STERLING SAVINGS, et al v. USA
Federal Civil Lawsuit United States Court of Federal Claims, Case No. 1:95-cv-00829-TCW
District Judge Thomas C. Wheeler, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Sterling Financial Corporation, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of MICHAEL L LOFT

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space William D. Symmes, Sr. +1 509 624 5265 +1 509 458 2728 wds@wkdtlaw.com
No Logo Sterling Savings Association, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of MICHAEL L LOFT

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space William D. Symmes, Sr. +1 509 624 5265 +1 509 458 2728 wds@wkdtlaw.com
v.
United States of America United States of America, Defendant
Officially listed as "USA"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Elizabeth Marie Hosford +1 202 616 0332 +1 202 305 7643 elizabeth.hosford@usdoj.gov
Office COFC
Filed 12/18/1995
Jury Demand
Demand $0
Nature of Suit 511 - Taking - FIRREA
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1491 Tucker Act
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition Judgment
County
Terminated 2/19/2008
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Cases '08-5067'[], 90-175[E. District of Washington]
Def Custody Status
Flags APPEAL, CLOSED, CRSAPP, ECF
  Entries (323) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document 301 Filed: 5/1/2008, Entered: 6/11/2008 Notice of cross-appeal
NOTICE OF CROSS APPEAL, filed by STERLING SAVINGS ASSOCIATION, STERLING FINANCIAL CORPORATION. Filing fee $ 455.00, receipt number 068053. (hw1, )
    LREF
    Legal Document 300 Filed: 4/28/2008, Entered: 4/29/2008 CAFC Case Number
    CAFC Case Number 08-5067 for [299] Notice of Appeal filed by USA. (hw1, )
      LREF
      Legal Document 299 Filed: 4/18/2008, Entered: 4/18/2008
      NOTICE OF APPEAL, filed by USA. Copies to judge, opposing party and CAFC. (hw1, )
        LREF
        Legal Document 298 Filed: 2/25/2008, Entered: 3/11/2008 Certified Transcript to Attorney
        CERTIFIED TRANSCRIPT OF JUDGMENT, dated February 20, 2008, forwarded to William D. Symmes, Sr. See letter in file. (bre, )
          LREF
          Legal Document 297 Filed: 2/19/2008, Entered: 2/19/2008
          JUDGMENT entered, pursuant to Rule 58, that the plaintiff recover of and from the United States the sum of $1,054,850.00, consisting of $900,204.00 in transaction costs that Sterling incurred in 1991 to replace the goodwill eliminated by FIRREA, and $154,646.00 in regulatory supervision costs for being considered a troubled thrift. Further, plaintiff's taking of property claims are dismissed with prejudice. No costs are awarded to either party. (lld)
            LREF
            Legal Document 296 Filed: 2/19/2008, Entered: 2/19/2008 Court Filing
            This Opinion is PUBLISHED. The Clerk is directed to enter judgment. Signed by Judge Thomas C. Wheeler. (ck)
              LREF
              Legal Document 295 Filed: 1/18/2008, Entered: 1/18/2008
              NOTICE, filed by USA of filing of reply brief CD rom (Hosford, Elizabeth)
                LREF
                Legal Document 294 Filed: 1/18/2008, Entered: 1/18/2008
                NOTICE, filed by USA of filing closing argument exhibits (Hosford, Elizabeth)
                  LREF
                  Legal Document 293 Filed: 1/10/2008, Entered: 1/11/2008 TranscriptCourt Filing
                  TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings (pages 1-138) held on January 9, 2008 before Judge Thomas C. Wheeler. (dw1)
                    LREF
                    Legal Document 292 Filed: 12/5/2007, Entered: 12/5/2007 Court Filing
                    ORDER Setting Closing Arguments. Closing Arguments will be held January 9, 2008 at 9:30 AM at the National Courts Building. Signed by Judge Thomas C. Wheeler. (ck) 293 Filed: 01/10/2008Entered: 01/11/2008 Transcript TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings (pages 1-138) held on January 9, 2008 before Judge Thomas C. Wheeler. (dw1) 294 Filed & Entered: 01/18/2008 Notice (Other) NOTICE, filed by USA of filing closing argument exhibits (Hosford, Elizabeth) 295 Filed & Entered: 01/18/2008 Notice (Other) NOTICE, filed by USA of filing of reply brief CD rom (Hosford, Elizabeth) 296 Filed & Entered: 02/19/2008 Published Opinion/Order This Opinion is PUBLISHED. The Clerk is directed to enter judgment. Signed by Judge Thomas C. Wheeler. (ck) 297 Filed & Entered: 02/19/2008 Judgment JUDGMENT entered, pursuant to Rule 58, that the plaintiff recover of and from the United States the sum of $1,054,850.00, consisting of $900,204.00 in transaction costs that Sterling incurred in 1991 to replace the goodwill eliminated by FIRREA, and $154,646.00 in regulatory supervision costs for being considered a troubled thrift. Further, plaintiff's taking of property claims are dismissed with prejudice. No costs are awarded to either party. (lld) 298 Filed: 02/25/2008Entered: 03/11/2008 Certified Transcript to Attorney CERTIFIED TRANSCRIPT OF JUDGMENT, dated February 20, 2008, forwarded to William D. Symmes, Sr. See letter in file. (bre, ) 299 Filed & Entered: 04/18/2008 Notice of Appeal NOTICE OF APPEAL, filed by USA. Copies to judge, opposing party and CAFC. (hw1, ) 300 Filed: 04/28/2008Entered: 04/29/2008 CAFC Case Number CAFC Case Number 08-5067 for [299] Notice of Appeal filed by USA. (hw1, ) 301 Filed: 05/01/2008Entered: 06/11/2008 Notice of Cross Appeal NOTICE OF CROSS APPEAL, filed by STERLING SAVINGS ASSOCIATION, STERLING FINANCIAL CORPORATION. Filing fee $ 455.00, receipt number 068053. (hw1, )
                      LREF
                      Legal Document 291 Filed: 11/26/2007, Entered: 11/26/2007
                      NOTICE, filed by USA of filing of post-trial brief on CD-Rom (Hosford, Elizabeth)
                        LREF
                        Legal Document 290 Filed: 11/21/2007, Entered: 11/21/2007
                        POST TRIAL BRIEF CORRECTED VERSION - WRONG BRIEF WAS ATTACHED TO #289, filed by STERLING SAVINGS ASSOCIATION, STERLING FINANCIAL CORPORATION. (Symmes, William)
                          LREF
                          Legal Document 289 Filed: 11/20/2007, Entered: 11/20/2007
                          POST TRIAL BRIEF CORRECTED RESPONSE TO GOVERNMENT'S PROPOSED FINDINGS OF FACT, filed by STERLING SAVINGS ASSOCIATION, STERLING FINANCIAL CORPORATION. (Symmes, William)
                            LREF
                            Legal Document 287 Filed: 11/19/2007, Entered: 11/20/2007 Post-Trial Brief
                            POST TRIAL BRIEF Response to Defendant's Post-Trial Proposed Findings of Fact and Law, filed by STERLING SAVINGS ASSOCIATION, STERLING FINANCIAL CORPORATION. (Symmes, William)
                              LREF
                              Legal Document 286 Filed: 11/19/2007, Entered: 11/19/2007
                              POST TRIAL BRIEF (Reply), filed by USA. (Hosford, Elizabeth)
                                LREF
                                Legal Document 288 Filed: 11/2/2007, Entered: 11/20/2007 Transcript - Cumulative Index
                                Cumulative Index for TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings (pages 1-55) held on June 25, 2007 through July 13, 2007. (dw1) Additional attachment(s) added on 12/17/2007 (Williams, Derek).
                                  LREF
                                  Legal Document 285 Filed: 9/24/2007, Entered: 9/24/2007
                                  Proposed Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law, filed by STERLING SAVINGS ASSOCIATION, STERLING FINANCIAL CORPORATION. (Symmes, William)
                                    LREF
                                    Legal Document 284 Filed: 9/22/2007, Entered: 9/22/2007
                                    Proposed Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law, filed by STERLING SAVINGS ASSOCIATION, STERLING FINANCIAL CORPORATION. (Symmes, William)
                                      LREF
                                      Legal Document 283 Filed: 9/21/2007, Entered: 9/21/2007
                                      POST TRIAL BRIEF, filed by USA. (Hosford, Elizabeth)
                                        LREF
                                        Legal Document 282 Filed: 8/22/2007, Entered: 8/23/2007 TranscriptCourt Filing
                                        TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings (pages 1-6) held on July 23, 2007 before Judge Thomas C. Wheeler. (dw1)
                                          LREF
                                          Legal Document 281 Filed: 7/24/2007, Entered: 7/24/2007 Court Filing
                                          SCHEDULING ORDER: Post-Trial Opening Briefs are due September 21, 2007. Response Briefs are due November 19, 2007. Signed by Judge Thomas C. Wheeler. (ck1)
                                            LREF
                                            Legal Document 280 Filed: 7/23/2007, Entered: 7/23/2007
                                            Exhibit List Joint Admitted Exhibit List, filed by all parties. (Hosford, Elizabeth)
                                              LREF
                                              Legal Document 279 Filed: 7/19/2007, Entered: 7/19/2007 Court Filing
                                              TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings (pages 1-32) held on June 19, 2007 before Judge Thomas C. Wheeler. (dw1)
                                                LREF
                                                Legal Document 278 Filed: 7/13/2007, Entered: 7/16/2007 TranscriptCourt Filing
                                                TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings (pages 2807-4356) held on July 9, 2007 through July 13, 2007 before Judge Thomas C. Wheeler. (dw1)
                                                  LREF
                                                  Legal Document 277 Filed: 7/9/2007, Entered: 7/10/2007 TranscriptCourt Filing
                                                  TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings (pages 1558-2806) held on July 2-6, 2007 before Judge Thomas C. Wheeler. (dw1)
                                                    LREF
                                                    Legal Document 276 Filed: 7/9/2007, Entered: 7/9/2007
                                                    SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEF re: proffer re inadvertently omitted exhibits, filed by STERLING SAVINGS ASSOCIATION, STERLING FINANCIAL CORPORATION. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit pp 5-37# (2) Exhibit pp 38-69)(Symmes, William)
                                                      LREF
                                                      Legal Document 275 Filed: 7/9/2007, Entered: 7/9/2007, Terminated: 2/19/2008 Motion for Judgment on Partial Findings
                                                      MOTION for Judgment on Partial Findings, filed by USA.Response due by 8/9/2007.(Hosford, Elizabeth)
                                                        LREF
                                                        Legal Document 274 Filed: 7/2/2007, Entered: 7/3/2007 TranscriptCourt Filing
                                                        TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings (pages 1-1557) held on June 25, 2007 through June 29, 2007 before Judge Thomas C. Wheeler. (dw1)
                                                          LREF
                                                          Blank -- Filed: 6/30/2007, Entered: 6/30/2007
                                                          The Court denied in open Court [272] Plaintiff's Motion for leave to present testimony of A. Adgate Duer by deposition. Signed by Judge Thomas C. Wheeler. (ck1)
                                                            LREF
                                                            Legal Document 273 Filed: 6/27/2007, Entered: 6/27/2007
                                                            Memorandum of Contentions of Fact and Law, filed by STERLING SAVINGS ASSOCIATION, STERLING FINANCIAL CORPORATION. (Symmes, William)
                                                              LREF
                                                              Legal Document 272 Filed: 6/24/2007, Entered: 6/24/2007, Terminated: 6/30/2007 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                                              MOTION Leave to Present Testimony by Deposition (Duer), filed by STERLING SAVINGS ASSOCIATION, STERLING FINANCIAL CORPORATION.Response due by 7/12/2007. (Attachments: # (1) pt 2# (2) pt 3# (3) pt 4# (4) pt 5# (5) pt 6)(Symmes, William)
                                                                LREF
                                                                Legal Document 271 Filed: 6/21/2007, Entered: 6/21/2007
                                                                Exhibit List Revised, filed by USA. (Hosford, Elizabeth)
                                                                  LREF
                                                                  Blank -- Filed: 6/20/2007, Entered: 6/20/2007
                                                                  Set/Reset Transcript Deadlines: Transcript due by 7/19/2007. (vp1, )
                                                                    LREF
                                                                    Legal Document 270 Filed: 6/18/2007, Entered: 6/18/2007 Court Filing
                                                                    ORDER denying [259] Defendant's Motion in Limine Concerning Hearsay Evidence. Signed by Judge Thomas C. Wheeler. (ck1)
                                                                      LREF
                                                                      Legal Document 269 Filed: 6/18/2007, Entered: 6/18/2007 Court Filing
                                                                      ORDER Granting in Part and Denying in Part [258] Defendant's Motion in Limine to Exclude Evidence of Breach and Damages Concerning the Central Evergreen Transaction. Signed by Judge Thomas C. Wheeler. (ck1)
                                                                        LREF
                                                                        Legal Document 268 Filed: 6/15/2007, Entered: 6/15/2007
                                                                        RESPONSE to [258] MOTION in Limine To Exclude Evidence Of Breach of Contract and Damage With Respect To Central Evergreen Copy with full appendix cites and appendix, filed by STERLING SAVINGS ASSOCIATION, STERLING FINANCIAL CORPORATION.Reply due by 6/29/2007. (Attachments: # (1) Appendix pp 1-100# (2) Appendix pp 101-191)(Symmes, William)
                                                                          LREF
                                                                          Legal Document 267 Filed: 6/15/2007, Entered: 6/15/2007
                                                                          RESPONSE to [258] MOTION in Limine To Exclude Evidence Of Breach of Contract and Damage With Respect To Central Evergreen, filed by STERLING SAVINGS ASSOCIATION, STERLING FINANCIAL CORPORATION.Reply due by 6/29/2007. (Symmes, William)
                                                                            LREF
                                                                            Legal Document 266 Filed: 6/15/2007, Entered: 6/15/2007
                                                                            RESPONSE to [259] MOTION in Limine To Exclude Hearsay Testimony And Exhibits, filed by STERLING SAVINGS ASSOCIATION, STERLING FINANCIAL CORPORATION.Reply due by 6/29/2007. (Symmes, William)
                                                                              LREF
                                                                              Blank -- Filed: 6/8/2007, Entered: 6/8/2007
                                                                              ORDER denying [253] Plaintiff's May 17, 2007 motion to strike the expert reports of Joe A. Hargett and Mukesh Bajaj. Signed by Judge Thomas C. Wheeler. (ck1)
                                                                                LREF
                                                                                Legal Document 265 Filed: 6/6/2007, Entered: 6/6/2007
                                                                                Objection to Exhibit List, filed by STERLING SAVINGS ASSOCIATION, STERLING FINANCIAL CORPORATION. Related document: [257] Exhibit List filed by USA, [215] Pretrial Order.(Symmes, William)
                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document 264 Filed: 6/6/2007, Entered: 6/6/2007
                                                                                  STIPULATION of facts (joint), filed by all parties. (Hosford, Elizabeth)
                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document 263 Filed: 6/6/2007, Entered: 6/6/2007
                                                                                    Objection to Exhibit List, filed by USA. Related document: [215] Pretrial Order.(Hosford, Elizabeth)
                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document 262 Filed: 6/6/2007, Entered: 6/6/2007 Court Filing
                                                                                      TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings 9pages (1-19) held on May 16, 2007 before Judge Thomas C. Wheeler. (dw1)
                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document 261 Filed: 6/4/2007, Entered: 6/4/2007
                                                                                        RESPONSE to [253] MOTION to Strike Expert reports of Hargett and Bajaj, filed by USA.Reply due by 6/18/2007. (Hosford, Elizabeth)
                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document 260 Filed: 5/31/2007, Entered: 5/31/2007 Court Filing
                                                                                          ORDER denying [222] Motion for Summary Judgment and [232] Cross Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Thomas C. Wheeler. (ck1)
                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document 259 Filed: 5/30/2007, Entered: 5/30/2007, Terminated: 6/18/2007 Motion in Limine
                                                                                            MOTION in Limine To Exclude Hearsay Testimony And Exhibits, filed by USA.Response due by 6/18/2007.(Hosford, Elizabeth)
                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document 258 Filed: 5/29/2007, Entered: 5/29/2007, Terminated: 6/18/2007 Motion in Limine
                                                                                              MOTION in Limine To Exclude Evidence Of Breach of Contract and Damage With Respect To Central Evergreen, filed by USA. Response due by 6/15/2007.(Hosford, Elizabeth) Modified on 6/7/2007 to correct response due date. (Samler, Debbie).
                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document 257 Filed: 5/23/2007, Entered: 5/23/2007
                                                                                                Exhibit List, filed by USA. (Attachments: # (1) exhibit list)(Hosford, Elizabeth)
                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document 256 Filed: 5/23/2007, Entered: 5/23/2007
                                                                                                  Witness List, filed by USA. (Hosford, Elizabeth)
                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document 255 Filed: 5/23/2007, Entered: 5/23/2007
                                                                                                    Memorandum of Contentions of Fact and Law, filed by USA. (Hosford, Elizabeth)
                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                      Legal Document 254 Filed: 5/23/2007, Entered: 5/23/2007
                                                                                                      Witness List, filed by STERLING SAVINGS ASSOCIATION, STERLING FINANCIAL CORPORATION. (Symmes, William)
                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document 253 Filed: 5/17/2007, Entered: 5/17/2007, Terminated: 6/8/2007 Motion to Strike
                                                                                                        MOTION to Strike Expert reports of Hargett and Bajaj, filed by STERLING SAVINGS ASSOCIATION, STERLING FINANCIAL CORPORATION.Response due by 6/4/2007. (Attachments: # (1) Appendix)(Symmes, William)
                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document 252 Filed: 5/17/2007, Entered: 5/17/2007
                                                                                                          REPLY to Response to Motion re [232] CROSS MOTION and RESPONSE to [222] Motion for Summary Judgment,, filed by USA, [222] MOTION for Summary Judgment Regarding Damages (Revised) MOTION for Summary Judgment Regarding Damages (Revised) MOTION for Summary Judgment Regarding Damages (Revised), filed by STERLING SAVINGS ASSOCIATION, STERLING FINANCIAL CORPORATION. (Attachments: # (1) Appendix)(Symmes, William)
                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document 251 Filed: 5/16/2007, Entered: 5/16/2007 Court Filing
                                                                                                            ORDER denying [240] Defendant's Motion to Strike the declaration of Dr. Paul Horvitz. Signed by Judge Thomas C. Wheeler. (ck1)
                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                              Blank -- Filed: 5/16/2007, Entered: 5/16/2007
                                                                                                              Set/Reset Transcript Deadlines: Transcript due by 6/18/2007. (vp1, )
                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document 250 Filed: 5/11/2007, Entered: 5/11/2007, Terminated: 6/19/2007 Motion for Status Conference
                                                                                                                MOTION for Status Conference, filed by USA.Response due by 5/29/2007.(Hosford, Elizabeth)
                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document 249 Filed: 5/8/2007, Entered: 5/8/2007
                                                                                                                  REPLY to Response to Motion re [240] MOTION to Strike Declaration of Dr. Horvitz, filed by USA. (Hosford, Elizabeth)
                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document 248 Filed: 5/3/2007, Entered: 5/3/2007
                                                                                                                    RESPONSE to [240] MOTION to Strike Declaration of Dr. Horvitz, filed by STERLING SAVINGS ASSOCIATION, STERLING FINANCIAL CORPORATION.Reply due by 5/17/2007. (Symmes, William)
                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document 247 Filed: 5/2/2007, Entered: 5/2/2007 Court Filing
                                                                                                                      ORDER denying [230] Plaintiff's Motion to Strike the Expert Report of W. Barefoot Bankhead. Signed by Judge Thomas C. Wheeler. (ck1)
                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document 246 Filed: 4/30/2007, Entered: 4/30/2007
                                                                                                                        REPLY to Response to Motion re [230] MOTION to Strike [222] MOTION for Summary Judgment Regarding Damages (Revised) MOTION for Summary Judgment Regarding Damages (Revised) MOTION for Summary Judgment Regarding Damages (Revised) Expert Report of W. Barefoot Bankhea MOTION to Strike [222] MOTION for Summary Judgment Regarding Damages (Revised) MOTION for Summary Judgment Regarding Damages (Revised) MOTION for Summary Judgment Regarding Damages (Revised) Expert Report of W. Barefoot Bankhea, filed by STERLING SAVINGS ASSOCIATION, STERLING FINANCIAL CORPORATION. (Attachments: # (1) Appendix)(Symmes, William)
                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document 245 Filed: 4/30/2007, Entered: 4/30/2007
                                                                                                                          RESPONSE to PROPOSED FINDINGS of Uncontroverted Fact in connection with Sterling's cross-motion for summary judgment, filed by USA, filed by USA. (Hosford, Elizabeth)
                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document 244 Filed: 4/30/2007, Entered: 4/30/2007
                                                                                                                            REPLY to Response to Motion re [232] CROSS MOTION and RESPONSE to [222] Motion for Summary Judgment,, filed by USA, [235] CROSS MOTION and RESPONSE to [232] Cross Motion [Dispositive] filed by STERLING SAVINGS ASSOCIATION, STERLING FINANCIAL CORPORATIONCROSS MOTION and RESPONSE to [232] Cross Motion [Dispositive] filed by STERLING SAVINGS ASSOCIATION, STERLING FINANCIAL CORPORATION, filed by USA. (Attachments: # (1) Appendix)(Hosford, Elizabeth)
                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document 243 Filed: 4/25/2007, Entered: 4/26/2007 Memorandum of Contentions of Fact and Law
                                                                                                                              Memorandum of Contentions of Fact and Law, filed by all plaintiffs. (Symmes, William)
                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document 242 Filed: 4/25/2007, Entered: 4/25/2007
                                                                                                                                Exhibit List, filed by all plaintiffs. (Symmes, William)
                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 241 Filed: 4/25/2007, Entered: 4/25/2007
                                                                                                                                  Witness List, filed by all plaintiffs. (Symmes, William)
                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 240 Filed: 4/16/2007, Entered: 4/16/2007, Terminated: 5/16/2007 Motion to Strike
                                                                                                                                    MOTION to Strike Declaration of Dr. Horvitz, filed by USA.Response due by 5/3/2007.(Hosford, Elizabeth)
                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 239 Filed: 4/16/2007, Entered: 4/16/2007
                                                                                                                                      RESPONSE to [230] MOTION to Strike [222] MOTION for Summary Judgment Regarding Damages (Revised) MOTION for Summary Judgment Regarding Damages (Revised) MOTION for Summary Judgment Regarding Damages (Revised) Expert Report of W. Barefoot Bankhea MOTION to Strike [222] MOTION for Summary Judgment Regarding Damages (Revised) MOTION for Summary Judgment Regarding Damages (Revised) MOTION for Summary Judgment Regarding Damages (Revised) Expert Report of W. Barefoot Bankhea, filed by USA.Reply due by 4/30/2007. (Hosford, Elizabeth)
                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 238 Filed: 4/4/2007, Entered: 4/4/2007 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                        ORDER granting in part and denying in part [224] Plaintiff's Motion to Strike and [225] Memorandum in Support Thereof. Signed by Judge Thomas C. Wheeler. (ck1)
                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 237 Filed: 4/2/2007, Entered: 4/2/2007
                                                                                                                                          REPLY to Response to Motion re [224] MOTION to Strike Government's Undisclosed Witnesses, filed by STERLING SAVINGS ASSOCIATION, STERLING FINANCIAL CORPORATION. (Attachments: # (1) Appendix pp 184-261)(Symmes, William)
                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                            Blank -- Filed: 4/2/2007, Entered: 4/2/2007
                                                                                                                                            ORDER granting [236] Motion for Extension of Time to File a Response to Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Thomas C. Wheeler. (ck1)
                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 236 Filed: 3/30/2007, Entered: 3/30/2007, Terminated: 4/2/2007 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Repl
                                                                                                                                              MOTION for Extension of Time until March 30, 2007 to File Response or Reply as to [222] MOTION for Summary Judgment Regarding Damages (Revised) MOTION for Summary Judgment Regarding Damages (Revised) MOTION for Summary Judgment Regarding Damages (Revised), filed by STERLING SAVINGS ASSOCIATION, STERLING FINANCIAL CORPORATION.Response due by 4/16/2007.(Symmes, William)
                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 235 Filed: 3/30/2007, Entered: 3/30/2007, Terminated: 5/31/2007 Cross Motion [Dispositive]
                                                                                                                                                CROSS MOTION and RESPONSE to [232] Cross Motion [Dispositive] filed by STERLING SAVINGS ASSOCIATION, STERLING FINANCIAL CORPORATION, filed by STERLING SAVINGS ASSOCIATION, STERLING FINANCIAL CORPORATION.Response due by 4/30/2007.(Symmes, William)
                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 234 Filed: 3/30/2007, Entered: 3/30/2007
                                                                                                                                                  STATEMENT OF FACTS re: [232] Cross Motion [Dispositive] Additional Appendix, filed by STERLING SAVINGS ASSOCIATION, STERLING FINANCIAL CORPORATION. (Attachments: # (1) Appendix pp 1026-1037# (2) Appendix pp 1038-1050# (3) Appendix pp 1051-1062# (4) Appendix pp 1063-1075# (5) Appendix 1076-1080# (6) Appendix 1082-1100# (7) Appendix pp 1101-1200# (8) Appendix 1201-1300# (9) Appendix 1301-1383# (10) Appendix 1384-1387)(Symmes, William)
                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 233 Filed: 3/30/2007, Entered: 3/30/2007
                                                                                                                                                    STATEMENT OF FACTS re: [232] Cross Motion [Dispositive] and Appendix, filed by STERLING SAVINGS ASSOCIATION, STERLING FINANCIAL CORPORATION. (Attachments: # (1) Appendix pp 1-100# (2) Appendix pp 101-200# (3) Appendix App 201-300# (4) Appendix pp 301-400# (5) Appendix pp 401-500# (6) Appendix pp 501-600# (7) Appendix pp 601-700# (8) Appendix pp 701-800# (9) Appendix pp 801-850# (10) Appendix pp 851-900# (11) Appendix pp 901-950# (12) Appendix pp 951-1000)(Symmes, William)
                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 232 Filed: 3/29/2007, Entered: 3/29/2007, Terminated: 5/31/2007 Cross Motion [Dispositive]
                                                                                                                                                      CROSS MOTION and RESPONSE to [222] Motion for Summary Judgment,, filed by USA, filed by STERLING SAVINGS ASSOCIATION, STERLING FINANCIAL CORPORATION.Response due by 4/30/2007.(Symmes, William)
                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 231 Filed: 3/29/2007, Entered: 3/29/2007
                                                                                                                                                        MEMORANDUM re: [230] Motion to Strike,, filed by STERLING SAVINGS ASSOCIATION, STERLING FINANCIAL CORPORATION. (Symmes, William)
                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 230 Filed: 3/29/2007, Entered: 3/29/2007, Terminated: 5/2/2007 Motion to Strike
                                                                                                                                                          MOTION to Strike [222] MOTION for Summary Judgment Regarding Damages (Revised) MOTION for Summary Judgment Regarding Damages (Revised) MOTION for Summary Judgment Regarding Damages (Revised) Expert Report of W. Barefoot Bankhead, filed by STERLING SAVINGS ASSOCIATION, STERLING FINANCIAL CORPORATION.Response due by 4/16/2007.(Symmes, William)
                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 229 Filed: 3/26/2007, Entered: 3/26/2007 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                            ORDER granting in part and denying in part [221] Defendant's Motion regarding the Government's objections to Plaintiff's list of witness. Signed by Judge Thomas C. Wheeler. (ck1)
                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 228 Filed: 3/22/2007, Entered: 3/22/2007
                                                                                                                                                              REPLY to Response to Motion re [221] MOTION to file objections to plaintiffs' list of witnesses pursuant to Paragraph 2(a) of the January 3, 2007 pretrial order MOTION to file objections to plaintiffs' list of witnesses pursuant to Paragraph 2(a) of the January 3, 2007 pretrial order, filed by USA. (Hosford, Elizabeth)
                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 227 Filed: 3/19/2007, Entered: 3/19/2007
                                                                                                                                                                RESPONSE to [224] MOTION to Strike Government's Undisclosed Witnesses, [225] MOTION to Strike [224] MOTION to Strike Government's Undisclosed Witnesses Memorandum in Support MOTION to Strike [224] MOTION to Strike Government's Undisclosed Witnesses Memorandum in Support, filed by USA.Reply due by 4/2/2007. (Attachments: # (1) Appendix)(Hosford, Elizabeth)
                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 226 Filed: 3/9/2007, Entered: 3/9/2007
                                                                                                                                                                  RESPONSE to [221] Motion for Miscellaneous Relief, Objections to Witnesses by Deposition, filed by STERLING SAVINGS ASSOCIATION, STERLING FINANCIAL CORPORATION. (Attachments: # (1) Appendix pp 1-37)(Symmes, William)
                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 225 Filed: 3/2/2007, Entered: 3/2/2007, Terminated: 4/4/2007 Motion to Strike
                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION to Strike [224] MOTION to Strike Government's Undisclosed Witnesses Memorandum in Support, filed by STERLING SAVINGS ASSOCIATION, STERLING FINANCIAL CORPORATION.Response due by 3/19/2007. (Attachments: # (1) Appendix pp 1-89# (2) Appendix pp 90-183)(Symmes, William)
                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 224 Filed: 3/2/2007, Entered: 3/2/2007, Terminated: 4/4/2007 Motion to Strike
                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION to Strike Government's Undisclosed Witnesses, filed by STERLING SAVINGS ASSOCIATION, STERLING FINANCIAL CORPORATION.Response due by 3/19/2007.(Symmes, William)
                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 223 Filed: 2/26/2007, Entered: 2/26/2007
                                                                                                                                                                        PROPOSED FINDINGS of Uncontroverted Fact RE: [222] MOTION for Summary Judgment Regarding Damages (Revised), filed by USA. (Hosford, Elizabeth)
                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 222 Filed: 2/26/2007, Entered: 2/26/2007, Terminated: 5/31/2007 Motion for Summary Judgment
                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION for Summary Judgment Regarding Damages (Revised), filed by USA.Response due by 3/29/2007. (Attachments: # (1) Appendix Vol. 1# (2) Appendix Vol. 1# (3) Appendix Vol. 1# (4) Appendix Vol. 1# (5) Appendix Vol. 1# (6) Appendix Vol. 1# (7) Appendix Vol. 1# (8) Appendix Vol. 1# (9) Appendix Vol. 1# (10) Appendix Vol. 1# (11) Appendix Vol. 1# (12) Appendix Vol. 1# (13) Appendix Vol. 2# (14) Appendix Vol. 2# (15) Appendix Vol. 2# (16) Appendix Vol. 2# (17) Appendix Vol. 2# (18) Appendix Vol. 2# (19) Appendix Vol. 2# (20) Appendix Vol. 2# (21) Appendix Vol. 2# (22) Appendix Vol. 2# (23) Appendix Vol. 2# (24) Appendix Vol. 2# (25) Appendix Vol. 2)(Hosford, Elizabeth)
                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 221 Filed: 2/20/2007, Entered: 2/20/2007, Terminated: 3/26/2007 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION to file objections to plaintiffs' list of witnesses pursuant to Paragraph 2(a) of the January 3, 2007 pretrial order, filed by USA.Response due by 3/9/2007. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1)(Hosford, Elizabeth)
                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 220 Filed: 2/20/2007, Entered: 2/20/2007 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER Granting Defendant's motion for authorization to serve subpoenas. Signed by Judge Thomas C. Wheeler. (ck1)
                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 219 Filed: 2/14/2007, Entered: 2/14/2007
                                                                                                                                                                            Witness List, filed by STERLING SAVINGS ASSOCIATION, STERLING FINANCIAL CORPORATION. (Symmes, William)
                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 218 Filed: 2/14/2007, Entered: 2/14/2007
                                                                                                                                                                              Witness List, filed by USA. (Hosford, Elizabeth)
                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 217 Filed: 1/30/2007, Entered: 1/31/2007 TranscriptCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings (pages 1-9) held on January 3, 2007 before Judge Thomas C. Wheeler. (dw1)
                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 216 Filed: 1/16/2007, Entered: 1/18/2007 TranscriptCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                  TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings (pages 1-43) held on December 15, 2006 before Judge Thomas C. Wheeler. (dw1)
                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 215 Filed: 1/3/2007, Entered: 1/3/2007 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                    PRETRIAL ORDER. Signed by Judge Thomas C. Wheeler. (ck1)
                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank -- Filed: 1/3/2007, Entered: 1/4/2007 Set Deadlines/Hearings:
                                                                                                                                                                                      Set Deadlines/Hearings: Pretrial Conference set for 6/19/2007 02:00 PM before Judge Thomas C. Wheeler. Trial set for 6/25/2007 09:30 AM in Out of Town Location before Judge Thomas C. Wheeler. (dw1)
                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 214 Filed: 12/13/2006, Entered: 12/13/2006
                                                                                                                                                                                        Witness List, filed by all plaintiffs. (Symmes, William)
                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 213 Filed: 12/13/2006, Entered: 12/13/2006
                                                                                                                                                                                          Witness List, filed by USA. (Hosford, Elizabeth)
                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 212 Filed: 11/14/2006, Entered: 11/14/2006
                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE, filed by USA re: change of phone number (Hosford, Elizabeth)
                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 211 Filed: 10/4/2006, Entered: 10/4/2006 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                              TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings (pages 1-19) held on September 14, 2006 before Judge Thomas C. Wheeler. (dw1)
                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 210 Filed: 9/28/2006, Entered: 9/28/2006 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                SCHEDULING ORDER: Signed by Judge Thomas C. Wheeler. (ck1)
                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank -- Filed: 9/27/2006, Entered: 9/29/2006 Set Deadlines/Hearings:
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Set Deadlines/Hearings: Pretrial Conference set for 12/15/2006 02:00 PM before Judge Thomas C. Wheeler. Trial set for 6/25/2007 before Judge Thomas C. Wheeler. (dw1)
                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 209 Filed: 9/25/2006, Entered: 9/25/2006
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Proposed Pretrial Order re Pretrial Schedule, filed by all plaintiffs. (Symmes, William)
                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 208 Filed: 9/25/2006, Entered: 9/25/2006
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Proposed Pretrial Order suggesting pretrial schedule of events, filed by USA. (Hosford, Elizabeth)
                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 207 Filed: 9/22/2006, Entered: 9/22/2006 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER denying [206] Plaintiff's Motion for Reconsideration. Signed by Judge Thomas C. Wheeler. (ck1)
                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank -- Filed: 9/20/2006, Entered: 9/20/2006
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Set/Reset Transcript Deadlines: Transcript due by 10/16/2006. (vp1, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 206 Filed: 9/14/2006, Entered: 9/14/2006, Terminated: 9/22/2006 Motion for Reconsideration
                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION for Reconsideration, filed by STERLING SAVINGS ASSOCIATION, STERLING FINANCIAL CORPORATION.(Symmes, William)
                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 205 Filed: 9/12/2006, Entered: 9/12/2006, Terminated: 9/12/2006 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION for court reporter at 9/14/2006 status conference, filed by USA.Response due by 9/29/2006.(Hosford, Elizabeth)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank -- Filed: 9/12/2006, Entered: 9/12/2006
                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER granting [205] Motion for Miscellaneous Relief. Signed by Judge Thomas C. Wheeler. (ck1)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 204 Filed: 8/30/2006, Entered: 8/30/2006 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER granting [178] Motion for Reconsideration. Signed by Judge Thomas C. Wheeler. (ck1)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 203 Filed: 8/11/2006, Entered: 8/16/2006 TranscriptCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings (pages 1-24) held on August 7, 2006 before Judge Thomas C. Wheeler. (dw1)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 202 Filed: 8/8/2006, Entered: 8/8/2006
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE, filed by USA re: Supplement To The Record Of Defendant's Motion For Reconsideration Dated March 3, 2005 (Hosford, Elizabeth)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank -- Filed: 8/8/2006, Entered: 8/8/2006
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Set/Reset Transcript Deadlines: Transcript due by 9/7/2006. (vp1, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank -- Filed: 8/3/2006, Entered: 8/3/2006
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER granting in part and denying in part [184] Motion to Strike. The Court denies Plaintiff's Motion to Strike Defendant's Reply in Support of its Motion for Reconsideration, but grants Plaintiff's request in the alternative to consider Plaintiff's rejoinder argument contained in its Motion to Strike. Signed by Judge Thomas C. Wheeler. (ck1)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank -- Filed: 8/3/2006, Entered: 8/3/2006
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER granting [187] Motion for Leave to File Supplemental Authority (re: Hometown Financial), granting [190] Motion for Leave to File Supplemental Authority (re: Franklin Federal), and granting [197] Motion for Status Conference. The parties are requested to be available for a telephonic status conference on Monday, August 7 at 2:00 PM (Eastern). Signed by Judge Thomas C. Wheeler. (ck1)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 201 Filed: 7/21/2006, Entered: 7/21/2006 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings (1-25) held on June 21, 2006 before Judge Thomas C. Wheeler. (dw1)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 200 Filed: 7/7/2006, Entered: 7/7/2006
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Designation of Electronic Case. (mb2, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 199 Filed: 7/7/2006, Entered: 7/7/2006 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER directing the Clerk to designate this case as an electronic (ECF) case. All future filings will be in electronic form. Signed by Judge Thomas C. Wheeler. (mb2, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank -- Filed: 6/22/2006, Entered: 6/22/2006
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Set/Reset Transcript Deadlines: Transcript due by 7/21/2006. (vp1, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 198 Filed: 6/16/2006, Entered: 6/19/2006 Status Conference OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      STATUS CONFERENCE ORDER: Status Conference set for 6/21/2006 at 3:00 PM before Judge Thomas C. Wheeler. Signed by Judge Thomas C. Wheeler. (mb2, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 197 Filed: 6/15/2006, Entered: 6/16/2006 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION for Status Conference , filed by USA. Service: 6/15/2006.Response due by 7/3/2006.(mb2, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 196 Filed: 6/1/2006, Entered: 6/8/2006 Notice of ReassignmentCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Reassignment. Case reassigned to Judge Thomas C. Wheeler for all further proceedings. (mb2, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 195 Filed: 6/1/2006, Entered: 6/8/2006 Order Transferring CaseCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE to Judge Thomas C. Wheeler. Signed by Judge Victor J. Wolski. (mb2, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 194 Filed: 6/1/2006, Entered: 6/8/2006 Notice of ReassignmentCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Reassignment. Case reassigned to Judge Thomas C. Wheeler for all further proceedings. Judge Victor J. Wolski no longer assigned to the case. (mb2, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 193 Filed: 6/1/2006, Entered: 6/8/2006 Order Transferring CaseCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE to Judge Thomas C. Wheeler. Signed by Judge Victor J. Wolski. (mb2, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 192 Filed: 2/24/2006, Entered: 2/28/2006 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  REPLY to Response to Motion re [190] MOTION for Leave to File Supplemental Authority (Franklin Federal) , filed by USA. Service: 2/24/2006.(mb2, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 191 Filed: 2/13/2006, Entered: 2/16/2006 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    RESPONSE to [190] MOTION for Leave to File Supplemental Authority (Franklin Federal) , filed by STERLING SAVINGS ASSOCIATION, STERLING FINANCIAL CORPORATION. Reply due by 2/27/2006. Service: 2/10/2006.(mb2, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 190 Filed: 1/26/2006, Entered: 1/30/2006 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION for Leave to File Supplemental Authority (Franklin Federal) , filed by USA. Service: 1/26/2006. Response due by 2/13/2006. (mb2, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 189 Filed: 12/8/2005, Entered: 12/13/2005 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        REPLY to Response to Motion re [187] MOTION for Leave to File Supplemental Authority , filed by USA. Service: 12/8/2005.(mb2, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 188 Filed: 11/28/2005, Entered: 12/1/2005 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          RESPONSE to [187] MOTION for Leave to File Supplemental Authority , filed by STERLING SAVINGS ASSOCIATION, STERLING FINANCIAL CORPORATION. Reply due by 12/9/2005. Service: 11/25/2005.(mb2, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 187 Filed: 11/9/2005, Entered: 11/14/2005 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION for Leave to File Supplemental Authority , filed by USA. Service: 11/9/2005. Response due by 11/28/2005. (mb2, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 186 Filed: 8/19/2005, Entered: 8/23/2005 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Appearance by Elizabeth Marie Hosford for USA. Service: 8/19/2005.(mb2, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank -- Filed: 4/6/2005, Entered: 4/6/2005
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                TRANSCRIPT (Pg 1-141) of Proceedings held on 3/31/05 before Judge Victor J. Wolski. (eph, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 185 Filed: 4/5/2005, Entered: 4/7/2005 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  RESPONSE to [184] MOTION to Strike [181] Reply to Response to Motion, filed by USA. Reply due by 4/11/2005. Service: 3/30/2005.(mb2, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 184 Filed: 4/5/2005, Entered: 4/7/2005 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION to Strike [181] Reply to Response to Motion, filed by STERLING SAVINGS ASSOCIATION, STERLING FINANCIAL CORPORATION. Service: 3/28/2005. Response due by 4/22/2005. (mb2, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 183 Filed: 4/5/2005, Entered: 4/7/2005 Order on Motion For Leave to File.Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER granting [182] Motion for Leave to File Motion to Strike the Government's Reply in Support of its Motion for Reconsideration of the Court's September 12, 2002, Liability Decision. Signed by Judge Victor J. Wolski. (mb2, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 182 Filed: 3/30/2005, Entered: 4/4/2005, Terminated: 4/5/2005 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION for Leave to File Motion to Strike the Government's Reply in Support of its Motion for Reconsideration of the Court's September 12, 2002, Liability Decision filed by STERLING SAVINGS ASSOCIATION, STERLING FINANCIAL CORPORATION.Service: 3/28/2005. Response due by 4/14/2005. (mb2, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 181 Filed: 3/24/2005, Entered: 3/29/2005 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          REPLY to Response to Motion re [178] MOTION for Reconsideration re [103] Published Decision, filed by USA. Service: 3/24/2005.(mb2, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 180 Filed: 3/18/2005, Entered: 3/23/2005 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            RESPONSE (with separate appendix and appendix under seal) to [178] MOTION for Reconsideration re [103] Published Decision, filed by STERLING SAVINGS ASSOCIATION, STERLING FINANCIAL CORPORATION. Reply due by 3/24/2005. Service: 3/17/2005.(mb2, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank -- Filed: 3/15/2005, Entered: 3/15/2005
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 2/17/05 before Judge Victor J. Wolski. (eph, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 178 Filed: 3/3/2005, Entered: 3/8/2005, Terminated: 8/30/2006 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION for Reconsideration re [103] Published Decision, filed by USA.Service: 3/3/2005. Response due by 3/21/2005. (mb2, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 179 Filed: 3/1/2005, Entered: 3/23/2005 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Appearance by Tarek Sawi for USA. Service: 3/1/05.(jat, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank -- Filed: 2/24/2005, Entered: 2/24/2005
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Set/Reset Transcript Deadlines: Transcript due by 3/17/2005. (vp1, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 177 Filed: 2/18/2005, Entered: 2/22/2005 Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      SCHEDULING ORDER: Motion due by 3/3/2005. Response due by 3/18/2005. Reply due by 3/24/2005. Oral Argument set for 3/31/2005 at 09:30 AM in National Courts Building before Judge Victor J. Wolski. Signed by Judge Victor J. Wolski. (mb2, ) Modified on 2/22/2005 (mb2, ).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 176 Filed: 2/16/2005, Entered: 2/18/2005 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous ReliefCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER denying as moot [175] Motion for Assignment of a Court Reporter. Signed by Judge Victor J. Wolski. (mb2, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 175 Filed: 2/15/2005, Entered: 2/17/2005, Terminated: 2/16/2005 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION Assignment of a Court Reporter by USA.Service: 2/15/2005. Response due by 3/4/2005. (mb2, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 174 Filed: 2/4/2005, Entered: 2/7/2005 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Appearance by Elizabeth Marie Hosford for USA. Service: 02/04/05.(mb2, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 173 Filed: 2/4/2005, Entered: 2/7/2005 Status Conference OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              STATUS CONFERENCE ORDER: Status Conference set for 2/17/2005 at 02:00 PM before Judge Victor J. Wolski. Signed by Judge Victor J. Wolski. (mb2, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 172 Filed: 1/31/2005, Entered: 2/1/2005 Published OpinionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                PUBLISHED Memorandum OPINION and Order on [171] MOTION to Compel filed by USA, [162] MOTION for Recusal filed by USA. Signed by Judge Victor J. Wolski. (mb2, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 171 Filed: 1/26/2005, Entered: 1/28/2005 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION for a Decision Regarding Our Pending Motion to Recuse by USA.Service: 01/26/05. Response due by 2/14/2005 (mb2, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 170 Filed: 8/25/2004, Entered: 8/25/2004
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    OPPOSITION to [168] Pltf's MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response Brief to [166] Dft's MOTION for Summary Judgment Regarding Damages, until 10/19/2004, filed by USA. [FILED BY LEAVE OF THE JUDGE] Reply due by 9/7/2004. Service: 8/23/2004.(jcp, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 169 Filed: 8/10/2004, Entered: 8/12/2004 Order on Motion For Leave to File.Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER: granting [167] Pltfs' Motion for Leave to File Pltf's Motion for an Enlargement of Time. The Court hereby ORDERS a stay of the briefing on dft's motion for summary judgment regarding damages, pending the Court's determination of the dft's motion to recuse. [168] Pltfs' Motion for Extension of Time to File Response Brief is DENIED as moot. Signed by Judge Victor J. Wolski. (jcp, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 168 Filed: 8/10/2004, Entered: 8/12/2004 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response Brief to [166] Dft's MOTION for Summary Judgment Regarding Damages, until 10/19/2004, by STERLING FINANCIAL CORPORATION, STERLING SAVINGS ASSOCIATION. [FILED BY LEAVE OF THE JUDGE]Service: 8/4/2004. Response due by 8/23/2004.(jcp, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 167 Filed: 8/5/2004, Entered: 8/10/2004, Terminated: 8/10/2004 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION for Leave to File motion for an enlargement of time by STERLING FINANCIAL CORPORATION, STERLING SAVINGS ASSOCIATION.Service: 8/4/2004. Response due by 8/23/2004 (hw1, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 166 Filed: 7/23/2004, Entered: 7/28/2004 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION for Summary Judgment Regarding Damages, Together with Two (2) Separately Bound Appendix Volumes (Red Covers), by USA. [FILED BY LEAVE OF THE JUDGE]Service: 7/20/2004. Response due by 8/20/2004. (jcp, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 165 Filed: 7/23/2004, Entered: 7/28/2004 Proposed Findings of Uncontroverted Fact
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              PROPOSED FINDINGS of Uncontroverted Fact in Connection With Motion for Summary Judgment Regarding Damages, by USA. [FILED BY LEAVE OF THE JUDGE] Service: 7/20/2004.(jcp, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 164 Filed: 3/1/2004, Entered: 3/3/2004 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                REPLY to Pltf's Opposition to [162] Dft's MOTION for Recusal filed by USA. Service: 3/1/2004.(jcp, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 163 Filed: 2/19/2004, Entered: 2/26/2004 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  OPPOSITION to [162] Dft's MOTION for Recusal, Together with Separately Bound Appendix Volume filed by STERLING FINANCIAL CORPORATION, STERLING SAVINGS ASSOCIATION. Reply due by 3/3/2004. Service: 2/18/2004.(jcp, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 162 Filed: 2/2/2004, Entered: 2/5/2004 Terminated: Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION for Recusal of the Assigned Judge, Together with Separately Bound Appendix Volume by USA.Service: 2/2/2004. Response due by 2/19/2004. (jcp, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 161 Filed: 2/2/2004, Entered: 2/5/2004 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Appearance by David Maurice Cohen for USA. Service: 2/2/2004.(jcp, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 160 Filed: 1/27/2004, Entered: 2/2/2004 Order Returning Document UnfiledCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER RETURNING: On 1/20/2004, the clerk's office received a document from dft entitled "Dft's Consolidated Motion to Recuse," and an accompanying appendix. These documents were not filed by the clerk's office due to dft's failure to follow the rules of this Court. First, the documents contain captions of three separate cases-- 93-162C, 95-468C, and 95-829C. But these cases have not been consolidated under Rules 42 or 42.1 of the RCFC. Second, the dft's motion was not signed by, or in the name of, the attorney of record in each case, as is required by RCFC Rules 11 and 83.1(c). For these reasons, the Clerk of the Court is instructed to return the documents to the dft for correction of these defects. Signed by Judge Victor J. Wolski. (jcp, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 159 Filed: 12/17/2003, Entered: 12/23/2003 Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          SCHEDULING ORDER: 1) On or before 1/9/2004, pltfs shall deliver to dft their supplemental expert reports. 2) On or before 2/9/2004, dft shall identify any experts. 3) Dft may conduct discovery related to the changes to pltfs' expert reports, including the depositions of Drs. james and Horvitz, through 3/9/2004. 4) On or before 4/23/2004, dft shall deliver to pltfs its expert reports. 5) Pltfs shall have until and including 6/7/2004 to depose dft's experts. 6) Dft shall file its Motion for summary judgment upon damages on or by 7/20/2004. Signed by Judge Victor J. Wolski. (jcp, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 158 Filed: 12/2/2003, Entered: 12/5/2003 ERRATA
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ERRATA to [155] Pltfs' Brief Re: Amending Damage Expert Reports Pursuant to the Court's November 10, 2003 Order filed by STERLING SAVINGS ASSOCIATION, STERLING FINANCIAL CORPORATION. [FILED BY LEAVE OF THE JUDGE] (jcp, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 157 Filed: 12/2/2003, Entered: 12/5/2003 Order on Motion for Status ConferenceCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER: The Court has no fiduciary or other interest in this or any savings and loan case, nor does the Court have any financial interest in its previous employer. There is nothing about the Court's prior employment that would create the appearance of partiality to any reasonable person. The [154] Dft's Motion for Status Conference is DENIED. Signed by Judge Victor J. Wolski. (jcp, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 156 Filed: 12/2/2003, Entered: 12/5/2003 Response
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                RESPONSE to [153] Court's Scheduling Order Dated 11/10/2003, and OPPOSITION to [155] Pltfs' Brief Re: Amending Damage Expert Report Pursuant to the Court's 11/10/2003 Order, filed by USA. Service: 12/2/03.(jcp, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 155 Filed: 11/25/2003, Entered: 12/3/2003 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  BRIEF Re: Amending Damage Expert Reports Pursuant to the Court's [153] 11/10/2003 Scheduling Order by all plaintiffs. [FILED BY LEAVE OF THE JUDGE] Service: 11/20/03.(jcp, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 154 Filed: 11/21/2003, Entered: 11/26/2003, Terminated: 12/2/2003 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION for Status Conference to Obtain Further Information With Respect to the Court's Involvement in Winstar-Related Matters Prior to Appointment to the Bench, by USA.Service: 11/21/03. Response due by 12/8/2003. (jcp, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 152 Filed: 11/12/2003, Entered: 11/13/2003 TranscriptCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on November 10, 2003 before Judge Victor J. Wolski. (hw1, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 153 Filed: 11/10/2003, Entered: 11/17/2003 Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        SCHEDULING ORDER: Pltf's shall submit a Brief no later than 11/20/2003, and dft shall submit a Response no later than 12/2/2003. Finally, to the extent that ptlfs requested, in the joint status report filed on 7/24/2003, that a trial on damages be bifurcated between their primary and fall-back theories, based on pltfs' counsel's comments at the status conference and for good cause shown, pltfs' request is hereby DENIED. Signed by Judge Victor J. Wolski. (jcp, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank -- Filed: 11/10/2003, Entered: 11/10/2003
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Set/Reset Transcript Deadlines: Transcript due by 12/10/2003. (vp1, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank -- Filed: 11/10/2003, Entered: 11/10/2003
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Victor J. Wolski: Status Conference held on 11/10/03 in Courtroom 8, Room 512. (jp1, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 151 Filed: 10/17/2003, Entered: 10/22/2003 Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              SCHEDULING ORDER:The court hereby schedules a Status Conference on Monday, 11/10/2003 10:30 AM in National Courts Building before Judge Victor J. Wolski. If the parties wish to update the Joint Status Report filed on 7/24/03, they should both file a Joint Status Report with the court no later than Wednesday, 11/5/2003. Signed by Judge Victor J. Wolski. (jcp, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 150 Filed: 9/26/2003, Entered: 10/6/2003 Status Conference OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                STATUS CONFERENCE ORDER: Status Conference set for 10/15/2003 10:30 AM in National Courts Building before Judge Victor J. Wolski. Signed by Judge Victor J. Wolski. (vro, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 148 Filed: 8/15/2003, Entered: 8/15/2003 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Reassignment to Judge Victor Wolski. (jcp, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 147 Filed: 8/15/2003, Entered: 8/15/2003 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Pursuant to Rule 40.1(c) of the RCFC, which permits the Chief Judge to reassign any cases if necessary for the efficient administration of justice, the Clerk of the Court is directed to reassign the above captioned case to Judge Victor Wolski. Judge Edward J. Damich no longer assigned to case. Signed by Judge Edward J. Damich. (jcp, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 149 Filed: 8/13/2003, Entered: 8/18/2003 Order on Motion to Amend/CorrectCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER granting [146] Dft's Unopposed Motion to Amend Mutually Agreeable Dates for the Status Conference to September 4 and 5, and granting [146] Dft's Unopposed Motion for Leave to File the Joint Status Report With the Original Signature Page to Replace the Facsimile Signature Page Included in the Status Report Filed on July 21, 2003. Signed by Judge Edward J. Damich. (jcp, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 146 Filed: 8/5/2003, Entered: 8/7/2003, Terminated: 8/13/2003 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION for Leave to File Original Signature Page to Replace Facsimile Signature Page and MOTION to Amend Mutually Agreeable Dates for Status Conference by USA.Service: 8/5/03. Response due by 8/22/2003.(jcp, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 145 Filed: 8/4/2003, Entered: 8/6/2003 Published OpinionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          PUBLISHED OPINION - REISSUED FOR PUBLICATION (Original opinion filed under seal July 11, 2003): For the reasons stated, the Court GRANTS Dft's Cross-Motion for Partial Summary Judgment on the issue of amortization of goodwill associated with FSLIC cash assistance. The goodwill associated with this assistance was to amortize according to the terms of the SM-2 forbearance. Thus, Pltf's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment with respect to this issue is DENIED.Signed by Judge Edward J. Damich. (jcp, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 144 Filed: 7/30/2003, Entered: 7/31/2003 Response to MotionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            STATEMENT OF NON-OPPOSITION to [141] MOTION for Leave to File Joint Status Report With a Facsimile Signature filed by STERLING FINANCIAL CORPORATION, STERLING SAVINGS ASSOCIATION, Filed by Leave of the Judge. Service: 7/23/03.(jcp, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 143 Filed: 7/24/2003, Entered: 7/24/2003
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              JOINT STATUS REPORT by all parties, Filed per Order of 7/24/03. Service: 7/21/03.(jcp, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 142 Filed: 7/24/2003, Entered: 7/24/2003 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER granting [141] Dft's Motion for Leave to File Joint Status Report With a Facsimile Signature. Signed by Judge Nancy B. Firestone. (jcp, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 141 Filed: 7/21/2003, Entered: 7/22/2003, Terminated: 7/24/2003 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION for Leave to File Joint Status Report With a Facsimile Signature by UNITED STATES.Service: 7/21/03. Response due by 8/7/2003.(jcp, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Sealed Legal Document 140 Filed: 7/11/2003, Entered: 7/15/2003 Sealed OpinionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    SEALED OPINION AND ORDER: For the reasons stated, the Court GRANTS [24] Dft's Cross Motion for Partial Summary Judgment on the issue of the amortization of goodwill associated with FSLIC cash assistance. The goodwill associated with this assistance was to be amortized according to the terms of the SM-2 forbearance. Thus, [20] Pltf's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment with respect to this issue is DENIED. The parties are ORDERED to file, within 10 days of the filing of this opinion, a joint status report as to future proceedings in this case and are to include three mutually agreeable dates for a status conference. Some of the information contained herein may be subject to a protective order. The opinion shall be filed under seal until the parties review the opinion to see if any information should be redacted prior to publication in accordance with the terms of the protective order. The parties shall also file a joint report indicating any such information that should be redacted within 10 days of the filing of this opinion.Signed by Judge Edward J. Damich. (jcp, ) Modified on 8/6/2003 (jcp, ).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 139 Filed: 7/9/2003, Entered: 7/11/2003 Published OpinionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      PUBLISHED OPINION: Sterling has standing to assert its claim for damages because it has demonstrated that, as a party to the breached agreement at issue, it has suffered a concrete injury-in-fact; this injury is causally connected to Dft's conduct; and Sterling's injury could be redressed by a favorable decision on damages. The Government's argument, while it may be relevant to the calculation of damages, has no bearing on Sterling's standing to assert a claim for damages. For the reasons stated herein, Dft's Cross-Motion for Partial Summary Judgment on this issue is DENIED.Signed by Judge Edward J. Damich. (jcp, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 138 Filed: 4/16/2003, Entered: 4/23/2003 Supplemental Brief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEF pursuant to Court's March 27, 2003 Order (together with separate appendix). Service: 4/15/03.(hw1, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 137 Filed: 4/9/2003, Entered: 4/15/2003 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          REPLY to Response to [135] MOTION for Extension of Time until 4/16/03 to file supplemental brief filed by STERLING FINANCIAL CORPORATION. Service: 4/8/03.(lrd)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 136 Filed: 4/8/2003, Entered: 4/14/2003 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            RESPONSE to [135] MOTION for Extension of Time until 4/16/03 to file supplemental brief, filed by The United States. Reply due 4/22/2003. Service: 4/8/03. (lrd)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 135 Filed: 4/8/2003, Entered: 4/14/2003 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION for Extension of Time until 4/16/03 to file supplemental brief, by STERLING FINANCIAL CORPORATION and STERLING SAVINGS ASSOCIATION.Service: 4/5/03. Response due 4/25/2003. (lrd)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 134 Filed: 4/8/2003, Entered: 4/14/2003 Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                SCHEDULING ORDER: Plainitff's brief due 4/16/2003. Signed by Judge Edward J. Damich. (lrd)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 133 Filed: 4/7/2003, Entered: 4/10/2003 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION for Leave to File Motion for Enlargement of Time by STERLING FINANCIAL CORPORATION and STERLING SAVINGS ASSOCIATION.Service: 4/5/03. Response due by 4/24/2003. (dw1, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 132 Filed: 4/4/2003, Entered: 4/9/2003 Supplemental Brief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEF re: Federal Circuit's En Banc Decision in Coast Federal Bank, etc., filed with a (1) one volume appendix in support. Service: 4/4/03.(dw1, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 131 Filed: 3/27/2003, Entered: 4/3/2003 Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      SCHEDULING ORDER: Defendant's brief due 4/4/2003 and Plaintiff's brief due 4/11/2003. Signed by Judge Edward J. Damich. (lrd)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 130 Filed: 3/24/2003, Entered: 3/24/2003 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings (one volume, no exhibits) held on 2/26/03, in Washington, D.C. before Judge Edward J. Damich. (hw1, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 129 Filed: 2/20/2003, Entered: 2/26/2003 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of order granting petition for rehearing en banc in Coast Federal Bank v. United States by USA. Service: 2/20/03. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 128 Filed: 2/19/2003, Entered: 2/26/2003 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER Oral argument set for 2:00 p.m. on 3/12/03 (signed by Chief Judge Edward J. Damich). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 127 Filed: 1/24/2003, Entered: 2/3/2003 Response
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEF, with appendix, by USA with respect to the amortization of offsetting goodwill associated with FCLIC assistance. Service: 1/24/03. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 126 Filed: 1/14/2003, Entered: 1/22/2003 Response
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                SUPPLEMENTAL RESPONSE, with appendix, by STERLING SAVINGS pursuant to [125-1] order. Service: 1/3/03 (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 125 Filed: 1/8/2003, Entered: 1/11/2003 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER directing the Clerk to return, unfiled plaintiffs' filing of its Supplemental Response on Whether it Contracted for permanent Regulatory Capitol for correction of defects. The corrected filings by 1/16/03 ( signed by Chief Judge Edward J. Damich ) Copy to parties. (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 124 Filed: 1/8/2003, Entered: 1/8/2003
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    TRANSCRIPT of proceedings re: 1 volume, at Washington, D.C., for date of December 12, 2002. Notice to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 123 Filed: 12/16/2002, Entered: 12/18/2002 ~Notice (other)Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of filing of supplemental brief, with appendix, with respect to the amortization of offsetting goodwill associated with FSLIC assistance by USA. Service: 12/9/02. Filed by leave of Judge. (LTD) Modified on 12/18/2002
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 122 Filed: 12/16/2002, Entered: 12/18/2002 Proposed Findings of Uncontroverted FactCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        SUPPLEMENTAL PROPOSED FINDINGS of Uncontroverted Fact by USA. Service: 12/9/02. Filed by leave of the Judge. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 121 Filed: 12/16/2002, Entered: 12/18/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER to file Defendant's motion and accompanying documents (signed by Chief Judge Edward J. Damich). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 120 Filed: 12/16/2002, Entered: 12/18/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER Plaintiff's response to Defendant's brief due 1/6/03 , and Defendant's reply brief due 1/24/03 (signed by Chief Judge Edward J. Damich). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 119 Filed: 12/3/2002, Entered: 12/6/2002 Response
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              RESPONSE by USA Pursuant to [114-4] order. Service: 12/3/02 (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 118 Filed: 11/22/2002, Entered: 11/25/2002 Status Report
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                JOINT STATUS REPORT. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 117 Filed: 11/15/2002, Entered: 11/19/2002 Unpublished DecisionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  UNPUBLISHED DECISION granting [109-1] motion for Clarification regarding damages resulting from the Government's cancellation of the 1989 preferred stock offering (signed by Chief Judge Edward J. Damich). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 116 Filed: 11/12/2002, Entered: 11/13/2002 Transcript
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    TRANSCRIPT of proceedings re: 1 volume, at Washington, D.C., for date of October 15, 2002. Notice to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 115 Filed: 10/31/2002, Entered: 11/4/2002 Reply to Response to MotionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      REPLY by STERLING SAVINGS to response to [109-1] motion for Clarification regarding damages resulting from the Government's cancellation of the 1989 preferred stock offering. Service: 10/23/02. Filed by leave of the Judge. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 114 Filed: 10/17/2002, Entered: 10/21/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER denying [92-1] motion to strike the declaration of Joe A. Hargett, denying as moot [110-1] motion for Leave to file citation of supplemental authorities in support of motion for partial summary judgment and motion to strike declaration of Joe A. Hargett. Set deadline of 12/9/02 for Defendant's supplemental brief addressing whether the SFLIC's cash contributions in connection with the Tri-Cities and Lewis acquisitions were to be recordered as an asset on a permanent basis or whether they were to be amortized ; set deadline of 12/23/02 for Plaintiffs' response ; Defendant shall have 7 days after service of Plaintiffs' response to file a reply; and set deadline of 10/25/02 for Plaintiffs to file a supplemental brief on whether Plaintiffs lack standing in this case due to the issuance of an injunctiton in the district court proceeding in the Eastern District of Washington. ( signed by Chief Judge Edward J. Damich ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 113 Filed: 10/17/2002, Entered: 10/21/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER re: the Order filed in the above-captioned case on 10/16/02 is hereby withdrawn. ( signed by Chief Judge Edward J. Damich ) Copy to parties. (JT) Modified on 10/21/2002
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 112 Filed: 10/17/2002, Entered: 10/21/2002 ~Notice (other)Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Citation of Supplemental Authorities in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Partial Summary Judgment and Motion to Strike the Declaration of Joe A. Hargett by STERLING SAVINGS, STERLING FINANCIAL. Filed by leave of the Judge. Service: 10/10/02 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 111 Filed: 10/15/2002, Entered: 10/17/2002 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              RESPONSE by USA (Service: 10/15/02 ) to [109-1] motion for Clarification regarding damages resulting from the Government's cancellation of the 1989 preferred stock offering. Reply due: 11/1/02 (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 110 Filed: 10/11/2002, Entered: 10/16/2002 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION by STERLING SAVINGS (Service: 10/10/02) for Leave to file citation of supplemental authorities in support of motion for partial summary judgment and motion to strike declaration of Joe A. Hargett . Response due: 10/28/02. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 109 Filed: 10/4/2002, Entered: 10/9/2002 Terminated: Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION by STERLING SAVINGS, STERLING FINANCIAL (Service : 9/25/02 ) for Clarification regarding damages resulting from the Government's cancellation of the 1989 preferred stock offering. Filed by leave of the Judge. Response due: 10/15/02 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 108 Filed: 10/2/2002, Entered: 10/8/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER setting Status Conference for 2:30 p.m. on 10/15/02 (signed by Chief Judge Edward J. Damich). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 107 Filed: 10/1/2002, Entered: 10/8/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER granting [104-1] motion to Extend Time to complete discovery and file status report Discovery deadline to 11/8/02 , and Status Report deadline to 11/22/02 ( signed by Chief Judge Edward J. Damich ) Copy to parties. (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 106 Filed: 9/25/2002, Entered: 9/30/2002 Status Report
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        JOINT STATUS REPORT. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 105 Filed: 9/16/2002, Entered: 9/19/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER granting [102-1] motion to Take Deposition of Newly Disclosed Individual by 9/27/02 (signed by Chief Judge Edward J. Damich). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 103 Filed: 9/12/2002, Entered: 9/13/2002 Published DecisionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            PUBLISHED DECISION granting [20-1] motion for partial Summary Judgment re: liability; granting in part, denying in part [24-1] cross motion; and directing parties to file a joint status report by 9/26/02 . ( signed by Chief Judge Edward J. Damich ). Copy to parties. (DS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 104 Filed: 9/11/2002, Entered: 9/16/2002, Terminated: 10/1/2002 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              JOINT MOTION by STERLING SAVINGS, STERLING FINANCIAL, USA to Extend Time to complete discovery and file status report [until November 8, 2002 and November 22, 2002]. (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 102 Filed: 9/4/2002, Entered: 9/6/2002, Terminated: 9/16/2002 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION by USA (Service : 9/4/02 ) to Take Deposition of Newly Disclosed Individual. Response due: 9/23/02 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 101 Filed: 7/23/2002, Entered: 7/26/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER granting [100-1] joint motion to Extend Time to complete discovery, granting [100-2] joint motion to Extend Time to file status report Discovery deadline is 9/20/02 , and Joint Status Report due 9/27/02 (signed by Chief Judge Edward J. Damich). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 100 Filed: 7/19/2002, Entered: 7/22/2002, Terminated: 7/23/2002 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    JOINT MOTION to Extend Time to complete discovery until 9/20/02 and to Extend Time to file status report until 9/27/02. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 99 Filed: 7/3/2002, Entered: 7/3/2002
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      TRANSCRIPT of proceedings re: 1 volume, at Washington, D.C., for date of June 18, 2002. Notice to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank -- Filed: 6/18/2002, Entered: 9/5/2002 Oral Argument
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Oral Argument re: [67-1] cross motion by USA, [20-1] motion for partial Summary Judgment re: liability by STERLING SAVINGS, [24-1] cross motion by USA (DS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 98 Filed: 5/14/2002, Entered: 5/15/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER oral argument set for 10:00 a.m. on 6/18/02 for [67-1] cross motion, [24-1] cross motion, and [20-1] motion for partial Summary Judgment re: liability (signed by Chief Judge Edward J. Damich). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 97 Filed: 4/3/2002, Entered: 4/4/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER oral argument set for 10:00 a.m. on 6/13/02 for [67-1] cross motion, [24-1] cross motion, [20-1] motion for partial Summary Judgment re: liability (signed by Judge Edward J. Damich). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 96 Filed: 3/20/2002, Entered: 3/21/2002 Transcript
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              TRANSCRIPT of proceedings re: status conference, 1 volume, at Washington, D.C., for date of February 26, 2002. Notice to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 95 Filed: 2/27/2002, Entered: 2/28/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER re: Draft Pre-trial Order (signed by Judge Edward J. Damich). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 94 Filed: 2/26/2002, Entered: 2/27/2002 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  REPLY by STERLING SAVINGS, STERLING FINANCIAL to response to [92-1] motion to strike the declaration of Joe A. Hargett filed [by leave of the judge]. Service: 4/26/01 (DS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 93 Filed: 2/26/2002, Entered: 2/27/2002 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    RESPONSE by USA (Service: 4/5/01) to [92-1] motion to strike the declaration of Joe A. Hargett filed [by leave of the judge]. (DS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 92 Filed: 2/26/2002, Entered: 2/27/2002, Terminated: 10/17/2002 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION, together with a separate volume of appendix, by STERLING SAVINGS, STERLING FINANCIAL (Service: 2/26/01) to strike the declaration of Joe A. Hargett . (DS) Modified on 02/27/2002
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 91 Filed: 2/26/2002, Entered: 2/27/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER granting [76-1] motion for Leave to file motion to strike the declaration of Joe A. Hargett and surreply; directing the Clerk to file the motion to strike and all subsequent briefing; directing the Clerk to file defendant's motion for enlargement of time received on March 2, 2001, and plaintiffs' motion for enlargement of time received on April 13, 2001; granting [89-1] motion to Extend Time to respond to motion for leave to file motion to strike, etc., granting [90-1] motion to Extend Time to reply to opposition to motion to strike, etc.; directing parties to complete all outstanding fact and expert discovery by 7/22/02 ; and directing parties to file a joint status report by 7/29/02 . ( signed by Judge Edward J. Damich ) Copy to parties. (DS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 90 Filed: 2/26/2002, Entered: 2/27/2002 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION by STERLING SAVINGS, STERLING FINANCIAL (Service: 4/11/01) to Extend Time to reply to opposition to motion to strike, etc. filed [by leave of the judge]. (DS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 89 Filed: 2/26/2002, Entered: 2/27/2002 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION by USA (Service: 3/2/01) to Extend Time to respond to motion for leave to file motion to strike, etc. filed [by leave of the judge]. (DS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank -- Filed: 2/26/2002, Entered: 2/27/2002 Status Conference
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Status Conference held ( Transcript due 3/28/02 ) (DS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 88 Filed: 2/22/2002, Entered: 2/25/2002 Status Report
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                JOINT STATUS REPORT by STERLING SAVINGS, STERLING FINANCIAL and USA. Service: 2/22/02. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 87 Filed: 2/13/2002, Entered: 2/13/2002 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER setting Status Conference for 10:00 a.m. on 2/26/02 , and Joint Status Report due 2/22/02 (signed by Judge J. Damich). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank -- Filed: 2/1/2002, Entered: 2/1/2002
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    CASE reassigned to Judge Edward J. Damich . (DS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 86 Filed: 1/11/2002, Entered: 1/11/2002 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Notice of reassignment to Judge Edward J. Damich, effective February 1, 2002. Copy to parties. (DS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 85 Filed: 1/7/2002, Entered: 1/8/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER re: reassignment of cases. ( signed by Sr. Judge Loren A. Smith ) Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 84 Filed: 5/9/2001, Entered: 5/10/2001 Remark
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Defendant's notice of filing Joint Status Report with original signature. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 83 Filed: 3/26/2001, Entered: 3/27/2001 Status Report
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            JOINT STATUS REPORT by STERLING SAVINGS and USA. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 82 Filed: 3/26/2001, Entered: 3/27/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER granting [81-1] motion for Leave to file joint status report with telecopied signature (signed by Judge Robert H. Hodges). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 81 Filed: 3/23/2001, Entered: 3/26/2001, Terminated: 3/26/2001 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION by USA (Service: 3/23/01) for Leave to file joint status report with telecopied signature . Response due: 4/9/01. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 80 Filed: 3/15/2001, Entered: 3/15/2001 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER granting [79-1] motion to Extend Time to respond to the Court's order dated March 6, 2001 by 3/23/01 ( signed by Judge Robert H. Hodges). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 79 Filed: 3/14/2001, Entered: 3/15/2001, Terminated: 3/15/2001 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    AMENDED MOTION by USA (Service: 3/14/01) to Extend Time to respond to the Court's order dated March 6, 2001 , (until March 23, 2001). (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 78 Filed: 3/13/2001, Entered: 3/14/2001 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION by USA (Service: 3/13/01) to Extend Time to respond to the Court's Order dated March 6, 2001 , (until March 23, 2001). (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 77 Filed: 3/6/2001, Entered: 3/7/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER re: The parties will contact the Court before March 14, 2001, to determine whether further action by the Court is needed in this matter (signed by Judge Robert H. Hodges ). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 76 Filed: 2/27/2001, Entered: 2/27/2001, Terminated: 2/26/2002 Motion for Leave to File
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION by STERLING SAVINGS and STERLING FINANCIAL (Service : 2/26/01) for Leave to file motion to strike the declaration of Joe A. Hargett and surreply regarding the permanency and non-amortization of the FSLIC assistance. Response due: 3/15/01. (FE) Modified on 02/27/2002
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 75 Filed: 2/2/2001, Entered: 2/5/2001 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            REPLY, together with a separate volume of appendix, by USA to response to [67-1] [supplement to] cross motion filed [by leave of the judge]. Service: 1/16/01 (DS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 74 Filed: 1/12/2001, Entered: 1/17/2001 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              RESPONSE,together with two volumes of appendix, by STERLING SAVINGS, STERLING FINANCIAL (Service: 12/16/00 ) to [67-1] [supplement to] cross motion filed [by leave of the judge]. Reply due: 1/16/01 (DS) Modified on 01/17/2001
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 73 Filed: 1/12/2001, Entered: 1/16/2001 ~Notice (other)Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ERRATA to plaintiff's supplemental memorandum, etc. by STERLING SAVINGS, STERLING FINANCIAL, filed by leave of the Judge. Service: 12/26/00. (HW) Modified on 01/17/2001
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 72 Filed: 11/9/2000, Entered: 11/13/2000 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER re: Defendant's law enforcement privilege claims. ( signed by Judge Robert H. Hodges ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 71 Filed: 11/7/2000, Entered: 11/9/2000 ResponseCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    RESPONSE by USA to [70-1] memorandum by STERLING FINANCIAL, STERLING SAVINGS. Filed by leave of the Judge. Service: 11/6/00 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 70 Filed: 10/23/2000, Entered: 10/25/2000 Memorandum
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      OBJECTION by STERLING SAVINGS, STERLING FINANCIAL re: Defendant's untimely filing of affidavits. Service: 10/18/00 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 69 Filed: 10/23/2000, Entered: 10/25/2000 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER granting [66-1] motion for Leave to File response to Defendant's untimely filing of affidavits in support of the law enforcement privilege and the Defendant's additional claims of privilege not previously claimed. ( signed by Judge John P. Wiese for Judge Robert H. Hodges ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 68 Filed: 10/19/2000, Entered: 10/24/2000 Proposed Findings of Uncontroverted FactCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          PROPOSED FINDINGS of Uncontroverted Fact by USA. Filed by leave of the Judge. Service: 10/10/00 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 67 Filed: 10/19/2000, Entered: 1/17/2001 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            [SUPPLEMENT to] CROSS MOTION, together with a separate volume of appendix, by USA ( Service: 10/10/00 ) and RESPONSE to [20-1] motion for partial Summary Judgment re: liability by STERLING SAVINGS filed [by leave of the judge].(DS) Modified on 01/17/2001
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 66 Filed: 10/19/2000, Entered: 10/24/2000, Terminated: 10/23/2000 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION by STERLING SAVINGS, STERLING FINANCIAL (Service : 10/18/00 ) for Leave to File response to Defendant's untimely filing of affidavits in support of the law enforcement privilege and the Defendant's additional claims of privilege not previously claimed. Response due: 11/6/00 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 65 Filed: 10/19/2000, Entered: 10/24/2000 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER re: documents that Defendant has asked the Court to review (Exhibt B Part II, numbered WOT942 1529 - WON878 2000) ( signed by Judge Robert H. Hodges ) Copy to parties. (JT) Modified on 10/24/2000
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 64 Filed: 9/27/2000, Entered: 10/2/2000 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION by USA (Service : 9/27/00 ) For leave to exceed the page limitation. (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 63 Filed: 9/26/2000, Entered: 9/29/2000 Response
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    RESPONSE to Defendant's surreply and Supplemental Affidavit of William M. Symmes by STERLING SAVINGS, STERLING FINANCIAL. Service: 9/21/00 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 62 Filed: 9/26/2000, Entered: 9/29/2000 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER granting [56-1] motion for Leave to File motion to compel discovery and request for hearing, granting [59-1] motion for Leave to File surreply, granting [60-1] motion for Leave to File response to Defendant's surreply and supplemental affidavit. ( signed by Judge Robert H. Hodges ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 60 Filed: 9/25/2000, Entered: 9/28/2000 Terminated: Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION by STERLING SAVINGS, STERLING FINANCIAL (Service : 9/21/00 ) for Leave to File response to Defendant's surreply and supplemental affidavit. Filed by leave of the Judge. Response due: 10/10/00 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 59 Filed: 9/15/2000, Entered: 9/18/2000 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION by USA (Service : 9/15/00 ) for Leave to File surreply. (surreply included) Response due: 10/2/00 (JT) Modified on 09/18/2000
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 58 Filed: 9/8/2000, Entered: 9/11/2000 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            REPLY by STERLING SAVINGS, STERLING FINANCIAL to response to [56-1] motion for Leave to File motion to compel discovery and request for hearing, [55-1] motion to Compel discovery, [55-2] motion for hearing. Service: 9/7/00 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 57 Filed: 8/28/2000, Entered: 8/29/2000 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              RESPONSE by USA (Service: 8/28/00 ) to [55-1] motion to Compel discovery, [55-2] motion for hearing, [56-1] motion for Leave to File motion to compel discovery and request for hearing. Reply due: 9/11/00 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 56 Filed: 8/15/2000, Entered: 8/16/2000, Terminated: 9/26/2000 Terminated: Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION by STERLING SAVINGS, STERLING FINANCIAL (Service : 8/11/00 ) for Leave to File motion to compel discovery and request for hearing. Filed by leave of the Judge. Response due: 8/28/00 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 55 Filed: 8/15/2000, Entered: 8/16/2000 Terminated: Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION by STERLING SAVINGS, STERLING FINANCIAL (Service : 8/11/00 ) to Compel discovery and for hearing. Filed by leave of the Judge. Response due: 8/28/00 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 54 Filed: 8/15/2000, Entered: 8/16/2000 AffidavitCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    AFFIDAVIT of William M. Symmes by STERLING SAVINGS, STERLING FINANCIAL. Filed by leave of the Judge. Service 8/11/00 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 53 Filed: 4/13/2000, Entered: 4/13/2000 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      REPLY by STERLING SAVINGS and STERLING FINANCIAL to response to [51-1] motion for Leave to File motion to set a hearing for the adjudication of Defendant's pending Rule 56(g) motion, by leave of the Judge. Service: 4/6/00. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 52 Filed: 3/23/2000, Entered: 3/24/2000 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        RESPONSE by USA (Service: 3/23/00 ) to [51-1] motion for Leave to File motion to set a hearing for the adjudication of Defendant's pending Rule 56(g) motion. Reply due: 4/6/00 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 51 Filed: 3/13/2000, Entered: 3/14/2000 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION by STERLING SAVINGS, STERLING FINANCIAL (Service : 3/10/00 ) for Leave to File motion to set a hearing for the adjudication of Defendant's pending Rule 56(g) motion. Response due: 3/27/00 (JT) Modified on 03/14/2000
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 50 Filed: 2/25/2000, Entered: 2/29/2000 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER re: copying and delivery of documents. ( signed by Chief Judge Loren A. Smith for Judge Robert H. Hodges ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 49 Filed: 4/6/1999, Entered: 4/12/1999 Remark
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              See Order of 4/6/99 in 90-8 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 48 Filed: 9/16/1998, Entered: 9/22/1998 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER memorializing the oral order of the court of August 11, 1998. Pursuant to that oral order, consideration of the motions for summary judgment, including any briefing not yet complete, is stayed until October 13, 1998. (See Order in 90-8) ( signed by Chief Judge Loren A. Smith ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 47 Filed: 8/31/1998, Entered: 9/2/1998 Response
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  REPLY by USA to [45-1] response by STERLING FINANCIAL and STERLING SAVINGS, [43-1] notice by USA. Service: 8/31/98. (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 46 Filed: 8/18/1998, Entered: 8/19/1998 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION by USA (Service : 8/17/98 ) to Extend Time to file it's reply , (until 8/31/98). Response due: 9/17/98 (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 45 Filed: 8/14/1998, Entered: 9/2/1998 ResponseCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      RESPONSE by STERLING SAVINGS, STERLING FINANCIAL to [43-1] notice by USA, filed y leav of the Judge. Service: 8/7/98. (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 44 Filed: 8/10/1998, Entered: 8/12/1998 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION by USA (Service: 8/10/98) for Leave to file Supplemental Authority with the Court Response due: 8/27/98. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 43 Filed: 7/27/1998, Entered: 7/29/1998 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Filing Motion for Stay by USA. Service: 7/27/98 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 42 Filed: 6/18/1998, Entered: 6/22/1998 Memorandum
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            SUR-REPLY by USA re: Plaintiff's reply regarding proposed order on motion for partial summary judgment regarding liability. Service: 6/18/98 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 41 Filed: 6/15/1998, Entered: 6/18/1998 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER granting [40-1] motion to Extend Time to file sur-reply to June 18, 1998. ( signed by Chief Judge Loren A. Smith ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 40 Filed: 6/9/1998, Entered: 6/10/1998, Terminated: 6/15/1998 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION by USA (Service : 6/9/98 ) to Extend Time to file sur-reply [to June 18, 1998]. Response due: 6/26/98 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 39 Filed: 6/5/1998, Entered: 6/5/1998
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  RESPONSE by STERLING SAVINGS to [36-1] response by USA Service: 6/5/98 (AB)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 38 Filed: 5/20/1998, Entered: 5/26/1998 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER granting [37-1] motion to Extend Time to respond to Defendant's Reply to proposed Order by 6/5/98. In addition, defendant is granted a commensurate 21 day enlargement within which to file its sur-reply ( signed by Chief Judge Loren A. Smith ) Copy to parties. (HW) Modified on 05/26/1998
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 37 Filed: 5/12/1998, Entered: 5/18/1998, Terminated: 5/20/1998 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION by STERLING SAVINGS, STERLING FINANCIAL (Service : 5/11/98 ) to Extend Time to respond to Defendant's Reply to proposed Order [to June 5, 1998]. Response due: 5/28/98 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 36 Filed: 4/30/1998, Entered: 5/4/1998 Response
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        RESPONSE by USA to [35-1] memorandum (proposed order) by STERLING FINANCIAL, STERLING SAVINGS. Service: 4/30/98 (DS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 35 Filed: 3/31/1998, Entered: 4/2/1998 Memorandum
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MEMORANDUM by STERLING SAVINGS, STERLING FINANCIAL re: Proposed Order for Partial Summary Judgment. Service: 3/30/98 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 34 Filed: 2/20/1998, Entered: 2/23/1998 Response
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            RESPONSE by USA to Order of December 22, 1997. Service: 2/20/98 (See Order of December 22, 1997, entered in No. 92-138.) (CDC) Modified on 02/23/1998
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 33 Filed: 2/20/1998, Entered: 2/23/1998 notice of filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Notice of filing notice of appearance of David M. Cohen with respect to the pending cross-motions for partial summary judgment and the Order of December 22, 1997, by USA Service: 2/20/98 (CDC)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 32 Filed: 8/18/1997, Entered: 8/19/1997 ~Notice (other)Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of letter (dated August 12, 1997, to Chief Judge Smith) by STERLING SAVINGS, STERLING FINANCIAL, by leave of the Judge. Service: 8/18/97 (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 31 Filed: 8/4/1997, Entered: 8/12/1997 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  REPLY by USA to response to [24-1] cross motion . Service: 8/4/97 (CDC)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 30 Filed: 7/14/1997, Entered: 7/29/1997 ~Notice (other)Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of letter dated July 3, 1997 re: status conference by STERLING SAVINGS, STERLING FINANCIAL, by leave of the Judge. Service: 7/14/97. (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 29 Filed: 6/30/1997, Entered: 7/10/1997 Terminated: Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION by STERLING SAVINGS (Service : 6/25/97 ) for Leave to File overlength brief filed by leave of the Judge. Response due: 7/14/97 (AB) Modified on 07/10/1997
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 28 Filed: 6/20/1997, Entered: 7/8/1997 AffidavitCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        AFFIDAVIT [of Leslie R. Weatherhead] by STERLING SAVINGS, STERLING FINANCIAL re: [20-1] motion for partial Summary Judgment, by leave of the Judge. IN CAMERA. Service 6/20/97. (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 27 Filed: 6/20/1997, Entered: 7/2/1997 Response to MotionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          RESPONSE by STERLING SAVINGS, STERLING FINANCIAL (Service: 6/16/97 ) to [24-1] cross motion, by leave of the Judge. Reply due: 7/3/97. (HW) Modified on 01/17/2001
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 26 Filed: 5/19/1997, Entered: 6/2/1997 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            RESPONSE by USA (Service: 5/19/97 ) to [20-1] motion for partial Summary Judgment re: liability. . Reply due: 6/5/97. (HW) Modified on 01/17/2001
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 25 Filed: 4/4/1997, Entered: 4/15/1997 Response to MotionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              RESPONSE by STERLING SAVINGS, STERLING FINANCIAL (Service: 3/18/97 ) to [23-1] motion to Extend Time to file a initial response to motion. Filed by leave of the Judge. Reply due: 3/31/97 (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 24 Filed: 4/4/1997, Entered: 4/14/1997, Terminated: 7/11/2003 Terminated: Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                CROSS MOTION by USA ( Service: 4/1/97 ) and RESPONSE to [20-1] motion for partial Summary Judgment re: liability by STERLING SAVINGS (together with separate one volume appendix), filed by leave of the Judge. Response due: 4/18/97. (HW) Modified on 01/17/2001
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 23 Filed: 3/13/1997, Entered: 3/18/1997 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION by USA (Service: 3/13/97) to Extend Time to file a initial response to motion [to April 1, 1997]. Response due: 3/31/97 (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 22 Filed: 3/13/1997, Entered: 3/18/1997 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION by USA (Service: 3/13/97) for Leave to File motion for leave to exceed page limitation for its response to motion for partial summary judgment, motion to dismiss and cross motion for summary judgment . Response due: 3/31/97 (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 21 Filed: 3/13/1997, Entered: 3/18/1997 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION by USA (Service: 3/13/97) For leave to exceed the page limitation for its response to motion for partial summary judgment, motion to dismiss and cross motion for summary judgment [NTE 20 pages] . (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 20 Filed: 1/21/1997, Entered: 1/24/1997 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION by STERLING SAVINGS (Service: 1/17/97) for partial Summary Judgment re: liability . Response due: 2/18/97 (FE) Modified on 01/17/2001
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 19 Filed: 10/8/1996, Entered: 10/11/1996 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Attorney Appearance for USA by Elizabeth Marie Hosford. Service : 10/8/96 (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 18 Filed: 8/28/1996, Entered: 9/13/1996 Case Assigned/ReassignedCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            SEE ORDER IN 90-8C for Notice of reassignment to Chief Judge Loren A. Smith. Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 17 Filed: 8/16/1996, Entered: 8/21/1996 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION by USA (Service : 8/16/96 ) for Leave to File attached proposed pretrial order. Response due: 9/3/96 (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 16 Filed: 7/24/1996, Entered: 7/26/1996 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION by USA (Service: 7/24/96) for Leave to File copy of motion to adopt special case management procedures . Response due: 8/12/96 (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 15 Filed: 6/19/1996, Entered: 6/21/1996 Notice of Change of Address
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of change of address by Martin Francis Hockey Jr. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 14 Filed: 5/20/1996, Entered: 5/23/1996 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER granting [6-1] motion to Stay of proceedings (signed by Judge Robert J. Yock). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 13 Filed: 4/26/1996, Entered: 5/1/1996 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER granting [10-1] motion to Extend Time to file reply to response to motion to stay (signed by Judge Robert J. Yock). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 12 Filed: 4/26/1996, Entered: 5/1/1996 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        REPLY by USA to response to [6-1] motion to Stay of proceedings. Service: 4/26/96 (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 11 Filed: 4/25/1996, Entered: 4/30/1996 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION by USA (Service: 4/25/96) for Leave to File Motion to Adopt Special Case Management Procedures . Response due: 5/13/96. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 10 Filed: 4/22/1996, Entered: 4/26/1996, Terminated: 4/26/1996 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION by USA (Service: 4/22/96) to Extend Time to file reply to response to motion to stay [to April 26, 1996]. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 9 Filed: 4/12/1996, Entered: 4/17/1996 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              RESPONSE by STERLING SAVINGS (Service: 4/8/96) to [6-1] motion to Stay of proceedings. Reply due: 4/22/96 (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 8 Filed: 4/12/1996, Entered: 4/17/1996 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER vacating [7-1] order, filing plaintiff's response to motion to stay and Reply to Response to Motion to stay to 4/22/96 (signed by Judge Robert J. Yock). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank -- Filed: 4/12/1996, Entered: 4/17/1996 Set/Reset Deadlines:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Deadline updated; Reply to Response to Motion reset to 4/22/96 for [6-1] motion to Stay of proceedings (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 7 Filed: 4/11/1996, Entered: 4/17/1996 Terminated: Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER granting [6-1] motion to Stay of proceedings (signed by Judge Robert J. Yock). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 6 Filed: 3/19/1996, Entered: 3/25/1996, Terminated: 4/11/1996 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION by USA (Service: 3/19/96) to Stay of proceedings , (until 30 days following the Supreme Court's final decsion in Winstar). Response due: 4/5/96. (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 5 Filed: 3/19/1996, Entered: 3/25/1996 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION by USA (Service : 3/19/96 ) for Leave to File notice and declaration re: certain documents that may be relevant to this action . Response due: 4/5/96 (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 4 Filed: 2/8/1996, Entered: 2/13/1996 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Attorney Appearance for USA by Martin Francis Hockey Jr. Service : 2/8/96 (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 3 Filed: 1/19/1996, Entered: 1/24/1996 Case Assigned/ReassignedCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Notice of assignment to Judge Robert J. Yock . Copy to parties. (DS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 2 Filed: 1/19/1996, Entered: 1/24/1996 Amended Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              AMENDED COMPLAINT by STERLING SAVINGS, STERLING FINANCIAL (Answer due 3/19/96). Copies (5) to defendant. (DS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 1 Filed: 12/18/1995, Entered: 12/20/1995 Case Transferred In - District Transfer
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Record transferred from the U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Washington. Case number 90-CS-175, consisting of nine volumes. Notice to parties. (Amended complaint due by 1/16/96). (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank -- Filed: 12/18/1995, Entered: 12/20/1995 Case Assigned/Reassigned
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  CASE assigned to Judge Unassigned. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    This case has been viewed 237 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                     
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Need Password Help?