MERCANTILE BANK v. USA
Federal Civil Lawsuit United States Court of Federal Claims, Case No. 1:95-cv-00732-LAS
District Judge Loren A. Smith, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Mercantile Bank Of St. Louis NA, Plaintiff
Officially listed as "MERCANTILE BANK OF ST. LOUIS NATIONAL ASSOCIATION"

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space James P Murphy +1 406 256 9700 +2569 256 256 9755 jamey.murphy09@gmail.com
v.
United States of America United States of America, Defendant
Officially listed as "USA"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space William George Kanellis +1 202 353 0526 +1 202 514 8640 william.kanellis@usdoj.gov
Office COFC
Filed 11/6/1995
Jury Demand
Demand $1000000
Nature of Suit 511 - Taking - FIRREA
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1491 Tucker Act
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition Preliminary Injunction
County
Terminated 11/21/2002
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flag CLOSED
  Entries (47) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 45 Filed: 11/21/2002, Entered: 12/6/2002 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by MERCANTILE BANK, USA . Complaint dismissed pursuant to Rule 41 (a)(1)(ii). Copy to parties. (DS)
    LREF
    Blank -- Filed: 11/21/2002, Entered: 12/6/2002 Terminated Case
    Case closed (DS)
      LREF
      Blank 44 Filed: 11/15/2002, Entered: 11/20/2002 OrderCourt Filing
      ORDER for Plaintiff's counsel to advise the court no later than 11/29/02 whether it will file a motion for voluntary dismissal (signed by Judge Robert H. Hodges). Copy to parties. (LTD)
        LREF
        Blank 43 Filed: 11/12/2002, Entered: 11/14/2002 Terminated:
        RESPONSE by MERCANTILE BANK (Service: 11/12/02) to [42-1] motion to Compel Plaintiff's Production of Documents. Reply due: 11/26/0.2 (LTD)
          LREF
          Blank 42 Filed: 10/28/2002, Entered: 10/30/2002 Terminated:
          MOTION by USA (Service : 10/28/02 (by hand)) to Compel Plaintiff's Production of Documents. Response due: 11/12/02 (JT)
            LREF
            Blank 41 Filed: 7/8/2002, Entered: 7/10/2002 Answer
            ANSWER to Complaint by USA. Service: 7/8/02 (JPSR due 8/29/02). (LTD)
              LREF
              Blank 40 Filed: 2/1/2002, Entered: 2/1/2002, Terminated: 2/1/2002 Motion to Substitute Attorney (Consented)
              MOTION by MERCANTILE BANK (Service: 2/1/02) to substitute attorney (consented) Terminated attorney David Michael Schwartz for MERCANTILE BANK Added James P. Murphy. (LTD)
                LREF
                Blank 39 Filed: 1/7/2002, Entered: 1/8/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                ORDER re: discovery. ( signed by Sr. Judge Loren A. Smith ) Copy to parties. (FE)
                  LREF
                  Blank 38 Filed: 11/15/2000, Entered: 11/17/2000 Notice of Appearance/
                  NOTICE of Attorney Appearance for USA by William George Kanellis Service : 11/9/00 (JT)
                    LREF
                    Blank 37 Filed: 7/19/2000, Entered: 7/22/2000 ~Notice (other)
                    NOTICE of Decision to Opt Out of Case-Specific Discovery by MERCANTILE BANK. Service: 7/19/00 (JT)
                      LREF
                      Blank 36 Filed: 7/5/2000, Entered: 7/11/2000 Terminated:
                      MOTION by MERCANTILE BANK (Service : 7/5/00 ) to substitute attorney (consented) Terminated attorney John Van Arnum Austin for MERCANTILE BANK Added David Michael Schwartz. (JT)
                        LREF
                        Blank 35 Filed: 4/29/1999, Entered: 5/4/1999 ~Notice (other)
                        NOTICE of decision to opt out of case-specific discovery by MERCANTILE BANK. Service: 4/29/99 (HW)
                          LREF
                          Blank 34 Filed: 1/4/1999, Entered: 1/6/1999 ~Notice (other)
                          NOTICE of Decision to Opt Out of Case-Specific Discovery by MERCANTILE BANK. Service: 12/31/98 (JT)
                            LREF
                            Blank 33 Filed: 5/29/1998, Entered: 6/1/1998 Notice of Appearance/
                            NOTICE of Attorney Appearance for USA by Renee Brooker. Service : 5/29/98 (CDC)
                              LREF
                              Blank 32 Filed: 1/7/1997, Entered: 1/10/1997 OrderCourt Filing
                              SEE 95-660C FOR OPINION denying [27-1] motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction ( signed by Judge John P. Wiese ) Copy to parties. (DS)
                                LREF
                                Blank 31 Filed: 12/5/1996, Entered: 12/9/1996 OrderCourt Filing
                                SEE 95-660C FOR ORDER oral argument set for 10:30 a.m. on 12/19/96 for [27-1] motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction signed by Judge John P. Wiese). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                  LREF
                                  Blank 30 Filed: 10/31/1996, Entered: 11/5/1996 Notice of Appearance/
                                  NOTICE of Attorney Appearance for USA by Lydia Kay Griggsby Service : 10/31/96 (FE)
                                    LREF
                                    Blank 29 Filed: 10/8/1996, Entered: 10/9/1996 Terminated:
                                    RESPONSE by MERCANTILE BANK (Service by hand: 10/8/96 ) to [27-1] motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction. Reply due: 10/18/96 (HW)
                                      LREF
                                      Blank 28 Filed: 10/7/1996, Entered: 10/8/1996 Case Assigned/ReassignedCourt Filing
                                      See 90-8C for Notice of reassignment to Judge John P. Wiese. Copy to parties. (FE)
                                        LREF
                                        Blank 27 Filed: 9/9/1996, Entered: 9/16/1996 Terminated:
                                        MOTION by USA (Service: 9/9/96) to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction . Response due: 10/10/96 (FE)
                                          LREF
                                          Blank 26 Filed: 8/30/1996, Entered: 9/4/1996 Status Report
                                          STATUS REPORT by MERCANTILE BANK. Service: 8/30/96. (HW)
                                            LREF
                                            Blank 25 Filed: 8/28/1996, Entered: 9/3/1996 Case Assigned/ReassignedCourt Filing
                                            SEE ORDER IN 90-8C for Notice of reassignment to Chief Judge Loren A. Smith. Copy to parties. (FE)
                                              LREF
                                              Blank 24 Filed: 8/23/1996, Entered: 8/28/1996 OrderCourt Filing
                                              ORDER granting [23-1] motion for Leave to File attached proposed pretrial order (signed by Judge Marian Blank Horn). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                LREF
                                                Blank 23 Filed: 8/16/1996, Entered: 8/20/1996, Terminated: 8/23/1996 Terminated:
                                                MOTION by USA (Service : 8/16/96 ) for Leave to File attached proposed pretrial order. Response due: 9/3/96 (HW)
                                                  LREF
                                                  Blank 22 Filed: 7/26/1996, Entered: 7/31/1996 Terminated:
                                                  MOTION by USA (Service : 7/26/96 ) for Leave to File motion to adopt special case management procedures . Response due: 8/12/96 (FE)
                                                    LREF
                                                    Blank 21 Filed: 7/26/1996, Entered: 7/30/1996 Status Report/OrderCourt Filing
                                                    STATUS REPORT ORDER. Status report due on 8/30/96 and returning case to an active status (signed by Judge Marian Blank Horn). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                      LREF
                                                      Blank 20 Filed: 7/11/1996, Entered: 7/16/1996 Status Report
                                                      Joint STATUS REPORT by MERCANTILE BANK and USA. Service: 7/11/96. (HW)
                                                        LREF
                                                        Blank 19 Filed: 7/8/1996, Entered: 7/11/1996 Notice of Change of Address
                                                        NOTICE of change of address by Darshpaul Singh Padda (FE)
                                                          LREF
                                                          Blank 18 Filed: 6/4/1996, Entered: 6/6/1996 OrderCourt Filing
                                                          ORDER addressing recent ruling in all Winstar related cases and reminding parties that all previously set reporting requirements remain in effect in this case (signed by Judge Marian Blank Horn). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                            LREF
                                                            Blank 17 Filed: 5/28/1996, Entered: 5/31/1996 Terminated:
                                                            RESPONSE by MERCANTILE BANK (Service: 5/28/96) to [14-1] motion for Leave to File a copy of the motion to adopt special case management procedures. Reply due: 6/10/96 (FE)
                                                              LREF
                                                              Blank 16 Filed: 5/17/1996, Entered: 5/21/1996 OrderCourt Filing
                                                              ORDER granting [15-1] motion to Extend Time within which to respond to defendant's motion for leave file a copy of the motion to adopt special case management prcedures and Response to [14-1] motion for Leave to File a copy of the motion to adopt special case management procedures reset to 5/28/96 (signed by Judge Marian Horn). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                LREF
                                                                Blank 15 Filed: 5/9/1996, Entered: 5/14/1996, Terminated: 5/17/1996 Terminated:
                                                                MOTION by MERCANTILE BANK (Service : 5/9/96 ) to Extend Time within which to respond to defndant's to adpbt special case management prcedures , (until May 27, 1996) (HW)
                                                                  LREF
                                                                  Blank 14 Filed: 4/26/1996, Entered: 4/30/1996 Terminated:
                                                                  MOTION by USA (Service : 4/26/96 ) for Leave to File a copy of the motion to adopt special case management procedures . Response due: 5/13/96 (HW)
                                                                    LREF
                                                                    Blank 13 Filed: 4/9/1996, Entered: 4/16/1996 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                    ORDER granting [9-1] motion to Stay proceedings pending Winstar decision . Parties shall file a Joint Status Report (7 days from issuance of decision by the United States Supreme Court in Winstar) deadline to 9/9/99 ( signed by Judge Marian Blank Horn ) Copy to parties. (HW)
                                                                      LREF
                                                                      Blank 12 Filed: 3/19/1996, Entered: 3/25/1996 Terminated:
                                                                      MOTION by USA (Service : 3/19/96) for Leave to File a notice with an attached declaration Response due: 4/5/96 (FE)
                                                                        LREF
                                                                        Blank 11 Filed: 3/13/1996, Entered: 3/19/1996 Terminated:
                                                                        MOTION by USA (Service : 3/12/96) to Extend Time to reply to motion to stay proceedings (to March 12, 1996). Response due: 3/29/96 (FE)
                                                                          LREF
                                                                          Blank 10 Filed: 2/28/1996, Entered: 3/5/1996 Terminated:
                                                                          RESPONSE by MERCANTILE BANK (Service: 2/28/96 ) to [9-1] motion to Stay proceedings pending Winstar decision. Reply due: 3/8/96 (HW)
                                                                            LREF
                                                                            Blank 9 Filed: 2/16/1996, Entered: 2/22/1996, Terminated: 4/9/1996 Terminated:
                                                                            MOTION by USA (Service: 2/15/96) to Stay proceedings pending Winstar decision . Response due: 3/4/96 (FE)
                                                                              LREF
                                                                              Blank 8 Filed: 1/30/1996, Entered: 2/6/1996 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                              ORDER granting [7-1] motion to Extend Time to file a motion to dismiss reset Dispositive Motion Filing deadline to 3/12/96 (signed by Judge Marian B. Horn). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                LREF
                                                                                Blank 7 Filed: 1/16/1996, Entered: 1/24/1996, Terminated: 1/30/1996 Terminated:
                                                                                MOTION by USA (Service: 1/16/96) to Extend Time to file a motion to dismiss [to March 12, 1996]. (FE)
                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                  Blank 6 Filed: 1/3/1996, Entered: 1/11/1996 Transcript
                                                                                  TRANSCRIPT of proceedings re: 1 volume, at Washington, D.C., for date of December 6, 1995. Notice to parties. (FE)
                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                    Blank 5 Filed: 12/7/1995, Entered: 12/11/1995 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                    ORDER set Motion Filing deadline to 1/17/96 , set Brief [response to motion] deadline to 2/14/96 , set Notice of Compliance [reply to response to motion] deadline 2/28/96 , and set Status Report [if relevant circumstances change or decision is issued] deadline [within 5 days of change in status] to 9/9/99 (signed by Judge Marian B. Horn). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                      Blank -- Filed: 12/6/1995, Entered: 12/21/1995 Status Conference
                                                                                      Status Conference held. ( Transcript due 1/5/96 ) (FE)
                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                        Blank 4 Filed: 11/28/1995, Entered: 12/4/1995 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                        NOTICE of Attorney Appearance for USA by Darshpaul Singh Padda. Service: 11/28/95 (FE)
                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                          Blank 3 Filed: 11/21/1995, Entered: 11/27/1995 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                          ORDER set Status Conference for 10:30 a.m. on 12/6/95 (signed by Judge Marian B. Horn). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                            Blank 2 Filed: 11/6/1995, Entered: 11/8/1995 Case Assigned/ReassignedCourt Filing
                                                                                            Notice of assignment to Judge Marian B. Horn. Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document 1 Filed: 11/6/1995, Entered: 11/8/1995 Complaint
                                                                                              COMPLAINT, FILING FEE $120, RECEIPT #040398. Answer due on 1/5/96. (FE) Additional attachment(s) added on 5/2/2008 (hw1, ).
                                                                                              LREF

                                                                                              Statistics

                                                                                              This case has been viewed 177 times.

                                                                                              No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                              Space
                                                                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                               
                                                                                              PlainSite
                                                                                              Sign Up
                                                                                              Need Password Help?