FONDEL v. USA
Federal Civil Lawsuit United States Court of Federal Claims, Case No. 1:96-cv-00355-LAS
District Judge Loren A. Smith, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo MATTHEW M. FONDEL, Plaintiff
v.
United States of America United States of America, Defendant
Officially listed as "USA"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space David Douglas Gustafson David.D.Gustafson@usdoj.gov
Office COFC
Filed 6/19/1996
Jury Demand
Demand $0
Nature of Suit 202 - Tax - Declaratory Judgment 28:1507
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1491 Tucker Act
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition Preliminary Injunction
County
Terminated 6/25/1998
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flag CLOSED
  Entries (17) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 13 Filed: 3/5/1999, Entered: 3/11/1999 CAFC Mandate Affirming
MANDATE (certified copy) from CAFC dated March 5, 1999 affirmed [11-1] judgment order. (HW)
    LREF
    Blank -- Filed: 8/21/1998, Entered: 8/24/1998 CAFC Case Number
    CAFC Case Number Re: [12-1] appeal by MATTHEW M. FONDEL CAFC NUMBER: 98-5155 (HW)
      LREF
      Blank 12 Filed: 8/7/1998, Entered: 8/7/1998, Terminated: 3/5/1999 Notice of AppealCourt Filing
      NOTICE OF APPEAL by MATTHEW M. FONDEL. Copy to Defendant, Chief Judge Smith and to CAFC. FILING FEE $ 105.00; RECEIPT # 045964. (HW)
        LREF
        Blank 11 Filed: 6/25/1998, Entered: 6/25/1998
        JUDGMENT entered dismissing complaint without prejudice. (Signed by clerk.) Copy to parties. DC (LD)
          LREF
          Blank -- Filed: 6/25/1998, Entered: 6/25/1998
          Case closed (LD)
            LREF
            Blank 10 Filed: 6/24/1998, Entered: 6/25/1998 Unpublished DecisionCourt Filing
            UNPUBLISHED DECISION dismissing complaint without prejudice. The court refrains from expressing any opinion on the merits. (Signed by Chief Judge Loren A. Smith.) Copy to parties. (LD)
              LREF
              Blank 9 Filed: 11/18/1996, Entered: 11/20/1996 Reply to Response to Motion
              REPLY by USA to response to [4-1] motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction. Service: 11/18/96 (HW)
                LREF
                Blank 8 Filed: 11/8/1996, Entered: 11/13/1996 Proposed Findings of Uncontroverted FactCourt Filing
                PROPOSED FINDINGS of Uncontroverted Fact by MATTHEW M. FONDEL by leave of the Judge. Service: 10/30/96 (FE)
                  LREF
                  Blank 7 Filed: 11/8/1996, Entered: 11/13/1996 Terminated: Court Filing
                  RESPONSE by MATTHEW M. FONDEL (Service: 10/30/96 ) to [4-1] motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction, [4-2] motion to Strike immaterial matter by leave of the Judge. Reply due: 11/18/96 (FE)
                    LREF
                    Blank 7 Filed: 11/8/1996, Entered: 11/13/1996 Terminated: Court Filing
                    MOTION by MATTHEW M. FONDEL (Service: 10/30/96) for Summary Judgment by leave of the Judge. Response due: 12/2/96 (FE)
                      LREF
                      Blank 6 Filed: 9/27/1996, Entered: 10/2/1996 Notice of Appearance/
                      NOTICE of Attorney Appearance for USA by David Douglas Gustafson. Service: 9/27/96 (FE)
                        LREF
                        Blank 5 Filed: 9/3/1996, Entered: 9/5/1996 OrderCourt Filing
                        ORDER returning plaintiff's motion for summary judgment and brief in opposition to defendant's motion, etc. for corrections [proof of service and proposed findings of uncontroverted fact missing] (signed by Chief Judge Loren A. Smith). Copy to parties. (FE)
                          LREF
                          Blank 4 Filed: 8/16/1996, Entered: 8/23/1996 Terminated:
                          MOTION by USA (Service: 8/16/96) to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction or to Strike immaterial matter . Response due: 9/16/96 (FE)
                            LREF
                            Blank 2 Filed: 6/27/1996, Entered: 6/27/1996 Court Filing
                            Notice of assignment to Chief Judge Loren A. Smith. Copy to parties. (FE)
                              LREF
                              Blank 3 Filed: 6/26/1996, Entered: 7/2/1996 Notice of Appearance/
                              NOTICE of Attorney Appearance for USA by William Charles Rapp. Service : 6/26/96 (HW)
                                LREF
                                Blank 1 Filed: 6/19/1996, Entered: 6/20/1996 Complaint
                                COMPLAINT, FILING FEE $120, RECEIPT #041715. Answer due on 8/19/96. (FE)
                                  LREF
                                  Blank -- Filed: 6/19/1996, Entered: 6/20/1996 Case Assigned/Reassigned
                                  CASE assigned to Judge Unassigned. (FE)
                                    LREF

                                    Statistics

                                    This case has been viewed 92 times.

                                    No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                    Space
                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                     
                                    PlainSite
                                    Sign Up
                                    Need Password Help?