ALHAM, INC., et al v. USA
Federal Civil Lawsuit United States Court of Federal Claims, Case No. 1:95-cv-00803-LAS
District Judge Loren A. Smith, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo AIMEE S. BLOOM, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Toni C. Lichstein +1 212 530 5000
No Logo ALHAM, INC., Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Toni C. Lichstein +1 212 530 5000
No Logo CAROL SIMON PORGES, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Toni C. Lichstein +1 212 530 5000
No Logo CYNTHIA L. SIMON, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Toni C. Lichstein +1 212 530 5000
No Logo DANA D. STREEP, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Toni C. Lichstein +1 212 530 5000
No Logo GERALD M. CZARNECKI, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Frank J. Eisenhart +1 202 261 3306 +1 202 261 3333 feisenhart@msn.com
No Logo HONKIDS PARTNERS, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Toni C. Lichstein +1 212 530 5000
No Logo J. PETER SIMON, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Toni C. Lichstein +1 212 530 5000
No Logo JANET M. SIMON, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Toni C. Lichstein +1 212 530 5000
No Logo JOHANNA SIMON MORRIS, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Toni C. Lichstein +1 212 530 5000
No Logo JOHN R. PORGES, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Toni C. Lichstein +1 212 530 5000
No Logo JOSEPH BLOOM, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Toni C. Lichstein +1 212 530 5000
No Logo JULIE SIMON MUNRO, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Toni C. Lichstein +1 212 530 5000
No Logo MARY BETH STREEP, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Toni C. Lichstein +1 212 530 5000
No Logo SAMDEX PARTNERS, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Toni C. Lichstein +1 212 530 5000
No Logo WILLIAM E. SIMON, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Toni C. Lichstein +1 212 530 5000
No Logo WILLIAM E. SIMON, JR., Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Toni C. Lichstein +1 212 530 5000
v.
United States of America United States of America, Defendant
Officially listed as "USA"

Represented by United States Department of Justice

No Logo Fdic, Intervenor-Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Michael McGaughran +1 617 345 8542
Office COFC
Filed 12/6/1995
Jury Demand
Demand $0
Nature of Suit 511 - Taking - FIRREA
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1491 Tucker Act
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition Preliminary Injunction
County
Terminated 12/6/2001
Origin 1
Reopened
Lead Case
195-cv-00660-JPW None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flags CLOSED, MEMBER
  Entries (37) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 35 Filed: 12/6/2001, Entered: 12/7/2001 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
Stipulation of Voluntary Dismissal by ALHAM, INC., AIMEE S. BLOOM, JOSEPH BLOOM, GERALD M. CZARNECKI, HONKIDS PARTNERS, JOHANNA SIMON MORRIS, JULIE SIMON MUNRO, CAROL SIMON PORGES, JOHN R. PORGES, SAMDEX PARTNERS, CYNTHIA L. SIMON, J. PETER SIMON, JANET M. SIMON, WILLIAM E. SIMON, WILLIAM E. SIMON JR., DANA D. STREEP, MARY BETH STREEP, USA, FDIC . Complaint dismissed with prejudice pursuant to Rule 41 (a)(1)(B). Copy to parties. Nature of Jgm DP (AB)
    LREF
    Blank -- Filed: 12/6/2001, Entered: 12/7/2001 Terminated Case
    Case closed (AB)
      LREF
      Blank 34 Filed: 6/3/1998, Entered: 6/5/1998 OrderCourt Filing
      See Lead Case, 95-660 C for 6/3/98 ORDER ( signed by Chief Judge Loren A. Smith ) Copy to parties. (HW)
        LREF
        Blank -- Filed: 6/3/1998, Entered: 6/5/1998 Set/Clear Flags
        Consolidated Member Case. See lead case number 95- 660 C for further proceedings. (HW)
          LREF
          Blank 33 Filed: 4/22/1998, Entered: 4/29/1998 Remark
          See 95-660C for joint motion for leave to file motion to consolidate related claims; order granting motion to consolidate; joint motion to consolidate related claims; and defendant's opposition to motion to consolidate. (4 separate items) (DS)
            LREF
            Blank 32 Filed: 4/2/1998, Entered: 4/6/1998 Notice of Appearance/
            NOTICE of Attorney Appearance for USA by Ming-Yuen Meyer-Fong. Service : 4/2/98 (DS)
              LREF
              Blank 31 Filed: 2/20/1998, Entered: 2/23/1998 Reply to Response to Motion
              SEE 92-820C FOR REPLY by FDIC to response to [27-1] motion to Consolidate this Case with 92-820 C, 95-731 C and 95-797 C . Service: 2/9/98 (DS)
                LREF
                Blank 30 Filed: 2/20/1998, Entered: 2/23/1998 Terminated:
                SEE 92-820C FOR RESPONSE by USA (Service: 1/29/98 ) to [27-1] motion to Consolidate this Case with 92-820 C, 95-731 C and 95-797 C (DS)
                  LREF
                  Blank 29 Filed: 2/18/1998, Entered: 2/20/1998 Notice of Change of Address
                  NOTICE of change of address by Frank J. Eisenhart. (HW)
                    LREF
                    Blank 28 Filed: 2/11/1998, Entered: 2/13/1998 Notice of Appearance/
                    NOTICE of Attorney Appearance for USA by Arlene Pianko Groner. Service : 2/11/98 (HW)
                      LREF
                      Blank 27 Filed: 1/8/1998, Entered: 1/15/1998 Terminated:
                      MOTION by FDIC (Service : 1/5/98 ) to Consolidate this Case with 92-820 C, 95-731 C and 95-797 C . Response due: 1/22/98. (HW) Modified on 02/23/1998
                        LREF
                        Blank 26 Filed: 10/30/1997, Entered: 11/10/1997 Terminated:
                        MOTION by FDIC (Service : 10/30/97 ) to substitute attorney (consented) Terminated attorney Robert Joel Soffer for FDIC Added Michael McGaughran. (DS)
                          LREF
                          Blank 25 Filed: 9/12/1997, Entered: 9/18/1997 Terminated:
                          MOTION by GERALD M. CZARNECKI (Service : 9/12/97 ) to substitute attorney (consented) Terminated attorney Murray Alan Indick for GERALD M. CZARNECKI Added Frank J. Eisenhart. (DS)
                            LREF
                            Blank 24 Filed: 4/18/1997, Entered: 5/1/1997 Amended Complaint
                            AMENDED COMPLAINT by ALHAM INC. et al. amending [1-1] complaint. Service: 4/18/97 (DS) Modified on 05/01/1997
                              LREF
                              Blank 23 Filed: 3/31/1997, Entered: 4/9/1997 Intervenor Complaint
                              Intervenor's COMPLAINT by FDIC against USA. Service: 3/26/97. RECEIPT # Not Required. (Answer due 5/28/97). (FE)
                                LREF
                                Blank 22 Filed: 2/3/1997, Entered: 2/6/1997 Terminated:
                                MOTION by ALHAM, INC., et al. (Service : 2/3/97 ) to substitute attorney (consented) Terminated attorney Murray Alan Indick (for all plaintiffs except Gerald M. Czarnecki) Added Toni C. Lichstein. (DS)
                                  LREF
                                  Blank 21 Filed: 1/7/1997, Entered: 1/10/1997 OrderCourt Filing
                                  SEE 95-660C FOR OPINION denying [15-1] motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction ( signed by Judge John P. Wiese ) Copy to parties. (DS)
                                    LREF
                                    Blank 20 Filed: 12/5/1996, Entered: 12/9/1996 OrderCourt Filing
                                    SEE 95-660 C FOR ORDER oral argument set for 10:30 a.m. on 12/19/96 for [15-1] motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction signed by Judge John P. Wiese). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                      LREF
                                      Blank 19 Filed: 11/25/1996, Entered: 11/27/1996 Terminated:
                                      RESPONSE by ALHAM, INC. to FDIC's motion to intervene [motion filed in 90-8C]. Service BY HAND: 11/25/96 (FE)
                                        LREF
                                        Blank 18 Filed: 10/18/1996, Entered: 10/23/1996 Terminated:
                                        MOTION by ALHAM, INC., AIMEE S. BLOOM, JOSEPH BLOOM, GERALD M. CZARNECKI, HONKIDS PARTNERS, JOHANNA SIMON MORRIS, JULIE SIMON MUNRO, CAROL SIMON PORGES, JOHN R. PORGES, SAMDEX PARTNERS, CYNTHIA L. SIMON, J. PETER SIMON, JANET M. SIMON, WILLIAM E. SIMON, WILLIAM E. SIMON JR., DANA D. STREEP, MARY BETH STREEP (Service: 10/18/96) to substitute attorney (consented). Terminated attorney William R. Richardson for MARY BETH STREEP, DANA D. STREEP, WILLIAM E. SIMON, JR., WILLIAM E. SIMON, JANET M. SIMON, J. PETER SIMON, CYNTHIA L. SIMON, SAMDEX PARTNERS, JOHN R. PORGES, CAROL SIMON PORGES, JULIE SIMON MUNRO, JOHANNA SIMON MORRIS, HONKIDS PARTNERS, GERALD M. CZARNECKI, JOSEPH BLOOM, AIMEE S. BLOOM, ALHAM, INC. Added Murray Alan Indick. (FE) Modified on 10/23/1996
                                          LREF
                                          Blank 17 Filed: 10/8/1996, Entered: 10/9/1996 Terminated:
                                          RESPONSE by ALHAM, INC., AIMEE S. BLOOM, JOSEPH BLOOM, GERALD M. CZARNECKI, HONKIDS PARTNERS, JOHANNA SIMON MORRIS, JULIE SIMON MUNRO, CAROL SIMON PORGES, JOHN R. PORGES, SAMDEX PARTNERS, CYNTHIA L. SIMON, J. PETER SIMON, JANET M. SIMON, WILLIAM E. SIMON, WILLIAM E. SIMON JR., DANA D. STREEP, MARY BETH STREEP (Service by hand: 10/8/96 ) to [15-1] motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction. Reply due: 10/18/96 (HW)
                                            LREF
                                            Blank 16 Filed: 10/7/1996, Entered: 10/8/1996 Case Assigned/ReassignedCourt Filing
                                            See 90-8 C for Notice of reassignment to Judge John P. Wiese. Copy to parties. (FE)
                                              LREF
                                              Blank 15 Filed: 9/9/1996, Entered: 9/13/1996 Terminated:
                                              MOTION by USA (Service: 9/9/96) to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction . Response due: 10/10/96 (FE)
                                                LREF
                                                Blank 14 Filed: 8/28/1996, Entered: 9/13/1996 Case Assigned/ReassignedCourt Filing
                                                SEE ORDER IN 90-8C for Notice of reassignment to Chief Judge Loren A. Smith. Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                  LREF
                                                  Blank 13 Filed: 8/19/1996, Entered: 8/23/1996 Terminated:
                                                  MOTION by USA (Service: 8/19/96) for Leave to File Proposed Pretrial Order . Response due: 9/5/96. (FE)
                                                    LREF
                                                    Blank 12 Filed: 7/24/1996, Entered: 7/26/1996 Terminated:
                                                    MOTION by USA (Service: 7/24/96) for Leave to File copy of motion to adopt special case management procedures . Response due: 8/12/96 (FE)
                                                      LREF
                                                      Blank 11 Filed: 6/28/1996, Entered: 7/11/1996 Notice of Change of Address
                                                      NOTICE of change of address by Thomas Owen Mason (FE)
                                                        LREF
                                                        Blank 10 Filed: 5/13/1996, Entered: 5/16/1996 Terminated:
                                                        MOTION by ALHAM, INC., et al. (Service: 5/13/96) for Leave to File Response to Government's Motion to Adopt Special Case Management Procedures . Response due: 5/30/96. (FE)
                                                          LREF
                                                          Blank 9 Filed: 4/26/1996, Entered: 4/30/1996 Terminated:
                                                          MOTION by USA (Service : 4/26/96 ) for Leave to File a copy of the motion to adopt special case management procedures . Response due: 5/13/96 (HW)
                                                            LREF
                                                            Blank 8 Filed: 3/26/1996, Entered: 4/1/1996 OrderCourt Filing
                                                            ORDER granting [7-1] motion for Leave to File notice and declaration re: certain documents that may be relevant to this action (signed by Judge Christine O. Miller). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                              LREF
                                                              Blank 7 Filed: 3/19/1996, Entered: 3/25/1996, Terminated: 3/26/1996 Terminated:
                                                              MOTION by USA (Service : 3/19/96 ) for Leave to File notice and declaration re: certain documents that may be relevant to this action . Response due: 4/5/96 (FE)
                                                                LREF
                                                                Blank 6 Filed: 2/8/1996, Entered: 2/13/1996 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                ORDER granting [5-1] motion to Stay Proceedings (signed by Judge Christine O. Miller). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                  LREF
                                                                  Blank 5 Filed: 2/5/1996, Entered: 2/9/1996, Terminated: 2/8/1996 Terminated:
                                                                  MOTION by USA (Service : 2/5/96) to Stay Proceedings . (FE)
                                                                    LREF
                                                                    Blank 4 Filed: 1/18/1996, Entered: 1/25/1996 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                    NOTICE of Attorney Appearance for USA by Thomas Owen Mason Service : 1/18/96 (FE)
                                                                      LREF
                                                                      Blank 3 Filed: 12/6/1995, Entered: 12/13/1995 Notice of Related Cases
                                                                      NOTICE by ALHAM, INC. et al. of related case(s). (92-820 C, 95-660 C, 95-731 C). (FE)
                                                                        LREF
                                                                        Blank 2 Filed: 12/6/1995, Entered: 12/13/1995 Case Assigned/ReassignedCourt Filing
                                                                        Notice of assignment to Judge Christine O. Miller. Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                          LREF
                                                                          Blank 1 Filed: 12/6/1995, Entered: 12/13/1995 Complaint
                                                                          COMPLAINT, FILING FEE $120, RECEIPT #040530. Answer due on 2/5/96. (FE)
                                                                            LREF

                                                                            Statistics

                                                                            This case has been viewed 413 times.

                                                                            No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                            Space
                                                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                             
                                                                            PlainSite
                                                                            Sign Up
                                                                            Need Password Help?