ALHAM, INC. v. USA
Federal Civil Lawsuit United States Court of Federal Claims, Case No. 1:95-cv-08032-ECH
District Judge Emily C. Hewitt, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo ALHAM, INC., Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Toni C. Lichstein +1 212 530 5000
v.
United States of America United States of America, Defendant
Officially listed as "USA"
Office COFC
Filed 12/6/1995
Jury Demand
Demand $0
Nature of Suit 511 - Taking - FIRREA
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1491 Tucker Act
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition Dismissed - Voluntarily
County
Terminated 2/1/2001
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flags CLOSED, MEMBER
  Entries (4) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank -- Filed: 12/15/2000, Entered: 12/15/2000
CASE reassigned to Judge Emily C. Hewitt . (DS)
    LREF
    Blank 1 Filed: 6/3/1998, Entered: 6/5/1998 Complaint
    COMPLAINT (WESTFED HOLDINGS, INC. related). (HW)
      LREF
      Blank -- Filed: 6/3/1998, Entered: 6/5/1998 Set/Clear Flags
      Consolidated Member Case. See lead case number 92-cv-820 for further proceedings. (HW) Modified on 09/17/1998
        LREF
        Blank -- Filed: 6/3/1998, Entered: 6/5/1998 Case Assigned/Reassigned
        CASE assigned to Chief Judge Loren A. Smith. (HW)
          LREF

          Statistics

          This case has been viewed 143 times.

          No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
          Space
          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
           
          PlainSite
          Sign Up
          Need Password Help?