CLARE BANK, N.A., et al v. USA
Federal Civil Lawsuit United States Court of Federal Claims, Case No. 1:95-cv-00801-LAS
District Judge Loren A. Smith, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo CLARE BANK, N.A., Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Daniel Jay Goldberg +1 617 439 0300
No Logo E. ROBERT CLARE, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Daniel Jay Goldberg +1 617 439 0300
v.
United States of America United States of America, Defendant
Officially listed as "USA"

Represented by United States Department of Justice

Office COFC
Filed 12/6/1995
Jury Demand
Demand $0
Nature of Suit 511 - Taking - FIRREA
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1491 Tucker Act
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition Preliminary Injunction
County
Terminated 4/5/2002
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flag CLOSED
  Entries (37) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 35 Filed: 4/5/2002, Entered: 4/5/2002
Stipulation of Voluntary Dismissal by CLARE BANK, N.A., E. ROBERT CLARE and USA. Complaint dismissed with prejudice pursuant to Rule 41 (a)(1)(B). Copy to parties. (AB)
    LREF
    Blank -- Filed: 4/5/2002, Entered: 4/5/2002
    Case closed (AB)
      LREF
      Blank 34 Filed: 1/29/2002, Entered: 1/30/2002 Terminated:
      MOTION by CLARE BANK, N.A. (Service: 1/29/02) to substitute attorney (consented) Terminated attorney Matthew G. Ash for E. ROBERT CLARE, attorney Matthew G. Ash for CLARE BANK, N.A. Added Daniel J. Goldberg. (LTD)
        LREF
        Blank 33 Filed: 1/7/2002, Entered: 1/8/2002 OrderCourt Filing
        ORDER re: discovery. ( signed by Sr. Judge Loren A. Smith ) Copy to parties. (FE)
          LREF
          Blank 32 Filed: 10/12/2000, Entered: 10/17/2000 Notice of Appearance/
          NOTICE of Attorney Appearance for USA by Paul Gerald Freeborne Service : 10/12/00 (JT)
            LREF
            Blank 31 Filed: 8/7/2000, Entered: 8/8/2000 ~Notice (other)Court Filing
            NOTICE of Opt-Out of Third Discovery Wave by CLARE BANK, N.A., E. ROBERT CLARE. Filed by leave of the Judge. Service: 7/24/00 (JT)
              LREF
              Blank 30 Filed: 6/30/2000, Entered: 7/10/2000 ~Notice (other)
              NOTICE of Corrected Notice of Appearance by USA. Service: 6/30/00 (JT)
                LREF
                Blank 29 Filed: 5/23/2000, Entered: 5/24/2000 Notice of Appearance/
                NOTICE of Attorney Appearance for USA by Jane Margaret Ellen Peterson. Service : 5/22/00 (JT)
                  LREF
                  Blank 28 Filed: 5/3/1999, Entered: 5/4/1999 ~Notice (other)Court Filing
                  NOTICE of Opt-Out of Second Discovery Wave by CLARE BANK, N.A., E. ROBERT CLARE. Filed by leave of the Judge. Service: 4/26/99 (JT)
                    LREF
                    Blank 27 Filed: 4/2/1999, Entered: 4/7/1999 ~Notice (other)
                    NOTICE of Opt-Out of Second Discovery Wave by CLARE BANK, N.A., E. ROBERT CLARE. Service: 4/2/99 (JT)
                      LREF
                      Blank 26 Filed: 10/2/1997, Entered: 10/7/1997 Notice of Change of Address
                      NOTICE of change of address by Matthew G. Ash (HW)
                        LREF
                        Blank 25 Filed: 1/7/1997, Entered: 1/10/1997 OrderCourt Filing
                        SEE 95-660C FOR OPINION denying [20-1] motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction ( signed by Judge John P. Wiese ) Copy to parties. (DS)
                          LREF
                          Blank 24 Filed: 12/5/1996, Entered: 12/9/1996 OrderCourt Filing
                          SEE 95-660 C FOR ORDER oral argument set for 10:30 a.m. on 12/19/96 for [20-1] motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction signed by Judge John P. Wiese). Copy to parties. (FE)
                            LREF
                            Blank 23 Filed: 10/28/1996, Entered: 10/31/1996 Notice of Appearance/
                            NOTICE of Attorney Appearance for USA by Jonathan Bruce Taylor. Service: 10/28/96 (FE)
                              LREF
                              Blank 22 Filed: 10/8/1996, Entered: 10/9/1996 Terminated:
                              RESPONSE by CLARE BANK, N.A., E. ROBERT CLARE (Service by hand: 10/8/96 ) to [20-1] motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction. Reply due: 10/18/96 (HW)
                                LREF
                                Blank 21 Filed: 10/7/1996, Entered: 10/8/1996 Case Assigned/ReassignedCourt Filing
                                See 90-8 C for Notice of reassignment to Judge John P. Wiese. Copy to parties. (FE)
                                  LREF
                                  Blank 20 Filed: 9/10/1996, Entered: 9/16/1996 Terminated:
                                  MOTION by USA (Service: 9/10/96) to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction . Response due: 10/11/96 (FE)
                                    LREF
                                    Blank 19 Filed: 8/28/1996, Entered: 9/13/1996 Case Assigned/ReassignedCourt Filing
                                    SEE ORDER IN 90-8C for Notice of reassignment to Chief Judge Loren A. Smith. Copy to parties. (FE)
                                      LREF
                                      Blank 18 Filed: 8/22/1996, Entered: 8/27/1996 OrderCourt Filing
                                      ORDER granting [17-1] motion for Leave to File proposed pretrial order (signed by Judge John P. Wiese). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                        LREF
                                        Blank 17 Filed: 8/20/1996, Entered: 8/26/1996, Terminated: 8/22/1996 Terminated:
                                        MOTION by USA (Service: 8/20/96 ) for Leave to File proposed pretrial order . Response due: 9/6/96 (FE)
                                          LREF
                                          Blank 15 Filed: 7/25/1996, Entered: 7/26/1996 OrderCourt Filing
                                          ORDER granting [14-1] motion for Leave to File copy of motion to adopt special case management procedures (signed by Judge John P. Wiese). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                            LREF
                                            Blank 14 Filed: 7/23/1996, Entered: 7/25/1996, Terminated: 7/25/1996 Terminated:
                                            MOTION by USA (Service: 7/23/96) for Leave to File copy of motion to adopt special case management procedures . Response due: 8/9/96 (FE)
                                              LREF
                                              Blank 16 Filed: 7/16/1996, Entered: 8/19/1996 Notice of Change of Address
                                              NOTICE of change of address by Hillary Adrienne Stern (FE)
                                                LREF
                                                Blank 13 Filed: 5/10/1996, Entered: 5/16/1996 OrderCourt Filing
                                                ORDER granting [12-1] motion response (signed by Judge John P. Wiese) Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                  LREF
                                                  Blank 12 Filed: 5/8/1996, Entered: 5/13/1996, Terminated: 5/10/1996 Terminated:
                                                  RESPONSE by CLARE BANK, N.A., E. ROBERT CLARE (Service: 5/8/96 ) to [10-1] motion for Leave to File a copy of the motion to adopt special case management procedures. Reply due: 5/20/96 (HW)
                                                    LREF
                                                    Blank 11 Filed: 4/30/1996, Entered: 5/2/1996 OrderCourt Filing
                                                    ORDER granting [10-1] motion for Leave to File a copy of the motion to adopt special case management procedures (signed by Judge John P. Wiese). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                      LREF
                                                      Blank 10 Filed: 4/26/1996, Entered: 4/30/1996, Terminated: 4/30/1996 Terminated:
                                                      MOTION by USA (Service : 4/26/96 ) for Leave to File a copy of the motion to adopt special case management procedures. Response due: 5/13/96 (HW)
                                                        LREF
                                                        Blank 9 Filed: 3/27/1996, Entered: 4/2/1996 OrderCourt Filing
                                                        ORDER granting [7-1] motion for Leave to File notice and declaration re: certain documents that may be relevant to this action (signed by Judge John P. Wiese). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                          LREF
                                                          Blank 7 Filed: 3/20/1996, Entered: 3/26/1996, Terminated: 3/27/1996 Terminated:
                                                          MOTION by USA (Service : 3/20/96 ) for Leave to File notice and declaration re: certain documents that may be relevant to this action . Response due: 4/8/96 (FE)
                                                            LREF
                                                            Blank 8 Filed: 3/19/1996, Entered: 3/26/1996 Notice of Change of Address
                                                            NOTICE of change of address by Matthew G. Ash (FE)
                                                              LREF
                                                              Blank 6 Filed: 2/14/1996, Entered: 2/20/1996 OrderCourt Filing
                                                              ORDER granting [5-1] motion to Stay proceedings (signed by Judge John P. Wiese). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                LREF
                                                                Blank 5 Filed: 2/13/1996, Entered: 2/16/1996, Terminated: 2/14/1996 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                ORDER granting [5-1] motion to Stay proceedings ( signed by Judge John P. Wiese ) Copy to parties. (HW)
                                                                  LREF
                                                                  Blank 5 Filed: 2/13/1996, Entered: 2/16/1996, Terminated: 2/13/1996 Terminated: Court Filing
                                                                  MOTION by USA (Service : 2/12/96 ) to Stay proceedings re: WINSTAR decision from the Supreme Court [filed by leave of the Judge]. (HW) Modified on 02/16/1996
                                                                    LREF
                                                                    Blank 4 Filed: 2/1/1996, Entered: 2/7/1996 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                    NOTICE of Attorney Appearance for USA by Hillary Adrienne Stern. Service : 2/1/96 (FE)
                                                                      LREF
                                                                      Blank 3 Filed: 12/14/1995, Entered: 12/18/1995 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                      ORDER directing parties to confer and arrange for preliminary status conference, identifying filing requirements for conference and precluding filing of dispositive motions until after conference is held (signed by Judge John P. Wiese). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                        LREF
                                                                        Blank 2 Filed: 12/6/1995, Entered: 12/13/1995 Case Assigned/ReassignedCourt Filing
                                                                        Notice of assignment to Judge John P. Wiese. Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                          LREF
                                                                          Blank 1 Filed: 12/6/1995, Entered: 12/13/1995 Complaint
                                                                          COMPLAINT, FILING FEE $120, RECEIPT #040532. Answer due on 2/5/96. (FE)
                                                                            LREF

                                                                            Statistics

                                                                            This case has been viewed 165 times.

                                                                            No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                            Space
                                                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                             
                                                                            PlainSite
                                                                            Sign Up
                                                                            Need Password Help?