WALLACE v. USA
Federal Civil Lawsuit United States Court of Federal Claims, Case No. 1:95-cv-00805-LAS
District Judge Loren A. Smith, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo PATRICIA B. WALLACE, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Michael George Shannon +1 212 895 2000
v.
United States of America United States of America, Defendant
Officially listed as "USA"

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Colleen Ann Conry
No Logo Fdic, Intervenor-Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jon Arthur Stewart +1 202 942 3609
Office COFC
Filed 12/6/1995
Jury Demand
Demand $100000
Nature of Suit 511 - Taking - FIRREA
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1491 Tucker Act
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition Preliminary Injunction
County
Terminated 8/14/2002
Origin 1
Reopened
Lead Case
191-cv-00034-LAS None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flags CLOSED, MEMBER
  Entries (25) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 22 Filed: 8/14/2002, Entered: 8/14/2002
JUDGMENT entered, pursuant to Rule 58, that the complaints of the plaintiffs are dismissed. [See 91-34 C] (signed by Clerk). Copy to parties. (LD)
    LREF
    Blank -- Filed: 8/14/2002, Entered: 8/14/2002
    Case closed (LD)
      LREF
      Blank 21 Filed: 1/15/1999, Entered: 1/20/1999 Notice of Appearance/
      NOTICE of Attorney Appearance for USA by Scott Jeffrey Pivnick. Service : 1/15/99 (JT)
        LREF
        Blank -- Filed: 6/26/1997, Entered: 8/26/1997 Set/Clear Flags
        Consolidated Member Case. See lead case number 91- 34C for further proceedings. (DS)
          LREF
          Blank 20 Filed: 6/18/1997, Entered: 6/25/1997 Transcript
          TRANSCRIPT of proceedings re:Oral Argument - to consolidate, 1 volume, at Washington, D.C., for date of June 13, 1997. Notice to parties. (FE)
            LREF
            Blank -- Filed: 6/13/1997, Entered: 6/25/1997 Oral Argument
            Oral Argument re: to consolidate. (FE)
              LREF
              Blank 19 Filed: 5/6/1997, Entered: 5/20/1997 Terminated: Court Filing
              RESPONSE by PATRICIA B. WALLACE to FDIC's motion to consolidate, by leave of the Judge. (Service: 4/28/97 ) (HW)
                LREF
                Blank 18 Filed: 5/5/1997, Entered: 5/20/1997 Reply to Response to Motion
                REPLY by USA to response to [12-1] motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction. Service: 5/5/97 (HW)
                  LREF
                  Blank 17 Filed: 3/31/1997, Entered: 4/9/1997 Intervenor Complaint
                  Intervenor's COMPLAINT by FDIC against USA. Service: 3/31/97. RECEIPT # Not Required. ( Answer due 6/2/97 ) (FE)
                    LREF
                    Blank 16 Filed: 1/7/1997, Entered: 1/10/1997 OrderCourt Filing
                    SEE 95-660C FOR OPINION denying [12-1] motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction ( signed by Judge John P. Wiese ) Copy to parties. (DS)
                      LREF
                      Blank 15 Filed: 12/5/1996, Entered: 12/9/1996 OrderCourt Filing
                      SEE 95-660 C FOR ORDER oral argument set for 10:30 a.m. on 12/19/96 for [12-1] motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction signed by Judge John P. Wiese). Copy to parties. (FE)
                        LREF
                        Blank 14 Filed: 10/8/1996, Entered: 10/9/1996 Terminated:
                        RESPONSE by PATRICIA B. WALLACE (Service by hand: 10/8/96 ) to [12-1] motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction. Reply due: 10/18/96 (HW)
                          LREF
                          Blank 13 Filed: 10/7/1996, Entered: 10/8/1996 Case Assigned/ReassignedCourt Filing
                          See 90-8 C for Notice of reassignment to Judge John P. Wiese. Copy to parties. (FE)
                            LREF
                            Blank 12 Filed: 9/9/1996, Entered: 9/16/1996 Terminated:
                            MOTION by USA (Service: 9/9/96) to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction . Response due: 10/10/96 (FE)
                              LREF
                              Blank 11 Filed: 8/28/1996, Entered: 9/5/1996 Case Assigned/ReassignedCourt Filing
                              SEE ORDER IN 90-8C for Notice of reassignment to Chief Judge Loren A. Smith . Copy to parties. (FE)
                                LREF
                                Blank 10 Filed: 8/16/1996, Entered: 8/20/1996 Terminated:
                                MOTION by USA (Service : 8/16/96 ) for Leave to File attached proposed pretrial order. Response due: 9/3/96 (HW)
                                  LREF
                                  Blank 9 Filed: 7/23/1996, Entered: 7/25/1996 Terminated:
                                  MOTION by USA (Service: 7/23/96) for Leave to File copy of motion to adopt special case management procedures . Response due: 8/9/96 (FE)
                                    LREF
                                    Blank 8 Filed: 6/24/1996, Entered: 6/28/1996 Notice of Change of Address
                                    NOTICE of change of address by Lesleyanne Koch Kessler (FE)
                                      LREF
                                      Blank 7 Filed: 4/26/1996, Entered: 4/30/1996 Terminated:
                                      MOTION by USA (Service : 4/26/96 ) for Leave to File a copy of the motion to adopt special case management procedures Response due: 5/13/96 (HW)
                                        LREF
                                        Blank 6 Filed: 3/19/1996, Entered: 3/25/1996 Terminated:
                                        MOTION by USA (Service : 3/19/96 ) for Leave to File notice and declaration re: certain documents that may be relevant to this action . Response due: 4/5/96 (FE)
                                          LREF
                                          Blank 5 Filed: 2/13/1996, Entered: 2/20/1996 OrderCourt Filing
                                          ORDER granting [3-1] motion to Stay Proceedings (signed by Judge Lawrence S. Margolis). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                            LREF
                                            Blank 4 Filed: 2/8/1996, Entered: 2/13/1996 Notice of Appearance/
                                            NOTICE of Attorney Appearance for USA by Lesleyanne Koch Kessler. Service : 2/8/96 (FE)
                                              LREF
                                              Blank 3 Filed: 2/5/1996, Entered: 2/12/1996, Terminated: 2/13/1996 Terminated:
                                              MOTION by USA (Service : 2/5/96) to Stay Proceedings . Response due: 2/22/96 (FE)
                                                LREF
                                                Blank 2 Filed: 12/6/1995, Entered: 12/20/1995 Case Assigned/ReassignedCourt Filing
                                                Notice of assignment to Judge Lawrence S. Margolis. Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                  LREF
                                                  Blank 1 Filed: 12/6/1995, Entered: 12/20/1995 Complaint
                                                  COMPLAINT, FILING FEE $120, RECEIPT #040528. Answer due on 2/5/96. (FE)
                                                    LREF

                                                    Statistics

                                                    This case has been viewed 169 times.

                                                    No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                    Space
                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                     
                                                    PlainSite
                                                    Sign Up
                                                    Need Password Help?