FORAN v. USA
Federal Civil Lawsuit United States Court of Federal Claims, Case No. 1:95-cv-00325-JFM
District Judge James F. Merow, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

No Logo GEORGINA G. FORAN, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by LAW OFFICE OF JOHN P. RACIN

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Guy James Ferrante +1 703 644 2009 kingand@erols.com
v.
United States of America United States of America, Defendant
Officially listed as "USA"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Agnes Marie Brown +1 202 307 1011
Office COFC
Filed 5/5/1995
Jury Demand
Demand $0
Nature of Suit 354 - Military Pay - SBP
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1491 Tucker Act
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition Preliminary Injunction
County
Terminated 8/30/1996
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flag CLOSED
  Entries (31) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 29 Filed: 9/10/1996, Entered: 9/17/1996 Certified Transcript to Attorney
CERTIFIED TRANSCRIPT OF JUDGMENT forwarded to attorney of record. See letter in file. (FE)
    LREF
    Blank 28 Filed: 8/30/1996, Entered: 9/5/1996 Judgment*
    JUDGMENT entered pursuant to Rule 58 that final judgment shall be entered in favor of plaintiff for the total amount of $53,631.20, that there shall be withheld from the $53,631.20 gross amount the sum of $18,765.23 for applicable federal taxes plus the sum of $14,051.82 covering the cost premiums owed for participation in the Survivor Benefit Plan from December 1, 1980 through May 27, 1991, with the net judgment amount to be paid to plaintiff, after the withholdings, in the amount of $20,814.15 (signed by Clerk). Copy to parties. (FE)
      LREF
      Blank 27 Filed: 8/30/1996, Entered: 9/4/1996 Unpublished DecisionCourt Filing
      UNPUBLISHED DECISION (signed by Judge James F. Merow). Copy to parties. (FE)
        LREF
        Blank -- Filed: 8/30/1996, Entered: 9/5/1996 Terminated Case
        Case closed. (FE)
          LREF
          Blank 26 Filed: 8/26/1996, Entered: 8/29/1996 Status Report
          Joint STATUS REPORT by GEORGINA G. FORAN and USA. Service: 8/26/96 (HW)
            LREF
            Blank 25 Filed: 8/20/1996, Entered: 8/26/1996 OrderCourt Filing
            ORDER granting [24-1] motion to Extend Time within which to file joint status report and reset Status Report deadline to 8/26/96 (signed by Judge James F. Merow). Copy to parties. (FE)
              LREF
              Blank 24 Filed: 8/16/1996, Entered: 8/22/1996, Terminated: 8/20/1996 Terminated:
              UNOPPOSED MOTION by GEORGINA G. FORAN (Service: 8/16/96) to Extend Time within which to file joint status report [until 8/26/96]. (FE)
                LREF
                Blank 23 Filed: 8/12/1996, Entered: 8/14/1996 OrderCourt Filing
                ORDER granting [22-1] motion to Extend Time to file a joint status report and reset Status Report deadline to 8/19/96 (signed by Judge James F. Merow). Copy to parties. (FE)
                  LREF
                  Blank 22 Filed: 8/5/1996, Entered: 8/9/1996, Terminated: 8/12/1996 Terminated:
                  MOTION by USA (Service: 8/5/96) to Extend Time to file a joint status report [to August 19, 1996]. (FE)
                    LREF
                    Blank 21 Filed: 7/11/1996, Entered: 7/15/1996 Unpublished DecisionCourt Filing
                    UNPUBLISHED DECISION granting [13-1] cross motion, denying [5-2] motion for Summary Judgment and set Status Report deadline to 8/12/96 (signed by Judge James F. Merow). Copy to parties. (FE)
                      LREF
                      Blank 20 Filed: 6/21/1996, Entered: 6/28/1996 Notice of Change of Address
                      NOTICE of change of address by Agnes Marie Brown (FE)
                        LREF
                        Blank 19 Filed: 2/23/1996, Entered: 3/1/1996 OrderCourt Filing
                        ORDER granting [18-1] motion for Leave to File supplement to motion to dismiss, etc. (signed by Judge James F. Merow). Copy to parties. (FE)
                          LREF
                          Blank 18 Filed: 2/20/1996, Entered: 2/23/1996, Terminated: 2/23/1996 Terminated:
                          MOTION by USA (Service: 2/16/96) for Leave to File supplement to motion to dismiss, etc. . Response due: 3/4/96 (FE)
                            LREF
                            Blank 17 Filed: 2/9/1996, Entered: 2/14/1996 OrderCourt Filing
                            ORDER granting [16-1] motion for Leave to File Supplemental Citation of Authority (signed by Judge James F. Merow). Copy to parties. (FE)
                              LREF
                              Blank 16 Filed: 1/4/1996, Entered: 1/11/1996, Terminated: 2/9/1996 Terminated:
                              MOTION by GEORGINA G. FORAN (Service : 1/3/96 ) for Leave to File Supplemental Citation of Authority . Response due: 1/22/96 (FE)
                                LREF
                                Blank 15 Filed: 11/15/1995, Entered: 11/21/1995 Reply to Response to Motion
                                REPLY by GEORGINA G. FORAN to response to [13-1] cross motion. Service: 11/14/95 (FE)
                                  LREF
                                  Blank 14 Filed: 11/6/1995, Entered: 11/9/1995 Terminated:
                                  RESPONSE by USA (Service: 11/6/95) to [13-1] cross motion. Reply due: 11/24/95 (FE) Modified on 11/09/1995
                                    LREF
                                    Blank 13 Filed: 10/5/1995, Entered: 10/10/1995 Terminated: Court Filing
                                    CROSS MOTION by GEORGINA G. FORAN (Service: 10/4/95) and RESPONSE to [5-1] motion to Dismiss by USA and [5-2] motion for Summary Judgment by USA by leave of Judge. Response due: 11/6/95. (FE)
                                      LREF
                                      Blank 12 Filed: 10/5/1995, Entered: 10/10/1995 Statement of FactsCourt Filing
                                      STATEMENT OF FACTS filed by GEORGINA G. FORAN by leave of Judge. Service: 10/4/95 (FE)
                                        LREF
                                        Blank -- Filed: 10/5/1995, Entered: 10/10/1995 Set/Reset Deadlines:
                                        Deadline updated; Response to [13-1] cross motion reset to 11/6/95 (FE)
                                          LREF
                                          Blank 11 Filed: 9/6/1995, Entered: 9/7/1995 OrderCourt Filing
                                          ORDER granting [10-1] motion to Extend Time within which to respond to motion to dismiss, Response to [5-1] motion to Dismiss reset to 10/5/95 and [5-2] motion for Summary Judgment reset to 10/5/95 (signed by Judge James F. Merow). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                            LREF
                                            Blank 10 Filed: 9/1/1995, Entered: 9/6/1995, Terminated: 9/6/1995 Terminated:
                                            MOTION by GEORGINA G. FORAN (Service : 8/30/95 ) to Extend Time within which to respond to motion to dismiss , (until October 5, 1995). Response due: 9/18/95. (HW)
                                              LREF
                                              Blank 9 Filed: 8/15/1995, Entered: 8/18/1995 Administrative Record
                                              Administrative record filed by USA. Service: 8/15/95. (HW)
                                                LREF
                                                Blank 8 Filed: 8/15/1995, Entered: 8/18/1995 OrderCourt Filing
                                                ORDER granting [7-1] motion for Leave to File the administrative record ( signed by Judge James F. Merow ) Copy to parties. (HW)
                                                  LREF
                                                  Blank 7 Filed: 8/11/1995, Entered: 8/16/1995, Terminated: 8/15/1995 Terminated:
                                                  MOTION by USA (Service : 8/11/95 ) for Leave to File the administrative record . Response due: 8/28/95 (HW)
                                                    LREF
                                                    Blank 6 Filed: 8/10/1995, Entered: 8/14/1995 OrderCourt Filing
                                                    ORDER granting [4-1] motion to Extend Time to respond to complaint and reset Answer deadline to 8/4/95 (signed by Judge James F. Merow). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                      LREF
                                                      Blank 5 Filed: 8/4/1995, Entered: 8/8/1995 Terminated:
                                                      MOTION by USA (Service: 8/4/95) to Dismiss , or in the alternative, for Summary Judgment . Response due: 9/5/95 (FE)
                                                        LREF
                                                        Blank 4 Filed: 6/30/1995, Entered: 7/6/1995, Terminated: 8/10/1995 Terminated:
                                                        MOTION by USA (Service : 6/30/95 ) to Extend Time to respond to complaint until 8/4/95. Response due: 7/17/95 (FE)
                                                          LREF
                                                          Blank 3 Filed: 5/18/1995, Entered: 5/22/1995 Notice of Appearance/
                                                          NOTICE of Attorney Appearance for USA by Agnes Marie Brown Service: 5/18/95 (FE)
                                                            LREF
                                                            Blank 2 Filed: 5/5/1995, Entered: 5/8/1995 Case Assigned/ReassignedCourt Filing
                                                            Notice of assignment to Judge James F. Merow. Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                              LREF
                                                              Blank 1 Filed: 5/5/1995, Entered: 5/8/1995 Complaint
                                                              COMPLAINT, FILING FEE $120, RECEIPT #39161. Answer due on 7/5/95. (FE)
                                                                LREF

                                                                Statistics

                                                                This case has been viewed 66 times.

                                                                No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                Space
                                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                 
                                                                PlainSite
                                                                Sign Up
                                                                Need Password Help?