POLLACK, et al v. USA
Federal Civil Lawsuit United States Court of Federal Claims, Case No. 1:95-cv-00807-LAS
District Judge Loren A. Smith, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Alan H. Pollack, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Elliot Samuels +1 312 357 0590
No Logo LINDA K. POLLACK, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Elliot Samuels +1 312 357 0590
No Logo MICHAEL R. POLLACK, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Elliot Samuels +1 312 357 0590
No Logo PHILIP POLLACK, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Elliot Samuels +1 312 357 0590
v.
United States of America United States of America, Defendant
Officially listed as "USA"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Tonia June Tornatore +1 202 305 7562 +1 202 305 7643 tonia.tornatore@usdoj.gov
No Logo Fdic, Intervenor-Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space John Francis Elmore +1 214 754 0098
Office COFC
Filed 12/7/1995
Jury Demand
Demand $20000000
Nature of Suit 511 - Taking - FIRREA
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1491 Tucker Act
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition Preliminary Injunction
County
Terminated 8/8/2002
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flag CLOSED
  Entries (42) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 40 Filed: 8/8/2002, Entered: 8/8/2002
JUDGMENT entered, pursuant to Rule 41 (a)(2), that the complaints of the Pollack plaintiffs and plaintiff FDIC are dismissed with prejudice. (signed by Clerk). Copy to parties. (LD)
    LREF
    Blank 39 Filed: 8/8/2002, Entered: 8/8/2002 Court Filing
    ORDER directing the clerk to dismiss the complaints of the Pollack plaintiffs and FDIC pursuant to RCFC 41(a)(2). ( signed by Sr. Judge Loren A. Smith ) Copy to parties. (LD)
      LREF
      Blank -- Filed: 8/8/2002, Entered: 8/8/2002
      Case closed (LD)
        LREF
        Blank 38 Filed: 6/26/2002, Entered: 7/2/2002 ~Notice (other)
        NOTICE of dismissal filed by FDIC. Service: 6/25/02 (DS)
          LREF
          Blank 37 Filed: 6/25/2002, Entered: 7/2/2002 Stipulation
          Stipulation by ALAN H. POLLACK, LINDA K. POLLACK, MICHAEL R. POLLACK, PHILIP POLLACK of dismissal. Service: 6/21/02. (DS)
            LREF
            Blank 36 Filed: 1/24/2002, Entered: 1/24/2002
            NOTICE of change of address by Elliot Samuels. (HW)
              LREF
              Blank 35 Filed: 1/7/2002, Entered: 1/8/2002 OrderCourt Filing
              ORDER re: discovery. ( signed by Sr. Judge Loren A. Smith ) Copy to parties. (FE)
                LREF
                Blank 34 Filed: 10/5/2000, Entered: 10/10/2000 Notice of Appearance/
                NOTICE of Attorney Appearance for USA by Tonia June Tornatore Service : 10/5/00 (JT)
                  LREF
                  Blank 33 Filed: 7/6/2000, Entered: 7/12/2000 Notice of Appearance/
                  NOTICE of Attorney Appearance for USA by David Dean Zimmerman. Service : 7/6/00 (JT)
                    LREF
                    Blank 32 Filed: 6/13/2000, Entered: 6/14/2000 Terminated:
                    MOTION by ALAN H. POLLACK, LINDA K. POLLACK, MICHAEL R. POLLACK, PHILIP POLLACK (Service : 6/9/00 ) to substitute attorney (consented) Terminated attorney William James Harte for PHILIP POLLACK, attorney William James Harte for MICHAEL R. POLLACK, attorney William James Harte for LINDA K. POLLACK, attorney William James Harte for ALAN H. POLLACK Added Elliot Samuels. (JT)
                      LREF
                      Blank 31 Filed: 5/3/2000, Entered: 5/5/2000 Terminated:
                      MOTION by FDIC (Service : 3/10/00 ) to substitute attorney (consented) Terminated attorney Michael Patrick Condon for FDIC Added John Francis Elmore. (JT)
                        LREF
                        Blank 30 Filed: 5/3/2000, Entered: 5/5/2000 OrderCourt Filing
                        ORDER granting [29-1] motion for Leave to file consent motion to substitute attorney of record. ( signed by Chief Judge Loren A. Smith ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                          LREF
                          Blank 29 Filed: 3/28/2000, Entered: 3/29/2000, Terminated: 5/3/2000 Terminated: Court Filing
                          MOTION by FDIC (Service: 3/10/00) for Leave to file consent motion to substitute attorney of record , by leave of the Judge. Response due: 3/27/00. (FE)
                            LREF
                            Blank 28 Filed: 1/27/1999, Entered: 2/2/1999 Memorandum
                            5 Common Issue 11 Briefs by USA re: 90-8. (JT)
                              LREF
                              Blank 27 Filed: 1/27/1999, Entered: 2/2/1999 OrderCourt Filing
                              ORDER filing by leave Common Issue 11 briefs re: 90-8. ( signed by Chief Judge Loren A. Smith ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                                LREF
                                Blank 26 Filed: 10/26/1998, Entered: 10/29/1998 Terminated:
                                MOTION by USA (Service : 10/26/98 ) for Leave to file "Common Issue 11 Briefs" . Response due: 11/12/98. (FE)
                                  LREF
                                  Blank 25 Filed: 2/3/1998, Entered: 2/5/1998 ~Notice (other)
                                  NOTICE of Opt Out of Priority Individual Case-Specific Discovery by ALAN H. POLLACK, LINDA K. POLLACK, MICHAEL R. POLLACK, PHILIP POLLACK. Service: 1/30/98 (JT)
                                    LREF
                                    Blank 24 Filed: 3/31/1997, Entered: 4/9/1997 Intervenor Complaint
                                    Intervenor's COMPLAINT by FDIC against USA. Service: 3/31/97. RECEIPT # Not Required. ( Answer due 6/2/97 ) (FE)
                                      LREF
                                      Blank 23 Filed: 1/7/1997, Entered: 1/10/1997 OrderCourt Filing
                                      SEE 95-660C FOR OPINION denying [18-1] motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction ( signed by Judge John P. Wiese ) Copy to parties. (DS)
                                        LREF
                                        Blank 22 Filed: 12/5/1996, Entered: 12/9/1996 OrderCourt Filing
                                        SEE 95-660 C FOR ORDER oral argument set for 10:30 a.m. on 12/19/96 for [18-1] motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction signed by Judge John P. Wiese). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                          LREF
                                          Blank 20 Filed: 10/8/1996, Entered: 10/9/1996 Terminated:
                                          RESPONSE by ALAN H. POLLACK, LINDA K. POLLACK, MICHAEL R. POLLACK, PHILIP POLLACK (Service by hand: 10/8/96 ) to [18-1] motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction. Reply due: 10/18/96 (HW)
                                            LREF
                                            Blank 21 Filed: 10/7/1996, Entered: 10/9/1996 Notice of Appearance/
                                            NOTICE of Attorney Appearance for USA by Scott Jeffrey Pivnick. Service: 10/7/96 (FE)
                                              LREF
                                              Blank 19 Filed: 10/7/1996, Entered: 10/8/1996 Case Assigned/ReassignedCourt Filing
                                              See 90-8 C for Notice of reassignment to Judge John P. Wiese. Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                LREF
                                                Blank 18 Filed: 9/9/1996, Entered: 9/16/1996 Terminated:
                                                MOTION by USA (Service: 9/9/96) to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction . Response due: 10/10/96 (FE)
                                                  LREF
                                                  Blank 17 Filed: 8/28/1996, Entered: 9/3/1996 Case Assigned/ReassignedCourt Filing
                                                  SEE ORDER IN 90-8C for Notice of reassignment to Chief Judge Loren A. Smith. Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                    LREF
                                                    Blank 16 Filed: 8/16/1996, Entered: 8/20/1996 Terminated:
                                                    MOTION by USA (Service : 8/16/96 ) for Leave to File attached proposed pretrial order. Response due: 9/3/96 (HW)
                                                      LREF
                                                      Blank 15 Filed: 7/23/1996, Entered: 7/25/1996 Terminated:
                                                      MOTION by USA (Service: 7/23/96) for Leave to File copy of motion to adopt special case management procedures . Response due: 8/9/96 (FE)
                                                        LREF
                                                        Blank 14 Filed: 6/21/1996, Entered: 6/28/1996 Notice of Change of Address
                                                        NOTICE of change of address by Steven Eric Gordon (FE)
                                                          LREF
                                                          Blank 13 Filed: 5/8/1996, Entered: 5/13/1996 Status Report
                                                          Joint STATUS REPORT by ALAN H. POLLACK, LINDA K. POLLACK, MICHAEL R. POLLACK, PHILIP POLLACK and USA. Service: 5/8/96 (HW)
                                                            LREF
                                                            Blank 12 Filed: 4/29/1996, Entered: 5/1/1996 Terminated:
                                                            MOTION by USA (Service: 4/26/96) for Leave to File Motion to Adopt Special Case Management Procedures . Response due: 5/13/96. (FE)
                                                              LREF
                                                              Blank 11 Filed: 3/26/1996, Entered: 4/1/1996 OrderCourt Filing
                                                              ORDER granting [10-1] motion for Leave to File notice and declaration re: documents that may be relevant to this action (signed by Judge Bohdan A. Futey). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                LREF
                                                                Blank 10 Filed: 3/19/1996, Entered: 3/25/1996, Terminated: 3/26/1996 Terminated:
                                                                MOTION by USA (Service : 3/19/96 ) for Leave to File notice and declaration re: documents that may be relevant to this action . Response due: 4/5/96 (FE)
                                                                  LREF
                                                                  Blank 9 Filed: 2/8/1996, Entered: 2/13/1996 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                  ORDER granting [8-1] motion to Stay Proceedings, set joint Status Report deadline to 5/8/96 and at 90 day intervals thereafter (signed by Judge Bohdan A. Futey). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                    LREF
                                                                    Blank 8 Filed: 2/2/1996, Entered: 2/8/1996, Terminated: 2/8/1996 Terminated:
                                                                    MOTION by ALAN H. POLLACK, LINDA K. POLLACK, MICHAEL R. POLLACK, PHILIP POLLACK, USA (Service : 2/2/96) to Stay Proceedings . (FE)
                                                                      LREF
                                                                      Blank 7 Filed: 1/24/1996, Entered: 1/30/1996 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                      NOTICE of Attorney Appearance for USA by Steven Eric Gordon. Service : 1/24/96. (HW)
                                                                        LREF
                                                                        Blank 6 Filed: 1/19/1996, Entered: 1/23/1996 Case Assigned/ReassignedCourt Filing
                                                                        Notice of assignment to Judge Bohdan A. Futey. Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                          LREF
                                                                          Blank 5 Filed: 1/11/1996, Entered: 1/19/1996 Terminated:
                                                                          MOTION by ALAN H. POLLACK, LINDA K. POLLACK, MICHAEL R. POLLACK and PHILIP POLLACK (Service : 1/11/96 ) for Leave to File affidavit instanter . Response due: 1/29/96. (HW)
                                                                            LREF
                                                                            Blank 4 Filed: 12/29/1995, Entered: 1/16/1996 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                            ORDER granting [2-1] motion to substitute attorney (consented) Terminated attorney PHILIP POLLACK for PHILIP POLLACK, attorney MICHAEL R. POLLACK for MICHAEL R. POLLACK, attorney LINDA K. POLLACK for LINDA K. POLLACK, attorney ALAN H. POLLACK for ALAN H. POLLACK Added William J. Harte. ( signed by Judge Diane G. Weinstein ) Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                              LREF
                                                                              Blank 3 Filed: 12/26/1995, Entered: 1/4/1996 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                              ORDER set Notice of Compliance (Affidavit of Alan Pollack) deadline to 1/3/96 ( signed by Judge Diane G. Weinstein ). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                LREF
                                                                                Blank 2 Filed: 12/21/1995, Entered: 1/3/1996, Terminated: 12/29/1995 Terminated:
                                                                                MOTION by ALAN H. POLLACK, LINDA K. POLLACK, MICHAEL R. POLLACK, PHILIP POLLACK, USA (Service : 12/20/95 ) to substitute attorney (consented) Terminated attorney PHILIP POLLACK for PHILIP POLLACK, attorney MICHAEL R. POLLACK for MICHAEL R. POLLACK, attorney LINDA K. POLLACK for LINDA K. POLLACK, attorney ALAN H. POLLACK for ALAN H. POLLACK Added William J. Harte. Copy to defendant. (FE) Modified on 01/22/1996
                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                  Blank 1 Filed: 12/7/1995, Entered: 12/13/1995 Complaint
                                                                                  COMPLAINT, FILING FEE $120, RECEIPT #040527. Answer due on 2/5/96. (FE)
                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                    Blank -- Filed: 12/7/1995, Entered: 12/13/1995 Case Assigned/Reassigned
                                                                                    CASE assigned to Judge Unassigned. (FE)
                                                                                      LREF

                                                                                      Statistics

                                                                                      This case has been viewed 404 times.

                                                                                      No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                      Space
                                                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                       
                                                                                      PlainSite
                                                                                      Sign Up
                                                                                      Need Password Help?