STATEWIDE SAVINGS v. USA
Federal Civil Lawsuit United States Court of Federal Claims, Case No. 1:95-cv-00779-MBH
District Judge Marian Blank Horn, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo STATEWIDE SAVINGS BANK, S.L.A., Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by McCarter & English LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space WILLIAM T. REILLY +1 973 622 4444 wreilly@mccarter.com
v.
United States of America United States of America, Defendant
Officially listed as "USA"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space John Hugh Roberson +1 202 353 7972 +1 202 514 8640 john.roberson@usdoj.gov
Office COFC
Filed 12/1/1995
Jury Demand
Demand $0
Nature of Suit 511 - Taking - FIRREA
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1491 Tucker Act
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition Preliminary Injunction
County
Terminated 2/28/2003
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flag CLOSED
  Entries (85) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 78 Filed: 2/28/2003, Entered: 2/28/2003
JUDGMENT entered, pursuant to Rule 58, that the complaint is dismissed pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1), with prejudice. (signed by Clerk). Copy to parties. (LD)
    LREF
    Blank -- Filed: 2/28/2003, Entered: 2/28/2003
    Case closed (LD)
      LREF
      Blank 77 Filed: 2/19/2003, Entered: 2/21/2003 Terminated:
      RESPONSE by USA to [73-2] order. Service: 2/10/03 (DS)
        LREF
        Blank 76 Filed: 2/19/2003, Entered: 2/19/2003 Court Filing
        ORDER dismissing the case with prejudice. ( signed by Sr. Judge Marian Blank Horn ) Copy to parties. (JT)
          LREF
          Blank 75 Filed: 2/19/2003, Entered: 2/19/2003
          Stipulation of dismissal filed by STATEWIDE SAVINGS, USA (JT)
            LREF
            Blank 74 Filed: 2/4/2003, Entered: 2/13/2003 Status ReportCourt Filing
            AFFIDAVIT [of WILLIAM T. REILLY] and STATUS REPORT by STATEWIDE SAVINGS, filed by leave of the Judge. Service: 2/4/03 (HW)
              LREF
              Blank 73 Filed: 2/4/2003, Entered: 2/13/2003 OrderCourt Filing
              ORDER Defendant's report deadline to 2/28/03 (signed by Sr. Judge Marian Blank Horn). Copy to parties. (FE)
                LREF
                Blank 72 Filed: 12/10/2002, Entered: 12/10/2002
                TRANSCRIPT of proceedings re: 1 volume, at Washington, D.C., for date of December 3, 2002. Notice to parties. (FE)
                  LREF
                  Blank -- Filed: 12/10/2002, Entered: 12/10/2002
                  Status Conference held (FE)
                    LREF
                    Blank 71 Filed: 12/5/2002, Entered: 12/9/2002 Status Report/OrderCourt Filing
                    STATUS REPORT ORDER. Plaintiff shall file a Status report due on 1/16/03 ( signed by Sr. Judge Marian Blank Horn ) Copy to parties. (HW)
                      LREF
                      Blank 70 Filed: 11/19/2002, Entered: 11/22/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                      ORDER setting Status Conference for 2:30 p.m. on 12/3/02 (signed by Sr. Judge Marian Blank Horn). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                        LREF
                        Blank 69 Filed: 11/19/2002, Entered: 11/22/2002 Sealed OpinionCourt Filing
                        Decision of Sr. Judge Marian Blank Horn. Copy to parties. (LTD)
                          LREF
                          Blank 68 Filed: 3/8/2002, Entered: 3/11/2002 Remark
                          STATEWIDE'S SUPPLEMENTAL SUBMISSION ON DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISQUALIFY PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL. (LTD)
                            LREF
                            Blank 67 Filed: 3/8/2002, Entered: 3/11/2002 Remark
                            DEFENDANT'S SUPPLEMENTAL PRODUCTION OF DEPOSITION TESTIMONY. (LTD)
                              LREF
                              Blank 66 Filed: 3/8/2002, Entered: 3/11/2002 Memorandum
                              MEMORANDUM OF LAW by USA. Service: 3/8/02. (LTD)
                                LREF
                                Blank 65 Filed: 3/4/2002, Entered: 3/5/2002 Transcript
                                TRANSCRIPT of proceedings re: status conference, 1 volume, at Washington, D.C., for date of February 28, 2002. Notice to parties. (FE)
                                  LREF
                                  Blank 64 Filed: 3/1/2002, Entered: 3/4/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                  ORDER Plaintiff to file a copy of the revolving door conflict rules applicable to the New Jersey State Dept. of Bank and Defendant to file a memorandum regarding Kesselhaul v. United States on 3/8/02 and proceedings on Plaintiff's Fifth Amendment takings claim is stayed (signed by Sr. Judge Marian Blank Horn). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                    LREF
                                    Blank -- Filed: 2/28/2002, Entered: 3/1/2002 Status Conference
                                    Status Conference and Oral Argument on motion to disqualify plaintiff's counsel held ( Transcript due 4/1/02 ) (DS)
                                      LREF
                                      Blank -- Filed: 2/27/2002, Entered: 2/27/2002
                                      Status Conference and oral argument on motion to disqualify plaintiff's attorney rescheduled for 3:30 p.m. on 2/28/02 (DS)
                                        LREF
                                        Blank 63 Filed: 2/4/2002, Entered: 2/5/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                        ORDER setting Status Conference for 2:30 p.m. on 2/28/02 (signed by Sr. Judge Marian Blank Horn). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                          LREF
                                          Blank -- Filed: 2/1/2002, Entered: 2/1/2002
                                          CASE reassigned to Sr. Judge Marian Blank Horn . (DS)
                                            LREF
                                            Blank 62 Filed: 1/11/2002, Entered: 1/11/2002 Court Filing
                                            Notice of reassignment to Judge Marian Blank Horn, effective February 1, 2002. Copy to parties. (DS)
                                              LREF
                                              Blank 61 Filed: 1/7/2002, Entered: 1/8/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                              ORDER re: reassignment of cases. ( signed by Sr. Judge Loren A. Smith ) Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                LREF
                                                Blank 60 Filed: 10/10/2001, Entered: 10/11/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                ORDER granting [59-1] motion for Leave to withdraw motion to compel (signed by Judge Robert H. Hodges). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                  LREF
                                                  Blank 59 Filed: 7/26/2001, Entered: 7/27/2001, Terminated: 10/10/2001 Terminated:
                                                  MOTION by USA (Service: 7/26/01) for Leave to withdraw motion to compel . Response due: 8/13/01. (FE)
                                                    LREF
                                                    Blank 58 Filed: 7/18/2001, Entered: 7/20/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                    ORDER directing parties to notify the court on or before 7/30/01 for a telephonic conference (signed by Judge Robert H. Hodges). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                      LREF
                                                      Blank 57 Filed: 7/5/2001, Entered: 7/9/2001 Terminated:
                                                      MOTION by USA (Service: 7/5/01) to Compel to satisfy discovery payment obligations . Response due: 7/23/01. (LTD)
                                                        LREF
                                                        Blank 56 Filed: 2/21/2001, Entered: 2/22/2001 Reply to Response to MotionCourt Filing
                                                        REPLY (Filed by leave of the Judge) by USA to response to [52-1] cross motion. Service: 2/12/01. (FE)
                                                          LREF
                                                          Blank 55 Filed: 1/26/2001, Entered: 1/29/2001 Terminated:
                                                          MOTION by USA (Service: 1/26/01) For leave to exceed the page limitation (FE)
                                                            LREF
                                                            Blank 54 Filed: 1/16/2001, Entered: 1/18/2001 Statement of Genuine Issues
                                                            STATEMENT OF GENUINE ISSUES by STATEWIDE SAVINGS. Service: 1/15/01. (FE)
                                                              LREF
                                                              Blank 53 Filed: 1/16/2001, Entered: 2/14/2001 Terminated:
                                                              RESPONSE by STATEWIDE SAVINGS (Service: 1/15/01 ) to [52-1] cross motion. Reply due: 2/12/01 (DS)
                                                                LREF
                                                                Blank 52 Filed: 11/9/2000, Entered: 11/14/2000 Terminated:
                                                                CROSS MOTION (for summary judgment and to dismiss), together with two separate volumes of appendix, by USA ( Service: 11/9/00 ) and RESPONSE to [44-1] motion for Summary Judgment by STATEWIDE SAVINGS. Response due: 12/29/00 (JT) Modified on 02/14/2001
                                                                  LREF
                                                                  Blank 51 Filed: 11/9/2000, Entered: 11/13/2000 Proposed Findings of Uncontroverted Fact
                                                                  PROPOSED FINDINGS of Uncontroverted Fact by USA. Service: 11/9/00 (JT)
                                                                    LREF
                                                                    Blank -- Filed: 11/9/2000, Entered: 11/14/2000 Set/Reset Deadlines:
                                                                    Deadline updated; Plaintiff's Response to [52-1] cross motion set to 12/29/00. (JT) Modified on 02/14/2001
                                                                      LREF
                                                                      Blank 50 Filed: 10/26/2000, Entered: 10/27/2000 Memorandum
                                                                      SURREPLY by STATEWIDE SAVINGS re: motion to disqualify Plaintiff's counsel. Service: 9/22/00 (JT)
                                                                        LREF
                                                                        Blank 49 Filed: 10/26/2000, Entered: 10/27/2000 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                        ORDER granting [42-1] motion for Leave to File surreply in opposition to motion to disqualify Plaintiff's counsel. ( signed by Senior Judge Loren A. Smith ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                                                                          LREF
                                                                          Blank 48 Filed: 10/26/2000, Entered: 10/27/2000 ~Notice (other)Court Filing
                                                                          NOTICE of Exhibit 2 to Statewide's opposition to motion to disqualify Plaintiff's counsel by STATEWIDE SAVINGS. Filed by leave of the Judge. (JT)
                                                                            LREF
                                                                            Blank 47 Filed: 10/26/2000, Entered: 10/27/2000 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                            ORDER directing the Clerk to file the substitute copy of the relevant exhibit of Plaintiff's opposition brief by leave of the court. ( signed by Senior Judge Loren A. Smith ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                                                                              LREF
                                                                              Blank 45 Filed: 10/24/2000, Entered: 10/25/2000 Terminated: Court Filing
                                                                              SUPPLEMENTAL AFFIDAVIT of MICHAEL HORN by STATEWIDE SAVINGS to [32-1] motion to disqualify Plaintiff's counsel by USA, by leave of the Judge. Service: 8/11/00. (FE)
                                                                                LREF
                                                                                Blank 46 Filed: 10/20/2000, Entered: 10/25/2000 Terminated:
                                                                                MOTION by USA (Service : 10/20/00 ) For leave to exceed the page limitation re: cross-motion for summary judgment. (DS)
                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                  Blank 44 Filed: 10/10/2000, Entered: 10/12/2000 Terminated:
                                                                                  MOTION by STATEWIDE SAVINGS (Service : 10/9/00 ) for Summary Judgment. Response due: 11/28/00 (JT)
                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                    Blank 43 Filed: 10/10/2000, Entered: 10/12/2000 Proposed Findings of Uncontroverted Fact
                                                                                    PROPOSED FINDINGS of Uncontroverted Fact by STATEWIDE SAVINGS. Service: 10/9/00 (JT)
                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                      Blank 42 Filed: 9/25/2000, Entered: 9/28/2000, Terminated: 10/26/2000 Terminated:
                                                                                      MOTION by STATEWIDE SAVINGS (Service : 9/22/00 ) for Leave to File surreply in opposition to motion to disqualify Plaintiff's counsel. Response due: 10/10/00 (JT) Modified on 09/28/2000
                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                        Blank 41 Filed: 9/19/2000, Entered: 9/21/2000 Terminated:
                                                                                        MOTION by STATEWIDE SAVINGS (Service: 9/18/00) for entry of an order establishing time to respond to request for admisions . Response due: 10/5/00. (FE)
                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                          Blank 40 Filed: 9/7/2000, Entered: 9/11/2000 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                          REPLY by USA to response to [32-1] motion to disqualify Plaintiff's counsel. Service: 9/7/00. (FE)
                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                            Blank 39 Filed: 9/5/2000, Entered: 9/7/2000 Terminated:
                                                                                            SECOND AMENDED MOTION by USA (Service : 9/5/00 ) to Extend Time to reply to response to motion to disqualify Plaintiff's counsel [until September 8, 2000]. Response due: 9/22/00 (JT)
                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                              Blank 38 Filed: 8/29/2000, Entered: 8/31/2000 Terminated:
                                                                                              AMENDED MOTION by USA (Service : 8/29/00 ) to Extend Time for filing response brief [until September 5, 2000]. Response due: 9/15/00 (JT)
                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                Blank 37 Filed: 8/14/2000, Entered: 8/15/2000 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                REPLY by USA to response to [35-1] motion to Extend Time to reply to response to motion to disqualify Plaintiff's counsel. Service: 8/14/00 (JT)
                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                  Blank 36 Filed: 8/8/2000, Entered: 8/10/2000 Terminated:
                                                                                                  RESPONSE by STATEWIDE SAVINGS (Service: 8/7/00 ) to [35-1] motion to Extend Time to reply to response to motion to disqualify Plaintiff's counsel. Reply due: 8/21/00 (JT)
                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                    Blank 35 Filed: 8/4/2000, Entered: 8/8/2000 Terminated:
                                                                                                    MOTION by USA (Service : 8/4/00 ) to Extend Time to reply to response to motion to disqualify Plaintiff's counsel [until August 30, 2000]. Response due: 8/21/00 (JT)
                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                      Blank 34 Filed: 7/28/2000, Entered: 8/2/2000 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                      ORDER denying [32-2] motion for expedited consideraton and filing by leave the Plaintiff's letter dated 7/13/00. ( signed by Senior Judge Loren A. Smith ) Copy to parties. (JT) Modified on 08/02/2000
                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                        Blank 33 Filed: 7/28/2000, Entered: 8/1/2000 Terminated:
                                                                                                        RESPONSE by STATEWIDE SAVINGS (Service: 7/27/00) to [32-1] motion to disqualify Plaintiff's counsel. Reply due: 8/10/00. (FE)
                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                          Blank 32 Filed: 7/11/2000, Entered: 7/14/2000 Terminated:
                                                                                                          MOTION by USA (Service : 7/11/00 ) to disqualify Plaintiff's counsel and for expedited consideraton. Response due: 7/28/00 (JT)
                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                            Blank 31 Filed: 6/9/2000, Entered: 6/12/2000 Notice of Appearance/Court Filing
                                                                                                            NOTICE of Attorney Appearance for USA by John Hugh Roberson. Filed by leave of the Judge. Service : 6/6/00 (JT)
                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                              Blank 30 Filed: 4/27/2000, Entered: 4/28/2000 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                              ORDER granting [29-1] motion to Extend Time to respond to interrogatories. Reset Defendant's response to Plaintiff's interrogatories deadline to 5/10/00. ( signed by Judge Robert H. Hodges ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                Blank 29 Filed: 4/26/2000, Entered: 4/27/2000, Terminated: 4/27/2000 Terminated:
                                                                                                                MOTION by USA (Service : 4/26/00 ) to Extend Time to respond to interrogatories. (to May 10, 2000) (DS)
                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                  Blank 28 Filed: 4/5/2000, Entered: 4/6/2000 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                  ORDER granting [27-1] motion to Extend Time to respond to interrogatories. Reset Defendant's response to Plaintiff's interrogatories deadline to 4/26/00. ( signed by Judge Robert H. Hodges ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                    Blank 27 Filed: 4/4/2000, Entered: 4/5/2000, Terminated: 4/5/2000 Terminated:
                                                                                                                    MOTION by USA (Service: 4/4/00) to Extend Time to respond to interrogatories , (until April 26, 2000). (FE)
                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                      Blank 26 Filed: 2/2/2000, Entered: 2/4/2000 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                      ORDER granting [25-1] motion to Extend Time to respond to Case-Specific Interrogatories. Reset Plaintiff's response to interrogatories deadline to 2/14/00. ( signed by Judge Robert H. Hodges ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                        Blank 25 Filed: 2/1/2000, Entered: 2/2/2000, Terminated: 2/2/2000 Terminated: Court Filing
                                                                                                                        MOTION by STATEWIDE SAVINGS (Service: 1/26/00) to Extend Time to respond to Case-Specific Interrogatories , (until February 10, 2000). [by leave of the Judge] (FE)
                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                          Blank 24 Filed: 9/22/1999, Entered: 9/28/1999 Answer
                                                                                                                          ANSWER to Complaint by USA. Service: 9/22/99 (JT)
                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                            Blank 23 Filed: 7/27/1999, Entered: 7/28/1999 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Attorney Appearance for USA by Kenneth MacPhee Kulak. Service : 7/27/99 (HW)
                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                              Blank 22 Filed: 6/18/1997, Entered: 6/30/1997 Terminated:
                                                                                                                              MOTION by STATEWIDE SAVINGS (Service : 6/16/97) to substitute attorney (consented) Terminated attorney Michael A. Guariglia for STATEWIDE SAVINGS Added William Thomas Reilly . (FE)
                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                Blank 21 Filed: 1/7/1997, Entered: 1/10/1997 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                SEE 95-660C FOR OPINION denying [16-1] motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction ( signed by Judge John P. Wiese ) Copy to parties. (DS)
                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                  Blank 20 Filed: 12/5/1996, Entered: 12/9/1996 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                  SEE 95-660 C FOR ORDER oral argument set for 10:30 a.m. on 12/19/96 for [16-1] motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction signed by Judge John P. Wiese). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                    Blank 19 Filed: 11/15/1996, Entered: 11/19/1996 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Attorney Appearance for USA by John Jay Hoffman. Service : 11/15/96 (HW)
                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                      Blank 18 Filed: 10/8/1996, Entered: 10/9/1996 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                      RESPONSE by STATEWIDE SAVINGS (Service by hand: 10/8/96 ) to [16-1] motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction. Reply due: 10/18/96. (HW)
                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                        Blank 17 Filed: 10/7/1996, Entered: 10/8/1996 Case Assigned/ReassignedCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                        See 90-8 C for Notice of reassignment to Judge John P. Wiese. Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                          Blank 16 Filed: 9/9/1996, Entered: 9/16/1996 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                          MOTION by USA (Service: 9/9/96) to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction . Response due: 10/10/96 (FE)
                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                            Blank 15 Filed: 8/28/1996, Entered: 9/3/1996 Case Assigned/ReassignedCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                            SEE ORDER IN 90-8C for Notice of reassignment to Chief Judge Loren A. Smith. Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                              Blank 14 Filed: 8/16/1996, Entered: 8/20/1996 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                              MOTION by USA (Service : 8/16/96 ) for Leave to File attached proposed pretrial order. Response due: 9/3/96 (HW)
                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                Blank 13 Filed: 7/24/1996, Entered: 7/26/1996 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                MOTION by USA (Service: 7/24/96) for Leave to File copy of motion to adopt special case management procedures . Response due: 8/12/96 (FE)
                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Blank 12 Filed: 5/14/1996, Entered: 5/17/1996 Status ReportCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                  JOINT STATUS REPORT (Filed by leave of the Judge) Service: 5/2/96 (FE)
                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Blank -- Filed: 5/14/1996, Entered: 5/17/1996 Set/Reset Deadlines:
                                                                                                                                                    Deadline updated; reset Status Report deadline to 8/12/96 (90 days) (FE)
                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Blank 11 Filed: 5/13/1996, Entered: 5/16/1996 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                      MOTION by STATEWIDE SAVINGS (Service: 5/10/96) for Leave to File Response to Defendant's Motion for Leave to File Motion . Response due: 5/28/96. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Blank 10 Filed: 5/9/1996, Entered: 5/14/1996 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Attorney Appearance for USA by Steven John Gillingham. Service : 5/9/96 (HW)
                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Blank 9 Filed: 4/26/1996, Entered: 4/30/1996 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                          MOTION by USA (Service : 4/26/96 ) for Leave to File a copy of the motion to adopt special case managemnet procedures . Response due: 5/13/96 (HW)
                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Blank 8 Filed: 3/26/1996, Entered: 4/1/1996 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                            ORDER granting [7-1] motion for Leave to File notice and declaration re: certain documents that may be relevant to this action (signed by Judge Bohdan A. Futey). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Blank 7 Filed: 3/20/1996, Entered: 3/26/1996, Terminated: 3/26/1996 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                              MOTION by USA (Service : 3/20/96 ) for Leave to File notice and declaration re: certain documents that may be relevant to this action . Response due: 4/8/96 (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Blank 6 Filed: 2/5/1996, Entered: 2/12/1996 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                ORDER granting [5-1] motion to Stay Proceedings, set joint Status Report deadline to 5/6/96 and at 90 day intervals thereafter (signed by Judge Bohdan A. Futey). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 5 Filed: 1/25/1996, Entered: 1/31/1996, Terminated: 2/5/1996 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION by USA (Service : 1/25/96) to Stay Proceedings . (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 4 Filed: 12/15/1995, Entered: 12/19/1995 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Attorney Appearance for USA by Dean Lawrence Grayson. Service: 12/15/95 (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 3 Filed: 12/1/1995, Entered: 12/12/1995 Notice of Related Cases
                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE by STATEWIDE SAVINGS BANK, S.L.A. of related case(s). (90-8 C Windstar Corp., et al.) (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 2 Filed: 12/1/1995, Entered: 12/12/1995 Case Assigned/ReassignedCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                        Notice of assignment to Judge Bohdan A. Futey. Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 1 Filed: 12/1/1995, Entered: 12/12/1995 Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                          COMPLAINT, FILING FEE $120, RECEIPT #040517. Answer due on 1/30/96. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                            LREF

                                                                                                                                                                            Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                            This case has been viewed 149 times.

                                                                                                                                                                            No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                            Space
                                                                                                                                                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                             
                                                                                                                                                                            PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                            Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                            Need Password Help?