THRALL, et al v. USA
Federal Civil Lawsuit United States Court of Federal Claims, Case No. 1:95-cv-00797-JPW
District Judge John P. Wiese, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo BEVERLY W. THRALL, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Arnold & Porter, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Melvin Carl Garbow +1 202 942 5000 +1 202 942 5999 melvin_garbow@aporter.com
v.
United States of America United States of America, Defendant
Officially listed as "USA"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Frank Jefferson Hughes +1 202 305 3067 +1 202 514 8640 jeff.hughes@usdoj.gov
No Logo Fdic, Intervenor-Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Michael McGaughran +1 617 345 8542
No Logo ROY DOUMANI, Movant

Toggle Switch Represented by Arnold & Porter, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Melvin Carl Garbow +1 202 942 5000 +1 202 942 5999 melvin_garbow@aporter.com
Office COFC
Filed 12/6/1995
Jury Demand
Demand $5000000
Nature of Suit 511 - Taking - FIRREA
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1491 Tucker Act
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition Dismissed
County
Terminated 3/21/2006
Origin 1
Reopened
Lead Case
195-cv-00660-JPW None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flags CLOSED, MEMBER
  Entries (44) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 39 Filed: 3/22/2006, Entered: 3/27/2006 Certified Transcript to Attorney
CERTIFIED TRANSCRIPT OF JUDGMENT (See 95-660C) (bre,)
    LREF
    Blank 38 Filed: 3/21/2006, Entered: 3/21/2006
    JUDGMENT (See 95-660C) (lld, )
      LREF
      Blank 37 Filed: 2/23/2006, Entered: 2/27/2006 Notice of Appearance/
      NOTICE of Appearance by Frank Jefferson Hughes for USA. Service: 2/23/2006.(mb2, )
        LREF
        Blank -- Filed: 4/10/2003, Entered: 4/16/2003 Order
        SEE NO. 95-660C FOR ORDER Vacating [36]Judgment. Signed by Judge John P. Wiese. (dls, )
          LREF
          Blank 36 Filed: 3/21/2003, Entered: 3/21/2003
          JUDGMENT entered, as provided in Rule 54(b) that the complaints of investor-plaintiffs Beverly W. Thrall (successor by operation of law to the claims of Larry B. Thrall) and Roy Doumani are dismissed. [SEE LEAD CASE 95-660C] (lld, )
            LREF
            Blank -- Filed: 2/1/2002, Entered: 5/15/2003 Case Assigned/Reassigned
            Case reassigned to Judge John P. Wiese. Judge Loren A. Smith no longer assigned to the case. (dls, )
              LREF
              Blank 35 Filed: 3/8/2001, Entered: 3/8/2001, Terminated: 3/21/2006 Motion for Leave to FileCourt Filing
              MOTION by ROY DOUMANI (Service: 1/4/01) for Leave to file notice of new authority , by leave of the Judge. Response due: 1/22/01. (FE)
                LREF
                Blank 34 Filed: 1/11/2001, Entered: 1/12/2001 Terminated:
                MOTION by ROY DOUMANI (Service : 11/17/00 ) to Amend [26-1] motion to Intervene by ROY DOUMANI, [26-2] motion to Amend [1-1] complaint to withdraw those portions that would result in his becoming a party in the consolidated action captioned WestFed Holdings, Inc., et al. v. The United States, Nos. 92-820C, et al. filed [by leave of the judge]. (DS)
                  LREF
                  Blank 33 Filed: 11/28/2000, Entered: 11/29/2000 Notice of Appearance/
                  NOTICE of Attorney Appearance for USA by David Charles Hoffman. Service: 11/28/00. (FE)
                    LREF
                    Blank 32 Filed: 7/2/1998, Entered: 8/25/1998 OrderCourt Filing
                    ORDER granting [31-1] motion substitute Beverly W. Thrall for Plaintiff Larry B. Thrall ( signed by Chief Judge Loren A. Smith ). Copy to parties. (HW)
                      LREF
                      Blank 31 Filed: 6/16/1998, Entered: 6/22/1998, Terminated: 7/2/1998 Terminated:
                      MOTION by LARRY B. THRALL (Service : 6/16/98 ) substitute Beverly W. Thrall for Plaintiff Larry B. Thrall. Response due: 7/6/98 (JT)
                        LREF
                        Blank 30 Filed: 6/3/1998, Entered: 6/5/1998 OrderCourt Filing
                        See Lead Case, 95-66O C for 6/3/98 ORDER ( signed by Chief Judge Loren A. Smith ) Copy to parties. (HW)
                          LREF
                          Blank -- Filed: 6/3/1998, Entered: 6/5/1998 Set/Clear Flags
                          Consolidated Member Case. See lead case number 95- 660 C for further proceedings. (HW)
                            LREF
                            Blank 29 Filed: 5/12/1998, Entered: 8/25/1998 Reply to Response to Motion
                            REPLY by ROY DOUMANI to response to [26-1] motion to Intervene by ROY DOUMANI, [26-2] motion to Amend [1-1] complaint. Service: 5/12/98. (HW)
                              LREF
                              Blank 28 Filed: 4/30/1998, Entered: 8/25/1998 Response to Motion
                              RESPONSE by USA (Service: 4/30/98 ) to [26-1] motion to Intervene by ROY DOUMANI. Reply due: 5/14/98. (HW)
                                LREF
                                Blank 27 Filed: 4/22/1998, Entered: 4/29/1998 Remark
                                See 95-660C for joint motion for leave to file motion to consolidate related claims; order granting motion for leave; joint motion to consolidate related claims; and defendant's opposition to motion to consolidate. (4 separate items) (DS)
                                  LREF
                                  Blank 26 Filed: 4/13/1998, Entered: 8/25/1998 Terminated:
                                  MOTION (Service : 4/13/98 ) to Intervene by ROY DOUMANI , and to Amend [1-1] complaint . (Amended Complaint attached as Exhibit A). Response due: 4/30/98.
                                    LREF
                                    Blank -- Filed: 4/13/1998, Entered: 8/25/1998 Set/Reset Deadlines:
                                    Deadline updated; Response to [26-1] motion to Intervene by ROY DOUMANI reset to 4/30/98, [26-2] motion to Amend [1-1] complaint reset to 4/30/98 . (HW)
                                      LREF
                                      Blank 25 Filed: 3/31/1998, Entered: 4/2/1998 Notice of Appearance/
                                      NOTICE of Attorney Appearance for USA by Ming-Yuen Meyer-Fong. Service : 3/30/98. (HW)
                                        LREF
                                        Blank 24 Filed: 2/20/1998, Entered: 2/23/1998 Reply to Response to Motion
                                        SEE NO. 92-820C FOR REPLY by FDIC to response to [22-1] motion to Consolidate this Case with 92-820 C, 95-731 C and 95-803 C . Service: 2/9/98 (DS)
                                          LREF
                                          Blank 23 Filed: 2/20/1998, Entered: 2/23/1998 Response to Motion
                                          SEE NO. 92-820C FOR RESPONSE by USA (Service: 1/29/98 ) to [22-1] motion to Consolidate this Case with 92-820 C, 95-731 C and 95-803 C. (DS) Modified on 02/23/1998
                                            LREF
                                            Blank 22 Filed: 1/8/1998, Entered: 1/15/1998 Terminated:
                                            MOTION by FDIC (Service: 1/5/98) to Consolidate this Case with 92-820 C, 95-731 C and 95-803 C . Response due: 1/22/98. (HW) Modified on 02/23/1998
                                              LREF
                                              Blank 21 Filed: 12/9/1997, Entered: 12/23/1997 Terminated:
                                              MOTION by LARRY B. THRALL (Service : 12/9/97 ) to substitute attorney (consented) Terminated attorney LARRY B. THRALL for LARRY B. THRALL Added Melvin Carl Garbow. (HW)
                                                LREF
                                                Blank 20 Filed: 10/30/1997, Entered: 11/12/1997 Terminated:
                                                MOTION by FDIC (Service : 10/30/97 ) to substitute attorney (consented) Terminated attorney Robert Joel Soffer for FDIC Added Michael McGaughran. (HW)
                                                  LREF
                                                  Blank 19 Filed: 3/26/1997, Entered: 4/2/1997 Intervenor Complaint
                                                  Intervenor's COMPLAINT by FDIC against USA . Service: 3/26/97 Fee Not Required ( Answer due 5/28/97 ). (HW)
                                                    LREF
                                                    Blank 18 Filed: 1/7/1997, Entered: 1/10/1997 OrderCourt Filing
                                                    SEE 95-660C FOR OPINION denying [13-1] motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction ( signed by Judge John P. Wiese ) Copy to parties. (DS)
                                                      LREF
                                                      Blank 17 Filed: 12/5/1996, Entered: 12/9/1996 OrderCourt Filing
                                                      SEE 95-660 C FOR ORDER oral argument set for 10:30 a.m. on 12/19/96 for [13-1] motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction signed by Judge John P. Wiese). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                        LREF
                                                        Blank 16 Filed: 10/8/1996, Entered: 10/9/1996 Response to Motion
                                                        RESPONSE by LARRY B. THRALL (Service by hand: 10/8/96 ) to [13-1] motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction. Reply due: 10/18/96 (HW)
                                                          LREF
                                                          Blank 15 Filed: 10/7/1996, Entered: 10/8/1996 Case Assigned/ReassignedCourt Filing
                                                          See 90-8 C for Notice of reassignment to Judge John P. Wiese. Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                            LREF
                                                            Blank 14 Filed: 10/2/1996, Entered: 10/4/1996 Notice of Appearance/
                                                            NOTICE of Attorney Appearance for USA by Scott Jeffrey Pivnick. Service: 10/2/96 (FE)
                                                              LREF
                                                              Blank 13 Filed: 9/9/1996, Entered: 9/16/1996 Terminated:
                                                              MOTION by USA (Service: 9/9/96) to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction . Response due: 10/10/96 (FE)
                                                                LREF
                                                                Blank 12 Filed: 7/31/1996, Entered: 8/5/1996 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                SEE 90-581C FOR ORDER granting [11-1] motion for Leave to File a copy of the attached motion to adopt special case management procedures (signed by Chief Judge Loren A. Smith). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                  LREF
                                                                  Blank 11 Filed: 7/23/1996, Entered: 7/26/1996, Terminated: 7/31/1996 Terminated:
                                                                  MOTION by USA (Service: 7/23/96) for Leave to File a copy of the attached motion to adopt special case management procedures Response due: 8/9/96 (FE)
                                                                    LREF
                                                                    Blank 10 Filed: 6/19/1996, Entered: 6/21/1996 Notice of Change of Address
                                                                    NOTICE of change of address by Franklin Elgin White Jr. (FE)
                                                                      LREF
                                                                      Blank 9 Filed: 4/26/1996, Entered: 4/30/1996 Terminated:
                                                                      MOTION by USA (Service : 4/26/96 ) for Leave to File a copy of the motion to adopt special case management procedures Response due: 5/13/96 (HW)
                                                                        LREF
                                                                        Blank 8 Filed: 4/11/1996, Entered: 4/18/1996 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                        SEE 90-581C for ORDER granting [7-1] motion for Leave to File notice and declaration re: certain documents that may be relevant to this action (signed by Chief Judge Loren A. Smith). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                          LREF
                                                                          Blank 7 Filed: 3/19/1996, Entered: 3/25/1996, Terminated: 4/11/1996 Terminated:
                                                                          MOTION by USA (Service : 3/19/96) for Leave to File notice and declaration re: certain documents that may be relevant to this action . Response due: 4/5/96 (FE)
                                                                            LREF
                                                                            Blank 6 Filed: 2/5/1996, Entered: 2/9/1996 Terminated:
                                                                            MOTION by USA (Service : 2/5/96 ) to Stay Proceedings . (FE)
                                                                              LREF
                                                                              Blank 5 Filed: 1/19/1996, Entered: 1/29/1996 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                              NOTICE of Attorney Appearance for USA by Franklin Elgin White Jr. Service : 1/19/96 (FE)
                                                                                LREF
                                                                                Blank 4 Filed: 12/20/1995, Entered: 12/29/1995 Case Assigned/ReassignedCourt Filing
                                                                                Notice of reassignment to Chief Judge Loren A. Smith. Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                  Blank 3 Filed: 12/13/1995, Entered: 12/18/1995 Case Assigned/ReassignedCourt Filing
                                                                                  Notice of assignment to Judge James T. Turner. Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                    Blank 2 Filed: 12/6/1995, Entered: 12/13/1995 Notice of Related Cases
                                                                                    NOTICE by LARRY B. THRALL of related case(s). (92-820 C, 93-52 C, 95-660 C). (FE)
                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                      Blank 1 Filed: 12/6/1995, Entered: 12/13/1995 Complaint
                                                                                      COMPLAINT, FILING FEE $120, RECEIPT #040536. Answer due on 2/5/96. (FE)
                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                        Blank -- Filed: 12/6/1995, Entered: 12/13/1995 Case Assigned/Reassigned
                                                                                        CASE assigned to Judge Unassigned. (FE)
                                                                                          LREF

                                                                                          Statistics

                                                                                          This case has been viewed 202 times.

                                                                                          No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                          Space
                                                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                           
                                                                                          PlainSite
                                                                                          Sign Up
                                                                                          Need Password Help?