SOVEREIGN BANCORP v. USA
Federal Civil Lawsuit United States Court of Federal Claims, Case No. 1:95-cv-00799-LAS
District Judge Loren A. Smith, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Sovereign Bancorp, Inc., Plaintiff

Represented by Stevens & Lee, PC

v.
United States of America United States of America, Defendant
Officially listed as "USA"

Represented by United States Department of Justice

Office COFC
Filed 12/6/1995
Jury Demand
Demand $0
Nature of Suit 511 - Taking - FIRREA
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1491 Tucker Act
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition Preliminary Injunction
County
Terminated 2/12/2003
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flag CLOSED
  Entries (37) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 37 Filed: 2/12/2003, Entered: 2/24/2003 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by SOVEREIGN BANCORP, USA . Complaint dismissed pursuant to Rule 41 (a)(1)(ii) this day. Copy to parties. Nature of Jgm DP (HW)
    LREF
    Blank -- Filed: 2/12/2003, Entered: 2/24/2003 Terminated Case
    Case closed. (HW)
      LREF
      Blank 36 Filed: 2/3/2003, Entered: 2/12/2003 OrderCourt Filing
      ORDER re: Plaintiff expects to withdraw this lawsuit, and seeks an extension to February 12 for Board approval, plaintiff's motion is GRANTED (signed by Judge Robert H. Hodges). Copy to parties. (FE)
        LREF
        Blank 35 Filed: 1/28/2003, Entered: 2/7/2003 OrderCourt Filing
        ORDER setting Status Conference for 10:00 a.m. on 2/5/03 if Plaintiff cannot produce documents requested or account for them by close of business 2/4/03 (signed by Judge Robert H. Hodges). Copy to parties. (LTD)
          LREF
          Blank 34 Filed: 1/27/2003, Entered: 2/3/2003 Reply to Response to Motion
          REPLY by USA to response to [32-1] motion to Compel adequate reaponses to request for production of documents and interrogatories and for expedited consideration. Service: 1/27/03. (LTD)
            LREF
            Blank 33 Filed: 1/21/2003, Entered: 1/27/2003 Terminated:
            RESPONSE by SOVEREIGN BANCORP (Service: 1/20/03) to [32-1] motion to Compel adequate reaponses to request for production of documents and interrogatories and for expedited consideration. Reply due: 2/3/03. (LTD)
              LREF
              Blank 32 Filed: 1/8/2003, Entered: 1/13/2003 Terminated:
              MOTION by USA (Service: 1/8/03) to Compel adequate reaponses to request for production of documents and interrogatories and for expedited consideration . Response due: 1/27/03 (HW)
                LREF
                Blank 31 Filed: 8/29/2002, Entered: 9/4/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                ORDER, re: discovery (signed by Judge Robert H. Hodges). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                  LREF
                  Blank 30 Filed: 8/19/2002, Entered: 8/22/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                  ORDER for parties to contact the Court for a hearing (signed by Judge Robert H. Hodges). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                    LREF
                    Blank 29 Filed: 8/12/2002, Entered: 8/14/2002 Reply to Response to Motion
                    REPLY by USA to response to [26-1] motion to Compel. Service: 8/12/02. (LTD)
                      LREF
                      Blank 28 Filed: 8/2/2002, Entered: 8/6/2002 Terminated:
                      RESPONSE by SOVEREIGN BANCORP (Service: 8/2/02 ) to [26-1] motion to Compel. Reply due: 8/16/02. (FE)
                        LREF
                        Blank 27 Filed: 7/23/2002, Entered: 7/25/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                        ORDER, re: Defendant's Motion to Compel (signed by Judge Robert H. Hodges). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                          LREF
                          Blank 26 Filed: 7/19/2002, Entered: 7/22/2002 Terminated:
                          MOTION by USA (Service: 7/19/02) to Compel sovereign Bancorp, Inc. to comply with its document-production and initial-disclosure obligations under rule 34(b) and the discovery plan. Response due: 8/5/02. (LTD)
                            LREF
                            Blank 25 Filed: 7/8/2002, Entered: 7/10/2002 Answer
                            ANSWER to Complaint by USA. Service: 7/8/02 (JPSR due 8/29/02). (FE)
                              LREF
                              Blank 24 Filed: 1/7/2002, Entered: 1/8/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                              ORDER re: discovery. ( signed by Sr. Judge Loren A. Smith ) Copy to parties. (FE)
                                LREF
                                Blank 23 Filed: 10/5/2000, Entered: 10/10/2000 Notice of Appearance/
                                NOTICE of Attorney Appearance for USA by Arlene Pianko Groner Service : 10/5/00 (JT)
                                  LREF
                                  Blank 22 Filed: 3/31/1998, Entered: 4/1/1998 Notice of Appearance/
                                  NOTICE of Attorney Appearance for USA by Patrick Terrence Murphy. Service : 3/31/98 (JT)
                                    LREF
                                    Blank 20 Filed: 1/7/1997, Entered: 1/10/1997 OrderCourt Filing
                                    SEE 95-660C FOR OPINION denying [14-1] motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction ( signed by Judge John P. Wiese ) Copy to parties. (DS)
                                      LREF
                                      Blank 19 Filed: 12/12/1996, Entered: 12/16/1996 Notice of Appearance/
                                      NOTICE of Attorney Appearance for USA by Pamela Anne Roth Service : 12/12/96 (FE)
                                        LREF
                                        Blank 18 Filed: 12/5/1996, Entered: 12/9/1996 OrderCourt Filing
                                        SEE 95-660 C FOR ORDER oral argument set for 10:30 a.m. on 12/19/96 for [14-1] motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction signed by Judge John P. Wiese). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                          LREF
                                          Blank 17 Filed: 10/8/1996, Entered: 10/9/1996 Terminated:
                                          RESPONSE by SOVEREIGN BANCORP (Service by hand: 10/8/96 ) to [14-1] motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction. Reply due: 10/18/96 (HW)
                                            LREF
                                            Blank 16 Filed: 10/7/1996, Entered: 10/8/1996 Case Assigned/ReassignedCourt Filing
                                            See 90-8 C for Notice of reassignment to Judge John P. Wiese. Copy to parties. (FE)
                                              LREF
                                              Blank 15 Filed: 9/20/1996, Entered: 9/25/1996 Terminated:
                                              MOTION by SOVEREIGN BANCORP (Service : 9/18/96 ) to substitute attorney (consented) Terminated attorney Charles J. Bloom for SOVEREIGN BANCORP Added Joseph Wolfson. (DS)
                                                LREF
                                                Blank 14 Filed: 9/9/1996, Entered: 9/13/1996 Terminated:
                                                MOTION by USA (Service: 9/9/96) to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction . Response due: 10/10/96 (FE)
                                                  LREF
                                                  Blank 12 Filed: 9/4/1996, Entered: 9/9/1996 Terminated:
                                                  MOTION by USA (Service: 9/4/96) for Leave to File proposed pretrial order . Response due: 9/23/96 (FE)
                                                    LREF
                                                    Blank 13 Filed: 8/28/1996, Entered: 9/13/1996 Case Assigned/ReassignedCourt Filing
                                                    SEE ORDER IN 90-8C for Notice of reassignment to Chief Judge Loren A. Smith. Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                      LREF
                                                      Blank 11 Filed: 7/31/1996, Entered: 8/5/1996 Status Report
                                                      STATUS REPORT by USA. Service: 7/31/96 (FE)
                                                        LREF
                                                        Blank 10 Filed: 7/24/1996, Entered: 7/26/1996 Terminated:
                                                        MOTION by USA (Service: 7/23/96) for Leave to File copy of motion to adopt special case management procedures . Response due: 8/9/96 (FE)
                                                          LREF
                                                          Blank 9 Filed: 7/3/1996, Entered: 7/11/1996 Notice of Change of Address
                                                          NOTICE of change of address by Thomas Owen Mason (FE)
                                                            LREF
                                                            Blank 8 Filed: 4/26/1996, Entered: 4/30/1996 Terminated:
                                                            MOTION by USA (Service : 4/26/96 ) for Leave to File a copy of the motion to adopt special case management procedures . Response due: 5/13/96 (HW)
                                                              LREF
                                                              Blank 7 Filed: 3/26/1996, Entered: 4/1/1996 OrderCourt Filing
                                                              ORDER granting [6-1] motion for Leave to File a notice with an attached declaration (signed by Judge James F. Merow). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                LREF
                                                                Blank 6 Filed: 3/19/1996, Entered: 3/25/1996, Terminated: 3/26/1996 Terminated:
                                                                MOTION by USA (Service : 3/19/96) for Leave to File a notice with an attached declaration Response due: 4/5/96 (FE)
                                                                  LREF
                                                                  Blank 5 Filed: 2/9/1996, Entered: 2/14/1996 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                  ORDER granting [4-1] motion to Stay Proceedings [status report or motion due within 30 days following decision by the United States Supreme Court] (signed by Judge James F. Merow). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                    LREF
                                                                    Blank 4 Filed: 2/5/1996, Entered: 2/9/1996, Terminated: 2/9/1996 Terminated:
                                                                    MOTION by USA (Service : 2/5/96) to Stay Proceedings . (FE)
                                                                      LREF
                                                                      Blank 3 Filed: 1/18/1996, Entered: 1/25/1996 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                      NOTICE of Attorney Appearance for USA by Thomas Owen Mason Service : 1/18/96 (FE)
                                                                        LREF
                                                                        Blank 2 Filed: 12/6/1995, Entered: 12/13/1995 Case Assigned/ReassignedCourt Filing
                                                                        Notice of assignment to Judge James F. Merow. Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                          LREF
                                                                          Blank 1 Filed: 12/6/1995, Entered: 12/13/1995 Complaint
                                                                          COMPLAINT, FILING FEE $120, RECEIPT #040534. Answer due on 2/5/96. (FE)
                                                                            LREF

                                                                            Statistics

                                                                            This case has been viewed 159 times.

                                                                            No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                            Space
                                                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                             
                                                                            PlainSite
                                                                            Sign Up
                                                                            Need Password Help?