MUSIC SQUARE CHURCH v. USA
Federal Civil Lawsuit United States Court of Federal Claims, Case No. 1:96-cv-00396-RHH
District Judge Robert H. Hodges, Jr., presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo MUSIC SQUARE CHURCH, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space James John Jackson +1 202 232 8288 +1 702 366 0327
v.
United States of America United States of America, Defendant
Officially listed as "USA"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space William Charles Rapp +1 202 307 0503 william.c.rapp2@usdoj.gov
Office COFC
Filed 7/3/1996
Jury Demand
Demand $0
Nature of Suit 202 - Tax - Declaratory Judgment 28:1507
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1491 Tucker Act
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition Preliminary Injunction
County
Terminated 4/15/1999
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flag CLOSED
  Entries (171) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 154 Filed: 9/5/2000, Entered: 9/12/2000 CAFC Mandate Affirming
MANDATE (certified copy) from CAFc dated September 5, 2000 affirmed [152-1] judgment order. (HW)
    LREF
    Blank -- Filed: 6/21/1999, Entered: 6/22/1999 CAFC Case Number
    CAFC Case Number Re: [153-1] appeal by MUSIC SQUARE CHURCH. CAFC NUMBER: 99-5109. (HW)
      LREF
      Blank 153 Filed: 6/11/1999, Entered: 6/11/1999, Terminated: 9/5/2000 Notice of AppealCourt Filing
      NOTICE OF APPEAL by MUSIC SQUARE CHURCH. Copy to Judge Robert H. Hodges, defendant and C.A.F.C. FILING FEE $ 105. RECEIPT # 047657. (FE)
        LREF
        Blank 152 Filed: 4/15/1999, Entered: 4/15/1999
        JUDGMENT entered pursuant to Rule 58, dismissing the complaint with prejudice. No costs or attorney fees are to be assessed against either party. (signed by Clerk). Copy to parties. (DS)
          LREF
          Blank -- Filed: 4/15/1999, Entered: 4/15/1999
          Case closed (DS)
            LREF
            Blank 151 Filed: 4/9/1999, Entered: 4/13/1999 Stipulation
            Stipulation by MUSIC SQUARE CHURCH, USA for entry of judgment. (CDC)
              LREF
              Blank 150 Filed: 3/24/1999, Entered: 3/25/1999 OrderCourt Filing
              ORDER Enlarging time to Respond to [145-1] motion for Partial Summary Judgment as to prospective relief by 4/21/99 . ( signed by Judge Robert H. Hodges). Copy to parties. (FE)
                LREF
                Blank 149 Filed: 3/18/1999, Entered: 3/22/1999 OrderCourt Filing
                ORDER re: settlement of this case. The Court is willing to continue the trial and await further advice from the parties no later than April 9. ( signed by Judge Robert H. Hodges ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                  LREF
                  Blank 148 Filed: 3/16/1999, Entered: 3/18/1999 Terminated:
                  RESPONSE by MUSIC SQUARE CHURCH to [146-2] order. Service: 3/15/99 (JT)
                    LREF
                    Blank 147 Filed: 3/5/1999, Entered: 3/10/1999 Terminated:
                    MOTION by USA (Service : 3/5/99 ) for a scheduling order , for clarification or, in that alternative, for reconsideration and for expedited consideration. (1 Separate Volume of Appendix) Response due: 3/22/99 (JT) Modified on 03/10/1999
                      LREF
                      Blank 147 Filed: 3/5/1999, Entered: 3/10/1999 Terminated:
                      RESPONSE by USA to [146-2] order. (1 Separate Volume of Appendix) Service: 3/5/99 (JT) Modified on 03/10/1999
                        LREF
                        Blank 146 Filed: 3/3/1999, Entered: 3/8/1999 OrderCourt Filing
                        ORDER set Notice of Compliance deadline to 3/17/99 for counsel to notify the court of any days during early April that they are not available for trial. ( signed by Judge Robert H. Hodges ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                          LREF
                          Blank 145 Filed: 2/19/1999, Entered: 2/23/1999 Terminated:
                          MOTION by USA (Service : 2/19/99 ) for Partial Summary Judgment as to prospective relief . Response due: 3/22/99. (FE)
                            LREF
                            Blank 144 Filed: 2/19/1999, Entered: 2/22/1999 Proposed Findings of Uncontroverted Fact
                            PROPOSED FINDINGS of Uncontroverted Fact by USA. Service: 2/19/99 (JT)
                              LREF
                              Blank 143 Filed: 2/16/1999, Entered: 2/17/1999 Terminated:
                              RESPONSE by MUSIC SQUARE CHURCH to [142-2] order. Service: 2/16/99 (JT)
                                LREF
                                Blank 142 Filed: 2/9/1999, Entered: 2/11/1999 OrderCourt Filing
                                ORDER set Notice of Compliance deadline to 2/16/99 for Plaintiff to advise the court how they wish to proceed. ( signed by Judge Robert H. Hodges ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                                  LREF
                                  Blank 141 Filed: 12/18/1998, Entered: 12/21/1998 Terminated:
                                  RESPONSE by MUSIC SQUARE CHURCH to [140-2] order. Service: 12/18/98. (FE)
                                    LREF
                                    Blank 140 Filed: 12/10/1998, Entered: 12/14/1998 OrderCourt Filing
                                    ORDER set Notice of Compliance deadline to 12/18/98 for Plaintiff to advise the court how they expect to make a showing that Plaintiff can qualify as an exempt organization. ( signed by Judge Robert H. Hodges ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                                      LREF
                                      Blank 139 Filed: 12/8/1998, Entered: 12/10/1998 Reply to Response to Motion
                                      REPLY by MUSIC SQUARE CHURCH to response to [136-1] motion to compel deponents to answer deposition questions and complete their deposition testimony. Service: 12/8/98 (JT)
                                        LREF
                                        Blank 138 Filed: 11/24/1998, Entered: 12/2/1998 Terminated:
                                        RESPONSE by USA (Service: 11/24/98 ) to [136-1] motion to compel deponents to answer deposition questions and complete their deposition testimony. Reply due: 12/10/98 (JT)
                                          LREF
                                          Blank 137 Filed: 11/16/1998, Entered: 11/17/1998 OrderCourt Filing
                                          ORDER re: issue before the court; sanctions for improper discovery will be ruled upon at trial. ( signed by Judge Robert H. Hodges ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                                            LREF
                                            Blank 136 Filed: 11/10/1998, Entered: 11/13/1998 Terminated:
                                            MOTION by MUSIC SQUARE CHURCH (Service : 11/10/98 ) to compel deponents to answer deposition questions and complete their deposition testimony. Response due: 11/30/98 (JT)
                                              LREF
                                              Blank 135 Filed: 10/16/1998, Entered: 10/16/1998
                                              TRANSCRIPT of proceedings re: Status Conference, 1 volume, at Washington, D.C., for date of September 30, 1998. Notice to parties. (FE)
                                                LREF
                                                Blank 132 Filed: 9/30/1998, Entered: 10/5/1998 OrderCourt Filing
                                                ORDER vacating all pending orders relating to trial or pretrial schedules. Counsel will agree on a trial date and notify the court. ( signed by Judge Robert H. Hodges ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                                                  LREF
                                                  Blank 131 Filed: 9/30/1998, Entered: 10/2/1998 Proposed Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law
                                                  ISSUES OF FACT AND LAW by MUSIC SQUARE CHURCH. Service: 9/28/98. (FE)
                                                    LREF
                                                    Blank -- Filed: 9/30/1998, Entered: 10/2/1998 Status Conference
                                                    Status Conference held ( Transcript due 10/30/98 ) (DS)
                                                      LREF
                                                      Blank 134 Filed: 9/29/1998, Entered: 10/5/1998 Terminated:
                                                      MOTION by USA (Service : 9/29/98 ) for authorization of service of subpoenas more than 100 miles from place of trial . Response due: 10/16/98. (HW)
                                                        LREF
                                                        Blank 133 Filed: 9/29/1998, Entered: 10/5/1998 Terminated:
                                                        MOTION by USA (Service : 9/29/98 ) for entry of a pretrial scheduling order . Response due: 10/16/98 (HW)
                                                          LREF
                                                          Blank -- Filed: 9/29/1998, Entered: 10/2/1998 Status Conference
                                                          Status Conference set at 10:00 a.m. on 9/30/98 (DS)
                                                            LREF
                                                            Blank 130 Filed: 9/28/1998, Entered: 9/30/1998 Terminated:
                                                            MOTION by USA (Service : 9/28/98 ) in Limine for an order precluding presentation by plaintiff of certain evidence and the testimony of certain witnesses . Response due: 10/15/98. (FE)
                                                              LREF
                                                              Blank 129 Filed: 9/28/1998, Entered: 9/30/1998 Terminated:
                                                              MOTION by USA (Service : 9/28/98 ) for Leave to file unilateral statement of issues . Response due: 10/15/98. (FE)
                                                                LREF
                                                                Blank 128 Filed: 9/28/1998, Entered: 9/30/1998 Memorandum of Contentions of Fact and Law
                                                                MEMORANDUM OF CONTENTIONS OF FACT AND LAW by USA. Service: 9/28/98 (JT)
                                                                  LREF
                                                                  Blank 127 Filed: 9/28/1998, Entered: 9/30/1998 Witness List
                                                                  Witness list by USA. Service: 9/28/98. (FE)
                                                                    LREF
                                                                    Blank 126 Filed: 9/28/1998, Entered: 9/30/1998 Exhibit
                                                                    Exhibit list by USA. Service: 9/28/98. (FE)
                                                                      LREF
                                                                      Blank 125 Filed: 9/25/1998, Entered: 9/29/1998 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                      ORDER denying [124-1] motion For reconsideration of [119-3] order under Rule 83.2. ( signed by Judge Robert H. Hodges, Jr. ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                                                                        LREF
                                                                        Blank 124 Filed: 9/21/1998, Entered: 9/24/1998, Terminated: 9/25/1998 Terminated:
                                                                        MOTION by MUSIC SQUARE CHURCH (Service : 9/21/98 ) For reconsideration of [119-3] order under Rule 83.2. (JT)
                                                                          LREF
                                                                          Blank 123 Filed: 9/17/1998, Entered: 9/23/1998 Terminated:
                                                                          MOTION by USA (Service : 9/17/98 ) for Reconsideration of [119-3] order. (JT)
                                                                            LREF
                                                                            Blank 122 Filed: 9/16/1998, Entered: 9/21/1998 Terminated:
                                                                            RESPONSE by USA (Service: 9/16/98 ) to [113-1] motion for Certification for Interlocutory Appeal. (JT)
                                                                              LREF
                                                                              Blank 121 Filed: 9/15/1998, Entered: 9/21/1998 Reply to Response to MotionCourt Filing
                                                                              REPLY by MUSIC SQUARE CHURCH to response to [112-2] motion requesting a status conference. Filed by leave of the Judge. (JT)
                                                                                LREF
                                                                                Blank 119 Filed: 9/15/1998, Entered: 9/18/1998 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                ORDER denying [113-1] motion for Certification for Interlocutory Appeal. Set Trial for 10:00 a.m., 10/19/98 and set Pretrial Conference for 10:00 a.m., 10/5/98. ( signed by Judge Robert H. Hodges, Jr. ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                  Blank 118 Filed: 9/15/1998, Entered: 9/18/1998 Reply to Response to MotionCourt Filing
                                                                                  REPLY by MUSIC SQUARE CHURCH to response to [85-1] motion to Compel Larry Howlett and Charles Beauregard to complete deposition testimony. Filed by leave of the Judge. Service: 11/20/97 (JT)
                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                    Blank 117 Filed: 9/15/1998, Entered: 9/18/1998 Reply to Response to MotionCourt Filing
                                                                                    REPLY by MUSIC SQUARE CHURCH to response to [87-1] motion to Compel production of documents which were requested of defendant on August 19, 1996. Filed by leave of the Judge. Service: 11/20/97 (JT)
                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                      Blank 116 Filed: 9/15/1998, Entered: 9/18/1998 Reply to Response to MotionCourt Filing
                                                                                      REPLY by MUSIC SQUARE CHURCH to response to [86-1] motion to Compel deponents to answer deposition questions. Filed by leave of the Judge. Service: 11/20/97 (JT)
                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                        Blank 120 Filed: 9/14/1998, Entered: 9/18/1998 Terminated:
                                                                                        RESPONSE by MUSIC SQUARE CHURCH (Service: 9/14/98 ) to [115-1] motion to Extend Time of discovery for Defendant only. Reply due: 9/28/98 (JT)
                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                          Blank 120 Filed: 9/14/1998, Entered: 9/18/1998 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                          REPLY by MUSIC SQUARE CHURCH to response to [112-1] motion to Extend Time of discovery. Service: 9/14/98 (JT)
                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                            Blank 115 Filed: 9/4/1998, Entered: 9/18/1998 Terminated:
                                                                                            MOTION by USA (Service : 9/4/98 ) to Extend Time of discovery for Defendant only [to December 15, 1998]. Response due: 9/21/98 (JT)
                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                              Blank 115 Filed: 9/4/1998, Entered: 9/15/1998 Terminated:
                                                                                              RESPONSE by USA (Service: 9/4/98 ) to [112-1] motion to Extend Time of discovery, [112-2] motion requesting a status conference. Reply due: 9/17/98 (AB)
                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                Blank 113 Filed: 9/3/1998, Entered: 9/8/1998, Terminated: 9/15/1998 Terminated:
                                                                                                MOTION by MUSIC SQUARE CHURCH (Service : 9/3/98 ) for Certification for Interlocutory Appeal. Response due: 9/21/98 (JT)
                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                  Blank 112 Filed: 9/3/1998, Entered: 9/8/1998 Terminated:
                                                                                                  MOTION by MUSIC SQUARE CHURCH (Service : 9/3/98 ) to Extend Time of discovery and requesting a status conference. Response due: 9/21/98 (JT)
                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                    Blank 111 Filed: 8/24/1998, Entered: 8/25/1998 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                    ORDER denying [56-1] motion for Summary Judgment, denying [93-1] motion to Dismiss. Set Notice of Compliance deadline to 9/8/98 for counsel to agree on a trial date during October and notify the court. ( signed by Judge Robert H. Hodges, Jr. ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                      Blank 110 Filed: 6/15/1998, Entered: 6/15/1998
                                                                                                      TRANSCRIPT of proceedings re: Evidentiary Hearing, 1 volume, at Washington, D.C., for date of May 28, 1998. Notice to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                        Blank 109 Filed: 5/28/1998, Entered: 6/1/1998 Terminated:
                                                                                                        MOTION by MUSIC SQUARE CHURCH (Service : 5/28/98 ) for admission of Michael Lee Hertzbert pro hac vice. Response due: 6/15/98 (JT)
                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                          Blank -- Filed: 5/28/1998, Entered: 6/1/1998 Evidentiary Hearing
                                                                                                          Hearing held ( Transcript due 6/29/98 ) (DS)
                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                            Blank 108 Filed: 5/21/1998, Entered: 5/26/1998 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                            ORDER set hearing for: 10:00 a.m., 5/28/98. ( signed by Judge Robert H. Hodges, Jr. ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                              Blank 107 Filed: 5/13/1998, Entered: 5/18/1998 Status Report
                                                                                                              STATUS REPORT by MUSIC SQUARE CHURCH. Service: 5/11/98 (JT)
                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                Blank 106 Filed: 5/11/1998, Entered: 5/14/1998 Status Report
                                                                                                                STATUS REPORT by USA. Service: 5/11/98 (JT)
                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                  Blank 105 Filed: 5/8/1998, Entered: 5/13/1998 Terminated:
                                                                                                                  RESPONSE by USA (Service: 5/8/98 ) to [103-1] motion for status conference. (JT)
                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                    Blank 104 Filed: 5/8/1998, Entered: 5/12/1998 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                    ORDER granting [103-1] motion for status conference. ( signed by Judge Robert H. Hodges, Jr. ) Copy to parties. (DS)
                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                      Blank 103 Filed: 5/8/1998, Entered: 5/12/1998, Terminated: 5/8/1998 Terminated:
                                                                                                                      MOTION by MUSIC SQUARE CHURCH (Service : 5/7/98 ) for status conference. Response due: 5/26/98 (DS)
                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                        Blank 102 Filed: 4/30/1998, Entered: 5/5/1998 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                        ORDER set Notice of Compliance deadline to 5/8/98 for counsel to advise the court whether Plaintiff has other issues that it wishes to pursue in this court. ( signed by Judge Robert H. Hodges, Jr. ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                          Blank 101 Filed: 4/2/1998, Entered: 4/6/1998 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                          REPLY by MUSIC SQUARE CHURCH to response to [99-1] motion for Leave to File Supplement to Opposition to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss. Service: 4/2/98 (DS)
                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                            Blank 100 Filed: 3/31/1998, Entered: 4/2/1998 Terminated: Court Filing
                                                                                                                            RESPONSE by USA (Service: 3/26/98 ) to [99-1] motion for Leave to File Supplement to Opposition to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss. Filed by leave of the Judge. Reply due: 4/13/98 (JT) Modified on 04/02/1998
                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                              Blank 99 Filed: 3/31/1998, Entered: 4/2/1998 Terminated: Court Filing
                                                                                                                              MOTION by MUSIC SQUARE CHURCH (Service : 3/25/98 ) for Leave to File Supplement to Opposition to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss. (Memorandum in Support of Opposition attached) Filed by leave of the Judge. Response due: 4/13/98 (JT) Modified on 04/02/1998
                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                Blank 98 Filed: 12/23/1997, Entered: 1/12/1998 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                REPLY by USA to response to [93-1] motion to Dismiss . Service: 12/23/97 (DS)
                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                  Blank 96 Filed: 12/22/1997, Entered: 12/23/1997 Transcript
                                                                                                                                  TRANSCRIPT of proceedings re: Status Conference, 1 volume, at Washington, D.C., for date of November 21, 1997. Notice to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                    Blank 97 Filed: 12/17/1997, Entered: 12/30/1997 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                    RESPONSE by MUSIC SQUARE CHURCH (Service: 12/17/97 ) to [93-1] motion to Dismiss Reply due: 1/5/98 (JT)
                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                      Blank 95 Filed: 11/21/1997, Entered: 12/4/1997 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                      MOTION by MUSIC SQUARE CHURCH (Service : 11/20/97 ) for Leave to File, out of time, replies in support of motion to compel. (DS)
                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                        Blank 94 Filed: 11/21/1997, Entered: 12/2/1997 Terminated: Court Filing
                                                                                                                                        RESPONSE by USA to plaintiff's request for a status conference. Service: 11/12/97 Filed by leave of the Judge. (CDC) Modified on 12/02/1997
                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                          Blank -- Filed: 11/21/1997, Entered: 11/24/1997 Status Conference
                                                                                                                                          Status Conference held ( Transcript due 12/22/97 ) (DS)
                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                            Blank 93 Filed: 11/19/1997, Entered: 11/25/1997 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                            MOTION by USA (Service : 11/19/97 ) to Dismiss Response due: 12/22/97 (CDC)
                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                              Blank -- Filed: 11/19/1997, Entered: 11/24/1997 Status Conference
                                                                                                                                              Status Conference set at 3:00 on 11/21/97 (DS)
                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                Blank 92 Filed: 11/10/1997, Entered: 11/21/1997 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                RESPONSE by USA (Service: 11/7/97) to [85-1] motion to Compel Larry Howlett and Charles Beauregard to complete deposition testimony. Reply due: 11/24/97. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Blank 91 Filed: 11/10/1997, Entered: 11/21/1997 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                  RESPONSE by USA (Service: 11/7/97) to [87-1] motion to Compel production of documents which were requested of defendant on August 19, 1996. Reply due: 11/24/97. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Blank 90 Filed: 11/10/1997, Entered: 11/20/1997 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                    RESPONSE by USA (Service: 11/10/97) to [86-1] motion to Compel deponents to answer deposition questions. Reply due: 11/24/97. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Blank 88 Filed: 10/28/1997, Entered: 11/5/1997 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                      ORDER re: scheduling hearing on pending motions and the purpose of discovery. ( signed by Judge Robert H. Hodges, Jr. ) Copy to parties. (DS)
                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Blank 87 Filed: 10/24/1997, Entered: 11/3/1997 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                        Second MOTION by MUSIC SQUARE CHURCH (Service : 10/24/97 ) to Compel production of documents which were requested of defendant on August 19, 1996. Response due: 11/10/97 (DS)
                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Blank 86 Filed: 10/24/1997, Entered: 11/3/1997 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                          MOTION by MUSIC SQUARE CHURCH (Service : 10/24/97 ) to Compel deponents to answer deposition questions. Response due: 11/10/97 (DS)
                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Blank 85 Filed: 10/24/1997, Entered: 11/3/1997 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                            MOTION by MUSIC SQUARE CHURCH (Service : 10/24/97 ) to Compel Larry Howlett and Charles Beauregard to complete deposition testimony. Response due: 11/10/97 (DS)
                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Blank 89 Filed: 10/23/1997, Entered: 11/10/1997 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                              MOTION by USA (Service : 10/23/97 ) to Show Cause filed [by leave of the judge]. (Included in response to motion for protective order) Response due: 11/10/97 (DS) Modified on 11/10/1997
                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Blank 89 Filed: 10/23/1997, Entered: 11/10/1997 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                RESPONSE by USA to plaintiff's [unfiled] motion for protective order and cross-motion for an order to show cause filed [by leave of the judge]. Service: 10/20/97 (DS)
                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 84 Filed: 10/20/1997, Entered: 10/29/1997 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER granting [61-1] motion for Protective Order moving place of deposition ( signed by Judge Robert H. Hodges, Jr.) Copy to parties. (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 83 Filed: 10/16/1997, Entered: 10/27/1997 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER re: deposition and directing plaintiff to produce documents requested by defendant. ( signed by Judge Robert H. Hodges, Jr. ) Copy to parties. (DS)
                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 82 Filed: 10/8/1997, Entered: 10/15/1997 Terminated: Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                      RESPONSE by USA to plaintiff's motion for order requiring witnesses to attend deposition outside their own locale. Service: 10/1/97 Filed by leave of the Judge. (CDC)
                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 81 Filed: 10/2/1997, Entered: 10/8/1997 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER directing payment re: depositions ( signed by Judge Robert H. Hodges, Jr. ) Copy to parties. (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 80 Filed: 9/30/1997, Entered: 9/30/1997
                                                                                                                                                                          TRANSCRIPT of proceedings re: status conference, 1 volume, at Washington, D.C., for date of September 25, 1997. Notice to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Blank -- Filed: 9/25/1997, Entered: 9/25/1997
                                                                                                                                                                            Status Conference held ( Transcript due 10/27/97 ) (DS)
                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 77 Filed: 9/24/1997, Entered: 9/26/1997 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                              CROSS MOTION by USA for enlargement of time (to December 19, 1997) for only defendant to conduct discovery ( Service: 9/23/97 ) and RESPONSE to [76-1] motion to Extend Time (to December 19, 1997) to conduct discovery by MUSIC SQUARE CHURCH. Response due: 10/10/97 10/6/97 (DS)
                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Blank -- Filed: 9/24/1997, Entered: 9/25/1997 Status Conference
                                                                                                                                                                                Status Conference set at 10:00 on 9/25/97 (DS)
                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank -- Filed: 9/24/1997, Entered: 9/26/1997 Set/Reset Deadlines:
                                                                                                                                                                                  Deadline updated; Response to [77-1] cross motion reset to 10/10/97 (DS)
                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 79 Filed: 9/23/1997, Entered: 9/26/1997 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER re: directing plaintiffs to respond to this order by 9/29/97 ( signed by Judge Robert H. Hodges, Jr. ) Copy to parties. (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 78 Filed: 9/23/1997, Entered: 9/26/1997 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER re: Status Conference for 10:00am, 9/25/97 ( signed by Judge Robert H. Hodges, Jr. ) Copy to parties. (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 76 Filed: 9/19/1997, Entered: 9/25/1997 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION by MUSIC SQUARE CHURCH (Service : 9/19/97 ) to Extend Time (to December 19, 1997) to conduct discovery. Response due: 10/6/97 (DS)
                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 75 Filed: 9/17/1997, Entered: 9/19/1997 Terminated: Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                          RESPONSE by USA (Service: 9/16/97 ) to motion for Protective Order moving place of deposition. Filed by leave of the Judge. (CDC) Modified on 09/19/1997
                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 74 Filed: 9/11/1997, Entered: 9/16/1997 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION by USA (Service : 9/11/97 ) for pretrial conference . Response due: 9/29/97. (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 73 Filed: 8/14/1997, Entered: 8/15/1997 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                              REPLY by MUSIC SQUARE CHURCH to response to [56-1] motion for Summary Judgment, together with two volume, separate appendix. Service: 8/14/97. (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 71 Filed: 8/1/1997, Entered: 8/7/1997 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER granting [68-1] motion to Extend Time to August 14, 1997, to reply to defendant's opposition to motion for summary judgment. Reply to Response to Motion reset to 8/14/97 for [56-1] motion for Summary Judgment ( signed by Judge Robert H. Hodges, Jr. ) Copy to parties. (CDC)
                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 69 Filed: 7/31/1997, Entered: 8/4/1997 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                  RESPONSE by USA (Service: 7/31/97 ) to [68-1] motion to Extend Time to August 14, 1997, to reply to defendant's opposition to motion for summary judgment. Reply due: 8/11/97 (CDC)
                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 68 Filed: 7/30/1997, Entered: 7/31/1997, Terminated: 8/1/1997 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION by MUSIC SQUARE CHURCH (Service : 7/30/97 ) to Extend Time to August 14, 1997, to reply to defendant's opposition to motion for summary judgment. Response due: 8/13/97 (CDC)
                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 72 Filed: 7/28/1997, Entered: 8/13/1997 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                      REPLY by MUSIC SQUARE CHURCH to response to [67-1] motion to Strike portions of "plaintiff's notice of withdrawal . Service: 7/25/97 (DS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 70 Filed: 7/28/1997, Entered: 8/4/1997 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                        RESPONSE by MUSIC SQUARE CHURCH (Service: 7/22/97 ) to [67-1] motion to Strike portions of "plaintiff's notice of withdrawal Reply due: 8/4/97 (CDC)
                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 67 Filed: 7/17/1997, Entered: 7/31/1997 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION by USA (Service : 7/17/97 ) to Strike portions of "plaintiff's notice of withdrawal . Response due: 8/4/97. (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 66 Filed: 7/17/1997, Entered: 7/30/1997 Statement of Genuine Issues
                                                                                                                                                                                                            STATEMENT OF GENUINE ISSUES by USA Service: 7/17/97 (CDC)
                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 65 Filed: 7/17/1997, Entered: 7/30/1997 Proposed Findings of Uncontroverted Fact
                                                                                                                                                                                                              PROPOSED FINDINGS of Uncontroverted Fact by USA Service: 7/17/97 (CDC)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 60 Filed: 7/17/1997, Entered: 7/23/1997 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                RESPONSE by USA (Service: 7/17/97 ) to [56-1] motion for Summary Judgment, together with separate one volume appendix. Reply due: 8/4/97. (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 64 Filed: 7/16/1997, Entered: 7/29/1997 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER granting [63-1] motion to Withdraw [61-1] motion for Protective Order moving place of deposition ( signed by Judge Robert H. Hodges, Jr. ) Copy to parties. (CDC)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 63 Filed: 7/15/1997, Entered: 7/29/1997, Terminated: 7/16/1997 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION by MUSIC SQUARE CHURCH (Service : 7/15/97 ) to Withdraw [61-1] motion for Protective Order moving place of deposition Response due: 8/1/97 (DS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 62 Filed: 7/14/1997, Entered: 7/25/1997 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER set Notice of Compliance deadline that defendant is to explain promptly if it objects to conducting its depositions in Washington, D.C. ( signed by Judge Robert H. Hodges, Jr. ) Copy to parties. (CDC)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 61 Filed: 7/9/1997, Entered: 7/25/1997, Terminated: 10/20/1997 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION by MUSIC SQUARE CHURCH (Service : 7/9/97 ) for Protective Order moving place of deposition Response due: 7/28/97 (DS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 59 Filed: 6/20/1997, Entered: 6/30/1997 Answer
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ANSWER to Second Amended Petition for Declaratory Judgment (Exempt Organizations) by USA Service: 6/12/97 (CDC)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 58 Filed: 6/20/1997, Entered: 6/30/1997 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER granting [54-1] motion for Leave to File out of time answer to second amended petition for declaratory judgment. ( signed by Judge Robert H. Hodges, Jr. ) Copy to parties. (CDC)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 57 Filed: 6/18/1997, Entered: 6/25/1997 Proposed Findings of Uncontroverted FactCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              PROPOSED FINDINGS of Uncontroverted Fact by MUSIC SQUARE CHURCH Service: 6/16/97 Filed by leave of the Judge. (CDC)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 56 Filed: 6/18/1997, Entered: 6/25/1997, Terminated: 8/24/1998 Terminated: Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION by MUSIC SQUARE CHURCH (Service : 6/16/97 ) for Summary Judgment Filed by leave of the Judge. Response due: 7/17/97 (CDC) Modified on 06/25/1997
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 54 Filed: 6/13/1997, Entered: 6/18/1997, Terminated: 6/20/1997 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION by USA (Service : 6/12/97 ) for Leave to File out of time answer to second amended petition for declaratory judgment. Response due: 6/30/97 (CDC)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 55 Filed: 6/10/1997, Entered: 6/20/1997 Answer
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ANSWER to Second Amended Complaint filed [by leave of the judge]. Service: 6/5/97 (DS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 53 Filed: 6/3/1997, Entered: 6/12/1997 Transcript
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      TRANSCRIPT of proceedings re: Status Conference, 1 volume, at Washington, D.C., for date of May 7, 1997. Notice to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 52 Filed: 5/22/1997, Entered: 5/28/1997 Amended ComplaintCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        AMENDED COMPLAINT by MUSIC SQUARE CHURCH (Answer due 6/4/97 ) amending [1-1] complaint, (by leave of the Judge). Service: 5/15/97. (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 51 Filed: 5/14/1997, Entered: 5/23/1997 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of supplemental compliance by MUSIC SQUARE CHURCH Service: 5/6/97 (CDC)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 50 Filed: 5/14/1997, Entered: 5/23/1997 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER granting [49-1] motion for Leave to File Supplemental Notice of Compliance ( signed by Judge Robert H. Hodges, Jr. ) Copy to parties. (CDC)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 49 Filed: 5/7/1997, Entered: 5/20/1997, Terminated: 5/14/1997 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION by MUSIC SQUARE CHURCH (Service : 5/7/97) for Leave to File Supplemental Notice of Compliance . Response due: 5/27/97 (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 48 Filed: 5/7/1997, Entered: 5/20/1997 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER plaintiff will amend complaint to remove first amendment issues and to clarify issues relating to L.R.C. 7611 ( signed by Judge Robert H. Hodges, Jr. ). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 47 Filed: 5/7/1997, Entered: 5/19/1997 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER plaintiff has made a prima facie showing that it is a proper party to this proceeding and its attorney is authorized to represent the taxpayer corporation. Defendant is directed to respond to plaintiff's requests ( signed by Judge Robert H. Hodges, Jr. ). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 45 Filed: 5/7/1997, Entered: 5/14/1997 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER granting [42-1] motion for Leave to File further response to 4/18/97 Order ( Signed by Judge Robert H. Hodges, Jr. ) Copy to parties. (CDC)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank -- Filed: 5/7/1997, Entered: 5/8/1997 Status Conference
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Status Conference (Hearing) held. ( Transcript due 6/6/97 ) (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 46 Filed: 5/6/1997, Entered: 5/15/1997 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION by USA (Service : 5/6/97) to Dismiss. Response due: 6/6/97 (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 46 Filed: 5/6/1997, Entered: 5/15/1997 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          RESPONSE by USA (Service: 5/6/97 ) to [43-1] motion for Protective Order. Reply due: 5/19/97 (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 44 Filed: 4/28/1997, Entered: 5/12/1997 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION by MUSIC SQUARE CHURCH (Service : 4/28/97 ) for status conference . Response due: 5/15/97 (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 43 Filed: 4/28/1997, Entered: 5/7/1997 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION by MUSIC SQUARE CHURCH (Service : 4/28/97 ) for Protective Order . Response due: 5/15/97 (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 42 Filed: 4/24/1997, Entered: 5/6/1997, Terminated: 5/7/1997 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION by USA (Service : 4/24/97 ) for Leave to File response to 4/18/97 Order and for Leave to File further response to 4/18/97 Order . Response due: 5/12/97. (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 41 Filed: 4/22/1997, Entered: 5/2/1997 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION by MUSIC SQUARE CHURCH (Service : 4/22/97 ) For reconsideration of [39-2] order under Rule 83.2 . (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 40 Filed: 4/22/1997, Entered: 5/2/1997 Status Report
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    STATUS REPORT by USA. Service: 4/22/97 (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 39 Filed: 4/18/1997, Entered: 5/1/1997 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER denying [38-1] motion to Extend Time to complete discovery, and directing defendant to submit a proposal for moving forward by 4/23/97 ( signed by Judge Robert H. Hodges, Jr. ) Copy to parties. (DS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 38 Filed: 4/11/1997, Entered: 4/21/1997, Terminated: 4/18/1997 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION by MUSIC SQUARE CHURCH (Service : 4/11/97 ) to Extend Time to complete discovery ,[until 10/15/97]. Response due: 4/28/97 (AB)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 37 Filed: 4/2/1997, Entered: 4/14/1997 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER denying [36-1] motion to Extend Time to complete discovery ( signed by Judge Robert H. Hodges, Jr. ) Copy to parties. (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 36 Filed: 3/28/1997, Entered: 4/4/1997, Terminated: 4/2/1997 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION by MUSIC SQUARE CHURCH (Service: 3/28/97) to Extend Time to complete discovery until 10/15/97. Response due: 4/14/97. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 35 Filed: 3/26/1997, Entered: 4/3/1997 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of complaince with Court's request re: proof of representation and corporate officer/director status by MUSIC SQUARE CHURCH. Service: 3/26/97. (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 34 Filed: 3/10/1997, Entered: 3/18/1997 Transcript
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                TRANSCRIPT of proceedings re:Status Conference, 1 volume, at Washington, D.C., for date of February 25, 1997. Notice to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank -- Filed: 2/25/1997, Entered: 3/6/1997 Status Conference
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Status Conference held. ( Transcript due 3/27/97 ) (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 33 Filed: 2/20/1997, Entered: 2/28/1997 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER re: Status Conference for 10:00 a.m, 2/25/97 ( signed by Judge Robert H. Hodges, Jr. ) Copy to parties. (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 32 Filed: 2/19/1997, Entered: 2/25/1997 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      RESPONSE by USA (Service: 2/19/97) to [31-1] motion to Compel Production of Documents. Reply due: 3/3/97. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 31 Filed: 2/11/1997, Entered: 2/12/1997 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION by MUSIC SQUARE CHURCH (Service : 2/11/97 ) to Compel Production of Documents . Response due: 2/28/97 (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 30 Filed: 2/7/1997, Entered: 2/12/1997 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION by USA (Service: 2/7/97) to Strike portions of plaintiff's first amended petition for declaratory judgment (exempt organization) . Response due: 2/24/97 (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 29 Filed: 2/7/1997, Entered: 2/12/1997 Answer
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ANSWER to amended Complaint by USA. Service: 2/7/97 (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 28 Filed: 1/31/1997, Entered: 2/5/1997 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER set Discovery deadline to 5/2/97 (signed by Judge Robert H. Hodges, Jr.). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 27 Filed: 1/23/1997, Entered: 1/29/1997 Amended Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                AMENDED COMPLAINT by MUSIC SQUARE CHURCH (Answer due 2/10/97) amending [1-1] complaint. Service: 1/23/97 (FE) Modified on 02/11/1997
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 26 Filed: 1/22/1997, Entered: 1/29/1997 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION by MUSIC SQUARE CHURCH (Service : 1/22/97 ) to Stay proceedings . Response due: 2/10/97 (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 25 Filed: 1/16/1997, Entered: 1/22/1997 Status Report
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    STATUS REPORT by MUSIC SQUARE CHURCH. Service: 1/16/97 (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 24 Filed: 12/23/1996, Entered: 12/30/1996 Status Report/OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      STATUS REPORT ORDER. Status report due on 1/17/97 (signed by Judge Robert H. Hodges, Jr.). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 23 Filed: 12/20/1996, Entered: 12/26/1996 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        RESPONSE by USA (Service: 12/19/96) to [19-1] motion to Compel answers to interrogatories. Reply due: 1/3/97 (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 22 Filed: 12/16/1996, Entered: 12/26/1996 Notice of Change of Address
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of change of address by James John Jackson (DS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 21 Filed: 12/10/1996, Entered: 12/13/1996 Transcript
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            TRANSCRIPT of proceedings re:Status Conference, 1 volume, at Washington, D.C., for date of December 9, 1996. Notice to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank -- Filed: 12/9/1996, Entered: 12/10/1996 Evidentiary Hearing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Evidentiary Hearing held. ( Transcript due 1/8/97 ) (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 20 Filed: 12/6/1996, Entered: 12/10/1996 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER denying [18-1] motion to Stay Proceedings ( signed by Judge Robert H. Hodges, Jr. ). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 19 Filed: 12/4/1996, Entered: 12/9/1996 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION by MUSIC SQUARE CHURCH (Service: 12/4/96) to Compel answers to interrogatories . Response due: 12/23/96 (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 18 Filed: 12/3/1996, Entered: 12/6/1996, Terminated: 12/6/1996 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION by MUSIC SQUARE CHURCH (Service : 12/3/96 ) to Stay Proceedings . Response due: 12/20/96 (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 17 Filed: 11/22/1996, Entered: 11/26/1996 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER granting [6-1] motion to Extend Time within which to respond to discovery request and reset Interrogatories deadline to 12/23/96 (signed by Judge Robert H. Hodges, Jr.). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 16 Filed: 11/13/1996, Entered: 11/15/1996 Additional DocumentationCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Additional Documentation [supplement to motion for an enlargement of time] by MUSIC SQUARE CHURCH by leave of the Judge. Service: 11/6/96 (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 15 Filed: 11/13/1996, Entered: 11/15/1996 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER granting [13-1] motion for leave to file supplement to opposition to motion for enlargement of time (signed by Judge Robert H. Hodges, Jr.). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 13 Filed: 11/7/1996, Entered: 11/12/1996, Terminated: 11/13/1996 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION by MUSIC SQUARE CHURCH (Service : 11/7/96) for leave to file supplement to opposition to motion for enlargement of time . Response due: 11/25/96 (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 14 Filed: 11/6/1996, Entered: 11/12/1996 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER granting in part, denying in part [9-1] motion to Extend Time within which to respond to request for production (signed by Judge Robert H. Hodges, Jr.). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 12 Filed: 10/31/1996, Entered: 11/7/1996 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                REPLY by USA to response to [9-1] motion to Extend Time within which to respond to request for production. Service: 10/31/96 (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 11 Filed: 10/30/1996, Entered: 11/5/1996 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  RESPONSE by MUSIC SQUARE CHURCH (Service:10/28/96) to defendant's [9-1] motion to Extend Time within which to respond to request for production. Reply due: 11/12/96. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 10 Filed: 10/29/1996, Entered: 11/4/1996 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER addressing defendant's motion for an enlargement of time to respond to plaintiff's request for production (signed by Judge Robert H. Hodges, Jr.). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 9 Filed: 10/23/1996, Entered: 10/25/1996, Terminated: 11/6/1996 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION by USA (Service : 10/23/96 ) to Extend Time within which to respond to request for production , (until 12/22/96). Response due: 11/12/96 (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 8 Filed: 10/11/1996, Entered: 10/17/1996 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER set Evidentiary Hearing for questions of law: 10:00 a.m. on 12/9/96 (signed by Judge Robert H. Hodges, Jr.). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 7 Filed: 10/4/1996, Entered: 10/8/1996 Joint Preliminary Status Report
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          JOINT PRELIMINARY STATUS REPORT. (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 6 Filed: 9/23/1996, Entered: 10/2/1996, Terminated: 11/22/1996 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION by USA (Service : 9/23/96 ) to Extend Time within which to respond to discovery request , (until October 23, 1996). Response due: 10/10/96 (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 5 Filed: 9/19/1996, Entered: 9/23/1996 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER reset date Joint Preliminary Status Report due to 10/4/96 (signed by Judge Robert H. Hodges, Jr.). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 4 Filed: 9/3/1996, Entered: 9/6/1996 Answer
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ANSWER to Complaint by USA. Service: 9/3/96. (JPSR due 10/21/96). (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 3 Filed: 7/12/1996, Entered: 7/17/1996 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Attorney Appearance for USA by William Charles Rapp. Service: 7/12/96 (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 2 Filed: 7/3/1996, Entered: 7/9/1996 Case Assigned/ReassignedCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Notice of assignment to Judge Robert H. Hodges, Jr. . Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 1 Filed: 7/3/1996, Entered: 7/9/1996 Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      COMPLAINT (Filed with Exhibits A through E), FILING FEE $120, RECEIPT #041829, Answer due on 9/3/96. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        This case has been viewed 80 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                         
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Need Password Help?