NICHOLAS v. USA
Federal Civil Lawsuit United States Court of Federal Claims, Case No. 1:96-cv-00394-JTT
District Judge James T. Turner, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

No Logo LOUELLA T. NICHOLAS, Plaintiff
v.
United States of America United States of America, Defendant
Officially listed as "USA"

Toggle Switch Represented by Ogletree, Deakins, Nash, Smoak & Stewart, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Erin Elizabeth Powell +1 202 887 0855
Office COFC
Filed 7/3/1996
Jury Demand
Demand $0
Nature of Suit 354 - Military Pay - SBP
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1491 Tucker Act
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition Preliminary Injunction
County
Terminated 4/26/1999
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flag CLOSED
  Entries (24) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 22 Filed: 4/26/1999, Entered: 4/26/1999
JUDGMENT entered, pursuant to Rule 58, that the complaint is dismissed. Each party shall bear its own costs. (signed by Clerk). Copy to parties. (LD)
    LREF
    Blank -- Filed: 4/26/1999, Entered: 4/26/1999
    Case closed (LD)
      LREF
      Blank 21 Filed: 4/22/1999, Entered: 4/22/1999 Court Filing
      UNPUBLISHED DECISION granting [18-1] defendant's motion to Dismiss for failure to state a claim upon which relief can be granted, and directing the clerk to enter judgment. Each party shall bear its own costs. ( signed by Judge James T. Turner ). Copy to parties. (LD)
        LREF
        Blank 20 Filed: 2/1/1999, Entered: 2/2/1999 Reply to Response to Motion
        REPLY by USA to response to [18-1] motion to Dismiss for failure to state a claim upon which relief can be granted. Service: 2/1/99 (JT)
          LREF
          Blank 19 Filed: 1/21/1999, Entered: 1/25/1999 Terminated: Court Filing
          RESPONSE by LOUELLA T. NICHOLAS (Service: 1/15/99 ) to [18-1] motion to Dismiss for failure to state a claim upon which relief can be granted, by leave of the Judge. Reply due: 1/29/99. (FE)
            LREF
            Blank 18 Filed: 12/22/1998, Entered: 12/29/1998 Terminated:
            SECOND MOTION by USA (Service : 12/22/98 ) to Dismiss for failure to state a claim upon which relief can be granted. Response due: 1/22/99 (JT)
              LREF
              Blank 17 Filed: 11/24/1998, Entered: 12/2/1998 Published DecisionCourt Filing
              PUBLISHED DECISION granting in part, denying in part [5-1] motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction or on the alternative ground of failure to state a claim on which relief can be granted (DISMISSED IN PART to the extent that Plaintiff asseerts a claim for annuity payments accruing from the due-date of the first payment following LTC Nicholas' death to the last due-date preceding 7/3/90). Set Answer deadline to 12/28/98. ( signed by Judge James T. Turner ). Copy to parties. (JT) Modified on 12/02/1998
                LREF
                Blank 15 Filed: 9/21/1998, Entered: 9/24/1998 Terminated:
                RESPONSE by USA to the Court's 7/22/98 letter to the parties. Service: 9/21/98. (FE) Modified on 09/24/1998
                  LREF
                  Blank 16 Filed: 9/18/1998, Entered: 9/24/1998 Terminated: Court Filing
                  RESPONSE by LOUELLA T. NICHOLAS to Judge's request for view on Supreme Court ruling of Bay Area Laundry and Dry Cleaning Pension Trust Fund v. Ferbar Corporation of California, Inc. and Stephan Barnes. Filed by leave of the Judge. Service: 9/16/98 (JT) Modified on 09/24/1998
                    LREF
                    Blank 14 Filed: 8/24/1998, Entered: 8/25/1998 OrderCourt Filing
                    ORDER granting [13-1] motion to Extend Time to respond to the Court's request for the Defendant's position regarding Bay Area Laundry and Dry Cleaning Pension Trust Fund v. Ferbar Corp of California, Inc. Set Notice of Compliance deadline to 9/21/98 for Defendant to respond to the Court's request. ( signed by Judge James T. Turner ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                      LREF
                      Blank 13 Filed: 8/20/1998, Entered: 8/20/1998, Terminated: 8/24/1998 Motion for Extension of Time
                      MOTION by USA (Service : 8/20/98 ) to Extend Time to respond to the Court's request for the Defendant's position regarding Bay Area Laundry and Dry Cleaning Pension Trust Fund v. Ferbar Corp of California, Inc. [to September 21, 1998]. Response due: 9/8/98 (JT)
                        LREF
                        Blank 12 Filed: 7/24/1998, Entered: 7/28/1998 Notice of Appearance/
                        NOTICE of Attorney Appearance for USA by Erin Elizabeth Powell. Service: 7/24/98. (FE)
                          LREF
                          Blank 11 Filed: 11/21/1996, Entered: 11/26/1996 Reply to Response to Motion
                          REPLY by USA to response to [5-1] motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction. Service: 11/21/96 (HW)
                            LREF
                            Blank 10 Filed: 11/14/1996, Entered: 11/19/1996 OrderCourt Filing
                            ORDER granting [9-1] motion to Extend Time to reply to motion to dismiss and Reply to Response to Motion reset to 11/21/96 for [5-1] motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction (signed by Judge James T. Turner). Copy to parties. (FE)
                              LREF
                              Blank 9 Filed: 11/7/1996, Entered: 11/13/1996, Terminated: 11/14/1996 Terminated:
                              MOTION by USA (Service : 11/7/96) to Extend Time to reply to motion to dismiss (to November 21, 1996). (FE)
                                LREF
                                Blank 8 Filed: 10/24/1996, Entered: 10/28/1996 Terminated: Court Filing
                                RESPONSE by LOUELLA T. NICHOLAS (Service: 10/21/96) to [5-1] motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by leave of the Judge. Reply due: 11/7/96 (FE)
                                  LREF
                                  Blank 7 Filed: 10/2/1996, Entered: 10/4/1996 OrderCourt Filing
                                  ORDER granting [6-1] motion to Extend Time to respond to motion to dismiss and Response to [5-1] motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction reset to 10/28/96 signed by Judge James T. Turner). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                    LREF
                                    Blank 6 Filed: 9/27/1996, Entered: 10/4/1996, Terminated: 10/2/1996 Terminated:
                                    MOTION by LOUELLA T. NICHOLAS (Service: 9/26/96) to Extend Time to respond to motion to dismiss [to October 28, 1996]. (FE)
                                      LREF
                                      Blank 5 Filed: 9/3/1996, Entered: 9/6/1996 Terminated:
                                      MOTION by USA (Service: 9/3/96) to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction . Response due: 10/4/96 (FE)
                                        LREF
                                        Blank 4 Filed: 7/29/1996, Entered: 8/2/1996 OrderCourt Filing
                                        ORDER outlining special procedures to facilitate discovery, conserve resources of the parties and expedite disposition of cases (signed by Judge James T. Turner). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                          LREF
                                          Blank 3 Filed: 7/22/1996, Entered: 7/24/1996 Case Assigned/ReassignedCourt Filing
                                          Notice of assignment to Judge James T. Turner. Copy to parties. (FE)
                                            LREF
                                            Blank 2 Filed: 7/18/1996, Entered: 7/22/1996 Notice of Appearance/
                                            NOTICE of Attorney Appearance for USA by Lauren Springer Moore. Service : 7/17/96. (HW)
                                              LREF
                                              Blank 1 Filed: 7/3/1996, Entered: 7/3/1996
                                              COMPLAINT, FILING FEE $120, RECEIPT #041810. Answer due on 9/3/96. (FE)
                                                LREF
                                                Blank -- Filed: 7/3/1996, Entered: 7/3/1996
                                                CASE assigned to Judge Unassigned. (FE)
                                                  LREF

                                                  Statistics

                                                  This case has been viewed 131 times.

                                                  No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                  Space
                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                   
                                                  PlainSite
                                                  Sign Up
                                                  Need Password Help?