SOUTHTRUST, et al v. USA
Federal Civil Lawsuit United States Court of Federal Claims, Case No. 1:95-cv-00773-NBF
District Judge Nancy B. Firestone, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Southtrust Bank Of Georgia, NA, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Smith Gambrell & Russell LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Stephen M. Forte +1 404 815 3500 sforte@sgrlaw.com
No Logo Southtrust Of Georgia, Inc., Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Smith Gambrell & Russell LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Stephen M. Forte +1 404 815 3500 sforte@sgrlaw.com
v.
United States of America United States of America, Defendant
Officially listed as "USA"

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Henry Roland Felix
Office COFC
Filed 11/29/1995
Jury Demand
Demand $25000000
Nature of Suit 511 - Taking - FIRREA
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1491 Tucker Act
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition Dismissed - Voluntarily
County
Terminated 6/4/2003
Origin
Reopened 1/13/2003
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flag CLOSED
  Entries (66) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 59 Filed: 6/19/2003, Entered: 7/9/2003 CAFC Mandate Dismissing
MANDATE of CAFC dismissing [54] Notice of Appeal filed by SOUTHTRUST OF GEORGIA, INC., SOUTHTRUST BANK OF GEORGIA, N.A. (hw1, )
    LREF
    Blank 58 Filed: 6/4/2003, Entered: 6/16/2003 Stipulation of Dismissal
    STIPULATION of Dismissal with prejudice by all parties filed [by leave of the judge]. Complaint dismissed pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(ii) this day. (dls, )
      LREF
      Blank 57 Filed: 4/21/2003, Entered: 4/25/2003 Reply to Response to Motion
      REPLY to Response to Motion re [23] Motion for Summary JudgmentMotion to Dismiss filed by The United States. Service: 4/21/03.(dw1, )
        LREF
        Blank 56 Filed: 3/31/2003, Entered: 4/4/2003 Response to Motion
        RESPONSE to Motion re [23] Motion for Summary Judgment, Motion to Dismiss, filed by SOUTHTRUST BANK OF GEORGIA, N.A., and SOUTHTRUST OF GEORGIA, INC.Reply due 4/21/2003. Service: 3/31/03. (lrd)
          LREF
          Blank 55 Filed: 3/17/2003, Entered: 3/17/2003
          JUDGMENT entered, as provided in Rule 54(b) that the contract claims are dismissed. Each party to bear its own costs. (lld, )
            LREF
            Blank -- Filed: 3/12/2003, Entered: 3/18/2003 Terminated:
            CAFC Case Number 03-5069 for [54] Notice of Appeal filed by SOUTHTRUST OF GEORGIA, INC., SOUTHTRUST BANK OF GEORGIA, N.A. (hw1, )
              LREF
              Blank 54 Filed: 3/6/2003, Entered: 3/7/2003 Terminated: Court Filing
              NOTICE OF APPEAL by SOUTHTRUST, SOUTHTRUST BANK. Copy to Judge Nancy B. Firestone, Defendant and to CAFC. FILING FEE $ 105.00; RECEIPT #056604. (HW)
                LREF
                Blank -- Filed: 2/6/2003, Entered: 3/24/2003 Scheduling Order
                SCHEDULING ORDER directing plaintiffs to respond to defendant's motion for summary judgment on the remaining claims by3/31/2003; and defendant to file its reply by 4/21/2003. Signed by Judge Nancy B. Firestone. (dls, )
                  LREF
                  Blank 53 Filed: 1/13/2003, Entered: 1/21/2003 OrderCourt Filing
                  ORDER vacating [51-1] judgment order (signed by Judge Nancy B. Firestone). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                    LREF
                    Blank 52 Filed: 1/9/2003, Entered: 1/13/2003 Terminated: Court Filing
                    MOTION by SOUTHTRUST (Service: 1/7/03) to Amend [51-1] judgment order filed 12/20/02 . Response due: 1/21/03. Filed by leave of the Judge. (LTD)
                      LREF
                      Blank 51 Filed: 12/20/2002, Entered: 12/20/2002, Terminated: 1/13/2003 Judgment*
                      JUDGMENT entered, pursuant to Rule 58, that the complaint is dismissed. Each party to bear its own costs. (signed by Clerk). Copy to parties. (LD)
                        LREF
                        Blank -- Filed: 12/20/2002, Entered: 12/20/2002
                        Case closed (LD)
                          LREF
                          Blank 50 Filed: 12/19/2002, Entered: 12/20/2002 Published DecisionCourt Filing
                          PUBLISHED DECISION granting [23-1] motion for Summary Judgment, denying [25-1] motion for Summary Judgment and directing the clerk to enter judgment. Each party to bear its own costs. ( signed by Judge Nancy B. Firestone ). Copy to parties. (LD)
                            LREF
                            Blank 49 Filed: 12/12/2002, Entered: 12/13/2002 Transcript
                            TRANSCRIPT of proceedings re: 1 volume, at Washington, D.C., for date of November 25, 2002. Notice to parties. (FE)
                              LREF
                              Blank -- Filed: 12/12/2002, Entered: 12/13/2002 Oral Argument
                              Oral Argument re: [23-1] motion for Summary Judgment by USA (Transcript due 1/13/03), [23-2] motion to Dismiss by USA (Transcript due 1/13/03), [25-1] motion for Summary Judgment. by BANKERS FIRST SAVING, BANKERS FIRST ( Transcript due 1/13/03) (FE)
                                LREF
                                Blank 48 Filed: 10/23/2002, Entered: 10/24/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                ORDER oral argument set for 10:00 a.m. 11/25/02 for [23-1] motion for Summary Judgment, [23-2] motion to Dismiss, [25-1] motion for Summary Judgment , in the National Courts Building, 717 Madison Pl., N.W., Washington, D.C. 20005 (signed by Judge Nancy B. Firestone). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                  LREF
                                  Blank 47 Filed: 9/3/2002, Entered: 9/5/2002 Notice of Appearance/
                                  NOTICE of Attorney Appearance for USA by Henry Roland Felix. Service :9/3/02 (JT)
                                    LREF
                                    Blank 46 Filed: 6/21/2002, Entered: 6/24/2002 Reply to Response to Motion
                                    REPLY by SOUTHTRUST, SOUTHTRUST BANK to response to [25-1] motion for Summary Judgment. Service: 6/21/02. (FE)
                                      LREF
                                      Blank 45 Filed: 6/10/2002, Entered: 6/12/2002 Reply to Response to MotionCourt Filing
                                      REPLY by USA to response to [23-1] motion for Summary Judgment, filed by leave of the Judge. Service: 6/6/02 (HW)
                                        LREF
                                        Blank 44 Filed: 4/22/2002, Entered: 4/22/2002
                                        SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEF by SOUTHTRUST, re: Motion for Summary Judgment on liability for breach of contract. Service: 4/19/02. (LTD)
                                          LREF
                                          Blank -- Filed: 4/22/2002, Entered: 4/22/2002
                                          Deadline updated; Defendant's response to Plaintiff's supplemental brief due 6/6/02 . (LTD)
                                            LREF
                                            Blank 43 Filed: 3/12/2002, Entered: 3/13/2002 Transcript
                                            TRANSCRIPT of proceedings re: status conference, 1 volume, at Washington, D.C., for date of March 7, 2002. Notice to parties. (FE)
                                              LREF
                                              Blank 42 Filed: 3/8/2002, Entered: 3/11/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                              ORDER Plaintiff's Supplemental Brief 4/22/02 , Defendant's Supplemental Brief/Response deadline to 6/6/02 and Reply due: for SOUTHTRUST BANK, for SOUTHTRUST, for BANKERS FIRST SAVING, for BANKERS FIRST (signed by Judge Nancy B. Firestone). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                LREF
                                                Blank -- Filed: 3/7/2002, Entered: 3/8/2002 Status Conference
                                                Status Conference held ( Transcript due 3/12/02 ) (DS)
                                                  LREF
                                                  Blank 41 Filed: 3/4/2002, Entered: 3/5/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                  ORDER setting Status Conference for 2:30 p.m. on 3/7/02 (signed by Judge Nancy B. Firestone). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                    LREF
                                                    Blank -- Filed: 2/1/2002, Entered: 2/1/2002
                                                    CASE reassigned to Judge Nancy B. Firestone . (DS)
                                                      LREF
                                                      Blank 40 Filed: 1/11/2002, Entered: 1/11/2002 Court Filing
                                                      Notice of reassignment to Judge Nancy B. Firestone, effective February 1, 2002. Copy to parties. (DS)
                                                        LREF
                                                        Blank 39 Filed: 1/7/2002, Entered: 1/8/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                        ORDER re: reassignment of cases. ( signed by Sr. Judge Loren A. Smith ) Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                          LREF
                                                          Blank 38 Filed: 9/25/2001, Entered: 9/25/2001, Terminated: 9/25/2001 Motion to Substitute Attorney (Consented)
                                                          MOTION by BANKERS FIRST, BANKERS FIRST SAVING (Service: 9/20/01) to substitute attorney (consented) Terminated attorney Charles T. Lester for BANKERS FIRST SAVING, attorney Charles T. Lester for BANKERS FIRST Added Stephen Michael Forte . (FE)
                                                            LREF
                                                            Blank 37 Filed: 2/9/2001, Entered: 2/12/2001 Memorandum
                                                            MEMORANDUM (First amendment to the appendix) by BANKERS FIRST, BANKERS FIRST SAVING re: [25-1] motion for Summary Judgment. Service: 11/7/00. (HW)
                                                              LREF
                                                              Blank 36 Filed: 2/9/2001, Entered: 2/12/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                              ORDER granting [28-1] motion for Leave to Amend Appendix to Plaintiffs' motion for summary judgment (signed by Senior Judge Loren A. Smith). Copy to parties. (HW)
                                                                LREF
                                                                Blank 35 Filed: 1/16/2001, Entered: 1/18/2001 Terminated:
                                                                RESPONSE by BANKERS FIRST and BANKERS FIRST SAVING to [31-1] statement by USA and [24-1] proposed findings by USA. Service: 1/16/01. (FE)
                                                                  LREF
                                                                  Blank 34 Filed: 1/16/2001, Entered: 1/17/2001 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                  REPLY by BANKERS FIRST, BANKERS FIRST SAVING to response to [25-1] motion for Summary Judgment. Service: 1/16/01. (FE)
                                                                    LREF
                                                                    Blank 33 Filed: 1/16/2001, Entered: 1/17/2001 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                    REPLY by USA to response to [23-1] motion for Summary Judgment, [23-2] motion to Dismiss. Service: 1/16/01. (FE)
                                                                      LREF
                                                                      Blank 32 Filed: 12/18/2000, Entered: 12/20/2000 Terminated:
                                                                      RESPONSE by USA (Service: 12/18/00 ) to [25-1] motion for Summary Judgment. (1 Separate Volume of Appendix) Reply due: 1/12/01 (JT)
                                                                        LREF
                                                                        Blank 31 Filed: 12/18/2000, Entered: 12/20/2000 Statement of Genuine Issues
                                                                        STATEMENT OF GENUINE ISSUES by USA. Service: 12/18/00 (JT)
                                                                          LREF
                                                                          Blank 30 Filed: 12/18/2000, Entered: 12/20/2000 Terminated:
                                                                          RESPONSE by BANKERS FIRST and BANKERS FIRST SAVING (Service: 12/18/00) to [23-1] motion for Summary Judgment, [23-2] motion to Dismiss, filed with a (1) one volume appendix. Reply due: 1/4/01. (FE)
                                                                            LREF
                                                                            Blank 29 Filed: 12/18/2000, Entered: 12/20/2000 Terminated:
                                                                            RESPONSE and OBJECTIONS by BANKERS FIRST and BANKERS FIRST SAVING to [24-1] proposed findings by USA. Service: 12/18/00. (FE)
                                                                              LREF
                                                                              Blank 28 Filed: 11/8/2000, Entered: 11/9/2000, Terminated: 2/9/2001 Terminated:
                                                                              MOTION by BANKERS FIRST, BANKERS FIRST SAVING (Service : 11/7/00 ) for Leave to Amend Appendix to Plaintiffs' motion for summary judgment. Response due: 11/27/00 (JT)
                                                                                LREF
                                                                                Blank 27 Filed: 10/13/2000, Entered: 10/17/2000 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                NOTICE of Filing Original Declaration by BANKERS FIRST, BANKERS FIRST SAVING. Service: 10/13/00 (JT)
                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                  Blank 26 Filed: 10/10/2000, Entered: 10/12/2000 Proposed Findings of Uncontroverted Fact
                                                                                  PROPOSED FINDINGS of Uncontroverted Fact by BANKERS FIRST, BANKERS FIRST SAVING. Service: 10/9/00 (JT)
                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                    Blank 25 Filed: 10/10/2000, Entered: 10/12/2000 Terminated:
                                                                                    MOTION by BANKERS FIRST, BANKERS FIRST SAVING (Service : 10/9/00 ) for Summary Judgment. (4 Separate Volumes of Appendix) Response due: 11/28/00 (JT)
                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                      Blank 24 Filed: 10/10/2000, Entered: 10/11/2000 Proposed Findings of Uncontroverted Fact
                                                                                      PROPOSED FINDINGS of Uncontroverted Fact by USA. Service: 10/10/00. (FE)
                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                        Blank 23 Filed: 10/10/2000, Entered: 10/11/2000 Terminated:
                                                                                        MOTION by USA (Service: 10/10/00) for Summary Judgment and to Dismiss , filed with a two (2) volume appendix. Response due: 11/29/00. (FE)
                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                          Blank 22 Filed: 9/27/2000, Entered: 10/2/2000 Terminated:
                                                                                          MOTION by USA (Service : 9/27/00 ) For leave to exceed the page limitation. (JT)
                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                            Blank 21 Filed: 9/22/1999, Entered: 9/28/1999 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                            NOTICE of Initial Disclosure List by USA. Service: 9/22/99 (JT)
                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                              Blank 20 Filed: 9/22/1999, Entered: 9/28/1999 Answer
                                                                                              ANSWER to Complaint by USA. Service: 9/22/99 (JT)
                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                Blank 19 Filed: 6/16/1999, Entered: 6/18/1999 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                NOTICE of Attorney Appearance for USA by Michael M. Duclos. Service: 6/14/99. (FE)
                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                  Blank 18 Filed: 8/14/1998, Entered: 8/17/1998 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                  NOTICE of Attorney Appearance for USA by Jonathan Scott Lawlor. Service : 8/14/98. (FE)
                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                    Blank 17 Filed: 1/7/1997, Entered: 1/10/1997 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                    SEE 95-660C FOR OPINION denying [12-1] motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction ( signed by Judge John P. Wiese ) Copy to parties. (DS)
                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                      Blank 16 Filed: 12/5/1996, Entered: 12/9/1996 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                      SEE 95-660C FOR ORDER oral argument set for 10:30 a.m. on 12/19/96 for [12-1] motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction signed by Judge John P. Wiese). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                        Blank 15 Filed: 10/8/1996, Entered: 10/9/1996 Terminated:
                                                                                                        RESPONSE by BANKERS FIRST, BANKERS FIRST SAVING (Service by hand: 10/8/96 ) to [12-1] motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction. Reply due: 10/18/96. (HW)
                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                          Blank 14 Filed: 10/7/1996, Entered: 10/8/1996 Case Assigned/ReassignedCourt Filing
                                                                                                          See 90-8 C for Notice of reassignment to Judge John P. Wiese. Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                            Blank 13 Filed: 10/2/1996, Entered: 10/5/1996 Amended ComplaintCourt Filing
                                                                                                            AMENDED COMPLAINT by BANKERS FIRST, BANKERS FIRST SAVING (Answer due 10/16/96 ) amending [1-1] complaint [by leave of the Judge]. Service: 9/17/96 (HW)
                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                              Blank 12 Filed: 9/9/1996, Entered: 9/16/1996 Terminated:
                                                                                                              MOTION by USA (Service: 9/9/96) to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction . Response due: 10/10/96 (FE)
                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                Blank 11 Filed: 8/28/1996, Entered: 9/13/1996 Case Assigned/ReassignedCourt Filing
                                                                                                                SEE ORDER IN 90-8C for Notice of reassignment to Chief Judge Loren A. Smith. Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                  Blank 10 Filed: 6/25/1996, Entered: 6/28/1996 Notice of Change of Address
                                                                                                                  NOTICE of change of address by Shalom Brilliant (FE)
                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                    Blank 9 Filed: 4/29/1996, Entered: 5/1/1996 Terminated:
                                                                                                                    MOTION by USA (Service: 4/29/96) for Leave to File copy of motion to adopt special case management procedures . Response due: 5/16/96 (FE)
                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                      Blank 8 Filed: 3/26/1996, Entered: 4/1/1996 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                      ORDER granting [7-1] motion for Leave to File notice with attached declaration (signed by Judge Christine O. Miller). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                        Blank 7 Filed: 3/19/1996, Entered: 3/25/1996, Terminated: 3/26/1996 Terminated:
                                                                                                                        MOTION by USA (Service: 3/19/96) for Leave to File notice with attached declaration Response due: 4/5/96 (FE)
                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                          Blank 6 Filed: 1/31/1996, Entered: 2/6/1996 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                          ORDER granting [4-1] motion to Stay pending final decision by the Supreme Court in Winstar Corp. v. United States ( signed by Chief Judge Loren A. Smith for Judge Christine Odell Cook Miller). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                            Blank 5 Filed: 1/30/1996, Entered: 2/5/1996 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Attorney Appearance for USA by Shalom Brilliant Service: 1/30/96 (FE)
                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                              Blank 4 Filed: 1/24/1996, Entered: 1/30/1996, Terminated: 1/31/1996 Terminated:
                                                                                                                              MOTION by USA (Service : 1/24/96 ) to Stay of proceedings until the US Supreeme Court renders its final decision in WINSTAR, etc. Response due: 2/12/96. (HW)
                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                Blank 3 Filed: 11/29/1995, Entered: 12/12/1995 Notice of Related Cases
                                                                                                                                NOTICE by BANKERS FIRST, BANKERS FIRST SAVINGS BANK of related case(s). (90-8 C Windstar Corp., et al.) (FE)
                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                  Blank 2 Filed: 11/29/1995, Entered: 12/12/1995 Case Assigned/ReassignedCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                  Notice of assignment to Judge Christine O. Miller. Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                    Blank 1 Filed: 11/29/1995, Entered: 12/12/1995 Complaint
                                                                                                                                    COMPLAINT, FILING FEE $120, RECEIPT #040523. Answer due on 1/29/96. (FE)
                                                                                                                                      LREF

                                                                                                                                      Statistics

                                                                                                                                      This case has been viewed 159 times.

                                                                                                                                      No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                      Space
                                                                                                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                       
                                                                                                                                      PlainSite
                                                                                                                                      Sign Up
                                                                                                                                      Need Password Help?