CATHY v. USA
Federal Civil Lawsuit United States Court of Federal Claims, Case No. 1:95-cv-00326-RBA
District Judge Roger B. Andewelt, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo RICHARD J. CATHY, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Robert Eugene Bergman +1 478 923 3176
v.
United States of America United States of America, Defendant
Officially listed as "USA"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Armando Omar Bonilla +1 202 616 2983 +1 202 514 3003 armando.bonilla@usdoj.gov
Office COFC
Filed 5/5/1995
Jury Demand
Demand $358000
Nature of Suit 346 - Military Pay - Correct/Reinstate
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1491 Tucker Act
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition Preliminary Injunction
County
Terminated 7/1/1998
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flag CLOSED
  Entries (39) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 35 Filed: 10/4/1999, Entered: 10/8/1999 CAFC Mandate Affirming
MANDATE (certified copy) from CAFC dated October 4, 1999 affirmed [33-1] judgment order. (HW)
    LREF
    Blank -- Filed: 8/18/1998, Entered: 8/20/1998 CAFC Case Number
    CAFC Case Number Re: [34-1] appeal by RICHARD J. CATHY. CAFC NUMBER: 98-5151. (HW)
      LREF
      Blank 34 Filed: 8/10/1998, Entered: 8/10/1998, Terminated: 10/4/1999 Notice of AppealCourt Filing
      NOTICE OF APPEAL by RICHARD J. CATHY. Copy to Defendant, Judge Andewelt and to CAFC. FILING FEE $ 105.00; RECEIPT # 045967. (HW)
        LREF
        Blank 33 Filed: 7/1/1998, Entered: 7/1/1998
        JUDGMENT entered dismissing complaint. (Signed by Clerk.) Copy to parties. (LD)
          LREF
          Blank -- Filed: 7/1/1998, Entered: 7/1/1998
          Case closed (LD)
            LREF
            Blank 32 Filed: 6/30/1998, Entered: 7/1/1998 Published DecisionCourt Filing
            PUBLISHED DECISION denying plaintiff's cross motion for summary judgment, and granting defendant's motion for Summary Judgment. (Signed by Judge Roger B. Andewelt.) Copy to parties. (LD)
              LREF
              Blank 31 Filed: 4/23/1997, Entered: 5/3/1997 OrderCourt Filing
              ORDER lifting stay of proceedings. ( signed by Judge Roger B. Andewelt ) Copy to parties. (DS)
                LREF
                Blank 30 Filed: 4/23/1997, Entered: 5/3/1997 Status Report
                STATUS REPORT by USA filed [by leave of the judge]. Service: 4/14/97 (DS)
                  LREF
                  Blank 29 Filed: 3/5/1997, Entered: 3/18/1997 Transcript
                  TRANSCRIPT of proceedings re:Oral Argument, Motion for Summary Judgment and Cross Motion, 1 volume, at Washington, D.C., for date of February 25, 1997. Notice to parties. (FE)
                    LREF
                    Blank 28 Filed: 3/4/1997, Entered: 3/10/1997 Status Report/OrderCourt Filing
                    STATUS REPORT ORDER. Status report [or stipulation] due on 3/17/97 and staying further consideration on parties' cross motions for summary judgment (signed by Judge Roger B. Andewelt). Copy to parties. (FE)
                      LREF
                      Blank -- Filed: 2/25/1997, Entered: 3/6/1997 Oral Argument
                      Oral Argument re: [17-1] cross motion by RICHARD J. CATHY ( Transcript due 3/27/97 ), [11-1] motion for Summary Judgment by USA. ( Transcript due 3/27/97 ) (FE)
                        LREF
                        Blank 27 Filed: 2/4/1997, Entered: 2/7/1997 Notice of Appearance/
                        NOTICE of Attorney Appearance for USA by Armando Omar Bonilla. Service: 2/4/97 (FE)
                          LREF
                          Blank 26 Filed: 1/14/1997, Entered: 1/16/1997 OrderCourt Filing
                          ORDER oral argument set for 2:00 p.m. on 2/25/97 for [17-1] cross motion and [11-1] motion for Summary Judgment (signed by Judge Roger B. Andewelt). Copy to parties. (FE)
                            LREF
                            Blank 25 Filed: 3/15/1996, Entered: 3/22/1996 Terminated:
                            RESPONSE by USA (Service: 3/15/96 ) to [17-1] cross motion. Reply due: 4/1/96. (HW)
                              LREF
                              Blank 24 Filed: 3/1/1996, Entered: 3/7/1996 Terminated:
                              MOTION by USA (Service : 3/1/96) to Extend Time to respond to cross-motion for summary judgment until 3/15/96. Response due: 3/18/96. (FE)
                                LREF
                                Blank 23 Filed: 2/14/1996, Entered: 2/20/1996 OrderCourt Filing
                                ORDER granting [22-1] motion to Extend Time to respond to plaintiff's cross motion for summary judgment Response to [17-1] cross motion reset to 3/1/96 , and Reply to Response to Motion reset to 3/1/96 for [11-1] motion for Summary Judgment ( signed by Judge Roger B. Andewelt ) Copy to parties. (HW)
                                  LREF
                                  Blank 22 Filed: 2/6/1996, Entered: 2/12/1996, Terminated: 2/14/1996 Terminated:
                                  MOTION by USA (Service: 2/6/96) to Extend Time to respond to plaintiff's cross motion for summary judgment [to March 1, 1996]. (FE)
                                    LREF
                                    Blank 21 Filed: 1/26/1996, Entered: 2/5/1996 OrderCourt Filing
                                    ORDER granting [20-1] motion to Extend Time to respond to cross-motion for summary judgment granting [20-1] motion to Extend Time to respond to cross-motion for summary judgment Reply to Response to Motion reset to 2/8/96 for [11-1] motion for Summary Judgment , and Response to [17-1] cross motion reset to 2/8/96 ( signed by Judge Roger B. Andewelt ) Copy to parties. (HW)
                                      LREF
                                      Blank 20 Filed: 1/11/1996, Entered: 1/30/1996, Terminated: 1/26/1996 Terminated:
                                      MOTION by USA (Service: 1/11/96) to Extend Time to respond to cross-motion for summary judgment (to February 8, 1996). Response due: 1/29/96 (DS)
                                        LREF
                                        Blank 19 Filed: 1/5/1996, Entered: 1/17/1996 OrderCourt Filing
                                        ORDER granting [18-1] motion to Extend Time to respond to cross motion for summary judgment Reply to Response to Motion reset to 1/10/96 for [11-1] motion for Summary Judgment , and Response to [17-1] cross motion reset to 1/10/96 ( signed by Judge Roger B. Andewelt ). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                          LREF
                                          Blank 18 Filed: 12/11/1995, Entered: 12/14/1995, Terminated: 1/5/1996 Terminated:
                                          MOTION by USA (Service: 12/11/95) to Extend Time to respond to cross motion for summary judgment [to January 10, 1996]. Response due: 12/28/95 (FE)
                                            LREF
                                            Blank 17 Filed: 11/9/1995, Entered: 12/13/1995 Terminated:
                                            CROSS MOTION by RICHARD J. CATHY ( Service: 11/8/95 ) and RESPONSE to [11-1] motion for Summary Judgment by USA Response due: 12/11/95 (DS)
                                              LREF
                                              Blank 16 Filed: 11/9/1995, Entered: 11/16/1995 Statement of Genuine Issues
                                              STATEMENT OF GENUINE ISSUES by RICHARD J. CATHY Service: 11/8/95 (i.e. statement of facts) (FE) Modified on 12/13/1995
                                                LREF
                                                Blank -- Filed: 11/9/1995, Entered: 12/13/1995 Set/Reset Deadlines:
                                                Deadline updated; Response to [17-1] cross motion reset to 12/11/95 (DS)
                                                  LREF
                                                  Blank 15 Filed: 10/26/1995, Entered: 11/2/1995 OrderCourt Filing
                                                  ORDER granting [14-1] motion to Extend Time to respond to motion for summary judgment ; Response to [11-1] motion for Summary Judgment reset to 11/9/95 ( signed by Judge Roger B. Andewelt ) Copy to parties. (HW)
                                                    LREF
                                                    Blank 14 Filed: 10/20/1995, Entered: 10/24/1995, Terminated: 10/26/1995 Terminated:
                                                    MOTION by RICHARD J. CATHY (Service: 10/19/95) to Extend Time to respond to motion for summary judgment [to November 9, 1995]. (FE)
                                                      LREF
                                                      Blank 13 Filed: 9/29/1995, Entered: 10/4/1995 Notice of Appearance/
                                                      NOTICE of Attorney Appearance for USA by John Sinclair Groat Service: 9/29/95 (FE)
                                                        LREF
                                                        Blank 12 Filed: 9/28/1995, Entered: 10/3/1995 Terminated:
                                                        MOTION by RICHARD J. CATHY (Service: 9/27/95) to Extend Time within which to respond to motion for summary judgment , (until October 25, 1995). Response due: 10/16/95. (HW) Modified on 10/03/1995
                                                          LREF
                                                          Blank 11 Filed: 9/12/1995, Entered: 9/18/1995 Terminated: Court Filing
                                                          MOTION by USA (Service: 9/1/95) for Summary Judgment by leave of Judge. Response due: 10/13/95 (FE)
                                                            LREF
                                                            Blank 10 Filed: 9/12/1995, Entered: 9/18/1995 Statement of FactsCourt Filing
                                                            STATEMENT OF FACTS filed by USA by leave of Judge. Service: 9/1/95 (FE)
                                                              LREF
                                                              Blank 9 Filed: 8/24/1995, Entered: 8/28/1995 OrderCourt Filing
                                                              ORDER granting [7-1] motion to Extend Time to respond to complaint and reset Answer deadline to 8/25/95 (signed by Judge Roger B. Andewelt). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                LREF
                                                                Blank 8 Filed: 8/24/1995, Entered: 8/28/1995 Terminated:
                                                                MOTION by USA (Service : 8/24/95) to Extend Time to respond to complaint (to September 1, 1995). Response due: 9/11/95 (FE)
                                                                  LREF
                                                                  Blank 7 Filed: 8/17/1995, Entered: 8/22/1995, Terminated: 8/24/1995 Terminated:
                                                                  MOTION by USA (Service : 8/17/95) to Extend Time to respond to complaint (to August 25, 1995). (FE) Modified on 08/22/1995
                                                                    LREF
                                                                    Blank 6 Filed: 8/3/1995, Entered: 8/7/1995 Terminated:
                                                                    MOTION by USA (Service: 8/3/95) to Extend Time to respond to complaint [to August 18, 1995]. Response due: 8/21/95 (FE)
                                                                      LREF
                                                                      Blank 5 Filed: 7/5/1995, Entered: 7/7/1995 Order
                                                                      ORDER granting [4-1] motion to Extend Time to respond to complaint and reset Answer deadline to 8/4/95 (signed by Clerk). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                        LREF
                                                                        Blank 4 Filed: 6/30/1995, Entered: 7/7/1995, Terminated: 7/5/1995 Terminated:
                                                                        MOTION by USA (Service : 6/30/95) to Extend Time to respond to complaint (to August 4, 1995). (FE)
                                                                          LREF
                                                                          Blank 3 Filed: 5/16/1995, Entered: 5/17/1995 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                          NOTICE of Attorney Appearance for USA by Hal Scott Shapiro Service : 5/16/95 (FE)
                                                                            LREF
                                                                            Blank 2 Filed: 5/5/1995, Entered: 5/8/1995 Case Assigned/ReassignedCourt Filing
                                                                            Notice of assignment to Judge Roger B. Andewelt. Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                              LREF
                                                                              Blank 1 Filed: 5/5/1995, Entered: 5/8/1995 Complaint
                                                                              COMPLAINT, FILING FEE $120, RECEIPT #39160. Answer due on 7/5/95. (FE)
                                                                                LREF

                                                                                Statistics

                                                                                This case has been viewed 159 times.

                                                                                No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                Space
                                                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                 
                                                                                PlainSite
                                                                                Sign Up
                                                                                Need Password Help?