
                            See 95-660C for joint motion for leave to file motion to consolidate related claims; order granting motion for leave; joint motion to consolidate related claims; and defendant's response to motion to consolidate. (4 separate items) (DS)
                              LREF
                              Blank 26 Filed: 3/31/1998, Entered: 4/2/1998 Notice of Appearance/
                              NOTICE of Attorney Appearance for USA by Ming-Yuen Meyer-Fong. Service : 3/30/98. (HW)
                                LREF
                                Blank 25 Filed: 2/20/1998, Entered: 2/23/1998 Reply to Response to Motion
                                SEE 92-820C FOR REPLY by FDIC to response to [23-1] motion to Consolidate this case with 92-820 C, 95-797 C, and 95-803 C . Service: 2/9/98 (DS)
                                  LREF
                                  Blank 24 Filed: 2/20/1998, Entered: 2/23/1998 Terminated:
                                  SEE 92-820C FOR RESPONSE by USA (Service: 1/29/98 ) to [23-1] motion to Consolidate this case with 92-820 C, 95-797 C, and 95-803 C (DS)
                                    LREF
                                    Blank 23 Filed: 1/8/1998, Entered: 1/15/1998 Terminated:
                                    MOTION by FDIC (Service : 1/5/98 ) to Consolidate this case with 92-820 C, 95-797 C, and 95-803 C . Response due: 1/22/98 (HW) Modified on 02/23/1998
                                      LREF
                                      Blank 22 Filed: 10/30/1997, Entered: 11/12/1997 Terminated:
                                      MOTION by FDIC (Service : 10/30/97 ) to substitute attorney (consented) Terminated attorney Robert Joel Soffer for FDIC Added Michael McGaughran. (HW)
                                        LREF
                                        Blank 21 Filed: 7/21/1997, Entered: 7/22/1997 Notice of Appearance/
                                        NOTICE of Attorney Appearance for USA by Craig Randall Gottlieb Service : 7/21/97 (CDC)
                                          LREF
                                          Blank 20 Filed: 3/26/1997, Entered: 4/3/1997 Intervenor Complaint
                                          Intervenor's COMPLAINT by FDIC against USA. Service: 3/26/97. Fee not required ( Answer due 5/28/97 ). (HW)
                                            LREF
                                            Blank 19 Filed: 1/7/1997, Entered: 1/10/1997 OrderCourt Filing
                                            SEE 95-660C FOR OPINION denying [14-1] motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction ( signed by Judge John P. Wiese ) Copy to parties. (DS)
                                              LREF
                                              Blank 18 Filed: 12/5/1996, Entered: 12/9/1996 OrderCourt Filing
                                              SEE 95-660C FOR ORDER oral argument set for 10:30 a.m. on 12/19/96 for [14-1] motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction (signed by Judge John P. Wiese). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                LREF
                                                Blank 17 Filed: 11/25/1996, Entered: 11/27/1996 Terminated:
                                                RESPONSE by GERALD L. PARSKY to FDIC's motion to intevene [motion filed in 90-8C]. Service: 11/25/96 (FE)
                                                  LREF
                                                  Blank 16 Filed: 10/8/1996, Entered: 10/9/1996 Terminated:
                                                  RESPONSE by GERALD L. PARSKY (Service by hand: 10/8/96 ) to [14-1] motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction. Reply due: 10/18/96 (HW)
                                                    LREF
                                                    Blank 15 Filed: 10/7/1996, Entered: 10/8/1996 Case Assigned/ReassignedCourt Filing
                                                    See 90-8C for Notice of reassignment to Judge John P. Wiese. Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                      LREF
                                                      Blank 14 Filed: 9/9/1996, Entered: 9/16/1996 Terminated:
                                                      MOTION by USA (Service: 9/9/96) to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction . Response due: 10/10/96 (FE)
                                                        LREF
                                                        Blank 13 Filed: 8/16/1996, Entered: 8/20/1996 Terminated:
                                                        MOTION by USA (Service : 8/16/96 ) for Leave to File attached proposed pretrial order. Response due: 9/3/96 (HW)
                                                          LREF
                                                          Blank 12 Filed: 7/31/1996, Entered: 8/5/1996 OrderCourt Filing
                                                          SEE 90-581C FOR ORDER granting [11-1] motion for Leave to File copy of motion to adopt special case management procedures (by Chief Judge Loren A. Smith). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                            LREF
                                                            Blank 11 Filed: 7/23/1996, Entered: 7/25/1996, Terminated: 7/31/1996 Terminated:
                                                            MOTION by USA (Service: 7/23/96) for Leave to File copy of motion to adopt special case management procedures . Response due: 8/9/96 (FE)
                                                              LREF
                                                              Blank 10 Filed: 6/24/1996, Entered: 6/28/1996 Notice of Change of Address
                                                              NOTICE of change of address by Lesleyanne Koch Kessler (FE)
                                                                LREF
                                                                Blank 9 Filed: 4/26/1996, Entered: 4/30/1996 Terminated:
                                                                MOTION by USA (Service : 4/26/96 ) for Leave to File a copy of the motion to adopt special case management procedures . Response due: 5/13/96 (HW)
                                                                  LREF
                                                                  Blank 8 Filed: 4/11/1996, Entered: 4/18/1996 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                  SEE 90-581C for ORDER granting [7-1] motion for Leave to File a notice an attached declaration (signed by Chief Judge Loren A. Smith). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                    LREF
                                                                    Blank 7 Filed: 3/19/1996, Entered: 3/25/1996, Terminated: 4/11/1996 Terminated:
                                                                    MOTION by USA (Service : 3/19/96) for Leave to File a notice an attached declaration Response due: 4/5/96 (FE)
                                                                      LREF
                                                                      Blank 6 Filed: 12/15/1995, Entered: 12/19/1995 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                      ORDER Staying pending response of Supreme Court to petition for writ of certiorari , set Notice of Compliance [amended complaints, answers or motions placing no immediatee burden on opposing party] deadline to 9/9/99 and set Brief [any response] deadline to 9/9/99 [30 days after stay is lifted] (signed by Chief Judge Loren A. Smith). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                        LREF
                                                                        Blank 5 Filed: 12/7/1995, Entered: 12/11/1995 Case Assigned/ReassignedCourt Filing
                                                                        Notice of reassignment to Chief Judge Loren A. Smith. Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                          LREF
                                                                          Blank 4 Filed: 11/22/1995, Entered: 11/29/1995 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                          NOTICE of Attorney Appearance for USA by Lesleyanne Koch Kessler. Service : 11/21/95 (HW)
                                                                            LREF
                                                                            Blank 3 Filed: 11/6/1995, Entered: 11/8/1995 Notice of Related Cases
                                                                            NOTICE by GERALD L. PARSKY of related case(s). (92-820 C, 93-52 C, 95-660 C). (FE)
                                                                              LREF
                                                                              Blank 2 Filed: 11/6/1995, Entered: 11/8/1995 Case Assigned/ReassignedCourt Filing
                                                                              Notice of assignment to Judge John P. Wiese. Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                LREF
                                                                                Blank 1 Filed: 11/6/1995, Entered: 11/8/1995 Complaint
                                                                                COMPLAINT, FILING FEE $120, RECEIPT #040399. Answer due on 1/5/96. (FE)
                                                                                  LREF

                                                                                  Statistics

                                                                                  This case has been viewed 173 times.

                                                                                  No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                  Space
                                                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                   
                                                                                  PlainSite
                                                                                  Sign Up
                                                                                  Need Password Help?