FIRST FEDERAL, et al v. USA
Federal Civil Lawsuit United States Court of Federal Claims, Case No. 1:95-cv-00787-LAS
District Judge Loren A. Smith, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo DORSEY AND COMPANY, INC., Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Army

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Patrick R. Bossetta +1 504 529 4541 patrick.r.bossetta@us.army.mil
No Logo FIRST FEDERAL SAVINGS BANK OF NEW ORLEANS, LOUSIANA, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Army

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Patrick R. Bossetta +1 504 529 4541 patrick.r.bossetta@us.army.mil
No Logo FOUNDERS FINANCIAL CORPORATION, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Army

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Patrick R. Bossetta +1 504 529 4541 patrick.r.bossetta@us.army.mil
No Logo GEORGE PAUL DORSEY, JR., Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Army

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Patrick R. Bossetta +1 504 529 4541 patrick.r.bossetta@us.army.mil
No Logo JOEL DASTE, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Army

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Patrick R. Bossetta +1 504 529 4541 patrick.r.bossetta@us.army.mil
No Logo OTHER STOCKHOLDERS OF FIRST FEDERAL SAVINGS BANK OF NEW ORLEANS, LOUISIANA, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Army

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Patrick R. Bossetta +1 504 529 4541 patrick.r.bossetta@us.army.mil
v.
United States of America United States of America, Defendant
Officially listed as "USA"

Toggle Switch Represented by Owen, Wickersham & Erickson, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Luke Paul Levasseur +1 212 463 2000 llevasseur@mayerbrown.com
No Logo Fdic, Intervenor-Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Michael Patrick Condon +1 202 942 3609
Office COFC
Filed 12/5/1995
Jury Demand
Demand $0
Nature of Suit 511 - Taking - FIRREA
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1491 Tucker Act
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition Dismissed - Voluntarily
County
Terminated 5/8/2003
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flag CLOSED
  Entries (46) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 44 Filed: 5/8/2003, Entered: 6/3/2003 Stipulation of Dismissal
STIPULATION of Dismissal with prejudice filed by all parties. Plaintiffs' Complaint and Plaintiff-Intervenor's Complaint dismissed pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(ii) this day. (dls, )
    LREF
    Blank 43 Filed: 4/30/2003, Entered: 5/1/2003 Order on Motion to Dismiss - Rule 41(a)Court Filing
    ORDER granting [41] Motion to Voluntarily Dismiss - Rule 41(a) and granting [42] Motion to Voluntarily Dismiss - Rule 41(a). Signed by Judge Loren A. Smith. (dw1, )
      LREF
      Blank 42 Filed: 4/25/2003, Entered: 4/30/2003 Terminated: Court Filing
      Supplemental MOTION to Voluntarily Dismiss with prejudice by JOEL DASTE, GEORGE PAUL DORSEY JR., DORSEY AND COMPANY, INC., FDIC, FIRST FEDERAL SAVINGS BANK OF NEW ORLEANS, LOUSIANA, FOUNDERS FINANCIAL CORPORATION, OTHER STOCKHOLDERS OF FIRST FEDERAL SAVINGS BANK OF NEW ORLEANS, LOUISIANA, filed by leave of the Judge.Service: 4/25/03. Response due by 5/27/2003 (hw1, )
        LREF
        Blank 41 Filed: 4/23/2003, Entered: 4/29/2003, Terminated: 4/30/2003 Terminated:
        MOTION to Voluntarily Dismiss pursuant to Rule 41(a) by JOEL DASTE, GEORGE PAUL DORSEY JR., DORSEY AND COMPANY, INC., FDIC, FIRST FEDERAL SAVINGS BANK OF NEW ORLEANS, LOUSIANA, FOUNDERS FINANCIAL CORPORATION and OTHER STOCKHOLDERS OF FIRST FEDERAL SAVINGS BANK OF NEW ORLEANS, LOUISIANA.Service: 4/14/03. Response due by 5/1/2003. (dw1, )
          LREF
          Blank 40 Filed: 4/23/2003, Entered: 4/29/2003 ~Notice (other)
          NOTICE OF FILING by The United States. Service: 4/23/03.(dw1, )
            LREF
            Blank 39 Filed: 4/11/2003, Entered: 4/17/2003 Terminated:
            MOTION to Compel Discovery and MOTION for an immediate Telephonic Hearing by The United States.Service: 4/11/03. Response due by 4/28/2003. (dw1, )
              LREF
              Blank 38 Filed: 3/11/2003, Entered: 3/12/2003 OrderCourt Filing
              ORDER, re: discovery (signed by Judge Robert H. Hodges). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                LREF
                Blank 37 Filed: 11/15/2002, Entered: 11/20/2002 Terminated: Court Filing
                MOTION by FIRST FEDERAL SAVING (Service: 10/28/02) to Extend Time to respond to interrogatories until 11/10/02. Filed by leave ofthe Judge. (LTD)
                  LREF
                  Blank 36 Filed: 10/23/2002, Entered: 10/24/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                  ORDER re: The Court hereby RETURNS the original and faxed copy of plaintiffs' Ex Parte Motion of Enlargement of Time to Answer Discovery for correction of defects (signed by Sr. Judge Loren A. Smith). Copy to parties. (FE)
                    LREF
                    Blank 35 Filed: 7/8/2002, Entered: 7/9/2002 Answer to Amended Complaint
                    ANSWER by USA to amended complaint. (LTD)
                      LREF
                      Blank 34 Filed: 7/8/2002, Entered: 7/9/2002 Answer to Amended Complaint
                      ANSWER by USA to amended complaint. (LTD)
                        LREF
                        Blank 33 Filed: 5/9/2002, Entered: 5/10/2002 Terminated:
                        MOTION by FDIC (Service: 5/8/02) to substitute attorney (consented) Terminated attorney Thelma Wanda Diaz for FDIC Added Michael Patrick Condon . (FE)
                          LREF
                          Blank 32 Filed: 1/7/2002, Entered: 1/8/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                          ORDER re: discovery. ( signed by Sr. Judge Loren A. Smith ) Copy to parties. (FE)
                            LREF
                            Blank 31 Filed: 10/6/2000, Entered: 10/10/2000 Notice of Appearance/
                            NOTICE of Attorney Appearance for USA by Luke Paul Levasseur. Service: 10/6/00. (FE)
                              LREF
                              Blank 30 Filed: 8/11/1999, Entered: 8/12/1999 Notice of Appearance/
                              NOTICE of Attorney Appearance for USA by Elizabeth Frank Service : 8/11/99 (JT)
                                LREF
                                Blank 29 Filed: 1/27/1999, Entered: 2/2/1999 Memorandum
                                5 Common Issue 11 Briefs by USA re: 90-8. (JT)
                                  LREF
                                  Blank 28 Filed: 1/27/1999, Entered: 2/2/1999 OrderCourt Filing
                                  ORDER filing by leave Common Issue 11 briefs re: 90-8. ( signed by Chief Judge Loren A. Smith ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                                    LREF
                                    Blank 27 Filed: 12/22/1998, Entered: 12/22/1998, Terminated: 12/11/2002 Motion for Leave to File
                                    MOTION by USA (Service : 12/22/98 ) for Leave to file "Common Issue 11 Briefs" . Response due: 1/11/99. (FE)
                                      LREF
                                      Blank 26 Filed: 8/5/1997, Entered: 8/12/1997 OrderCourt Filing
                                      SEE 90-581C FOR ORDER denying [23-1] motion to Strike [22-1] amended complaint by plaintiffs ( signed by Judge James T. Turner). Copy to parties. (DS)
                                        LREF
                                        Blank -- Filed: 8/4/1997, Entered: 8/4/1997
                                        Oral Argument re: [23-1] motion to Strike [22-1] amended complaint by plaintiffs by USA ( Transcript due 9/3/97 ) (DS)
                                          LREF
                                          Blank 25 Filed: 6/30/1997, Entered: 7/17/1997 Reply to Response to Motion
                                          REPLY by USA to response to [23-1] motion to Strike [22-1] amended complaint by plaintiffs filed [by leave of the judge]. Service: 6/4/97 (DS)
                                            LREF
                                            Blank 24 Filed: 6/4/1997, Entered: 6/17/1997 Response to MotionCourt Filing
                                            RESPONSE (Filed by leave of the Judge), by FIRST FEDERAL SAVING, FOUNDERS FINANCIAL, DORSEY AND COMPANY, GEORGE PAUL DORSEY JR., JOEL DASTE, OTHER STOCKHOLDERS (Service: 5/22/97) to [23-1] motion to Strike [22-1] amended complaint by plaintiffs. Reply due: 6/9/97. (FE) Modified on 06/17/1997
                                              LREF
                                              Blank 23 Filed: 5/5/1997, Entered: 6/7/1997, Terminated: 8/5/1997 Terminated:
                                              MOTION by USA (Service : 5/5/97 ) to Strike [22-1] amended complaint by plaintiffs Response due: 5/22/97. (DS)
                                                LREF
                                                Blank -- Filed: 5/5/1997, Entered: 6/7/1997 Set/Reset Deadlines:
                                                Deadline updated; Response to [23-1] motion to Strike [22-1] amended complaint by plaintiffs set to 5/22/97 (DS)
                                                  LREF
                                                  Blank 22 Filed: 4/21/1997, Entered: 5/2/1997 Amended Complaint
                                                  AMENDED COMPLAINT by FIRST FEDERAL SAVIN, FOUNDERS FINANCIAL, DORSEY AND COMPANY, GEORGE PAUL DORSEY JR., JOEL DASTE, OTHER STOCKHOLDERS (Answer due 5/5/97 ) amending [1-1] complaint. Service: 4/21/97 (FE)
                                                    LREF
                                                    Blank 21 Filed: 4/11/1997, Entered: 4/22/1997 Notice of Appearance/
                                                    NOTICE of Attorney Appearance for USA by Gordon Michael Harvey. Service : 4/11/97 (AB)
                                                      LREF
                                                      Blank 20 Filed: 3/25/1997, Entered: 4/1/1997 Intervenor Complaint
                                                      Intervenor's COMPLAINT by FDIC against USA . Service: 3/25/97. Fee Not Required ( Answer due 5/27/97 ) (HW)
                                                        LREF
                                                        Blank 19 Filed: 1/7/1997, Entered: 1/10/1997 OrderCourt Filing
                                                        SEE 95-660C FOR OPINION denying [13-1] motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction ( signed by Judge John P. Wiese ) Copy to parties. (DS)
                                                          LREF
                                                          Blank 18 Filed: 12/5/1996, Entered: 12/9/1996 OrderCourt Filing
                                                          SEE 95-660 C FOR ORDER oral argument set for 10:30 a.m. on 12/19/96 for [13-1] motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction signed by Judge John P. Wiese). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                            LREF
                                                            Blank 17 Filed: 11/12/1996, Entered: 11/14/1996 MemorandumCourt Filing
                                                            MEMORANDUM by FDIC re:in support of [16-1] motion to substitute it for and in the place of First Federal. Filed by leave of the Judge. Service: 10/21/96 (FE)
                                                              LREF
                                                              Blank 16 Filed: 10/21/1996, Entered: 10/24/1996 Terminated:
                                                              MOTION by FDIC (Service: 10/21/96) to substitute it for and in the place of First Federal . Response due: 11/7/96 (FE)
                                                                LREF
                                                                Blank 15 Filed: 10/8/1996, Entered: 10/9/1996 Response to Motion
                                                                RESPONSE by FIRST FEDERAL SAVIN, FOUNDERS FINANCIAL, DORSEY AND COMPANY, GEORGE PAUL DORSEY JR., JOEL DASTE, OTHER STOCKHOLDERS (Service by hand: 10/8/96 ) to [13-1] motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction. Reply due: 10/18/96 (HW)
                                                                  LREF
                                                                  Blank 14 Filed: 10/7/1996, Entered: 10/8/1996 Case Assigned/ReassignedCourt Filing
                                                                  See 90-8 C for Notice of reassignment to Judge John P. Wiese. Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                    LREF
                                                                    Blank 13 Filed: 9/9/1996, Entered: 9/16/1996 Terminated:
                                                                    MOTION by USA (Service: 9/9/96) to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction . Response due: 10/10/96 (FE)
                                                                      LREF
                                                                      Blank 12 Filed: 8/28/1996, Entered: 9/13/1996 Case Assigned/ReassignedCourt Filing
                                                                      SEE ORDER IN 90-8C for Notice of reassignment to Chief Judge Loren A. Smith. Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                        LREF
                                                                        Blank 11 Filed: 8/16/1996, Entered: 8/20/1996 Terminated:
                                                                        MOTION by USA (Service : 8/16/96 ) for Leave to File attached proposed pretrial order. Response due: 9/3/96 (HW)
                                                                          LREF
                                                                          Blank 10 Filed: 7/24/1996, Entered: 7/26/1996 Terminated:
                                                                          MOTION by USA (Service: 7/24/96) for Leave to File copy of motion to adopt special case management procedures . Response due: 8/12/96 (FE)
                                                                            LREF
                                                                            Blank 9 Filed: 6/27/1996, Entered: 7/11/1996 Notice of Change of Address
                                                                            NOTICE of change of address by Mark Arnold Melnick (FE)
                                                                              LREF
                                                                              Blank 8 Filed: 4/3/1996, Entered: 4/8/1996 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                              ORDER granting [5-1] motion to Quash, granting [4-1] motion to Stay proceedings and directing counsel to file a status report within 30 days after decision in Winstar (signed by Judge James F. Merow). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                LREF
                                                                                Blank 7 Filed: 3/26/1996, Entered: 4/1/1996 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                ORDER granting [6-1] motion for Leave to File a notice with an attached declaration (signed by Judge James F. Merow). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                  Blank 6 Filed: 3/19/1996, Entered: 3/25/1996, Terminated: 3/26/1996 Terminated:
                                                                                  MOTION by USA (Service : 3/19/96) for Leave to File a notice with an attached declaration Response due: 4/5/96 (FE)
                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                    Blank 5 Filed: 2/15/1996, Entered: 2/21/1996, Terminated: 4/3/1996 Terminated:
                                                                                    MOTION by USA (Service : 2/15/96 ) to Quash . Response due: 3/4/96. (HW)
                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                      Blank 4 Filed: 2/2/1996, Entered: 2/8/1996 Terminated:
                                                                                      MOTION by USA (Service : 2/2/96 ) to Stay proceedings pending final resolution of WINSTAR. Response due: 2/20/96. (HW)
                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                        Blank 3 Filed: 1/19/1996, Entered: 1/26/1996 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                        NOTICE of Attorney Appearance for USA by Mark Arnold Melnick Service : 1/19/96 (FE)
                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                          Blank 2 Filed: 12/5/1995, Entered: 12/20/1995 Case Assigned/ReassignedCourt Filing
                                                                                          Notice of assignment to Judge James F. Merow. Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                            Blank 1 Filed: 12/5/1995, Entered: 12/20/1995 Complaint
                                                                                            COMPLAINT, FILING FEE $120, RECEIPT #040544. Answer due on 2/5/96. (FE)
                                                                                              LREF

                                                                                              Statistics

                                                                                              This case has been viewed 203 times.

                                                                                              No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                              Space
                                                                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                               
                                                                                              PlainSite
                                                                                              Sign Up
                                                                                              Need Password Help?