HEMINGWAY v. USA
Federal Civil Lawsuit United States Court of Federal Claims, Case No. 1:96-cv-00498-RHH
District Judge Robert H. Hodges, Jr., presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo MARK ALAN HEMINGWAY, Plaintiff
v.
United States of America United States of America, Defendant
Officially listed as "USA"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space John Sinclair Groat +1 202 616 8260 +1 202 514 7965 jack.groat@usdoj.gov
Office COFC
Filed 8/12/1996
Jury Demand
Demand $0
Nature of Suit 346 - Military Pay - Correct/Reinstate
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1491 Tucker Act
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition Preliminary Injunction
County
Terminated 10/22/1998
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flag CLOSED
  Entries (23) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 21 Filed: 10/22/1998, Entered: 10/27/1998 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by MARK ALAN HEMINGWAY. Complaint dismissed pursuant to Rule 41 (a)(1)(A). Copy to parties. (JT)
    LREF
    Blank -- Filed: 10/22/1998, Entered: 10/27/1998 Terminated Case
    Case closed. (JT)
      LREF
      Blank 20 Filed: 5/4/1998, Entered: 5/6/1998 Status Report
      STATUS REPORT by MARK ALAN HEMINGWAY. Service: 5/1/98 (JT)
        LREF
        Blank 19 Filed: 5/4/1998, Entered: 5/6/1998 Status Report
        STATUS REPORT by USA. Service: 5/4/98 (JT)
          LREF
          Blank 18 Filed: 4/17/1998, Entered: 4/21/1998 OrderCourt Filing
          ORDER re: the 1/22/98 status report stated that settlement was expected within the next 30 days. The parties are to file a stipulation of dismissal immediately or explain the current status. ( signed by Judge Robert H. Hodges, Jr. ) Copy to parties. (JT)
            LREF
            Blank 17 Filed: 1/22/1998, Entered: 1/23/1998 Status Report
            STATUS REPORT by USA Service: 1/22/98 (CDC)
              LREF
              Blank 16 Filed: 1/16/1998, Entered: 1/21/1998 OrderCourt Filing
              ORDER set Status Report deadline to 1/28/98. ( signed by Judge Robert H. Hodges, Jr. ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                LREF
                Blank 15 Filed: 9/23/1997, Entered: 9/25/1997 Status Report
                STATUS REPORT by MARK ALAN HEMINGWAY Service: 9/18/97 (CDC)
                  LREF
                  Blank 14 Filed: 6/25/1997, Entered: 7/10/1997 OrderCourt Filing
                  ORDER granting [10-1] motion to Stay Proceedings [60 days] ( signed by Judge Robert H. Hodges, Jr. ) Copy to parties. (HW)
                    LREF
                    Blank 13 Filed: 6/10/1997, Entered: 6/13/1997 Status Report
                    STATUS REPORT by USA. Service: 6/10/97 (AB)
                      LREF
                      Blank 12 Filed: 1/30/1997, Entered: 2/3/1997 OrderCourt Filing
                      ORDER granting [11-1] motion to Continue Stay of Proceedings until March 31, 1997 ( signed by Judge Robert H. Hodges, Jr. ). Copy to parties. (FE)
                        LREF
                        Blank 11 Filed: 1/22/1997, Entered: 1/29/1997, Terminated: 1/30/1997 Terminated:
                        MOTION by USA (Service : 1/22/97) to Continue Stay of Proceedings . (FE)
                          LREF
                          Blank 10 Filed: 11/4/1996, Entered: 11/7/1996, Terminated: 6/25/1997 Terminated:
                          MOTION by USA (Service : 11/4/96) to Stay Proceedings . (FE)
                            LREF
                            Blank 9 Filed: 10/28/1996, Entered: 11/4/1996 Terminated:
                            RESPONSE by MARK ALAN HEMINGWAY (Service: 10/24/96) to [4-1] motion for the issuance of a call. Reply due: 11/7/96 (FE)
                              LREF
                              Blank 8 Filed: 10/25/1996, Entered: 10/30/1996 OrderCourt Filing
                              ORDER Response to [4-1] motion for the issuance of a call reset to immediately (signed by Judge Robert H. Hodges, Jr.). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                LREF
                                Blank 7 Filed: 10/24/1996, Entered: 10/28/1996 Administrative Record
                                Administrative record filed by USA. (FE)
                                  LREF
                                  Blank 6 Filed: 10/24/1996, Entered: 10/28/1996 OrderCourt Filing
                                  ORDER granting [5-1] motion for Leave to File administrative record (signed by Judge Robert H. Hodges, Jr.). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                    LREF
                                    Blank 5 Filed: 10/21/1996, Entered: 10/23/1996, Terminated: 10/24/1996 Terminated:
                                    MOTION by USA (Service : 10/15/96) for Leave to File administrative record . Response due: 11/1/96 (FE)
                                      LREF
                                      Blank 4 Filed: 10/11/1996, Entered: 10/21/1996 Terminated:
                                      MOTION by USA (Service : 10/11/96 ) for the issuance of a call . Response due: 10/28/96 (HW)
                                        LREF
                                        Blank 3 Filed: 8/27/1996, Entered: 8/30/1996 Notice of Appearance/
                                        NOTICE of Attorney Appearance for USA by John Sinclair Groat Service: 8/27/96 (FE)
                                          LREF
                                          Blank 2 Filed: 8/14/1996, Entered: 8/15/1996 Case Assigned/ReassignedCourt Filing
                                          Notice of assignment to Judge Robert H. Hodges, Jr. . Copy to parties. (FE)
                                            LREF
                                            Blank 1 Filed: 8/12/1996, Entered: 8/14/1996 Complaint
                                            COMPLAINT, FILING FEE $120, RECEIPT #042072. Answer due on 10/11/96. (FE)
                                              LREF
                                              Blank -- Filed: 8/12/1996, Entered: 8/14/1996 Case Assigned/Reassigned
                                              CASE assigned to Judge Unassigned. (FE)
                                                LREF

                                                Statistics

                                                This case has been viewed 149 times.

                                                No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                Space
                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                 
                                                PlainSite
                                                Sign Up
                                                Need Password Help?