BRIGANTE v. USA
Federal Civil Lawsuit United States Court of Federal Claims, Case No. 1:95-cv-00307-LSM
District Judge Lawrence S. Margolis, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo ANGELO BRIGANTE, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Glen E. Keller, Jr

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space John Adams Wickham +1 303 670 3825 +1 303 670 1586 wickham1@wispertel.net
v.
United States of America United States of America, Defendant
Officially listed as "USA"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Richard Alan Miller +1 202 616 0383 +1 202 307 2503 alan.miller@usdoj.gov
Office COFC
Filed 4/24/1995
Jury Demand
Demand $0
Nature of Suit 346 - Military Pay - Correct/Reinstate
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1491 Tucker Act
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition Preliminary Injunction
County
Terminated 5/31/1996
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flag CLOSED
  Entries (34) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 32 Filed: 6/14/1996, Entered: 6/25/1996 Transcript
TRANSCRIPT of proceedings re: Oral Argument-motion to dismiss, 1 volume, at Washington, D.C., for date of May 16, 1996. Notice to parties. (FE)
    LREF
    Blank 31 Filed: 5/31/1996, Entered: 6/5/1996 Judgment*
    JUDGMENT entered pursuant to Rule 58 dismissing complaint with no costs (signed by Clerk). Copy to parties. (FE)
      LREF
      Blank 30 Filed: 5/31/1996, Entered: 6/4/1996 Published DecisionCourt Filing
      PUBLISHED DECISION granting [16-1] motion to Dismiss (signed by Judge Lawrence S. Margolis). Copy to parties. (FE)
        LREF
        Blank -- Filed: 5/31/1996, Entered: 6/5/1996 Terminated Case
        Case closed. (FE)
          LREF
          Blank -- Filed: 5/16/1996, Entered: 5/21/1996 Oral Argument
          Oral Argument re: [16-1] motion to Dismiss by USA. ( Transcript due 6/17/96 ) (FE)
            LREF
            Blank 29 Filed: 4/18/1996, Entered: 4/24/1996 OrderCourt Filing
            ORDER oral argument set for 2:30 p.m. on 5/16/96 for [16-1] motion to Dismiss (signed by Judge Lawrence S. Margolis). Copy to parties. (FE)
              LREF
              Blank 28 Filed: 3/29/1996, Entered: 4/3/1996 Reply to Response to Motion
              REPLY by USA to response to [16-1] motion to Dismiss . Service: 3/29/96 (FE)
                LREF
                Blank 27 Filed: 2/20/1996, Entered: 2/27/1996 OrderCourt Filing
                ORDER granting [26-1] motion to Extend Time to reply to response to motion to dismiss, Reply to Response to Motion reset to 3/29/96 for [16-1] motion to Dismiss and Staying defendant's time to respond to plaintiff's motion for summary judgment until 30 days after the court has ruled on the motion to dismiss (signed by Judge Lawrence S. Margolis). Copy to parties. (FE)
                  LREF
                  Blank 26 Filed: 2/12/1996, Entered: 2/15/1996, Terminated: 2/20/1996 Terminated:
                  MOTION by USA (Service : 2/12/96) to Extend Time to reply to response to motion to dismiss until 3/29/96. Response due: 2/29/96. (FE)
                    LREF
                    Blank 25 Filed: 1/30/1996, Entered: 2/6/1996 Terminated:
                    RESPONSE by ANGELO BRIGANTE (Service: 1/28/96) to [16-1] motion to Dismiss. Reply due: 2/14/96. (HW)
                      LREF
                      Blank 24 Filed: 1/30/1996, Entered: 2/6/1996 Terminated:
                      MOTION by ANGELO BRIGANTE (Service : 1/28/96 ) for Summary Judgment . Response due: 2/28/96. (HW)
                        LREF
                        Blank 23 Filed: 1/30/1996, Entered: 2/6/1996 Statement of Facts
                        Counter STATEMENT OF FACTS filed by ANGELO BRIGANTE. Service: 1/29/96. (HW)
                          LREF
                          Blank 22 Filed: 1/24/1996, Entered: 1/30/1996 OrderCourt Filing
                          ORDER granting [21-1] motion to Extend Time to respond to motion to dismiss Response to [16-1] motion to Dismiss reset to 1/30/96 ( signed by Judge Lawrence S. Margolis ). Copy to parties. (FE)
                            LREF
                            Blank 21 Filed: 1/18/1996, Entered: 1/25/1996, Terminated: 1/24/1996 Terminated:
                            MOTION by ANGELO BRIGANTE (Service : 1/16/96 ) to Extend Time to respond motion to dismiss (to January 30, 1996). (FE) Modified on 01/30/1996
                              LREF
                              Blank 20 Filed: 12/21/1995, Entered: 1/3/1996 OrderCourt Filing
                              ORDER granting [19-1] motion to Extend Time to respond to motion to dismiss ; Response to [16-1] motion to Dismiss reset to 1/22/96 ( signed by Judge Lawrence S. Margolis ) Copy to parties. (HW)
                                LREF
                                Blank 19 Filed: 12/18/1995, Entered: 12/27/1995, Terminated: 12/21/1995 Terminated:
                                MOTION by ANGELO BRIGANTE (Service: 12/16/95) to Extend Time to respond to motion to dismiss [to January 22, 1996]. (FE)
                                  LREF
                                  Blank 18 Filed: 12/1/1995, Entered: 12/6/1995 OrderCourt Filing
                                  ORDER granting [17-1] motion to Extend Time within which to respond to motion to dismiss Response to [16-1] motion to Dismiss reset to 12/22/95 ( signed by Judge Lawrence S. Margolis ). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                    LREF
                                    Blank 17 Filed: 11/16/1995, Entered: 11/21/1995, Terminated: 12/1/1995 Terminated:
                                    MOTION by ANGELO BRIGANTE (Service : 11/16/95 ) to Extend Time within which to respond to motion to dismiss , (until December 22, 1995). Response due: 12/4/95. (HW)
                                      LREF
                                      Blank 16 Filed: 10/24/1995, Entered: 10/31/1995 Terminated: Court Filing
                                      MOTION by USA (Service: 10/20/95) to Dismiss filed by leave of the Judge. Response due: 11/20/95 (FE) Modified on 10/31/1995
                                        LREF
                                        Blank 15 Filed: 10/20/1995, Entered: 10/25/1995 OrderCourt Filing
                                        ORDER granting [14-1] motion to Extend Time to respond to complaint and setting Answer deadline to 10/20/95 (signed by Judge Lawrence S. Margolis) Copy to parties. (FE)
                                          LREF
                                          Blank 14 Filed: 9/29/1995, Entered: 10/4/1995, Terminated: 10/20/1995 Terminated:
                                          MOTION by USA (Service: 9/29/95) to Extend Time to respond to complaint [to October 20, 1995]. Response due: 10/16/95 (FE)
                                            LREF
                                            Blank 13 Filed: 9/21/1995, Entered: 9/25/1995 Administrative Record
                                            Administrative record filed by USA [two volumes]. (FE) Modified on 09/25/1995
                                              LREF
                                              Blank 12 Filed: 9/21/1995, Entered: 9/25/1995 OrderCourt Filing
                                              ORDER granting [10-1] motion for Leave to File administrative record and granting [10-2] motion for Waiver of Duplication (signed by Judge Lawrence S. Margolis). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                LREF
                                                Blank 11 Filed: 9/20/1995, Entered: 9/22/1995 OrderCourt Filing
                                                ORDER granting [9-1] motion to Extend Time to respond to complaint and reset Answer deadline to 9/29/95 (signed by Judge Lawrence S. Margolis). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                  LREF
                                                  Blank 10 Filed: 9/13/1995, Entered: 9/18/1995, Terminated: 9/21/1995 Terminated:
                                                  MOTION by USA (Service: 9/11/95) for Leave to File administrative record and for Waiver of Duplication . Response due: 9/28/95 (FE)
                                                    LREF
                                                    Blank 9 Filed: 9/11/1995, Entered: 9/14/1995, Terminated: 9/20/1995 Terminated:
                                                    MOTION by USA (Service : 9/11/95) to Extend Time to respond to complaint until 9/29/95. (FE) Modified on 09/14/1995
                                                      LREF
                                                      Blank 8 Filed: 8/2/1995, Entered: 8/4/1995 OrderCourt Filing
                                                      ORDER granting [7-1] motion to Extend Time to respond to complaint and reset Answer deadline to 9/11/95 (signed by Judge Lawrence S. Margolis). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                        LREF
                                                        Blank 7 Filed: 7/28/1995, Entered: 8/1/1995, Terminated: 8/2/1995 Terminated:
                                                        MOTION by USA (Service: 7/28/95) to Extend Time to respond to complaint [to September 11, 1995]. (FE)
                                                          LREF
                                                          Blank 6 Filed: 7/6/1995, Entered: 7/10/1995 OrderCourt Filing
                                                          ORDER granting [5-1] motion to Extend Time to respond to the complaint reset Answer deadline to 7/28/95 ( signed by Judge Lawrence S. Margolis ). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                            LREF
                                                            Blank 5 Filed: 6/19/1995, Entered: 6/21/1995, Terminated: 7/6/1995 Terminated:
                                                            MOTION by USA (Service: 6/19/95) to Extend Time to respond to the complaint (to July 28, 1995). Response due: 7/6/95 (DS)
                                                              LREF
                                                              Blank 4 Filed: 5/22/1995, Entered: 5/23/1995 Notice of Appearance/
                                                              NOTICE of Attorney Appearance for USA by Richard Alan Miller Service: 5/22/95 (FE)
                                                                LREF
                                                                Blank 3 Filed: 5/10/1995, Entered: 5/12/1995 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                NOTICE of Attorney Appearance for USA by John Peebles Sholar Jr. Service : 5/10/95 (FE)
                                                                  LREF
                                                                  Blank 2 Filed: 4/24/1995, Entered: 4/25/1995 Case Assigned/ReassignedCourt Filing
                                                                  Notice of assignment to Judge Lawrence S. Margolis. Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                    LREF
                                                                    Blank 1 Filed: 4/24/1995, Entered: 4/25/1995 Complaint
                                                                    COMPLAINT, FILING FEE $120, RECEIPT #39087. Answer due on 6/23/95. (FE)
                                                                      LREF

                                                                      Statistics

                                                                      This case has been viewed 171 times.

                                                                      No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                      Space
                                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                       
                                                                      PlainSite
                                                                      Sign Up
                                                                      Need Password Help?