ALHAM, INC. v. USA
Federal Civil Lawsuit United States Court of Federal Claims, Case No. 1:95-cv-08031-JPW
District Judge John P. Wiese, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo ALHAM, INC., Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Toni C. Lichstein +1 212 530 5000
v.
United States of America United States of America, Defendant
Officially listed as "USA"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Frank Jefferson Hughes +1 202 305 3067 +1 202 514 8640 jeff.hughes@usdoj.gov
Office COFC
Filed 12/6/1995
Jury Demand
Demand $0
Nature of Suit 511 - Taking - FIRREA
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1491 Tucker Act
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition Dismissed - Voluntarily
County
Terminated 12/6/2001
Origin 1
Reopened
Lead Case
195-cv-00660-JPW None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flags CLOSED, MEMBER
  Entries (7) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank -- Filed: 2/1/2002, Entered: 2/1/2002
CASE reassigned to Judge John P. Wiese . (DS)
    LREF
    Blank 4 Filed: 1/11/2002, Entered: 2/1/2002 Case Assigned/ReassignedCourt Filing
    SEE NO. 95-660C FOR Notice of reassignment to Judge John P. Wiese, effective February 1, 2002. Copy to parties. (DS)
      LREF
      Blank 3 Filed: 4/6/1999, Entered: 4/12/1999 Remark
      See Order of 4/6/99 in 90-8 (JT)
        LREF
        Blank 2 Filed: 6/30/1998, Entered: 7/2/1998 Notice of Appearance/
        NOTICE of Attorney Appearance for USA by Frank Jefferson Hughes. See Notice in 95-660 Service : 6/30/98 (JT)
          LREF
          Blank 1 Filed: 6/3/1998, Entered: 6/5/1998 Complaint
          COMPLAINT (HonFed related) (FE)
            LREF
            Blank -- Filed: 6/3/1998, Entered: 6/5/1998 Set/Clear Flags
            Consolidated Member Case. See lead case number 95-660 for further proceedings. (FE)
              LREF
              Blank -- Filed: 6/3/1998, Entered: 11/13/1998 Case Assigned/Reassigned
              CASE assigned to Chief Judge Loren A. Smith . (DS)
                LREF

                Statistics

                This case has been viewed 147 times.

                No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                Space
                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                 
                PlainSite
                Sign Up
                Need Password Help?