MOLA DEVELOPMENT v. USA
Federal Civil Lawsuit United States Court of Federal Claims, Case No. 1:95-cv-00790-MCW
District Judge Mary Ellen Coster Williams, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo MOLA DEVELOPMENT CORPORATION, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Franke Greenhouse, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Paul Richard Franke, III +1 303 623 4500 +1 303 623 0960 pfranke@fgll-law.com
v.
United States of America United States of America, Defendant
Officially listed as "USA"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Sameer Pandurang Yerawadekar +1 202 305 4696 +1 202 307 0927 sameer.yerawadekar@usdoj.gov
Office COFC
Filed 12/5/1995
Jury Demand
Demand $0
Nature of Suit 511 - Taking - FIRREA
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1491 Tucker Act
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition Dismissed
County
Terminated 12/15/2006
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Cases '07-5058'[], '07-5080'[]
Def Custody Status
Pending Status AppRecord
Flags CLOSED, ECF
  Entries (118) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document 109 Filed: 5/13/2008, Entered: 5/13/2008
MANDATE of CAFC affirming [100] Order directing the Clerk to Dismiss the Case and enter judgment. (hw1, )
    LREF
    Blank -- Filed: 11/19/2007, Entered: 11/19/2007
    Appeal record sent to CAFC. (hw1, )
      LREF
      Legal Document 108 Filed: 3/12/2007, Entered: 3/15/2007 Terminated:
      CAFC Case Number 07-5080 for [106] Notice of Cross Appeal filed by USA. (hw1, )
        LREF
        Legal Document 106 Filed: 2/21/2007, Entered: 2/22/2007 Terminated:
        NOTICE OF CROSS APPEAL, filed by USA. Copies to opposing party, judge and CAFC. (hw1, )
          LREF
          Legal Document 105 Filed: 2/21/2007, Entered: 2/21/2007
          NOTICE, filed by MOLA DEVELOPMENT CORPORATION Certificate Regarding Transcript (Franke, Paul)
            LREF
            Legal Document 107 Filed: 2/16/2007, Entered: 2/22/2007 Terminated:
            CAFC Case Number 07-5058 for [104] Notice of Appeal filed by MOLA DEVELOPMENT CORPORATION.(hw1, )
              LREF
              Legal Document 104 Filed: 2/12/2007, Entered: 2/12/2007, Terminated: 5/13/2008 Notice of Appeal
              NOTICE OF APPEAL, filed by MOLA DEVELOPMENT CORPORATION. Filing fee $ 455, receipt number 066149. Copies to judge, opposing party and CAFC. (hw1, )
                LREF
                Legal Document 103 Filed: 2/9/2007, Entered: 2/9/2007
                NOTICE, filed by MOLA DEVELOPMENT CORPORATION Notice of Appeal (Franke, Paul)
                  LREF
                  Legal Document 102 Filed: 12/20/2006, Entered: 12/20/2006, Terminated: 2/5/2007 Motion for Clarification
                  MOTION for Clarification Concerning Status Conference, filed by USA.Response due by 1/8/2007.(Yerawadekar, Sameer)
                    LREF
                    Legal Document 101 Filed: 12/15/2006, Entered: 12/15/2006
                    JUDGMENT entered, pursuant to Rule 58, that plaintiff's Fifth Amendment Takings and Due Process claims are dismissed. This action is dismissed. No costs. (lld, )
                      LREF
                      Legal Document 100 Filed: 12/14/2006, Entered: 12/14/2006 Court Filing
                      ORDER directing the Clerk to dismiss the case. Signed by Judge Mary Ellen Coster Williams. (tb1, )
                        LREF
                        Legal Document 99 Filed: 12/12/2006, Entered: 12/12/2006, Terminated: 12/15/2006 Motion for Status Conference
                        MOTION for Status Conference filed by USA.(Yerawadekar, Sameer)
                          LREF
                          Legal Document 98 Filed: 8/31/2006, Entered: 8/31/2006
                          NOTICE of Designation of Electronic Case. (hw1, )
                            LREF
                            Blank 97 Filed: 8/31/2006, Entered: 8/31/2006 Court Filing
                            ORDER directing the Clerk to designate this case as an electronic (ECF) case. All future filings will be in electronic form. Signed by Judge Mary Ellen Coster Williams. (hw1, )
                              LREF
                              Blank 96 Filed: 11/14/2005, Entered: 11/16/2005 Reply to Response to Motion
                              REPLY to Response to Motion re [94] MOTION for Leave to File Motion for Summary Judgment Upon Damages , filed by USA. Service: 11/14/2005.(mb2, )
                                LREF
                                Blank 95 Filed: 11/7/2005, Entered: 11/9/2005 Response to Motion
                                RESPONSE to [94] MOTION for Leave to File Motion for Summary Judgment Upon Damages , filed by MOLA DEVELOPMENT CORPORATION. Reply due by 11/21/2005. Service: 11/4/2005.(mb2, )
                                  LREF
                                  Blank 94 Filed: 10/27/2005, Entered: 11/1/2005 Terminated:
                                  MOTION for Leave to File Motion for Summary Judgment Upon Damages , filed by USA. Service: 10/27/2005. Response due by 11/14/2005. (mb2, )
                                    LREF
                                    Blank 93 Filed: 5/12/2005, Entered: 5/16/2005 Notice of Appearance/
                                    NOTICE of Appearance by Sameer Pandurang Yerawadekar for USA. Service: 5/12/2005.(mb2, )
                                      LREF
                                      Blank 92 Filed: 11/8/2004, Entered: 11/15/2004 Response
                                      RESPONSE to Pltf's Notice of Supplemental Authority, filed by USA. Service: 11/8/2004.(jcp, )
                                        LREF
                                        Blank 91 Filed: 10/29/2004, Entered: 11/3/2004 Order on Motion For Leave to File.Court Filing
                                        ORDER granting [90] Pltf's Motion for Leave to File Notice of Supplemental Authority. Dft has 14 days from the date of this order (11/15/2004) to file a response. Signed by Judge Mary Ellen Coster Williams. (jcp, )
                                          LREF
                                          Blank 90 Filed: 10/25/2004, Entered: 10/29/2004, Terminated: 10/29/2004 Terminated:
                                          MOTION for Leave to File Notice of Supplemental Authority by MOLA DEVELOPMENT CORPORATION.Service: 10/22/04. Response due by 11/8/2004 (jat, )
                                            LREF
                                            Blank 89 Filed: 10/5/2004, Entered: 10/6/2004 ~Notice (other)Court Filing
                                            NOTICE OF FILING: a more legible copy of Supervisory Memorandum SP-24 to the Court than that currently attached to our reply brief dated September 15, 2003, at pages 61-87 of the appendix by USA, by leave of the Judge. Service: 9/30/2004.(lg1, )
                                              LREF
                                              Blank 88 Filed: 9/30/2004, Entered: 10/4/2004 TranscriptCourt Filing
                                              TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on September 24, 2004 before Judge Williams. (lg1, )
                                                LREF
                                                Blank -- Filed: 9/23/2004, Entered: 9/23/2004
                                                Set/Reset Transcript Deadlines: Transcript due by 10/25/2004. (vp1, )
                                                  LREF
                                                  Blank 87 Filed: 8/11/2004, Entered: 8/13/2004 Terminated:
                                                  MOTION for Leave to File Notice of Supplemental Authority by USA.Service: 8/11/2004. Response due by 8/30/2004. (jcp, )
                                                    LREF
                                                    Blank 86 Filed: 8/2/2004, Entered: 8/5/2004 Supplemental Brief
                                                    SUPPLEMENTAL MEMORANDUM OF LAW by MOLA DEVELOPMENT CORPORATION. Service: 7/30/04.(jat, )
                                                      LREF
                                                      Blank 85 Filed: 8/2/2004, Entered: 8/5/2004 Supplemental Brief
                                                      SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEF re: [65] Motion to Dismiss - Rule 12(b)(1), Motion for Summary Judgment by USA. Service: 8/2/04.(vro, )
                                                        LREF
                                                        Blank 84 Filed: 7/19/2004, Entered: 7/20/2004 TranscriptCourt Filing
                                                        TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on June 16, 2004 before Judge Mary Ellen Coster Williams. (dw1)
                                                          LREF
                                                          Blank -- Filed: 6/23/2004, Entered: 6/23/2004
                                                          Set/Reset Transcript Deadlines: Transcript due by 7/16/2004. (vp1, )
                                                            LREF
                                                            Blank 83 Filed: 6/18/2004, Entered: 6/22/2004 Order Setting Oral Argument/Hearing on MotionCourt Filing
                                                            ORDER Setting Oral Argument for 9/24/2004 10:00 AM in National Courts Building before Judge Mary Ellen Coster Williams. The parties are granted leave to file supplemental briefs on or before August 2, 2004. Signed by Judge Mary Ellen Coster Williams. (lld, )
                                                              LREF
                                                              Blank -- Filed: 6/18/2004, Entered: 6/22/2004 Set/Reset Deadlines:
                                                              Set/Reset Deadlines: Brief due by 8/2/2004. (lld, )
                                                                LREF
                                                                Blank -- Filed: 6/16/2004, Entered: 6/16/2004
                                                                Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Mary Ellen Coster Williams: Status Conference. (teg, )
                                                                  LREF
                                                                  Blank 82 Filed: 6/2/2004, Entered: 6/4/2004 Order on Motion for Status ConferenceCourt Filing
                                                                  ORDER: On 5/25/2004, Dft filed a [81] Request for a Status Conference. A telephonic Status Conference has been scheduled for Wednesday, 6/16/2004 02:00 PM before Judge Mary Ellen Coster Williams. Signed by Judge Mary Ellen Coster Williams. (jcp, )
                                                                    LREF
                                                                    Blank 81 Filed: 5/25/2004, Entered: 5/27/2004 Terminated:
                                                                    REQUEST for Status Conference, by USA.Service: 5/25/2004. Response due by 6/11/2004. (jcp, )
                                                                      LREF
                                                                      Blank 80 Filed: 2/5/2004, Entered: 2/10/2004 Response
                                                                      RESPONSE to [78] Dft's Notice of Supplemental Authority filed by MOLA DEVELOPMENT CORPORATION. [FILED BY LEAVE OF THE JUDGE] Service: 2/2/2004.(jcp, )
                                                                        LREF
                                                                        Blank 79 Filed: 1/15/2004, Entered: 1/21/2004 Order on Motion For Leave to File.Court Filing
                                                                        ORDER: On 1/12/2004, Dft filed a [78] Motion for Leave to File Additional Authority, Cain v. United States, a recent Vinstar-related opinion. Good cause having been shown, this motion is GRANTED. Signed by Judge Mary Ellen Coster Williams. (jcp, )
                                                                          LREF
                                                                          Blank 78 Filed: 1/12/2004, Entered: 1/14/2004, Terminated: 1/15/2004 Terminated:
                                                                          MOTION for Leave to File Notice of Supplemental Authority by USA.Service: 1/12/2004. Response due by 1/29/2004. (jcp, )
                                                                            LREF
                                                                            Blank 77 Filed: 11/3/2003, Entered: 11/6/2003 ~Notice (other)
                                                                            NOTICE of Filing of Supplemental Authority Concerning Anderson v. United States by USA. Service: 11/3/03.(jcp, )
                                                                              LREF
                                                                              Blank 76 Filed: 10/8/2003, Entered: 10/16/2003 Order on Motion For Leave to File.Court Filing
                                                                              ORDER granting [74] Motion for Leave to File Notice of Supplemental Authority. Signed by Judge Mary Ellen Coster Williams. (jat, )
                                                                                LREF
                                                                                Blank 75 Filed: 10/6/2003, Entered: 10/15/2003 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                NOTICE of Filing of Pltf's Expert Witness Report by James R. Causey, with the Substituted Exhibit 11, which was previously filed with the Court on or around 9/16/03 by MOLA DEVELOPMENT CORPORATION. (jcp, )
                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                  Blank 74 Filed: 10/2/2003, Entered: 10/9/2003, Terminated: 10/8/2003 Terminated:
                                                                                  MOTION for Leave to File notice of supplemental authority by USA.Service: 10/2/03. Response due by 10/20/2003 (hw1, )
                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                    Blank 73 Filed: 10/2/2003, Entered: 10/8/2003 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                    REPLY to Response to Motion re [68] CROSS MOTION to [65] Motion to Dismiss - Rule 12(b)(1), Motion for Summary Judgment filed by USA filed by MOLA DEVELOPMENT CORPORATION. Service: 10/1/03.(jat, )
                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                      Blank 72 Filed: 9/16/2003, Entered: 9/22/2003 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                      ORDER: The Clerk's Office did not accept the 9/8/03 filing of the expert report of James R. Causey due to noncompliance with the RCFC. The court will permit the filing of Mr. Causey's report once these matters are corrected. Signed by Judge Mary Ellen Coster Williams. (jcp, )
                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                        Blank 71 Filed: 9/15/2003, Entered: 9/22/2003 Response to Proposed Findings of Uncontroverted Fa
                                                                                        RESPONSE to [69] Pltf's PROPOSED FINDINGS of Uncontroverted Fact filed by USA. Service: 9/15/03.(jcp, )
                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                          Blank 70 Filed: 9/15/2003, Entered: 9/22/2003 Response to Motion
                                                                                          OPPOSITION to [68] Pltf's CROSS MOTION and REPLY in Support of [65] Dft's Renewed Motion to Dismiss Pursuant to Statute of Limitations, or, in the Alternative, Motion for Summary Judgment, filed by USA. Reply due by 10/2/03. Service: 9/15/03.(jcp, ) Modified on 10/6/2003 (dls, ).
                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                            Blank 69 Filed: 8/18/2003, Entered: 8/20/2003 Proposed Findings of Uncontroverted Fact
                                                                                            COMBINED PROPOSED FINDINGS of Uncontroverted Fact in Support of Cross Motion for Summary Judgment and RESPONSE to [64] Dft's PROPOSED FINDINGS of Uncontroverted Fact by MOLA DEVELOPMENT CORPORATION. Service: 8/15/03.(jcp, )
                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                              Blank 68 Filed: 8/18/2003, Entered: 8/20/2003 Terminated:
                                                                                              RESPONSE to Dft's Renewed Motion to Dismiss Pursuant to Statute of Limitations, or, in the Alternative, for Summary Judgment and CROSS MOTION to [65] Dft's Motion for Summary Judgment on Liability for Breach of Contract and Memorandum of Law in Support Thereof by MOLA DEVELOPMENT CORPORATION.Service: 8/15/03. Response due by 9/15/2003.(jcp, )
                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                Blank -- Filed: 8/18/2003, Entered: 8/20/2003 Set/Reset Deadlines:
                                                                                                Set/Reset Deadlines: Reply due by 9/15/2003. (jcp, )
                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                  Blank 67 Filed: 8/15/2003, Entered: 8/15/2003 Court Filing
                                                                                                  NOTICE of Reassignment to Judge Mary Ellen Coster Williams. (jcp, )
                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                    Blank 66 Filed: 8/15/2003, Entered: 8/15/2003 Court Filing
                                                                                                    ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Pursuant to Rule 40.1(c) of the RCFC, which permits the Chief Judge to reassign any cases if necessary for the efficient administration of justice, the Clerk of the Court is directed to reassign the above captioned case to Judge Mary Ellen Coster Williams. Judge Emily C. Hewitt no longer assigned to case. The Clerk is also directed to notify the parties that the case will not be included in the September 8, 2003 expansion of ECF. Signed by Judge Edward J. Damich. (jcp, )
                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                      Blank 65 Filed: 7/21/2003, Entered: 7/22/2003 Terminated:
                                                                                                      RENEWED MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Rule 12(b)(1), Statute of Limitations, or, in the Alternative, MOTION for Summary Judgment by UNITED STATES.Service: 7/21/03. Response due by 8/22/2003. (jcp, )
                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                        Blank 64 Filed: 7/21/2003, Entered: 7/22/2003 Proposed Findings of Uncontroverted Fact
                                                                                                        PROPOSED FINDINGS of Uncontroverted Fact in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment by UNITED STATES. Service: 7/21/03.(jcp, )
                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                          Blank 63 Filed: 7/18/2003, Entered: 7/21/2003 Response
                                                                                                          JOINT RESPONSE to [59] Order of July 8, 2003 filed by MOLA DEVELOPMENT CORPORATION, UNITED STATES. Service: 7/17/03.(jcp, )
                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                            Blank -- Filed: 7/15/2003, Entered: 7/15/2003
                                                                                                            Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Emily C. Hewitt : Status Conference held on 07/08/03. (srh)
                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                              Blank 62 Filed: 7/14/2003, Entered: 7/15/2003 TranscriptCourt Filing
                                                                                                              TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on July 8, 2003 before Judge Emily C. Hewitt. (dw1, )
                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                Blank 61 Filed: 7/9/2003, Entered: 7/10/2003 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                NOTICE of Filing of Miscellaneous Docket Entries by UNITED STATES per [59] Order of 7/8/03. Service: 7/9/03.(jcp, )
                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                  Blank -- Filed: 7/9/2003, Entered: 7/9/2003
                                                                                                                  Set/Reset Transcript Deadlines: Transcript due by 7/14/2003. (vp1, )
                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                    Blank 60 Filed: 7/8/2003, Entered: 7/10/2003 Order on Motion to Dismiss - Rule 41(a)Court Filing
                                                                                                                    ORDER: As there is no counterclaim pending against the FDIC in this case and as neither dft nor pltf oppose FDIC's motion to dismiss, the court deems the voluntary dismissal of FDIC's case with prejudice proper under RCFC 41(a)(2) and hereby GRANTS [45] Intervenor's Motion to Voluntarily Dismiss - Rule 41(a) with Prejudice. Signed by Judge Emily C. Hewitt. (jcp, )
                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                      Blank 59 Filed: 7/8/2003, Entered: 7/10/2003 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                      ORDER: Pursuant to a telephonic status conference held today, Tuesday, 7/8/03, and as agreed to by the parties, dft shall file with the Clerk of the Court on or before Tuesday, 7/15/03, copies of the following items listed on the court's docket sheet for this case: 1) Docket No. 31, 2) Docket No. 32, 3) Docket No. 44. In addition, the parties shall file on or before Friday, 7/18/03, a summary of the scheduling orders applicable to this case and a summary of future filing deadlines contemplated by those same orders. Signed by Judge Emily C. Hewitt. (jcp, )
                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                        Blank 58 Filed: 7/8/2003, Entered: 7/10/2003 Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                        SCHEDULING ORDER:Pursuant to a telephonic status conference held today, Tuesday, 7/8/03, and as agreed to by the parties, ddft shall file a Dispositive Motion on or before Monday, 7/21/2003. The parties shall conclude the briefing in accordance with the Rules of the USCFC. Signed by Judge Emily C. Hewitt. (jcp, )
                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                          Blank 57 Filed: 7/8/2003, Entered: 7/10/2003 Status Conference OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                          STATUS CONFERENCE ORDER:The court will hold a Telephonic Status Conference on Tuesday, 7/8/2003 10:00 AM before Judge Emily C. Hewitt. Signed by Judge Emily C. Hewitt. (jcp, )
                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                            Blank 56 Filed: 7/7/2003, Entered: 7/9/2003 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                            Expert Witness Disclosure by MOLA DEVELOPMENT CORPORATION. Service: 7/3/03.(jcp, )
                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                              Blank 55 Filed: 6/30/2003, Entered: 6/30/2003 Court Filing
                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Reassignment to Judge Emily C. Hewitt. (dls, )
                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                Blank 54 Filed: 6/30/2003, Entered: 6/30/2003 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Emily C. Hewitt for all further proceedings. Senior Judge Loren A. Smith no longer assigned to case. Signed by Chief Judge Edward J. Damich. (dls, )
                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                  Blank 53 Filed: 6/5/2003, Entered: 6/17/2003 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Appearance by Lee McWethy Straus for UNITED STATES Service: 6/5/03.(jat, )
                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                    Blank 52 Filed: 5/12/2003, Entered: 5/15/2003 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                    RESPONSE re [50] MOTION for Leave to File notice deposition filed by The United States. Reply due by 5/27/2003. Service: 5/12/03.(hw1, )
                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                      Blank 51 Filed: 5/12/2003, Entered: 5/14/2003 Order on Motion For Leave to File.Court Filing
                                                                                                                                      ORDER denying [50] Motion for Leave to File Notice Deposition Signed by Judge Robert H. Hodges Jr. (vro, )
                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                        Blank 50 Filed: 5/7/2003, Entered: 5/12/2003, Terminated: 5/12/2003 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                        MOTION for Leave to notice deposition by MOLA DEVELOPMENT CORPORATION.Service: 5/6/03. Response due by 5/23/2003 (hw1, )
                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                          Blank 49 Filed: 5/2/2003, Entered: 5/7/2003 Status Report
                                                                                                                                          STATUS REPORT by MOLA DEVELOPMENT CORPORATION. Service: 5/1/03.(hw1, )
                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                            Blank 48 Filed: 4/25/2003, Entered: 4/30/2003 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                            REPLY to Response to Motion re [45] MOTION to Voluntarily Dismiss pursuant to Rule 41(a) filed by FDIC. Service: 4/25/03.(hw1, )
                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                              Blank 47 Filed: 4/17/2003, Entered: 4/24/2003 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                              RESPONSE re [45] FDIC's MOTION to Voluntarily Dismiss pursuant to Rule 41(a) filed by MOLA DEVELOPMENT CORPORATION. Reply due by 5/1/2003. Service: 4/16/03.(hw1, )
                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                Blank 46 Filed: 4/10/2003, Entered: 4/16/2003 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                RESPONSE to [45] MOTION to Voluntarily Dismiss pursuant to Rule 41(a), filed by The United States. Reply due 4/24/2003. Service: 4/10/03. (lrd)
                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Blank 45 Filed: 4/3/2003, Entered: 4/9/2003 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                  MOTION to Voluntarily Dismiss pursuant to Rule 41(a) by FDIC.Service: 4/3/03. Response due by 5/5/2003. (dw1, )
                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Blank 44 Filed: 3/11/2003, Entered: 3/12/2003 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                    ORDER, re: discovery (signed by Judge Robert H. Hodges). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Blank 43 Filed: 2/14/2003, Entered: 2/25/2003 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                      ORDER, re: further proceedings (signed by Judge Robert H. Hodges). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Blank 42 Filed: 2/11/2003, Entered: 2/21/2003 Response
                                                                                                                                                        RESPONSE by MOLA DEVELOPMENT pursuant to [41-1] order. Service: 2/10/03. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Blank 41 Filed: 2/5/2003, Entered: 2/13/2003 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                          ORDER re: The court asks that counsel file a representation of whether or not his client is not considering withdrawing this case, but intends to pursue it to judgment, such representation shall be filed by February 12, 2003 (signed by Judge Robert H. Hodges). Copy to parties. (FE) Modified on 02/13/2003
                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Blank 40 Filed: 1/31/2003, Entered: 2/12/2003 Terminated: Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                            MOTION by MOLA DEVELOPMENT (Service: 1/28/03) to Extend Time to respond to interrogatories until 2/28/03. Response due: 2/14/03. Filed by leave of the Judge. (FILED WITH RESPONSE TO MOTION TO COMPEL AND/OR DISMISS). (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Blank 40 Filed: 1/31/2003, Entered: 2/12/2003 Response to MotionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                              RESPONSE by MOLA DEVELOPMENT (Service: 1/28/03) to [36-1] motion to Dismiss, [35-1] motion to Compel. Reply due: 2/14/03. (FILED WITH MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO INTERROGATORIES). Filed by leave of the Judge. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Blank 39 Filed: 1/22/2003, Entered: 1/30/2003 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                MOTION by MOLA DEVELOPMENT to substitute attorney (consented) Terminated attorney Guy Craig for MOLA DEVELOPMENT Added Paul R. Franke III . (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 38 Filed: 1/15/2003, Entered: 1/24/2003 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                  RESPONSE by MOLA DEVELOPMENT (Service: 1/14/03) to [36-1] motion to Dismiss. Reply due: 1/31/03. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 37 Filed: 1/9/2003, Entered: 1/13/2003 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER granting [36-2] motion for Expedited consideration Plaintiff to show cause why case should not be dismissed by 1/16/03 (signed by Judge Robert H. Hodges). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 36 Filed: 1/9/2003, Entered: 1/13/2003 Description not availableCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION by USA (Service: 1/6/03) to Dismiss complaint based upon Plaintiff's failure to comply with its discovery obligations under RCFC 33(b) and the discovery plan and based on Plaintiff's failure to prosecute and for Expedited consideration . Response due: 2/6/03. Filed by leave of the Judge. (LTD) Modified on 01/17/2003
                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 35 Filed: 11/25/2002, Entered: 11/27/2002 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION by USA (Service: 11/25/02) to Compel Plaintiff's compliance with its discovery obligations under RCFC 33(b) and the discovery plan. Response due: 12/12/02. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 34 Filed: 7/15/2002, Entered: 7/18/2002 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Attorney Appearance for USA by Jordan A. Thomas. Service: 7/15/02. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 33 Filed: 7/8/2002, Entered: 7/10/2002 Answer
                                                                                                                                                                            ANSWER to FDIC's Complaint by USA. Service: 7/8/02. (LTD) Modified on 07/19/2002
                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 32 Filed: 7/8/2002, Entered: 7/10/2002 Answer
                                                                                                                                                                              ANSWER to Mola Development Corporation's Complaint by USA. Service: 7/8/02. (LTD) Modified on 07/19/2002
                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 31 Filed: 1/7/2002, Entered: 1/8/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER re: discovery. ( signed by Sr. Judge Loren A. Smith ) Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 30 Filed: 12/27/2001, Entered: 1/2/2002 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION by FDIC (Service: 12/27/01) to substitute attorney (consented) Terminated attorney Bruce Clark Taylor for FDIC Added Andrew Charles Gilbert. Response due: 1/15/02. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 29 Filed: 2/12/2001, Entered: 2/14/2001 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Attorney Appearance for USA by Katherine Mary Kelly. Service: 2/12/01. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 28 Filed: 10/5/2000, Entered: 10/10/2000 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Attorney Appearance for USA by Tonya Jean Williams Service : 10/5/00 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 27 Filed: 4/13/2000, Entered: 4/13/2000 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Lien by MOLA DEVELOPMENT, by leave of the Judge. Service: 4/10/00. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 26 Filed: 3/22/2000, Entered: 3/29/2000 Notice of Change of Address
                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of change of address by Bruce Clark Taylor (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 25 Filed: 5/3/1999, Entered: 5/4/1999 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Decision to Opt-Out of Case-Specific Discovery by MOLA DEVELOPMENT. Service: 5/3/99 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 24 Filed: 1/27/1999, Entered: 2/2/1999 Memorandum
                                                                                                                                                                                              5 Common Issue 11 Briefs USA re: 90-8. (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 23 Filed: 1/27/1999, Entered: 2/2/1999 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER filing by leave Common Issue 11 briefs re: 90-8. ( signed by Chief Judge Loren A. Smith ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 22 Filed: 12/22/1998, Entered: 12/22/1998, Terminated: 12/11/2002 Motion for Leave to File
                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION by USA (Service : 12/22/98 ) for Leave to file "Common Issue 11 Briefs" . Response due: 1/11/99. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 21 Filed: 5/29/1998, Entered: 6/1/1998 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Attorney Appearance for USA by Renee Brooker. Service : 5/29/98 (CDC)
                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 20 Filed: 2/13/1998, Entered: 2/17/1998 Notice of Change of Address
                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of change of address by Bruce Clark Taylor. (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 19 Filed: 3/26/1997, Entered: 4/3/1997 Intervenor Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Intervenor's COMPLAINT by FDIC against USA. Service: 3/26/97. Fee not required ( Answer due 5/28/97 ). (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 18 Filed: 1/7/1997, Entered: 1/10/1997 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                          SEE 95-660C FOR OPINION denying [13-1] motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction ( signed by Judge John P. Wiese ) Copy to parties. (DS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 17 Filed: 12/5/1996, Entered: 12/9/1996 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                            SEE 95-660 C FOR ORDER oral argument set for 10:30 a.m. on 12/19/96 for [13-1] motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction signed by Judge John P. Wiese). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 16 Filed: 10/31/1996, Entered: 11/5/1996 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Attorney Appearance for USA by Lydia Kay Griggsby Service : 10/31/96 (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 15 Filed: 10/8/1996, Entered: 10/9/1996 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                RESPONSE by MOLA DEVELOPMENT (Service by hand: 10/8/96 ) to [13-1] motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction. Reply due: 10/18/96 (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 14 Filed: 10/7/1996, Entered: 10/8/1996 Case Assigned/ReassignedCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  See 90-8 C for Notice of reassignment to Judge John P. Wiese. Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 13 Filed: 9/9/1996, Entered: 9/16/1996 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION by USA (Service: 9/9/96) to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction . Response due: 10/10/96 (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 12 Filed: 8/28/1996, Entered: 9/13/1996 Case Assigned/ReassignedCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      SEE ORDER IN 90-8C for Notice of reassignment to Chief Judge Loren A. Smith. Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 11 Filed: 8/16/1996, Entered: 8/20/1996 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION by USA (Service : 8/16/96 ) for Leave to File attached proposed pretrail order. Response due: 9/3/96 (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 10 Filed: 7/25/1996, Entered: 7/29/1996 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION by USA (Service: 7/25/96) for Leave to File copy of motion to adopt special case management procedures . Response due: 8/12/96 (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 9 Filed: 6/21/1996, Entered: 6/28/1996 Notice of Change of Address
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of change of address by Agnes Marie Brown (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 8 Filed: 4/29/1996, Entered: 5/1/1996 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION by USA (Service: 4/26/96) for Leave to File Motion to Adopt Special Case Management Procedures . Response due: 5/13/96. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 7 Filed: 3/26/1996, Entered: 4/1/1996 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER granting [6-1] motion for Leave to File a notice with an attached declaration (signed by Judge Christine O. Miller). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 6 Filed: 3/21/1996, Entered: 3/27/1996, Terminated: 3/26/1996 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION by USA (Service : 3/20/96) for Leave to File a notice with an attached declaration Response due: 4/8/96 (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 5 Filed: 2/8/1996, Entered: 2/13/1996 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER granting [4-1] motion to Stay (signed by Judge Christine O. Miller). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 4 Filed: 2/5/1996, Entered: 2/9/1996, Terminated: 2/8/1996 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION by USA (Service : 2/5/96 ) to Stay . Response due: 2/22/96 (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 3 Filed: 1/16/1996, Entered: 1/23/1996 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Attorney Appearance for USA by Agnes Marie Brown. Service : 1/16/96. (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 2 Filed: 12/5/1995, Entered: 12/19/1995 Case Assigned/ReassignedCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Notice of assignment to Judge Christine O. Miller. Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 1 Filed: 12/5/1995, Entered: 12/19/1995 Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            COMPLAINT, FILING FEE $120, RECEIPT #040540. Answer due on 2/5/96. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              This case has been viewed 218 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                               
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Need Password Help?