THOMAS v. USA
Federal Civil Lawsuit United States Court of Federal Claims, Case No. 1:95-cv-00749-JTT
District Judge James T. Turner, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo WAYNE A. THOMAS, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Leodis C Matthews Law Offices

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Leodis Clyde Matthews +1 323 930 5690
v.
United States of America United States of America, Defendant
Officially listed as "USA"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Lauren Springer Moore +1 202 616 0333 +1 202 514 8640 lauren.moore@usdoj.gov
Office COFC
Filed 11/14/1995
Jury Demand
Demand $0
Nature of Suit 346 - Military Pay - Correct/Reinstate
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1491 Tucker Act
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition Preliminary Injunction
County
Terminated 12/22/1998
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flag CLOSED
  Entries (48) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 45 Filed: 6/13/2000, Entered: 6/13/2000 Court Filing
Taxation of Costs for USA in the amount of $243.75. (signed by Clerk). Copy to parties and to Judge. (LD)
    LREF
    Blank 44 Filed: 11/29/1999, Entered: 12/3/1999 CAFC Mandate Affirming
    MANDATE (certified copy) from CAFC dated November 29, 1999 affirmed [41-1] judgment order. (HW)
      LREF
      Blank -- Filed: 2/24/1999, Entered: 3/8/1999 CAFC Case Number
      CAFC Case Number Re: [43-1] appeal by WAYNE A. THOMAS. CAFC NUMBER: 99-5055. (HW)
        LREF
        Blank 43 Filed: 2/22/1999, Entered: 2/22/1999, Terminated: 11/29/1999 Notice of AppealCourt Filing
        NOTICE OF APPEAL by WAYNE A. THOMAS. Copy to Defendant, Judge Turner and to CAFC. FILING FEE $105.00; RECEIPT #047018. (HW)
          LREF
          Blank 42 Filed: 1/7/1999, Entered: 1/14/1999 Terminated:
          Bill of costs by USA. Service: 1/4/99 ( Objection to Bill of Costs due by 1/21/99 ) (DS)
            LREF
            Blank 41 Filed: 12/22/1998, Entered: 12/22/1998
            JUDGMENT entered, pursuant to Rule 58, that the complaint is dismissed. Pursuant to RCFC 54(d), costs shall be sllowed to the defendant ("the prevailing party"). (signed by Clerk). Copy to parties. (LD)
              LREF
              Blank 40 Filed: 12/22/1998, Entered: 12/22/1998 Court Filing
              PUBLISHED DECISION granting in part defendant's motion to dismiss to the extent that defendant seeks dismissal for failure to state a claim upon which relief can be granted, and denying in part [9-1] defendant's motion to Dismiss to the extent that it seeks dismissal for Lack of subject-matter Jurisdiction, denying [22-1] plaintiff's cross motion for summary judgment, filed August 7, 1996, and directing the clerk to enter judgment in favor of defendant. Pursuant to RCFC 54(d), costs shall be allowed to the defendant ("the prevailing party"). ( signed by Judge James T. Turner ). Copy to parties. (LD)
                LREF
                Blank -- Filed: 12/22/1998, Entered: 12/22/1998
                Case closed (LD)
                  LREF
                  Blank 39 Filed: 9/3/1998, Entered: 9/4/1998 Terminated:
                  RESPONSE by USA to [36-1] Scheduling order. Service: 9/3/98. (HW)
                    LREF
                    Blank 38 Filed: 8/14/1998, Entered: 8/18/1998 OrderCourt Filing
                    ORDER granting [37-1] motion to Extend Time to file the supplementation ordered by this Court on July 31, 1998 (signed by Judge James T. Turner) Copy to parties. (FE)
                      LREF
                      Blank 37 Filed: 8/13/1998, Entered: 8/14/1998, Terminated: 8/14/1998 Terminated:
                      MOTION by USA (Service: 8/13/98) to Extend Time to file the supplementation ordered by this Court on July 31, 1998 , (Until September 3, 1998). Response due: 8/31/98. (FE) Modified on 08/17/1998
                        LREF
                        Blank 36 Filed: 7/31/1998, Entered: 8/5/1998 Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
                        ORDER directing defendant to file supplemental documents (information relating to proceedings before the ABCMR) by 8/21/98, with plaintiff's time to respond to be in accordance with RCFC 83.2(c). ( signed by Judge James T. Turner ) Copy to parties. (DS)
                          LREF
                          Blank 35 Filed: 12/31/1996, Entered: 1/3/1997 Reply to Response to Motion
                          REPLY by WAYNE A. THOMAS to response to [22-1] crossmotion. Service: 12/27/96 (FE)
                            LREF
                            Blank 34 Filed: 12/31/1996, Entered: 1/3/1997 OrderCourt Filing
                            ORDER granting [33-1] motion for Leave to File reply brief (signed by Judge James T. Turner). Copy to parties. (FE)
                              LREF
                              Blank 33 Filed: 12/31/1996, Entered: 1/3/1997, Terminated: 12/31/1996 Terminated:
                              MOTION by WAYNE A. THOMAS (Service: 12/29/96) for Leave to File reply brief . (FE)
                                LREF
                                Blank 32 Filed: 11/22/1996, Entered: 11/26/1996 OrderCourt Filing
                                ORDER granting [31-1] motion to Extend Time to reply to response to motion for summary judgment, granting [30-1] motion to Extend Time to reply to motion for summary judgment and Reply to Response to Motion reset to 12/2/96 for [22-1] cross motion (signed by Judge James T. Turner). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                  LREF
                                  Blank 31 Filed: 11/22/1996, Entered: 11/26/1996, Terminated: 11/22/1996 Terminated:
                                  MOTION by WAYNE A. THOMAS to Extend Time to reply to response to motion for summary judgment [to December 2, 1996]. (FE)
                                    LREF
                                    Blank 30 Filed: 11/20/1996, Entered: 11/22/1996 Terminated:
                                    MOTION by WAYNE A. THOMAS (Service : 11/13/96 ) to Extend Time to reply to motion for summary judgment (?). (FE)
                                      LREF
                                      Blank 29 Filed: 10/28/1996, Entered: 11/5/1996 Statement of FactsCourt Filing
                                      COUNTER-STATEMENT OF FACTS filed by USA by leave of the Judge. Service: 10/23/96 (FE)
                                        LREF
                                        Blank 28 Filed: 10/23/1996, Entered: 10/29/1996 Terminated:
                                        RESPONSE by USA (Service: 10/23/96) to [22-1] crossmotion. Reply due: 11/12/96 (FE)
                                          LREF
                                          Blank 27 Filed: 10/9/1996, Entered: 10/11/1996 OrderCourt Filing
                                          ORDER granting [26-1] motion to Extend Time to respond to motion for summary judgment and reply to response to motion to dismiss and Response to [22-1] cross motion reset to 10/23/96 (signed by Judge James T. Turner). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                            LREF
                                            Blank 26 Filed: 10/7/1996, Entered: 10/9/1996, Terminated: 10/9/1996 Terminated:
                                            MOTION by USA (Service: 10/7/96) to Extend Time to respond to motion for summary judgment and reply to response to motion to dismiss [to October 23, 1996]. (FE)
                                              LREF
                                              Blank 25 Filed: 9/10/1996, Entered: 9/16/1996 OrderCourt Filing
                                              ORDER granting [24-1] motion to Extend Time within which to respond to motion for summary judgment and reply to response to motion to dismiss and Response to [22-1] cross motion reset to 10/7/96 (signed by Judge James T. Turner). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                LREF
                                                Blank 24 Filed: 9/5/1996, Entered: 9/10/1996, Terminated: 9/10/1996 Terminated:
                                                MOTION by USA (Service : 9/5/96 ) to Extend Time within which to respond to motion for summary judgment and reply to response to motion to dismiss , (until October 7, 1996). (HW)
                                                  LREF
                                                  Blank 23 Filed: 9/5/1996, Entered: 9/10/1996 Terminated:
                                                  MOTION by USA (Service : 9/5/96 ) to Extend Time Response due: (HW)
                                                    LREF
                                                    Blank 22 Filed: 8/7/1996, Entered: 9/9/1996 Terminated:
                                                    CROSS MOTION by WAYNE A. THOMAS (Service: 8/5/96) and RESPONSE to [9-1] motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by USA filed [by leave of the judge]. Response due: 9/5/96 (DS)
                                                      LREF
                                                      Blank 21 Filed: 8/7/1996, Entered: 9/9/1996 Proposed Findings of Uncontroverted Fact
                                                      PROPOSED FINDINGS of Uncontroverted Fact by WAYNE A. THOMAS filed [by leave of the judge]. Service: 8/5/96 (DS)
                                                        LREF
                                                        Blank -- Filed: 8/7/1996, Entered: 9/9/1996 Set/Reset Deadlines:
                                                        Deadline updated; Response to [22-1] cross motion set to 9/5/96 (DS)
                                                          LREF
                                                          Blank 20 Filed: 7/29/1996, Entered: 9/9/1996 OrderCourt Filing
                                                          ORDER granting [19-1] motion to Extend Time to respond to motion to dismiss Response to [9-1] motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction reset to 8/8/96 signed by Judge James T. Turner). Copy to parties. (DS) Modified on 09/09/1996
                                                            LREF
                                                            Blank 19 Filed: 7/25/1996, Entered: 9/9/1996, Terminated: 7/29/1996 Terminated:
                                                            MOTION by WAYNE A. THOMAS (Service: 7/25/96) to Extend Time to respond to motion to dismiss (to August 8, 1996). (DS)
                                                              LREF
                                                              Blank 18 Filed: 7/17/1996, Entered: 9/9/1996 OrderCourt Filing
                                                              ORDER granting [17-1] motion to Extend Time to respond to motion to dismiss Response to [9-1] motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction reset to 7/25/96 signed by Judge James T. Turner). Copy to parties. (DS)
                                                                LREF
                                                                Blank 17 Filed: 7/17/1996, Entered: 9/9/1996, Terminated: 7/17/1996 Terminated:
                                                                MOTION by WAYNE A. THOMAS (Service: 7/15/96) to Extend Time to respond to motion to dismiss (to July 25, 1996) filed [by leave of the judge]. (DS)
                                                                  LREF
                                                                  Blank 16 Filed: 6/26/1996, Entered: 9/9/1996 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                  ORDER granting [14-1] motion for Leave to File a motion for extension of time out of time; granting [15-1] motion to Extend Time to respond to motion to dismiss Response to [9-1] motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction reset to 7/15/96 . (signed by Judge James T. Turner) Copy to parties. (DS)
                                                                    LREF
                                                                    Blank 15 Filed: 6/26/1996, Entered: 9/9/1996 Terminated:
                                                                    MOTION by WAYNE A. THOMAS to Extend Time to respond to motion to dismiss (to July 13, 1996). (DS)
                                                                      LREF
                                                                      Blank 14 Filed: 6/24/1996, Entered: 9/9/1996, Terminated: 6/26/1996 Terminated:
                                                                      MOTION by WAYNE A. THOMAS (Service: 6/21/96) for Leave to File a motion for extension of time out of time . (DS)
                                                                        LREF
                                                                        Blank 13 Filed: 5/14/1996, Entered: 9/9/1996 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                        ORDER granting [12-1] motion to Extend Time to respond to motion to dismiss Response to [9-1] motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction reset to 6/12/96 . (signed by Judge James T. Turner) Copy to parties. (DS)
                                                                          LREF
                                                                          Blank 12 Filed: 5/13/1996, Entered: 9/9/1996, Terminated: 5/14/1996 Terminated:
                                                                          MOTION by WAYNE A. THOMAS (Service: 5/13/96) to Extend Time to respond to motion to dismiss (to June 12, 1996). (DS)
                                                                            LREF
                                                                            Blank 11 Filed: 4/12/1996, Entered: 9/9/1996 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                            ORDER granting [10-1] motion to Extend Time to respond to motion to dismiss Response to [9-1] motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction reset to 5/13/96 . (signed by Judge James T. Turner) Copy to parties. (DS)
                                                                              LREF
                                                                              Blank 10 Filed: 4/11/1996, Entered: 9/9/1996, Terminated: 4/12/1996 Terminated:
                                                                              MOTION by WAYNE A. THOMAS (Service: 4/11/96) to Extend Time to respond to motion to dismiss (to May 12, 1996). (DS)
                                                                                LREF
                                                                                Blank 9 Filed: 3/12/1996, Entered: 9/9/1996 Terminated:
                                                                                MOTION by USA, together with appendix, in two volumes, (Service: 3/12/96) to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction or, in the alternative, for failure to state a claim. Response due: 4/12/96 (DS)
                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                  Blank 8 Filed: 2/29/1996, Entered: 3/6/1996 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                  ORDER granting [7-1] motion to Extend Time to respond to complaint . Answer deadline to 3/12/96 ( signed by Judge James T. Turner ). Copy to parties. (HW)
                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                    Blank 7 Filed: 2/26/1996, Entered: 3/1/1996, Terminated: 2/29/1996 Terminated:
                                                                                    MOTION by USA (Service : 2/26/96) to Extend Time to respond to complaint (to March 12, 1996). Response due: 3/14/96 (FE)
                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                      Blank 6 Filed: 1/19/1996, Entered: 1/30/1996 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                      ORDER granting [5-1] motion to Extend Time within which to respond to complaint resetting Answer deadline to 2/27/96 (signed by Judge James T. Turner) Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                        Blank 5 Filed: 1/16/1996, Entered: 1/24/1996, Terminated: 1/19/1996 Terminated:
                                                                                        MOTION by USA (Service : 1/16/96 ) to Extend Time within which to respond to complaint , (until February 27, 1996). Response due: 2/2/96. (HW)
                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                          Blank 4 Filed: 11/29/1995, Entered: 12/5/1995 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                          ORDER entered re: special procedures, etc., ( signed by Judge James T. Turner ) Copy to parties. (HW)
                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                            Blank 3 Filed: 11/28/1995, Entered: 12/5/1995 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                            NOTICE of Attorney Appearance for USA by Lauren Springer Moore. Service : 11/28/95. (HW)
                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                              Blank 2 Filed: 11/14/1995, Entered: 11/15/1995 Case Assigned/ReassignedCourt Filing
                                                                                              Notice of assignment to Judge James T. Turner. Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                Blank 1 Filed: 11/14/1995, Entered: 11/15/1995 Complaint
                                                                                                COMPLAINT, FILING FEE $120, RECEIPT #040420. Answer due on 1/16/96 (FE)
                                                                                                  LREF

                                                                                                  Statistics

                                                                                                  This case has been viewed 184 times.

                                                                                                  No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                  Space
                                                                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                   
                                                                                                  PlainSite
                                                                                                  Sign Up
                                                                                                  Need Password Help?