CENTEX CORPORATION, et al v. USA
Federal Civil Lawsuit United States Court of Federal Claims, Case No. 1:96-cv-00494-EGB
District Judge Eric G. Bruggink, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Centex Corporation, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Arnold & Porter, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Melvin Carl Garbow +1 202 942 5000 +1 202 942 5999 melvin_garbow@aporter.com
No Logo CTX HOLDING COMPANY, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Arnold & Porter, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Melvin Carl Garbow +1 202 942 5000 +1 202 942 5999 melvin_garbow@aporter.com
v.
United States of America United States of America, Defendant
Officially listed as "USA"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jeffery Thomas infelise +1 202 616 8254 +1 202 514 8624 jeffery.infelise@usdoj.gov
Office COFC
Filed 8/9/1996
Jury Demand
Demand $0
Nature of Suit 511 - Taking - FIRREA
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1491 Tucker Act
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition Preliminary Injunction
County None
Terminated 2/26/2003
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Cases '03-5095'[], '06-5105'[]
Def Custody Status
Flag CLOSED
  Entries (314) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 286 Filed: 7/9/2007, Entered: 10/10/2007 CAFC Mandate Affirming
MANDATE of CAFC affirming [283] Unpublished Opinion/Order. (hw1, )
    LREF
    Blank -- Filed: 8/17/2006, Entered: 8/17/2006, Terminated: 7/9/2007 CAFC Appeal Fees
    Additional CAFC Appeal Fee received of $5.00, receipt number 065277 re [281] Notice of Appeal filed by CENTEX CORPORATION, CTX HOLDING COMPANY. (hw1, )
      LREF
      Blank 285 Filed: 8/11/2006, Entered: 8/11/2006
      CERTIFIED COPY OF JUDGMENT dated August 11, 2006, forwarded to Jeffery Thomas Infelise, which provides for the recovery by plaintiff as sanctions for violation of Rule 37(c)(1). See letter in file. (bre,)
        LREF
        Blank 284 Filed: 8/1/2006, Entered: 8/1/2006
        JUDGMENT entered, pursuant to Rule 58, that the plaintiffs recover of and from the United States the sum of $351,877.40 as sanctions for violation of RUle 37(c)(1). No further costs. (lld, )
          LREF
          Blank 283 Filed: 8/1/2006, Entered: 8/1/2006 Court Filing
          ORDER directing the clerk to enter judgment against the U.S. in the amount of $351,877.40 as sanctions for violation of Rule 37(c)(1). No further costs. Signed by Judge Eric G. Bruggink. (lld, )
            LREF
            Blank 282 Filed: 7/28/2006, Entered: 7/31/2006 Terminated:
            CAFC Case Number 06-5105 for [281] Notice of Appeal filed by CENTEX CORPORATION, CTX HOLDING COMPANY. (hw1, )
              LREF
              Blank 281 Filed: 7/24/2006, Entered: 7/24/2006, Terminated: 7/9/2007 Notice of Appeal
              NOTICE OF APPEAL, filed by CENTEX CORPORATION, CTX HOLDING COMPANY. Filing fee $ 450.00 paid, receipt number 065173 (additional $5.00 due). Copies to judge, opposing party and CAFC. (hw1, )
                LREF
                Blank 280 Filed: 7/21/2006, Entered: 7/24/2006 Reply to Response to Supplemental Brief
                REPLY to Response to [278] Supplemental Brief , filed by CENTEX CORPORATION, CTX HOLDING COMPANY. Service: 7/21/2006.(mb2, )
                  LREF
                  Blank 279 Filed: 7/5/2006, Entered: 7/7/2006 Response
                  RESPONSE to [278] Supplemental Brief , filed by USA. Service: 7/5/2006.(mb2, )
                    LREF
                    Blank 278 Filed: 6/22/2006, Entered: 6/23/2006 Supplemental Brief
                    SUPPLEMENTAL Declaration of Kent A. Yalowitz, filed by CENTEX CORPORATION. [FILED BY LEAVE OF THE JUDGE] Service: 6/15/2006.(mb2, )
                      LREF
                      Blank 277 Filed: 5/24/2006, Entered: 5/30/2006 Published OpinionCourt Filing
                      PUBLISHED OPINION on [230] MOTION for Attorney Fees pursuant to Rule 37(c), [268] MOTION to Strike [266] Reply to Response to Motion, [258] MOTION for Attorney Fees. Documentation due by 6/16/2006. Response due within 17 days of service. Reply due within 17 days of service. Signed by Judge Eric G. Bruggink. (mb2, )
                        LREF
                        Blank 276 Filed: 2/14/2006, Entered: 2/14/2006 Court Filing
                        TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on January 25, 2006 before Senior Judge Eric G. Bruggink. (dw1)
                          LREF
                          Blank -- Filed: 1/26/2006, Entered: 1/26/2006
                          Set/Reset Transcript Deadlines: Transcript due by 2/27/2006. (vp1, )
                            LREF
                            Blank 275 Filed: 1/11/2006, Entered: 1/17/2006 Order Setting Oral Argument/Hearing on MotionCourt Filing
                            ORDER Setting Hearing on Motion [258] MOTION for Attorney Fees, [230] MOTION for Attorney Fees pursuant to Rule 37(c), [268] MOTION to Strike [266] Reply to Response to Motion: Motion Hearing set for 1/25/2006 at 10:00 AM in National Courts Building before Senior Judge Eric G. Bruggink. Signed by Judge Eric G. Bruggink. (mb2, )
                              LREF
                              Blank 273 Filed: 12/12/2005, Entered: 12/16/2005 Reply to Response to Motion
                              REPLY to Response to Motion re [268] MOTION to Strike [266] Reply to Response to Motion , filed by USA. Service: 12/12/2005.(mb2, )
                                LREF
                                Blank 274 Filed: 12/8/2005, Entered: 12/23/2005 Certified Transcript to Attorney
                                CERTIFIED TRANSCRIPT, dated November 28, 2005, forwarded to Melvin Carl Garbow, which provides for the payment of costs. See letter in file. (bre,)
                                  LREF
                                  Blank 272 Filed: 12/6/2005, Entered: 12/12/2005 Response to Motion
                                  RESPONSE to [268] MOTION to Strike [266] Reply to Response to Motion , filed by CENTEX CORPORATION, CTX HOLDING COMPANY. Reply due by 12/19/2005. Service: 12/6/2005.(mb2, )
                                    LREF
                                    Blank 271 Filed: 11/30/2005, Entered: 12/5/2005 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File RespCourt Filing
                                    ORDER granting [269] Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re [230] MOTION for Attorney Fees pursuant to Rule 37(c). Reply due by 11/30/2000. Signed by Judge Eric G. Bruggink. (mb2, )
                                      LREF
                                      Blank 270 Filed: 11/30/2005, Entered: 12/5/2005 Reply to Response to Motion
                                      REPLY to Response to Motion re [230] MOTION for Attorney Fees pursuant to Rule 37(c) , filed by CENTEX CORPORATION, CTX HOLDING COMPANY. Service: 11/30/2005 by hand.(mb2, )
                                        LREF
                                        Blank 267 Filed: 11/30/2005, Entered: 11/30/2005
                                        Costs Taxed in amount of $ 85,711.99 against defendant (Signed by Clerk of Court) (lld, )
                                          LREF
                                          Blank 269 Filed: 11/28/2005, Entered: 12/2/2005, Terminated: 11/30/2005 Terminated:
                                          MOTION for Extension of Time until 11/30/05 to File Reply to Response to [230] MOTION for Attorney Fees pursuant to Rule 37(c) filed by CENTEX CORPORATION, CTX HOLDING COMPANY. Service: 11/28/05. (dls )
                                            LREF
                                            Blank 268 Filed: 11/28/2005, Entered: 12/1/2005 Terminated:
                                            MOTION to Strike Portions of [266] Reply to Response to Motion , filed by USA. Service: 11/28/2005. Response due by 12/15/2005. (mb2, )
                                              LREF
                                              Blank 266 Filed: 11/16/2005, Entered: 11/18/2005 Reply to Response to Motion
                                              REPLY to Response to Motion re [258] MOTION for Attorney Fees , filed by CENTEX CORPORATION, CTX HOLDING COMPANY. Service: 11/10/2005.(mb2, )
                                                LREF
                                                Blank 265 Filed: 11/16/2005, Entered: 11/18/2005 Order on Motion for Leave to File Excess PagesCourt Filing
                                                ORDER granting [264] Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages on the Reply Memorandum in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Fees Based on the Government's Bad Faith. Signed by Judge Eric G. Bruggink. (mb2, )
                                                  LREF
                                                  Blank 264 Filed: 11/10/2005, Entered: 11/14/2005, Terminated: 11/16/2005 Terminated:
                                                  MOTION for Leave to Exceed Page Limit on the Reply Memorandum in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Fees Based on the Government's Bad Faith, filed by CENTEX CORPORATION, CTX HOLDING COMPANY. Service: 11/10/2005. Response due by 11/28/2005. (mb2, )
                                                    LREF
                                                    Blank 263 Filed: 11/9/2005, Entered: 12/2/2005 Response to Motion
                                                    RESPONSE to [230] MOTION for Attorney Fees pursuant to Rule 37(c) filed by USA. Reply due by 11/28/2005. Service: 11/9/05.(dls)
                                                      LREF
                                                      Blank 262 Filed: 11/8/2005, Entered: 11/10/2005 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File RespCourt Filing
                                                      ORDER granting [261] Motion for Extension of Time to File Response re [230] MOTION for Attorney Fees. Response due by 11/9/2005. Signed by Judge Eric G. Bruggink. (mb2, ) Modified on 12/2/2005 to link to correct document. (dls).
                                                        LREF
                                                        Blank 261 Filed: 11/3/2005, Entered: 11/7/2005, Terminated: 11/8/2005 Terminated:
                                                        MOTION for Extension of Time until 11/9/2005 to File Response as to [230] MOTION for Attorney Fees filed by USA. Service: 11/3/2005. Response due by 11/21/2005. (mb2, ) Modified on 12/2/2005 to link to correct motion. (dls).
                                                          LREF
                                                          Blank 260 Filed: 10/24/2005, Entered: 10/26/2005 Response to Motion
                                                          RESPONSE to [258] MOTION for Attorney Fees and litigation expenses filed by USA. Reply due by 11/7/2005. Service: 10/24/05.(dw1)
                                                            LREF
                                                            Blank 259 Filed: 10/3/2005, Entered: 10/4/2005 Reply to Objections to Bill of Costs
                                                            REPLY to Objections to [254] Bill of Costs, filed by CENTEX CORPORATION, CTX HOLDING COMPANY. Service: 10/3/2005 by hand.(mb2, )
                                                              LREF
                                                              Blank 258 Filed: 9/26/2005, Entered: 9/27/2005 Terminated:
                                                              MOTION for Attorney Fees and Litigation Expenses, filed by CENTEX CORPORATION, CTX HOLDING COMPANY. Service: 9/23/2005. Response due by 10/24/2005. (mb2, ) Modified on 10/12/2005 to correct response date (mb2, ).
                                                                LREF
                                                                Blank 257 Filed: 9/26/2005, Entered: 9/27/2005 Order on Motion for Leave to File Excess PagesCourt Filing
                                                                ORDER granting [256] Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. Signed by Judge Eric G. Bruggink. (mb2, )
                                                                  LREF
                                                                  Blank 256 Filed: 9/23/2005, Entered: 9/26/2005, Terminated: 9/26/2005 Terminated:
                                                                  MOTION for Leave to Exceed Page Limit of Memorandum in support of motion for attorneys' fees by 5 pages filed by CENTEX CORPORATION and CTX HOLDING COMPANY.Service by hand: 9/23/05. Response due by 10/7/2005. (dw1)
                                                                    LREF
                                                                    Blank 255 Filed: 9/19/2005, Entered: 9/21/2005 Objections to Bill of Costs
                                                                    Objections to [254] Bill of Costs, filed by USA. Reply due by 10/3/2005. Service: 9/19/2005.(mb2, )
                                                                      LREF
                                                                      Blank 254 Filed: 8/29/2005, Entered: 8/30/2005 Bill of Costs
                                                                      BILL OF COSTS (with separate memorandum), filed by CENTEX CORPORATION, CTX HOLDING COMPANY. Objection to Bill of Costs due by 9/19/2005. (mb2, ) Modified on 8/30/2005 (mb2, ). [FILED BY LEAVE OF THE JUDGE]
                                                                        LREF
                                                                        Blank 253 Filed: 8/18/2005, Entered: 8/19/2005 Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
                                                                        SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due by 10/7/2005. Response to pending Rule 37(c) Motion due by 11/4/2005. Motion for fees under RCFC 54(d)(2) due by 9/23/2005. Signed by Judge Eric G. Bruggink. (mb2, )
                                                                          LREF
                                                                          Blank 252 Filed: 8/15/2005, Entered: 8/16/2005 Status Report
                                                                          STATUS REPORT and Proposed Briefing Schedule by USA. Service: 8/15/05.(dw1)
                                                                            LREF
                                                                            Blank -- Filed: 7/8/2005, Entered: 7/8/2005
                                                                            Set/Reset Transcript Deadlines: Transcript due by 8/8/2005. (vp1, )
                                                                              LREF
                                                                              Blank 251 Filed: 7/7/2005, Entered: 7/11/2005 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous ReliefCourt Filing
                                                                              ORDER denying [243] Motion Set Briefing Schedule for Fee Applications Under RCFC 54(d)(2). Signed by Judge Eric G. Bruggink. (mb2, )
                                                                                LREF
                                                                                Blank -- Filed: 7/7/2005, Entered: 7/11/2005 Transcript
                                                                                TRANSCRIPT(pg 1-16)preceedings held on 7/6/05 before Judge Eric G. Bruggink. (eph, )
                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                  Blank 250 Filed: 7/6/2005, Entered: 7/11/2005 Memorandum
                                                                                  Corrected Response re: [245] Response to Motion, filed by USA. Service: 6/30/2005.(mb2, )
                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                    Blank 249 Filed: 7/6/2005, Entered: 7/11/2005 Order on Motion For Leave to File.Court Filing
                                                                                    ORDER granting [248] Motion for Leave to File Corrected Version of Response to Plaintiffs' Motion to Set Briefing Schedule for Fee Applications Under RCFC 54(d)(2). Signed by Judge Eric G. Bruggink. (mb2, )
                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                      Blank 248 Filed: 6/30/2005, Entered: 7/5/2005, Terminated: 7/6/2005 Terminated:
                                                                                      MOTION for Leave to File Corrected Version of Response to Plaintiffs' Motion to Set Briefing Schedule for Fee Applications Under RCFC 54(d)(2), filed by USA. Service: 6/30/2005. Response due by 7/18/2005. (mb2, )
                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                        Blank 247 Filed: 6/24/2005, Entered: 6/27/2005 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                        REPLY to Response to Motion re [243] MOTION Set Briefing Schedule for Fee Applications Under RCFC 54(d)(2), filed by CENTEX CORPORATION, CTX HOLDING COMPANY. Service: 6/23/2005.(mb2, )
                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                          Blank 246 Filed: 6/16/2005, Entered: 6/21/2005 Order Setting Oral Argument/Hearing on MotionCourt Filing
                                                                                          ORDER Setting Hearing on Motion [243] MOTION Set Briefing Schedule for Fee Applications Under RCFC 54(d)(2): Oral Argument set for 7/6/2005 at 2:30 PM in National Courts Building before Senior Judge Eric G. Bruggink. Signed by Judge Eric G. Bruggink. (mb2, )
                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                            Blank 245 Filed: 6/16/2005, Entered: 6/20/2005 Response to Motion
                                                                                            RESPONSE to [243] MOTION Set Briefing Schedule for Fee Applications Under RCFC 54(d)(2), filed by USA. Reply due by 6/30/2005. Service: 6/16/2005.(mb2, )
                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                              Blank 244 Filed: 6/15/2005, Entered: 6/17/2005 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                              NOTICE of Appearance by Jeffery Thomas Infelise for USA. Service: 6/15/2005.(mb2, )
                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                Blank 243 Filed: 6/14/2005, Entered: 6/16/2005, Terminated: 7/7/2005 Terminated:
                                                                                                MOTION Set Briefing Schedule for Fee Applications Under RCFC 54(d)(2), filed by CENTEX CORPORATION, CTX HOLDING COMPANY. [FILED BY LEAVE OF THE JUDGE] Service: 6/6/2005. Response due by 6/23/2005. (mb2, )
                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                  Blank 242 Filed: 5/3/2005, Entered: 5/4/2005 Terminated:
                                                                                                  MANDATE of CAFC affirming [225] Published Decision that directed the Clerk of the Court to enter judgment. (hw1, )
                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                    Blank -- Filed: 5/2/2005, Entered: 5/3/2005 Appeal Record Returned
                                                                                                    Appeal record returned from CAFC. (hw1, )
                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                      Blank 241 Filed: 2/4/2004, Entered: 2/6/2004 Notice of Change of Address
                                                                                                      NOTICE of Change of Address by Melvin Carl Garbow. Service: 2/4/04.(hw1, )
                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                        Blank -- Filed: 1/7/2004, Entered: 1/7/2004
                                                                                                        Appeal record sent to CAFC. (hw1, )
                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                          Blank 240 Filed: 8/29/2003, Entered: 9/2/2003 Order on Motion to StayCourt Filing
                                                                                                          ORDER: We therefore find that although RCFC 54(d)(2) does not prohibit us from entertaining pltfs' RCFC 37(c) motion, because the motion is based on a matter not "uniquely separable from the cause of action to be proved at trial," considering it now would be premature. [232] Dft's Motion to Stay proceedings pending appeal is therefore GRANTED. Signed by Judge Eric G. Bruggink. (jcp, )
                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                            Blank 239 Filed: 8/4/2003, Entered: 8/5/2003 Response to Supplemental BriefCourt Filing
                                                                                                            RESPONSE to [238] Pltf's Supplemental Memorandum in Opposition to Motion for a Stay filed by USA, Filed by Leave of the Judge. Service: 7/30/03 by hand.(jcp, )
                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                              Blank 238 Filed: 8/4/2003, Entered: 8/5/2003 Supplemental BriefCourt Filing
                                                                                                              SUPPLEMENTAL MEMORANDUM in Opposition to [232] Dft's Motion for a Stay, Filed by Leave of the Judge. Service: 7/14/03.(jcp, )
                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                Blank 237 Filed: 8/4/2003, Entered: 8/5/2003 Order on Motion For Leave to File.Court Filing
                                                                                                                ORDER granting [236] Pltf's Motion for Leave to File a Supplemental Memorandum in Opposition to Dft's Motion to Stay. On 7/30/03, the court received dft's response to pltfs' supplemental memorandum. Because the court has now allowed pltfs' supplemental memorandum to be filed, dft's response is filed by my leave. The court now deems dft's 5/15/03 motion to stay proceedings regarding pltfs' attorney fees petition as ready for ruling. Signed by Judge Eric G. Bruggink. (jcp, )
                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                  Blank 236 Filed: 7/15/2003, Entered: 7/17/2003, Terminated: 8/4/2003 Terminated:
                                                                                                                  MOTION for Leave to File Supplemental Memorandum in Opposition to Motion for a Stay by CENTEX CORPORATION, CTX HOLDING COMPANY.Service: 7/14/03. Response due by 7/31/2003.(jcp, )
                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                    Blank 234 Filed: 5/28/2003, Entered: 6/3/2003 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                    REPLY to Response to [232] MOTION to Stay regarding plaintiffs' attorneys fees petition filed by UNITED STATES. Service: 5/28/03 by hand.(dls, )
                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                      Blank 233 Filed: 5/19/2003, Entered: 6/3/2003 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                      RESPONSE to [232] MOTION to Stay regarding plaintiffs' attorneys fees petition filed by CENTEX CORPORATION. Reply due by 5/29/2003. Service: 5/19/03 by hand.(dls, ) Modified on 6/3/2003 (dls, ).
                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                        Blank 232 Filed: 5/15/2003, Entered: 5/26/2003 Terminated:
                                                                                                                        MOTION to Stay regarding plaintiffs' attorneys fees petition by UNITED STATES.Service: 5/15/03 by hand. Response due by 5/29/2003 (hw1, )
                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                          Blank 235 Filed: 5/7/2003, Entered: 7/9/2003 Terminated:
                                                                                                                          CAFC Case Number 03-5095 for [229] Notice of Cross Appeal filed by CENTEX CORPORATION, CTX HOLDING COMPANY. (hw1, )
                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                            Blank 231 Filed: 5/5/2003, Entered: 5/6/2003 DeclarationCourt Filing
                                                                                                                            DECLARATION of Kent A. Yalowitz by CENTEX CORPORATION, CTX HOLDING COMPANY, filed by leave of the Judge. Service: 5/2/03.(hw1, )
                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                              Blank 230 Filed: 5/5/2003, Entered: 5/6/2003 Terminated: Court Filing
                                                                                                                              MOTION (together with separate appendix) for Attorney Fees pursuant to Rule 37(c) by CENTEX CORPORATION, CTX HOLDING COMPANY, filed by leave of the Judge. Service: 4/29/03. Response due by 5/30/2003 (hw1, ) Modified on 12/2/2005 to include the rule plaintiffs are filing under. (dls).
                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                Blank 229 Filed: 4/29/2003, Entered: 5/7/2003 Terminated: Court Filing
                                                                                                                                NOTICE OF CROSS APPEAL as to [225] Published Decision by CENTEX CORPORATION, CTX HOLDING COMPANY. Filing fee $ 105.00, receipt number 057087. Copies to Judge, opposing counsel and CAFC.(hw1, )
                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                  Blank 228 Filed: 4/24/2003, Entered: 4/24/2003, Terminated: 5/3/2005 Notice of Appeal
                                                                                                                                  NOTICE OF APPEAL by The United States. Copies to judge, opposing party and CAFC. (hw1, )
                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                    Blank 227 Filed: 3/31/2003, Entered: 3/31/2003
                                                                                                                                    Certified transcript judgment, dated March 13, 2003, forwarded to Melvin Carl Garbow. See letter in file. (bre, )
                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                      Blank 226 Filed: 2/26/2003, Entered: 2/26/2003
                                                                                                                                      JUDGMENT entered pursuant to Rule 58, that the plaintiffs recover of and from the United States the sum of $28,101,105.00 (50% of $55,510,947.00 plus $345,631.00, rounded to the nearest dollar). Costs to plaintiffs.( Signed by Clerk). Copy to parties. (LD) Modified on 03/13/2003
                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                        Blank -- Filed: 2/26/2003, Entered: 2/26/2003
                                                                                                                                        Case closed (LD)
                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                          Blank 225 Filed: 2/24/2003, Entered: 2/25/2003 Published DecisionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                          PUBLISHED DECISION granting in part, denying in part [181-1] cross motion, granting in part, denying in part [177-1] motion for Summary Judgment on Damages (signed by Sr. Judge Eric G. Bruggink). Copy to parties. (HW)
                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                            Blank 224 Filed: 1/8/2003, Entered: 1/13/2003 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                            ORDER denying [222-1] motion for Leave to file a short post-trial brief addressing the double-counting in the plaintiffs' damages claim (signed by Sr. Judge Eric G. Bruggink). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                              Blank 223 Filed: 1/7/2003, Entered: 1/10/2003 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                              RESPONSE by CENTEX CORPORATION, CTX HOLDING COMPANY (Service by hand: 1/7/03) to [222-1] motion for Leave to file a short post-trial brief addressing the double-counting in the plaintiffs' damages claim Reply due: 1/17/03 (HW)
                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                Blank 222 Filed: 1/3/2003, Entered: 1/8/2003, Terminated: 1/8/2003 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                MOTION by USA (Service: 1/3/03) for Leave to file a short post-trial brief addressing the double-counting in the plaintiffs' damages claim . Response due: 1/21/03 (HW)
                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Blank 221 Filed: 12/20/2002, Entered: 1/2/2003 Transcript
                                                                                                                                                  TRANSCRIPT of proceedings re: one volume, at Washington, DC, for date of December 19, 2002, exhibits: none. Notice to parties. (HW)
                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Blank 220 Filed: 12/20/2002, Entered: 12/30/2002 ExhibitCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                    Exhibit list by CENTEX CORPORATION. Service: 12/13/02. Filed by leave of the Judge. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Blank 219 Filed: 12/20/2002, Entered: 12/23/2002 ~Notice (other)Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Supplemental Exhibits by CENTEX CORPORATION, CTX HOLDING COMPANY, filed by leave of the Judge. Filed UNDER SEAL. Service: 12/18/02 (HW)
                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Blank 218 Filed: 12/12/2002, Entered: 12/19/2002 Exhibit
                                                                                                                                                        Supplemental Designation of Exhibits filed by CENTEX CORPORATION, CTX HOLDING COMPANY. Service: 12/12/02 (DS)
                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Blank 217 Filed: 12/12/2002, Entered: 12/16/2002 Exhibit
                                                                                                                                                          Supplemental Exhibit list by USA. Service: 12/12/02. [FILED UNDER SEAL] (FE) Modified on 12/19/2002
                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Blank 216 Filed: 12/11/2002, Entered: 12/13/2002 Status Report
                                                                                                                                                            STATUS REPORT by CENTEX CORPORATION, CTX HOLDING COMPANY. Service: 12/10/02 (HW)
                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Blank 215 Filed: 12/10/2002, Entered: 12/11/2002 Status Report
                                                                                                                                                              STATUS REPORT by USA. Service: 12/10/02 (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Blank 214 Filed: 12/5/2002, Entered: 12/9/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                ORDER that parties are directed to file lists of exhibits supplemental to those included with the summary judgment materials by Notice of Compliance deadline of 5:00 p.m., 12/12/02 ( signed by Sr. Judge Eric G. Bruggink ) Copy to parties. (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 213 Filed: 12/3/2002, Entered: 12/6/2002 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                  RESPONSE by USA to [211-2] order, or, in the alternative for clarification. Service by hand: 12/3/02. FULED UNDER SEAL. (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 212 Filed: 11/14/2002, Entered: 11/20/2002 Transcript
                                                                                                                                                                    TRANSCRIPT of proceedings re: 1 volume, at Washington, D.C., for date of November 8, 2002. Notice to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 211 Filed: 11/13/2002, Entered: 11/18/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER A Hearing to take witnesses' testimony 9:30 a.m. on 12/19/02 (signed by Sr. Judge Eric G. Bruggink). Copy to parties. (LTD) Modified on 12/04/2002
                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 210 Filed: 10/24/2002, Entered: 10/25/2002 MemorandumCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                        SURREPLY by CENTEX CORPORATION, CTX HOLDING COMPANY in support of motion for summary judgment on damages. Filed by leave of the Judge. Service: 10/23/02 FILED UNDER SEAL (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 209 Filed: 10/3/2002, Entered: 10/8/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER oral argument set for 10:00 a.m., 11/8/02 for [181-1] cross motion, set for 10:00 a.m, 11/8/02 for [177-1] motion for Summary Judgment on Damages, set for 10:00 a.m., 11/8/02 for [74-1] motion for Summary Judgment on Liability., set for 10:00 a.m., 11/8/02 for [57-1] cross motion ( signed by Sr. Judge Eric G. Bruggink ) Copy to parties. (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 208 Filed: 10/2/2002, Entered: 10/8/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER denying [198-1] motion for Leave to file declaration in opposition to cross-motion for summary judgment (signed by Sr. Judge Eric G. Bruggink). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 207 Filed: 9/17/2002, Entered: 9/20/2002 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                              REPLY by CENTEX CORPORATION, CTX HOLDING COMPANY to response to [202-1] motion to Strike untimely expert report. Service: 9/17/02. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 206 Filed: 9/13/2002, Entered: 9/18/2002 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                RESPONSE by USA (Service: 9/13/02 (by hand)) to [202-1] motion to Strike untimely expert report. Reply due: 9/24/02 FILED UNDER SEAL (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 205 Filed: 9/9/2002, Entered: 9/11/2002 Memorandum
                                                                                                                                                                                  CORRECTED MEMORANDUM by CENTEX CORPORATION in support of [202-1] motion to Strike untimely expert report by CTX HOLDING COMPANY, CORPORATION. Service: 9/4/02. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 204 Filed: 9/9/2002, Entered: 9/11/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER granting [203-1] motion for Leave to File corrected memorandum in support of motion to strike untimely supplemental expert report Response to [202-1] motion to Strike untimely expert report due 9/19/02 (signed by Sr. Judge Eric G. Bruggink). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 203 Filed: 9/4/2002, Entered: 9/6/2002, Terminated: 9/9/2002 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION by CENTEX CORPORATION, CTX HOLDING COMPANY (Service : 9/4/02 (by hand)) for Leave to File corrected memorandum in support of motion to strike untimely supplemental expert report. Response due: 9/18/02 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 202 Filed: 9/3/2002, Entered: 9/6/2002 Terminated: Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION by CENTEX CORPORATION, CTX HOLDING COMPANY (Service by hand: 8/29/02) to Strike untimely expert report , by leave of the Judge. Response due: 9/12/02. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 201 Filed: 8/28/2002, Entered: 9/4/2002 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                          REPLY by USA to response to [198-1] motion for Leave to file declaration in opposition to cross-motion for summary judgment. Service by hand: 8/28/02. [FILED UNDER SEAL] (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 200 Filed: 8/23/2002, Entered: 8/28/2002 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                            RESPONSE by USA to Plaintiffs' Supplemental Appendix. Service: 8/23/02 FILED UNDER SEAL (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 199 Filed: 8/21/2002, Entered: 8/26/2002 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                              RESPONSE by CENTEX CORPORATION (Service by hand: 8/20/02) to [198-1] motion for Leave to file declaration in opposition to cross-motion for summary judgment. Reply due: 8/29/02. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 198 Filed: 8/15/2002, Entered: 8/19/2002, Terminated: 10/2/2002 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION by USA (Service by hand: 8/15/02) for Leave to file declaration in opposition to cross-motion for summary judgment . Response due: 8/29/02. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 197 Filed: 8/12/2002, Entered: 8/14/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER granting [196-1] motion for Leave to file supplemental appendix Defendant's response to supplemental appendix due 8/23/02 (signed by Sr. Judge Eric G. Bruggink). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 196 Filed: 8/8/2002, Entered: 8/9/2002, Terminated: 8/12/2002 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION by CENTEX CORPORATION (Service: 8/8/02) for Leave to file supplemental appendix . Response due: 8/26/02. FILED UNDER SEAL. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 195 Filed: 8/2/2002, Entered: 8/6/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER granting [186-1] motion to Strike hearsay testimony of Leslie Crawford (signed by Sr. Judge Eric G. Bruggink). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 194 Filed: 8/2/2002, Entered: 8/6/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER denying [185-1] motion to Strike newly disclosed and unsponsored expert exhibits (signed by Sr. Judge Eric G. Bruggink). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 193 Filed: 7/31/2002, Entered: 8/2/2002 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                          RESPONSE by USA (Service: 7/29/02 ) to [186-1] motion to Strike hearsay testimony of Leslie Crawford, [185-1] motion to Strike newly disclosed and unsponsored expert exhibits. Reply due: 8/7/02 (reply to response to cross-motion included) FILED UNDER SEAL (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 193 Filed: 7/31/2002, Entered: 8/2/2002 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                            REPLY by USA to response to [181-1] cross motion. (response to motion to strike evidence included) Service: 7/29/02 FILED UNDER SEAL (JT) Modified on 08/02/2002
                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 192 Filed: 7/31/2002, Entered: 8/2/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER granting [191-1] motion For leave to exceed the page limitation. ( signed by Sr. Judge Eric G. Bruggink ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 191 Filed: 7/29/2002, Entered: 7/31/2002, Terminated: 7/31/2002 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION by USA (Service by hand: 7/29/02) For leave to exceed the page limitation . Response due: 8/12/02. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 190 Filed: 7/16/2002, Entered: 7/18/2002 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  RESPONSE by CENTEX CORPORATION (Service by hand: 7/15/02) to [181-1] cross motion. Reply due: 7/29/02. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 190 Filed: 7/16/2002, Entered: 7/18/2002 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    REPLY by CENTEX CORPORATION to response to [177-1] motion for Summary Judgment on Damages. Service by hand: 7/15/02. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 189 Filed: 7/16/2002, Entered: 7/18/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER granting [188-1] motion For leave to exceed the page limitation (signed by Sr. Judge Eric G. Bruggink). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 188 Filed: 7/15/2002, Entered: 7/17/2002, Terminated: 7/16/2002 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION by CENTEX CORPORATION (Service by hand: 7/15/02) For leave to exceed the page limitation re: response to cross (DS) Modified on 07/18/2002
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 187 Filed: 7/15/2002, Entered: 7/16/2002 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          RESPONSE by CENTEX CORPORATION to [182-1] proposed findings by USA. Service: 7/15/02. FILED UNDER SEAL. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 186 Filed: 7/15/2002, Entered: 7/16/2002, Terminated: 8/2/2002 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION by CENTEX CORPORATION (Service by hand: 7/15/02) to Strike hearsay testimony of Leslie Crawford . Response due: 7/29/02. (LTD) Modified on 07/18/2002
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 185 Filed: 7/15/2002, Entered: 7/16/2002, Terminated: 8/2/2002 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION by CENTEX CORPORATION (Service by hand: 7/15/02) to Strike newly disclosed and unsponsored expert exhibits . Response due: 7/29/02. (LTD) Modified on 07/18/2002
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 184 Filed: 7/15/2002, Entered: 7/16/2002 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of filing of videotape deposition excerpt by CENTEX CORPORATION. Service: 7/15/02. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank -- Filed: 7/15/2002, Entered: 7/16/2002 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Text not available.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank -- Filed: 7/15/2002, Entered: 7/18/2002 Set/Reset Deadlines:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Deadline updated; Response to [188-1] motion For leave to exceed the page limitation due 7/29/02, [186-1] motion to Strike hearsay testimony of Leslie Crawford due 7/29/02, [185-1] motion to Strike newly disclosed and unsponsored expert exhibits due 7/29/02 (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 183 Filed: 6/28/2002, Entered: 7/1/2002 Statement of Genuine IssuesCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      STATEMENT OF GENUINE ISSUES of Material Fact in Dispute by USA. Filed by leave of the Judge. Service: 6/24/02 FILED UNDER SEAL (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 182 Filed: 6/28/2002, Entered: 7/1/2002 Proposed Findings of Uncontroverted FactCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        PROPOSED FINDINGS of Undisputed Fact by USA. Filed by leave of the Judge. Service: 6/24/02 FILED UNDER SEAL (JT) Modified on 07/01/2002
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 181 Filed: 6/28/2002, Entered: 7/1/2002 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          CROSS MOTION by USA ( Service: 6/24/02 ) and RESPONSE to [177-1] motion for Summary Judgment on Damages by CENTEX CORPORATION. (3 Separate Volumes of Appendix) Filed by leave of the judge. Response due: 7/25/02 FILED UNDER SEAL (JT) Modified on 07/01/2002
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank -- Filed: 6/28/2002, Entered: 7/1/2002 Set/Reset Deadlines:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Deadline updated; Response to [181-1] cross motion reset to 7/25/02. (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 180 Filed: 6/20/2002, Entered: 6/21/2002 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION by USA (Service: 6/20/02) to Extend Time within which to respond to motion for summary judgment , (until June 24, 2002). (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 179 Filed: 6/14/2002, Entered: 6/14/2002
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                TRANSCRIPT of proceedings re: 1 volume, at Washington, D.C., for date of May 15, 2002. Notice to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 178 Filed: 5/31/2002, Entered: 6/3/2002 Published DecisionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  PUBLISHED DECISION denying [160-1] motion to dismiss Centrex Corp. (signed by Sr. Judge Eric G. Bruggink). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 177 Filed: 5/29/2002, Entered: 5/29/2002, Terminated: 2/24/2003 Motion for Summary Judgment
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION by CENTEX CORPORATION (Service by hand: 5/23/02) for Summary Judgment on Damages with 3 volume appendix, Tax Materials Appendix (UNDER SEAL), Tax Materials Appendix (Public version) and the Declaration of Jeff A. Mason (UNDER SEAL). Response due: 6/20/02. [Note, service corrected to reflect service by hand, therefore, Response is due 6/20/02.] (LTD) Modified on 06/20/2002
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 176 Filed: 5/29/2002, Entered: 5/29/2002
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of filing of documents under seal by CENTEX CORPORATION. Service: 5/23/02. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 175 Filed: 5/29/2002, Entered: 5/29/2002
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        {REDACTED VERSION} PLAINTIFFS' PROPOSED FINDINGS OF UNCONTROVERTED FACT IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT ON DAMAGES. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 174 Filed: 5/29/2002, Entered: 5/29/2002
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          PROPOSED FINDINGS of Uncontroverted Fact by CENTEX CORPORATION. Service: 5/23/02. FILED UNDER SEAL. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 173 Filed: 5/29/2002, Entered: 5/29/2002 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER granting [172-1] motion For leave to exceed the page limitation for a total of 57 pages (signed by Sr. Judge Eric G. Bruggink). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 172 Filed: 5/23/2002, Entered: 5/24/2002, Terminated: 5/29/2002 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION by CENTEX CORPORATION (Service by hand : 5/23/02 ) For leave to exceed the page limitation for a total of 57 pages . Response due: 6/6/02 (AB)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 171 Filed: 5/16/2002, Entered: 5/17/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER, re: Oral argument held 5/15/02 (signed by Sr. Judge Eric G. Bruggink). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 170 Filed: 5/15/2002, Entered: 5/15/2002 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  REPLY, with one volume of appendix, by CENTEX CORPORATION to response to [165-1] motion to Compel deposition testimony and production of documents. Service by hand: 5/14/02. Filed by leave of the Judge. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 169 Filed: 5/8/2002, Entered: 5/9/2002 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    RESPONSE, with one volume of appendix, by USA (Service by hand: 5/8/02) to [165-1] motion to Compel deposition testimony and production of documents. Reply due: 5/17/02. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 168 Filed: 5/7/2002, Entered: 5/8/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER oral argument set for 2:00 5/15/02 for [165-1] motion to Compel deposition testimony and production of documents , and Response to [165-1] motion to Compel deposition testimony and production of documents due 5/8/02 (signed by Sr. Judge Eric G. Bruggink). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 167 Filed: 4/30/2002, Entered: 5/1/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER, re: see order in 96-494C (signed by Sr. Judge Eric G. Bruggink). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 166 Filed: 4/30/2002, Entered: 5/1/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER oral argument set for 2:00 p.m. on 5/15/02 for [165-1] motion to Compel deposition testimony and production of and Response to [165-1] motion to Compel deposition testimony and production of documents due 5/8/02 (signed by Sr. Judge Eric G. Bruggink). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 165 Filed: 4/24/2002, Entered: 4/24/2002, Terminated: 12/9/2002 Motion to Compel
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION, with two volumes of appendix, by CENTEX CORPORATION (Service: 4/24/02) to Compel deposition testimony and production of documents , and for Expedited hearing of motion . Response due: 5/13/02. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 164 Filed: 4/18/2002, Entered: 4/19/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER granting [163-1] motion to Extend Time within which to take deposition of Mr. Ross Delston . Discovery deadline to 4/30/02 (signed by Sr. Judge Eric G. Bruggink ) Copy to parties. (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 163 Filed: 4/18/2002, Entered: 4/19/2002, Terminated: 4/18/2002 Terminated: Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION by USA (Service: 4/17/02) to Extend Time within which to take deposition of Mr. Ross Delston , (until April 30, 2002). Filed by leave of the Judge. (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 162 Filed: 3/19/2002, Entered: 3/20/2002 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  REPLY by USA to response to [160-1] motion to dismiss Centrex Corp. Service: 3/19/02. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 161 Filed: 3/6/2002, Entered: 3/7/2002 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    RESPONSE, with one volume of appendix, by CENTEX CORPORATION (Service: 3/5/02) to [160-1] motion to dismiss Centrex Corp. Reply due: 3/19/02. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 160 Filed: 2/27/2002, Entered: 2/28/2002 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION, with one volume of Appendix, by USA (Service: 2/27/02) to dismiss Centrex Corp. Response due: 3/13/02. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 159 Filed: 2/7/2002, Entered: 2/7/2002
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        TRANSCRIPT of proceedings re: status conference, 1 volume, at Washington, D.C., for date of February 1, 2002. Notice to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank -- Filed: 2/1/2002, Entered: 2/5/2002 Status Conference
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Status Conference held ( Transcript due 3/4/02 ) (DS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 158 Filed: 1/10/2002, Entered: 1/11/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER Status Conference for 10:00 a.m. 2/1/02 , in the National Courts Building, 717 Madison Pl., N.W., Washington, D.C. (signed by Sr. Judge Eric G. Bruggink). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 157 Filed: 1/4/2002, Entered: 1/7/2002 Transcript
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              TRANSCRIPT of proceedings re: 1 volume, at Washington, D.C., for date of December 20, 2001. Notice to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 156 Filed: 12/20/2001, Entered: 12/26/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER denying [152-1] motion to Compel production of documents and responses to interrogatories, granting [151-1] motion for Protective Order, denying [149-1] motion to Compel the production of financial information pertaining to Plaintiffs' Damages claims (signed by Sr. Judge Eric G. Bruggink). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 155 Filed: 12/20/2001, Entered: 12/21/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER transferring all aspects of this case to Judge Eric G. Bruggink. ( signed by Chief Judge Lawrence M. Baskir and Senior Judge Loren A. Smith ) Copy to parties. (DS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 154 Filed: 12/17/2001, Entered: 12/18/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER oral argument set for 10:00 a.m. on 12/20/01 for [151-1] motion for Protective Order and [149-1] motion to Compel the production of financial information pertaining to Plaintiffs' Damages claims (signed by Sr. Judge Eric G. Bruggink). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 153 Filed: 12/7/2001, Entered: 12/10/2001 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      REPLY by CENTEX CORPORATION to response to [151-1] motion for Protective Order. Service: 12/7/01. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 152 Filed: 11/26/2001, Entered: 11/27/2001, Terminated: 12/20/2001 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        REPLY by USA to response to [149-1] motion to Compel the production of financial information pertaining to Plaintiffs' Damages claims. Service by hand: 11/26/01. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 155 Filed: 11/20/2001, Entered: 11/21/2001 Affidavit
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          DECLARATION OF RAYMOND G. SMERGE by CENTEX CORPORATION, CTX HOLDING COMPANY. Service 11/20/01 (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 154 Filed: 11/20/2001, Entered: 11/21/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER granting [150-1] motion for Leave to file the declaration of Raymond G. Smerge granting [153-1] motion for Leave to file original signed declaration of Raymond G. Smerge ( signed by Sr. Judge Eric G. Bruggink ) Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 153 Filed: 11/13/2001, Entered: 11/14/2001 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION by CENTEX CORPORATION and CTX HOLDING COMPANY (Service: 11/13/01) for Leave to file original signed declaration of Raymond G. Smerge . Response due: 11/30/01. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 152 Filed: 11/9/2001, Entered: 11/13/2001, Terminated: 12/20/2001 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION by CENTEX CORPORATION, CTX HOLDING COMPANY (Service : 11/9/01 ) to Compel production of documents and responses to interrogatories . Response due: 11/26/01 (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 151 Filed: 11/9/2001, Entered: 11/27/2001 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  RESPONSE by CENTEX CORPORATION (Service by hand: 11/9/01 ) to [149-1] motion to Compel the production of financial information pertaining to Plaintiffs' Damages claims. (Included in Plaintiff's Cross Motion for a Protective Order.) (AB) Modified on 11/27/2001
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 151 Filed: 11/9/2001, Entered: 11/13/2001 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    [CROSS]MOTION by CENTEX CORPORATION, CTX HOLDING COMPANY (Service by hand: 11/9/01) for Protective Order (includes Plaintiff's response to Defendant's Motion to Compel.) Response due: 11/26/01 (HW) Modified on 11/27/2001
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 150 Filed: 11/9/2001, Entered: 11/13/2001 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION by CENTEX CORPORATION, CTX HOLDING COMPANY (Service : 11/9/01 ) for Leave to declaration of Raymond G. Smerge . Response due: 11/26/01 (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 149 Filed: 10/26/2001, Entered: 10/29/2001 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION by USA (Service: 10/26/01) to Compel the production of financial information pertaining to Plaintiffs' Damages claims . Response due: 11/13/01. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 148 Filed: 8/24/2001, Entered: 8/27/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER regarding correction of July 6, 2001, Opinion ( signed by Sr. Judge Eric G. Bruggink ) Copy to parties. (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 147 Filed: 8/24/2001, Entered: 8/24/2001, Terminated: 2/26/2003 ResponseCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            RESPONSE (Filed by leave of the Judge) to the Court's Proposed Scheduling Order of 08/21/01 by CENTEX CORPORATION, CTX HOLDING COMPANY. Service: 8/23/01. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 146 Filed: 8/24/2001, Entered: 8/24/2001 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER to file facsimile (Response to proposed scheduling order) by leave (signed by Sr. Judge Eric G. Bruggink) Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 145 Filed: 8/24/2001, Entered: 8/24/2001, Terminated: 2/26/2003 ResponseCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                RESPONSE (Filed by leave of the Judge) by USA to Draft Proposed Order. Service: 8/24/01. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 144 Filed: 8/3/2001, Entered: 8/6/2001 Status Report
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  JOINT STATUS REPORT. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 143 Filed: 8/3/2001, Entered: 8/6/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER re: Revision's to the July 6, 2001, opinion (signed by Sr. Judge Eric G. Bruggink). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 142 Filed: 7/6/2001, Entered: 7/9/2001 Published DecisionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      PUBLISHED DECISION denying [139-1] motion to Strike [138-1] remark, granting [123-1] motion to Dismiss to the extent that Counts II through X of the complaint are dismissed, denying [123-1] cross motion, granting in part, denying in part [119-1] motion for Summary Judgment, Parties shall file a joint proposed schedule for resolving remaining issues on 8/3/01 (signed by Judge Eric G. Bruggink). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 141 Filed: 7/6/2001, Entered: 7/9/2001 Reply to Response to MotionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        REPLY by USA to response to [139-1] motion to Strike [138-1] remark. Filed by leave of the Judge. Service: 6/4/01. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 140 Filed: 7/6/2001, Entered: 7/9/2001 Terminated: Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          RESPONSE by CENTEX CORPORATION (Service: 5/30/01) to [139-1] motion to Strike [138-1] remark. Filed by leave of the Judge. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 139 Filed: 7/6/2001, Entered: 7/9/2001 Terminated: Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION by USA (Service by hand: 5/22/01) to Strike [138-1] remark . Filed by leave of the Judge. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 138 Filed: 7/6/2001, Entered: 7/9/2001 RemarkCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              COMPARISON OF PLAINTIFFS' SUPPLEMENTAL PROPOSED FINDINGS OF UNCONTROVERTED FACT AND DEFENDANT'S STATEMENT OF GENUINE ISSUES. Filed by leave of the Judge. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 137 Filed: 7/6/2001, Entered: 7/6/2001
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                TRANSCRIPT of proceedings 1 volume (190 pages), at Washington, D.C., for date of June 29, 2001. Notice to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 136 Filed: 7/3/2001, Entered: 7/5/2001 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION by CENTEX CORPORATION, CTX HOLDING COMPANY (Service : 7/3/01) for Leave to file recent Federal Circuit decision (Consolidated Edison v. U.S.) Response due: 7/20/01. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank -- Filed: 6/29/2001, Entered: 7/5/2001 Oral Argument
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Oral Argument re: [119-1] motion for Summary Judgment by CTX HOLDING COMPANY, CENTEX CORPORATION ( Transcript due 7/5/01 ), [123-1] motion to Dismiss by USA ( Transcript due 7/5/01 ), [123-1] cross motion by USA ( Transcript due 7/5/01 ) (DS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 135 Filed: 6/26/2001, Entered: 6/27/2001 Statement of Genuine Issues
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      SUPPLEMENTAL STATEMENT OF GENUINE ISSUES filed by USA. Service: 6/26/01 (DS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 134 Filed: 6/6/2001, Entered: 6/8/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER scheduling oral argument for 10:00 a.m. on 6/29/01 for [123-1] motion to Dismiss, [123-1] cross motion, [119-1] motion for Summary Judgment , and for cross-motions for summary judgment in No. 96-811C and 96-590C. ( signed by Judge Eric G. Bruggink ) Copy to parties. (DS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 133 Filed: 6/6/2001, Entered: 6/7/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER Defendant shall file new responses to paragraphs 76, 77 and 80 of plaintiff's September 22, 2000, Proposed Findings of Uncontroverted Fact by 6/26/01 (signed by Judge Eric G. Bruggink). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 132 Filed: 6/1/2001, Entered: 6/5/2001 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            REPLY to response to [123-1] motion to Dismiss and [123-1] cross motion. Service: 6/1/01. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 131 Filed: 5/23/2001, Entered: 5/25/2001 Remark
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Corrected reply memorandum (Service: 5/22/01) in support of second renewed motion for partial summary judgment by CENTEX CORP. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 130 Filed: 5/23/2001, Entered: 5/25/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER granting [129-1] motion for Leave to file corrected brief (signed by Judge Eric G. Bruggink). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 129 Filed: 5/22/2001, Entered: 5/23/2001, Terminated: 5/23/2001 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION by CENTEX CORPORATION and CTX HOLDING COMPANY (Service by hand: 5/22/01) for Leave to file corrected brief . Response due: 6/5/01. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 128 Filed: 5/21/2001, Entered: 5/22/2001 Statement of Genuine Issues
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    STATEMENT OF GENUINE ISSUES by CENTEX CORPORATION. Service by hand: 5/21/01. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 127 Filed: 5/21/2001, Entered: 5/22/2001 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      RESPONSE by CENTEX CORPORATION (Service by hand: 5/21/01) to [123-1] cross motion. Reply due: 6/7/01. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 127 Filed: 5/21/2001, Entered: 5/22/2001 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        REPLY by CENTEX CORPORATION to response to [119-1] motion for Summary Judgment. Service by hand: 5/21/01. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 126 Filed: 5/3/2001, Entered: 5/4/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER clarifying order of 03/28/01 (signed by Judge Eric G. Bruggink). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 125 Filed: 4/23/2001, Entered: 4/24/2001 Proposed Findings of Uncontroverted FactCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            PROPOSED FINDINGS of Uncontroverted Fact by USA, by leave of the Judge. Service: 4/20/01. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 124 Filed: 4/23/2001, Entered: 4/24/2001 Statement of Genuine IssuesCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              STATEMENT OF GENUINE ISSUES by USA, by leave of the Judge. Service: 4/20/01. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 123 Filed: 4/23/2001, Entered: 4/24/2001 Terminated: Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION by USA (Service: 4/20/01) to Dismiss , by leave of the Judge. Response due: 5/21/01. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 123 Filed: 4/23/2001, Entered: 4/24/2001 Terminated: Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  CROSS MOTION by USA (Service: 4/20/01) and RESPONSE to [119-1] motion for Summary Judgment by CTX HOLDING COMPANY, CENTEX CORPORATION, by leave of the Judge. Response due: 5/21/01. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank -- Filed: 4/23/2001, Entered: 4/24/2001 Set/Reset Deadlines:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Deadline updated; Response to [123-1] cross motion reset to 5/21/01 . (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 122 Filed: 3/28/2001, Entered: 3/28/2001 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER denying [121-1] motion to Strike [119-1] motion for Summary Judgment by CTX HOLDING COMPANY, CENTEX CORPORATION ( signed by Judge Eric G. Bruggink ) Copy to parties. (DS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 121 Filed: 3/26/2001, Entered: 3/27/2001, Terminated: 3/28/2001 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION by USA (Service by hand: 3/26/01 ) to Strike [119-1] motion for Summary Judgment by CTX HOLDING COMPANY, CENTEX CORPORATION , and to Expedite . Response due: 4/9/01. (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 120 Filed: 3/22/2001, Entered: 3/23/2001 Proposed Findings of Uncontroverted Fact
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          (Supplemental) PROPOSED FINDINGS of Uncontroverted Fact by CENTEX CORPORATION, CTX HOLDING COMPANY Service: 3/22/01 (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 119 Filed: 3/22/2001, Entered: 3/23/2001 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Second Renewed MOTION by CENTEX CORPORATION and CTX HOLDING COMPANY (Service: 3/22/01 by hand) for Summary Judgment with Appendix (Volumes 1-4). Response due: 4/19/01. (LTD) Modified on 04/23/2001
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 118 Filed: 3/7/2001, Entered: 3/8/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER granting [117-1] motion to Extend Time to file reply in support of their motion for summary judgment, granting in part, denying in part [117-2] motion For leave to exceed the page limitation , (Principal nte - 60; Response nte - 50; and reply nte - 40). Reply shall be filed by 3/22/01 . ( signed by Judge Eric G. Bruggink ) Copy to parties. (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 117 Filed: 3/6/2001, Entered: 3/7/2001, Terminated: 3/7/2001 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION by CENTEX CORPORATION (Service: 3/6/01) to Extend Time to file reply in support of their motion for summary judgment (until 3/22/01), and For leave to exceed the page limitation . Response due: 3/20/01. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 116 Filed: 2/12/2001, Entered: 2/13/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER Motion Filing deadline to 3/12/01 for plaintiff to file renewed motion for summary judgment (signed by Judge Eric G. Bruggink). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 115 Filed: 2/12/2001, Entered: 2/12/2001
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    TRANSCRIPT of proceedings (See: 96-590 for Transcript) 1 volume, at Washington, D.C., for date of February 9, 2001. Notice to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank -- Filed: 2/9/2001, Entered: 2/14/2001 Status Conference
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Status Conference held (see No. 96-590C for transcript of proceedings) (DS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 114 Filed: 2/7/2001, Entered: 2/8/2001 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of New Authority by CENTEX CORPORATION and CTX HOLDING COMPANY. Service: 2/7/01. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 113 Filed: 2/7/2001, Entered: 2/8/2001 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          CORRECTED SURREPLY by CENTEX CORPORATION and CTX HOLDING COMPANY to [97-1] motion reply by USA. Service: 2/7/01. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 112 Filed: 2/7/2001, Entered: 2/8/2001 Published DecisionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            PUBLISHED DECISION granting [106-1] motion for Leave to file notice of New Authority, granting [102-1] motion for Leave to file a corrected surreply memorandum in response to cross-motion for partial summary judgment, granting [100-1] motion for Leave to to file a surreply, denying [93-1] motion to Strike Plaintiffs' reply memorandum and comparison of proposed findings., granting in part, denying in part [86-1] cross motion, granting in part, denying in part [77-1] motion for Summary Judgment (signed by Judge Eric G. Bruggink). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 111 Filed: 2/1/2001, Entered: 2/1/2001 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              SCHEDULING ORDER setting Status conference for 10:00 a.m. 2/9/01, in the National Courts Building, 717 Madison Pl., N.W., Washington, D.C. (signed by Judge Eric G. Bruggink). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 110 Filed: 1/30/2001, Entered: 1/31/2001 Transcript
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                TRANSCRIPT of proceedings, 1 volume, at Washington, D.C., for date of January 19, 2001. Notice to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 109 Filed: 1/29/2001, Entered: 1/30/2001 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Notice of filing: (excerpt of Third Reply in support of its Motion for Summary Judgment) by USA. Service: 1/29/01. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 108 Filed: 1/22/2001, Entered: 1/23/2001 Transcript
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    TRANSCRIPT of proceedings 1 volume, at Washington, D.C., for date of January 17, 2001. Notice to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 107 Filed: 1/22/2001, Entered: 1/22/2001 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER Pursuant to oral argument instructions, defendant's supplemental brief due 1/29/01 ( signed by Judge Emily C. Hewitt ). Copy to parties. (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank -- Filed: 1/19/2001, Entered: 1/19/2001
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Oral Argument re: [86-1] cross motion by USA, [77-1] motion for Summary Judgment by CTX HOLDING COMPANY, CENTEX CORPORATION, [74-1] motion for Summary Judgment on Liability by CTX HOLDING COMPANY, CENTEX CORPORATION, [57-1] cross motion by CENTEX CORPORATION ( Transcript due 2/5/01 ) (DS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 106 Filed: 1/16/2001, Entered: 1/17/2001 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION by CENTEX CORPORATION, CTX HOLDING COMPANY (Service :1/12/01) for Leave to file notice of New Authority Response due: 1/29/01. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 105 Filed: 1/12/2001, Entered: 1/16/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER granting [101-1] motion for Leave to file suggestion regarding structuring of argument at the forthcoming January 17 hearing on the pending motions for summary judgment (signed by Judge Eric G. Bruggink) Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 104 Filed: 1/12/2001, Entered: 1/16/2001 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              RESPONSE by USA (Service: 1/12/01) to [102-1] motion for Leave to file a corrected surreply memorandum in response to cross-motion for partial summary judgment. Reply due: 1/23/01. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 103 Filed: 1/10/2001, Entered: 1/11/2001 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                RESPONSE by USA (Service: 1/10/01 ) to [101-1] motion for Leave to file suggestion regarding structuring of argument at the forthcoming January 17 hearing on the pending motions for summary judgment. Reply due: 1/25/01 (DS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 102 Filed: 1/9/2001, Entered: 1/10/2001 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION by CENTEX CORPORATION, CTX HOLDING COMPANY (Service :1/9/01) for Leave to file a corrected surreply memorandum in response to cross-motion for partial summary judgment Response due: 1/26/01. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 101 Filed: 1/5/2001, Entered: 1/6/2001, Terminated: 1/12/2001 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION by CENTEX CORPORATION, CTX HOLDING COMPANY (Service : 1/5/01 ) for Leave to file suggestion regarding structuring of argument at the forthcoming January 17 hearing on the pending motions for summary judgment . Response due: 1/24/01. (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 100 Filed: 1/5/2001, Entered: 1/6/2001 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION by CENTEX CORPORATION, CTX HOLDING COMPANY (Service: 1/5/01) for Leave to to file a surreply . Response due: 1/24/01. (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 99 Filed: 1/4/2001, Entered: 1/5/2001 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        REPLY by USA to response to [93-1] motion to Strike Plaintiffs' reply memorandum and comparison of proposed findings. Service: 1/4/01 (DS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 98 Filed: 12/26/2000, Entered: 12/28/2000 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          RESPONSE by CENTEX CORPORATION, CTX HOLDING COMPANY (Service by hand: 12/22/00 ) to [93-1] motion to Strike Plaintiffs' reply memorandum and comparison of proposed findings. Reply due: 1/4/01. (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 97 Filed: 12/19/2000, Entered: 12/20/2000 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            REPLY by USA to response to [86-1] cross motion. Service: 12/15/00. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 96 Filed: 12/19/2000, Entered: 12/20/2000 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER granting [95-1] motion For leave, out of time, to exceed the page limitation (signed by Judge Eric G. Bruggink). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 95 Filed: 12/15/2000, Entered: 12/19/2000, Terminated: 12/19/2000 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION by USA (Service : 12/15/00 ) For leave, out of time, to exceed the page limitation. (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 94 Filed: 12/11/2000, Entered: 12/12/2000 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER oral argument set for 10:00 a.m. 1/17/01 for [86-1] cross motion, [77-1] motion for Summary Judgment, [74-1] motion for Summary Judgment on Liability., [57-1] cross motion , in the National Courts Building, 717 Madison Pl., N.W., Washington, D.C. 20005 (signed by Judge Eric G. Bruggink). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 93 Filed: 12/8/2000, Entered: 12/11/2000 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION by USA (Service : 12/8/00 (by hand)) to Strike Plaintiffs' reply memorandum and comparison of proposed findings. Response due: 12/22/00 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 92 Filed: 12/5/2000, Entered: 12/8/2000 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      RESPONSE by CENTEX CORPORATION, CTX HOLDING COMPANY (Service: 12/1/00 (by hand)) to [86-1] cross motion. Reply due: 12/15/00 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 91 Filed: 12/5/2000, Entered: 12/8/2000 Proposed Findings of Uncontroverted Fact
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        PROPOSED FINDINGS of Uncontroverted Fact by CENTEX CORPORATION, CTX HOLDING COMPANY. Service: 12/1/00 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 90 Filed: 12/5/2000, Entered: 12/8/2000 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER granting [89-1] motion For leave to exceed the page limitation. ( signed by Judge Eric G. Bruggink ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 89 Filed: 12/1/2000, Entered: 12/5/2000, Terminated: 12/5/2000 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION by CENTEX CORPORATION, CTX HOLDING COMPANY (Service : 12/1/00 ) For leave to exceed the page limitation. (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 88 Filed: 11/3/2000, Entered: 11/7/2000 Proposed Findings of Uncontroverted FactCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              PROPOSED FINDINGS of Undisputed Fact by USA. Filed by leave of the Judge. Service: 10/31/00 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 87 Filed: 11/3/2000, Entered: 11/7/2000 Statement of Genuine IssuesCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                STATEMENT OF GENUINE ISSUES by USA. Filed by leave of the Judge. Service: 10/31/00 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 86 Filed: 11/3/2000, Entered: 11/7/2000 Terminated: Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  CROSS MOTION by USA ( Service: 10/31/00 ) and RESPONSE to [74-1] motion for Summary Judgment on Liability. by CTX HOLDING COMPANY, CENTEX CORPORATION. (1 Separate Volume of Appendix) Filed by leave of the Judge. Response due: 12/1/00 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank -- Filed: 11/3/2000, Entered: 11/7/2000 Set/Reset Deadlines:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Deadline updated; Plaintiff's Response to [86-1] cross motion reset to 12/1/00. (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 85 Filed: 10/23/2000, Entered: 10/25/2000 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER granting [84-1] motion For leave to exceed the page limitation. ( signed by Judge Eric G. Bruggink ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 84 Filed: 10/19/2000, Entered: 10/24/2000, Terminated: 10/23/2000 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION by USA (Service : 10/19/00 ) For leave to exceed the page limitation. (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 83 Filed: 10/6/2000, Entered: 10/12/2000 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER granting [82-1] motion for Leave to File a notice of new authority. ( signed by Judge Eric G. Bruggink ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 82 Filed: 10/4/2000, Entered: 10/6/2000, Terminated: 10/6/2000 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION by CENTEX CORPORATION, CTX HOLDING COMPANY (Service : 10/4/00 (by hand)) for Leave to File a notice of new authority. (notice attached) Response due: 10/18/00 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 81 Filed: 10/2/2000, Entered: 10/5/2000 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER Response to [74-1] motion for Summary Judgment on Liability reset to 10/31/00 (signed by Judge Eric G. Bruggink). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank -- Filed: 10/2/2000, Entered: 10/5/2000 Status Conference
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Status Conference held (See 95-525C for transcript) (DS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 79 Filed: 9/25/2000, Entered: 9/28/2000 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER set telephonic Status Conference for 2:00 p.m., 10/2/00. ( signed by Judge Eric G. Bruggink ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 80 Filed: 9/22/2000, Entered: 10/3/2000 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER granting the Motion for enlargement to September 29, 2000, within which to respond to Motion to Compel ( signed by Judge Eric G. Bruggink ) Copy to parties. (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 78 Filed: 9/22/2000, Entered: 9/25/2000 Proposed Findings of Uncontroverted Fact
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      PROPOSED FINDINGS of Uncontroverted Fact by CENTEX CORPORATION, CTX HOLDING COMPANY. Service by hand: 9/18/00. (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 77 Filed: 9/22/2000, Entered: 9/25/2000 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        [RENEWED] MOTION by CENTEX CORPORATION, CTX HOLDING COMPANY (Service by hand : 9/18/00 ) for Summary Judgment , together with Second Supplemental Appendix (corrected), and Statutory Appendix (corrected). Response due: 10/16/00. (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 76 Filed: 9/22/2000, Entered: 9/25/2000 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER granting [75-1] motion for Leave to file corrected motion in support of motion for summary judgment ( signed by Judge Eric G. Bruggink ) Copy to parties. (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 75 Filed: 9/19/2000, Entered: 9/21/2000, Terminated: 9/22/2000 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION by CENTEX CORPORATION and CTX HOLDING COMPANY (Service: 9/18/00) for Leave to file corrected motion in support of motion for summary judgment . Response due: 10/10/00. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 74 Filed: 9/18/2000, Entered: 9/19/2000 Terminated: Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION by CENTEX CORPORATION, CTX HOLDING COMPANY (Service : 9/15/00 (by hand)) for Summary Judgment on Liability. (2 Separate Volumes of Appendix) Filed by leave of the Judge. Response due: 10/13/00 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 73 Filed: 9/18/2000, Entered: 9/19/2000 Proposed Findings of Uncontroverted FactCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                PROPOSED FINDINGS of Uncontroverted Fact by CENTEX CORPORATION, CTX HOLDING COMPANY. Filed by leave of the Judge. (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 72 Filed: 9/1/2000, Entered: 9/6/2000 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER set Plaintiff's motion for partial summary judgment filing deadline to 9/15/00. ( signed by Judge Eric G. Bruggink ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 71 Filed: 8/4/2000, Entered: 8/7/2000 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER denying [38-1] motion for partial Summary Judgment Motion Filing deadline to 9/8/00 and First Heights shall file response to the government's pending motion for summary judgment, along with a cross-motion for summary judgment by 9/8/00 (signed by Judge Eric G. Bruggink). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 70 Filed: 7/31/2000, Entered: 7/31/2000
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      TRANSCRIPT of proceedings, 1 volume, at Washingtonm D.C., for date of July 19, 2000. Notice to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 69 Filed: 7/24/2000, Entered: 7/25/2000 Transcript
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        TRANSCRIPT of proceedings, 1 volume, at Washington, D.C., for date of July 18, 2000. Notice to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 68 Filed: 7/19/2000, Entered: 7/24/2000 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER denying [66-1] motion to Strike Plaintiffs' supplemental memorandum in support of Plaintiffs' motion partial summary judgment, denying [66-2] motion for Leave to Respond following 7/18/00 Hearing. ( signed by Judge Eric G. Bruggink ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 67 Filed: 7/19/2000, Entered: 7/22/2000 Terminated: Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            RESPONSE by USA to [61-1] notice by CTX HOLDING COMPANY, CENTEX CORPORATION. Filed by leave of the Judge. Service: 7/17/00 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank -- Filed: 7/19/2000, Entered: 7/20/2000 Oral Argument
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Oral Argument re: [38-1] motion for partial Summary Judgment by CTX HOLDING COMPANY, CENTEX CORPORATION, [47-1] motion for discovery on Plaintiffs' law of misrepresentation claim by USA ( Transcript due 8/18/00 ) (DS) Modified on 07/20/2000
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 66 Filed: 7/17/2000, Entered: 7/20/2000, Terminated: 7/19/2000 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION by USA (Service : 7/17/00 (by hand)) to Strike Plaintiffs' supplemental memorandum in support of Plaintiffs' motion partial summary judgment or, in the alternative, for Leave to Respond following 7/18/00 Hearing. Response due: 7/31/00 (JT) Modified on 07/20/2000
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 65 Filed: 7/14/2000, Entered: 7/19/2000 Memorandum
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  CORRECTED SUPPLEMENTAL MEMORANDUM by CENTEX CORPORATION, CTX HOLDING COMPANY re: motion for partial summary judgment. Service: 7/12/00 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 64 Filed: 7/14/2000, Entered: 7/19/2000 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER filing by leave and granting [63-1] motion for Leave to File corrected memorandum. ( signed by Judge Eric G. Bruggink ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 63 Filed: 7/14/2000, Entered: 7/19/2000, Terminated: 7/14/2000 Terminated: Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION by CENTEX CORPORATION, CTX HOLDING COMPANY (Service : 7/12/00 (by hand)) for Leave to File corrected memorandum. Filed by leave of the Judge. Response due: 7/26/00 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 62 Filed: 7/13/2000, Entered: 7/17/2000 MemorandumCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        SUPPLEMENTAL MEMORANDUM by CENTEX CORPORATION, CTX HOLDING COMPANY re: motion for partial summary judgment. 2 Separate Volumes of Appendix. Filed by leave of the Judge. Service: 7/11/00 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 61 Filed: 7/12/2000, Entered: 7/17/2000 ~Notice (other)Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of New Authority by CENTEX CORPORATION, CTX HOLDING COMPANY. Filed by leave of the Judge. Service: 7/7/00 (JT) Modified on 07/17/2000
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 60 Filed: 7/10/2000, Entered: 7/13/2000 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER granting [59-1] motion to Extend Time of Discovery period to take one deposition. Reset Discovery deadline to 7/13/00. ( signed by Judge Eric G. Bruggink ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 59 Filed: 6/28/2000, Entered: 6/29/2000, Terminated: 7/10/2000 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION by USA (Service: 6/28/00) to Extend Time of Discovery period to take one deposition until 7/13/00. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 58 Filed: 5/22/2000, Entered: 5/23/2000 Transcript
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                TRANSCRIPT of proceedings, 1 volume, at Washington, D.C., for date of May 17, 2000. Notice to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 57 Filed: 5/18/2000, Entered: 5/22/2000 Terminated: Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  CROSS MOTION by CENTEX CORPORATION ( Service: 5/15/00 ) and RESPONSE to motion for status conference. Filed by leave of the Judge. Response due: 6/1/00 (See 95-525 for cross-motion) (JT) Modified on 05/22/2000
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 56 Filed: 5/17/2000, Entered: 5/18/2000 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER oral argument set for 10:00 a.m., 7/18/00 for [38-1] motion for partial Summary Judgment, [47-1] motion for discovery on Plaintiffs' law of misrepresentation claim. ( signed by Judge Eric G. Bruggink ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 55 Filed: 4/27/2000, Entered: 4/28/2000 Memorandum
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      SURREPLY by USA re: request for discovery on Plaintiff's Law of Misrepresentation Claim. Service: 4/18/00 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 54 Filed: 4/27/2000, Entered: 4/28/2000 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER granting [53-1] motion for Leave to File surreply brief in support of request for discovery on Plaintiff's "Law of Misrepresentation" claim. ( signed by Judge Eric G. Bruggink ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 53 Filed: 4/18/2000, Entered: 4/20/2000, Terminated: 4/27/2000 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION by USA (Service : 4/18/00 (by hand)) for Leave to File surreply brief in support of request for discovery on Plaintiff's "Law of Misrepresentation" claim. Response due: 5/2/00 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 52 Filed: 4/4/2000, Entered: 4/4/2000
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            REPLY MEMORANDUM by CENTEX CORPORATION and CTX HOLDING COMPANY re: [38-1] motion for partial Summary Judgment by CTX HOLDING COMPANY and CENTEX CORPORATION. Service by hand : 3/31/00. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 51 Filed: 4/4/2000, Entered: 4/4/2000 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER granting [50-1] motion out of time, for leave to exceed the page limitation (signed by Judge Eric G. Bruggink). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 50 Filed: 3/31/2000, Entered: 4/3/2000, Terminated: 4/4/2000 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION by CENTEX CORPORATION, CTX HOLDING COMPANY, (Service : 3/31/00 ) out of time, for leave to exceed the page limitation. (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 49 Filed: 3/15/2000, Entered: 3/17/2000 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER granting [48-1] motion to Extend Time to reply to response to motion for summary judgment. Plaintiff's reply to response to motion reset to 3/31/00 for [38-1] motion for partial Summary Judgment. ( signed by Judge Eric G. Bruggink ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 48 Filed: 3/15/2000, Entered: 3/17/2000, Terminated: 3/15/2000 Terminated: Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION by CENTEX CORPORATION, CTX HOLDING COMPANY (Service : 3/10/00 (by hand)) to Extend Time to reply to response to motion for summary judgment. Filed by leave of the Judge. Response due: 3/24/00 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 47 Filed: 3/1/2000, Entered: 3/2/2000 Terminated: Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION by USA (Service : 2/24/00 ) for discovery on Plaintiffs' law of misrepresentation claim. (1 Separate Volume of Appendix) Filed by leave of the Judge. Response due: 3/13/00 (response to motion included) (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 47 Filed: 3/1/2000, Entered: 3/2/2000 Terminated: Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        RESPONSE by USA (Service: 2/24/00 ) to [38-1] motion for partial Summary Judgment. (1 Separate Volume of Appendix) Filed by leave of the Judge. Reply due: 3/13/00 (motion for discovery included) (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 46 Filed: 3/1/2000, Entered: 3/2/2000 AffidavitCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          DECLARATION OF COUNSEL by USA. Filed by leave of the Judge. Service 2/24/00 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 45 Filed: 3/1/2000, Entered: 3/2/2000 Statement of Genuine IssuesCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            STATEMENT OF GENUINE ISSUES by USA. Filed by leave of the Judge. Service: 2/24/00 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 44 Filed: 3/1/2000, Entered: 3/2/2000 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER granting [43-1] motion For leave to exceed the page limitation. ( signed by Judge Eric G. Bruggink ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 43 Filed: 2/24/2000, Entered: 2/25/2000, Terminated: 3/1/2000 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION, out of time, by USA (Service : 2/24/00 ) For leave to exceed the page limitation re: response to motion for summary judgment. (DS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 42 Filed: 2/7/2000, Entered: 2/9/2000 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER granting [41-1] motion to Extend Time to respond to Plaintiff's motion for partial summary judgment Response to [38-1] motion for partial Summary Judgment reset to 2/24/00 (signed by Judge Eric G. Bruggink). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 41 Filed: 2/3/2000, Entered: 2/7/2000, Terminated: 2/7/2000 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION by USA (Service : 2/3/00 ) to Extend Time to respond to Plaintiff's motion for partial summary judgment [until February 24, 2000]. Response due: 2/22/00 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 40 Filed: 1/10/2000, Entered: 1/11/2000 Proposed Findings of Uncontroverted Fact
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      PROPOSED FINDINGS of Uncontroverted Fact by CENTEX CORPORATION, CTX HOLDING COMPANY. Service: 1/6/00 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 39 Filed: 1/10/2000, Entered: 1/11/2000 Affidavit
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        DECLARATION of David W. Quinn by CENTEX CORPORATION, CTX HOLDING COMPANY Re: [38-1] motion for partial Summary Judgment by CTX HOLDING COMPANY, CENTEX CORPORATION. Service 1/6/00 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 38 Filed: 1/10/2000, Entered: 1/11/2000, Terminated: 8/4/2000 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION by CENTEX CORPORATION, CTX HOLDING COMPANY (Service : 1/6/00 (by hand)) for partial Summary Judgment. (3 Separate Volumes of Appendix) Response due: 2/3/00 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 37 Filed: 1/10/2000, Entered: 1/11/2000 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER granting [36-1] motion For leave to exceed the page limitation on memorandum in support of motion for partial summary judgment. ( signed by Judge Eric G. Bruggink ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 36 Filed: 1/6/2000, Entered: 1/7/2000, Terminated: 1/10/2000 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION by CENTEX CORPORATION, CTX HOLDING COMPANY (Service by hand: 1/6/00) For leave to exceed the page limitation on memorandum in support of motion for partial summary judgment , out of time. Response due: (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 35 Filed: 11/18/1999, Entered: 11/22/1999 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Attorney Appearance for USA by Paul Gerald Freeborne. Service : 11/18/99 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 34 Filed: 7/1/1999, Entered: 7/1/1999
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  TRANSCRIPT of proceedings (see: 95-525 C for Transcript) 1 volume, at Washington, D.C., for date of June 29, 1999. Notice to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 33 Filed: 1/5/1999, Entered: 1/8/1999 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER granting [32-1] motion to Extend Time within which to file a privilege log by Brief deadline of 1/8/99 ( signed by Judge Eric G. Bruggink ) Copy to parties. (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 32 Filed: 12/23/1998, Entered: 1/8/1999, Terminated: 1/5/1999 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION by USA (Service : 12/23/98 ) to Extend Time within which to file a privilege log , (until 1/8/99). Response due: 1/11/99 (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 31 Filed: 12/7/1998, Entered: 12/10/1998 ~Notice (other)Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Proposed Agenda for Status Conference by CENTEX CORPORATION, CTX HOLDING COMPANY. Filed by leave of the Judge. (See 95-525) Service: 12/2/98 (JT) Modified on 12/10/1998
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 30 Filed: 12/7/1998, Entered: 12/10/1998 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER Defendant shall serve their privilege log on Plaintiffs by 12/21/98. The Government is granted leave to file a supplemental privilege log with respect to Office of Thrift Supervision documents. Defendant shall complete their document production by 12/31/98. Set Defendant's dispositive motion filing deadline to 1/19/99 ; set Notice of Compliance deadline to 1/29/99 for Plaintiffs to file their motion to compel ; set Additional Documents due: 2/9/99 for USA (response to motion to compel) for Plaintiff (response to dispositive motion); 2/23/99 for Plaintiff (reply brief re: motion to compel); for USA (reply brief re: dispositive motion) ; set oral argument regarding the motion to compel on 5:00 p.m., 3/3/99 ; and reset discovery deadline to 6/30/99. ( signed by Judge Eric G. Bruggink ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 29 Filed: 11/19/1998, Entered: 11/23/1998 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Attorney Appearance for USA by Carl Dewey Taylor Jr. Service : 11/19/98. (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 28 Filed: 10/27/1998, Entered: 11/2/1998 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER filing by leave and granting [27-1] motion to Extend Time to respond to Plaintiff's first joint interrogatories and extension of the discovery deadline. Reset Defendant's response to Plaintiffs' first joint interrogatories deadline to 11/6/98 and reset Discovery deadline to 12/30/98. ( signed by Judge Eric G. Bruggink ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 27 Filed: 10/27/1998, Entered: 11/2/1998, Terminated: 10/27/1998 Terminated: Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION by USA (Service : 8/19/98 ) to Extend Time to respond to Plaintiff's first joint interrogatories and extension of the discovery deadline [to November 6, 1998]. Filed by leave of the Judge. (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 26 Filed: 8/28/1998, Entered: 8/31/1998 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER granting [21-1] motion for Protective Order. ( signed by Judge Eric G. Bruggink ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 25 Filed: 8/26/1998, Entered: 8/28/1998 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER granting [23-1] motion to Extend Time to complete production of documents and the time of discovery. Reset Defendant's response to Plaintiffs' first joint set of requests for production deadline to 9/28/98 and reset Discovery deadline to 12/11/98. ( signed by Judge Eric G. Bruggink ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 22 Filed: 8/26/1998, Entered: 8/26/1998
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      SEE 95-525C for REPLY by USA to response to motion to extend time to produce documents. Service: 8/25/98 (AB)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 21 Filed: 8/25/1998, Entered: 8/25/1998, Terminated: 8/28/1998 Motion for Protective Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        SEE 95-525C for Joint Stipulated MOTION by CENTEX CORPORATION, CTX HOLDING COMPANY and USA (Service : 8/25/98 ) for Protective Order Response due: 10/8/96 (AB)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 24 Filed: 8/14/1998, Entered: 8/28/1998 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          RESPONSE by CENTEX CORPORATION, CTX HOLDING COMPANY (Service: 8/14/98 (by hand)) to [23-1] motion to Extend Time to complete production of documents [to September 28, 1998] and the time of discovery [to November 9, 1998]. Reply due: 8/21/98 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 23 Filed: 8/5/1998, Entered: 8/28/1998, Terminated: 8/26/1998 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION by USA (Service : 8/5/98 ) to Extend Time to complete production of documents [to September 28, 1998] and the time of discovery [to November 9, 1998]. Response due: 8/24/98 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 18 Filed: 6/10/1998, Entered: 6/10/1998, Terminated: 6/9/1998 Motion for Extension of Time
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION by USA (Service : 6/10/98 ) to Extend Time Response due: 6/10/98 (AB)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 19 Filed: 6/9/1998, Entered: 6/12/1998 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER granting [18-1] motion to Extend Time, granting [17-1] motion to Extend Time to respond to discovery requests ( Signed by Chief Judge Loren A. Smith for Judge Eric G. Bruggink.) Copy to parties. (CDC)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 17 Filed: 6/4/1998, Entered: 6/5/1998 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  SEE CASE No. 95-525 for MOTION by CENTEX CORPORATION, CTX HOLDING COMPANY (Service : 6/4/98 ) to Extend Time to respond to discovery requests [until July 7, 1998.] Response due: 6/22/98 (CDC)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 16 Filed: 5/21/1998, Entered: 5/27/1998 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    See 95-525 for ORDER re: consideration of defendant's motion for partial dismissal shall be suspended pending further order from the court. The parties are directed to file all future papers using a single caption reflecting all five cases (95-525, 96-584, 96-494, 96-811, 96-590). ( signed by Judge Eric G. Bruggink ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 15 Filed: 5/21/1998, Entered: 5/27/1998 MemorandumCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      See 95-525 for MEMORANDUM by CENTEX CORPORATION, CTX HOLDING COMPANY re: [14-1] joint preliminary status rpt. Filed by leave of the Judge. Service: 4/10/98 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 14 Filed: 3/24/1998, Entered: 3/26/1998 Joint Preliminary Status Report
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        SEE NO. 95-525C FOR JOINT PRELIMINARY STATUS REPORT (DS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 13 Filed: 3/24/1998, Entered: 3/26/1998 Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          SEE NO. 95-525C FOR SCHEDULING ORDER setting Discovery cutoff on 9/22/98; and directing plaintiff to file a supplement to the joint preliminary status report by 4/10/98. ( signed by Judge Eric G. Bruggink ) Copy to parties. (DS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 12 Filed: 2/27/1998, Entered: 3/2/1998 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            SEE 95-525C FOR ORDER granting [11-1] motion to Extend Time to file the joint preliminary status report. reset date Joint Preliminary Status Report due to 3/6/98 ( signed by Judge Eric G. Bruggink ) Copy to parties. (DS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 11 Filed: 2/27/1998, Entered: 3/2/1998, Terminated: 2/27/1998 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              SEE 95-525C FOR MOTION by CENTEX CORPORATION (Service : 2/25/98 ) to Extend Time to file the joint preliminary status report. (DS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 10 Filed: 2/23/1998, Entered: 2/25/1998 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                SEE 95-525C FOR ORDER granting [9-1] motion to Extend Time (to February 25, 1998) to file the joint preliminary status report. reset date Joint Preliminary Status Report due to 2/25/98 ( signed by Judge Eric G. Bruggink ) Copy to parties. (DS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 9 Filed: 2/23/1998, Entered: 2/25/1998, Terminated: 2/23/1998 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  SEE NO. 95-525C FOR MOTION by USA (Service : 2/13/98 ) to Extend Time (to February 25, 1998) to file the joint preliminary status report. (DS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 8 Filed: 1/22/1998, Entered: 1/29/1998 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER set date Joint Preliminary Status Report due to 2/13/98. ( signed by Judge Eric G. Bruggink ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 7 Filed: 1/9/1998, Entered: 1/22/1998 Case Assigned/ReassignedCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Notice of reassignment to Judge Eric G. Bruggink . Copy to parties. (DS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 6 Filed: 1/9/1998, Entered: 1/22/1998 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        SEE NO. 95-525C FOR ORDER reassigning case to Judge Bruggink. ( signed by Chief Judge Loren A. Smith ) Copy to parties. (DS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 5 Filed: 3/26/1997, Entered: 4/3/1997 Remark
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          *** See 96-590 C for motion for entry of supplemental case management Order, etc. *** (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 4 Filed: 10/8/1996, Entered: 10/10/1996 Answer
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ANSWER to Complaint by USA Service: 10/8/96 ( JPSR due 11/25/96 ) (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 3 Filed: 8/22/1996, Entered: 8/28/1996 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Attorney Appearance for USA by Lee McWethy Straus. Service : 8/22/96. (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank -- Filed: 8/21/1996, Entered: 8/21/1996
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 2 Filed: 8/9/1996, Entered: 8/13/1996 Case Assigned/ReassignedCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Notice of assignment to Chief Judge Loren A. Smith. Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 1 Filed: 8/9/1996, Entered: 8/13/1996 Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    COMPLAINT, FILING FEE $120, RECEIPT #042062. Answer due on 10/8/96. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      This case has been viewed 332 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                       
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Need Password Help?