HEARTLAND SAVINGS, et al v. USA
Federal Civil Lawsuit United States Court of Federal Claims, Case No. 1:95-cv-00793-LAS
District Judge Loren A. Smith, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo HEARTLAND SAVINGS BANK, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Daniel Jay Goldberg +1 617 439 0300
No Logo LOVE SAVINGS HOLDING COMPANY, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Daniel Jay Goldberg +1 617 439 0300
v.
United States of America United States of America, Defendant
Officially listed as "USA"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Frank Jefferson Hughes +1 202 305 3067 +1 202 514 8640 jeff.hughes@usdoj.gov
Office COFC
Filed 12/5/1995
Jury Demand
Demand $0
Nature of Suit 511 - Taking - FIRREA
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1491 Tucker Act
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition Preliminary Injunction
County
Terminated 7/11/2002
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flag CLOSED
  Entries (43) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 42 Filed: 7/11/2002, Entered: 7/11/2002
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by HEARTLAND SAVINGS, USA, LOVE SAVINGS HOLDING . Complaint dismissed pursuant to Rule 41 (a)(1)(ii). Copy to parties. (DS)
    LREF
    Blank -- Filed: 7/11/2002, Entered: 7/11/2002
    Case closed (DS)
      LREF
      Blank 41 Filed: 7/10/2002, Entered: 7/11/2002 Terminated: Court Filing
      MOTION by USA (Service: 7/3/02) for Continuance on "Short-Form" motion for partial summary judgment , by leave of the Judge. Response due: 7/22/02. (FE)
        LREF
        Blank 40 Filed: 1/7/2002, Entered: 1/8/2002 OrderCourt Filing
        ORDER re: discovery. ( signed by Sr. Judge Loren A. Smith ) Copy to parties. (FE)
          LREF
          Blank 39 Filed: 10/5/2000, Entered: 10/10/2000 Notice of Appearance/
          NOTICE of Attorney Appearance for USA by Frank Jefferson Hughes. Service : 10/5/00 (JT)
            LREF
            Blank 38 Filed: 7/24/2000, Entered: 7/26/2000 ~Notice (other)
            NOTICE of Opt Out of Third Discovery Wave by HEARTLAND SAVINGS, LOVE SAVINGS HOLDING. Service: 7/24/00 (JT) Modified on 07/26/2000
              LREF
              Blank 37 Filed: 4/27/1999, Entered: 4/30/1999 ~Notice (other)
              NOTICE of Opt-Out of Second Discovery Wave by HEARTLAND SAVINGS, LOVE SAVINGS HOLDING. Service: 4/26/99 (JT)
                LREF
                Blank 36 Filed: 4/2/1999, Entered: 4/7/1999 ~Notice (other)
                NOTICE of Opt-Out of Second Discovery Wave by HEARTLAND SAVINGS, LOVE SAVINGS HOLDING. Service: 4/2/99 (JT)
                  LREF
                  Blank 35 Filed: 1/4/1999, Entered: 1/6/1999 Notice of Appearance/
                  NOTICE of Attorney Appearance for USA by Michael M. Duclos Service: 1/4/99. (FE) Modified on 01/07/1999
                    LREF
                    Blank 34 Filed: 12/23/1998, Entered: 1/7/1999 OrderCourt Filing
                    ORDER vacating [33-1] order ( signed by Chief Judge Loren A. Smith ) Copy to parties. (DS)
                      LREF
                      Blank 33 Filed: 11/3/1998, Entered: 11/13/1998 Terminated: Court Filing
                      ORDER allowing plaintiff's motion to amend case caption. ( signed by Chief Judge Loren A. Smith ) Copy to parties. (DS)
                        LREF
                        Blank 32 Filed: 9/16/1998, Entered: 9/22/1998 OrderCourt Filing
                        ORDER memorializing the oral order of the court of August 11, 1998. Pursuant to that oral order, consideration of the motions for summary judgment, including ay briefing not yet complete, is stayed until October 13, 1998. (See Order in 90-8) ( signed by Chief Judge Loren A. Smith ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                          LREF
                          Blank 31 Filed: 7/29/1998, Entered: 8/3/1998 Memorandum
                          SUR-REPLY by HEARTLAND SAVINGS, LOVE SAVINGS HOLDING re: [24-1] motion to Stay all motions practice and discovery by USA, [24-2] motion to Extend Time to make a consolidated filing by USA. (JT) Modified on 08/03/1998
                            LREF
                            Blank 30 Filed: 7/29/1998, Entered: 8/3/1998 OrderCourt Filing
                            ORDER granting [27-1] motion for Leave to file a sur-reply to defendant's motion to stay, or, in the alternative, motion for enlargement of time for a consolidated filing of briefs. ( signed by Acting Chief Judge Robert H. Hodges, Jr. for Chief Judge Smith ) Copy to parties. (JT) Modified on 08/03/1998
                              LREF
                              Blank 29 Filed: 7/22/1998, Entered: 7/24/1998 Terminated:
                              RESPONSE by HEARTLAND SAVINGS, LOVE SAVINGS HOLDING to [28-1] notice by USA. Service: 7/22/98 (JT)
                                LREF
                                Blank 28 Filed: 7/15/1998, Entered: 7/21/1998 ~Notice (other)
                                NOTICE of Filing Motion for Stay by USA. Service: 7/15/98 (JT)
                                  LREF
                                  Blank 27 Filed: 7/2/1998, Entered: 7/10/1998, Terminated: 7/29/1998 Terminated:
                                  MOTION by HEARTLAND SAVINGS, LOVE SAVINGS HOLDING (Service : 7/2/98 ) for Leave to sur-reply to defendant's motion to stay, or, in the alternative, motion for enlargement of time for a consolidated filing of briefs Response due: 7/20/98 (CDC)
                                    LREF
                                    Blank 26 Filed: 6/23/1998, Entered: 6/24/1998 Reply to Response to Motion
                                    REPLY by USA to response to [24-1] motion to Stay all motions practice and discovery, [24-2] motion to Extend Time to make a consolidated filing. Service: 6/23/98 (JT)
                                      LREF
                                      Blank 25 Filed: 6/12/1998, Entered: 6/16/1998 Terminated:
                                      RESPONSE by HEARTLAND SAVINGS, LOVE SAVINGS HOLDING (Service: 6/12/98 ) to [24-1] motion to Stay all motions practice and discovery, [24-2] motion to Extend Time to make a consolidated filing. Reply due: 6/23/98 FILED UNDER SEAL (JT)
                                        LREF
                                        Blank 24 Filed: 6/2/1998, Entered: 6/4/1998 Terminated:
                                        MOTION by USA (Service : 6/2/98 ) to Stay all motions practice and discovery or, in the alternative to Extend Time to make a consolidated filing [to August 3, 1998]. Response due: 6/19/98 (JT)
                                          LREF
                                          Blank 23 Filed: 4/2/1998, Entered: 4/6/1998 Terminated:
                                          MOTION by HEARTLAND SAVINGS, LOVE SAVINGS HOLDING (Service : 4/2/98 ) for Summary Judgment , together with a separate volume of appendix FILED UNDER SEAL. Response due: 6/4/98 (DS)
                                            LREF
                                            Blank 22 Filed: 10/2/1997, Entered: 10/7/1997 Notice of Change of Address
                                            NOTICE of change of address by Daniel J. Goldberg. (HW)
                                              LREF
                                              Blank 21 Filed: 1/7/1997, Entered: 1/10/1997 OrderCourt Filing
                                              SEE 95-660C FOR OPINION denying [16-1] motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction ( signed by Judge John P. Wiese ) Copy to parties. (DS)
                                                LREF
                                                Blank 20 Filed: 12/5/1996, Entered: 12/9/1996 OrderCourt Filing
                                                SEE 95-660 C FOR ORDER oral argument set for 10:30 a.m. on 12/19/96 for [16-1] motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction signed by Judge John P. Wiese). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                  LREF
                                                  Blank 19 Filed: 10/28/1996, Entered: 10/30/1996 Notice of Appearance/
                                                  NOTICE of Attorney Appearance for USA by Peter Stuart Levitt. Service : 10/28/96 (HW)
                                                    LREF
                                                    Blank 18 Filed: 10/8/1996, Entered: 10/9/1996 Terminated:
                                                    RESPONSE by HEARTLAND SAVINGS, LOVE SAVINGS HOLDING (Service by hand: 10/8/96 ) to [16-1] motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction. Reply due: 10/18/96 (HW)
                                                      LREF
                                                      Blank 17 Filed: 10/7/1996, Entered: 10/8/1996 Case Assigned/ReassignedCourt Filing
                                                      See 90-8 C for Notice of reassignment to Judge John P. Wiese. Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                        LREF
                                                        Blank 16 Filed: 9/9/1996, Entered: 9/16/1996 Terminated:
                                                        MOTION by USA (Service: 9/9/96) to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction . Response due: 10/10/96 (FE)
                                                          LREF
                                                          Blank 15 Filed: 8/16/1996, Entered: 8/20/1996 Terminated:
                                                          MOTION by USA (Service : 8/16/96 ) for Leave to File attached proposed pretrial order. Response due: 9/3/96 (HW)
                                                            LREF
                                                            Blank 13 Filed: 7/31/1996, Entered: 8/5/1996 OrderCourt Filing
                                                            SEE 90-581C FOR ORDER granting [12-1] motion for Leave to File a copy of the motion to adopt special case management procedures (by Chief Judge Loren A. Smith). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                              LREF
                                                              Blank 14 Filed: 7/30/1996, Entered: 8/6/1996 Notice of Change of Address
                                                              NOTICE of change of address by Salomon Gomez (FE)
                                                                LREF
                                                                Blank 12 Filed: 7/23/1996, Entered: 7/25/1996, Terminated: 7/31/1996 Terminated:
                                                                MOTION by USA (Service : 7/23/96 ) for Leave to File a copy of the motion to adopt special case management procedures . Response due: 8/5/96 (HW)
                                                                  LREF
                                                                  Blank 11 Filed: 5/8/1996, Entered: 5/13/1996 Terminated:
                                                                  MOTION by HEARTLAND SAVINGS, LOVE SAVINGS HOLDING (Service : 5/8/96 ) for Leave to File response to defendant's motion to adopt special case management procedures. Response due: 5/28/96 (HW)
                                                                    LREF
                                                                    Blank 10 Filed: 4/26/1996, Entered: 4/30/1996 Terminated:
                                                                    MOTION by USA (Service : 4/25/96 ) for Leave to File a copy of the motion to adopt special case management procedures. Response due: 5/13/96 (HW)
                                                                      LREF
                                                                      Blank 9 Filed: 4/11/1996, Entered: 4/18/1996 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                      SEE 90-581C for ORDER granting [6-1] motion for Leave to File notice and declaration re: certain documents that may be relevant to this action (signed by Chief Judge Loren A. Smith). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                        LREF
                                                                        Blank 8 Filed: 3/21/1996, Entered: 3/26/1996 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                        ORDER entered staying proceedings until after decision in Winstar 90-8C with parties to file amended papers that place on burden on opposing party. (signed by Chief Judge Loren A. Smith) Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                          LREF
                                                                          Blank 6 Filed: 3/20/1996, Entered: 3/26/1996, Terminated: 4/11/1996 Terminated:
                                                                          MOTION by USA (Service : 3/19/96 ) for Leave to File notice and declaration re: certain documents that may be relevant to this action . Response due: 4/5/96 (FE)
                                                                            LREF
                                                                            Blank 7 Filed: 3/19/1996, Entered: 3/26/1996 Notice of Change of Address
                                                                            NOTICE of change of address by Daniel J. Goldberg (FE)
                                                                              LREF
                                                                              Blank 5 Filed: 3/11/1996, Entered: 3/15/1996 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                              ORDER granting [4-1] motion to Stay pending decision in Winstar (signed by Chief Judge Loren A. Smith). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                LREF
                                                                                Blank 4 Filed: 2/5/1996, Entered: 2/8/1996, Terminated: 3/11/1996 Terminated:
                                                                                MOTION by USA (Service: 2/5/96) to Stay pending decision in Winstar . (FE)
                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                  Blank 3 Filed: 12/15/1995, Entered: 12/20/1995 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                  NOTICE of Attorney Appearance for USA by Salomon Gomez Service : 12/15/95 (FE)
                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                    Blank 2 Filed: 12/5/1995, Entered: 12/13/1995 Case Assigned/ReassignedCourt Filing
                                                                                    Notice of assignment to Chief Judge Loren A. Smith. Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                      Blank 1 Filed: 12/5/1995, Entered: 12/13/1995 Complaint
                                                                                      COMPLAINT, FILING FEE $120, RECEIPT #040539. Answer due on 2/5/96. (FE)
                                                                                        LREF

                                                                                        Statistics

                                                                                        This case has been viewed 169 times.

                                                                                        No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                        Space
                                                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                         
                                                                                        PlainSite
                                                                                        Sign Up
                                                                                        Need Password Help?