FIRST FEDERAL BANK, et al v. USA
Federal Civil Lawsuit United States Court of Federal Claims, Case No. 1:95-cv-00794-LAS
District Judge Loren A. Smith, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo FIRST FEDERAL BANK, F.S.B., Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Daniel Jay Goldberg +1 617 439 0300
No Logo SOUTHEASTERN FINANCIAL, INC., Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Daniel Jay Goldberg +1 617 439 0300
v.
United States of America United States of America, Defendant
Officially listed as "USA"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space John Hugh Roberson +1 202 353 7972 +1 202 514 8640 john.roberson@usdoj.gov
Office COFC
Filed 12/5/1995
Jury Demand
Demand $0
Nature of Suit 511 - Taking - FIRREA
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1491 Tucker Act
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition Preliminary Injunction
County
Terminated 3/28/2002
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flag CLOSED
  Entries (31) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 30 Filed: 3/28/2002, Entered: 3/28/2002
Stipulation of Voluntary Dismissal by FIRST FEDERAL BANK, SOUTHEASTERN and USA. Complaint dismissed pursuant to Rule 41 (a)(1)(B). Copy to parties. (AB)
    LREF
    Blank -- Filed: 3/28/2002, Entered: 3/28/2002
    Case closed (AB)
      LREF
      Blank 29 Filed: 1/7/2002, Entered: 1/8/2002 OrderCourt Filing
      ORDER re: discovery. ( signed by Sr. Judge Loren A. Smith ) Copy to parties. (FE)
        LREF
        Blank 28 Filed: 8/8/2001, Entered: 8/9/2001 Notice of Appearance/
        NOTICE of Attorney Appearance for USA by John Hugh Roberson. Service: 8/8/01. (LTD)
          LREF
          Blank 27 Filed: 11/28/2000, Entered: 11/29/2000 ~Notice (other)
          NOTICE of "Corrected Certificate of Service" by USA. Service: 11/28/00. (FE)
            LREF
            Blank 26 Filed: 11/16/2000, Entered: 11/17/2000 Notice of Appearance/
            NOTICE of Attorney Appearance for USA by Kenneth John Guido. Service: 11/16/00. (FE)
              LREF
              Blank 25 Filed: 8/22/2000, Entered: 8/24/2000 Notice of Appearance/
              NOTICE of Attorney Appearance for USA by Daniel D. McClain Service : 8/22/00 (JT)
                LREF
                Blank 24 Filed: 7/24/2000, Entered: 7/26/2000 ~Notice (other)
                NOTICE of Opt Out of Third Discovery Wave by FIRST FEDERAL BANK, SOUTHEASTERN. Service: 7/26/00 (JT)
                  LREF
                  Blank 23 Filed: 4/27/1999, Entered: 4/30/1999 ~Notice (other)
                  NOTICE of Opt-Out of Second Discovery Wave by FIRST FEDERAL BANK, SOUTHEASTERN. Service: 4/26/99 (JT)
                    LREF
                    Blank 22 Filed: 4/2/1999, Entered: 4/7/1999 ~Notice (other)
                    NOTICE of Opt-Out of Second Discovery Wave by FIRST FEDERAL BANK, SOUTHEASTERN. Service: 4/2/99 (JT)
                      LREF
                      Blank 21 Filed: 10/9/1997, Entered: 10/14/1997 Notice of Appearance/
                      NOTICE of Attorney Appearance for USA by Kenneth Ray Nagle Service : 9/24/97 (CDC)
                        LREF
                        Blank 20 Filed: 10/2/1997, Entered: 10/7/1997 Notice of Change of Address
                        NOTICE of change of address by Daniel J. Goldberg. (HW)
                          LREF
                          Blank 19 Filed: 1/7/1997, Entered: 1/10/1997 OrderCourt Filing
                          SEE 95-660C FOR OPINION denying [14-1] motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction ( signed by Judge John P. Wiese ) Copy to parties. (DS)
                            LREF
                            Blank 18 Filed: 12/6/1996, Entered: 12/11/1996 Notice of Appearance/
                            NOTICE of Attorney Appearance for USA by Pamela Anne Roth Service : 12/6/96 (HW)
                              LREF
                              Blank 17 Filed: 12/5/1996, Entered: 12/9/1996 OrderCourt Filing
                              SEE 95-660 C FOR ORDER oral argument set for 10:30 a.m. on 12/19/96 for [14-1] motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction signed by Judge John P. Wiese). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                LREF
                                Blank 16 Filed: 10/8/1996, Entered: 10/9/1996 Terminated:
                                RESPONSE by FIRST FEDERAL BANK, SOUTHEASTERN (Service by hand: 10/8/96 ) to [14-1] motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction. Reply due: 10/18/96 (HW)
                                  LREF
                                  Blank 15 Filed: 10/7/1996, Entered: 10/8/1996 Case Assigned/ReassignedCourt Filing
                                  See 90-8 C for Notice of reassignment to Judge John P. Wiese. Copy to parties. (FE)
                                    LREF
                                    Blank 14 Filed: 9/9/1996, Entered: 9/16/1996 Terminated:
                                    MOTION by USA (Service: 9/9/96) to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction . Response due: 10/10/96 (FE)
                                      LREF
                                      Blank 13 Filed: 8/28/1996, Entered: 9/13/1996 Case Assigned/ReassignedCourt Filing
                                      SEE ORDER IN 90-8C for Notice of reassignment to Chief Judge Loren A. Smith. Copy to parties. (FE)
                                        LREF
                                        Blank 12 Filed: 8/19/1996, Entered: 8/26/1996 Terminated:
                                        MOTION by USA (Service: 8/19/96) for Leave to File proposed pretrial order . Response due: 9/5/96 (FE)
                                          LREF
                                          Blank 11 Filed: 7/23/1996, Entered: 7/25/1996 Terminated:
                                          MOTION by USA (Service: 7/23/96) for Leave to File copy of motion to adopt special case management procedures . Response due: 8/9/96 (FE)
                                            LREF
                                            Blank 10 Filed: 6/25/1996, Entered: 6/28/1996 Notice of Change of Address
                                            NOTICE of change of address by William Patrick Donovan Jr. (FE)
                                              LREF
                                              Blank 9 Filed: 5/8/1996, Entered: 5/13/1996 Terminated:
                                              RESPONSE by FIRST FEDERAL BANK, SOUTHEASTERN (Service: 5/8/96 ) to [8-1] motion for Leave to File a copy of the motion to adopt special case manangement procedures. Reply due: 5/20/96. (HW)
                                                LREF
                                                Blank 8 Filed: 4/26/1996, Entered: 4/30/1996 Terminated:
                                                MOTION by USA (Service : 4/26/96 ) for Leave to File a copy of the motion to adopt special case manangement procedures . Response due: 5/13/96 (HW)
                                                  LREF
                                                  Blank 7 Filed: 3/19/1996, Entered: 3/26/1996 Notice of Change of Address
                                                  NOTICE of change of address by Daniel J. Goldberg (FE)
                                                    LREF
                                                    Blank 6 Filed: 3/19/1996, Entered: 3/25/1996 Terminated:
                                                    MOTION by USA (Service : 3/19/96 ) for Leave to File notice and declaration re: certain documents that may be relevant to this action . Response due: 4/5/96 (FE)
                                                      LREF
                                                      Blank 5 Filed: 2/1/1996, Entered: 2/8/1996 OrderCourt Filing
                                                      ORDER Staying proceedings pending resolution of WINSTAR CORP case ( signed by Judge James T. Turner ) Copy to parties. (HW)
                                                        LREF
                                                        Blank 4 Filed: 1/26/1996, Entered: 2/1/1996 OrderCourt Filing
                                                        ORDER re: special procedures ( signed by Judge James T. Turner ). Copy to parties. (HW)
                                                          LREF
                                                          Blank 3 Filed: 1/23/1996, Entered: 1/29/1996 Notice of Appearance/
                                                          NOTICE of Attorney Appearance for USA by William Patrick Donovan Jr. Service : 1/23/96 (FE)
                                                            LREF
                                                            Blank 2 Filed: 12/5/1995, Entered: 12/13/1995 Case Assigned/ReassignedCourt Filing
                                                            Notice of assignment to Judge James T. Turner. Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                              LREF
                                                              Blank 1 Filed: 12/5/1995, Entered: 12/13/1995 Complaint
                                                              COMPLAINT, FILING FEE $120, RECEIPT #040539. Answer due on 2/5/96. (FE)
                                                                LREF

                                                                Statistics

                                                                This case has been viewed 201 times.

                                                                No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                Space
                                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                 
                                                                PlainSite
                                                                Sign Up
                                                                Need Password Help?