THRALL v. USA
Federal Civil Lawsuit United States Court of Federal Claims, Case No. 1:95-cv-07971-JPW
District Judge John P. Wiese, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo LARRY B. THRALL, Plaintiff
v.
United States of America United States of America, Defendant
Officially listed as "USA"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Frank Jefferson Hughes +1 202 305 3067 +1 202 514 8640 jeff.hughes@usdoj.gov
Office COFC
Filed 12/6/1995
Jury Demand
Demand $0
Nature of Suit 511 - Taking - FIRREA
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1491 Tucker Act
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition Dismissed
County
Terminated 3/21/2006
Origin 1
Reopened
Lead Case
195-cv-00660-JPW None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flags CLOSED, MEMBER
  Entries (9) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 6 Filed: 3/22/2006, Entered: 3/27/2006 Certified Transcript to Attorney
CERTIFIED TRANSCRIPT OF JUDGMENT (See 95-660C) (bre,)
    LREF
    Blank 5 Filed: 3/21/2006, Entered: 3/21/2006
    JUDGMENT (See 95-660C) (lld, )
      LREF
      Blank -- Filed: 2/1/2002, Entered: 2/1/2002
      CASE reassigned to Judge John P. Wiese . (DS)
        LREF
        Blank 4 Filed: 1/11/2002, Entered: 2/1/2002 Case Assigned/ReassignedCourt Filing
        SEE NO. 95-660C FOR Notice of reassignment to Judge John P. Wiese, effective February 1, 2002. Copy to parties. (DS)
          LREF
          Blank 3 Filed: 4/6/1999, Entered: 4/12/1999 Remark
          See Order of 4/6/99 in 90-8 (JT)
            LREF
            Blank 2 Filed: 6/30/1998, Entered: 7/2/1998 Notice of Appearance/
            NOTICE of Attorney Appearance for USA by Frank Jefferson Hughes. See Notice in 95-660 Service : 6/30/98 (JT)
              LREF
              Blank 1 Filed: 6/3/1998, Entered: 6/5/1998 Complaint
              COMPLAINT (HonFed related) (FE)
                LREF
                Blank -- Filed: 6/3/1998, Entered: 6/5/1998 Set/Clear Flags
                Consolidated Member Case. See lead case number 95-660 for further proceedings. (FE)
                  LREF
                  Blank -- Filed: 6/3/1998, Entered: 6/5/1998 Case Assigned/Reassigned
                  CASE assigned to Chief Judge Loren A. Smith. (FE)
                    LREF

                    Statistics

                    This case has been viewed 118 times.

                    No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                    Space
                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                     
                    PlainSite
                    Sign Up
                    Need Password Help?