LSB INDUSTRIES, INC., et al v. USA
Federal Civil Lawsuit United States Court of Federal Claims, Case No. 1:95-cv-00782-LAS
District Judge Loren A. Smith, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Lsb Industries, Inc., Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Daniel Jay Goldberg +1 617 439 0300
No Logo PRIME FINANCIAL CORPORATION, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Daniel Jay Goldberg +1 617 439 0300
v.
United States of America United States of America, Defendant
Officially listed as "USA"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jeffery Thomas infelise +1 202 616 8254 +1 202 514 8624 jeffery.infelise@usdoj.gov
Office COFC
Filed 12/4/1995
Jury Demand
Demand $0
Nature of Suit 511 - Taking - FIRREA
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1491 Tucker Act
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition Preliminary Injunction
County
Terminated 3/27/2002
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flag CLOSED
  Entries (29) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 28 Filed: 3/27/2002, Entered: 3/27/2002
Stipulation of Voluntary Dismissal by LSB INDUSTRIES, INC., USA and PRIME FINANCIAL. Complaint dismissed with prejudcie pursuant to Rule 41 (a)(1)(B). Copy to parties. (AB)
    LREF
    Blank -- Filed: 3/27/2002, Entered: 3/27/2002
    Case closed (AB)
      LREF
      Blank 27 Filed: 1/7/2002, Entered: 1/8/2002 OrderCourt Filing
      ORDER re: discovery. ( signed by Sr. Judge Loren A. Smith ) Copy to parties. (FE)
        LREF
        Blank 26 Filed: 10/31/2000, Entered: 11/2/2000 Notice of Appearance/
        NOTICE of Attorney Appearance for USA by Jeffery Thomas Infelise Service : 10/31/00 (JT)
          LREF
          Blank 25 Filed: 8/7/2000, Entered: 8/8/2000 ~Notice (other)Court Filing
          NOTICE of Opt-Out of Third Discovery Wave by LSB INDUSTRIES, INC., PRIME FINANCIAL. Filed by leave of the Judge. Service: 7/24/00 (JT)
            LREF
            Blank 24 Filed: 5/3/1999, Entered: 5/4/1999 ~Notice (other)Court Filing
            NOTICE of Opt-Out of Second Discovery Wave by LSB INDUSTRIES, INC., PRIME FINANCIAL. Filed by leave of the Judge. Service: 4/26/99 (JT)
              LREF
              Blank 23 Filed: 4/6/1999, Entered: 4/12/1999 Notice of Appearance/
              NOTICE of Attorney Appearance for USA by Matthew David Lee Service : 4/6/99 (JT)
                LREF
                Blank 22 Filed: 4/2/1999, Entered: 4/7/1999 ~Notice (other)
                NOTICE of Opt-Out of Second Discovery Wave by LSB INDUSTRIES, INC., PRIME FINANCIAL. Service: 4/2/99 (JT)
                  LREF
                  Blank 21 Filed: 10/2/1997, Entered: 10/7/1997 Notice of Change of Address
                  NOTICE of change of address by Daniel J. Goldberg. (HW)
                    LREF
                    Blank 20 Filed: 1/7/1997, Entered: 1/10/1997 OrderCourt Filing
                    SEE 95-660C FOR OPINION denying [15-1] motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction ( signed by Judge John P. Wiese ) Copy to parties. (DS)
                      LREF
                      Blank 19 Filed: 12/5/1996, Entered: 12/9/1996 OrderCourt Filing
                      SEE 95-660 C FOR ORDER oral argument set for 10:30 a.m. on 12/19/96 for [15-1] motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction signed by Judge John P. Wiese). Copy to parties. (FE)
                        LREF
                        Blank 18 Filed: 10/24/1996, Entered: 10/29/1996 Notice of Appearance/
                        NOTICE of Attorney Appearance for USA by Henry Roland Felix. Service : 10/24/96 (HW)
                          LREF
                          Blank 17 Filed: 10/8/1996, Entered: 10/9/1996 Terminated:
                          RESPONSE by LSB INDUSTRIES, INC., PRIME FINANCIAL (Service by hand: 10/8/96 ) to [15-1] motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction. Reply due: 10/18/96 (HW)
                            LREF
                            Blank 16 Filed: 10/7/1996, Entered: 10/8/1996 Case Assigned/ReassignedCourt Filing
                            See 90-8 C for Notice of reassignment to Judge John P. Wiese. Copy to parties. (FE)
                              LREF
                              Blank 15 Filed: 9/9/1996, Entered: 9/16/1996 Terminated:
                              MOTION by USA (Service: 9/9/96) to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction . Response due: 10/10/96 (FE)
                                LREF
                                Blank 14 Filed: 8/28/1996, Entered: 9/13/1996 Case Assigned/ReassignedCourt Filing
                                SEE ORDER IN 90-8C for Notice of reassignment to Chief Judge Loren A. Smith. Copy to parties. (FE)
                                  LREF
                                  Blank 13 Filed: 8/16/1996, Entered: 8/20/1996 Terminated:
                                  MOTION by USA (Service : 8/16/96 ) for Leave to File attached proposed pretrial order. Response due: 9/3/96 (HW)
                                    LREF
                                    Blank 12 Filed: 7/24/1996, Entered: 7/26/1996 Terminated:
                                    MOTION by USA (Service: 7/24/96) for Leave to File copy of motion to adopt special case management procedures . Response due: 8/12/96 (FE)
                                      LREF
                                      Blank 11 Filed: 6/19/1996, Entered: 6/21/1996 Notice of Change of Address
                                      NOTICE of change of address by Randi-Sue Rimerman (FE)
                                        LREF
                                        Blank 10 Filed: 5/8/1996, Entered: 5/13/1996 Terminated:
                                        RESPONSE by LSB INDUSTRIES, INC., PRIME FINANCIAL (Service: 5/8/96 ) to [9-1] motion for Leave to File Motion to Adopt Special Case Management Procedures. Reply due: 5/20/96 (HW)
                                          LREF
                                          Blank 9 Filed: 4/25/1996, Entered: 4/30/1996 Terminated:
                                          MOTION by USA (Service: 4/25/96) for Leave to File Motion to Adopt Special Case Management Procedures . Response due: 5/13/96. (FE)
                                            LREF
                                            Blank 8 Filed: 3/26/1996, Entered: 4/1/1996 OrderCourt Filing
                                            ORDER granting [6-1] motion for Leave to File notice and declaration re: certain documents that may be relevant to this action (signed by Judge Christine O. Miller). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                              LREF
                                              Blank 7 Filed: 3/26/1996, Entered: 3/26/1996
                                              NOTICE of change of address by Daniel J. Goldberg (FE)
                                                LREF
                                                Blank 6 Filed: 3/20/1996, Entered: 3/26/1996, Terminated: 3/26/1996 Terminated:
                                                MOTION by USA (Service : 3/19/96 ) for Leave to File notice and declaration re: certain documents that may be relevant to this action . Response due: 4/5/96 (FE)
                                                  LREF
                                                  Blank 5 Filed: 2/7/1996, Entered: 2/13/1996 OrderCourt Filing
                                                  ORDER granting [4-1] motion to Stay Proceedings pending a final decision by the Supreme Court in WINSTAR CORP ( signed by Judge Christine O. Miller ) Copy to parties. (HW)
                                                    LREF
                                                    Blank 4 Filed: 2/2/1996, Entered: 2/8/1996, Terminated: 2/7/1996 Terminated:
                                                    MOTION by USA (Service : 2/2/96) to Stay Proceedings . (FE)
                                                      LREF
                                                      Blank 3 Filed: 1/16/1996, Entered: 1/23/1996 Notice of Appearance/
                                                      NOTICE of Attorney Appearance for USA by Randi-Sue Rimerman. Service : 1/16/96 (HW)
                                                        LREF
                                                        Blank 2 Filed: 12/4/1995, Entered: 12/13/1995 Case Assigned/ReassignedCourt Filing
                                                        Notice of assignment to Judge Christine O. Miller. Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                          LREF
                                                          Blank 1 Filed: 12/4/1995, Entered: 12/13/1995 Complaint
                                                          COMPLAINT, FILING FEE $120, RECEIPT #040547. Answer due on 2/2/96. (FE)
                                                            LREF

                                                            Statistics

                                                            This case has been viewed 196 times.

                                                            No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                            Space
                                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                             
                                                            PlainSite
                                                            Sign Up
                                                            Need Password Help?