COLON v. USA
Federal Civil Lawsuit United States Court of Federal Claims, Case No. 1:95-cv-00393-RJY
District Judge Robert J. Yock, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo RICHARD COLON, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Tony Hernandez, III +1 407 723 7843
v.
United States of America United States of America, Defendant
Officially listed as "USA"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Richard Alan Miller +1 202 616 0383 +1 202 307 2503 alan.miller@usdoj.gov
Office COFC
Filed 6/8/1995
Jury Demand
Demand $0
Nature of Suit 352 - Military Pay - Retirement
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1491 Tucker Act
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition Preliminary Injunction
County
Terminated 5/23/1996
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flag CLOSED
  Entries (21) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 20 Filed: 5/23/1996, Entered: 5/29/1996 Judgment*
JUDGMENT entered pursuant to Rule 58 dismissing complaint with prejudice. Each party is to bear its own costs (signed by Clerk). Copy to parties. (FE)
    LREF
    Blank -- Filed: 5/23/1996, Entered: 5/29/1996 Terminated Case
    Case closed. (FE)
      LREF
      Blank 19 Filed: 5/22/1996, Entered: 5/28/1996 Published DecisionCourt Filing
      PUBLISHED DECISION granting [11-1] motion to Dismiss (signed by Judge Robert J. Yock). Copy to parties. (FE)
        LREF
        Blank 18 Filed: 2/1/1996, Entered: 2/8/1996 Reply to Response to Motion
        REPLY by USA to response to [11-1] motion to Dismiss. Service: 2/1/96 (FE)
          LREF
          Blank 17 Filed: 1/16/1996, Entered: 1/23/1996 OrderCourt Filing
          ORDER granting [16-1] motion to Extend Time to reply to plaintiff's response to motion to dismiss and Reply to Response to Motion reset to 2/2/96 for [11-1] motion to Dismiss (signed by Judge Robert J. Yock). Copy to parties. (FE)
            LREF
            Blank 16 Filed: 1/5/1996, Entered: 1/16/1996, Terminated: 1/16/1996 Terminated:
            MOTION by USA (Service : 1/5/96) to Extend Time to reply to plaintiff's response to motion to dismiss until 2/2/96. (FE)
              LREF
              Blank 15 Filed: 12/21/1995, Entered: 1/2/1996 Terminated:
              RESPONSE by RICHARD COLON (Service: 12/18/95 ) to [11-1] motion to Dismiss. Reply due: 1/4/96 (FE)
                LREF
                Blank 14 Filed: 12/11/1995, Entered: 12/12/1995 OrderCourt Filing
                ORDER granting [12-1] motion to Extend Time to respond to Motion to Dismiss and Response to [11-1] motion to Dismiss reset to 1/5/96 (signed by Judge Robert J. Yock). Copy to parties. (FE)
                  LREF
                  Blank 13 Filed: 12/11/1995, Entered: 12/12/1995 OrderCourt Filing
                  ORDER returning Plaintiff's response to Defendant's motion to dismiss [untimely, not signed] and filing once corrections are made (signed by Judge Robert J. Yock). Copy to parties. (FE)
                    LREF
                    Blank 12 Filed: 11/20/1995, Entered: 11/24/1995, Terminated: 12/11/1995 Terminated:
                    MOTION by RICHARD COLON (Service : 11/14/95) to Extend Time to respond to Motion to Dismiss until 1/5/96. Response due: 12/1/95 (FE)
                      LREF
                      Blank 11 Filed: 10/26/1995, Entered: 11/1/1995 Terminated:
                      MOTION by USA (Service : 10/26/95) to Dismiss . Response due: 11/27/95 (FE)
                        LREF
                        Blank 10 Filed: 10/6/1995, Entered: 10/12/1995 Administrative Record
                        Administrative record filed by USA [two volumes]. (FE)
                          LREF
                          Blank 9 Filed: 10/6/1995, Entered: 10/12/1995 OrderCourt Filing
                          ORDER granting [6-1] motion for Leave to File the record and for waiver of copying requirements (signed by Judge Robert J. Yock). Copy to parties. (FE)
                            LREF
                            Blank 8 Filed: 10/4/1995, Entered: 10/6/1995 OrderCourt Filing
                            ORDER granting [7-1] motion to Extend Time within which to respond to complaint and reset Answer deadline to 10/27/95 (signed by Judge Robert J. Yock). Copy to parties. (FE)
                              LREF
                              Blank 7 Filed: 10/3/1995, Entered: 10/5/1995, Terminated: 10/4/1995 Terminated:
                              MOTION by USA (Service: 10/3/95 ) to Extend Time within which to respond to complaint , (until October 27, 1995). Response due: 10/19/95. (HW)
                                LREF
                                Blank 6 Filed: 10/3/1995, Entered: 10/5/1995, Terminated: 10/6/1995 Terminated:
                                MOTION by USA (Service : 10/2/95 ) for Leave to File the record and for waiver of copying requirements . Response due: 10/19/95. (HW)
                                  LREF
                                  Blank 5 Filed: 8/10/1995, Entered: 8/14/1995 OrderCourt Filing
                                  ORDER granting [4-1] motion to Extend Time to respond to complaint and reset Answer deadline to 10/6/95 (signed by Judge Robert J. Yock). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                    LREF
                                    Blank 4 Filed: 8/4/1995, Entered: 8/9/1995, Terminated: 8/10/1995 Terminated:
                                    MOTION by USA (Service: 8/4/95) to Extend Time to respond to complaint [to October 6, 1995]. (FE)
                                      LREF
                                      Blank 3 Filed: 6/16/1995, Entered: 6/20/1995 Notice of Appearance/
                                      NOTICE of Attorney Appearance for USA by Richard Alan Miller Service: 6/16/95 (FE)
                                        LREF
                                        Blank 2 Filed: 6/8/1995, Entered: 6/13/1995 Case Assigned/ReassignedCourt Filing
                                        Notice of assignment to Judge Robert J. Yock. Copy to parties. (FE)
                                          LREF
                                          Blank 1 Filed: 6/8/1995, Entered: 6/13/1995 Complaint
                                          COMPLAINT, FILING FEE $120, RECEIPT #39439. Answer due on 8/7/95. (FE)
                                            LREF

                                            Statistics

                                            This case has been viewed 164 times.

                                            No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                            Space
                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                             
                                            PlainSite
                                            Sign Up
                                            Need Password Help?