HOMETOWN SAVINGS, et al v. USA
Federal Civil Lawsuit United States Court of Federal Claims, Case No. 1:95-cv-00800-LAS
District Judge Loren A. Smith, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo ANNE B. SVEC, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Daniel Jay Goldberg +1 617 439 0300
No Logo EDWARD L. BODLAK, ESTATE OF, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Daniel Jay Goldberg +1 617 439 0300
No Logo ELSTON R. ASHPOLE, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Daniel Jay Goldberg +1 617 439 0300
No Logo ENN MEISTER, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Daniel Jay Goldberg +1 617 439 0300
No Logo ETHEL HAJTMANEK, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Daniel Jay Goldberg +1 617 439 0300
No Logo HOMETOWN SAVINGS AND LOAN, F.A., Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Daniel Jay Goldberg +1 617 439 0300
No Logo JOHN G. STANEK, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Daniel Jay Goldberg +1 617 439 0300
No Logo JUDITH A. MARTINO, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Daniel Jay Goldberg +1 617 439 0300
No Logo VIOLET V. STANEK, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Daniel Jay Goldberg +1 617 439 0300
No Logo WILLIAM J. FERDINAND, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Daniel Jay Goldberg +1 617 439 0300
v.
United States of America United States of America, Defendant
Officially listed as "USA"

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Henry Roland Felix
No Logo Fdic, Intervenor-Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Hugo Alexander Zia +1 202 942 3609
Office COFC
Filed 12/6/1995
Jury Demand
Demand $0
Nature of Suit 511 - Taking - FIRREA
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1491 Tucker Act
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition Preliminary Injunction
County
Terminated 5/14/2002
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flag CLOSED
  Entries (53) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 52 Filed: 5/14/2002, Entered: 5/14/2002
Stipulation of Voluntary Dismissal by USA, HOMETOWN SAVINGS, VIOLET V. STANEK, ELSTON R. ASHPOLE, EDWARD L. BODLAK, WILLIAM J. FERDINAND, ETHEL HAJTMANEK, JUDITH A. MARTINO, ENN MEISTER, JOHN G. STANEK, ANNE B. SVEC and FDIC. Complaint dismissed with prejudice pursuant to Rule 41 (a)(1)(ii). Copy to parties. (AB)
    LREF
    Blank -- Filed: 5/14/2002, Entered: 5/14/2002
    Case closed (AB)
      LREF
      Blank 51 Filed: 1/7/2002, Entered: 1/8/2002 OrderCourt Filing
      ORDER re: discovery. ( signed by Sr. Judge Loren A. Smith ) Copy to parties. (FE)
        LREF
        Blank 50 Filed: 8/7/2000, Entered: 8/8/2000 ~Notice (other)Court Filing
        NOTICE of Opt-Out of Third Discovery Wave by HOMETOWN SAVINGS. Filed by leave of the Judge. Service: 7/24/00 (JT)
          LREF
          Blank 49 Filed: 5/3/1999, Entered: 5/4/1999 ~Notice (other)Court Filing
          NOTICE of Opt-Out of Second Discovery Wave by HOMETOWN SAVINGS et al. Filed by leave of the Judge. Service: 4/26/99 (JT)
            LREF
            Blank 48 Filed: 1/27/1999, Entered: 2/2/1999 Memorandum
            5 Common Issue 11 Briefs by USA re: 90-8. (JT)
              LREF
              Blank 47 Filed: 1/27/1999, Entered: 2/2/1999 OrderCourt Filing
              ORDER filing by leave Common Issue 11 briefs re: 90-8. ( signed by Chief Judge Loren A. Smith ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                LREF
                Blank 46 Filed: 12/4/1998, Entered: 12/9/1998 Terminated: Court Filing
                RESPONSE by HOMETOWN SAVINGS et al. (Service: 10/30/98 ) to [44-1] motion for Leave to file "Common Issue 11 Briefs". Filed by leave of the Judge. Reply due: 11/13/98 (JT)
                  LREF
                  Blank 45 Filed: 12/4/1998, Entered: 12/9/1998 Terminated: Court Filing
                  MOTION by HOMETOWN SAVINGS et al. (Service : 10/30/98 ) to substitute attorney (consented) Terminated attorney Matthew G. Ash for ANNE B. SVEC, attorney Matthew G. Ash for JOHN G. STANEK, attorney Matthew G. Ash for ENN MEISTER, attorney Matthew G. Ash for JUDITH A. MARTINO, attorney Matthew G. Ash for ETHEL HAJTMANEK, attorney Matthew G. Ash for WILLIAM J. FERDINAND, attorney Matthew G. Ash for EDWARD L. BODLAK, attorney Matthew G. Ash for ELSTON R. ASHPOLE, attorney Matthew G. Ash for VIOLET V. STANEK, attorney Matthew G. Ash for HOMETOWN SAVINGS Added Daniel J. Goldberg. Filed by leave of the Judge. (JT) Modified on 12/09/1998
                    LREF
                    Blank 44 Filed: 10/28/1998, Entered: 10/30/1998 Terminated:
                    MOTION by USA (Service : 10/28/98 ) for Leave to file "Common Issue 11 Briefs" . Response due: 11/16/98. (FE)
                      LREF
                      Blank 43 Filed: 11/5/1997, Entered: 11/13/1997 Notice of Change of Address
                      NOTICE of change of address by Matthew G. Ash (HW)
                        LREF
                        Blank 42 Filed: 10/24/1997, Entered: 10/31/1997 Notice of Change of Address
                        NOTICE of change of address by Matthew G. Ash (DS)
                          LREF
                          Blank 41 Filed: 10/24/1997, Entered: 10/31/1997 OrderCourt Filing
                          ORDER directing counsel for plaintiffs to serve the Notice of Address Change on counsel for FDIC and file a certificate of service by 10/27/97. ( signed by Chief Judge Loren A. Smith ) Copy to parties. (DS)
                            LREF
                            Blank 40 Filed: 3/27/1997, Entered: 4/5/1997 Intervenor Complaint
                            Intervenor's COMPLAINT by FDIC against USA. Service: 3/27/97. Fee not required ( Answer due 5/29/97 ) (HW)
                              LREF
                              Blank 39 Filed: 1/7/1997, Entered: 1/10/1997 OrderCourt Filing
                              SEE 95-660C FOR OPINION denying [30-1] motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction ( signed by Judge John P. Wiese ) Copy to parties. (DS)
                                LREF
                                Blank 38 Filed: 12/23/1996, Entered: 12/31/1996 Remark
                                *** See 90-8 C for reply to motion to intervene. *** (HW)
                                  LREF
                                  Blank 37 Filed: 12/5/1996, Entered: 12/9/1996 OrderCourt Filing
                                  SEE 95-660 C FOR ORDER oral argument set for 10:30 a.m. on 12/19/96 for [30-1] motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction signed by Judge John P. Wiese). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                    LREF
                                    Blank 36 Filed: 11/25/1996, Entered: 11/27/1996 Terminated:
                                    RESPONSE by HOMETOWN SAVINGS to FDIC's motion to be substituted for seven failed financial institutions and to be substituted as counsel [motion filed io 90-8C]. Service: 11/25/96 (FE)
                                      LREF
                                      Blank 35 Filed: 11/12/1996, Entered: 11/14/1996 MemorandumCourt Filing
                                      MEMORANDUM by FDIC re:in support of [33-1] motion to substitute it for and in the place of Hometown Savings and Loan Association, F.A. Filed by leave of the Judge. Service: 10/21/96 (FE)
                                        LREF
                                        Blank 34 Filed: 10/24/1996, Entered: 10/29/1996 Notice of Appearance/
                                        NOTICE of Attorney Appearance for USA by Henry Roland Felix. Service : 10/24/96 (HW)
                                          LREF
                                          Blank 33 Filed: 10/21/1996, Entered: 10/24/1996 Terminated:
                                          MOTION by FDIC (Service: 10/21/96) to substitute it for and in the place of Hometown Savings and Loan Association, F.A. . Response due: 11/7/96 (FE)
                                            LREF
                                            Blank 32 Filed: 10/8/1996, Entered: 10/9/1996 Terminated:
                                            RESPONSE by HOMETOWN SAVINGS, ANNE B. SVEC (Service by hand: 10/8/96 ) to [30-1] motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction. Reply due: 10/18/96 (HW)
                                              LREF
                                              Blank 31 Filed: 10/7/1996, Entered: 10/8/1996 Case Assigned/ReassignedCourt Filing
                                              See 90-8 C for Notice of reassignment to Judge John P. Wiese. Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                LREF
                                                Blank 30 Filed: 9/9/1996, Entered: 9/16/1996 Terminated:
                                                MOTION by USA (Service: 9/9/96) to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction . Response due: 10/10/96 (FE)
                                                  LREF
                                                  Blank 29 Filed: 8/28/1996, Entered: 9/3/1996 Case Assigned/ReassignedCourt Filing
                                                  SEE ORDER IN 90-8C for Notice of reassignment to Chief Judge Loren A. Smith. Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                    LREF
                                                    Blank 28 Filed: 8/16/1996, Entered: 8/20/1996 Terminated:
                                                    MOTION by USA (Service : 8/16/96 ) for Leave to File attached proposed pretrial order. Response due: 9/3/96 (HW)
                                                      LREF
                                                      Blank 27 Filed: 7/24/1996, Entered: 7/26/1996 Terminated:
                                                      MOTION by USA (Service: 7/24/96) for Leave to File copy of motion to adopt special case management procedures . Response due: 8/12/96 (FE)
                                                        LREF
                                                        Blank 26 Filed: 7/23/1996, Entered: 7/24/1996 OrderCourt Filing
                                                        ORDER set Scheduling Conference for 9:00 a.m. on 7/31/96 (signed by Judge Robert H. Hodges, Jr.). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                          LREF
                                                          Blank 25 Filed: 7/11/1996, Entered: 7/15/1996 OrderCourt Filing
                                                          ORDER addressing future case proceedings (signed by Judge Robert H. Hodges, Jr.). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                            LREF
                                                            Blank 24 Filed: 6/14/1996, Entered: 6/18/1996 Terminated:
                                                            MOTION by HOMETOWN SAVINGS, VIOLET V. STANEK, ELSTON R. ASHPOLE, EDWARD L. BODLAK, WILLIAM J. FERDINAND, ETHEL HAJTMANEK, JUDITH A. MARTINO, ENN MEISTER, JOHN G. STANEK, ANNE B. SVEC (Service : 6/14/96 ) to Extend Time within which to respond to Court's May 30, 1996 Order , (until 10 days after receipt of the response of the defendant to plaintiff's request for the voluntary exchange of relevant information, etc.) Response due: 7/1/96 (HW)
                                                              LREF
                                                              Blank 23 Filed: 6/12/1996, Entered: 6/13/1996 OrderCourt Filing
                                                              ORDER further Clarifying 2/20/96 order (signed by Judge Robert H. Hodges, Jr.). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                LREF
                                                                Blank 22 Filed: 5/30/1996, Entered: 6/3/1996 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                ORDER granting [21-1] motion for Leave to File status report and status report and set Notice of Compliance deadline to 6/14/96 (signed by Judge Robert H. Hodges, Jr.). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                  LREF
                                                                  Blank 21 Filed: 5/24/1996, Entered: 5/29/1996, Terminated: 5/30/1996 Terminated:
                                                                  MOTION by USA (Service: 5/24/96) for Leave to File status report and status report . Response due: 6/10/96 (FE)
                                                                    LREF
                                                                    Blank 20 Filed: 5/8/1996, Entered: 5/13/1996 Terminated:
                                                                    RESPONSE by HOMETOWN SAVINGS, ANNE B. SVEC (Service: 5/8/96 ) to [19-1] motion for Leave to File Motion to Adopt Special Case Management Procedures. Reply due: 5/20/96 (HW)
                                                                      LREF
                                                                      Blank 19 Filed: 4/25/1996, Entered: 4/30/1996 Terminated:
                                                                      MOTION by USA (Service: 4/25/96) for Leave to File Motion to Adopt Special Case Management Procedures . Response due: 5/13/96. (FE)
                                                                        LREF
                                                                        Blank 18 Filed: 4/19/1996, Entered: 4/24/1996 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                        ORDER addressing defendant's motion for changes to the protective order (signed by Judge Robert H. Hodges, Jr.). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                          LREF
                                                                          Blank 17 Filed: 4/18/1996, Entered: 4/24/1996 Terminated: Court Filing
                                                                          MOTION by USA (Service: 4/11/96) for Reconsideration of [8-2] order by leave of the Judge. (FE)
                                                                            LREF
                                                                            Blank 16 Filed: 4/17/1996, Entered: 4/22/1996 Terminated:
                                                                            MOTION by USA (Service: 4/17/96) for Leave to File Partial Modification of Protective Order . Response due: 5/6/96. (FE)
                                                                              LREF
                                                                              Blank 15 Filed: 4/9/1996, Entered: 4/11/1996 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                              ORDER granting [14-1] motion for Leave to File letter from defendant's counsel (signed by Judge Robert H. Hodges, Jr.). The Government will file the results of its full investigation of the incident as soon as it becomes available. Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                LREF
                                                                                Blank 14 Filed: 4/4/1996, Entered: 4/9/1996, Terminated: 4/9/1996 Terminated:
                                                                                MOTION by USA (Service : 4/4/96 ) for Leave to File letter from defendant's counsel . Response due: 4/22/96. (HW)
                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                  Blank 13 Filed: 4/4/1996, Entered: 4/9/1996 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                  ORDER set Brief deadline to immediately re: destroyed documents (signed by Judge Robert H. Hodges). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                    Blank 12 Filed: 3/25/1996, Entered: 3/28/1996 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                    PROTECTIVE ORDER (signed by Judge Robert H. Hodges). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                      Blank 11 Filed: 3/25/1996, Entered: 3/28/1996 Status Report/OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                      STATUS REPORT ORDER. Status report due on 5/24/96 (signed by Judge Robert H. Hodges). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                        Blank 10 Filed: 3/19/1996, Entered: 3/26/1996 Notice of Change of Address
                                                                                        NOTICE of change of address by Matthew G. Ash (FE)
                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                          Blank 9 Filed: 3/19/1996, Entered: 3/25/1996 Terminated:
                                                                                          MOTION by USA (Service : 3/19/96) for Leave to File a notice with an attached declaration Response due: 4/5/96 (FE)
                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                            Blank 8 Filed: 3/14/1996, Entered: 3/21/1996 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                            ORDER set Additional Documents due: 4/15/96 for ANNE B. SVEC [brief re: statute of limitations issue], 5/13/96 for USA [response to brief] (signed by Judge Robert H. Hodges). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                              Blank 7 Filed: 2/20/1996, Entered: 2/23/1996 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                              ORDER addressing case proceedings (signed by Judge Robert H. Hodges). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                Blank 6 Filed: 2/9/1996, Entered: 2/14/1996 Terminated:
                                                                                                RESPONSE by USA to [4-1] order. Service: 2/9/96 (FE)
                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                  Blank 5 Filed: 2/5/1996, Entered: 2/12/1996 Terminated:
                                                                                                  MOTION by USA (Service : 2/5/96) to Stay Proceedings . Response due: 2/22/96 (FE)
                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                    Blank 4 Filed: 1/29/1996, Entered: 2/5/1996 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                    ORDER directing parties to review the proposed protective order and contact the court by 2/9/96 with comments or suggestions ( signed by Judge Robert H. Hodges ) Copy to parties. (HW)
                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                      Blank 3 Filed: 1/17/1996, Entered: 1/24/1996 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                      NOTICE of Attorney Appearance for USA by Steven John Gillingham. Service : 1/16/96 (FE)
                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                        Blank 2 Filed: 12/6/1995, Entered: 12/13/1995 Case Assigned/ReassignedCourt Filing
                                                                                                        Notice of assignment to Judge Robert H. Hodges. Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                          Blank 1 Filed: 12/6/1995, Entered: 12/13/1995 Complaint
                                                                                                          COMPLAINT, FILING FEE $120, RECEIPT #040533. Answer due on 2/5/96. (FE)
                                                                                                            LREF

                                                                                                            Statistics

                                                                                                            This case has been viewed 178 times.

                                                                                                            No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                            Space
                                                                                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                             
                                                                                                            PlainSite
                                                                                                            Sign Up
                                                                                                            Need Password Help?