MARIN v. USA
Federal Civil Lawsuit United States Court of Federal Claims, Case No. 1:95-cv-00831-LAS
District Judge Loren A. Smith, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo DARRELL W. MARIN, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Cowardin & Kim PLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Timothy Scott Fisher +1 757 873 1188
v.
United States of America United States of America, Defendant
Officially listed as "USA"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space S. Lane Tucker +1 202 514 7300
Office COFC
Filed 12/18/1995
Jury Demand
Demand $10000
Nature of Suit 352 - Military Pay - Retirement
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1491 Tucker Act
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition Preliminary Injunction
County
Terminated 6/11/1998
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flag CLOSED
  Entries (32) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 27 Filed: 6/11/1998, Entered: 6/11/1998
JUDGMENT entered pursuant to court's Opinion of June 11, 1998, dismissing complaint. Each side shall bear their own costs. (Signed by Clerk.) Copy to parties. (LD)
    LREF
    Blank 26 Filed: 6/11/1998, Entered: 6/11/1998 Court Filing
    PUBLISHED DECISION denying [19-1] cross motion, granting [15-1] motion for Summary Judgment ( signed by Chief Judge Loren A. Smith ). Copy to parties. (LD)
      LREF
      Blank -- Filed: 6/11/1998, Entered: 6/11/1998
      Case closed (LD)
        LREF
        Blank 25 Filed: 1/26/1998, Entered: 1/26/1998
        TRANSCRIPT of proceedings 1 volume, at Washington, D.C., for date of January 5, 1998. Notice to parties. (FE)
          LREF
          Blank -- Filed: 1/5/1998, Entered: 1/7/1998 Oral Argument
          Oral Argument re: [19-1] cross motion by DARRELL W. MARIN ( Transcript due 2/4/98 ), [15-1] motion for Summary Judgment by USA ( Transcript due 2/4/98 ) (DS)
            LREF
            Blank -- Filed: 10/30/1997, Entered: 11/4/1997 Set/Reset Deadlines:
            Deadline updated; oral argument set for 3:00 on 1/5/98 for [19-1] cross motion, for [15-1] motion for Summary Judgment (DS)
              LREF
              Blank 24 Filed: 10/27/1997, Entered: 11/4/1997 OrderCourt Filing
              ORDER oral argument set for 3:00 on 1/5/98 for [19-1] cross motion, for [15-1] motion for Summary Judgment ( signed by Chief Judge Loren A. Smith ) Copy to parties. (DS)
                LREF
                Blank 23 Filed: 10/14/1997, Entered: 10/20/1997 Terminated:
                MOTION by DARRELL W. MARIN (Service : 10/10/97 ) for Oral Argument Response due: 10/27/97 (CDC)
                  LREF
                  Blank 22 Filed: 8/8/1996, Entered: 8/13/1996 Reply to Response to Motion
                  REPLY by USA to response to [15-1] motion for Summary Judgment. Service: 8/8/96 (FE)
                    LREF
                    Blank 22 Filed: 8/8/1996, Entered: 8/13/1996 Terminated:
                    RESPONSE by USA (Service: 8/8/96) to [19-1] cross motion. Reply due: 8/26/96 (FE)
                      LREF
                      Blank 21 Filed: 8/5/1996, Entered: 8/9/1996 OrderCourt Filing
                      ORDER granting [20-1] motion to Extend Time to respond to cross motion for summary judgment and Response to [19-1] cross motion reset to 8/8/96 (signed by Judge Eric G. Bruggink for Chief Judge Loren A. Smith). Copy to parties. (FE)
                        LREF
                        Blank 20 Filed: 8/1/1996, Entered: 8/7/1996, Terminated: 8/5/1996 Terminated:
                        MOTION by USA (Service : 8/1/96) to Extend Time to respond to cross motion for summary judgment (to August 8, 1996). (FE)
                          LREF
                          Blank 19 Filed: 7/15/1996, Entered: 7/17/1996 Terminated: Court Filing
                          CROSS MOTION by DARRELL W. MARIN (Service: 7/1/96) and RESPONSE to [15-1] motion for Summary Judgment by USA by leave of the Judge. Response due: 8/1/96 (FE)
                            LREF
                            Blank 18 Filed: 7/15/1996, Entered: 7/17/1996 Statement of FactsCourt Filing
                            COUNTERSTATEMENT OF FACTS filed by DARRELL W. MARIN by leave of the Judge. Service: 7/1/96 (FE)
                              LREF
                              Blank -- Filed: 7/15/1996, Entered: 7/17/1996 Set/Reset Deadlines:
                              Deadline updated; Response to [19-1] cross motion reset to 8/1/96 (FE)
                                LREF
                                Blank 17 Filed: 6/25/1996, Entered: 7/1/1996 OrderCourt Filing
                                ORDER granting [16-1] motion to Extend Time to respond to Motion for Judgment and Response to [15-1] motion for Summary Judgment reset to 7/2/96 (signed by Acting Chief Judge Christine O.C. Miller for Chief Judge Loren A. Smith). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                  LREF
                                  Blank 16 Filed: 6/17/1996, Entered: 6/19/1996, Terminated: 6/25/1996 Terminated:
                                  MOTION by DARRELL W. MARIN (Service: 6/14/96) to Extend Time to respond to Motion for Judgment until 7/2/96. (FE)
                                    LREF
                                    Blank 15 Filed: 5/21/1996, Entered: 5/24/1996 Terminated:
                                    MOTION by USA (Service : 5/21/96) for Summary Judgment . Response due: 6/21/96 (FE) Modified on 05/28/1996
                                      LREF
                                      Blank 14 Filed: 5/21/1996, Entered: 5/24/1996 Statement of Facts
                                      STATEMENT OF FACTS filed by USA. Service: 5/21/96 (FE)
                                        LREF
                                        Blank 13 Filed: 5/21/1996, Entered: 5/24/1996 Terminated:
                                        MOTION by USA (Service : 5/21/96 ) for Leave to File the Administrative Record . Response due: 6/7/96 (FE)
                                          LREF
                                          Blank 12 Filed: 5/20/1996, Entered: 5/22/1996 Terminated:
                                          MOTION by USA (Service : 5/20/96) to Extend Time to answer complaint (to May 21, 1996). Response due: 6/6/96 (FE)
                                            LREF
                                            Blank 11 Filed: 5/16/1996, Entered: 5/20/1996 OrderCourt Filing
                                            ORDER granting [9-1] motion to Extend Time within which to file a response to plaintiff's complaint and reset Answer deadline to 5/20/96 (signed by Chief Judge Loren A. Smith). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                              LREF
                                              Blank 9 Filed: 5/13/1996, Entered: 5/15/1996, Terminated: 5/16/1996 Terminated:
                                              UNOPPOSED MOTION by USA (Service: 5/13/96) to Extend Time within which to file a response to plaintiff's complaint [until 5/20/96]. (FE)
                                                LREF
                                                Blank 10 Filed: 5/10/1996, Entered: 5/16/1996 OrderCourt Filing
                                                ORDER granting [8-1] motion to Extend Time within which to respond to the complaint. Answer deadline to 5/14/96 ( signed by Chief Judge Loren A. Smith ) Copy to parties. (HW)
                                                  LREF
                                                  Blank 8 Filed: 4/30/1996, Entered: 5/2/1996, Terminated: 5/10/1996 Terminated:
                                                  MOTION by USA (Service : 4/30/96 ) to Extend Time within which to respond to the complaint , (until May 14, 1996). (HW)
                                                    LREF
                                                    Blank 7 Filed: 4/19/1996, Entered: 4/24/1996 OrderCourt Filing
                                                    ORDER granting [6-1] motion to Extend Time to respond to complaint and reset Answer deadline to 4/30/96 (signed by Chief Judge Loren A. Smith). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                      LREF
                                                      Blank 6 Filed: 4/16/1996, Entered: 4/19/1996, Terminated: 4/19/1996 Terminated:
                                                      MOTION by USA (Service : 4/16/96) to Extend Time to respond to complaint (to April 30, 1996). (FE)
                                                        LREF
                                                        Blank 5 Filed: 2/29/1996, Entered: 3/6/1996 OrderCourt Filing
                                                        ORDER granting [4-1] motion to Extend Time within which to file our response to complaint reset Answer deadline to 4/16/96 ( signed by Chief Judge Loren A. Smith ). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                          LREF
                                                          Blank 4 Filed: 2/15/1996, Entered: 2/21/1996, Terminated: 2/29/1996 Terminated:
                                                          MOTION by USA (Service : 2/15/96 ) to Extend Time within which to file our response to complaint , (until April 16, 1996). Response due: 3/4/96. (HW)
                                                            LREF
                                                            Blank 3 Filed: 1/19/1996, Entered: 1/29/1996 Notice of Appearance/
                                                            NOTICE of Attorney Appearance for USA by S. Lane Tucker Service : 1/19/96 (FE)
                                                              LREF
                                                              Blank 2 Filed: 12/18/1995, Entered: 12/21/1995 Case Assigned/ReassignedCourt Filing
                                                              Notice of assignment to Chief Judge Loren A. Smith. Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                LREF
                                                                Blank 1 Filed: 12/18/1995, Entered: 12/21/1995 Complaint
                                                                COMPLAINT (Filed with Exhibits 1 through 8), FILING FEE $120, RECEIPT #040613. Answer due on 2/16/96. (FE)
                                                                  LREF

                                                                  Statistics

                                                                  This case has been viewed 196 times.

                                                                  No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                  Space
                                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                   
                                                                  PlainSite
                                                                  Sign Up
                                                                  Need Password Help?