MASVIDAL, et al v. USA
Federal Civil Lawsuit United States Court of Federal Claims, Case No. 1:95-cv-00804-JPW
District Judge John P. Wiese, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo MIAMI SAVINGS CORP., Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Michael George Shannon +1 212 895 2000
No Logo RAUL MASVIDAL, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Michael George Shannon +1 212 895 2000
v.
United States of America United States of America, Defendant
Officially listed as "USA"

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Daniel D. McClain
No Logo Fdic, Intervenor-Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space John Vincent Thomas +1 202 942 3609
Office COFC
Filed 12/6/1995
Jury Demand
Demand $100000
Nature of Suit 511 - Taking - FIRREA
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1491 Tucker Act
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition Preliminary Injunction
County
Terminated 10/18/2002
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flag CLOSED
  Entries (53) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 52 Filed: 6/13/2003, Entered: 6/19/2003 Order Returning Document UnfiledCourt Filing
ORDER RETURNING the request of the law firm of Adorno & Yoss received June 2, 2003. This action was dismissed with prejudice pursuant to Rule 41(a)(2) on October 17, 2002. Signed by Judge John P. Wiese. (dw1, )
    LREF
    Blank 51 Filed: 10/18/2002, Entered: 10/18/2002
    JUDGMENT entered, pursuant to Rule 41(a)(2), that the action is dismissed, with prejudice, as to both plaintiff and plaintiff-intervenor. (signed by Clerk). Copy to parties. (LD)
      LREF
      Blank -- Filed: 10/18/2002, Entered: 10/18/2002
      Case closed (LD)
        LREF
        Blank 50 Filed: 10/17/2002, Entered: 10/18/2002 OrderCourt Filing
        ORDER directing the clerk to enter judgment pursuant to Rule 41(a)(2) dismissing this action with prejudice as to both plaintiff and plaintiff-intervenor. ( signed by Judge John P. Wiese ) Copy to parties. (LD)
          LREF
          Blank 49 Filed: 10/8/2002, Entered: 10/10/2002 ~Notice (other)
          NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal With Prejudice by FDIC. Service: 10/8/02. (FE)
            LREF
            Blank 48 Filed: 10/8/2002, Entered: 10/9/2002 ~Notice (other)Court Filing
            NOTICE of voluntary dismissal by RAUL MASVIDAL. Service: 10/1/02. Filed by leave of the Judge. (LTD)
              LREF
              Blank 47 Filed: 8/2/2002, Entered: 8/6/2002 OrderCourt Filing
              ORDER granting [46-1] motion to Extend Time to file an amended complaint and to respond to interrogatories Plaintiff's motion for substitution of counsel, amended complaint and a response to discovery requests or a notice of dismissal is due 10/1/02 (signed by Judge John P. Wiese). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                LREF
                Blank 46 Filed: 8/1/2002, Entered: 8/6/2002, Terminated: 8/2/2002 Terminated:
                MOTION by RAUL MASVIDAL (Service: 7/26/02) to Extend Time to file an amended complaint and to respond to interrogatories until 10/1/02. Response due: 8/12/02. (LTD)
                  LREF
                  Blank 45 Filed: 7/30/2002, Entered: 8/1/2002 Terminated:
                  RESPONSE by USA (Service: 7/30/02 ) to [43-1] motion to Extend Time to serve amended complaint and to respond to discovery. Reply due: 8/12/02 (HW)
                    LREF
                    Blank 44 Filed: 7/26/2002, Entered: 7/30/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                    ORDER granting [43-1] motion to Extend Time to serve amended complaint and to respond to discovery. Reset deadline for Plaintiff to file his first amended complaint and to respond to Defendant's discovery requests to 7/29/02. ( signed by Judge John P. Wiese ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                      LREF
                      Blank 43 Filed: 7/22/2002, Entered: 7/24/2002, Terminated: 7/26/2002 Terminated: Court Filing
                      MOTION by RAUL MASVIDAL (Service: 7/15/02) to Extend Time to serve amended complaint and to respond to discovery until 7/29/02. Response due: 8/1/02. Filed by leave of the Judge. (LTD)
                        LREF
                        Blank 42 Filed: 7/16/2002, Entered: 7/18/2002 Terminated:
                        MOTION by FDIC (Service: 7/16/02) to substitute attorney (consented) Terminated attorney Bruce Clark Taylor for FDIC Added John Vincent Thomas. (LTD)
                          LREF
                          Blank 41 Filed: 7/8/2002, Entered: 7/10/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                          ORDER granting [40-1] motion to Extend Time to file first amended complaint and to respond to discovery requests by 7/15/02 (signed by Judge John P. Wiese). Copy to parties. (FE)
                            LREF
                            Blank 40 Filed: 7/8/2002, Entered: 7/10/2002, Terminated: 7/8/2002 Terminated:
                            MOTION by RAUL MASVIDAL and MIAMI SAVINGS CORP. (Service: 6/28/02) to Extend Time to file first amended complaint and to respond to discovery requests , (until July 15, 2002). Response due: 7/15/02. (FE)
                              LREF
                              Blank 39 Filed: 6/25/2002, Entered: 6/26/2002 Transcript
                              TRANSCRIPT of proceedings re: 1 volume, at Washington, D.C., for date of June 20, 2002. Notice to parties. (FE)
                                LREF
                                Blank 38 Filed: 6/18/2002, Entered: 6/18/2002, Terminated: 10/18/2002 Response
                                RESPONSE (to the eight questions) by USA set fourth in the [36-2] order. Service: 6/17/02 (HW)
                                  LREF
                                  Blank 37 Filed: 6/14/2002, Entered: 6/14/2002 Court Filing
                                  Notice of reassignment to Judge John P. Wiese . Copy to parties. (DS)
                                    LREF
                                    Blank 36 Filed: 6/5/2002, Entered: 6/6/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                    ORDER oral argument set for 2:30 p.m. on 6/20/02 for [24-1] motion to Dismiss complaint of Raul Madvidal (signed by Judge John P. Wiese). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                      LREF
                                      Blank 35 Filed: 1/7/2002, Entered: 1/8/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                      ORDER re: discovery. ( signed by Sr. Judge Loren A. Smith ) Copy to parties. (FE)
                                        LREF
                                        Blank 34 Filed: 10/18/2001, Entered: 10/19/2001 Reply to Response to MotionCourt Filing
                                        REPLY by USA to response to [24-1] motion to Dismiss complaint of Raul Madvidal, by leave of the Judge. Service: 6/22/01. (FE)
                                          LREF
                                          Blank 33 Filed: 10/18/2001, Entered: 10/19/2001 Reply to Response to MotionCourt Filing
                                          REPLY by USA to response to [25-1] motion to Dismiss complaint of FDIC, by leave of the Judge. Service: 6/4/01. (FE)
                                            LREF
                                            Blank 32 Filed: 10/18/2001, Entered: 10/19/2001 Terminated: Court Filing
                                            RESPONSE by RAUL MASVIDAL (Service: 6/8/01) to [24-1] motion to Dismiss complaint of Raul Madvidal, by leave of the Judge. (FE)
                                              LREF
                                              Blank 31 Filed: 8/14/2001, Entered: 8/15/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                              ORDER referring the Government's renewed motion to dismiss to Judge Wiese for determination. Case will remain on Chief Judge Smith's docket unless and until Judge Wiese grants the government's renewed motion (signed by Chief Judge Lawrence M. Baskir). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                LREF
                                                Blank 30 Filed: 7/19/2001, Entered: 7/20/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                ORDER re: The Court will request that the Chief Judge transfer this case to Issue Judge Wiese for consideration of defendant's motions to dismiss the complaints of the plaintiffs as barred by the statue of limitations, it is under stood that this transfer will be for the purpose of resolving the pending statue of limitations motions only ( signed by Sr. Judge Loren A. Smith). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                  LREF
                                                  Blank 29 Filed: 5/18/2001, Entered: 5/22/2001 Terminated:
                                                  RESPONSE by FDIC (Service: 5/18/01) to [25-1] motion to Dismiss complaint of FDIC. Reply due: 6/1/01. (FE)
                                                    LREF
                                                    Blank 28 Filed: 5/18/2001, Entered: 5/22/2001 Terminated:
                                                    MOTION by RAUL MASVIDAL (Service: 5/17/01) to Extend Time to respond to the motion to dismiss the complaint , (until June 8, 2001). (FE)
                                                      LREF
                                                      Blank 27 Filed: 4/26/2001, Entered: 4/27/2001 Terminated:
                                                      JOINT MOTION by RAUL MASVIDAL, MIAMI SAVINGS CORP., and FDIC to allow them until May 18, 2001, to file their responses to defendant's motions to dismiss their complaints as barred bythe statute of limitations . (HW)
                                                        LREF
                                                        Blank 26 Filed: 4/23/2001, Entered: 4/24/2001 Terminated:
                                                        RESPONSE by RAUL MASVIDAL (Service: 4/20/01) to [23-1] motion to Transfer Case to resolve statute of limitations issue. Reply due: 5/4/01. (FE)
                                                          LREF
                                                          Blank 25 Filed: 4/3/2001, Entered: 4/4/2001 Terminated:
                                                          MOTION by USA (Service: 4/3/01) to Dismiss complaint of FDIC . Response due: 5/23/01. (LTD)
                                                            LREF
                                                            Blank 24 Filed: 4/3/2001, Entered: 4/4/2001 Terminated:
                                                            MOTION by USA (Service: 4/3/01) to Dismiss complaint of Raul Madvidal . Response due: 5/23/01. (LTD) Modified on 04/04/2001
                                                              LREF
                                                              Blank 23 Filed: 4/3/2001, Entered: 4/4/2001 Terminated:
                                                              MOTION by USA (Service: 4/3/01) to Transfer Case to resolve statute of limitations issue . Response due: 5/23/01. (LTD)
                                                                LREF
                                                                Blank 22 Filed: 8/22/2000, Entered: 8/24/2000 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                NOTICE of Attorney Appearance for USA by Daniel D. McClain Service : 8/22/00 (JT)
                                                                  LREF
                                                                  Blank 21 Filed: 5/24/2000, Entered: 5/24/2000
                                                                  NOTICE of Opting Out of the Third Thirty Wave of Phase II Case-Specific Fact Discovery by RAUL MASVIDAL, MIAMI SAVINGS CORP. Service: 5/23/00 (JT)
                                                                    LREF
                                                                    Blank 20 Filed: 4/7/2000, Entered: 4/14/2000 Notice of Change of Address
                                                                    NOTICE of change of address by Michael George Shannon. (HW)
                                                                      LREF
                                                                      Blank 19 Filed: 3/22/2000, Entered: 3/29/2000 Notice of Change of Address
                                                                      NOTICE of change of address by Bruce Clark Taylor (HW)
                                                                        LREF
                                                                        Blank 18 Filed: 2/13/1998, Entered: 2/17/1998 Notice of Change of Address
                                                                        NOTICE of change of address by Bruce Clark Taylor. (HW)
                                                                          LREF
                                                                          Blank 17 Filed: 3/31/1997, Entered: 4/9/1997 Intervenor Complaint
                                                                          Intervenor's COMPLAINT by FDIC against USA. Service: 3/31/97. RECEIPT # not require.d ( Answer due 6/2/97 ) (FE)
                                                                            LREF
                                                                            Blank 16 Filed: 1/7/1997, Entered: 1/10/1997 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                            SEE 95-660C FOR OPINION denying [12-1] motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction ( signed by Judge John P. Wiese ) Copy to parties. (DS)
                                                                              LREF
                                                                              Blank 15 Filed: 12/5/1996, Entered: 12/9/1996 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                              SEE 95-660 C FOR ORDER oral argument set for 10:30 a.m. on 12/19/96 for [12-1] motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction signed by Judge John P. Wiese). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                LREF
                                                                                Blank 14 Filed: 10/8/1996, Entered: 10/9/1996 Terminated:
                                                                                RESPONSE by RAUL MASVIDAL, MIAMI SAVINGS CORP. (Service by hand: 10/8/96 ) to [12-1] motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction. Reply due: 10/18/96 (HW)
                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                  Blank 13 Filed: 10/7/1996, Entered: 10/8/1996 Case Assigned/ReassignedCourt Filing
                                                                                  See 90-8 C for Notice of reassignment to Judge John P. Wiese. Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                    Blank 12 Filed: 9/9/1996, Entered: 9/16/1996 Terminated:
                                                                                    MOTION by USA (Service: 9/9/96) to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction . Response due: 10/10/96 (FE)
                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                      Blank 11 Filed: 8/28/1996, Entered: 9/13/1996 Case Assigned/ReassignedCourt Filing
                                                                                      SEE ORDER IN 90-8C for Notice of reassignment to Chief Judge Loren A. Smith. Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                        Blank 10 Filed: 8/16/1996, Entered: 8/20/1996 Terminated:
                                                                                        MOTION by USA (Service : 8/16/96 ) for Leave to File attached proposed pretrial order. Response due: 9/3/96 (HW)
                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                          Blank 9 Filed: 7/23/1996, Entered: 7/25/1996 Terminated:
                                                                                          MOTION by USA (Service: 7/23/96) for Leave to File copy of motion to adopt special case management procedures . Response due: 8/9/96 (FE)
                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                            Blank 8 Filed: 7/2/1996, Entered: 7/11/1996 Notice of Change of Address
                                                                                            NOTICE of change of address by Rhonda Kay Schnare (FE)
                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                              Blank 7 Filed: 5/8/1996, Entered: 5/13/1996 Terminated:
                                                                                              MOTION by USA (Service : 5/8/96 ) for Leave to submit a copy of the attached motion to adopt special case management procedures. Response due: 5/8/96 (HW)
                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                Blank 6 Filed: 3/19/1996, Entered: 3/25/1996 Terminated:
                                                                                                MOTION by USA (Service : 3/19/96 ) for Leave to File notice and declaration re: certain documents that may be relevant to this action . Response due: 4/5/96 (FE)
                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                  Blank 5 Filed: 2/28/1996, Entered: 3/5/1996 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                  ORDER granting [4-1] motion to Stay pending decision in Winstar (signed by Judge Robert J. Yock). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                    Blank 4 Filed: 2/12/1996, Entered: 2/15/1996, Terminated: 2/28/1996 Terminated: Court Filing
                                                                                                    MOTION by USA (Service: 2/6/96) to Stay pending decision in Winstar by leave of Judge. (FE)
                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                      Blank 3 Filed: 1/16/1996, Entered: 1/23/1996 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                      NOTICE of Attorney Appearance for USA by Rhonda Kay Schnare. Service : 1/16/96 (HW)
                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                        Blank 2 Filed: 12/6/1995, Entered: 12/20/1995 Case Assigned/ReassignedCourt Filing
                                                                                                        Notice of assignment to Judge Robert J. Yock. Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                          Blank 1 Filed: 12/6/1995, Entered: 12/20/1995 Complaint
                                                                                                          COMPLAINT, FILING FEE $120, RECEIPT #040529. Answer due on 2/5/96. (FE)
                                                                                                            LREF

                                                                                                            Statistics

                                                                                                            This case has been viewed 201 times.

                                                                                                            No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                            Space
                                                                                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                             
                                                                                                            PlainSite
                                                                                                            Sign Up
                                                                                                            Need Password Help?