INDEPENDENCE FEDERAL v. USA
Federal Civil Lawsuit United States Court of Federal Claims, Case No. 1:95-cv-00737-LAS
District Judge Loren A. Smith, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo INDEPENDENCE FEDERAL SAVINGS BANK, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Joseph Patrick Daly +1 202 362 0840
v.
United States of America United States of America, Defendant
Officially listed as "USA"

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Brian L. Owsley +1 202 305 7561 +1 202 305 7643
Office COFC
Filed 11/7/1995
Jury Demand
Demand $0
Nature of Suit 511 - Taking - FIRREA
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1491 Tucker Act
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition Preliminary Injunction
County
Terminated 5/30/2002
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flag CLOSED
  Entries (41) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 38 Filed: 5/30/2002, Entered: 5/30/2002
Stipulation of Voluntary Dismissal by INDEPENDENCE FEDERAL and USA. Complaint dismissed with prejudice pursuant to Rule 41 (a)(1)(ii). Copy to parties. (AB)
    LREF
    Blank -- Filed: 5/30/2002, Entered: 5/30/2002
    Case closed (AB)
      LREF
      Blank 37 Filed: 3/4/2002, Entered: 3/5/2002 Notice of Appearance/
      NOTICE of Attorney Appearance for USA by Brian L. Owsley Service: 3/4/02 (DS)
        LREF
        Blank 36 Filed: 1/7/2002, Entered: 1/8/2002 OrderCourt Filing
        ORDER re: discovery. ( signed by Sr. Judge Loren A. Smith ) Copy to parties. (FE)
          LREF
          Blank 35 Filed: 10/10/2000, Entered: 10/12/2000 Notice of Appearance/
          NOTICE of Attorney Appearance for USA by Robert Ernest Leidenheimer Jr. Service : 10/10/00 (JT)
            LREF
            Blank 34 Filed: 7/24/2000, Entered: 7/26/2000 ~Notice (other)
            NOTICE of Opt Out of Third Discovery Wave by INDEPENDENCE FEDERAL. Service: 7/24/00 (JT)
              LREF
              Blank 33 Filed: 7/20/2000, Entered: 7/24/2000 Terminated:
              MOTION by INDEPENDENCE FEDERAL (Service: 7/20/00) to substitute attorney (consented) Terminated attorney Sean Patrick Murphy for INDEPENDENCE FEDERAL Added Joseph Patrick Daly . (FE)
                LREF
                Blank 32 Filed: 5/3/1999, Entered: 5/5/1999 ~Notice (other)
                NOTICE of Opt-Out of Second Discovery Wave by INDEPENDENCE FEDERAL. Service: 5/3/99 (JT)
                  LREF
                  Blank 31 Filed: 9/17/1998, Entered: 9/23/1998 Reply to Response to MotionCourt Filing
                  REPLY by USA to response to [25-1] motion to Stay all motions practice and discovery, [25-2] motion to Extend Time to make a consolidated filing. Filed by leave of the Judge. Service: 8/7/98 (JT)
                    LREF
                    Blank 30 Filed: 9/17/1998, Entered: 9/23/1998 Order
                    ORDER granting [28-1] motion for Leave to File, Out of Time, Reply in Support of Motion for stay or, in the Alternative, an Enlargement of Time for a Consolidated Filing of Briefs. (JT)
                      LREF
                      Blank 29 Filed: 9/16/1998, Entered: 9/22/1998 OrderCourt Filing
                      ORDER memorializing the oral order of the court of August 11, 1998. Pursuant to that oral order, consideration of the motions for summary judgment, including any briefing not yet complete, is stayed until October 13, 1998. (See Order in 90-8) ( signed by Chief Judge Loren A. Smith ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                        LREF
                        Blank 28 Filed: 8/7/1998, Entered: 8/12/1998, Terminated: 9/17/1998 Terminated:
                        MOTION by USA (Service : 8/7/98 ) for Leave to File, Out of Time, Reply in Support of Motion for stay or, in the Alternative, an Enlargement of Time for a Consolidated Filing of Briefs. Response due: 8/24/98 (JT)
                          LREF
                          Blank 27 Filed: 7/20/1998, Entered: 7/22/1998 ~Notice (other)
                          NOTICE of Filing of Motion for Stay by USA. Service: 7/15/98 (JT)
                            LREF
                            Blank 26 Filed: 7/13/1998, Entered: 7/17/1998 Terminated:
                            RESPONSE by INDEPENDENCE FEDERAL to Motion to Stay filed in 90-8. Service: 7/13/98 (JT)
                              LREF
                              Blank 26 Filed: 7/13/1998, Entered: 7/17/1998 Terminated:
                              RESPONSE by INDEPENDENCE FEDERAL (Service: 7/13/98 ) to [25-1] motion to Stay all motions practice and discovery, [25-2] motion to Extend Time to make a consolidated filing. Reply due: 7/23/98 (JT)
                                LREF
                                Blank 25 Filed: 6/26/1998, Entered: 6/30/1998 Terminated:
                                MOTION by USA (Service : 6/26/98 ) to Stay all motions practice and discovery or, in the Alternative, to Extend Time to make a consolidated filing [to September 9, 1998]. Response due: 7/13/98 (JT)
                                  LREF
                                  Blank 24 Filed: 6/3/1998, Entered: 6/5/1998 OrderCourt Filing
                                  ORDER granting [23-1] motion to Extend Time to respond to Plaintiff's short form motion for summary judgment. Response to [22-1] motion for Summary Judgment relating to liability reset to 6/26/98. ( signed by Chief Judge Loren A. Smith ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                                    LREF
                                    Blank 23 Filed: 5/27/1998, Entered: 5/29/1998, Terminated: 6/3/1998 Terminated: Court Filing
                                    MOTION by USA (Service : 5/26/98 ) to Extend Time to respond to Plaintiff's short form motion for summary judgment [to June 26, 1998]. Filed by leave of the Judge. Response due: 6/12/98 (JT) Modified on 05/29/1998
                                      LREF
                                      Blank 22 Filed: 3/23/1998, Entered: 3/24/1998 Terminated:
                                      SHORT FORM MOTION by INDEPENDENCE FEDERAL (Service : 3/23/98 ) for Summary Judgment relating to liability. Response due: 5/22/98 FILED UNDER SEAL (JT) Modified on 03/24/1998
                                        LREF
                                        Blank -- Filed: 3/23/1998, Entered: 3/24/1998 Set/Reset Deadlines:
                                        Deadline updated; Response to [22-1] motion for Summary Judgment relating to liability reset to 5/22/98. (JT)
                                          LREF
                                          Blank 21 Filed: 8/22/1997, Entered: 8/26/1997 Terminated:
                                          MOTION by INDEPENDENCE FEDERAL (Service : 8/20/97 ) to substitute attorney (consented) Terminated attorney Marc Paul Levy for INDEPENDENCE FEDERAL Added Sean Patrick Murphy. (HW)
                                            LREF
                                            Blank 20 Filed: 1/15/1997, Entered: 1/22/1997 Terminated:
                                            MOTION by INDEPENDENCE FEDERAL (Service: 1/15/97) to substitute attorney (consented). Terminated attorney William Edward Donnelly for INDEPENDENCE FEDERAL. Added Marc Paul Levy. (FE)
                                              LREF
                                              Blank 19 Filed: 1/7/1997, Entered: 1/10/1997 OrderCourt Filing
                                              SEE 95-660C FOR OPINION denying [14-1] motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction ( signed by Judge John P. Wiese ) Copy to parties. (DS)
                                                LREF
                                                Blank 18 Filed: 12/5/1996, Entered: 12/9/1996 OrderCourt Filing
                                                SEE 95-660C FOR ORDER oral argument set for 10:30 a.m. on 12/19/96 for [14-1] motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction signed by Judge John P. Wiese). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                  LREF
                                                  Blank 17 Filed: 10/24/1996, Entered: 10/29/1996 Notice of Appearance/
                                                  NOTICE of Attorney Appearance for USA by Henry Roland Felix. Service : 10/24/96. (HW)
                                                    LREF
                                                    Blank 16 Filed: 10/8/1996, Entered: 10/9/1996 Terminated:
                                                    RESPONSE by INDEPENDENCE FEDERAL (Service by hand: 10/8/96 ) to [14-1] motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction. Reply due: 10/18/96 (HW)
                                                      LREF
                                                      Blank 15 Filed: 10/7/1996, Entered: 10/8/1996 Case Assigned/ReassignedCourt Filing
                                                      See 90-8 C for Notice of reassignment to Judge John P. Wiese. Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                        LREF
                                                        Blank 14 Filed: 9/9/1996, Entered: 9/16/1996 Terminated:
                                                        MOTION by USA (Service: 9/9/96) to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction . Response due: 10/10/96 (FE)
                                                          LREF
                                                          Blank 13 Filed: 8/28/1996, Entered: 9/13/1996 Case Assigned/ReassignedCourt Filing
                                                          SEE ORDER IN 90-8C for Notice of reassignment to Chief Judge Loren A. Smith . Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                            LREF
                                                            Blank 12 Filed: 8/16/1996, Entered: 8/20/1996 Terminated:
                                                            MOTION by USA (Service : 8/16/96 ) for Leave to File attached proposed pretrial order. Response due: 9/3/96 (HW)
                                                              LREF
                                                              Blank 11 Filed: 7/24/1996, Entered: 7/26/1996 Terminated:
                                                              MOTION by USA (Service: 7/24/96) for Leave to File copy of motion to adopt special case management procedures . Response due: 8/12/96 (FE)
                                                                LREF
                                                                Blank 10 Filed: 5/9/1996, Entered: 5/14/1996 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                NOTICE of Attorney Appearance for USA by Steven John Gillingham. Service : 5/9/96 (HW)
                                                                  LREF
                                                                  Blank 9 Filed: 4/26/1996, Entered: 4/30/1996 Terminated:
                                                                  MOTION by USA (Service : 4/26/96 ) for Leave to File a copy of the motion to adopt special case management procedures . Response due: 5/13/96 (HW)
                                                                    LREF
                                                                    Blank 8 Filed: 3/20/1996, Entered: 3/26/1996 Terminated:
                                                                    MOTION by USA (Service: 3/20/96) for Leave to File notice and declaration . Response due: 4/8/96 (FE)
                                                                      LREF
                                                                      Blank 7 Filed: 1/26/1996, Entered: 2/1/1996 Terminated: Court Filing
                                                                      RESPONSE by INDEPENDENCE FEDERAL (Service: 1/11/96 ) to [5-1] motion to Stay Proceedings [filed by leave of the Judge]. Reply due: 1/26/96. (HW)
                                                                        LREF
                                                                        Blank 6 Filed: 1/5/1996, Entered: 1/17/1996 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                        ORDER granting [5-1] motion to Stay Proceedings, on or before the date 30 days after the Supreme Court denies defendant's petition for writ of certiorari or renders final decision in Winstar Corp, the parties shall file a status report ( signed by Judge Roger B. Andewelt ). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                          LREF
                                                                          Blank 5 Filed: 1/4/1996, Entered: 1/11/1996, Terminated: 1/5/1996 Terminated:
                                                                          MOTION by USA (Service : 1/4/96) to Stay Proceedings . (FE)
                                                                            LREF
                                                                            Blank 4 Filed: 11/24/1995, Entered: 11/29/1995 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                            NOTICE of Attorney Appearance for USA by Dean Lawrence Grayson. Service : 11/24/95 (FE)
                                                                              LREF
                                                                              Blank 3 Filed: 11/7/1995, Entered: 11/9/1995 Notice of Related Cases
                                                                              NOTICE by INDEPENDENCE FEDERAL of related case(s). (90-8 and related cases). (FE)
                                                                                LREF
                                                                                Blank 2 Filed: 11/7/1995, Entered: 11/9/1995 Case Assigned/ReassignedCourt Filing
                                                                                Notice of assignment to Judge Roger B. Andewelt. Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                  Blank 1 Filed: 11/7/1995, Entered: 11/9/1995 Complaint
                                                                                  COMPLAINT (Filed with Exhibits 1 & 2), FILING FEE $120, RECEIPT #040402. Answer due on 1/8/96. (FE)
                                                                                    LREF

                                                                                    Statistics

                                                                                    This case has been viewed 169 times.

                                                                                    No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                    Space
                                                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                     
                                                                                    PlainSite
                                                                                    Sign Up
                                                                                    Need Password Help?