FIRST MID-ILLINOIS v. USA
Federal Civil Lawsuit United States Court of Federal Claims, Case No. 1:95-cv-00792-LAS
District Judge Loren A. Smith, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo FIRST MID-ILLINOIS BANK & TRUST, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Greenberg Traurig, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jerry Stouck +1 202 331 3173 +1 202 331 3101 stouckj@gtlaw.com
v.
United States of America United States of America, Defendant
Officially listed as "USA"

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space David D. Zimmerman +1 316 315 4110 dzkansas@gmail.com
Office COFC
Filed 12/5/1995
Jury Demand
Demand $0
Nature of Suit 511 - Taking - FIRREA
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1491 Tucker Act
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition Preliminary Injunction
County
Terminated 4/9/2002
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flag CLOSED
  Entries (34) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 33 Filed: 4/9/2002, Entered: 4/10/2002 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
Stipulation of Voluntary Dismissal by FIRST MID-ILLINOIS and USA. Complaint dismissed with prejudice pursuant to Rule 41 (a)(1)(B). Copy to parties. (AB) Modified on 04/10/2002
    LREF
    Blank -- Filed: 4/9/2002, Entered: 4/10/2002 Terminated Case
    Case closed (AB)
      LREF
      Blank 32 Filed: 1/7/2002, Entered: 1/8/2002 OrderCourt Filing
      ORDER re: discovery. ( signed by Sr. Judge Loren A. Smith ) Copy to parties. (FE)
        LREF
        Blank 31 Filed: 10/5/2000, Entered: 10/10/2000 Notice of Appearance/
        NOTICE of Attorney Appearance for USA by David Dean Zimmerman. Service : 10/5/00 (JT)
          LREF
          Blank 30 Filed: 4/30/1999, Entered: 5/3/1999 ~Notice (other)
          NOTICE of Decision to Opt-Out of Case-Specific Discovery by FIRST MID-ILLINOIS. Service: 4/30/99 (JT)
            LREF
            Blank 29 Filed: 1/4/1999, Entered: 1/27/1999 Notice of Appearance/
            NOTICE of Attorney Appearance for USA by Michael M. Duclos. Service : 1/4/99. (HW)
              LREF
              Blank 28 Filed: 12/23/1998, Entered: 1/7/1999 OrderCourt Filing
              ORDER granting [21-1] motion for Leave to file notice of plaintiff's name change, with the case to be captioned "FIRST MID-ILLINOIS BANK & TRUST v. UNITED STATES"; and vacating the order entered erroneously in No. 95-793 C on November 3, 1998. ( signed by Chief Judge Loren A. Smith ) Copy to parties. (DS)
                LREF
                Blank 27 Filed: 9/1/1998, Entered: 9/2/1998 Reply to Response to MotionCourt Filing
                REPLY by HEARTLAND SAVINGS to response to [21-1] motion for Leave to file notice of plaintiff's name change. Filed by leave of the Judge. Service: 9/1/98 (JT)
                  LREF
                  Blank 26 Filed: 8/31/1998, Entered: 9/1/1998 Terminated:
                  RESPONSE by HEARTLAND SAVINGS to [22-1] notice by USA. Service: 8/31/98 (JT)
                    LREF
                    Blank 25 Filed: 8/18/1998, Entered: 8/19/1998 Terminated:
                    RESPONSE by USA (Service: 8/18/98 ) to [21-1] motion for Leave to file notice of plaintiff's name change. Reply due: 8/28/98 (JT)
                      LREF
                      Blank 24 Filed: 8/18/1998, Entered: 8/18/1998 Court Filing
                      PROPOSED FINDINGS of Uncontroverted Fact by HEARTLAND SAVINGS, filed by leave of the Judge. Service: 8/18/98. (HW)
                        LREF
                        Blank 23 Filed: 8/18/1998, Entered: 8/18/1998, Terminated: 4/9/2002 Motion for Summary Judgment
                        MOTION by HEARTLAND SAVINGS (MID-ILLINOIS BANK & TRUST (Service : 8/6/98 ) for Summary Judgment , on liability for breach of contract, together with separate appendix. Response due: 9/8/98. (HW)
                          LREF
                          Blank 22 Filed: 8/13/1998, Entered: 8/17/1998 ~Notice (other)
                          NOTICE of Filing Motion for Stay by USA. Service: 8/13/98 (JT)
                            LREF
                            Blank 21 Filed: 8/6/1998, Entered: 8/10/1998, Terminated: 12/23/1998 Terminated:
                            MOTION by HEARTLAND SAVINGS (Service : 8/6/98 ) for Leave to file notice of plaintiff's name change Response due: 8/20/98 (CDC) Modified on 01/07/1999
                              LREF
                              Blank 20 Filed: 1/7/1997, Entered: 1/10/1997 OrderCourt Filing
                              SEE 95-660C FOR OPINION denying [15-1] motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction ( signed by Judge John P. Wiese ) Copy to parties. (DS)
                                LREF
                                Blank 19 Filed: 12/5/1996, Entered: 12/9/1996 OrderCourt Filing
                                SEE 95-660 C FOR ORDER oral argument set for 10:30 a.m. on 12/19/96 for [15-1] motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction (signed by Judge John P. Wiese). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                  LREF
                                  Blank 18 Filed: 10/28/1996, Entered: 10/30/1996 Notice of Appearance/
                                  NOTICE of Attorney Appearance for USA by Peter Stuart Levitt. Service : 10/28/96 (HW)
                                    LREF
                                    Blank 17 Filed: 10/8/1996, Entered: 10/9/1996 Terminated:
                                    RESPONSE by HEARTLAND SAVINGS (Service by hand: 10/8/96 ) to [15-1] motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction. Reply due: 10/18/96 (HW)
                                      LREF
                                      Blank 16 Filed: 10/7/1996, Entered: 10/8/1996 Case Assigned/ReassignedCourt Filing
                                      See 90-8 C for Notice of reassignment to Judge John P. Wiese. Copy to parties. (FE)
                                        LREF
                                        Blank 15 Filed: 9/9/1996, Entered: 9/16/1996 Terminated:
                                        MOTION by USA (Service: 9/9/96) to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction . Response due: 10/10/96 (FE)
                                          LREF
                                          Blank 14 Filed: 8/16/1996, Entered: 8/20/1996 Terminated:
                                          MOTION by USA (Service : 8/16/96 ) for Leave to File attached proposed pretrial order. Response due: 9/3/96 (HW)
                                            LREF
                                            Blank 12 Filed: 7/31/1996, Entered: 8/5/1996 OrderCourt Filing
                                            SEE 90-581C FOR ORDER granting [11-1] motion for Leave to File copy of motion to adopt special case management procedures (by Chief Judge Loren A. Smith). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                              LREF
                                              Blank 11 Filed: 7/23/1996, Entered: 7/25/1996, Terminated: 7/31/1996 Terminated:
                                              MOTION by USA (Service: 7/23/96) for Leave to File copy of motion to adopt special case management procedures . Response due: 8/9/96 (FE)
                                                LREF
                                                Blank 13 Filed: 7/19/1996, Entered: 8/19/1996 Notice of Change of Address
                                                NOTICE of change of address by Salomon Gomez (FE)
                                                  LREF
                                                  Blank 10 Filed: 5/8/1996, Entered: 5/13/1996 Terminated:
                                                  MOTION by HEARTLAND SAVINGS (Service : 5/8/96 ) for Leave to File response to the defenadt's motion for leave to file motion to adopt special case management procedures . Response due: 5/28/96 (HW)
                                                    LREF
                                                    Blank 9 Filed: 4/26/1996, Entered: 4/30/1996 Terminated:
                                                    MOTION by USA (Service : 4/25/96 ) for Leave to File a copy of the motion to adopt special case management procedures . Response due: 5/13/96. (HW)
                                                      LREF
                                                      Blank 8 Filed: 4/11/1996, Entered: 4/18/1996 OrderCourt Filing
                                                      SEE 90-581C for ORDER granting [7-1] motion for Leave to File notice and declaration re: certain documents that may be relevant to this action (signed by Chief Judge Loren A. Smith). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                        LREF
                                                        Blank 7 Filed: 3/20/1996, Entered: 3/26/1996, Terminated: 4/11/1996 Terminated:
                                                        MOTION by USA (Service : 3/19/96 ) for Leave to File notice and declaration re: certain documents that may be relevant to this action . Response due: 4/5/96 (FE)
                                                          LREF
                                                          Blank 6 Filed: 3/11/1996, Entered: 3/15/1996 OrderCourt Filing
                                                          ORDER granting [4-1] motion to Stay pending decision in Winstar (signed by Chief Judge Loren A. Smith). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                            LREF
                                                            Blank 5 Filed: 2/22/1996, Entered: 2/29/1996 Terminated:
                                                            RESPONSE by HEARTLAND SAVINGS (Service: 2/22/96) to [4-1] motion to Stay pending decision in Winstar. Reply due: 3/7/96 (FE)
                                                              LREF
                                                              Blank 4 Filed: 2/5/1996, Entered: 2/8/1996, Terminated: 3/11/1996 Terminated:
                                                              MOTION by USA (Service: 2/5/96) to Stay pending decision in Winstar . (FE)
                                                                LREF
                                                                Blank 3 Filed: 12/15/1995, Entered: 12/20/1995 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                NOTICE of Attorney Appearance for USA by Salomon Gomez. Service : 12/15/95 (FE)
                                                                  LREF
                                                                  Blank 2 Filed: 12/5/1995, Entered: 12/13/1995 Case Assigned/ReassignedCourt Filing
                                                                  Notice of assignment to Chief Judge Loren A. Smith. Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                    LREF
                                                                    Blank 1 Filed: 12/5/1995, Entered: 12/13/1995 Complaint
                                                                    COMPLAINT, FILING FEE $120, RECEIPT #040540. Answer due on 2/5/96. (FE)
                                                                      LREF

                                                                      Statistics

                                                                      This case has been viewed 210 times.

                                                                      No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                      Space
                                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                       
                                                                      PlainSite
                                                                      Sign Up
                                                                      Need Password Help?