MORTON FEDERAL v. USA
Federal Civil Lawsuit United States Court of Federal Claims, Case No. 1:95-cv-00784-LAS
District Judge Loren A. Smith, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo MORTON FEDERAL SAVINGS BANK, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Daniel Jay Goldberg +1 617 439 0300
v.
United States of America United States of America, Defendant
Officially listed as "USA"

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Maureen Ann Delaney
Office COFC
Filed 12/4/1995
Jury Demand
Demand $0
Nature of Suit 511 - Taking - FIRREA
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1491 Tucker Act
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition Preliminary Injunction
County
Terminated 5/1/2002
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flag CLOSED
  Entries (35) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 34 Filed: 5/1/2002, Entered: 5/1/2002
Stipulation of Voluntary Dismissal by MORTON FEDERAL and USA. Complaint dismissed with prejudice pursuant to Rule 41 (a)(1)(ii). Copy to parties. (FE)
    LREF
    Blank -- Filed: 5/1/2002, Entered: 5/1/2002
    Case closed (FE)
      LREF
      Blank 33 Filed: 1/7/2002, Entered: 1/8/2002 OrderCourt Filing
      ORDER re: discovery. ( signed by Sr. Judge Loren A. Smith ) Copy to parties. (FE)
        LREF
        Blank 32 Filed: 2/7/2001, Entered: 2/8/2001 Notice of Appearance/
        NOTICE of Attorney Appearance for USA by Maureen Ann Delaney. Service: 2/7/01. (FE)
          LREF
          Blank 31 Filed: 10/31/2000, Entered: 11/2/2000 Notice of Appearance/
          NOTICE of Attorney Appearance for USA by Renee Brooker Service : 10/31/00 (JT)
            LREF
            Blank 30 Filed: 7/24/2000, Entered: 7/26/2000 ~Notice (other)
            NOTICE of Opt-Out of Third Discovery Wave by MORTON FEDERAL. Service: 7/24/00 (JT)
              LREF
              Blank 29 Filed: 4/27/1999, Entered: 4/30/1999 ~Notice (other)
              NOTICE of Opt-Out of Second Discovery Wave by MORTON FEDERAL. Service: 4/26/99 (JT)
                LREF
                Blank 27 Filed: 10/2/1997, Entered: 10/7/1997 Notice of Change of Address
                NOTICE of change of address by Daniel J. Goldberg. (HW)
                  LREF
                  Blank 26 Filed: 1/7/1997, Entered: 1/10/1997 OrderCourt Filing
                  SEE 95-660C FOR OPINION denying [21-1] motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction ( signed by Judge John P. Wiese ) Copy to parties. (DS)
                    LREF
                    Blank 25 Filed: 12/5/1996, Entered: 12/9/1996 OrderCourt Filing
                    SEE 95-660 C FOR ORDER oral argument set for 10:30 a.m. on 12/19/96 for [21-1] motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction (signed by Judge John P. Wiese). Copy to parties. (FE)
                      LREF
                      Blank 24 Filed: 11/4/1996, Entered: 11/8/1996 Notice of Appearance/
                      NOTICE of Attorney Appearance for USA by Robert Ethan Steinbuch. Service: 11/4/96 (FE)
                        LREF
                        Blank 23 Filed: 10/8/1996, Entered: 10/9/1996 Terminated:
                        RESPONSE by MORTON FEDERAL (Service by hand: 10/8/96 ) to [21-1] motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction. Reply due: 10/18/96 (HW)
                          LREF
                          Blank 22 Filed: 10/7/1996, Entered: 10/8/1996 Case Assigned/ReassignedCourt Filing
                          See 90-8 C for Notice of reassignment to Judge John P. Wiese. Copy to parties. (FE)
                            LREF
                            Blank 21 Filed: 9/9/1996, Entered: 9/13/1996 Terminated:
                            MOTION by USA (Service: 9/9/96) to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction . Response due: 10/10/96 (FE)
                              LREF
                              Blank 20 Filed: 8/28/1996, Entered: 9/3/1996 Case Assigned/ReassignedCourt Filing
                              SEE ORDER IN 90-8C for Notice of reassignment to Chief Judge Loren A. Smith. Copy to parties. (FE)
                                LREF
                                Blank 19 Filed: 8/23/1996, Entered: 8/28/1996 OrderCourt Filing
                                ORDER granting [17-1] motion for Leave to File attached proposed pretrial order (signed by Judge Marian Blank Horn). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                  LREF
                                  Blank 17 Filed: 8/16/1996, Entered: 8/20/1996, Terminated: 8/23/1996 Terminated:
                                  MOTION by USA (Service : 8/16/96 ) for Leave to File attached proposed pretrial order. Response due: 9/3/96 (HW)
                                    LREF
                                    Blank 16 Filed: 7/26/1996, Entered: 7/30/1996 Status Report/OrderCourt Filing
                                    STATUS REPORT ORDER. Status report due on 8/30/96 and returning case to an active status (signed by Judge Marian Blank Horn). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                      LREF
                                      Blank 15 Filed: 7/25/1996, Entered: 7/29/1996 Terminated:
                                      MOTION by USA (Service: 7/25/96) for Leave to File copy of motion to adopt special case management procedures . Response due: 8/12/96 (FE)
                                        LREF
                                        Blank 14 Filed: 7/11/1996, Entered: 7/16/1996 Status Report
                                        Joint STATUS REPORT by MORTON FEDERAL and USA. Service: 7/11/96 (HW)
                                          LREF
                                          Blank 18 Filed: 7/9/1996, Entered: 8/22/1996 Notice of Change of Address
                                          NOTICE of change of address by Domenique Grace Kirchner (DS)
                                            LREF
                                            Blank 13 Filed: 6/4/1996, Entered: 6/6/1996 OrderCourt Filing
                                            ORDER addressing recent ruling in all Winstar related cases and reminding parties all previously set reporting requirements remain in effect in this case (signed by Judge Marian Blank Horn). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                              LREF
                                              Blank 12 Filed: 5/8/1996, Entered: 5/13/1996 Terminated:
                                              MOTION by MORTON FEDERAL (Service : 5/8/96 ) for Leave to File a response to defendant's motion re: special case management procedures. Response due: 5/28/96 (HW)
                                                LREF
                                                Blank 11 Filed: 4/26/1996, Entered: 4/30/1996 Terminated:
                                                MOTION by USA (Service : 4/26/96 ) for Leave to File a copy of the motion to adopt special case management procedures . Response due: 5/13/96. (HW)
                                                  LREF
                                                  Blank 10 Filed: 3/19/1996, Entered: 3/26/1996 Notice of Change of Address
                                                  NOTICE of change of address by Daniel J. Goldberg (FE)
                                                    LREF
                                                    Blank 9 Filed: 3/19/1996, Entered: 3/25/1996 Terminated:
                                                    MOTION by USA (Service : 3/19/96 ) for Leave to File notice and declaration re: certain documents that may be relevant to this action . Response due: 4/5/96 (FE)
                                                      LREF
                                                      Blank 8 Filed: 3/19/1996, Entered: 3/25/1996 Notice of Appearance/
                                                      NOTICE of Attorney Appearance for USA by Domenique Grace Kirchner. Service : 3/19/96 (FE)
                                                        LREF
                                                        Blank 7 Filed: 2/21/1996, Entered: 3/1/1996 Transcript
                                                        TRANSCRIPT of proceedings re: 1 volume, at Washington, D.C., for date of February 2, 1996. Notice to parties. (FE)
                                                          LREF
                                                          Blank 6 Filed: 2/8/1996, Entered: 2/13/1996 Status Report/OrderCourt Filing
                                                          STATUS REPORT ORDER. Status report due on 9/9/99 [7 days from date of ths issuance of a decision by the United States Supreme Court in Winstar] and staying proceedings (signed by Judge Marian B. Horn). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                            LREF
                                                            Blank -- Filed: 2/2/1996, Entered: 2/8/1996 Status Conference
                                                            Status Conference held. ( Transcript due 3/4/96 ) (FE)
                                                              LREF
                                                              Blank 5 Filed: 1/22/1996, Entered: 1/29/1996 Notice of Appearance/
                                                              NOTICE of Attorney Appearance for USA by Lisa Beth Donis. Service : 1/22/96 (HW)
                                                                LREF
                                                                Blank 4 Filed: 1/18/1996, Entered: 1/26/1996 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                ORDER reset Status Conference for 10:00 2/2/96 ( signed by Judge Marian B. Horn ). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                  LREF
                                                                  Blank 3 Filed: 1/11/1996, Entered: 1/22/1996 Status Report/OrderCourt Filing
                                                                  STATUS REPORT ORDER. Status report due on 10:00 1/31/96 ( signed by Judge Marian B. Horn ) Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                    LREF
                                                                    Blank 2 Filed: 12/4/1995, Entered: 12/13/1995 Case Assigned/ReassignedCourt Filing
                                                                    Notice of assignment to Judge Marian B. Horn. Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                      LREF
                                                                      Blank 1 Filed: 12/4/1995, Entered: 12/13/1995 Complaint
                                                                      COMPLAINT, FILING FEE $120, RECEIPT #040547. Answer due on 2/2/96. (FE)
                                                                        LREF

                                                                        Statistics

                                                                        This case has been viewed 165 times.

                                                                        No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                        Space
                                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                         
                                                                        PlainSite
                                                                        Sign Up
                                                                        Need Password Help?