SUPERIOR FEDERAL SAV v. USA
Federal Civil Lawsuit United States Court of Federal Claims, Case No. 1:95-cv-00769-LAS
District Judge Loren A. Smith, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo SUPERIOR FEDERAL SAVINGS BANK, FSB, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Arnold & Porter, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Alan Kenneth Palmer +1 202 682 3536 +1 202 682 3580 apalmer@kayescholer.com
v.
United States of America United States of America, Defendant
Officially listed as "USA"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Victoria Louise Strohmeyer +1 202 305 7573 +1 202 305 7643 victoria.strohmeyer@usdoj.gov
Office COFC
Filed 11/24/1995
Jury Demand
Demand $5000000
Nature of Suit 511 - Taking - FIRREA
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1491 Tucker Act
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition Preliminary Injunction
County
Terminated 1/3/2003
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flag CLOSED
  Entries (69) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 62 Filed: 1/3/2003, Entered: 1/6/2003 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by SUPERIOR FEDERAL SAV, USA . Complaint dismissed pursuant to Rule 41 (a)(1)(ii). Copy to parties. (DS)
    LREF
    Blank -- Filed: 1/3/2003, Entered: 1/6/2003 Terminated Case
    Case closed (DS)
      LREF
      Blank 61 Filed: 12/13/2002, Entered: 12/17/2002 OrderCourt Filing
      ORDER granting [59-1] motion to Stay (signed by Judge Robert H. Hodges). Copy to parties. (LTD)
        LREF
        Blank 60 Filed: 12/12/2002, Entered: 12/16/2002 Terminated:
        RESPONSE by USA (Service: 12/12/02) to [59-1] motion to Stay. Reply due: 12/27/02. (FE)
          LREF
          Blank 60 Filed: 12/12/2002, Entered: 12/16/2002 Reply to Response to Motion
          REPLY by USA to response to [58-1] motion to Compel. Service: 12/12/02. (FE)
            LREF
            Blank 59 Filed: 12/2/2002, Entered: 12/4/2002, Terminated: 12/13/2002 Terminated:
            MOTION by SUPERIOR FEDERAL SAV (Service: 12/2/02) to Stay . Response due: 12/19/02. (LTD)
              LREF
              Blank 59 Filed: 12/2/2002, Entered: 12/4/2002, Terminated: 12/13/2002 Terminated:
              RESPONSE by SUPERIOR FEDERAL SAV (Service: 12/2/02) to [58-1] motion to Compel. Reply due: 12/16/02. (FILE WITH MOITON TO STAY). (LTD)
                LREF
                Blank 58 Filed: 11/13/2002, Entered: 11/15/2002 Terminated:
                MOTION by USA (Service: 11/13/02) to Compel , plaintiff's to comply with their document production and interrogatory obligations, etc. . Response due: 12/2/02. (FE)
                  LREF
                  Blank 57 Filed: 10/8/2002, Entered: 10/10/2002 Notice of Change of Address
                  NOTICE of change of address by Alan Kenneth Palmer (HW)
                    LREF
                    Blank 56 Filed: 9/10/2002, Entered: 9/13/2002 Notice of Appearance/
                    NOTICE of Attorney Appearance for USA by Victoria Louise Strohmeyer. Service :9/10/02 (JT)
                      LREF
                      Blank 55 Filed: 8/27/2002, Entered: 9/3/2002 Notice of Appearance/
                      NOTICE of Attorney Appearance for USA by Jeanne E. Davidson. Service: 8/27/02. (LTD)
                        LREF
                        Blank 54 Filed: 7/8/2002, Entered: 7/9/2002 Answer
                        ANSWER to Complaint by USA. Service: 7/8/02 (JPSR due 8/29/02). (LTD)
                          LREF
                          Blank 53 Filed: 6/5/2002, Entered: 6/5/2002
                          NOTICE of change of address by Alan Kenneth Palmer. (HW)
                            LREF
                            Blank 52 Filed: 1/7/2002, Entered: 1/8/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                            ORDER re: discovery. ( signed by Sr. Judge Loren A. Smith ) Copy to parties. (FE)
                              LREF
                              Blank 51 Filed: 10/5/2000, Entered: 10/10/2000 Notice of Appearance/
                              NOTICE of Attorney Appearance for USA by Michael M. Duclos Service : 10/5/00 (JT)
                                LREF
                                Blank 50 Filed: 7/24/2000, Entered: 7/27/2000 ~Notice (other)
                                NOTICE of Decision to Opt Out of Case Specific Discovery by SUPERIOR FEDERAL SAV. Service: 7/24/00 (JT)
                                  LREF
                                  Blank 49 Filed: 5/3/1999, Entered: 5/4/1999 ~Notice (other)
                                  NOTICE of Decision to Opt-Out of Case-Specific Discovery by SUPERIOR FEDERAL SAV. Service: 5/3/99 (JT)
                                    LREF
                                    Blank 48 Filed: 4/2/1999, Entered: 4/7/1999 ~Notice (other)
                                    NOTICE of Decision to Opt-Out of Case-Specific Discovery by SUPERIOR FEDERAL SAV. Service: 4/2/99 (JT)
                                      LREF
                                      Blank 47 Filed: 4/2/1999, Entered: 4/6/1999 Terminated:
                                      MOTION by SUPERIOR FEDERAL SAV (Service : 4/2/99 ) to substitute attorney (consented) Terminated attorney Robert B. Hoemeke for SUPERIOR FEDERAL SAV Added Alan Kenneth Palmer. (DS)
                                        LREF
                                        Blank 46 Filed: 8/12/1998, Entered: 8/14/1998 Notice of Appearance/
                                        NOTICE of Attorney Appearance for USA by Tonya Jean Williams * Service : 8/11/98 (FE)
                                          LREF
                                          Blank 45 Filed: 1/7/1997, Entered: 1/10/1997 OrderCourt Filing
                                          SEE 95-660C FOR OPINION denying [40-1] motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction ( signed by Judge John P. Wiese ) Copy to parties. (DS)
                                            LREF
                                            Blank 44 Filed: 12/5/1996, Entered: 12/9/1996 OrderCourt Filing
                                            SEE 95-660C FOR ORDER oral argument set for 10:30 a.m. on 12/19/96 for [40-1] motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction signed by Judge John P. Wiese). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                              LREF
                                              Blank 43 Filed: 11/7/1996, Entered: 11/13/1996 Notice of Appearance/
                                              NOTICE of Attorney Appearance for USA by John Jay Hoffman. Service : 11/7/96 (HW)
                                                LREF
                                                Blank 42 Filed: 10/8/1996, Entered: 10/9/1996 Terminated:
                                                RESPONSE by SUPERIOR FEDERAL SAV (Service by hand: 10/8/96 ) to [40-1] motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction. Reply due: 10/18/96 (HW)
                                                  LREF
                                                  Blank 41 Filed: 10/7/1996, Entered: 10/8/1996 Case Assigned/ReassignedCourt Filing
                                                  See 90-8 C for Notice of reassignment to Judge John P. Wiese. Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                    LREF
                                                    Blank 40 Filed: 9/9/1996, Entered: 9/16/1996 Terminated:
                                                    MOTION by USA (Service: 9/9/96) to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction . Response due: 10/10/96 (FE)
                                                      LREF
                                                      Blank 39 Filed: 8/28/1996, Entered: 9/3/1996 Case Assigned/ReassignedCourt Filing
                                                      SEE ORDER IN 90-8C for Notice of reassignment to Chief Judge Loren A. Smith. Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                        LREF
                                                        Blank 38 Filed: 8/16/1996, Entered: 8/20/1996 Terminated:
                                                        MOTION by USA (Service : 8/16/96 ) for Leave to File attached proposed pretrial order. Response due: 9/3/96 (HW)
                                                          LREF
                                                          Blank 37 Filed: 7/29/1996, Entered: 8/1/1996 Terminated:
                                                          MOTION by SUPERIOR FEDERAL SAV (Service : 7/24/96) to substitute attorney (consented) Terminated attorney Lawrence H. Weltman for SUPERIOR FEDERAL SAV Added Robert B. Hoemeke . Response due: 7/26/96 (FE)
                                                            LREF
                                                            Blank 36 Filed: 7/23/1996, Entered: 7/25/1996 Terminated:
                                                            MOTION by USA (Service: 7/23/96) for Leave to File copy of motion to adopt special case management procedures . Response due: 8/9/96 (FE)
                                                              LREF
                                                              Blank 35 Filed: 7/23/1996, Entered: 7/24/1996 OrderCourt Filing
                                                              ORDER set Scheduling Conference for 9:00 a.m. on 7/31/96 (signed by Judge Robert H. Hodges, Jr.). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                LREF
                                                                Blank 34 Filed: 7/11/1996, Entered: 7/15/1996 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                ORDER addressing future case proceedings (signed by Judge Robert H. Hodges, Jr.). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                  LREF
                                                                  Blank 33 Filed: 6/24/1996, Entered: 6/28/1996 Notice of Change of Address
                                                                  NOTICE of change of address by Steven Jay Abelson (FE)
                                                                    LREF
                                                                    Blank 33 Filed: 6/12/1996, Entered: 6/13/1996 Memorandum
                                                                    MEMORANDUM [REPLY] by SUPERIOR FEDERAL SAV re: [27-1] response by USA. Service: 5/24/96 (FE)
                                                                      LREF
                                                                      Blank 32 Filed: 6/12/1996, Entered: 6/13/1996 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                      ORDER granting [29-1] motion for Leave to File Reply on the Statute of Limitations Issue (signed by Judge Robert H. Hodges, Jr.). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                        LREF
                                                                        Blank 32 Filed: 6/12/1996, Entered: 6/13/1996 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                        ORDER filing plaintiff's reply to defendant's response regarding the statute of limitations issue (signed by Judge Robert H. Hodges, Jr.). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                          LREF
                                                                          Blank 31 Filed: 6/12/1996, Entered: 6/13/1996 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                          ORDER further Clarifying 2/20/96 order (signed by Judge Robert H. Hodges, Jr.). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                            LREF
                                                                            Blank 30 Filed: 6/10/1996, Entered: 6/12/1996 Terminated:
                                                                            RESPONSE by SUPERIOR FEDERAL SAV to [28-2] order. Service: 6/6/96 (FE)
                                                                              LREF
                                                                              Blank 29 Filed: 5/31/1996, Entered: 6/5/1996, Terminated: 6/12/1996 Terminated: Court Filing
                                                                              MOTION by SUPERIOR FEDERAL SAV (Service : 5/24/96 ) for Leave to File Reply on the Statute of Limitations Issue . Filed by leave of the Judge. Response due: 6/10/96 (FE)
                                                                                LREF
                                                                                Blank 28 Filed: 5/30/1996, Entered: 6/3/1996 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                ORDER set Notice of Compliance deadline to 6/14/96 (signed by Judge Robert H. Hodges, Jr.). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                  Blank 28 Filed: 5/30/1996, Entered: 6/3/1996 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                  ORDER granting [26-1] motion for Leave to File status report and status report (signed by Judge Robert H. Hodges, Jr.). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                    Blank 26 Filed: 5/24/1996, Entered: 5/29/1996 Terminated:
                                                                                    MOTION by USA (Service: 5/24/96) for Leave to File status report and status report . Response due: 6/10/96 (FE)
                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                      Blank 27 Filed: 5/17/1996, Entered: 6/3/1996 Terminated:
                                                                                      RESPONSE BRIEF by USA to [11-1] relief set Additional Documents due: 5/13/96 for USA [response to brief], 4/15/96 for SUPERIOR FEDERAL SAV [brief re: statute of limitations issue] Service: 5/17/96 (FE)
                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                        Blank 25 Filed: 5/15/1996, Entered: 5/17/1996 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                        ORDER granting [23-1] motion to Extend Time to Respond to Court Order of 3/14/96 and reset Additional Documents due: 5/17/96 for USA (signed by Judge Robert H. Hodges, Jr.). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                          Blank 24 Filed: 5/14/1996, Entered: 5/17/1996 Reply to Response to MotionCourt Filing
                                                                                          REPLY (Filed by leave of the Judge) by USA to response to [20-1] motion for Partial Modification of the [14-1] Protective Order. Service: 5/13/96 (FE) Modified on 05/17/1996
                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                            Blank 23 Filed: 5/13/1996, Entered: 5/16/1996, Terminated: 5/15/1996 Terminated:
                                                                                            MOTION by USA (Service : 5/13/96) to Extend Time to Respond to Court Order of 3/14/96 (to May 17 1996). Response due: 5/30/96 (FE)
                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                              Blank 22 Filed: 4/29/1996, Entered: 5/1/1996 Terminated:
                                                                                              RESPONSE by SUPERIOR FEDERAL SAV (Service: 4/26/96) to defendant's [20-1] motion for Partial Modification of the [14-1] Protective Order. Reply due: 5/10/96. (FE)
                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                Blank 21 Filed: 4/25/1996, Entered: 4/30/1996 Terminated:
                                                                                                MOTION by USA (Service: 4/25/96) for Leave to File Motion to Adopt Special Case Management Procedures . Response due: 5/13/96. (FE)
                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                  Blank 20 Filed: 4/18/1996, Entered: 4/24/1996 Terminated:
                                                                                                  MOTION by USA (Service: 4/18/96) for Partial Modification of the [14-1] Protective Order . Response due: 5/5/96. (FE)
                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                    Blank -- Filed: 4/18/1996, Entered: 4/24/1996 Set/Reset Deadlines:
                                                                                                    Deadline updated; Response to [20-1] motion for Partial Modification of the [14-1] Protective Order set to 5/6/96 . (FE)
                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                      Blank 19 Filed: 4/15/1996, Entered: 4/18/1996 Additional Documentation
                                                                                                      Additional Documentation (Response to Court Order dated 3/14/96) by SUPERIOR FEDERAL SAV. Service: 4/11/96 (FE)
                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                        Blank 18 Filed: 4/9/1996, Entered: 4/11/1996 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                        ORDER granting [16-1] motion for Leave to File letter from defendant's counsel to plaintiff's counsel dated April 1, 1996 ( signed by Judge Robert H. Hodges, Jr. ). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                          Blank 17 Filed: 4/4/1996, Entered: 4/9/1996 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                          ORDER set Brief deadline to immediately re: destroyed documents (signed by Judge Robert H. Hodges). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                            Blank 16 Filed: 4/3/1996, Entered: 4/8/1996, Terminated: 4/9/1996 Terminated:
                                                                                                            MOTION by USA (Service: 4/3/96 ) for Leave to File letter from defendant's counsel to plaintiff's counsel dated April 1, 1996 . [Response due: 4/22/96] (FE)
                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                              Blank 15 Filed: 3/27/1996, Entered: 4/2/1996 Terminated:
                                                                                                              MOTION by USA (Service : 3/27/96 ) to Stay proceeding re: pending the Supreme Court decision WINSTAR CORP., et al. v. UNITED STATES (HW)
                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                Blank 14 Filed: 3/25/1996, Entered: 3/28/1996 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                PROTECTIVE ORDER (signed by Judge Robert H. Hodges). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                  Blank 13 Filed: 3/25/1996, Entered: 3/28/1996 Status Report/OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                  STATUS REPORT ORDER. Status report due on 5/24/96 (signed by Judge Robert H. Hodges). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                    Blank 12 Filed: 3/19/1996, Entered: 3/25/1996 Terminated:
                                                                                                                    MOTION by USA (Service : 3/19/96 ) for Leave to File notice and declaration re: certain documents that may be relevant to this action . Response due: 4/5/96 (FE)
                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                      Blank 11 Filed: 3/14/1996, Entered: 3/21/1996 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                      ORDER set Additional Documents due: 5/13/96 for USA [response to brief], 4/15/96 for SUPERIOR FEDERAL SAV [brief re: statute of limitations issue] (signed by Judge Robert H. Hodges). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                        Blank 10 Filed: 2/20/1996, Entered: 2/23/1996 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                        ORDER addressing case proceedings (signed by Judge Robert H. Hodges). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                          Blank 9 Filed: 2/9/1996, Entered: 2/14/1996 Terminated:
                                                                                                                          RESPONSE by USA to [8-1] order. Service: 2/9/96 (FE)
                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                            Blank 8 Filed: 1/29/1996, Entered: 2/5/1996 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                            ORDER directing parties to reviw the proposed protective order and contact the court by 2/9/96 with comments or suggestions ( signed by Judge Robert H. Hodges ) Copy to parties. (HW)
                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                              Blank 7 Filed: 1/2/1996, Entered: 1/11/1996 Additional DocumentationCourt Filing
                                                                                                                              Additional Documentation [response to 12/5/95 order requesting information regarding jurisdictional limitations] by SUPERIOR FEDERAL SAV by leave of Judge. Service: 12/19/95 (FE)
                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                Blank 6 Filed: 12/12/1995, Entered: 12/21/1995 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                ORDER entered re: advisng court whether our normal 6 year statue of limitations applies, etc. by Notice of Compliance deadline of 12/29/95 ( signed by Judge Robert H. Hodges ) Copy to parties. (HW)
                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                  Blank 5 Filed: 12/11/1995, Entered: 12/14/1995 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Attorney Appearance for USA by Steven Jay Abelson Service: 12/11/95 (FE)
                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                    Blank 4 Filed: 12/5/1995, Entered: 12/11/1995 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                    ORDER re: telephone conference to discuss this matter may be arranged at a time mutually convenient to counsel ( signed by Judge Robert H. Hodges ). Copy to parties. (HW)
                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                      Blank 3 Filed: 11/24/1995, Entered: 12/4/1995 Case Assigned/ReassignedCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                      Notice of assignment to Judge Robert H. Hodges. Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                        Blank 2 Filed: 11/24/1995, Entered: 12/4/1995 Notice of Related Cases
                                                                                                                                        NOTICE by SUPERIOR FEDERAL SAV of related cases. (90-8C, 90-773C, 90-772C, & 90-981C). (FE)
                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                          Blank 1 Filed: 11/24/1995, Entered: 12/4/1995 Complaint
                                                                                                                                          COMPLAINT FILED. FILING FEE $ 120. RECEIPT # 40501. Answer due on 1/23/96. (FE)
                                                                                                                                            LREF

                                                                                                                                            Statistics

                                                                                                                                            This case has been viewed 169 times.

                                                                                                                                            No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                            Space
                                                                                                                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                             
                                                                                                                                            PlainSite
                                                                                                                                            Sign Up
                                                                                                                                            Need Password Help?