PARSKY v. USA
Federal Civil Lawsuit United States Court of Federal Claims, Case No. 1:95-cv-07312-ECH
District Judge Emily C. Hewitt, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo GERALD L. PARSKY, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Gibson Dunn & Crutcher, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space John Curry Millian +1 202 955 8500 +1 202 467 0539 jmillian@gibsondunn.com
v.
United States of America United States of America, Defendant
Officially listed as "USA"
Office COFC
Filed 11/6/1995
Jury Demand
Demand $0
Nature of Suit 511 - Taking - FIRREA
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1491 Tucker Act
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition Preliminary Injunction
County
Terminated 3/1/2001
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flags CLOSED, MEMBER
  Entries (7) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 3 Filed: 3/1/2001, Entered: 3/1/2001
JUDGMENT entered, pursuant to Rule 58, that the complaint is dismissed, with prejudice, and judgment is entered in favor of defendant. (signed by Clerk). Copy to parties. (LD)
    LREF
    Blank 2 Filed: 3/1/2001, Entered: 3/1/2001 Court Filing
    ORDER directing the clerk to enter judgment for defendatn in 95-7312 C. ( signed by Judge Emily C. Hewitt ) Copy to parties. (LD)
      LREF
      Blank -- Filed: 3/1/2001, Entered: 3/1/2001
      Case closed (LD)
        LREF
        Blank -- Filed: 12/15/2000, Entered: 12/15/2000
        CASE reassigned to Judge Emily C. Hewitt . (DS)
          LREF
          Blank 1 Filed: 6/3/1998, Entered: 6/5/1998 Complaint
          COMPLAINT (WESTFED HOLDINGS, INC. related). (HW)
            LREF
            Blank -- Filed: 6/3/1998, Entered: 6/5/1998 Set/Clear Flags
            Consolidated Member Case. See lead case number 92-cv-820 for further proceedings. (HW) Modified on 09/17/1998
              LREF
              Blank -- Filed: 6/3/1998, Entered: 6/5/1998 Case Assigned/Reassigned
              CASE assigned to Chief Judge Loren A. Smith. (HW)
                LREF

                Statistics

                This case has been viewed 115 times.

                No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                Space
                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                 
                PlainSite
                Sign Up
                Need Password Help?