WEICHERT (CHATHAM), et al v. USA
Federal Civil Lawsuit United States Court of Federal Claims, Case No. 1:95-cv-00783-LAS
District Judge Loren A. Smith, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo JAMES M. WEICHERT, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Daniel Jay Goldberg +1 617 439 0300
v.
United States of America United States of America, Defendant
Officially listed as "USA"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Tarek Sawi Tarek.Sawi@usdoj.gov
Office COFC
Filed 12/4/1995
Jury Demand
Demand $0
Nature of Suit 511 - Taking - FIRREA
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1491 Tucker Act
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition Preliminary Injunction
County
Terminated 3/26/2002
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flag CLOSED
  Entries (30) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 29 Filed: 3/26/2002, Entered: 3/26/2002
Stipulation of Voluntary Dismissal by JAMES M. WEICHERT and USA. Complaint dismissed with prejudice pursuant to Rule 41 (a)(1)(B). Copy to parties. (AB)
    LREF
    Blank -- Filed: 3/26/2002, Entered: 3/26/2002
    Case closed (AB)
      LREF
      Blank 28 Filed: 1/7/2002, Entered: 1/8/2002 OrderCourt Filing
      ORDER re: discovery. ( signed by Sr. Judge Loren A. Smith ) Copy to parties. (FE)
        LREF
        Blank 27 Filed: 7/24/2000, Entered: 7/26/2000 ~Notice (other)
        NOTICE of Opt-Out of Third Discovery Wave by JAMES M. WEICHERT. Service: 7/24/00 (JT)
          LREF
          Blank 26 Filed: 1/6/2000, Entered: 1/6/2000 Court Filing
          AMENDED COMPLAINT by JAMES M. WEICHERT (Answer due 1/19/00 ) amending [1-1] complaint. Filed by leave of the Judge. Service: 12/27/99 (JT)
            LREF
            Blank 25 Filed: 12/15/1999, Entered: 12/20/1999 ~Notice (other)
            NOTICE of Dismissal of Chatham Savings, FSB by CHATHAM SAVINGS. Service: 12/15/99 (JT)
              LREF
              Blank 24 Filed: 4/27/1999, Entered: 4/30/1999 ~Notice (other)
              NOTICE of Opt-Out of Second Discovery Wave by CHATHAM SAVINGS, JAMES M. WEICHERT. Service: 4/26/99 (JT)
                LREF
                Blank 23 Filed: 4/2/1999, Entered: 4/7/1999 ~Notice (other)
                NOTICE of Opt-Out of Second Discovery Wave by CHATHAM SAVINGS, JAMES M. WEICHERT. Service: 4/2/99 (JT)
                  LREF
                  Blank 22 Filed: 10/2/1997, Entered: 10/7/1997 Notice of Change of Address
                  NOTICE of change of address by Daniel J. Goldberg. (HW)
                    LREF
                    Blank 21 Filed: 1/7/1997, Entered: 1/10/1997 OrderCourt Filing
                    SEE 95-660C FOR OPINION denying [17-1] motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction ( signed by Judge John P. Wiese ) Copy to parties. (DS)
                      LREF
                      Blank 20 Filed: 12/5/1996, Entered: 12/9/1996 OrderCourt Filing
                      SEE 95-660 C FOR ORDER oral argument set for 10:30 a.m. on 12/19/96 for [17-1] motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction signed by Judge John P. Wiese). Copy to parties. (FE)
                        LREF
                        Blank 19 Filed: 10/8/1996, Entered: 10/9/1996 Terminated:
                        RESPONSE by CHATHAM SAVINGS, JAMES M. WEICHERT (Service by hand: 10/8/96 ) to [17-1] motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction. Reply due: 10/18/96 (HW)
                          LREF
                          Blank 18 Filed: 10/7/1996, Entered: 10/8/1996 Case Assigned/ReassignedCourt Filing
                          See 90-8C for Notice of reassignment to Judge John P. Wiese. Copy to parties. (FE)
                            LREF
                            Blank 17 Filed: 9/9/1996, Entered: 9/16/1996 Terminated:
                            MOTION by USA (Service: 9/9/96) to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction . Response due: 10/10/96 (FE)
                              LREF
                              Blank 16 Filed: 8/28/1996, Entered: 9/13/1996 Case Assigned/ReassignedCourt Filing
                              SEE ORDER IN 90-8C for Notice of reassignment to Chief Judge Loren A. Smith. Copy to parties. (FE)
                                LREF
                                Blank 15 Filed: 8/23/1996, Entered: 8/29/1996 Notice of Appearance/
                                NOTICE of Attorney Appearance for USA by Tarek Sawi. Service : 8/23/96 (FE)
                                  LREF
                                  Blank 14 Filed: 8/19/1996, Entered: 8/26/1996 Terminated:
                                  MOTION by USA (Service: 8/19/96) for Leave to File proposed pretrial order . Response due: 9/5/96 (FE)
                                    LREF
                                    Blank 13 Filed: 7/23/1996, Entered: 7/25/1996 Terminated:
                                    MOTION by USA (Service : 7/23/96 ) for Leave to File a copy of the attached motion to adopt special case management procedures . Response due: 8/5/96 (HW)
                                      LREF
                                      Blank 12 Filed: 6/27/1996, Entered: 7/3/1996 Notice of Appearance/
                                      NOTICE of Attorney Appearance for USA by William Patrick Donovan Jr. Service : 6/27/96 (FE)
                                        LREF
                                        Blank 11 Filed: 6/24/1996, Entered: 6/28/1996 Notice of Change of Address
                                        NOTICE of change of address by Mark Brian Ehrlich (FE)
                                          LREF
                                          Blank 10 Filed: 5/8/1996, Entered: 5/13/1996 Terminated:
                                          MOTION by CHATHAM SAVINGS, JAMES M. WEICHERT (Service : 5/8/96 ) for Leave to File response to defendant's motion to adopt special case management procedures. Response due: 5/28/96 (HW)
                                            LREF
                                            Blank 9 Filed: 4/25/1996, Entered: 4/30/1996 Terminated:
                                            MOTION by USA (Service: 4/25/96) for Leave to File Motion to Adopt Special Case Management Procedures . Response due: 5/13/96. (FE)
                                              LREF
                                              Blank 8 Filed: 3/26/1996, Entered: 4/1/1996 OrderCourt Filing
                                              ORDER granting [7-1] motion for Leave to File notice and declaration re: certain documents that may be relevant to this action (signed by Judge Wilkes C. Robinson). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                LREF
                                                Blank 7 Filed: 3/20/1996, Entered: 3/26/1996, Terminated: 3/26/1996 Terminated:
                                                MOTION by USA (Service : 3/20/96 ) for Leave to File notice and declaration re: certain documents that may be relevant to this action . Response due: 4/8/96 (FE)
                                                  LREF
                                                  Blank 6 Filed: 3/19/1996, Entered: 3/26/1996 Notice of Change of Address
                                                  NOTICE of change of address by Daniel J. Goldberg (FE)
                                                    LREF
                                                    Blank 5 Filed: 2/6/1996, Entered: 2/12/1996 OrderCourt Filing
                                                    ORDER granting [4-1] motion to Stay pending final decision in Winstar (signed by Judge Wilkes C. Robinson). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                      LREF
                                                      Blank 4 Filed: 1/30/1996, Entered: 2/5/1996, Terminated: 2/6/1996 Terminated:
                                                      MOTION by USA (Service: 1/30/96) to Stay pending final decision in Winstar . (FE)
                                                        LREF
                                                        Blank 3 Filed: 12/18/1995, Entered: 12/27/1995 Notice of Appearance/
                                                        NOTICE of Attorney Appearance for USA by Mark Brian Ehrlich Service: 12/18/95 (FE)
                                                          LREF
                                                          Blank 2 Filed: 12/4/1995, Entered: 12/13/1995 Case Assigned/ReassignedCourt Filing
                                                          Notice of assignment to Judge Wilkes C. Robinson. Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                            LREF
                                                            Blank 1 Filed: 12/4/1995, Entered: 12/13/1995 Complaint
                                                            COMPLAINT, FILING FEE $120, RECEIPT #040547. Answer due on 2/2/96. (FE)
                                                              LREF

                                                              Statistics

                                                              This case has been viewed 186 times.

                                                              No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                              Space
                                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                               
                                                              PlainSite
                                                              Sign Up
                                                              Need Password Help?