SARLUND v. USA
Federal Civil Lawsuit United States Court of Federal Claims, Case No. 1:95-cv-00738-RHH
District Judge Robert H. Hodges, Jr., presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

No Logo JAMES C. SARLUND, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Stephen Eisenberg +1 608 256 8356
v.
United States of America United States of America, Defendant
Officially listed as "USA"

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Lisa Beth Donis
Office COFC
Filed 11/7/1995
Jury Demand
Demand $0
Nature of Suit 214 - Tax - Informer's Fees
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1491 Tucker Act
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition Preliminary Injunction
County
Terminated 1/29/1998
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flag CLOSED
  Entries (45) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 43 Filed: 1/29/1998, Entered: 1/30/1998 Judgment*
JUDGMENT entered pursuant to Rule 58 dismissing the complaint as plaintiff has failed to state a claim upon which relief can be granted. No costs (signed by Clerk). Copy to parties. (FE)
    LREF
    Blank -- Filed: 1/29/1998, Entered: 1/30/1998 Terminated Case
    Case closed (FE)
      LREF
      Blank 42 Filed: 1/27/1998, Entered: 1/30/1998 Published DecisionCourt Filing
      PUBLISHED DECISION granting defendant's [31-1] motion to Dismiss, and directing Clerk to enter judgment accordingly (signed by Judge Robert H. Hodges, Jr.). Copy to parties. (FE)
        LREF
        Blank 41 Filed: 10/23/1997, Entered: 10/30/1997 Reply to Response to Motion
        REPLY by USA to response to [31-1] motion to Dismiss. Service: 10/23/97. (HW)
          LREF
          Blank 40 Filed: 10/8/1997, Entered: 10/16/1997 Memorandum
          Letter to the Clerk, dated October 3, 1997, re: itemization of reasonable expenses, etc. re: order of August 21, 1997, filed [by leave of the judge]. (DS)
            LREF
            Blank 39 Filed: 10/8/1997, Entered: 10/16/1997 Terminated:
            RESPONSE by JAMES C. SARLUND (Service: 10/7/97 ) to [31-1] motion to Dismiss. Reply due: 10/24/97 (DS)
              LREF
              Blank 38 Filed: 9/23/1997, Entered: 9/25/1997 OrderCourt Filing
              ORDER Response to [31-1] motion to Dismiss reset to 10/8/97 ( signed by Judge Robert H. Hodges, Jr. ) Copy to parties. (CDC)
                LREF
                Blank 37 Filed: 9/10/1997, Entered: 9/11/1997 Transcript
                TRANSCRIPT of proceedings re: 1 volume, at Washington, DC, for date of August 18, 1997. Notice to parties. (FE)
                  LREF
                  Blank 36 Filed: 9/5/1997, Entered: 9/11/1997 OrderCourt Filing
                  ORDER re: further procedures specific to discovery, etc. ( signed by Judge Robert H. Hodges, Jr. ) Copy to parties. (HW)
                    LREF
                    Blank 35 Filed: 9/4/1997, Entered: 9/10/1997 Terminated:
                    MOTION by JAMES C. SARLUND (Service : 9/4/97 ) For reconsideration of [32-2] order under Rule 83.2 (DS)
                      LREF
                      Blank 34 Filed: 9/3/1997, Entered: 9/5/1997 Terminated:
                      RESPONSE by USA (Service: 9/3/97 ) to [31-1] motion to Dismiss. Reply due: 9/22/97. (HW)
                        LREF
                        Blank 33 Filed: 8/26/1997, Entered: 8/27/1997 Terminated:
                        RESPONSE by JAMES C. SARLUND (Service: 8/21/97 ) to [31-1] motion to Dismiss. Reply due: 9/8/97 (DS)
                          LREF
                          Blank 32 Filed: 8/21/1997, Entered: 8/25/1997 OrderCourt Filing
                          ORDER granting [29-1] motion to Compel discovery; and directing plaintiff to file an itemization of his reasonable expenses, including attorneys' fees. ( signed by Judge Robert H. Hodges, Jr. ) Copy to parties. (DS)
                            LREF
                            Blank -- Filed: 8/18/1997, Entered: 8/19/1997 Oral Argument
                            Oral Argument re: [29-1] motion to Compel discovery by JAMES C. SARLUND ( Transcript due 9/17/97 ) (DS)
                              LREF
                              Blank 31 Filed: 8/15/1997, Entered: 8/18/1997 Terminated:
                              MOTION by USA (Service : 8/15/97 ) to Dismiss . Response due: 9/15/97 (HW)
                                LREF
                                Blank 30 Filed: 8/13/1997, Entered: 8/18/1997 OrderCourt Filing
                                ORDER oral argument (hearing) set for 12:00 on 8/18/97 for [29-1] motion to Compel discovery ( signed by Judge Robert H. Hodges, Jr. ) Copy to parties. (DS)
                                  LREF
                                  Blank 29 Filed: 8/11/1997, Entered: 8/14/1997, Terminated: 8/21/1997 Terminated:
                                  MOTION by JAMES C. SARLUND (Service : 8/7/97 ) to Compel discovery Response due: 8/25/97 (CDC)
                                    LREF
                                    Blank 28 Filed: 7/28/1997, Entered: 8/4/1997 Joint Preliminary Status Report
                                    JOINT PRELIMINARY STATUS REPORT (CDC)
                                      LREF
                                      Blank 27 Filed: 7/28/1997, Entered: 8/4/1997 OrderCourt Filing
                                      ORDER granting [26-1] motion for Leave to File JPSR out of time ( signed by Judge Robert H. Hodges, Jr. ) Copy to parties. (CDC)
                                        LREF
                                        Blank 26 Filed: 7/25/1997, Entered: 8/4/1997, Terminated: 7/28/1997 Terminated:
                                        MOTION by JAMES C. SARLUND (Service : 7/21/97 ) for Leave to File JPSR out of time Response due: 8/7/97 (CDC)
                                          LREF
                                          Blank 25 Filed: 7/17/1997, Entered: 7/30/1997 OrderCourt Filing
                                          ORDER set Notice of Compliance deadline that the Court expects a representation from plaintiff that it intends to prosecute this case and from defendant that it intends to defend. ( signed by Judge Robert H. Hodges, Jr. ) Copy to parties. (CDC)
                                            LREF
                                            Blank 24 Filed: 5/7/1997, Entered: 5/19/1997 Answer
                                            ANSWER to Complaint by USA. Service: 4/28/97 ( JPSR due 6/16/97 ) (FE)
                                              LREF
                                              Blank 23 Filed: 5/7/1997, Entered: 5/14/1997 OrderCourt Filing
                                              ORDER granting [22-1] motion for Leave to File answer to the complaint out of time ( signed by Judge Robert H. Hodges, Jr. ) Copy to parties. (CDC)
                                                LREF
                                                Blank 22 Filed: 4/28/1997, Entered: 5/11/1997, Terminated: 5/7/1997 Terminated:
                                                MOTION by USA (Service : 4/28/97 ) for Leave to File answer to the complaint out of time . Response due: 5/15/97 (HW)
                                                  LREF
                                                  Blank 21 Filed: 4/18/1997, Entered: 5/1/1997 OrderCourt Filing
                                                  ORDER re: filing of motions for extension on due date ( signed by Judge Robert H. Hodges, Jr. ) Copy to parties. (DS)
                                                    LREF
                                                    Blank 20 Filed: 4/15/1997, Entered: 5/1/1997 Terminated:
                                                    MOTION by USA (Service : 4/15/97) to Extend Time to respond to discovery requests (to May 16, 1997). Response due: 5/5/97 (DS)
                                                      LREF
                                                      Blank 19 Filed: 4/3/1997, Entered: 4/15/1997 OrderCourt Filing
                                                      ORDER re: further proceedings ( signed by Judge Robert H. Hodges, Jr. ) Copy to parties. (HW)
                                                        LREF
                                                        Blank 18 Filed: 3/14/1997, Entered: 3/18/1997 OrderCourt Filing
                                                        ORDER re: further procedures ( signed by Judge Robert H. Hodges, Jr. ) Copy to parties. (HW)
                                                          LREF
                                                          Blank 17 Filed: 3/10/1997, Entered: 3/13/1997 Terminated:
                                                          MOTION by USA (Service : 3/10/97 ) to Extend Time within which to respond to discovery requests , (until 4/16/97). (HW)
                                                            LREF
                                                            Blank 16 Filed: 1/31/1997, Entered: 2/5/1997 OrderCourt Filing
                                                            ORDER addressing case status (signed by Judge Robert H. Hodges, Jr.). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                              LREF
                                                              Blank 15 Filed: 11/20/1996, Entered: 11/22/1996 Status Report/OrderCourt Filing
                                                              STATUS REPORT ORDER. Status report due (signed by Judge Robert H. Hodges, Jr.). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                LREF
                                                                Blank 14 Filed: 10/24/1996, Entered: 10/28/1996 Notice of Change of Address
                                                                NOTICE of change of address by Stephen Eisenberg (HW)
                                                                  LREF
                                                                  Blank 13 Filed: 10/1/1996, Entered: 10/4/1996 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                  NOTICE of Attorney Appearance for USA by Lisa Beth Donis Service: 10/1/96 (FE)
                                                                    LREF
                                                                    Blank 12 Filed: 6/24/1996, Entered: 6/28/1996 Notice of Change of Address
                                                                    NOTICE of change of address by John Peebles Sholar Jr. (FE)
                                                                      LREF
                                                                      Blank 11 Filed: 3/5/1996, Entered: 3/11/1996 Terminated: Court Filing
                                                                      RESPONSE by JAMES C. SARLUND to [9-1] motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction, [9-2] motion to Stay pending decision in Doe v. United States. Filed by leave of the Judge. (FE) Modified on 03/11/1996
                                                                        LREF
                                                                        Blank 10 Filed: 2/20/1996, Entered: 2/23/1996 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                        ORDER addressing case proceedings (signed by Judge Robert H. Hodges). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                          LREF
                                                                          Blank 9 Filed: 1/30/1996, Entered: 2/5/1996 Terminated:
                                                                          MOTION by USA (Service: 1/30/96) to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction or to Stay pending decision in Doe v. United States . Response due: 3/1/96 (FE)
                                                                            LREF
                                                                            Blank 8 Filed: 1/17/1996, Entered: 1/24/1996 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                            ORDER granting [7-1] motion to Extend Time to respond to complaint reset Answer deadline to 2/7/96 ( signed by Judge Robert H. Hodges ). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                              LREF
                                                                              Blank 7 Filed: 1/4/1996, Entered: 1/11/1996, Terminated: 1/17/1996 Terminated:
                                                                              MOTION by USA (Service : 1/4/96) to Extend Time to respond to complaint (to February 7, 1996). Response due: 1/22/96 (FE)
                                                                                LREF
                                                                                Blank 6 Filed: 1/4/1996, Entered: 1/11/1996 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                NOTICE of Attorney Appearance for USA by John Peebles Sholar Jr. Service : 1/4/96 (FE)
                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                  Blank 5 Filed: 12/5/1995, Entered: 12/11/1995 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                  ORDER re: Counsel should agree on a time for a status conference during week of January 15 and notify the court ( signed by Judge Robert H. Hodges ). Copy to parties. (HW)
                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                    Blank 4 Filed: 12/5/1995, Entered: 12/11/1995 Terminated: Court Filing
                                                                                    RESPONSE by JAMES C. SARLUND to [3-2] order [filed by leave of the Judge]. Service: 12/5/95 (HW)
                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                      Blank 3 Filed: 11/15/1995, Entered: 11/21/1995 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                      ORDER set Plaintiff's Brief [supplemental authority re: legal basis for claim] deadline to 11/30/95 (signed by Judge Robert H. Hodges). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                        Blank 2 Filed: 11/7/1995, Entered: 11/9/1995 Case Assigned/ReassignedCourt Filing
                                                                                        Notice of assignment to Judge Robert H. Hodges. Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                          Blank 1 Filed: 11/7/1995, Entered: 11/9/1995 Complaint
                                                                                          COMPLAINT (Filed with Exhibits A through F), FILING FEE $120, RECEIPT #040401. Answer due on 1/8/96 (FE)
                                                                                            LREF

                                                                                            Statistics

                                                                                            This case has been viewed 158 times.

                                                                                            No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                            Space
                                                                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                             
                                                                                            PlainSite
                                                                                            Sign Up
                                                                                            Need Password Help?